Ashton, et al v. Al Qaeda Islamic, et al
Plaintiff: Evelyn Tepedino, Raj Thackurdeen, Sat Thackurdeen, Rosanna Thompson, Kimberly Trimingham-Aiken, Marie Twomey, Victor Ugolyn, Feliciana Umanzor, Virginia Lorene Rossiter Valvo, Jasmine Victoria, Dawn Brown, Richard Villa, Lucy Virgilio, Diane Wall, Diane M. Walsh, Amy Weaver, Delia Welty, Kristin Galusha-Wild, Patricia Wiswall, Anne M. Wodensheck, Cella Woo-Yeun, Siew-Som Yeow, Erica Zucker, Nancy Lynn Zuckerman, Aldo Addissi, Edward Arancio, Kathleen M. Arancio, Leonard Ardizzone, Barbara Ardizzone, Thomas Baez, Joseph Beltrani, Andrew Braun, James Cizikie, Thomas Conroy, Jr., Gibson A. Craig, Bradley Daly, Robert D'Elia, Thomas Donnelly, Charles Downey, Joseph R. Downey, Timothy L. Frolich, Irene Frolich, Steven M. Gillespie, Joseph Hands, John Hassett, James D. Hodges, Netta Issacof, John F. Jermyn, Arnold Lederman, Phyllis Lederman, Michael J. Lindy, Sandy Amrita Mahabir, William Martin, Kevin McArdle, James McGetrick, Owen McGovern, Kevin G. Murphy, Janice O'Dell, Timothy Parker, Howard Rice, Louis Schaefer, Scott Schrimpe, Scott Ting, George Luis Torres, Robert V. Trivingo, Russell Vomero, Edward Walsh, Philip J. Zeiss, Vice Rose Arestegui, Traci Bosco, Jennifer E. Brady, Patricia Coughlin, Michael Deloughery, Jeanne M. Evans, Amy Farnum, Lori Fletcher, Mathilda Geidel, Armine Giorgetti, Regan Grice-Vega, Elinore Hartz, Colleen Holohan, Roberta Kellerman, Veronica Klares, Laurie S. Lauterbach, Ingrid M. Lenihan, Jerline Lewis, Jeffrey Lovit, Virginia McKeon, Olga Merino, Merrilly E. Noeth, Harry Ong, Jr., Perry S. Oretzky, Michael Puckett, Janlyn Scauso, Nancy Shea, Holli Silver, Robin Theurkauf, Joseph A. Tiesi, Anthony Vincelli, Benhardt R. Wainio, Lena Whittaker, Madeleine A. Zuccala, Andrezej Cieslik, Domenick Damiano, Warren Hayes, Warren Monroe, Kevin Mount, Kevin Quinn, Charles Schmidt, Jo Ann Meehan, Christy Ferer, Julio Cesar Fernandez, Carol Laieta, Juan Martinez, Laurie Weinberg, Susan Wohlforth, Danny Ray Johnson and Frank Maisano
Defendant: Egyptian Islamic Jihad, Osama Bin Laden, Ayman Al Zawahari, Abu Zubaydh, Saif Al Adel, Khalid Sheikh Mohammed, Abu Salah Al-Yemini, Ramzi Bin Al-Shibb, Hasim Abdulrahman, Musstafa Ahmed Al-Hawsawi, Abdullah Azzam, Mohamed Bayazid, The Estate Al-Shehhi, The Estate of Fayez, The Estate of Ahmed Al Ghamdi, Hamza Al Ghamdi, The Estate of Mohald Al Shehri, Estate of Satam Al-Suqami, The Estate of Omari, Estate of Waleed Al-Shehri, Estate of Wail Al-Shehri, The Estate of Mohammed Atta, The Estate of Khalid Al Midhair, Estate of Nawaf Al-Hazmi, Estate of Hanjour, The Estate of Salem Al Hazmi, Estate of Majed Moqued, The Estate of Ziad Samir Jarrah, The Estate of Ahmed Ibrahim A. Al Haznawi, The Estate of Saeed Al Ghamdi, The Estate of Ahmed Al Nami, Zacarias Moussaoui, Muhammed Omar, The Republic of Iraq, Saddam Hussein, Qusay Hussein, Uday Hussein, Taha Yassin Ramadan, Faruq Al-Hijazi, Ahmed Khalil Ibrahim Samir Al-Ani, Taha Al Alwani, Ahmad I. Nasreddin, Al Rashid Trust, Al Taqwa Bank, Al Taqwa Management Orginization, Al-Haramin, Albert Friedrich Arman Huber, Ali Ghaleb Himmat, Ali Ghaleeb Himmat, Enaam M. Arnanout, Global Relief Foudantion, International Relief Foundation, Inc., International Islamic Relief Organization, International Institute of Islamic Thought, Jamal Barzini, Nada Management Organization, S.A., Mufti Mohammed Rashid, Muslim World League, Muwaffaq Foundation, Rabita Trust, Saar Foundation, Shamal Islamic Bank, Adil Galil Batargy, Somali Internet Company, Somali Network, A.B., Somali International Relief Organization (U.S.A.), Suleiman Abdel Aziz Al Rajhi, World Assembly Muslim Youth, Yasin Al-Qadi, Yousef M. Nada, Yousef M. Nada & Co. Gesellschaft, M.b.H, Jeffrey Lovett, Saleh Abdullah Kamel, Wa'el Jalaidan, Faisal Group Holding Co., Mohammed Bin Abdulrahman Al Ariefy, Omar Abdullah Kamel, Soliman S. Biheiri, Wadith El Hage, Al Qaeda Islamic Army, Sana-Bell, Inc. and Sanabel Al Kheer, Inc.
Movant: Federal Insurance Company, Pacific Insurance Company and Vigilant Insurance Company
Cross_claimant: Muslim World League
Cross_defendant: Musstafa Ahmed Al-Hawsawi, Ramzi Bin Al-Shibb and Khalid Sheikh Mohammed
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Muslim World League
Thirdparty_defendant: Jamal Ahmed Al Fadl
Consolidated_plaintiff: Ernesto Barrera, Sharlene M. Beckwith, James A. Reed, Benito Colon, Rachel W. Goodrich, Victoria Higley, Maureen Kelly, Marion Knox, Laura J. Lassman, Philip Lee, Mei Jy Lee, Melvin C. Lewis, John Lewis, John A. Martin, Paul R. Martin, Joviana Mercado, Linda Pascuma, Sean Passananti, Helen Pfeifer, Daniel Polatsch, Theresa Regan, Armand Reo, Alexander Santoro, Maureen Santoro, Narasimha Sattaluri, Wen Shi, Cynthia Tumulty, Yun Yu Zheng, David Ziminski, Robert Bermingham, Mark Bernheimer, Donald DiDomenico, Joseph Donovan, William Ellis, Michael Endrizzi, Thomas Fletcher, Mark Goldwasser, Ron Harding, Jeremiah Harney, Peter Ioveno, Jurgiel Kazimierz, Robert Keane, Raymond Lachhman, George Lantay, Houssain Lazaar, Joyce Leigh, Vincent LeVien, Jeff Lever, Jerzy Mrozek, Andrew Quinn, Dennis Quinn, Kevin Rogers, Carmen Romero, Christine Sakoutis, Kemraj Singh and Gary Wendell
Case Number: 1:2002cv06977
Filed: September 4, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1776 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Deborah Basham(spouse of 9/11 decedent Alfred Todd Rancke), Jennifer E Brady Cieszko, Erin K. Brady(child of 9/11 decedent David B. Brady), Grace A. Brady(child of 9/11 decedent David B. Brady), Mark R. Brady(child of 9/11 decedent David B. Brady), Matthew D. Brady(child of 9/11 decedent David B. Brady), Erin Coughlin(child of 9/11 decedent John G. Coughlin), Kayle Coughlin(child of 9/11 decedent John G. Coughlin), Patricia Coughlin(spouse of 9/11 decedent John G. Coughlin), Tara Coughlin(child of 9/11 decedent John G. Coughlin), Amanda Deloughery(child of 9/11 decedent Colleen Ann Deloughery), Michael Deloughery(spouse of 9/11 decedent Colleen Ann Deloughery), Michael Deloughery(child of 9/11 decedent Colleen Ann Deloughery), Bettyann Martineau(spouse of 9/11 decedent Brian E. Martineau), Chelsea E. Martineau(child of 9/11 decedent Brian E. Martineau), Scott Martineau(child of 9/11 decedent Brian E. Martineau), Olga Merino(spouse of 9/11 decedent George L. Merino), Tania Merino(child of 9/11 decedent George L. Merino), Amy Polmar(spouse of 9/11 decedent Douglas Farnum), Brittany Barbara Rancke, Alfred Todd Rancke, II, Alexandra Robotham(child of 9/11 decedent Michell L. Robotham), Gabrielle S. Scauso(child of 9/11 decedent Dennis Scauso), Janlyn Scauso(spouse of 9/11 decedent Dennis Scauso), Juliette L. Scauso(child of 9/11 decedent Dennis Scauso)..(Kreindler, James)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1775 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Katherine Maher, Katherine Maher, Colin Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan, Patricia Ryan..(Fleming, Timothy) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1774 DECLARATION of Timothy B. Fleming in Support re: (189 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 1773 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 8638 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban.. Document filed by Katherine Maher, Katherine Maher, Colin Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan, Patricia Ryan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Fleming, Timothy)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1773 MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban. Document filed by Katherine Maher, Katherine Maher, Colin Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan, Patricia Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A re: Estates, #2 Exhibit B re: Solatium)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Fleming, Timothy)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1772 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy B. Fleming on behalf of Colin Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan, Patricia Ryan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Fleming, Timothy)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1771 NOTICE of of Amendment. Document filed by Colin Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Fleming, Timothy)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1770 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Caroline Breitweiser, Kristen Breitweiser..(Fleming, Timothy) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (251 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1770 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 8629 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN(km)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Notice to attorney Timothy Fleming to RE-FILE Document No. (249 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 8627 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1768 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The document and filing event need to match (please remove the word Order from the title). The section of the default judgment (where interest needs to be calculated) please add, interest in the amount of $________, so that the interest calculations can be added in. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Default Judgment found under the event list Proposed Orders. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN(km)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1769 DECLARATION of Timothy B. Fleming in Support re: (1767 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 248 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 8626 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban.. Document filed by Caroline Breitweiser, Kristen Breitweiser. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Fleming, Timothy)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1768 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Caroline Breitweiser, Kristen Breitweiser..(Fleming, Timothy) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 10/13/2022 (km).
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1767 MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban. Document filed by Caroline Breitweiser, Kristen Breitweiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A re: Estates, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B re: Solatium)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Fleming, Timothy)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1766 NOTICE of of Amendment. Document filed by Caroline Breitweiser, Kristen Breitweiser. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Fleming, Timothy)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1765 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy B. Fleming on behalf of Caroline Breitweiser, Kristen Breitweiser. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Fleming, Timothy)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1764 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Eva Bartels(child of 9/11 decedent Carlton Bartels), Jane Bartels(spouse of 9/11 decedent Carlton Bartels), Melina Bartels(child of 9/11 decedent Carlton Bartels), Abigail R. Bosco(child of 9/11 decedent Richard Edward Bosco), Richard E. Bosco, Jr.(child of 9/11 decedent Richard Edward Bosco), Traci Bosco-Myhal(spouse of 9/11 decedent Richard Edward Bosco), Hillary A. Briley(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jonathan E. Briley), Yuko Clark(spouse of 9/11 decedent Gregory A. Clark), Ildefonso A. Cua(spouse of 9/11 decedent Grace Cua), Kurt Foster(spouse of 9/11 decedent Claudia Foster), Helen Friedlander Del Sindaco(spouse of 9/11 decedent Alan W. Friedlander), Regan Grice(spouse of 9/11 decedent Peter Vega), Ingrid Lenihan(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph A. Lenihan), Evan W. Lozier(child of 9/11 decedent Garry W. Lozier), Karoline E. Lozier(child of 9/11 decedent Garry W. Lozier), Olivia M. Lozier(child of 9/11 decedent Garry W. Lozier), Diane Miller(spouse of 9/11 decedent Henry A. Miller, Jr.), Alexis Perez(child of 9/11 decedent Anthony Perez), Anthony Perez(child of 9/11 decedent Anthony Perez), Mary Gola Perez(spouse of 9/11 decedent Anthony Perez), James Seymour(child of 9/11 decedent Jacqueline Norton), Ruby Vega(child of 9/11 decedent Peter Vega), Jasmine Victoria(child of 9/11 decedent Celeste Torres-Victoria)..(Kreindler, James)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1763 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Meg Bloom(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas Glasser), Elizabeth Burns(spouse of 9/11 decedent Donald J. Burns), Dominick R. Calia(child of 9/11 decedent Dominick E. Calia), Jaclyn N. Calia(child of 9/11 decedent Dominick E. Calia), Janet Calia-Donahue, Jeanna Calia-Micallef, Michele Iavarone(spouse of 9/11 decedent Carl Bedigian), Yesenia Ielpi(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jonathan Ielpi), Nicole Klein Girluard(child of 9/11 decedent Julie Lynne Zipper), Jason Klein(child of 9/11 decedent Julie Lynne Zipper), Richard Klein, Maryclair Leistman(spouse of 9/11 decedent David R. Leistman), Julian Perez(nephew of 9/11 decedent Marlyn C. Garcia), Dominic J. Puopolo, Sr.(spouse of 9/11 decedent Sonia Morales-Puopolo), Joyce Quinn(child of 9/11 decedent Matthew L. Ryan), Lauren Rosenzweig Morton(spouse of 9/11 decedent Phillip Rosenzweig), Max Rosenzweig(child of 9/11 decedent Phillip Rosenzweig), Matthew L. Ryan, Jr.(child of 9/11 decedent Matthew L. Ryan), Margaret Ryan(spouse of 9/11 decedent Matthew L. Ryan), Meaghan Ryan(child of 9/11 decedent Matthew L. Ryan), David Spampinato(child of 9/11 decedent Donald F. Spampinato, Jr.), Donald Spampinato(child of 9/11 decedent Donald F. Spampinato, Jr.), Laurie Spampinato(spouse of 9/11 decedent Donald F. Spampinato, Jr.), Peter Spampinato(child of 9/11 decedent Donald F. Spampinato, Jr.), Theresa Stack(spouse of 9/11 decedent Lawrence T. Stack)..(Kreindler, James)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1762 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Barbara Boyle(parent of 9/11 decedent Michael Boyle), Christina Bruehert(child of 9/11 decedent Richard Bruehert), Danielle Bruehert(child of 9/11 decedent Richard Bruehert), Jo Anne Bruehert, Jason A. Bruno(child of 9/11 decedent Rachel Tamares), Juan B. Bruno(spouse of 9/11 decedent Rachel Tamares), Robert J. Bruno(child of 9/11 decedent Rachel Tamares), Antonio D'antonio(spouse of 9/11 decedent Mary D'Antonio), Elizabeth D'antonio(child of 9/11 decedent Mary D'Antonio), Elizabeth Gardner(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas Gardner), Rene B. Hannafin(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas Hannafin), Jennifer Harvey-Trainor(spouse of 9/11 decedent Emeric J. Harvey), Dorothy Mauro-Jastremski(spouse of 9/11 decedent Charles A. Mauro), Anne Mcginley(child of 9/11 decedent Daniel F. McGinley), Madeline Mcginley(child of 9/11 decedent Daniel F. McGinley), Margaret Mcginley(spouse of 9/11 decedent Daniel F. McGinley), Patrick McGinley (child of 9/11 decedent Daniel F. McGinley), Peter Mcginley(child of 9/11 decedent Daniel F. McGinley), Terence Mcginley(child of 9/11 decedent Daniel F. McGinley), Barbara Minervino(spouse of 9/11 decedent Louis J. Minervino), Laina Minervino(child of 9/11 decedent Louis J. Minervino), Marisa Minervino(child of 9/11 decedent Louis J. Minervino), Christina M. Princiotta(child of 9/11 decedent Vincent Princiotta), Karen Princiotta(spouse of 9/11 decedent Vincent Princiotta), Nancy Sparozic(sibling of 9/11 decedent Charles A. Mauro)..(Kreindler, James)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1761 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Alexandria N. Bradshaw(child of 9/11 decedent Sandra W. Bradshaw), Nathan G. Bradshaw(child of 9/11 decedent Sandra W. Bradshaw), Phillip G. Bradshaw(spouse of 9/11 decedent Sandra W. Bradshaw), Shenan M. Bradshaw(stepchild of 9/11 decedent Sandra W. Bradshaw), Warren Colodner(spouse of 9/11 decedent Patricia Colodner), Alexis Colon(child of 9/11 decedent Sol E. Colon), Benito Colon(spouse of 9/11 decedent Sol E. Colon), Shayla Colon(child of 9/11 decedent Sol E. Colon), Brett Eagleson(child of 9/11 decedent John B. Eagleson), Gail Eagleson(spouse of 9/11 decedent John B. Eagleson), Kyle Eagleson(child of 9/11 decedent John B. Eagleson), Timothy Eagleson(child of 9/11 decedent John B. Eagleson), Roxann Giordano(spouse of 9/11 decedent John Giordano), Susan Hutchins(parent of 9/11 decedent Kevin Colbert), Christopher Pascuma(child of 9/11 decedent Michael J. Pascuma, Jr.), Linda Pascuma(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael J. Pascuma, Jr.), Michael Pascuma(child of 9/11 decedent Michael J. Pascuma, Jr.), Helen Pfeifer(parent of 9/11 decedent Kevin Pfeifer), William Pfeifer(parent of 9/11 decedent Kevin Pfeifer), Akiko Takahashi(child of 9/11 decedent Keiichiro Takahashi), Harumi Takahashi(spouse of 9/11 decedent Keiichiro Takahashi), Alexander T. Uman(child of 9/11 decedent Jonathan Uman), Anna I. Uman(child of 9/11 decedent Jonathan Uman), Julie Uman(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jonathan Uman), Yun Yu Zheng..(Kreindler, James)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1760 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Boris Basin(child of 9/11 decedent Inna Basina), Vladimir Basin(spouse of 9/11 decedent Inna Basina), Jolanta Boyarsky(spouse of 9/11 decedent Gennady Boyarsky), Michael Boyarsky(child of 9/11 decedent Gennady Boyarsky), Brett Cahill(child of 9/11 decedent John Cahill), Sean Cahill(child of 9/11 decedent John Cahill), Griffin C. Gelinas(child of 9/11 decedent Peter Gelinas), Jack G. Gelinas(child of 9/11 decedent Peter Gelinas), Michelle Gelinas(spouse of 9/11 decedent Peter Gelinas), Ella Khalif(spouse of 9/11 decedent Boris Khalif), Steven Khalif(child of 9/11 decedent Boris Khalif), Elizabeth Ladley(child of 9/11 decedent James P. Ladley), James Ladley(child of 9/11 decedent James P. Ladley), Sheri Anne Ladley-Calamusa, Joseph Owens(child of 9/11 decedent Peter Owens, Jr.), Kathleen Owens(spouse of 9/11 decedent Peter Owens, Jr.), Maryellen Owens(child of 9/11 decedent Peter Owens, Jr.), Thomas Owens(child of 9/11 decedent Peter Owens, Jr.), Kimberly Reyes(child of 9/11 decedent Eduvigis Reyes, Jr.), Tiffany Reyes(child of 9/11 decedent Eduvigis Reyes, Jr.), Stephanie Villarin(child of 9/11 decedent Eduvigis Reyes, Jr.), Helen Zaccoli(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph Zaccoli), James Zaccoli(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph Zaccoli), Joseph Zaccoli(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph Zaccoli), Regina Zaccoli(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph Zaccoli)..(Kreindler, James)
October 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1759 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Anne K. Brewer(child of 9/11 decedent Carol K. Demitz), Curtis F. Brewer(spouse of 9/11 decedent Carol K. Demitz), Brian Flannery(spouse of 9/11 decedent Christina Flannery), James Gabriel(child of 9/11 decedent Richard P. Gabriel), Anne Gabriel(spouse of 9/11 decedent Richard P. Gabriel), Christopher Gabriel(child of 9/11 decedent Richard P. Gabriel), Carol L. Gies(spouse of 9/11 decedent Ronnie E. Gies), Robert E. Gies(child of 9/11 decedent Ronnie E. Gies), Ronnie J. Gies(child of 9/11 decedent Ronnie E. Gies), Thomas W. Gies(child of 9/11 decedent Ronnie E. Gies), Kathryn E. Healey(child of 9/11 decedent Michael Healey), Matthew A. Healey(child of 9/11 decedent Michael Healey), Michael J. Healey(child of 9/11 decedent Michael Healey), Theresa Healey(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael Healey), Caitlyn H. Holohan(child of 9/11 decedent Thomas P. Holohan), Colleen M. Holohan(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas P. Holohan), Thomas P. Holohan, III, Liam M. Holohan(child of 9/11 decedent Thomas P. Holohan), Isa S. Martin(child of 9/11 decedent Linda C. Mair Grayling), William Nelson(spouse of 9/11 decedent Theresa Nelson-Risco), Donna Smith Yule, Caroline Smith(child of 9/11 decedent James G. Smith), Kristen Smith(child of 9/11 decedent James G. Smith), Robert Smith, William Smith(child of 9/11 decedent James G. Smith)..(Kreindler, James)
