Nowell v. Austin Coins, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Nowell
Defendant: Austin Coins, Inc, Eric P Lesak, Timothy James King, Patrick J. White, David Schmidt, Christopher M. Paradise, P. White Holdings, LLC, Austin Coins, Inc. and Eric P. Lesak
Case Number: 2:2024cv00218
Filed: January 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Francesco P. Tini on behalf of Austin Coins, Inc., P. White Holdings, LLC, Patrick J. White (aty to be noticed) (Tini, Francesco)
January 25, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bobby Nowell. Timothy James King served on 1/19/2024, answer due 2/9/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 25, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bobby Nowell. Christopher M. Paradise served on 1/19/2024, answer due 2/9/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 25, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bobby Nowell. P. White Holdings, LLC served on 1/22/2024, answer due 2/12/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 25, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bobby Nowell. David Schmidt served on 1/19/2024, answer due 2/9/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 25, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bobby Nowell. Austin Coins, Inc. served on 1/22/2024, answer due 2/12/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 25, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bobby Nowell. Patrick J. White served on 1/19/2024, answer due 2/9/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 25, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bobby Nowell. Eric P. Lesak served on 1/17/2024, answer due 2/7/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 12, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (LJ)
January 11, 2024 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Bobby Nowell (Walsh, Kenneth)
January 11, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (CL)
January 11, 2024 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (CL)
January 11, 2024 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (CL)
January 11, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
January 11, 2024 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No summons provided, please submit summons. The event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CL)
January 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17449820 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Bobby Nowell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Walsh, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nowell v. Austin Coins, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Nowell
Represented By: Kenneth G. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Coins, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric P Lesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy James King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. White
Represented By: Francesco P. Tini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. White Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Francesco P. Tini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Coins, Inc.
Represented By: Francesco P. Tini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric P. Lesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?