Marconi et al v. Northwell Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Marconi, R. M., Cory Coyle and Patrick Nealon
Defendant: Northwell Health, Inc. and Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv08638
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Action by Northwell Health, Inc.. (Conniff, Christopher)
December 26, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by Cory Coyle, R. M., Amanda Marconi, Patrick Nealon of Copy of MOTION for Transfer filed before the US Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Canty, Michael)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on February 29, 2024 before the undersigned by phone. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-89511 with access code 3152145. The attached Discovery Plan Worksheet is to be completed by counsel and electronically filed with the Court by February 27th. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/20/2023. (LV)
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Flynn on behalf of Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Flynn, Ashley)
December 11, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Adam Nirenberg on behalf of Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Nirenberg, Seth)
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Michael Maxwell on behalf of Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Maxwell, Joel)
December 8, 2023 Filing 10 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in civil action 23cv9011(AYS) indicates this is a related case. (LJ)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Izzo on behalf of Cory Coyle, R. M., Amanda Marconi, Patrick Nealon (aty to be noticed) (Izzo, Danielle)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Cecilia Villegas on behalf of Cory Coyle, R. M., Amanda Marconi, Patrick Nealon (aty to be noticed) (Villegas, Carol)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Canty on behalf of Cory Coyle, R. M., Amanda Marconi, Patrick Nealon (notification declined or already on case) (Canty, Michael)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patrick Nealon, Amanda Marconi, Cory Coyle, R. M.. Northwell Health, Inc. waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Canty, Michael)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (CL)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (CL)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (CL)
November 22, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Nusrat Jahan Choudhury and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Cory Coyle, R. M., Amanda Marconi, Patrick Nealon (Canty, Michael)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northwell Health, Inc., Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17305856 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Patrick Nealon, Amanda Marconi, Cory Coyle, R. M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Flyer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Canty, Michael) Modified on 11/22/2023 (CL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marconi et al v. Northwell Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Marconi
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Represented By: Carol Cecilia Villegas
Represented By: Danielle Izzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. M.
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Represented By: Carol Cecilia Villegas
Represented By: Danielle Izzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Coyle
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Represented By: Carol Cecilia Villegas
Represented By: Danielle Izzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Nealon
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Represented By: Carol Cecilia Villegas
Represented By: Danielle Izzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwell Health, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Conniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Johnson & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Michael Maxwell
Represented By: Ashley Flynn
Represented By: Seth Adam Nirenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?