October 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1758 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Jennifer Abad(child of 9/11 decedent Edelmiro Abad), Lorraine Abad(spouse of 9/11 decedent Edelmiro Abad), Serena Abad(child of 9/11 decedent Edelmiro Abad), Terrence Adderley(parent of 9/11 decedent Terence Adderley, Jr.), Crystal Barkow(stepchild of 9/11 decedent Colleen Barkow), Daniel F. Barkow(spouse of 9/11 decedent Colleen Barkow), Kayla Barkow(stepchild of 9/11 decedent Colleen Barkow), Edward Brennan(parent of 9/11 decedent Edward A. Brennan, III), Gail Brennan(parent of 9/11 decedent Edward A. Brennan, III), Sandra Burnside Sturiano(spouse of 9/11 decedent John P. Burnside), Mariano D'alessandro(nephew of 9/11 decedent Rocco N. Gargano), Anthony D. Deniro Graffino(stepchild of 9/11 decedent Peter J. Carroll), Robert Devitt, Sr.(parent of 9/11 decedent Robert Devitt, Jr.), Kenneth Fried(spouse of 9/11 decedent Arlene E. Fried), Elizabeth A. King(child of 9/11 decedent Robert King), Stephen J. King(child of 9/11 decedent Robert King), Theresa King(spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert King), Thomas C. King(child of 9/11 decedent Robert King), Andrew R. Lenoir(child of 9/11 decedent John Robinson Lenoir), Courtney A. Lenoir(child of 9/11 decedent John Robinson Lenoir), Asher Richards Frankel(child of 9/11 decedent Gregory D. Richards), Erin P. Richards Frankel(spouse of 9/11 decedent Gregory D. Richards), Claudia Ruggiere Donovan(spouse of 9/11 decedent Bart Ruggiere), Matthew Vilardo(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph Vilardo), Patricia Vilardo(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph Vilardo)..(Kreindler, James)
October 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1757 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Angelica Allen(spouse of 9/11 decedent Eric Allen), Kathleen Allen(child of 9/11 decedent Eric Allen), Dennis Eulau(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michele Coyle-Eulau), Eric Eulau(child of 9/11 decedent Michele Coyle-Eulau), Mark Eulau(child of 9/11 decedent Michele Coyle-Eulau), Matthew Eulau(child of 9/11 decedent Michele Coyle-Eulau), Carolynn Iskyan(child of 9/11 decedent John Iskyan), Margaret Iskyan(spouse of 9/11 decedent John Iskyan), Peter Iskyan(child of 9/11 decedent John Iskyan), Christopher Mascali(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph Mascali), Jennifer Mascali(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph Mascali), Katelyn Mascali(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph Mascali), Lori Mascali(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph Mascali), Corbin Mayo(child of 9/11 decedent Robert Mayo), Meryl Mayo(spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert Mayo), Lauren Murphy Lewis, Merrilly E. Noeth(parent of 9/11 decedent Michael Noeth), Diane Ryan(spouse of 9/11 decedent Edward Ryan), Edward Ryan(child of 9/11 decedent Edward Ryan), Joseph Ryan, Kelly Ryan(child of 9/11 decedent Edward Ryan), Megan Ryan(child of 9/11 decedent Edward Ryan), Andrija Tomasevic(parent of 9/11 decedent Vladimir Tomasevic), Radmila Tomasevic(parent of 9/11 decedent Vladimir Tomasevic), Jelena Watkins(sibling of 9/11 decedent Vladimir Tomasevic)..(Kreindler, James)
October 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1756 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Evelyn Aron(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jack C. Aron), Timothy Aron(child of 9/11 decedent Jack C. Aron), Joanne Barbara(spouse of 9/11 decedent Gerard Barbara), Susan E Buhse Whelan, Sloan Buhse(child of 9/11 decedent Patrick Buhse), William F. Buhse(child of 9/11 decedent Patrick Buhse), Tara Feinberg Edgette, Michael Feinberg(child of 9/11 decedent Alan Feinberg), Wendy S. Feinberg(spouse of 9/11 decedent Alan Feinberg), Angela Gitto(spouse of 9/11 decedent Salvatore Gitto), Gregory Gitto(child of 9/11 decedent Salvatore Gitto), Stephen Gitto(child of 9/11 decedent Salvatore Gitto), Caitlin McGinnis(child of 9/11 decedent Thomas H. McGinnis), Iliana Mcginnis-Guibert, Cynthia F. McGinty(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael McGinty), Daniel McGinty(child of 9/11 decedent Michael McGinty), David McGinty(child of 9/11 decedent Michael McGinty), Charles Noonan(child of 9/11 decedent Robert W. Noonan), Dana Noonan McGowan, Melissa Pescatore, Jill Rosenblum(spouse of 9/11 decedent Andrew I. Rosenblum), Jordan Rosenblum(child of 9/11 decedent Andrew I. Rosenblum), Kyle Rosenblum(child of 9/11 decedent Andrew I. Rosenblum), Jaime Shulman(child of 9/11 decedent Mark Shulman), Lori Shulman(spouse of 9/11 decedent Mark Shulman)..(Kreindler, James)
October 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1755 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Ethan Baron (child of 9/11 decedent Evan J. Baron), Jeannine P. Baron(spouse of 9/11 decedent Evan J. Baron), Julia Baron(child of 9/11 decedent Evan J. Baron), Israel J. Biegeleisen(child of 9/11 decedent Shimmy D. Biegeleisen), Miriam Biegeleisen(spouse of 9/11 decedent Shimmy D. Biegeleisen), Mordechai Biegeleisen(child of 9/11 decedent Shimmy D. Biegeleisen), Moshe J. Biegeleisen(child of 9/11 decedent Shimmy D. Biegeleisen), Ursula Broghammer(spouse of 9/11 decedent Herman C. Broghammer), Alexandria Catalano(grandchild of 9/11 decedent Harry Taback), Anamarie Catarelli(child of 9/11 decedent Richard G. Catarelli), Santa Catarelli(spouse of 9/11 decedent Richard G. Catarelli), Adina Gewirezman(child of 9/11 decedent Shimmy D. Biegeleisen), John J. Gill, Jr, Aleesia C. Gillis(child of 9/11 decedent Rodney C. Gillis), Rodney C. Gillis, II(child of 9/11 decedent Rodney C. Gillis), Jonique C. Gillis(child of 9/11 decedent Rodney C. Gillis), Elyse R. Harrell(child of 9/11 decedent Harvey L. Harrell), Marissa R. Harrell(child of 9/11 decedent Harvey L. Harrell), Rachel R. Harrell(spouse of 9/11 decedent Harvey L. Harrell), Kelly Hayes(spouse of 9/11 decedent Scott J. O'Brien), Joann T. Howard(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph L. Howard), Janice Howard-Battaglia(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph L. Howard), Francine Raggio(spouse of 9/11 decedent Eugene J. Raggio), Dvora Rotberg(child of 9/11 decedent Shimmy D. Biegeleisen), Amy B. Stabile(child of 9/11 decedent Herman C. Broghammer)..(Kreindler, James)
October 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1754 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Benjamin Blanding(child of 9/11 decedent Harry A. Blanding, Jr.), Deborah Blanding(spouse of 9/11 decedent Harry A. Blanding, Jr.), Hayley Blanding(child of 9/11 decedent Harry A. Blanding, Jr.), Jeremy Blanding(child of 9/11 decedent Harry A. Blanding, Jr.), Louis Francisco Cortes-Lauterbach(child of 9/11 decedent Carlos Cortes-Rodriguez), Ricardo Cortes-Rodriguez(sibling of 9/11 decedent Carlos Cortes-Rodriguez), Alicia Cortes-Rodriguez(sibling of 9/11 decedent Carlos Cortes-Rodriguez), Julio Cortes-Rodriguez(sibling of 9/11 decedent Carlos Cortes-Rodriguez), Maria Claudia Cortes-Rodriguez, Maria Elvira Cortes-Rodriguez(sibling of 9/11 decedent Carlos Cortes-Rodriguez), Martha Helena Cortes-Rodriguez, Mercedes Cortes-Rodriguez(sibling of 9/11 decedent Carlos Cortes-Rodriguez), Laurie S. Lauterbach(spouse of 9/11 decedent Carlos Cortes-Rodriguez), Erin O'connor(child of 9/11 decedent Richard J. O'Connor), Lauren O'connor(child of 9/11 decedent Richard J. O'Connor), Lynne O'connor(spouse of 9/11 decedent Richard J. O'Connor), Matthew O'Connor(child of 9/11 decedent Richard J. O'Connor), Donna Paolillo(spouse of 9/11 decedent John Paolillo), Ella Paolillo(child of 9/11 decedent John Paolillo), Jake Paolillo(child of 9/11 decedent John Paolillo), Nancy Raeside Shea, Peter Raeside Shea, Catherine Ellen Shea, Daniel F. Shea, Patrick J. Shea(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph P. Shea)..(Kreindler, James)
October 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1753 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by David L. Albert(child of 9/11 decedent Jon L Albert), Donna L. Albert(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jon L Albert), Stephen L. Albert(child of 9/11 decedent Jon L Albert), Christine Baione(child of 9/11 decedent Louis J. Modafferi), Nicole DeAngelis(child of 9/11 decedent Thomas P. Deangelis), Patricia J. Deangelis(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas P. Deangelis), Dori E. Freund(child of 9/11 decedent Peter L. Freund), Julie A. Freund(child of 9/11 decedent Peter L. Freund), Peter C. Freund(child of 9/11 decedent Peter L. Freund), Robin A. Freund, Joanne Modafferi(spouse of 9/11 decedent Louis J. Modafferi), Joseph Modafferi(child of 9/11 decedent Louis J. Modafferi), Michael Modafferi(child of 9/11 decedent Louis J. Modafferi), Anna Mojica(spouse of 9/11 decedent Manuel Mojica, Jr.), Letty Mojica(sibling of 9/11 decedent Manuel Mojica, Jr.), Manny Mojica(child of 9/11 decedent Manuel Mojica, Jr.), Stephanie Mojica(child of 9/11 decedent Manuel Mojica, Jr.), Amanda R. O'Connor(child of 9/11 decedent Diana J. O'Connor), William O'Connor, Anne Wodenshek(spouse of 9/11 decedent Christopher Wodenshek), Haley Wodenshek(child of 9/11 decedent Christopher Wodenshek), Mollie Wodenshek(child of 9/11 decedent Christopher Wodenshek), Sarah Wodenshek(child of 9/11 decedent Christopher Wodenshek), William Wodenshek(child of 9/11 decedent Christopher Wodenshek), Zachary Wodenshek..(Kreindler, James)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1752 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Alexander Ashton Berry(child of 9/11 decedent David S. Berry), Nile Philip Berry(child of 9/11 decedent David S. Berry), Paula Berry(spouse of 9/11 decedent David S. Berry), Reed Nicholas Berry(child of 9/11 decedent David S. Berry), Susan Calcagno(spouse of 9/11 decedent Philip Calcagno), Christian Espinoza(child of 9/11 decedent Fanny Espinoza), Luis Espinoza(spouse of 9/11 decedent Fanny Espinoza), Stephanie Espinoza(child of 9/11 decedent Fanny Espinoza), Candy Glazer(spouse of 9/11 decedent Edmund Glazer), Nathan Glazer(child of 9/11 decedent Edmund Glazer), Eva Mallery Gurian(child of 9/11 decedent Douglas B. Gurian), Susan Mallery Gurian(spouse of 9/11 decedent Douglas B. Gurian), Tyler Douglas Gurian(child of 9/11 decedent Douglas B. Gurian), Daniel Henry Kates(child of 9/11 decedent Andrew Kates), Hannah Kates(child of 9/11 decedent Andrew Kates), Lucy Kates(child of 9/11 decedent Andrew Kates), Libby Kristen Palazzo, Kaitlin Elizabeth Palazzo(child of 9/11 decedent Thomas A. Palazzo), Keri Ann Palazzo(child of 9/11 decedent Thomas A. Palazzo), Lisa Palazzo(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas A. Palazzo), Emily Terry(spouse of 9/11 decedent Andrew Kates), Patricia Wik Farese(child of 9/11 decedent William J. Wik), Daniel Wik(child of 9/11 decedent William J. Wik), Kathleen Wik(spouse of 9/11 decedent William J. Wik), Kathleen Wik(child of 9/11 decedent William J. Wik)..(Kreindler, James)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1751 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Anne Angelini(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph J. Angelini, Sr.), Justin Apostol(child of 9/11 decedent Faustino Apostol, Jr.), Kathleen Apostol(spouse of 9/11 decedent Faustino Apostol, Jr.), Caroline Kelly(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph A. Kelly), Catherine Kelly(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph A. Kelly), Christopher Kelly(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph A. Kelly), Susan Kelly(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph A. Kelly), Thomas Kelly, Timothy Kelly, David Dwight Nelson(child of 9/11 decedent Kerene Gordon), Delroy Nelson(child of 9/11 decedent Kerene Gordon), Andrea O'Hagan(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas G. O'Hagan), Patrick O'Hagan(child of 9/11 decedent Thomas G. O'Hagan), Pierce O'Hagan(child of 9/11 decedent Thomas G. O'Hagan), Christopher Ake Olson(child of 9/11 decedent Maureen L. Olson), John Eric Olson(spouse of 9/11 decedent Maureen L. Olson), Maeve Elizabeth Olson(child of 9/11 decedent Maureen L. Olson), Sara Tumulty(child of 9/11 decedent Lance Tumulty), Cynthia Tumulty-Ollerman(spouse of 9/11 decedent Lance Tumulty), Cynthia Tumulty-Ollerman(parent and legal guardian on behalf of C.T. minor child of 9/11 decedent Lance Tumulty ), Darren Williams, Payton Williams(child of 9/11 decedent Debbie L. Williams), Dorota Zois(spouse of 9/11 decedent Prokopios Zois), Theofanis Zois(child of 9/11 decedent Prokopios Zois), Stefania Zois-Geol(child of 9/11 decedent Prokopios Zois)..(Kreindler, James)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1750 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Cristina Alger Wang, Josephine Alger(spouse of 9/11 decedent David D. Alger), Mary Anderson(sibling of 9/11 decedent Joseph J. Coppo, Jr.), Lisa Dilallo Clark (spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas R. Clark), Matthew J. Clark, Whitney Clark, Joseph Coppo, III, John Coppo(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph J. Coppo, Jr.), Matthew Coppo, Patricia Coppo(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph J. Coppo, Jr.), Samantha Dolan(child of 9/11 decedent Brendan Dolan), Sarah Dolan(child of 9/11 decedent Brendan Dolan), Stacey Dolan(spouse of 9/11 decedent Brendan Dolan), Danielle Ganci Cowan(child of 9/11 decedent Peter J. Ganci), Peter J. Ganci, III, Kathleen Ganci, Craig Harris(child of 9/11 decedent Stewart D. Harris), Elissa Harris(child of 9/11 decedent Stewart D. Harris), Sheila Harris(spouse of 9/11 decedent Stewart D. Harris), Joseph Holland, IV, Kathleen Holland(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph Holland, III), Kathryn J. Hussa(spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert R. Hussa), Robert Hussa(child of 9/11 decedent Robert R. Hussa), Thomas Hussa(child of 9/11 decedent Robert R. Hussa), Kathleen N. Zapata(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph J. Coppo, Jr.)..(Kreindler, James)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1749 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Brendan Carroll(child of 9/11 decedent Michael T. Carroll), Nancy Carroll(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael T. Carroll), Olivia Carroll(child of 9/11 decedent Michael T. Carroll), Mary Jo Grillo, Matthew Grillo, Timothy Grillo(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph Grillo), Digna Hernandez, Christina Hughes(child of 9/11 decedent Timothy Hughes), Karen Hughes(spouse of 9/11 decedent Timothy Hughes), Kenneth Hughes(child of 9/11 decedent Timothy Hughes), Timothy Hughes(child of 9/11 decedent Timothy Hughes), Christopher Jakubiak(child of 9/11 decedent Maria Jakubiak), Joanna Jakubiak(child of 9/11 decedent Maria Jakubiak), Kazimierz Jakubiak(spouse of 9/11 decedent Maria Jakubiak), Pawel Jakubiak(child of 9/11 decedent Maria Jakubiak), Debra McSweeney(spouse of 9/11 decedent Timothy Patrick McSweeney), Dennis T. McSweeney(spouse of 9/11 decedent Timothy Patrick McSweeney), Katherine McSweeney(stepparent of 9/11 decedent Timothy Patrick McSweeney), Margaret M. McSweeney, Debra McSweeney(child of 9/11 decedent Timothy Patrick McSweeney), Matthew A Reda, Nicholas G Reda, Nicole Reda(spouse of 9/11 decedent Gregory Reda), James Vider Rivers(child of 9/11 decedent David E. Rivers), Ricky Vider(spouse of 9/11 decedent David E. Rivers)..(Kreindler, James)
October 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1748 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by John Badagliacca(Child of 9/11 decedent John Badagliacca), Nancy Badagliacca(Spouse of 9/11 decedent John Badagliacca), Nikki Badagliacca(Child of 9/11 decedent John Badagliacca), Christine Bini(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Carl Bini), Kris Blood(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Richard M. Blood, Jr.), Madeline Blood, Michael Blood, Christopher Cannizzaro(Child of 9/11 decedent Brian Cannizzaro), Jackie Cannizzaro(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Brian Cannizzaro), Sharon Cobb-Glenn(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Harry Glenn), Desiree Didonna(Child of 9/11 decedent Carl Bini), Joseph DiPilato (Child of 9/11 decedent Joseph DiPilato), Maria DiPilato(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph DiPilato), Daniel Friedman(Child of 9/11 decedent Andrew Friedman), Mike Friedman(Child of 9/11 decedent Andrew Friedman), Lisa Friedman-Clark(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Andrew Friedman), Lynnette Giannelli (Child of 9/11 decedent Anthony Rodriguez), Jalen L Glenn, Pamela Hohlweck, Saradha Moorthy(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Krishna Moorthy), Stefanie Parish(Child of 9/11 decedent Carl Bini), Derek Rodriguez(Child of 9/11 decedent Anthony Rodriguez), Evelyn Rodriguez(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Anthony Rodriguez), Lauren Rodriguez(Child of 9/11 decedent Anthony Rodriguez), Morgan Rodriguez..(Kreindler, James)
October 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1747 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by John Bergin, Katie Bergin(Child of 9/11 decedent John Bergin), Madeline Bergin(Spouse of 9/11 decedent John Bergin), Shannon Bergin(Child of 9/11 decedent John Bergin), Dorothy A. Bogdan(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Nicholas Bogdan), Emily Bogdan, Nicholas Bogdan(Child of 9/11 decedent Nicholas Bogdan), Jessica Fiore Lacasse(Child of 9/11 decedent Michael Fiore), Cristen Fiore Staiano(Child of 9/11 decedent Michael Fiore), Charlene Fiore(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael Fiore), Michael Fiore(Child of 9/11 decedent Michael Fiore), Cameron Kellett(Child of 9/11 decedent Joseph P. Kellett), Julie Anne Kellett, Patricia Kellett(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph P. Kellett), Natalie Makshanov(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Jason M. Sekzer), Lisa Palazzo(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Jeffery M. Palazzo), Nicole Palazzo(Child of 9/11 decedent Jeffery M. Palazzo), Samantha Palazzo(Child of 9/11 decedent Jeffery M. Palazzo), Alec Russin(Child of 9/11 decedent Steven Russin), Andrea Russin(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Steven Russin), Ariella Russin, Olivia Russin, Melissa Tarasiewicz(Child of 9/11 decedent Allan Tarasiewicz), Patricia Tarasiewicz(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Allan Tarasiewicz), Rambascia Thackurdeen(Parent of 9/11 decedent Goumatie Thackurdeen)..(Kreindler, James)
October 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1746 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Deborah Calderon(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Edward Calderon), Jeremy Calderon(Child of 9/11 decedent Edward Calderon), James Della Bella(Stepchild of 9/11 decedent Andrea Della Bella), James Della Bella(Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Della Bella, deceased spouse of 9/11 decedent Andrea Della Bella), Andy Dinnoo(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Reno Dinnoo), Charles Greene, Claudette B Greene(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Donald Greene), Jody Greene(Child of 9/11 decedent Donald Greene), Kevin T. Haag(Child of 9/11 decedent Gary Haag), Mary Haag(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Gary Hagg), Michael P. Haag(Child of 9/11 decedent Gary Haag), Molly M. Haag(Child of 9/11 decedent Gary Haag), Jameer Hinds(Child of 9/11 decedent Neil Hinds), Karen Hinds(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Neil Hinds), Jennifer Jacobs(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Ariel L. Jacobs), Gabriel Jacobs, Roberta J. Levine(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert M. Levine), Edward Oliver(Child of 9/11 decedent Edward K. Oliver), Emily Oliver(Child of 9/11 decedent Edward K. Oliver), Sheryl Jane Oliver, Aneesa Rasool(Child of 9/11 decedent Amenia Rasool), Aseefa Rasool(Child of 9/11 decedent Amenia Rasool), Farhaad N. Rasool(Child of 9/11 decedent Amenia Rasool), Sadiq Rasool(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Amenia Rasool), Saeed N. Rasool(Child of 9/11 decedent Amenia Rasool)..(Kreindler, James)
