Cleary v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Kevin Cleary
Defendant: Austin Lloyd, Inc., Austin Coins, Inc., Eric P Lesak, Brandon E Chancey, Patrick J White, David Schmidt, Christopher M Paradise, P. White Holdings, LLC, Eric P. Lesak, Brandon E. Chancey, Patrick J. White and Christopher M. Paradise
Case Number: 2:2024cv01662
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lee G Dunst
Referring Judge: Natasha C Merle
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold an Initial Conference on 5/23/2024 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 830, Alfonse M. D'Amato U.S. Courthouse, Central Islip in the following related cases: 23-cv-09461, 24-cv-00206, 24-cv-00218, 24-cv-00220, 24-cv-01125, 24-cv-01662. The parties are directed to follow Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rules, which are available on the Court's website, and submit a proposed discovery plan/scheduling order at least five business days prior to the initial conference pursuant to Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rule IV.A.1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 4/11/2024. (CT) Modified on 4/12/2024 (CT).
April 10, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Answer to co-defendant cross-claims) by Brandon E. Chancey. (Klein, Alexander)
April 10, 2024 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Austin Coins, Inc., Austin Lloyd, Inc., Eric P. Lesak, P. White Holdings, LLC, Christopher M. Paradise, David Schmidt, Patrick J. White by Brandon E. Chancey. (Klein, Alexander)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Natasha C. Merle and Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst (as related to 23-cv-9461) for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/10/2024. Motions referred to Lee G. Dunst. (KD)
March 28, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Kevin Cleary. Eric P. Lesak served on 3/22/2024, answer due 4/12/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
March 28, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Kevin Cleary. David Schmidt served on 3/18/2024, answer due 4/8/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
March 28, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Kevin Cleary. Christopher M. Paradise served on 3/18/2024, answer due 4/8/2024. (Walsh, Kenneth)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold an Initial Conference on 5/23/2024 at 12:00PM in Courtroom 830 of the Alfonse M. D'Amato Federal Courthouse, Central Islip. The parties are directed to follow Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rules, which are available on the Court's website, and submit a proposed discovery plan/scheduling order at least five business days prior to the initial conference pursuant to Judge Dunst's Individual Practice Rule IV.A.1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst on 3/25/2024. (CT)
March 21, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by William Kevin Cleary. (Walsh, Kenneth)
March 20, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Brandon E. Chancey, Eric P. Lesak, Christopher M. Paradise, David Schmidt by Austin Coins, Inc., P. White Holdings, LLC, Austin Lloyd, Inc.. (Tini, Francesco)
March 20, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brandon E. Chancey. (Klein, Alexander)
March 7, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Francesco P. Tini on behalf of Austin Coins, Inc., Austin Lloyd, Inc., P. White Holdings, LLC, Patrick J. White (aty to be noticed) (Tini, Francesco)
March 7, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (LJ)
March 7, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (LJ)
March 7, 2024 Filing 4 Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website: #https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. (LJ)
March 7, 2024 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
March 6, 2024 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2024: #1 Additional Corrections) (LJ).
March 6, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by William Kevin Cleary (Walsh, Kenneth)
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17637926 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by William Kevin Cleary. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Walsh, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleary v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kevin Cleary
Represented By: Kenneth G. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Lloyd, Inc.
Represented By: Francesco P. Tini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Coins, Inc.
Represented By: Francesco P. Tini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric P Lesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon E Chancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. White Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Francesco P. Tini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric P. Lesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon E. Chancey
Represented By: Alexander R. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. White
Represented By: Francesco P. Tini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?