Wurthmann v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Wurthmann
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sandoz Inc., Accord Healthcare, Inc., HOSPIRA INC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc. and Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2023cv08655
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Referring Judge: Lee G Dunst
2 Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Filing 19 Letter responding to Court Order on 12/21/23 by Susan Wurthmann (Browne, Ryan)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER. Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. #1 , alleges that this Court has diversity subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. The allegations regarding the citizenship of Defendants Sanofi US Services Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC are insufficient.Diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a) requires complete diversity among the plaintiffs and defendants. See Tagger v. Strauss Grp. Ltd., 951 F.3d 124, 126 (2d Cir. 2020); see also Herrick Co. v. SCS Commc'ns, Inc., 251 F.3d 315, 322 (2d Cir. 2001) ("[Diversity jurisdiction is available only when all adverse parties to a litigation are completely diverse in their citizenships."). For the purposes of diversity jurisdiction, a party's citizenship depends on its domicile, which "is the place where that individual has a true, fixed home and principal establishment, and to which, whenever that person is absent from the jurisdiction, he or she has the intention of returning[.]" 13E Charles Alan Wright & Arthur R. Miller, Federal Practice and Procedure 3612 (3d ed. 2021); Van Buskirk v. United Grp. of Cos., Inc., 935 F.3d 49, 53 (2d Cir. 2019). "For diversity purposes, a corporation is considered a citizen of the state in which it is incorporated and the state of its principal place of business." Bayerische Landesbank v. Aladdin Cap. Mgmt. LLC, 692 F.3d 42, 48 (2d Cir. 2012). As for an LLC, "the citizenship of a limited liability company is determined by the citizenship of each of its members." Carter v. HealthPort Techs., LLC, 822 F.3d 47, 60 (2d Cir. 2016). Plaintiff alleges diversity because she is a citizen of New York but fails to assert the citizenship of either of the two remaining Defendants. See Snyder Corp. v. Fitness Ridge Worldwide, LLC, 2018 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 47514 at *5 (W.D.N.Y. 2018) (establishing diversity requires affirmative statements of the identity and citizenship of all parties and the members thereof: conclusory statements upon information and belief are insufficient). Accordingly, in order to determine whether federal subject matter jurisdiction exists, Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a letter identifying: (1) the state of incorporation and the state where Defendant Sanofi US Services Inc. has its principal place of business; and (2) the name and residency of each member of Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC on or before December 29, 2023. Ordered by Judge Nusrat Jahan Choudhury on 12/21/2023. (ASB)
December 11, 2023 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT - Joint Status Letter by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (DePaz, Matthew)
December 11, 2023 PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE: re #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-17361989 $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-17366713 (Browne, Ryan)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER re #16 : The Motion of Ryan Jon Browne for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/11/2023. c/ecf (RI)
December 8, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice by Susan Wurthmann (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing) (Browne, Ryan)
December 8, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-17361989 by Susan Wurthmann. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing) (Browne, Ryan)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER re #13 : The Motion of Matthew DePaz for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/4/2023. c/ecf (RI)
November 28, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Doerner-Fogel on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Doerner-Fogel, Maureen)
November 28, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Doerner-Fogel on behalf of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (aty to be noticed) (Doerner-Fogel, Maureen)
November 27, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-17319103 by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (DePaz, Matthew)
November 27, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Vita, William)
November 27, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edward Vita on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (aty to be noticed) (Vita, William)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER The parties are directed to file a joint Status Report letter detailing remaining discovery to be conducted and any anticipated motion practice by December 11, 2023.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/27/2023. (BJ)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst recused. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay for all further proceedings. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 11/22/2023. (GO)
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (DC)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-12224. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Eastern District of New York. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
November 21, 2023 The case of Wurthmann v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al, has been transferred from U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Louisiana to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 23-cv-8655-NJC-LGD. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (DC)
September 29, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer of Orders, #2 Exhibit B - PTO, #3 Exhibit C - CMO, #4 Exhibit D - Pleadings, #5 Exhibit E - Orders on Dispositive Motions, #6 Exhibit F - Daubert Orders, #7 Exhibit G - MIL Orders)(Moore, Douglas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR, Re-Filed at Doc. #6 ** Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designations of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Moore, Douglas) Modified on 10/6/2023 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (mp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7276161) filed by Susan Wurthmann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)Attorney Spencer Paul Browne added to party Susan Wurthmann(pty:pla).(Browne, Spencer) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wurthmann v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Maureen Doerner-Fogel
Represented By: William Edward Vita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Maureen Doerner-Fogel
Represented By: William Edward Vita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Maureen Doerner-Fogel
Represented By: William Edward Vita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Wurthmann
Represented By: Ryan J. Browne
Represented By: Spencer Paul Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?