October 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1745 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 6537 in 03-MDL-1570).. Document filed by Ashley Amato, Lorraine H Gardella, Lorraine A. Gardella, Aaron Gill, Joshua Gill, Susan Kraljic, Joseph Lipari, Michael Lipari, Christopher Prunty, Alex Ryjov, Daniel Ryjov, Aaron Sand, John Paul Sarle, Leeann Sarle, Norma A. Sarle, Paul J Sarle, Christopher Snyder, Priscilla Stumm, Elizabeth Tatsumo, Elizabeth Chloe Wohlforth..(Kreindler, James)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1744 REPORT & RECOMMENDATION re: (8494 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 94 in 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Solatium Damages against Islamic Republic of Iran filed by Jamie K. Hawkins. The Court recommends finding that service was achieved on Iran and that Ms. Hawkins be granted solatium damages as follows in Table 2: (See document.) The Court further recommends that Ms. Hawkins be awarded prejudgment interest on these damages from September 11, 2001, to the date of judgment, at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually. ECF No. 3358, adopted at ECF No. 3383. Plaintiffs in Chairnoff, No. 18-cv-12370, may apply for punitive, economic, and other damages at a later date and in a manner consistent with any applicable future Court rulings on the issue. Additionally, plaintiffs in this case not appearing in these motions who were not previously awarded damages may still submit applications for damages awards in later stages. Upon resolution of these motions, the Court may terminate the motion at ECF No. 8494, and the related motion in Chairnoff, et al. v. Islamic Republic of Iran, No. 18-cv-12370, at ECF No. 94. The parties shall have fourteen days from the service of this Report and Recommendation to file written objections under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). These objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court, with courtesy copies delivered to the chambers of the Honorable George B. Daniels at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, and to any opposing parties. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b). Any requests for an extension of time for filing objections must be addressed to Judge Daniels. The failure to file these timely objections will result in a waiver of those objections for purposes of appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b); Thomas v. Arn, 474 U.S. 140 (1985). (Objections to R&R due by 10/11/2022.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/27/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN. (ras)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1743 AMENDED REPORT & RECOMMENDATION: The Court's Report and Recommendation on Sudan's motion to dismiss at ECF No. 7942 is modified according to the terms of this Amended Report and Recommendation. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 8090. Absent further order of the Court, any objections to the Sudan Report and Recommendation and Amended Report and Recommendation shall be filed with Judge Daniels within 14 days. 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b). (Objections to R&R due by 10/7/2022). Motions terminated: (8090 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (7942) Report and Recommendation Motion for Partial Reconsideration filed by Consolidated Amended Complaint Plaintiffs. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/23/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (mml)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1742 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Frank H. Granitto, III dated September 22, 2022 re: Expert Reports to Motion (ECF 8363), Declaration (ECF 8364), Proposed Judgment (ECF 8366). Document filed by Maureen Dominguez, Maureen Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit expert report, #2 Exhibit expert report, #3 Exhibit expert report, #4 Exhibit expert report, #5 Exhibit expert report, #6 Exhibit expert report, #7 Exhibit expert report, #8 Exhibit expert report, #9 Exhibit expert report, #10 Exhibit expert report, #11 Exhibit expert report, #12 Exhibit expert report, #13 Exhibit expert report, #14 Exhibit expert report, #15 Exhibit expert report, #16 Exhibit expert report, #17 Exhibit expert report, #18 Exhibit expert report, #19 Exhibit expert report)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SNMotion or Order to File Under Seal: 7963 .(Granito, Frank)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1741 ORDER: Plaintiffs in Ashton, et al. v. al Qaeda Islamic Army, et al., No. 02-cv-6977, and member case Burlingame, et al. v. Bin Laden, et al., No. 02-cv-7230, move for default judgment against the Taliban. ECF No. 8363. In support, they have filed a set of expert reports under seal and by disc. ECF No. 8364-3. The Court has directed that all expert reports submitted in support of a default judgment shall be filed on ECF. These materials may be sealed, with access restricted to the Court and any applicable parties. ECF No. 7963. The plaintiffs shall therefore file their experts reports on ECF in accordance with that Order at their earliest convenience. For avoidance of doubt, the Court's order at ECF No. 7963 applies to all motions for default judgment regardless of the defendant and supersedes the Court's prior order on filing expert reports at ECF No. 7067. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/19/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN. (ras)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1740 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Katherine Amato, Sean Amato, Tara Amato, Andrew Esposito, Michael Esposito, Alexandra Fallone, Anthony Fallone, III, Katherine Fallone, Patrick Fallone, Jeanne Kennedy, Emily LaMantia, Stephen LaMantia, Hafeezah Legree, Christopher Maggitti, Christopher Monahan, Terrence Monahan, Alexandra Morell, Lisa Prunty Aram, Christine Reilly, Thomas Reilly, William Reilly(Sibling of 9/11 decedent James B. Reilly), Lauren Salbeck, Kevin Torres, Nicholas Torres, Melissa Van Ness Fatha(Spouse of 9/11 decedent Syed Abdul Fatha)..(Kreindler, James)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1739 ORDER: The Court has begun its review of motions for default judgments against the Taliban. Several of these motions request a default judgment against not only the Taliban, but against Muhammad Omar, its founder and former leader. See ECF Nos. 8274, 8335, 8363, 8386. The Taliban remains active, but by all available accounts Muhammad Omar has been dead since at least 2015 and likely died sometime in 2013. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1) provides that "[i]f a party dies and the claim is not extinguished, the court may order substitution of the proper party." If a suitable motion substituting the proper party is not brought within 90 days after service of a statement noting death, "the action by or against the decedent must be dismissed." Id. Given Omar's apparent death, the Plaintiffs' Executive Committees are ordered to submit a letter stating (1) if there is any reason that Omar's death should not be noted on the record pursuant to Rule 25(a)(2); (2) when the relevant plaintiffs will file motions substituting the proper party for Omar; or (3) indicating if dismissal of claims related to Omar is appropriate given his apparent death. This letter shall be filed by September 16, 2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/9/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD. (ras)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1738 ORDER granting (8491) Motion to Substitute Party in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (1735) Motion to Substitute Party in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; granting (182) Motion to Substitute Party in case 1:02-cv-07236-GBD; granting (240) Motion to Substitute Party in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN. Dorothy Bauer, Karen A. Mee, Donald Schlag, John York, Heidi Bauer-Pollard, Thomas Mee, Patricia A. Schlag, and Dolores York are substituted as provided for in the document at ECF No. 8491-1. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN. (ras)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (8497 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 97 in 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(km)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1737 ORDER granting (8488) Motion to Amend/Correct (8488 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1732 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 179 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibit. in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (1732) Motion to Amend/Correct (8488 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1732 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 179 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibit. in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; granting (179) Motion to Amend/Correct (8488 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1732 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 179 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibit. in case 1:02-cv-07236-GBD. The Plaintiffs' motion to correct exhibits is granted. Their proposed default judgment and supporting declaration exhibits for the motion for default judgment at ECF No. 8298 are substituted as provided in Table 1, as further set forth. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 8488, and the related motions in Ashton, No. 02-cv-6977, ECF No. 1732, and Bauer, No. 02-cv- 7236, ECF No. 179. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/2/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD (mml)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1736 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. Related Document Number: 8491 ..(Capone, Dorothea) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1735 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: as set forth in Exhibit A, New Party: as set forth in Exhibit A . Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN.(Capone, Dorothea)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (181 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 1734 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 8490 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD. (tp)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (8492 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1736 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 183 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 241 in 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN. (tp)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1734 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Michael Giordano, Michael Giordano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B).(Capone, Dorothea) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1733 DECLARATION of Dorothea M. Capone in Support re: (8488 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1732 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 179 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibit.. Document filed by Michael Giordano, Michael Giordano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1732 MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibit. Document filed by Michael Giordano, Michael Giordano.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (8485 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 93 in 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN(km)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1731 ORDER: Plaintiffs in Burlingame v. Bin Laden, et al., No. 02-cv-7230 (the "Burlingame Plaintiffs"), request several actions in connection with the process for briefing default judgment motions brought against the Taliban. ECF Nos. 8187, 8205. The Burlingame Plaintiffs request that the Court (1) permit them to submit "adversary" briefing on other plaintiffs' default judgment motions against the Taliban; (2) modify its case management orders on the format for default judgments against the Taliban; (3) issue an order determining the permissibility of certain default actions against the Taliban; and (4) grant them leave to file a Rule 60(b) motion challenging a judgment obtained by the plaintiffs in member case Havlish v. Bin Laden, et al., No. 03-cv-9848, ECF No. 317 (the "Havlish Judgment"), which was secured almost a decade ago. These requests are denied. The Burlingame Plaintiffs lack standing to challenge other plaintiffs' default judgments through "adversary" briefing. They propose to challenge other plaintiffs' motions on the grounds that these claims against the Taliban are untimely and that these plaintiffs are not properly heirs of September 11 victims who may recover for their loss. ECF No. 8205 at 12. A "plaintiff generally must assert his own legal rights and interests, and cannot rest his claim to relief on the legal rights or interests of third parties." Sec'y of State of Md. v. Joseph H. Munson Co., 467 U.S. 947, 955 (1984) (quoting Warth v. Seldin, 422 U.S. 490, 499 (1975)) (internal quotation omitted). This limit on third party standing is, admittedly, prudential. Id. at 956. There are "exceptions [that] permit third-party standing where the plaintiff can demonstrate (1) a close relationship to the injured party and (2) a barrier to the injured party's ability to assert its own interests." W.R. Huff Asset Mgmt. Co., LLC v. Deloitte & Touche LLP, 549 F.3d 100, 109 (2d Cir. 2008). The Burlingame Plaintiffs do not have a "close relationship" with the Taliban. They are Taliban victims with their own claims against the group. They seek to assert the Taliban's defenses against other terror victims in order to improve their own prospects of recovery. ECF No. 8187 at 1 ("With the Taliban in default, some 'adversary' party needs to advise the Court when certain plaintiffs, lacking standing and timely claims, seek money from a 'limited fund,' or those invalid claims will take money from court-authorized plaintiffs with timely, long-standing claims.") This purely adversarial relationship cannot support third-party standing. Turning to the Burlingame Plaintiffs' other requests, the Court does not see any need to modify its case management order at ECF No. 8198 at this time. Additionally, an order preemptively determining the standing and timeliness of all potential claims against the Taliban is not appropriate. The Court doubts that a single order could comprehensively or fairly address the full array of potential claims and claimants who might seek defaults. Finally, leave to file a Rule 60(b) motion is inappropriate as all deadlines for such a motion have passed. The Havlish Judgment the Burlingame Plaintiffs propose to challenge was entered nearly a decade ago. ECF No. 2624. Rule 60(c)(1) provides that motions under Rule 60(b) must be made within a reasonable time--and for reasons [of mistake, surprise new evidence, or fraud] no more than a year after the entry of the judgment or order or the date of the proceeding." "The one-year limitation period for Rule 60(b) motions is absolute and has clearly elapsed. Martha Graham Sch. & Dance Found., Inc. v. Martha Graham Ctr. of Contemp. Dance, Inc., 466 F.3d 97, 100 (2d Cir. 2006) (internal quotations and citations omitted).Any motion would not be brought in a "reasonable time" either. Reasonable time "is to be determined based on 'the particular circumstances of the case,' taking into account the reason for any delay, the possible prejudice to the non-moving party, and the interests of finality." Thai-Lao Lignite Co. v. Gov't of Lao People's Democratic Republic, 864 F.3d 172, 182 (2d Cir. 2017) (quoting PRC Harris, Inc. v. Boeing Co., 700 F.2d 894, 897 (2d Cir. 1983)). The Court of Appeals has consistently found that delays extending beyond two years are not reasonable. See, e.g., Truskoski v. ESPN, Inc., 60 F.3d 74, 77 (2d Cir. 1995) (eighteen-month delay was not reasonable); Rodriguez v. Mitchell, 252 F.3d 191, 201 (2d Cir. 2001) ("We do not think that three and one-half years from the date judgment was entered is a reasonable time."); Wang, 839 F. App'x at 646 (a five-year delay was unreasonable). District courts have similarly found that Rule 60(b) motions are untimely after more than twenty-four months. See Sec. & Exch. Comm'n v. Bronson, No. 12-cv-6421 (KMK), 2022 WL 1287937, at *10 (S.D.N.Y. Apr. 29, 2022) (collecting eight cases in which delays beyond 24 months were untimely). The Court does not see any compelling reason for this delay. The Burlingame Plaintiffs noted their disapproval of the award made under the Havlish Judgment at least as early as December 16, 2019. ECF No. 5367 at 8 n.3. Despite noting their disapproval, they did not seek leave to make a Rule 60(b) motion until April 20, 2022, Havlish, No. 03-cv-9848, ECF No. 615, 28 months later. Even this more favorably construed timeline puts them beyond the time range courts in this District generally consider reasonable. In the absence of any evidence that the Burlingame Plaintiffs can satisfy the timeliness requirements of Rule 60(c)(1), the Court declines to grant them leave to file a Rule 60(b) motion. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/24/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN. (ras)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1730 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Lee Wolosky dated August 23, 2022 re: Ashton Plaintiffs Letter of August 22, 2022 (Dkt. 8423). Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:01-cv-10132-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN.(Wolosky, Lee)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED a copy of the Notice of Default Judgment, Default Judgment on Liability deemed filed August 31, 2015, Final Order of Judgment on Behalf of Ashton 21 Plaintiffs, including the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion deemed filed on October 5, 2021, Final Order of Judgment on Behalf of Ashton 22 Plaintiffs, including the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion deemed filed on October 5, 2021, Final Order of Judgment on Behalf of Ashton 23 Plaintiffs, including the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion deemed filed on October 5, 2021, Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act & Affidavit of Translator (along with translations of the above documents in Farsi) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran, C/O Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square, Tehran, Iran on 12/29/2021 by Federal Express tracking # 8157 2471 5908, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Jared Hess, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20522, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN on 12/29/2021 by Federal Express as per #1580 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. RECEIVED ON: 6/29/2022.(amf)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1729 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Megan Benett and Theresa Trzaskoma dated 8/22/2022 re: ECF No. 8399 and ECF No. 8419. Document filed by Ashton Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Benett, Megan)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (177 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 1727 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 240 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 8415 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 87 in 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD. (tp)
August 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1728 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Lee Wolosky dated August 21, 2022 re: Ashton Plaintiffs Motion for Attachment (Dkt. 8412). Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:01-cv-10132-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN.(Wolosky, Lee)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1727 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Ashton Plaintiffs. Related Document Number: [ECF No. 8412]..(Maloney, Andrew) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1726 DECLARATION of Andrew J. Maloney, III in Support re: (84 in 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN, 1724 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 8412 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 174 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 237 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) EMERGENCY MOTION for Attachment of Defendant's assets in this District held in the name of Da Afghanistan Bank / Notice of Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Order of Attachment .. Document filed by Ashton Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Maloney, Andrew)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1725 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (84 in 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN, 1724 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 8412 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 174 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 237 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) EMERGENCY MOTION for Attachment of Defendant's assets in this District held in the name of Da Afghanistan Bank / Notice of Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Order of Attachment . . Document filed by Ashton Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Maloney, Andrew)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1724 EMERGENCY MOTION for Attachment of Defendant's assets in this District held in the name of Da Afghanistan Bank / Notice of Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Order of Attachment . Document filed by Ashton Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Maloney, Andrew)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1723 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Irene Dickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Plaintiffs & Proposed Awards In Default Judgment Against the Taliban and Omar Muhammad).(Schutty, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 8/17/2022 (km).
