Ramirez-Sanchez v. Jaddou et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Ramirez-Sanchez
Defendant: USCIS Director Ur M. Jaddou, District Director Michael Borgen, Christopher A. Wray, US Attorney General Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Michael Borgen and Merrick B. Garland
Case Number: 2:2023cv08864
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lee G Dunst
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary McGarvey-DePuy on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (McGarvey-DePuy, Mary)
January 2, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Ramirez-Sanchez. Michael Borgen served on 12/21/2023, answer due 2/19/2024; Merrick B. Garland served on 12/21/2023, answer due 2/19/2024; Ur M. Jaddou served on 12/21/2023, answer due 2/19/2024; Christopher A. Wray served on 12/21/2023, answer due 2/19/2024. (Norona, Mauricio)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Michael Borgen, Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Christopher A. Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (AMF)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File and to Appear as Law Students. Having reviewed the Motion to Appear as Law Students (DE #11 ) submitted by Dinara Khabibulina and Eva Ukman for Plaintiff Daniel Ramirez-Sanchez and found it in compliance with the Eastern District Student Practice Rule, the motion is approved. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 12/7/2023. (MO)
December 6, 2023 Filing 11 First MOTION for Leave to File Document Motion for Leave to Appear as Law Students by Daniel Ramirez-Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Law Student Appearance Form for Dinara Khabibulina, #2 Exhibit Law Student Appearance Form for Eva Ukman) (Norona, Mauricio)
December 6, 2023 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. by Daniel Ramirez-Sanchez (Norona, Mauricio)
December 5, 2023 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The full case caption must appear on the summons, and if multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included.Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (AMF)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. by Daniel Ramirez-Sanchez (Norona, Mauricio)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by Daniel Ramirez-Sanchez (Norona, Mauricio)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by Daniel Ramirez-Sanchez (Norona, Mauricio)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Daniel Ramirez-Sanchez (Norona, Mauricio)
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. (LJ)
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
December 4, 2023 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Daniel Ramirez-Sanchez (Norona, Mauricio)
December 4, 2023 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
December 4, 2023 A summons was not issued for the following reason: No summons provided, please submit summons. The event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Daniel Ramirez-Sanchez (Norona, Mauricio)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, COMPLAINT UNDER ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT, AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Ur M. Jaddou, Michael Borgen, Christopher A. Wray, Merrick B. Garland filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17336603 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Daniel Ramirez-Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A, Evidence of SIJS Application and Approval, #2 Exhibit Exh. B, Adjustment of Status Application Receipt, #3 Exhibit Exh. C, Evidence of Case Status Requests, #4 Exhibit Exh. D, USCIS Ombudsman Communications) (Norona, Mauricio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez-Sanchez v. Jaddou et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ramirez-Sanchez
Represented By: Mauricio Norona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Director Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Michael Borgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Mary McGarvey-DePuy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General Merrick B. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By: Mary McGarvey-DePuy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Borgen
Represented By: Mary McGarvey-DePuy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: Mary McGarvey-DePuy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?