Nirmala Realty LLC v. The Hedgestone Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nirmala Realty LLC
Defendant: The Hedgestone Group LLC, Michael Steinberg, Marc Warshaw and The Hedgestone Group LLC doing business as Hedgestone Business Advisors
Case Number: 2:2023cv08675
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lee G Dunst
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order STIPULATION AND ORDER re #15 Stipulation. The parties' stipulation at DE #15 to extend the time for Defendants to answer Plaintiff's complaint is APPROVED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint by 1/26/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 1/12/2024. (CT)
January 11, 2024 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #12 Summons Returned Executed to extend time to answer by Michael Steinberg, The Hedgestone Group LLC, Marc Warshaw (Romano, Michael)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER: The parties' stipulation at DE #12 is APPROVED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint by 1/12/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 12/20/2023. (SBE)
December 19, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Romano on behalf of Michael Steinberg, The Hedgestone Group LLC, Marc Warshaw (aty to be noticed) (Romano, Michael)
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #12 Summons Returned Executed to extend time to answer by Michael Steinberg, The Hedgestone Group LLC, Marc Warshaw (Romano, Michael)
December 5, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nirmala Realty LLC. The Hedgestone Group LLC served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Gottesman, Baruch)
November 28, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Michael Steinberg, The Hedgestone Group LLC, Marc Warshaw. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (AMF)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. by Nirmala Realty LLC (Gottesman, Baruch)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. by Nirmala Realty LLC (Gottesman, Baruch)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by Nirmala Realty LLC (Gottesman, Baruch)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. (LJ)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
November 27, 2023 Your proposed summons was not issued for the following reason: The Plaintiffs attorney name and addresses section has not been completed. Please correct and resubmit using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ)
November 27, 2023 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Complaint was entered as against plaintiff; entry was deleted and re-entered as against defendants. (LJ)
November 27, 2023 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Nirmala Realty LLC. (LJ)
November 22, 2023 FILING FEE: $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17310238 (LJ)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Nirmala Realty LLC (Gottesman, Baruch)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Nirmala Realty LLC (Gottesman, Baruch)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Nirmala Realty LLC (Gottesman, Baruch)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Nirmala Realty LLC (Gottesman, Baruch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nirmala Realty LLC v. The Hedgestone Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nirmala Realty LLC
Represented By: Baruch S. Gottesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hedgestone Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Steinberg
Represented By: Michael Joseph Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Warshaw
Represented By: Michael Joseph Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hedgestone Group LLC doing business as Hedgestone Business Advisors
Represented By: Michael Joseph Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?