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1722 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1720 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) AMENDED MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Omar Defendants. . Document filed by Irene Dickey. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Schutty, John)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1721 DECLARATION of John F. Schutty, Esq. in Support re: (1720 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) AMENDED MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Omar Defendants.. Document filed by Irene Dickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. of Irene Dickey for Default Judgment Against TALIBAN, #2 Exhibit Decl. of Jacqueline Eaton for Default Judgment Against TALIBAN, #3 Exhibit Decl. of Joanne Kelly for Default Judgment Against TALIBAN, #4 Exhibit Decl. of Lisa O'Brien for Default Judgment Against TALIBAN, #5 Exhibit Decl. of Dara Seaman for Default Judgment Against TALIBAN, #6 Exhibit Decl. of Susan Sliwak for Default Judgment Against TALIBAN, #7 Exhibit Decl. of Allison Wallice for Default Judgment Against TALIBAN, #8 Exhibit Decl. of Eileen Lynch for Default Judgment Against TALIBAN, #9 Exhibit Court Orders Appointing Personal Representatives of the 8 Decedent Estates, #10 Exhibit List of Plaintiffs & Proposed Awards In Default Judgment Against the Taliban and Omar Muhammad)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Schutty, John)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1720 AMENDED MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Omar Defendants. Document filed by Irene Dickey.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Schutty, John)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1719 ORDER granting (8376) Motion to Amend/Correct (8376 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1716 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 170 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibits in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (1716) Motion to Amend/Correct (8376 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1716 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 170 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibits in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; granting (170) Motion to Amend/Correct (8376 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1716 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 170 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibits in case 1:02-cv-07236-GBDThis document relates to: Ashton, et al., v. Islamic Republic of Iran, No. 02-cv-6977, Bauer, et al., v. Islamic Republic of Iran., No. 02-cv-7236, The Plaintiffs motion to correct exhibits is granted. Their proposed default judgment and supporting declaration exhibits for the motion for default judgment at ECF No. 8298 are substituted as provided in Table 1, as set forth below. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 8376, and the related motions in Ashton, No. 02-cv-6977, ECF No. 1716, and Bauer, No. 02-cv- 7236, ECF No. 170. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/17/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD. (mml)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Notice to attorney John Schutty to RE-FILE Document No. (8391 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1723 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The title of the document should be a proposed default judgment (please remove the word Order from the title). Also, the section for pre-judgment interest, please add a blank line with in the amount of $_________, so that the calculations can be added into the judgment. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Default Judgment found under the event list Proposed Orders. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(km)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (8380 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 172 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 1718 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD(km)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1718 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C-1).(Capone, Dorothea) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1717 DECLARATION of Dorothea M. Capone in Support re: (8376 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 170 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 1716 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibits.. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1716 MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibits. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1715 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame..(Granito, Frank) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1714 DECLARATION of Frank H. Granito, III in Support re: (8363 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1713 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 234 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burlingame II Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar.. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B-1 through B-19, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1713 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burlingame II Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1712 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame..(Granito, Frank) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Notice to attorney Frank Granito to RE-FILE Document No. (8338 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 232 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1710 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the title of the document should be a proposed judgment, please remove the word Order from the title. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Judgment found under the event list Proposed Orders. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN(km)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (1712 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 233 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 8341 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN(km)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1711 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Megan Benett and Theresa Trzaskoma dated August 12, 2022 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Ashton Plaintiffs.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Trzaskoma, Theresa)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1710 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame..(Granito, Frank) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 8/15/2022 (km).
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1709 DECLARATION of Frank H. Granito, III in Support re: (1708 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 230 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 8335 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burlingame Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar.. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1708 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burlingame Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1707 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the true and certified Notice of Default Judgment and its certified Farsi translation, which conforms to the requirements of 22 C.F.R. 93.2 (Notice), a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 Default Judgment on Liability and its certified Farsi translation. See Attachment A to the Notice, a true and certified copy of the July 19, 2022 Order for Default Judgment on Liability on behalf of Betru Plaintiffs, including the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion, and the certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers. See Attachment B to the Notice, a true and certified copy of the July 21, 2022 Order on Partial Final Judgment on behalf of Betru Wrongful Death Plaintiffs, including the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion, and the certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers. See Attachment C to the Notice, a true and certified copy of the July 28, 2022 Memorandum Decision and Order of the Ashton 24 Wrongful Death Plaintiffs Motion for Final Judgments, including the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion, and the certified Farsi translations of the Report and Recommendation and Plaintiffs motion papers. See Attachment D to the Notice, a true and certified copy of the July 28, 2022 Memorandum Decision and Order of the Ashton/Personal Injury 2 Plaintiffs Motion for Final Judgments, including the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion, and the certified Farsi translations of the Report and Recommendation and Plaintiffs motion papers. See Attachment E to the Notice, a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities and the certified Farsi translation. See Attachment F to the Notice mailed to DEFENDANT Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Jared Hess, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20522 pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), on 08/12/2022 by Federal Express tracking # 7775 6272 9445. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN(amf) (Main Document 1707 replaced on 8/16/2022) (amf). Modified on 8/16/2022 (amf).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1706 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment and its certified Farsi translation, which conforms to the requirements of 22 C.F.R 93.2 (Notice), A True and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 default judgment on liability and the certified Farsi translation thereof. See Attachment A to the Notice, A True and certified copy of the July 19, 2022 Partial Final Order of Judgment and the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion, and the certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers. See Attachment B to the Notice, Copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act and the certified Farsi translation. See Attachment C to the Notice mailed to DEFENDANT Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Jared Hess, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20522 pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), on 08/08/2022 by Federal Express tracking # 7775 0659 6333.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(ehn)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1705 PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT (ANAYA/IRAN III): It is hereby; ORDERED that service of process in the above-captioned Marie Laure Anaya, et al. v. Islamic Republic of Iran, l: 18-cv-12341 (GBD) (SN) was effectuated upon the Islamic Republic of Iran in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1608(a); and it is ORDERED that, there being no just reason for delay, partial final judgment is entered against the Islamic Republic of Iran and in favor of Anaya/Iran Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A hereto, who each represent the estate of an individual who was killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that Anaya/Iran Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A hereto are awarded economic damages as set forth in Exhibit A hereto and as supported by the expert reports and analyses tendered in conjunction with the Declaration of Joseph Peter Drennan executed on July 28, 2022; and it is ORDERED that Anaya/Iran Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A hereto are each awarded prejudgment interest on the damages hereby awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of this judgment; and it is ORDERED that Anaya/Iran Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A hereto may submit applications for punitive or other damages at a later date consistent with any future rulings of this Court; and it is ORDERED that other Anaya/Iran Plaintiffs may submit in later stages applications for damages awards. Furthermore, the Court respectfully directs the Clerk of Court terminate the motion at ECF 8280 in 03-MDL-1570 (GBD)(SN) and ECF No. 114 in 18-cv-12341 (GBD)(SN). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/2/2022) (jca)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 1704 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. As per ECF-ERROR Email correspondence received on 8/2/2022 @ 4:08pm. (db)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (169 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 8300 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1703 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD(km)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1703 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2).(Capone, Dorothea) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1702 DECLARATION of Dorothea M. Capone in Support re: (167 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 8298 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1701 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Damages against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar.. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1701 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Damages against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1698 PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT: ORDERED that service of process was effectuated upon the Islamic Republic of Iran in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1608(a); and it is ORDERED that, there being no just reason for delay, partial final judgment is entered against the Islamic Republic of Iran and in favor of Anaya/Iran Plaintiffs Rosemary Puma, John Puma, and William J. Posa as personal representative of the Estate of Grace Posa, each of whom is ( or represents) a sibling of the late Debra Ann DiMartino who was killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001; and it is ORDERED that Anayal1ran Plaintiffs Rosemary Puma, John Puma, and William J. Posa as personal representative of the Estate of Grace Posa are each awarded solatium damages of $4,250,000 against the lslamic Republic of Iran as set forth in Exhibit A hereto; and it is ORDERED that Anaya/Iran Plaintiffs Rosemary Puma, John Puma, and William J. Posa as personal representative of the Estate of Grace Posa are each awarded prejudgment interest on the damages hereby awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 200 I until the date of this judgment; and it is ORDERED that Anaya/Iran Plaintiffs Rosemary Puma, John Puma, and William J. Posa as personal representative of the Estate of Grace Posa may submit applications for punitive or other damages at a later date consistent with any future rulings of this Court; and it is ORDERED that other Anaya/Iran Plaintiffs may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent they seek solatium such applications will be approved consistent with those approved herein. Furthermore, the Court respectfully directs the Clerk of Court to terminate the motion at ECF 8247 in 03-MDL-1570 (GBD)(SN) and ECF No. 108 in 18-cv-12341 (GBD)(SN). SO ORDERED., Motions terminated: (8247 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 108 in 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to solatium Damages against Islamic Republic of Iran filed by Rosemary Puma, William J. Posa, John Puma. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/28/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN (ama)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1697 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: granting (8191) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (1666) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN. Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments, (ECF No. 8191), is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgments for pain and suffering damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for punitive, economic, and/or other damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions in 03 MDL 1570, ECF No. 7987, and No. 02-cv-6977, ECF No. 1666. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/28/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN (ama)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1696 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: granting (8225) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (1673) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN. Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Judgments, (ECF No. 8225), is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that the Ashton Plaintiffs Timothy Frolich and John F. Jermyn are awarded judgments for pain and suffering damages in the amounts of $7,000,000 and $5,000,000, respectively; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing in this motion and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for punitive, economic, and/or other damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for these two Plaintiffs or in prior filings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions in 03-MDL-1570, (ECF No. 8225), and 02-cv-6977, (ECF No. 1673), Accordingly. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/28/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN (ama)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1695 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Andrew J. Maloney, III dated 07/28/2022 re: This Courts Report and Recommendations dated July 26, 2022. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Maloney, Andrew)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1694 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton..(Maloney, Andrew) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (8285 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 118 in 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN(km)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Notice to attorney Andrew Maloney to RE-FILE Document No. (8276 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1693 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Please remove the word Order from the title. It should be a proposed judgment. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Judgment found under the event list Proposed Orders. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(km)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (1694 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 8278 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(km)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1693 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton..(Maloney, Andrew) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 7/28/2022 (km).
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1692 DECLARATION of Andrew J. Maloney, III in Support re: (1691 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban.. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Decedent Citizens, #2 Exhibit A-2 Decedent Non-Citizens, #3 Exhibit B-1 Citizen Solatium, #4 Exhibit B-2 Non-Citizen Solatium, #5 Exhibit C Declaration, #6 Exhibit D Declaration)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Maloney, Andrew)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1691 MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Maloney, Andrew)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1700 ORDER terminating (612) Motion for Judgment; terminating (613) Motion for Judgment in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; terminating (7805) Motion for Judgment; terminating (7806) Motion for Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; terminating (616) Motion for Judgment in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; terminating (555) Motion for Judgment; terminating (556) Motion for Judgment in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; terminating (798) Motion for Judgment in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; terminating (619) Motion for Judgment; terminating (620) Motion for Judgment in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; terminating (710) Motion for Judgment in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; terminating (653) Motion for Judgment in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; terminating (440) Motion for Judgment; terminating (441) Motion for Judgment in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; terminating (562) Motion for Judgment; terminating (563) Motion for Judgment in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; terminating (400) Motion for Judgment; terminating (401) Motion for Judgment in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; terminating (687) Motion for Judgment in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; terminating (219) Motion for Judgment; terminating (220) Motion for Judgment in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; terminating (558) Motion for Judgment; terminating (559) Motion for Judgment in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; terminating (97) Motion for Judgment; terminating (98) Motion for Judgment in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; terminating (150) Motion for Judgment; terminating (151) Motion for Judgment in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; terminating (109) Motion for Judgment; terminating (110) Motion for Judgment in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; terminating (116) Motion for Judgment; terminating (117) Motion for Judgment in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; terminating (141) Motion for Judgment; terminating (142) Motion for Judgment in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; terminating (140) Motion for Judgment; terminating (141) Motion for Judgment in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; terminating (140) Motion for Judgment; terminating (141) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; terminating (116) Motion for Judgment; terminating (117) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; terminating (140) Motion for Judgment; terminating (141) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; terminating (227) Motion for Judgment; terminating (228) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; terminating (107) Motion for Judgment; terminating (108) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; terminating (134) Motion for Judgment; terminating (135) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; terminating (97) Motion for Judgment; terminating (98) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; terminating (116) Motion for Judgment; terminating (117) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; terminating (133) Motion for Judgment; terminating (134) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; terminating (103) Motion for Judgment; terminating (104) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; terminating (103) Motion for Judgment; terminating (104) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; terminating (101) Motion for Judgment; terminating (102) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; terminating (103) Motion for Judgment; terminating (104) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; terminating (81) Motion for Judgment; terminating (82) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; terminating (86) Motion for Judgment; terminating (87) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; terminating (98) Motion for Judgment; terminating (99) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; terminating (90) Motion for Judgment; terminating (91) Motion for Judgment in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; terminating (81) Motion for Judgment; terminating (82) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; terminating (71) Motion for Judgment; terminating (72) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; terminating (117) Motion for Judgment; terminating (118) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; terminating (67) Motion for Judgment; terminating (68) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; terminating (213) Motion for Judgment; terminating (214) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; terminating (195) Motion for Judgment; terminating (196) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; terminating (185) Motion for Judgment; terminating (186) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; terminating (165) Motion for Judgment; terminating (166) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; terminating (191) Motion for Judgment; terminating (192) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; terminating (88) Motion for Judgment; terminating (89) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; terminating (73) Motion for Judgment; terminating (74) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; terminating (55) Motion for Judgment; terminating (56) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; terminating (63) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; terminating (151) Motion for Judgment; terminating (152) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; terminating (52) Motion for Judgment; terminating (53) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; terminating (77) Motion for Judgment; terminating (78) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; terminating (46) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-10820-GBD-SN; terminating (42) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; terminating (45) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; terminating (42) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; terminating (47) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; terminating (43) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; terminating (47) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; terminating (44) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; terminating (44) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; terminating (42) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; terminating (43) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; terminating (46) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; terminating (42) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; terminating (43) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; terminating (43) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; terminating (44) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; terminating (43) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; terminating (44) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; terminating (41) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; terminating (44) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; terminating (56) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; terminating (43) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; terminating (42) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11346-GBD-SN; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11361-GBD-SN; terminating (42) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; terminating (44) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; terminating (41) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; terminating (65) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; terminating (52) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11422-GBD-SN; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11423-GBD-SN; terminating (41) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; terminating (41) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11431-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11433-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11459-GBD-SN; terminating (41) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; terminating (41) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11479-GBD-SN; terminating (39) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11481-GBD-SN; terminating (43) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11484-GBD-SN; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; terminating (50) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; terminating (43) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; terminating (49) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; terminating (49) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; terminating (49) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11517-GBD-SN; terminating (49) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11532-GBD-SN; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; terminating (41) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; terminating (47) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; terminating (48) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; terminating (43) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11713-GBD-SN; terminating (47) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11727-GBD-SN; terminating (41) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11757-GBD-SN; terminating (38) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11772-GBD-SN; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11781-GBD-SN; terminating (41) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11785-GBD-SN; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11798-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11803-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11804-GBD-SN; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11810-GBD-SN; terminating (49) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11814-GBD-SN; terminating (44) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11831-GBD-SN; terminating (39) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11833-GBD-SN; terminating (45) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11841-GBD-SN; terminating (40) Motion for J
