Gogoe v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Gogoe
Defendant: Eric Lesak, Austin Lloyd, Inc., Austin Coins, Inc., P. White Holding, LLC, Patrick White, Charisma Perry, Mike Todd, Christopher M. Paradise and Sean Klein
Case Number: 2:2024cv01307
Filed: February 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Referring Judge: James M Wicks
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Filing 13 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Thomas A. Gogoe. (Dei, Brandon)
April 11, 2024 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint Personally served on Eric Lesak on 3/12/24, filed by Thomas A. Gogoe. (Dei, Brandon)
April 11, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint Suitably served on Charisma Perry on 3/12/24, filed by Thomas A. Gogoe. (Dei, Brandon)
April 11, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint Suitably served on Patrick White on 3/12/24, filed by Thomas A. Gogoe. (Dei, Brandon)
April 11, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on P. White Holding LLC on 3/12/24, filed by Thomas A. Gogoe. (Dei, Brandon)
April 11, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Austin Coins Inc on 3/12/24, filed by Thomas A. Gogoe. (Dei, Brandon)
April 11, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Austin Lloyd, Inc. on 3/12/24, filed by Thomas A. Gogoe. (Dei, Brandon)
March 7, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Austin Coins, Inc., Austin Lloyd, Inc., Sean Klein, Eric Lesak, P. White Holding, LLC, Christopher M. Paradise, Charisma Perry, Patrick White. (AMF)
March 6, 2024 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Thomas A. Gogoe (Dei, Brandon)
March 6, 2024 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (AMF)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Thomas A. Gogoe (Dei, Brandon)
February 21, 2024 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (CL)
February 21, 2024 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (CL)
February 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17590675 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by THOMAS A. GOGOE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dei, Brandon)
February 21, 2024 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No summons provided, please submit summons. The event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CL)
February 21, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Nusrat Jahan Choudhury and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gogoe v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Lesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Lloyd, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Coins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. White Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charisma Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Gogoe
Represented By: Brandon Dei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?