Grindle v. Austin Coins, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David R Grindle and David R. Grindle
Defendant: Eric P. Lesak, Patrick J. White, David Schmidt and Christopher M. Paradise
Cross Defendant: Austin Coins, Inc.
Other: P. White Holdings, LLC and Brandon E. Chancey
Case Number: 2:2024cv01125
Filed: February 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lee G Dunst
Referring Judge: Natasha C Merle
2 Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold an Initial Conference on 5/23/2024 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 830, Alfonse M. D'Amato U.S. Courthouse, Central Islip in the following related cases: 23-cv-09461, 24-cv-00206, 24-cv-00218, 24-cv-00220, 24-cv-01125, 24-cv-01662. The parties are directed to follow Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rules, which are available on the Court's website, and submit a proposed discovery plan/scheduling order at least five business days prior to the initial conference pursuant to Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rule IV.A.1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 4/11/2024. (CT) Modified on 4/12/2024 (CT).
April 10, 2024 Filing 23 ANSWER to #20 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Answer to co-defendant cross-claims) by Brandon E. Chancey. (Klein, Alexander)
April 10, 2024 Filing 22 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Austin Coins, Inc., Eric P. Lesak, P. White Holdings, LLC, Christopher M. Paradise, David Schmidt, Patrick J. White by Brandon E. Chancey. (Klein, Alexander)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Natasha C. Merle and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/10/2024. Motions referred to Lee G. Dunst. (SDM)
March 21, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by David R. Grindle. (Walsh, Kenneth)
March 20, 2024 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Brandon E. Chancey, Eric P. Lesak, Christopher M. Paradise, David Schmidt by Austin Coins, Inc., P. White Holdings, LLC, Patrick J. White. (Tini, Francesco)
March 20, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brandon E. Chancey. (Klein, Alexander)
March 7, 2024 Filing 18 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER by Austin Coins, Inc., P. White Holdings, LLC, Patrick J. White (Tini, Francesco)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: An IN-PERSON Initial Conference is set for 6/24/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. See order and attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 3/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 AYS RULES) (JT)
March 4, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David R. Grindle. Patrick J. White served on 2/28/2024, answer due 3/20/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
March 4, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David R. Grindle. P. White Holdings, LLC served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
March 4, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David R. Grindle. Eric P. Lesak served on 3/1/2024, answer due 3/22/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
March 4, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David R. Grindle. David Schmidt served on 2/28/2024, answer due 3/20/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
March 4, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David R. Grindle. Christopher M. Paradise served on 2/28/2024, answer due 3/20/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
March 4, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David R. Grindle. Brandon E. Chancey served on 2/28/2024, answer due 3/20/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
March 4, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David R. Grindle. Austin Coins, Inc. served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
February 28, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander R. Klein on behalf of Brandon E. Chancey (aty to be noticed) (Klein, Alexander)
February 27, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce A. Barket on behalf of Brandon E. Chancey (aty to be noticed) (Barket, Bruce)
February 21, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Austin Coins, Inc., Brandon E. Chancey, Eric P. Lesak, P. White Holdings, LLC, Christopher M. Paradise, David Schmidt, Patrick J. White. (AMF)
February 20, 2024 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by David R. Grindle (Walsh, Kenneth)
February 16, 2024 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The name on the summons does not match the name as it appears on the complaint; specifically as to the Defendant Brandon E. Chancey. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (GO)
February 15, 2024 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by David R. Grindle (Walsh, Kenneth)
February 15, 2024 Filing 4 Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. (CL)
February 15, 2024 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (CL)
February 15, 2024 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: PLEASE LEAVE THE DATE BLANK. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CL)
February 15, 2024 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
February 13, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by David R Grindle (Walsh, Kenneth)
February 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17566649 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by David R Grindle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Walsh, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grindle v. Austin Coins, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R Grindle
Represented By: Kenneth G. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Grindle
Represented By: Kenneth G. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Austin Coins, Inc.
Represented By: Francesco P. Tini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric P. Lesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. White
Represented By: Francesco P. Tini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: P. White Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Francesco P. Tini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Brandon E. Chancey
Represented By: Bruce A. Barket
Represented By: Alexander R. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?