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1699 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; terminating (60) Motion for Judgment in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; terminating (58) Motion for Judgment in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; terminating (441) Motion for Judgment in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; terminating (75) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11888-GBD-SN; terminating (32) Motion for Judgment; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11890-GBD-SN; terminating (38) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11891-GBD-SN; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11892-GBD-SN; terminating (44) Motion for Judgment; terminating (45) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11893-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11896-GBD-SN; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment; terminating (41) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11899-GBD-SN; terminating (70) Motion for Judgment; terminating (71) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11904-GBD-SN; terminating (38) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11909-GBD-SN; terminating (47) Motion for Judgment; terminating (48) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11911-GBD-SN; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment; terminating (38) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11921-GBD-SN; terminating (72) Motion for Judgment; terminating (73) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11926-GBD-SN; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11927-GBD-SN; terminating (32) Motion for Judgment; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11929-GBD-SN; terminating (73) Motion for Judgment; terminating (74) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11941-GBD-SN; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11942-GBD-SN; terminating (48) Motion for Judgment; terminating (49) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11944-GBD-SN; terminating (71) Motion for Judgment; terminating (72) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11946-GBD-SN; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment; terminating (38) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11949-GBD-SN; terminating (72) Motion for Judgment; terminating (73) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11950-GBD-SN; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment; terminating (38) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11951-GBD-SN; terminating (73) Motion for Judgment; terminating (74) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11964-GBD-SN; terminating (70) Motion for Judgment; terminating (71) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11965-GBD-SN; terminating (70) Motion for Judgment; terminating (71) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11966-GBD-SN; terminating (70) Motion for Judgment; terminating (71) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11967-GBD-SN; terminating (70) Motion for Judgment; terminating (71) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11969-GBD-SN; terminating (70) Motion for Judgment; terminating (71) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11970-GBD-SN; terminating (69) Motion for Judgment; terminating (70) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11971-GBD-SN; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment; terminating (38) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11983-GBD-SN; terminating (42) Motion for Judgment; terminating (43) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11992-GBD-SN; terminating (42) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-11996-GBD-SN; terminating (54) Motion for Judgment; terminating (55) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12001-GBD-SN; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12005-GBD-SN; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment; terminating (38) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12010-GBD-SN; terminating (45) Motion for Judgment; terminating (46) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12026-GBD-SN; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment; terminating (38) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12034-GBD-SN; terminating (39) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12039-GBD-SN; terminating (78) Motion for Judgment; terminating (79) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12041-GBD-SN; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment; terminating (38) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12044-GBD-SN; terminating (39) Motion for Judgment; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12052-GBD-SN; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment; terminating (41) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12067-GBD-SN; terminating (39) Motion for Judgment; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12071-GBD-SN; terminating (41) Motion for Judgment; terminating (42) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12085-GBD-SN; terminating (38) Motion for Judgment; terminating (39) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12109-GBD-SN; terminating (110) Motion for Judgment; terminating (111) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12114-GBD-SN; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12141-GBD-SN; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12144-GBD-SN; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12145-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12224-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12256-GBD-SN; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12257-GBD-SN; terminating (72) Motion for Judgment; terminating (73) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12270-GBD-SN; terminating (70) Motion for Judgment; terminating (71) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12273-GBD-SN; terminating (70) Motion for Judgment; terminating (71) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12274-GBD-SN; terminating (70) Motion for Judgment; terminating (71) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12275-GBD-SN; terminating (145) Motion for Judgment; terminating (146) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN; terminating (174) Motion for Judgment; terminating (175) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN; terminating (31) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12280-GBD-SN; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12286-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12291-GBD-SN; terminating (30) Motion for Judgment; terminating (31) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12294-GBD-SN; terminating (31) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12298-GBD-SN; terminating (31) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12301-GBD-SN; terminating (31) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12305-GBD-SN; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment; terminating (41) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN; terminating (39) Motion for Judgment; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12337-GBD-SN; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12338-GBD-SN; terminating (60) Motion for Judgment; terminating (61) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12339-GBD-SN; terminating (102) Motion for Judgment; terminating (103) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12344-GBD-SN; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12347-GBD-SN; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12348-GBD-SN; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12349-GBD-SN; terminating (32) Motion for Judgment; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12350-GBD-SN; terminating (32) Motion for Judgment; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12351-GBD-SN; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12352-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12353-GBD-SN; terminating (32) Motion for Judgment; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12354-GBD-SN; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12358-GBD-SN; terminating (32) Motion for Judgment; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12360-GBD-SN; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12362-GBD-SN; terminating (63) Motion for Judgment; terminating (64) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12367-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12368-GBD-SN; terminating (32) Motion for Judgment; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12369-GBD-SN; terminating (81) Motion for Judgment; terminating (82) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12372-GBD-SN; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12375-GBD-SN; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12377-GBD-SN; terminating (34) Motion for Judgment; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12378-GBD-SN; terminating (68) Motion for Judgment; terminating (69) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12381-GBD-SN; terminating (32) Motion for Judgment; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12383-GBD-SN; terminating (161) Motion for Judgment; terminating (162) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment; terminating (38) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12398-GBD-SN; terminating (35) Motion for Judgment; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment in case 1:18-cv-12399-GBD-SN; terminating (36) Motion for Judgment; terminating (37) Motion for Judgment in case 1:19-cv-00003-GBD-SN; terminating (268) Motion for Judgment; terminating (269) Motion for Judgment in case 1:19-cv-00012-GBD-SN; terminating (32) Motion for Judgment; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment in case 1:19-cv-00025-GBD-SN; terminating (39) Motion for Judgment; terminating (40) Motion for Judgment in case 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN; terminating (32) Motion for Judgment; terminating (33) Motion for Judgment in case 1:19-cv-00027-GBD-SN; terminating (32) Motion for Judgment; terminating (33) Motion for Jud
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1690 REPORT & RECOMMENDATION re: (1666 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 8191 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton 24 Wrongful Death Plaintiffs filed by Kathleen Ashton. The Court recommends finding that service was achieved on Iran and that the Plaintiffs in this Report and Recommendation be awarded solatium and economic damages as set out in Table 1 appended below. The Court further recommends that Plaintiffs be awarded prejudgment interest on these damages from September 11, 2001, to the date of judgment, at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually. ECF No. 3358, adopted at ECF No. 3383. Plaintiffs may apply for punitive, economic, and other damages at a later date and in a manner consistent with any applicable future Court rulings on the issue. Additionally, any parties in these seven cases not appearing in this Motion who were not previously awarded damages may still submit applications for damages awards in later stages. In light of the August 1, 2022 deadline to file with the United States Victims of State Sponsored Terrorism Fund, parties are encouraged to notify the Court as soon as possible if any objections will be filed. Upon resolution of these motions, the Court may terminate the motion at ECF No. 8191, and the related motions in Ashton, No. 02-cv-6977, ECF No. 1666. The parties shall have fourteen days from the service of this Report and Recommendation to file written objections under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). These objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court, with courtesy copies delivered to the chambers of the Honorable George B. Daniels at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, and to any opposing parties. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b). Any requests for an extension of time for filing objections must be addressed to Judge Daniels. The failure to file these timely objections will result in a waiver of those objections for purposes of appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a), 6(d), 72(b); Thomas v. Arn, 474 U.S. 140 (1985). (Objections to R&R due by 8/9/2022.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/26/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN. (ras)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1689 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: (1673 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 8225 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Ashton/Personal Injury 2 Plaintiffs. filed by Kathleen Ashton. The Court recommends granting pain and suffering damages as set out in Table 1. These plaintiffs should also be awarded prejudgment interest on these damages from September 11, 2001, to the date of judgment, at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually. ECF No. 3358, adopted by, ECF No. 3383. Plaintiffs may apply for punitive, economic, and other damages at a later date and in a manner consistent with any applicable future Court rulings on the issue. Additionally, any Burnett personal injury plaintiffs not appearing in this motion who were not previously awarded damages may still submit applications for damages awards in later stages. In light of the August 1, 2022 deadline to file with the United States Victims of State Sponsored Terrorism Fund, parties are encouraged to notify the Court as soon as possible if any objections will be filed. Upon resolution of this motion, the Court should terminate the motion at ECF No. 8225, and the related motion in Ashton, No. 02-cv-6977, ECF No. 1673. Objections to R&R due by 8/9/2022 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/26/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN (jca)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1688 ORDER granting (8257) Motion to Substitute Party in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (1687) Motion to Substitute Party in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN. John F. Jermyn, Jr. is substituted for John F. Jermyn. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN. (ras)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1687 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: John F. Jermyn, New Party: John F. Jermyn, Jr. . Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Maloney, Andrew)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1686 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J. Maloney, III dated 07/25/2022 re: Courts Order ECF No. 8255. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Maloney, Andrew)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1685 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the motion for default judgment for personal injuries sustained by the plaintiffs in Ashton, et al. v. al Qaeda Islamic Army, et al., 02-cv-6977 (the "Ashton Plaintiffs"), at ECF No. 8225. That motion seeks damages for John F. Jermyn, who passed away in 2019. The Court has been unable to locate the pleading substituting an appropriate party for Mr. Jermyn as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25. The Ashton Plaintiffs are directed to identify this pleading for the Court at their earliest convenience. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/25/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN (ras)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1684 ORDER granting (8252) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. The parties are substituted as provided for in the exhibit at ECF No. 8252-1. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN. (ras)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1683 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: New Party: . Document filed by Sheri Burlingame. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1682 ORDER granting (8246) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (1681) Motion to Substitute Party, in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN. The following parties are substituted in this case as set out at ECF No. 8246: Gail Brennan, Bob Cheatham, Robert Clark, Marianne Cruikshank, Robert Devitt, David Distefano, Eileen Geraty, Joseph Hromada, Frederick Irby, Jan Kandell, Emmet P. Kelly, Ilia Rodriguez, Lloyd C. Mair, Jeffrey Lovit, Helen Passaro, Helen Pfeifer, Robin Theurkauf, Floyd Weil, Sheila Capparis, Arthur Cheatham, Regina Gans, Douglas A. Cruikshank, Joyce Devitt, Frank Distefano, Erin Durkin, Stephen Hromada, Kenneth Irby, Beatrice Kandell, James P. Kelly, Haydee C. Lillo, Yvonne Ramirez, Jason Seymour, Irene Durbin, Joseph and Mary Machinksi (Mary & Joseph Pfeifer), Thomas Francis Theurkauf, and Judith Weil. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN. (ras)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1681 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Old Party, New Party: New Party . Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Maloney, Andrew)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1680 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from James P. Kreindler dated 7/20/2022 re: supplementing ECF No. 8225 - Motion for Default Judgment. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1679 ORDER: While the Burlingame Plaintiffs have filed papers to supplement their original, denied motion, they have not filed a renewed motion so their default judgment request is not presently before the Court. In addition, any such renewed motion must comply with the requirements for default judgments against non-sovereign defendants set out by the Court's order at ECF No. 8198. In particular, the Court directs the Burlingame Plaintiffs' attention to the information that must be contained in supporting exhibits for each plaintiff under the rules at ECF No. 8198 at 4, as well as the requirement that "[p]roposed orders granting default judgment must indicate that it is not binding on the determination of damages for defendants besides the one against whom default judgment is being sought." Id. at 5. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/20/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN. (ras)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney John Schutty to RE-FILE Document (1678 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 8241 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment. Your document and docket entry need to match. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(km)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1678 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Irene Dickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed List of Wrongful Death Damage Awards).(Schutty, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 7/20/2022 (km).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1677 DECLARATION of John F. Schutty, Esq. in Support re: (1603 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 7678 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) AMENDED MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Emir Muhammad Omar.. Document filed by Irene Dickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Appointing Irene Dickey As Personal Rep., #2 Exhibit Order Appointing Jacqueline Eaton As Personal Rep., #3 Exhibit Order Appointing Joanne Kelly As Personal Rep., #4 Exhibit Order Appointing Lisa O'Brien As Personal Rep., #5 Exhibit Order Appointing Dara Seaman As Personal Rep., #6 Exhibit Order Appointing Susan Sliwak As Personal Rep., #7 Exhibit Order Appointing Allison Wallace As Personal Rep., #8 Exhibit Order Appointing Eileen Lynch As Personal Rep., #9 Exhibit Proposed List of Death Award)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Schutty, John)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1676 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF BURLINGAME XII PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: granting (8081) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (1660) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; granting (217) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN. ORDERED that partial final judgment is entered against the Iran Defendants and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Burlingame, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each a spouse, parent, child, or sibling ( or the estate of a spouse, parent, child, or sibling) of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibit A, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages of$12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling, as set forth in Exhibit A; and as set forth herein. FURTHERMORE, the Court respectfully directs the Clerk of the Court to terminate the motions at ECF No. 8081, Case No 03-md-1570; ECF No. 217, Case No. 02 cv-7230; and ECF No. 1660, Case No. 02-cv-6977. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/19/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN (ama)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (8227 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1675 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(km)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1675 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton..(Kreindler, James) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1674 DECLARATION of James P. Kreindler in Support re: (1673 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 8225 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Ashton/Personal Injury 2 Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1673 MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Ashton/Personal Injury 2 Plaintiffs. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1672 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Frank H. Granitto, III dated July 14, 2022 re: Pending motion for default judgment against the Islamic Republic of Iran. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1671 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from John F. Schutty, Esq. dated July 14, 2022 re: Order re Liability of the Taliban to Various Plaintiffs in This MDL Proceeding. Document filed by Irene Dickey.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Schutty, John)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1670 ORDER terminating (951) Motion for Judgment; terminating (958) Motion for Default Judgment; terminating (962) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; terminating (7489) Motion for Default Judgment; terminating (7516) Motion for Default Judgment; terminating (7594) Motion for Default Judgment; terminating (7634) Motion for Judgment; terminating (7652) Motion re: (951 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 7805 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 615 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 381 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 1622 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 76 in 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN, 197 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 143 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 85 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:20-cv-10366-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment against Taliban and Muhammed Omar, (958 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 7843 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban for Burnett Plaintiffs with Liability Defaults and Final Judgments Against Iran Defendants, (962 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 7847 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban for Certain Burnett Plaintiffs, (7489 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1576 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7516 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1581 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 132 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Bauer Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7594 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1588 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 182 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burlingame Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7634 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1597 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 187 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment Burlingame II Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7652 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 604 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment for Damages, (7756 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1616 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 194 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 80 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Kristen Breitweiser, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald Breitweiser, Deceased, Kristen Breitweiser, and Caroline Breitweiser The Breitweiser Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Default, (7758 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1618 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 139 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 82 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Patricia Ryan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of John J. Ryan, Deceased, Patricia Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan, Colin Ryan, Katherine Maher, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel L. Maher, D, (8181 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 646 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment Against the Taliban. ; terminating (7756) Motion for Entry of Default; terminating (7758) Motion for Entry of Default; terminating (7805) Motion for Judgment; terminating (7843) Motion for Default Judgment; terminating (7847) Motion for Default Judgment; terminating (8181) Motion re: (951 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 7805 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 615 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 381 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 1622 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 76 in 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN, 197 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 143 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 85 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:20-cv-10366-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment against Taliban and Muhammed Omar, (958 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 7843 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban for Burnett Plaintiffs with Liability Defaults and Final Judgments Against Iran Defendants, (962 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 7847 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban for Certain Burnett Plaintiffs, (7489 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1576 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7516 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1581 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 132 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Bauer Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7594 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1588 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 182 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burlingame Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7634 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1597 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 187 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment Burlingame II Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7652 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 604 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment for Damages, (7756 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1616 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 194 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 80 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Kristen Breitweiser, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald Breitweiser, Deceased, Kristen Breitweiser, and Caroline Breitweiser The Breitweiser Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Default, (7758 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1618 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 139 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 82 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Patricia Ryan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of John J. Ryan, Deceased, Patricia Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan, Colin Ryan, Katherine Maher, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel L. Maher, D, (8181 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 646 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment Against the Taliban. in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; terminating (604) Motion re: (951 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 7805 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 615 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 381 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 1622 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 76 in 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN, 197 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 143 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 85 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:20-cv-10366-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment against Taliban and Muhammed Omar, (958 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 7843 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban for Burnett Plaintiffs with Liability Defaults and Final Judgments Against Iran Defendants, (962 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 7847 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban for Certain Burnett Plaintiffs, (7489 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1576 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7516 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1581 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 132 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Bauer Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7594 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1588 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 182 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burlingame Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7634 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1597 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 187 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment Burlingame II Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7652 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 604 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment for Damages, (7756 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1616 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 194 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 80 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Kristen Breitweiser, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald Breitweiser, Deceased, Kristen Breitweiser, and Caroline Breitweiser The Breitweiser Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Default, (7758 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1618 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 139 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 82 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Patricia Ryan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of John J. Ryan, Deceased, Patricia Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan, Colin Ryan, Katherine Maher, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel L. Maher, D, (8181 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 646 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment Against the Taliban. ; terminating (615) Motion for Judgment; terminating (646) Motion re: (951 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 7805 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 615 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN, 381 in 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN, 1622 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 76 in 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN, 197 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 143 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 85 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN, 39 in 1:20-cv-10366-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment against Taliban and Muhammed Omar, (958 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 7843 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban for Burnett Plaintiffs with Liability Defaults and Final Judgments Against Iran Defendants, (962 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 7847 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to the Taliban for Certain Burnett Plaintiffs, (7489 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1576 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7516 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1581 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 132 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Bauer Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7594 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1588 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 182 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burlingame Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7634 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1597 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 187 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment Burlingame II Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar, (7652 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 604 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment for Damages, (7756 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1616 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 194 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 80 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Kristen Breitweiser, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald Breitweiser, Deceased, Kristen Breitweiser, and Caroline Breitweiser The Breitweiser Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Default, (7758 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1618 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 139 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 82 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Patricia Ryan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of John J. Ryan, Deceased, Patricia Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan, Colin Ryan, Katherine Maher, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel L. Maher, D, (8181 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 646 in 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN) MOTION Partial Final Judgment Against the Taliban. in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; terminating (381) Motion for Judgment in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; terminating (1576) Motion for Default Judgment; terminating (1581) Motion for Default Judgment; terminating (1588) Motion for Default Judgment; terminating (15
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (1668 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 8193 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(km)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1669 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from James P. Kreindler dated 7/8/2022 re: Expert Reports to Motion (ECF 8191), Declaration (ECF 8192), Proposed Judgment (ECF 8193). Document filed by Kathleen Ashton(as Administrator of the Estate of Thomas Ashton, deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Thomas Ashton), Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit expert report 1, #2 Exhibit expert report 2, #3 Exhibit expert report 3, #4 Exhibit expert report 4, #5 Exhibit expert report 5, #6 Exhibit expert report 6, #7 Exhibit expert report 7)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SNMotion or Order to File Under Seal: 7963 .(Kreindler, James)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1668 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Kreindler, James) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1667 DECLARATION of James P. Kreindler in Support re: (1666 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 8191 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton 24 Wrongful Death Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1666 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton 24 Wrongful Death Plaintiffs. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1665 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from John F. Schutty, Esq. dated July 8, 2022 re: Requesting Briefing on the Liability of the Taliban to Plaintiffs Before Default Judgments Are Entered or Enforced. Document filed by Irene Dickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LTR to Judges Daniels & Netburn re Defects in Havlish Default Judgment Entered Against the Taliban)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Schutty, John)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1664 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 3237 in 03-MDL-1570). Document filed by Ashley Amato, H. Lorraine Gardella, Lorraine A. Gardella, Susan Kraljic, Joseph Lipari, Michael Lipari, Christopher Prunty, Alex Ryjov, Daniel Ryjov, Aaron Sand..(Kreindler, James)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1663 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Sheri Burlingame..(Granito, Frank) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1662 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame..(Granito, Frank) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 6/8/2022 (km).
