Keith v. Austin Coins, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Earl E Keith and Earl E. Keith
Defendant: Austin Coins, Inc, Christian Foster, Brandon E Chancey, Eric P Lesak, David Schmidt, Christopher M. Paradise, Eric P. Lesak, Austin Coins, Inc., Brandon E. Chancey, Mike Todd and Patrick J. White
Case Number: 2:2023cv09461
Filed: December 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lee G Dunst
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Earl E. Keith. Christopher M. Paradise served on 1/19/2024, answer due 2/9/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 29, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Earl E. Keith. Eric P. Lesak served on 1/17/2024, answer due 2/7/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 29, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Earl E. Keith. David Schmidt served on 1/19/2024, answer due 2/9/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 29, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Earl E. Keith. Christian Foster served on 1/19/2024, answer due 2/9/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 29, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Earl E. Keith. Patrick J. White served on 1/19/2024, answer due 2/9/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 29, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Earl E. Keith. Brandon E. Chancey served on 1/27/2024, answer due 2/19/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 29, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Earl E. Keith. Austin Coins, Inc. served on 1/22/2024, answer due 2/12/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
December 27, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (LJ)
December 27, 2023 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (LJ)
December 27, 2023 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
December 27, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
December 27, 2023 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Added missing Defendant Patrick J. White to the case to conform to the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet) and re-entered as against all Defendants. (LJ)
December 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Earl E. Keith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (LJ)
December 22, 2023 FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17406143 (LJ)
December 22, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Earl E Keith (Walsh, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keith v. Austin Coins, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl E Keith
Represented By: Kenneth G. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl E. Keith
Represented By: Kenneth G. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Coins, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon E Chancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric P Lesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric P. Lesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Coins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon E. Chancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?