American International Group, Inc. v. United States of America Featured Case

Plaintiff: American International Group, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2009cv01871
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Taxes Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Louis L. Stanton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 26:7422 Refund of Income Tax

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2017 177 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION DENYING MOTION IN LIMINE: on re: 168 MOTION in Limine to exclude from trial evidence concerning eight so-called Domestic Transactions, filed by United States of America. Such evidence bears so directly on the issue whether t he foreign transactions had "no business purpose or economic effect other than the creation of tax" benefits, DeMartino v. Comm'r, 862 F.2d 400, 406 (2d Cir. 1988), that it cannot be excluded in advance of trial. In fact, the presentat ion of the domestic transactions need not present extraordinary complexities. The salient point should be whether they have such significant differences from the foreign transactions that the two classes of transactions cannot be usefully compared. T hose differences should be identified and isolated by counsel before trial, at the latest in the joint pretrial order, so that their submission to the jury can be evaluated. The motion to exclude the domestic transactions in limine (Doc. No. 168) is denied, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/6/2017) (ap)
March 29, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re: 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by American International Group, Inc. AIG's motion for partial summary jdugment, Dkt. No. 109, is therefore denied. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/29/2013) (tro)
February 27, 2009 1
COMPLAINT against United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 680011)Document filed by American International Group, Inc.(laq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American International Group, Inc. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American International Group, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis S. Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?