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1661 DECLARATION of Frank H. Granito, III in Support re: (217 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 8081 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1660 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burlingame XII Plaintiffs against the Islamic Republic of Iran.. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1660 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burlingame XII Plaintiffs against the Islamic Republic of Iran. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. (8085 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1663 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 220 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN(km)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Frank Granito to RE-FILE Document (219 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1662 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 8083 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment. Use the event type Proposed Orders, Proposed Default Judgment. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN(km)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1659 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1658 NOTICE of Amendment (ECF No. 3237 in 03-MDL-1570). Document filed by Katherine Amato, Sean Amato, Tara Amato, Andrew Esposito, Michael Esposito, Alexandra Fallone, Anthony Fallone, III, Katherine Fallone, Patrick Fallone, Jeanne Kennedy, Emily LaMantia, Stephen LaMantia, Hafeezah Legree, Christopher Maggitti, Christopher Monahan, Terrance Monahan, Alexandra Morell, Lisa Prunty Aram, Christine Reilly, Thomas Reilly, William Reilly(sibling of 9/11 decedent James B. Reilly), Lauren Salbeck, Kevin Torres, Nicholas Torres, Melissa Van Ness Fatha(spouse of 9/11 decedent Syed Abdul Fatha)..(Kreindler, James)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1657 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erick Krikor Alahverdian on behalf of Zaree Voskerijian..(Alahverdian, Erick)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1656 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erick Krikor Alahverdian on behalf of Zabel Voskerijian..(Alahverdian, Erick)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1655 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erick Krikor Alahverdian on behalf of Shont Voskerijian..(Alahverdian, Erick)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1654 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erick Krikor Alahverdian on behalf of Isabelle Voskerijian..(Alahverdian, Erick)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1653 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erick Krikor Alahverdian on behalf of Aleene Voskerijian..(Alahverdian, Erick)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1652 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying without prejudice to renewal (7678) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying without prejudice to renewal (1603) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN. The Burlingame Plaintiffs' motion for a default judgment is denied without prejudice to renew through a motion with a properly limited scope. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 7678. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/5/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN. (ras)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1651 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/26/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1650 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/26/2022 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/26/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1649 ORDER: The plaintiffs in Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., et al. v. The Republic of Iraq, et al., 04-cv-1076 (the "O'Neill Plaintiffs") request a partial default judgment on behalf of certain plaintiffs. ECF No. 7652. That motion requests economic damages based on an expert report provided at ECF No. 7655-4. That expert report, however, references certain additional materials filed under seal. Id. at 43. The Court has not received these expert materials. The O'Neill Plaintiffs shall file that component of the expert report at their earliest convenience. This document shall be filed on ECF with access restricted to the Court. Going forward, all expert reports submitted in support of a default judgment shall be filed on ECF. These materials may be sealed, with access restricted to the Court and any applicable parties. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/5/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (ras)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1648 REPORT & RECOMMENDATION: The Plaintiffs are people injured or killed in the September 11, 2001 terrorist attacks ("September 11 Attacks"), their families, commercial entities that suffered property damage, and insurers who compensated the victims. O'Neill also alleges harms on behalf of a class. See Estate of John P. O'Neill, Sr., et al. v. Republic of the Sudan, et al., No. 18-cv-12114 (GDB)(SN) (Dec. 12, 2018) ("O'Neill"). All Plaintiffs allege that the Republic of Sudan aided the attack by providing crucial support to the al Qaeda terrorist network. Sudan moves to dismiss these complaints under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). ECF No. 6575. The Court recommends dismissing certain federal, state, and international law claims but otherwise denying the motion. The Court recommends denying Sudan's motion to dismiss except as regards specific claims. In particular, it recommends granting Sudan's motion to dismiss for the Plaintiffs' state law claims for punitive damages, conspiracy, aiding and abetting, intentional infliction of emotional distress, claims sounding in negligence, and assault and battery claims brought after September 11, 2002. It also recommends granting the dismissal of the international law claims. Finally, it recommends granting the dismissal of secondary ATA claims for all plaintiffs but the Ashton plaintiffs and the O'Neill plaintiffs in the event those plaintiffs are not certified as a class. The Court also recommends directing the Clerk of Court to vacate the Certificates of Default at ECF Nos. 2511 and 2575. If a Certificate of Default exists for the Fed. Ins. Co., the Court recommends that default be vacated as well. The parties shall have fourteen days from the service of this Report and Recommendation to file written objections under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. Rule 72(b)(2). These objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court, with courtesy copies delivered to the chambers of the Honorable George B. Daniels at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, and to any opposing parties. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Rule 6(a), 6(d), 72(b). Any requests for an extension of time for filing objections must be addressed to Judge Daniels. The failure to file these timely objections will result in a waiver of those objections for purposes of appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1); Rule 6(a), 6(d), 72(b); Thomas v. Arn, 474 U.S. 140 (1985). (Objections to R&R due by 5/17/2022.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/3/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (ras)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1647 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noam Korati Biale on behalf of Ashton Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN.(Biale, Noam)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1646 NOTICE of Amendment re: #2 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Barbara Lynch, Carol M. Lynch, Chris Maldonado, Krystal Maldonado, Otelio Maldonado, Jr., Cathleen L. Miller, Tracey Osborne, Mary Ann Prokop, Lauren Saraniti, Matthew Sherman, Jason Sherman, Jerome Smith, Tensay Betru, Sara Tesheberu, Pamela J. Thornton, Richard Tipaldi, Kerri Viverito, Jason Weinberg, Laurie Weinberg, Lindsay Weinberg, Samuel Weinberg..(Kreindler, James)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1645 NOTICE of Amendment re: #2 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Jevon William Alexander Castrillo, Aron Betru, Ruth Betru, Sirak Betru, David Burford, Vicki L. Burford, Ashley R. Calabro, Kathleen L. Clarke Head, Patricia Clarke Scudder, Kelly Anne Clarke, Timothy Clarke, Amanda Martinez Diaz, Belkys Diaz, Carmen Diaz, Leocadio Diaz, Leonel Diaz, Margaret Doyle, Andrew J. Fredericks, Hayley Fredericks, Michelle Fredericks, Holly Rae Harrell, Margaret Harrell, Lauren Kiefer, Jeremy M. Krist, Stella Lombardo..(Kreindler, James)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1644 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1643 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Dorothea M. Capone dated April 11, 2022 re: Notices of Amendment as to Defendants the Taliban and Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1642 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1641 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1640 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1639 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1638 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1637 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1636 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1635 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1634 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1633 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1632 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1631 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Frank H. Granito, III dated April 7, 2022 re: in response to the Court's Order at ECF 7835. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 7595-1, #2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 7635-1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1630 ORDER: The request for a default judgment against the Taliban at ECF No. 7579 duplicates an updated motion at ECF No. 7678. The Clerk of the Court is therefore respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 7579 and at ECF No. 1586 in Ashton, et al. v. al Qaeda Islamic Army, et al., No. 02-cv-6977. Motions terminated: (1586 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 7579 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Muhammad Omar, Proposed Order Granting Default Judgment, filed by Irene Dickey. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/7/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN. (ras)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1629 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Dorothea M. Capone dated 04/07/2022 re: Response to Order (ECF No. 7837) regarding clarification. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1628 ORDER: The Court's review of the Bauer Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment against the Taliban has revealed items requiring clarification. ECF No. 7516. Exhibit C of that motion lists plaintiffs requesting solatium damages. ECF No. 7517-3. The exhibit states that these plaintiffs previously received identical solatium judgments as part of judgments against Iran (the "Iranian Judgments"). In those judgments, several plaintiffs' names were redacted because they were minor children. It appears that their names may be listed in the new motion. These plaintiffs are listed in Table 1. It also appears that there may be differences between plaintiffs' names in the Iranian Judgments and the names in Exhibit C. These parties' names in Exhibit C and what the Court believes their names were in the Iranian Judgments are in Table 2. The Bauer Plaintiffs shall file a letter by April 15, 2022, confirming that the parties in Table 1 are parties whose names were redacted in the original Iran default judgments and that, despite any name changes or typographical issues, the parties identified in Table 2 are the same people. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/7/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD. (ras)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1627 ORDER: The Court's review of the Burlingame Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment against the Taliban has revealed an item requiring clarification. In Exhibit A-1, ECF No. 7635-1, "Frederick Kelley" is listed as the plaintiff, while "Janet Kelley" is listed as the decedent. The expert report submitted with this motion, however, identifies Frederick Kelley as the decedent, as does the Sixth Amended Ashton complaint. ECF No. 1463 at 83. Accordingly, by April 11, 2022, the Burlingame Plaintiffs shall submit a letter confirming that Janet Kelley is the plaintiff for whom default judgment is sought and that Frederick Kelley is the decedent. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/7/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN. (ras)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1626 ORDER: The request for a default judgment against the Taliban at ECF No. 7678 is an amended motion replacing the prior motion at ECF No. 7577. See ECF No. 7678 at 1. The Clerk of the Court is therefore respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 7577 and ECF No. 1584 in Ashton, et al. v. al Qaeda Islamic Army, et al., No. 02-cv-6977. Motions terminated: (1584 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 7577 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Muhammad Omar, filed by Irene Dickey. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/7/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN. (ras)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (956 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 93 in 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN, 692 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 52 in 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN, 563 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 101 in 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN, 52 in 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN, 53 in 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN, 53 in 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN, 51 in 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN, 44 in 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN, 51 in 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN, 54 in 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN, 53 in 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN, 53 in 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN, 7829 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 45 in 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN) MOTION for Jennifer G. Guy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(aea)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1625 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michel F. Baumeister dated 03/30/2022 re: Response to Letter filed by Federal Insurance Plaintiffs (ECF No. 7809) regarding their March 22, 2022 letter (ECF No. 7790) re Taliban judgment applications and DAB turnover proceedings. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Baumeister, Michel)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1624 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michel F. Baumeister dated 03/30/2022 re: Response to Letter filed by Federal Insurance Plaintiffs (ECF No. 7809) regarding their March 22, 2022 letter (ECF No. 7790) re Taliban judgment applications and DAB turnover proceedings. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Baumeister, Michel)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1623 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Judgment Declaration of Meryl Schwartz. Document filed by Cheryl Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pain and Suffering, #2 Exhibit Solatium)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Schwartz, Meryl) Modified on 3/29/2022 (db).
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1622 MOTION for Judgment against Taliban and Muhammed Omar. Document filed by Cheryl Schneider.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Schwartz, Meryl)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1621 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Michel F. Baumeister dated 03/22/2022 re: Response to Letter filed by Federal Insurance Plaintiffs, et al. regarding the Taliban judgment applications and DAB turnover proceedings. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Baumeister, Michel)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1620 ORDER terminating (7643) Motion for Default Judgment; terminating (7644) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; terminating (1600) Motion for Default Judgment; terminating (1601) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; terminating (190) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; terminating (135) Motion for Default Judgment in case 1:02-cv-07236-GBD. The Court has received the Plaintiffs' motions for default judgments against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar. These motions at ECF Nos. 7756 and 7758 replace the Plaintiffs' motions at ECF Nos. 7644 and 7643 respectively. Accordingly, the Court respectfully directs the Clerk of the Court to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 7643 and 7644. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/18/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN. (ras)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1619 DECLARATION of Dennis G. Pantazis in Support re: (139 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 7758 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 82 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN, 1618 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Patricia Ryan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of John J. Ryan, Deceased, Patricia Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan, Colin Ryan, Katherine Maher, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel L. Maher, D. Document filed by Daniel Maher, Joseph Maher, Katherine Maher, Katherine Maher, Colin Ryan, John Ryan, John Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan, Patricia Ryan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN.(Pantazis, Dennis)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1618 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Patricia Ryan, as Personal Representative of the Estate of John J. Ryan, Deceased, Patricia Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan, Colin Ryan, Katherine Maher, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel L. Maher, Deceased, Katherine Maher, Daniel R. Maher, and Joseph F. Maher The Ryan and Maher Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar [substitute motion for MDL Doc. No. 7643]. Document filed by Daniel Maher, Joseph Maher, Katherine Maher, Katherine Maher, Colin Ryan, John Ryan, John Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan, Patricia Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN.(Pantazis, Dennis)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1617 DECLARATION of Dennis G. Pantazis in Support re: (194 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1616 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 80 in 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Kristen Breitweiser, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald Breitweiser, Deceased, Kristen Breitweiser, and Caroline Breitweiser The Breitweiser Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Default Judg. Document filed by Caroline Breitweiser, Kristen Breitweiser. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN.(Pantazis, Dennis)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1616 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Kristen Breitweiser, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald Breitweiser, Deceased, Kristen Breitweiser, and Caroline Breitweiser The Breitweiser Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Final Default Judgment Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar [substitute motion for MDL Doc. No. 7644]. Document filed by Caroline Breitweiser, Kristen Breitweiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN.(Pantazis, Dennis)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1615 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/22/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1614 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/22/2022 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/23/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1613 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Elise Ghotbi on behalf of Ashton Plaintiffs..(Ghotbi, Kathryn)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1612 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Tremonte on behalf of Ashton Plaintiffs..(Tremonte, Michael)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1611 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theresa Marie Trzaskoma on behalf of Ashton Plaintiffs..(Trzaskoma, Theresa)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1610 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Elise Ghotbi on behalf of Ashton Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN.(Ghotbi, Kathryn)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1609 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Tremonte on behalf of Ashton Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN.(Tremonte, Michael)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1608 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theresa Marie Trzaskoma on behalf of Ashton Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN.(Trzaskoma, Theresa)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1607 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Irene Dickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary of Awards Requested by Plaintiffs) Related Document Number: 7678 ..(Schutty, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (7685 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1607 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(dt)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1606 DECLARATION of John F. Schutty, Esq. in Support re: (1604 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) AMENDED MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Emir Muhammad Omar.. Document filed by Irene Dickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Irene Dickey with attached Economist Report, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jacqueline Eaton with Economist Report, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Joanne Kelly with Economist Report, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Lisa O'Brien with Economist Report, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Dara Seaman with Economist Report, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Susan Sliwak with Economist Report, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Allison Wallice with Economist Report, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Eileen Lynch with Economist Report, #9 Exhibit Summary List of Awards Requested on this Motion)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Schutty, John)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1605 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Irene Dickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary of Awards Requested by Plaintiffs).(Schutty, John) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 2/17/2022 (dt).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1604 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU -AMENDED MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Emir Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Irene Dickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Irene Dickey with attached Economist Report, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jacqueline Eaton with Economist Report, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Joanne Kelly with Economist Report, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Lisa O'Brien with Economist Report, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Dara Seaman with Economist Report, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Susan Sliwak with Economist Report, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Allison Wallice with Economist Report, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Eileen Lynch with Economist Report, #9 Exhibit Summary List of Awards Requested on this Motion)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Schutty, John) Modified on 2/17/2022 (db).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1603 AMENDED MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Emir Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Irene Dickey.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Schutty, John)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney John Francis Schutty to RE-FILE Document (1604 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 7680 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) AMENDED MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Emir Muhammad Omar. Use the event type Declaration in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. Then link to the 7678 and #1603 Motions in their respective cases. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(db)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Schutty, John to RE-FILE Document (1605 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 7681 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Default Judgment. The Attached Document is not a Default Judgment. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(dt)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1602 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: (7664 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 564 in 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN) MOTION to Lift Stay of Judicial Enforcement of Writ of Execution . And Addressing ECF 7661. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1601 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Certain Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against The Taliban And Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Kristen Breitweiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed Order])Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Pantazis, Dennis)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1600 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Certain Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against The Taliban And Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Daniel Maher, Joseph Maher, Katherine Maher, Colin Ryan, Kristen Ryan, Laura Ryan, Patricia Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed Order])Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Pantazis, Dennis)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (189 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1599 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 7636 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN(dt)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1599 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame..(Granito, Frank) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 1/31/2022 (dt).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1598 DECLARATION of Frank H. Granito, III in Support re: (1597 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 7634 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 187 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) MOTION for Judgment Burlingame II Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar.. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B-1 through B-19)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1597 MOTION for Judgment Burlingame II Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1596 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Jeanne M. O'Grady, New Attorney: Erick Alahverdian, Address: Alahverdian Van Leuvan, P.C., 295 Broadway, Bethpage, New York, United States 11714, 5164903559. Document filed by Zaree Voskerijian. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Alahverdian, Erick)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1595 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Jeanne M. O'Grady, New Attorney: Erick Alahverdian, Address: Alahverdian Van Leuvan, P.C., 295 Broadway, Bethpage, New York, United States 11714, 5164903559. Document filed by Zabel Voskerijian. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Alahverdian, Erick)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney John Schutty to RE-FILE Document #1594 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Emir Muhammad Omar. Wrong PDF is attached. (kj)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1594 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Emir Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Irene Dickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Irene Dickey with attached Economist Report, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jacqueline Eaton with Economist Report, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Joanne Kelly with Economist Report, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Lisa O'Brien with Economist Report, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Dara Seaman with Economist Report, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Susan Sliwak with Economist Report, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Allison Wallice with Economist Report, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Eileen Lynch with Economist Report, #9 Exhibit Summary List of Awards Requested on this Motion)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Schutty, John) Modified on 2/8/2022 (kj).
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1593 DECLARATION of Jonathan Winer in Opposition re: (7342 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) JOINT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JONATHAN WINER AND BRIAN MICHAEL JENKINS .. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Haefele, Robert)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1592 DECLARATION of Robert T. Haefele in Opposition re: (7342 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) JOINT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JONATHAN WINER AND BRIAN MICHAEL JENKINS .. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Haefele, Robert)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1591 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (7342 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) JOINT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JONATHAN WINER AND BRIAN MICHAEL JENKINS . . Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Haefele, Robert)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1590 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame..(Granito, Frank) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1589 DECLARATION of Frank H. Granito, III in Support re: (1588 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 7594 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 182 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burlingame Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar.. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit C-1, #7 Exhibit C-2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1588 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Burlingame Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Sheri Burlingame.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (7596 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 184 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1590 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN(km)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1587 ORDER AND PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT: ORDERED that the following corrections are deemed made nunc pro tune to Anaya Plaintiffs' First Amended Short Form Complaint filed on February 22, 2019 (Anaya ECF 29), and the Partial Final Judgment Entered on October 5, 2021 (MDL ECF 7178 and Anaya ECF70): As set forth herein. ORDERED that Exhibits A and B to the Partial Final Judgment Entered on October 5, 2021 (MDL ECF 7178 and Anaya ECF 70) are corrected nunc pro tune to conform to, respectively, Exhibits A and B attached hereto; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs are not required to serve the Islamic Republic of Iran with an amended pleading reflecting the above corrections to the First Amended Short Farm Complaint, and that service of copies of the Partial Final Judgment entered on October 5, 2021 and this judgment on the Islamic Republic of Iran shall be through diplomatic channels pursuant to 28U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Furthermore, the Court respectfully directs the Clerk of Court to termination the motion at MDL ECF No. 7561 (Anaya ECF No. 92). SO ORDERED., Motions terminated: (7561 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 92 in 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN) AMENDED MOTION to Amend/Correct (7178 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Judgment filed by Helen L. Colhoun. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/10/2022) (ama)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1586 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Muhammad Omar, Proposed Order Granting Default Judgment. Document filed by Irene Dickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LIST OF PLAINTIFFS & AWARDS FOR ENTRY OF PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENTS AGAINST THE TALIBAN AND MUHAMMAD OMAR)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Schutty, John)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1585 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #7617) - MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Muhammad Omar, Declaration of John F. Schutty, Esq. in Support of Motion. Document filed by Irene Dickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Irene Dickey with attached Economist Report, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jacqueline Eaton with attached Economist Report, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Joanne Kelly with attached Economist Report, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Lisa O'Brien with attached Economist Report, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Dara Seaman with attached Economist Report, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Lisa Sliwak with attached Economist Report, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Allison Wallice with attached Economist Report, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Eileen Lynch with attached Economist Report, #9 Exhibit Summary of Awards Requested by Plaintiffs on this Motion)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Schutty, John) Modified on 1/20/2022 (lb).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1584 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Taliban and Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Irene Dickey.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Schutty, John)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. #1583 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1583 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Capone, Dorothea) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 1/3/2022 (km).
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1582 DECLARATION of Dorothea M. Capone in Support re: (7516 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 132 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD, 1581 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Bauer Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar.. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1581 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Bauer Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al, Virginia Bauer, et al..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1580 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment, Default Judgment on Liability deemed filed August 31, 2015, Final Order of Judgment on Behalf of Ashton 21 Plaintiffs, including the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion deemed filed on October 5, 2021, Final Order of Judgment on Behalf of Ashton 22 Plaintiffs, including the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion deemed filed on October 5, 2021, Final Order of Judgment on Behalf of Ashton 23 Plaintiffs, including the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion deemed filed on October 5, 2021, Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act & Affidavit of Translator (along with translations of the above documents in Farsi) mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran, C/O Mohammad Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square, Tehran, Iran on 12/29/2021 by Federal Express tracking # 8157 2471 5908, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Jared Hess, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20522, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(JKR)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1579 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Andrew J. Maloney, III dated 12/22/2021 re: Ashton Motion for final judgment against the Taliban ECF 7489. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Maloney, Andrew)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (1578 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(dt)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1578 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1 - Decedent Citizens, #2 Exhibit A2 - Decedent Non Citizens, #3 Exhibit B1 - Citizens Solatium, #4 Exhibit B2 - Non-Citizens Solatium, #5 Exhibit C1 - All other Solatiums, Citizens, #6 Exhibit C2 - All other Solatiums, Non Citizens).(Maloney, Andrew) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1577 DECLARATION of Andrew J. Maloney, III in Support re: (1576 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar.. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1 - Decedent Citizens, #2 Exhibit A2 - Decedent Non Citizens, #3 Exhibit B1 - Citizens Solatium, #4 Exhibit B2 - Non-Citizens Solatium, #5 Exhibit C1 - All other Solatiums, Citizens, #6 Exhibit C2 - All other Solatiums, Non Citizens)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Maloney, Andrew)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1576 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton Plaintiffs Against the Taliban and Muhammad Omar. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Maloney, Andrew)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1575 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Boyle(Personal Representative of the Estate of James Boyle, Deceased, surviving Parent of Michael Boyle, Deceased; ), Michael Burns(Personal Representative of the Estate of Julia Burns, Deceased, surviving Parent of Donald Burns, Deceased; ), Timothy Burns, John Calia(Personal Representative of the Estate of Mildred Calia, Deceased, surviving Parent of Dominick Calia, Deceased; ), Charles Dunne(Personal Representative of the Estate of Jay Dunne, Deceased, surviving Parent of Christopher Dunne, Deceased; ), Irene Durbin(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anthony Passaro, Deceased, surviving Parent of Suzanne Passaro, Deceased; ), Irene Durbin(Personal Representative of the Estate of Helene Passaro, Deceased, surviving Parent of Suzanne Passaro, Deceased; ), Thomas Edwards, Pamela Fox, Calliope Katsimatides(Personal Representative of the Estate of Antonios Katsimatides, Deceased, surviving Parent of John Katsimatides, Deceased; ), Lucille Keefe, James Kelly(Personal Representative of the Estate of Emmet Kelly, Deceased, surviving Parent of Thomas Kelly, Deceased; ), James Kelly, Miriam Lafuente, David Lapin(Personal Representative of the Estate of Joan Lopatin, Deceased, surviving Parent of Ruth Lapin, Deceased; ), Tawania Loyd, Theresa McDonald, William Novotny(Personal Representative of the Estate of John Novotny, Deceased, surviving Sibling of Brian Novotny, Deceased; ), Harry Ong, Jr, Nancy Picone(Personal Representative of the Estate of Tommaso Sereno, Deceased, surviving Parent of Arturo Sereno, Deceased; ), Katherine Rohner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald Rohner, Deceased, surviving Parent of Scott Rohner, Deceased; ), Michael Santo(Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Santo, Deceased, surviving Parent of Susan Santo, Deceased; ), Mary Trant, Kara Walker(Personal Representative of the Estate of Caroline Coakley, Deceased, surviving Parent of Steven Coakley, Deceased; ), Rebecca Wynne..(Kreindler, James)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1574 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Laura Andrucki, Gary Berger, Jacob Biegeleisen, Mariza Calderon(Personal Representative of the Estate of Vicente Calderon, Deceased, surviving Parent of Edward Calderon, Deceased; ), Joseph Callahan, Carolyn Garcia, Karen Greene(Personal Representative of the Estate of Collin Hinds, Deceased, surviving Parent of Neil Hinds, Deceased; ), Janice Hart(Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Schreier, Deceased, surviving Parent of Jeffrey Schreier, Deceased; ), Janice Hart(Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephanie Schreier, Deceased, surviving Parent of Jeffrey Schreier, Deceased; ), Claudia Jacobs(Personal Representative of the Estate of Melvin Jacobs, Deceased, surviving Parent of Ariel Jacobs, Deceased; ), Erin James, Peggy Lamonsoff, Andrea Maffeo(Personal Representative of the Estate of Sam Maffeo, Deceased, surviving Parent of Jennieann Maffeo, Deceased; ), Roger Mair, Dallas Mckinney(Personal Representative of the Estate of Darryl McKinney, Deceased, surviving Parent of Darryl McKinney, Deceased; ), Keri Murphy, Scott Naiman, Caroline Otero(Personal Representative of the Estate of Edward Calderon, Deceased, surviving Parent of Edward Calderon, Deceased; ), Linda Pickford(Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Pickford, Deceased, surviving Parent of Christopher Pickford, Deceased; ), Evelyn Sekzer(Personal Representative of the Estate of Wilton Sekzer, Deceased, surviving Parent of Jason Sekzer, Deceased; ), Barbara Sohan(Personal Representative of the Estate of Clive Sohan, Deceased, surviving Parent of Astrid Sohan, Deceased; ), Carlton Valvo(Personal Representative of the Estate of Nicoletta Valvo, Deceased, surviving Parent of Carlton Valvo II, Deceased; ), Lucy Virgilio(Parent of 9/11 Decedent Lawrence Virgilio), Dianne Walsh(Personal Representative of the Estate of John Barbuto, Deceased, surviving Parent of Christine Barbuto, Deceased; ), Raymond Wodenshek(Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Wodenshek, Deceased, surviving Parent of Christopher Wodenshek, Deceased; )..(Kreindler, James)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1573 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mary Andrucki(Parent of 9/11 Decedent Jean Andrucki), Aaron Gill, Joshua Gill, Jennifer Harvey Castellano, Antoinette McCarthy, Patricia McDowell, Frank Oliva, Leeann Sarle, Norma Sarle, Paul Sarle, Priscilla Stumm, Elizabeth Tatsuno, Sat Thackurdeen(Sibling of 9/11 Decedent Goumatie Thackurdeen), Ellen Tiesi, John Twomey, Richard Twomey, William Twomey, Elizabeth Wohlforth, Billy Yuen, Gilma Yuen, Mary Zaremba, Barbara Zion Green, Jolaine Zuccala, Sandra Zuccala, Kaylene Zuccala-Sams..(Kreindler, James)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1572 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David Bruce(Personal Representative of the Estate of Diane Bruce, Deceased, surviving Parent of Mark Bruce, Deceased), Donna Caballero(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Rose Lang, Deceased, surviving Parent of Rosanne Lang, Deceased), Donna Caballero(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of William Lang, Deceased, surviving Parent of Rosanne Lang, Deceased), Elizabeth Crawford(Personal Representative of the Estate of James Crawford, Deceased, surviving Parent of James Crawford Jr, Deceased), Mary Curran(Personal Representative of the Estate of Ada Pascuma, Deceased, surviving Parent of Michael Pascuma Jr, Deceased), Mary Curran(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Pascuma, Deceased, surviving Parent of Michael Pascuma Jr, Deceased), Daniel Dean, Joanne Fletcher(Personal Representative of the Estate of Marie Hunchak, Deceased, surviving Sibling of Andrew La Corte, Deceased), Zhanna Galperina(Personal Representative of the Estate of Alexander Zaltsman, Deceased, surviving Parent of Arkady Zaltsman, Deceased), Zhanna Galperina(Personal Representative of the Estate of Faina Zaltsman, Deceased, surviving Parent of Arkady Zaltsman, Deceased), Barbara Green, Larry Hawk(Personal Representative of the Estate of Phyllis Hawk, Deceased, surviving Parent of Kathleen Nicosia, Deceased), Alan James(Personal Representative of the Estate of Howard James, Deceased, surviving Parent of Katherine Wolf, Deceased), Alan James(Personal Representative of the Estate of Valerie James, Deceased, surviving Parent of Katherine Wolf, Deceased), James Lang(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of William Lang, Deceased, surviving Parent of Rosanne Lang, Deceased), James Lang(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Rose Lang, Deceased, surviving Parent of Rosanne Lang, Deceased), Mary Mercado(Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Mercado, Jr, Deceased, surviving Sibling of Steve Mercado, Deceased), Mary Mercado(Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Mercado, Sr, Deceased, surviving Parent of Steve Mercado, Deceased), Melissa Nussbaum, Sean Passananti(Personal Representative of the Estate of Marie Passananti, Deceased, surviving Parent of Horace Passananti, Deceased), Martin Rambousek(Personal Representative of the Estate of Jindra Rambousek, Deceased, surviving Parent of Lukas Rambousek, Deceased), Martin Rambousek(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Rambousek, Deceased, surviving Parent of Lukas Rambousek, Deceased), Isabel Reyes(Personal Representative of the Estate of Clementina Reyes, Deceased, surviving Parent of Eduvigis Reyes Jr, Deceased), Fred Searby, Lawan Srinuan(Personal Representative of the Estate of Chaleramcha Srinuan, Deceased, surviving Parent of Saranya Srinuan, Deceased)..(Kreindler, James)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1571 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Steven R. Pounian re: in response to ECF No. 7433 on behalf of the Ashton plaintiffs. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Pounian, Steven)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1570 ORDER: If plaintiffs believe there is reason to resume activity in York, they may file a motion detailing the grounds for its continued viability. Otherwise, amendments and other activity should be docketed to the general MDL docket, No. 03-md-1570 and, as necessary, the appropriate active individual case (e.g., Ashton). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/8/2021) (ras)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1569 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Capone, Dorothea)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1568 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Capone, Dorothea)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1567 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Capone, Dorothea)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1566 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Capone, Dorothea)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1565 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Capone, Dorothea)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1564 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Capone, Dorothea)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1563 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Capone, Dorothea)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1562 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Capone, Dorothea)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1561 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Capone, Dorothea)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1560 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Capone, Dorothea)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1559 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Capone, Dorothea)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1558 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/2/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1557 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/2/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1556 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/1/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1555 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1554 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/29/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1553 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/29/2021 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/6/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1552 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/28/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1551 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/28/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/6/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1550 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/28/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/6/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
October 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1549 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/29/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
October 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1548 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/29/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1547 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated October 8, 2021 re: The nine judgments entered by the Court on October 5, 2021. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Eubanks, John)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1546 FINAL ORDER OF JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF ASHTON 21 PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: It is hereby; ORDERED that service of process was effected upon Iran in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1608(a) for sovereign defendants and 28 U.S.C. 1608(b) for agencies and instrumentalities of sovereign defendants; ORDERED that final judgment is entered against Iran and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Ashton, as identified in the attached Exhibits A-1 and A-2, who are each an immediate family member of individuals killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as indicated in Exhibits A-1 and A-2, and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A-1 and A-2 are awarded: solatium damages in the amount as set forth in Exhibits A-1 and A-2; and it is ORDERED that the Ashton Plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A-1 and A-2 are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A-1 and A-2 may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue, and it is ORDERED that the remaining Ashton Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibits A-1 or A-2, may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent they are for solatium or by estates for compensatory damages for decedents pain and suffering from the September 11 attacks, they will be approved consistent with those approved herein for the Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibits A-1 and A-2. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/5/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN (ks)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1545 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENTS: ORDERED that Anaya Plaintiffs, except Tracy Anne Larkey, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robin Blair Larkey, Nicholas Blair Larkey, Oliver Robin Larkey, and William James Larkey, having established their claims against the Islamic Republic of Iran under 28 U.S.C. Section 1605A(c) by evidence satisfactory to the Court and there being no just reason for delay, their Motion for Judgment by Default Against the Islamic Republic of Iran is hereby GRANTED and partial final judgment on liability is entered in favor of Anaya Plaintiffs except Tracy Anne Larkey, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Robin Blair Larkey, Nicholas Blair Larkey, Oliver Robin Larkey, and WilliamJames Larkey and against the Islamic Republic of Iran; ORDERED that, there being no just reason for delay, partial final judgment is entered against the Islamic Republic of Iran and in favor of those Anaya Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each the spouse, parent, child, sibling, or the estate of a parent or child, of an individual killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, for solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and $4,250,000 per sibling as set forth in Exhibit A; ORDERED that, there being no just reason for delay, partial final judgment is entered against the Islamic Republic of Iran and in favor of those Anaya Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit B, who are each the personal representative of the estate of an individual killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, for compensatory damages for the decedent's pain and suffering in the amount of $2,000,000 as set forth in Exhibit B; ORDERED that those Anaya Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibits A and Bare awarded prejudgment interest on the damages hereby awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of this judgment; ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibits A and B may submit applications for economic, punitive or other damages, to the extent such awards have not previously been addressed, at a later date consistent with any future rulings of this Court; ORDERED that Anaya Plaintiffs Donovan Lanham, Gary Lanham, and Jasmine Lanham, who are each step-children of Michael W. Lowe who was killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, may submit applications for judgments for solatium, punitive or other damages at a later date. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/05/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN (ama) (Main Document 1545 replaced on 10/25/2021) (ks).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1544 ORDER OF PARTIAL FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT., Motions terminated: #1426 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton XXI Wrongful Death Plaintiffs. filed by Kathleen Ashton, #1434 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton XXII Wrongful Death Plaintiffs. filed by Kathleen Ashton, #1466 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton 23 Wrongful Death Plaintiff. filed by Kathleen Ashton. Upon consideration of the evidence and arguments submitted by Plaintiffs in the above-captionedHugh A. Chairnoff et al. v. Islamic Republic of/ran, 1:18-cv-12370 (GBD) (SN) (the "Chairnoff (Plaintiffs") through their Motion for (1) Judgment by Default as to Liability of the Islamic Republic of Iran pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1605A(c), and (2) Partial Final Judgments for Solatium and Pain and Suffering Damages for Certain Plaintiffs, and the evidence filed in theabove-captioned multi district litigation on May 19, 2011, July 13, 2011 and August 19, 2011, and the evidence presented at the December 15, 2011 hearing on liability, together with the entire record in this case, it is hereby; ORDERED that Chairnoff,(Plaintiffs' except Isabel Nimbley having established their claims against the Islamic Republic of Iran under 28 U.S.C. Section 1605A(c) by evidencesatisfactory to the Court and there being no just reason for delay, their Motion for Judgment by Default Against the Islamic Republic of Iran is hereby GRANTED and partial final judgment on liability is entered in favor of Chairnoff (Plaintiffs except Isabel Nimbley and against the Islamic Republic of Iran; and it is ORDERED that, there being no just reason for delay, partial final judgment is entered against the Islamic Republic of Iran and in favor of those Chairnoff Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are each the spouse, parent, child, or sibling ( or the estate of a parent)of an individual killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, are awarded solatium damages of $12,500,000 per spouse, $8,500,000 per parent, $8,500,000 per child, and$4,250,000 per sibling as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that those Chairnoff Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest on the damages hereby awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of this judgment; and it is ORDERED that, there being no just reason for delay, partial final judgment awarding compensatory damages for decedent's pain and suffering in the amount of $2,000,000 is entered against the Islamic Republic of Iran and in favor of the Estate of Geoffrey E. Guja, together with prejudgment interest thereon to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of this judgment; and it isORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A and the Estate of Geoffrey E. Guja may submit applications for economic, punitive or other damages, to the extent such awards have not previously been addressed, at a later date consistent with any future rulings of this Court; and it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs Angel Anderson, Aishah Anderson and Michele M. Nimbley, and Plaintiff Debra Guja, acting on behalf of the stepchildren of decedent Geoffrey E. Guja, may submit applications for judgments for solatium damages at a later date. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/5/2021) (ks) (Main Document 1544 replaced on 10/26/2021) (kv).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1543 FIINAL ORDER OF JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF ASHTON 23 PLAINTIFF IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that service of process was effected upon Iran in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1608(a) for sovereign defendants; ORDERED that final judgment is entered against Iran and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Ashton, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who is the immediate family members of an individual killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as described in Exhibit A; ORDERED that Plaintiff identified in Exhibit A is awarded: solatium damages in the amount as set forth in Exhibit A; ORDERED that the Ashton Plaintiff identified in Exhibit A is awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; ORDERED that Plaintiff identified in Exhibit A may submit an application for punitive damages, economic damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered) at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue; and it is ORDERED that the remaining Ashton Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A, may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent they are for solatium or by estates for compensatory damages for decedents' pain and suffering from the September 11, 2001 attacks, they will be approved consistent with those approved herein for the Plaintiff appearing on Exhibit A. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/05/2021) (ama)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1542 FINAL ORDER OF JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF ASHTON 22 PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that service of process was effected upon Iran in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1608(a) for sovereign defendants; ORDERED that final judgment is entered against Iran and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Ashwn, as identified in the attached who are the Personal Representatives of the estates of victims killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as described in Exhibit A; ORDERED that Plaintiffs, on behalf of the estates identified in Exhibit A, are awarded economic damages as set forth in Exhibit A and as supported by the expert reports and analyses submitted as Exhibit C of the Declaration of James P. Kreindler, Esq.; ORDERED that Plaintiffs, on behalf of the estates identified in Exhibit A, are awarded final damages judgments that include the economic loss listed in Exhibit A as well as compensatory damages for decedents' pain and suffering in an amount of $2,000,000 per estate, with the final damages judgment set forth in Exhibit A; ORDERED that the Ashton Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment; ORDERED that Plaintit1s identified in Exhibit A may submit an application for punitive damages, or other damages (to the extent such awards have not previously been ordered), at a later date consistent with any future rulings made by this Court on this issue; and it is ORDERED that the remaining Ashton Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A, may submit in later stages applications for damages awards, and to the extent they are for solatium or by estates for compensatory damages for decedents' pain and suffering from the September 11, 2001 attacks, they will be approved consistent with those approved herein for other plaintiffs in this action, including the Plaintiffs appearing on Exhibit A. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/05/2021) (ama) (Main Document 1542 replaced on 10/25/2021) (ama).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1541 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Megan Wolfe Benett on behalf of Kreindler & Kreindler dated 10/05/2021 re: ECF No. 7167. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1540 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Megan Wolfe Benett on behalf of Kreindler & Kreindler dated 10/04/2021 re: Letter and Declarations in response to ECF No. 7165. Document filed by FBI, Plaintiffs Executive Committees, Dallah Avco Trans Arabia, Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Consultant Declaration)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SNMotion or Order to File Under Seal: 1900 .(Benett, Megan)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1538 ORDER denying as moot #1531 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. This motion is DENIED as moot in light of the Court's prior grant of identical Letters Rogatory at ECF NO. 7153 on the main MDL docket. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) (ras)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1537 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Megan Wolfe Benett on behalf of Kreindler & Kreindler dated 09/30/2021 re: ECF No. 7157, 7147, 7082.. Document filed by Dallah Avco Trans Arabia, FBI, Plaintiffs Executive Committees, Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Declaration)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SNMotion or Order to File Under Seal: 1900 .(Benett, Megan)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1536 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Megan Wolfe Benett on behalf of Kreindler & Kreindler dated 09/30/2021 re: ECF No. 7157, 7147, 7082.. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1539 ORDER granting (7144) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (53) Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory in case 1:20-cv-00266-GBD-SN. The plaintiffs in Ryan et al., v. Iran et al., No. 20-cv-00266 (GBD)(SN) (Jan. 10. 2020) move for the issuance of Letters Rogatory to the Islamic Republic of Iran. ECF No. 7144. That motion is GRANTED. The Court respectfully directs the Clerk of the Court to issue Letters Rogatory directed to the Islamic Republic of Iran, substantially similar in form to those attached as EXHIBIT A to the Plaintiffs' Motion (ECF No. 7144-1), requesting assistance in serving the Complaint in this matter and the necessary accompanying documents, upon the following defendants: (1) National Iranian Tanker Corporation; (2) National Iranian Oil Corporation; (3) National Iranian Gas Corporation; (4) National Iranian Petrochemical Company; (5) Iran Airlines; (6) Hezbollah, (7) Ayatollah Ali Khamenei, Supreme Leader of Iran; and (8) the Estate of Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, former Chairman of the Expediency Discernment Counsel and former President of Iran.The Letters Rogatory and the accompanying legal documents, including any translations, related to the Complaint in this case shall be transmitted to the U.S. Department of State for delivery to the appropriate judicial authority of the Islamic Republic of Iran, pursuant to 1608(b)(3)(A). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/28/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (ras)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1535 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Megan Wolfe Benett on behalf of Kreindler & Kreindler dated 9/28/2021 re: Letter update re ECF No. 7147 and request to substitute Kreindler & Kreindler attorneys on CMO 3. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1534 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/14/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1533 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/14/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/19/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Moya, Goretti)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1532 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Megan Wolfe Benett on behalf of Kreindler & Kreindler dated 9/27/2021 re: in response to ECF No. 7082. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Kreindler Declaration, #2 Maloney Declaration, #3 Benett Declaration, #4 Pounian Declaration, #5 Simpson Declaration, #6 Hartney Declaration, #7 Pagan Declaration, #8 Sienski Declaration, #9 Ranieri Declaration, #10 Consultant 1 Under Seal Declaration, #11 Fawcett Under Seal Declaration)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1531 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory as to National Iranian Tanker Corporation; National Iranian Oil Corporation; National Iranian Gas Corporation; National Iranian Petrochemical Company; Iran Airlines; Hezbollah; Ayatollah Ali Khamenei, Supreme Leader of Iran; Estate of Akbar Hashemi Rafsanjani, former Chairman of the Expediency Discernment Counsel and former President of Iran in Switzerland for delivery to the Islamic Republic of Iran. Document filed by Patricia Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Memorandum of Law In Support, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Corr, Stephen)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1530 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from James P. Kreindler dated 09/09/2021 re: response to the Court's Order filed at ECF No. 7100. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1529 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Suit, Sudan Short Form Complaint deemed filed December 18, 2020, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act mailed to The Republic of Sudan, Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Gamma Street, Khartoum, Sudan on 08/20/2021 by Federal Express tracking # 7745 7985 8922, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20522, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(JKR)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1528 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation.2) a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 default judgment on liability with certified Farsi translation.3) a true and certified copy of the February 14, 2020 Memorandum Decision and Order (ECF Doc No. 5947), February 18, 2020 Partial Final Default Judgment (ECF Doc. No 5974) and the moving papers of Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers and a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran Iran on 02/28/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7778 0030 5219, as per (1295 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing, Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN(JKR)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1527 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for Notice of Suit, Summons, Complaint ECF notification, Complaint, Complaint Appendix, Civil Cover Sheet ECF notification, Civil Cover Sheet, Related Case Statement ECF notification and Related Case Statement (along with attached affidavit of translator and Farsi translations mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran on 06/22/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RB596281405US, as per (6289 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing, Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(JKR)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1526 ORDER:On June 23, 2021, the Court issued an order granting the Plaintiffs' Executive Committees' motion at ECF No. 6816. ECF No. 6872. That order was made under seal in light of some of the content in motions preceding that order. To increase public access to the docket and reduce the volume of material that must undergo redaction review, the Court now proposes to unseal the order at ECF No. 6872. If the parties have any objections to unsealing that order, those must be filed with the Court by July 9, 2021. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 7/9/2021) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/02/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ama)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1525 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Gavin Simpson on behalf of Kathleen Ashton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN.(Simpson, James)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1524 ORDER granting (6873) Motion re: (6873 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 21 to drop certain Plaintiffs in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. The Movants' Motion is GRANTED. Marie Laure Anaya, individually and as the personal representative of the estate of Calixto Anaya, Jr., Kristina-Marie Anaya, Brandon Michael Anaya, Rebecca Anaya, Elizabeth A. Emery, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Edgar H. Emery, Jr. and Brian K. Emery are dismissed as plaintiffs in Anaya et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran, 18-cv-12341 (GBD)(SN) (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 29, 2018), under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12341-GBD-SN. (ras)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1523 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Elizabeth Parks hereby voluntarily dismisses without prejudice her claims against the Defendant the Islamic Republic of Iran in the above-captioned Hugh A. Chairnoff, et al. v. hlamic Republic of Iran, 1:18-cv-12370(GBD)(SN). This Notice of Voluntary Dismissal is limited only to dismissing Plaintiff Elizabeth Parks from this action. All other Plaintiffs maintain and continue to prosecute their claims against the Defendant. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/9/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-12370-GBD-SN (mro)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1522 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Corrine Warnock, Anatoly Weiser, Darren Welty, J Whittaker, Lena Whittaker(parent of 9/11 decedent Karen Hagerty), Caryn Wiley, Andrew Williams, Craig Williams, Kathleen Williams, Kenneth Williams, Scott Williams, Keith Wiswall, Robert Wiswall, Amy Wiswall Edgington, Patricia Wodenshek, Raymond Wodenshek(sibling of 9/11 decedent Christopher Wodenshek), Florence Wodenshek Garrett, Lynn Wright, Lisa Wylie, Dawn Yamashiro, Michele Yaniz, Emily Yarembinsky, Misha Yoshida Gnazzo, Kjell Youngren, Nissa Youngren..(Kreindler, James)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1521 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Caterina Venuto, Salvatore Venuto, Theresa Vesnesky, Carlos Villa, Richard Villa(sibling of 9/11 decedent Sharon Millan), Caren Villarreal, Anthony Vincelli(sibling of 9/11 decedent Chantal Vincelli), Antonio Vincelli, Anthony Viola, Vincent Viola, Jr., Thomas Virgilio, Cathy Vranchas, Benhardt Wainio, Sarah Wainio, Thomas Wainio, Brian Wall, Gary Wall, Jean Wall, Kevin Wall, Dianne Walsh(sibling of 9/11 decedent Christine Barbuto), Joseph Walsh, Kevin Walsh, Kristin Walsh, Nancy Walsh(partner of 9/11 decedent Carol Flyzik), Gerald Warner..(Kreindler, James)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1520 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Pamela Trentini(child of 9/11 decedent Mary Trentini), Patti Trentini(child of 9/11 decedent James Trentini), Patti Trentini(child of 9/11 decedent Mary Trentini), James Trentini, II(child of 9/11 decedent James Trentini), James Trentini, II(child of 9/11 decedent Mary Trentini), Jason Tucker, Karen Tucker, James Tumulty, Shawn Tumulty, Kathy Ugalde, Diane Ugolyn, Trevor Ugolyn, Victor Ugolyn(parent of 9/11 decedent Tyler Ugolyn), Michael Uman, Feliciana Umanzor(parent of 9/11 decedent Elsy Osorio), Katherine Umanzor, Anthony Umanzor, Jr., Eileen Valiente, Brandon Valvo, Carlton Valvo(parent of 9/11 decedent Carlton Valvo, II), Trenton Valvo, Elizabeth Van Duyne, Mary Vatalaro(child of 9/11 decedent James Trentini), Mary Vatalaro(child of 9/11 decedent Mary Trentini), Margarita Vazquez..(Kreindler, James)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1519 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rosaleen Tallon-Daros, Allan Tarasiewicz, Samantha Taylor, Rebecca Taylor Wynne, Evelyn Tepedino, Leland Terry, Tania Terry, Janice Testagrose, Raj Thackurdeen(sibling of 9/11 decedent Goumatie Thackurdeen), Marie Thomas, Joseph Tiesi, Barbara Tirado, Rafael Tirado, Richard Tirado, Dean Torres, Denise Torres, Richard Torres, Dawn Torres-Brown, Marie Tortorici, Kevin Trant, Matthew Trant, Maureen Trant, Sally Trant, Timothy Trant, Pamela Trentini(child of 9/11 decedent James Trentini)..(Kreindler, James)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1518 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Della-Ann Spadafora, Lawan Srinuan(parent of 9/11 decedent Saranya Srinuan), Brian Stack, Michael Stack, Daniel Stan(sibling of 9/11 decedent Alexandru Stan), Irwin Steinman, Laura Steinman, Linda Steinman, Susan Steinman Kelleher, Antoinette Steo, Marilyn Stufano, Angelic Suarez, Joanne Sullivan, Suzanne Swaine(sibling of 9/11 decedent John Reo), Edward Sweeney, Mary Sweeney, Matthew Sweeney, Cheryl Taback, Lori Taback, Tracy Taback Catalano, Andrew Taddei, Loretta Taddei, Mary Taddei(child of 9/11 decedent Norma Taddei), Hiroyuki Takahashi, Eileen Tallon(parent of 9/11 decedent Sean Tallon)..(Kreindler, James)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1517 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Julia Sears, Evelyn Sekzer(parent of 9/11 decedent Jason Sekzer), Marc Sekzer, Anna Sereno, Jason Seymour, John Seymour, Leonor Shahid, Syed Shahid, Beniamin Shamay, Gabriel Shamay, Simon Shamay, Lori Shapiro, Evelyn Shulman(parent of 9/11 decedent Mark Shulman), Lawrence Shulman, Dhanraj Singh, Dhanraj Singh, Liza Sloan, Barbara Smith, LaKimmie Smith, Donna Smollen, Christopher Snyder, Barbara Sohan(parent of 9/11 decedent Astrid Sohan), Maria Somogyi, Terri Sondak, Anne Sorge..(Kreindler, James)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1516 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Patricia Ryan, Paul Ryan, Robert Ryan, Robert Ryan, William Ryan, Dae Jin Ryook, Roni Salkin, Clarence Sam, Dhanmatee Sam(parent of 9/11 decedent Rena Dinnoo), Gina Sam, Lisa Sam, Jeffrey Santo, Michael Santo(sibling of 9/11 decedent Susan Santo), Carlos Santos, John Sarle, Barbara Scaramuzzino(parent of 9/11 decedent Nicholas Rossomando), Salvatore Scauso, Kenneth Schielke, Jessica Schoenholtz Murphy, Nichole Scochemaro, Elisabeth Scott, James Scullin(child of 9/11 decedent Arthur Scullin), James Scullin(sibling of 9/11 decedent Arthur Scullin), Nora Scullin, Arthur Scullin, Jr...(Kreindler, James)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1515 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lisa Richards Keston, Marilyn Rimmele, Frederick Rimmele, Jr., Alphonso Rodgers, Jr., Brunilda Rodriguez(parent of 9/11 decedent Anthony Rodriguez), Celina Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Janet Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Peter Rodriguez, Ticey Rosario, Fern Rosenbaum, Martin Rosenbaum(parent of 9/11 decedent Brooke Rosenbaum), Philip Rosenblatt(sibling of 9/11 decedent Muriel Siskopoulos), Adam Rosenblum, Richard Rosenblum, Allan Rosenzweig, Irene Ross, Marshall Ross, Christine Rothschild, Gilbert Ruiz, Jr., Theresa Ruther, Deena Ryan, Francis Ryan, Marie Ryan(sibling of 9/11 decedent Emeric Harvey)..(Kreindler, James)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1514 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Judith Dalton, Tricia Marsala, Christopher Wren(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia Wren, deceased Spouse of William Wren), William Wren (Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia Wren, deceased Spouse of William Wren). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1513 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Clive Hopwood(Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Hopwood, deceased Parent of Dinah Webster), Clive Hopwood(Personal Representative of the Estate of Sonia Hopwood, deceased Parent of Dinah Webster), Andrew Petisce, Aleene Voskerijian, Isabelle Voskerijian, Zabel Voskerijian, Zaree Voskerijian, Mary Louise Waldie Klimm, Meredith Waldie Witherspoon, Jane Waldie Wrenshall, Carol Waldie, Jeffrey Waldie, Jonathan Waldie, Zoe Webster Ghirarduzzi, Philip Nicholas Webster, Marcia Weiss, Allison Noble Works, Dorothea Wotton, Jean Wotton, Jean Wotton(Personal Representative of the Estate of Stewart Wotton, deceased Parent of Rodney Wotton), Rodney Wotton, Christopher Wren(Individually as Child), Christopher Wren(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of William Wren, Deceased), William Wren (Individually as Child), William Wren (Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of William Wren, Deceased). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1512 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Danielle Taddonio Miscioscia, Michael Taddonio, Jr, Nicole Taddonio, Richard Taddonio, Lisa Crowe, Teresa Martin, Elizabeth Brian Terrenzi Spring, Jane Terrenzi-Spring(Individually as Spouse), Jane Terrenzi-Spring(Personal Representative of the Estate of Brian Terrenzi, Deceased), Sharon Thorpe Hanson, Gregory Todisco, Lisa Debarbrie, Emily Tompsett, Taylor Tucker, Gaffney Tucker, Alexandra Tucker, Morgan Tucker, Liam Vauk, Meaghan Vauk, Patricia Vauk, Dennis Vauk, Teresa Masterson, Lynne Caba, Christine Vianna Tenaglia, Shont Voskerijian. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1511 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Jennifer Fosburgh(Individually as Sibling), Jennifer Fosburgh(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Hayes, deceased Sibling of Robert Spencer), Christina L. Kminek, Christopher Kminek, Frank Kminek, Jr., Frank Kminek, Sr, Stacy Lupcho, Elizabeth Richardson, Frank Song, Hyungshin Song, Julie Song, Addison Spencer, Kathryn Spencer, Michael Spencer, Michael Spencer(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Hayes, deceased Sibling of Robert Spencer), Robert Spencer, Susan Spencer-Craig, Hans Ulrich Sutter(Personal Representative of the Estate of Seline Sutter, Deceased), Hans Ulrich Sutter(Personal Representative of the Estate of Selina Sutter Derrer, deceased Parent of Seline Sutter), Hans Ulrich Sutter(Individually as Sibling), Marc Taddonio(Individually as Sibling), Marc Taddonio(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Josephine Taddonio, deceased Parent of Michael Taddonio), Marc Taddonio(Personal Representative of the Estate of Richard Taddonio, deceased Parent of Michael Taddonio), Richard Taddonio(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Josephine Taddonio, deceased Parent of Michael Taddonio). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1510 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by James Rand, Lisa Rand, Mary Ann Rand, Beth Rasweiler-Griffin, Christopher Reda, Frank Reda, John Reda, James Reed, Albert Regenhard, Catherine Regenhard, Elizabeth Rego(parent of 9/11 decedent Leah Oliver), Susan Reidlinger, William Reilly, Armand Reo, Judith Reo, Mark Reo, Armando Reyes, Enoel Reyes, Isabel Reyes(sibling of 9/11 decedent Eduvigis Reyes, Jr.), Luz Reyes, Nemesio Reyes, Aidaline Reyes Concepcion, Nydia Reyes Rodriguez, Carol Richards, Paul Richards..(Kreindler, James)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1509 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Jill Abbott, Eugenia Bogado, Ellen Brotman, Susan Brotman, Richard Champion(Individually as Sibling), Richard Champion(Personal Representative of the Estate of Hubert Champion, deceased Parent of Marjorie Salamone), Richard Champion(Personal Representative of the Estate of Lillian Champion, deceased Parent of Marjorie Salamone), Amanda Olcott, John Salerno, Antoinetta Salvaterra, Carmen Salvaterra, Christian Salvaterra, Gabrielle Salvaterra, Isabelle Salvaterra, Luis Samaniego, Cameron Silverstein, Gabrielle Silverstein, Laurie Simowitz, Daniel Slattery, Linda Slattery, Erin Slattery-Appelle, George Smith, Judy Smith, Yongjin Song, Carrie Spero. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1508 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Janet Berns, Debra Godwin, Marcy Ilena Godwin, Ruth Godwin, Jason Hochman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Marilyn Reich, deceased Spouse of Howard Reich), Nancy Holzhauer, Kara Marie Irvine, Stuart Irvine, Tracy Janess, Jeremy Punches, Joseph Quinn, Michael T. Quinn, Noreen Quinn, Sharon Reich(Individually as Sibling), Sharon Reich(Personal Representative of the Estate of Howard Reich, Deceased), Daniel Riches, Rita Riches, Thomas Riches, Timothy Riches, Lara Ropiteau Davis, Jean-Marc Ropiteau, Barbara Ropiteau-Galloway, Ann Marie Santillo, Michelle Schleider, Wendy Irvine Toomey. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1507 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Megan Pezzuti-Pelino, Kevin Phillips, David Pickford, Linda Pickford(parent of 9/11 decedent Christopher Pickford), Nancy Picone(sibling of 9/11 decedent Arturo Sereno), Faygee Piller, Madeline Placek Zinzi, Bernard Polatsch, Daniel Polatsch, Bernadette Princiotta (sibling of 9/11 decedent Vincent Princiotta), Linda Pritchard, Chaya Protovin, Kathleen Psirogianes, Janna Pulver, Mark Puopolo, Sonia Puopolo, Leah Quigley, Patricia Quigley(spouse of 9/11 decedent Patrick Quigley), Rachel Quigley, Edward Radburn, Catherine Raddatz, Melissa Raggio-Granato, Gregory Rakovsky, Martin Rambousek(sibling of 9/11 decedent Lukas Rambousek), Yvonne Ramirez..(Kreindler, James)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1506 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Bettina Palazzo Grunke, Barbara Palazzo Sulliman, Elda Palma, Marianne Panicola, Lula Parker, Melissa Pascuma, Michael Passananti, Sean Passananti(child of 9/11 decedent Horace Passananti), Kalpana Patel, Kantilal Patel, Parul Patel, Theresa Paterson, Maria Paulino, Ana Paz Gutierrez, Jose Paz Gutierrez, Julia Paz Gutierrez, Daniel Pelletier, Lillian Pelletier, Marcel Pelletier, Ronald Pelletier, Karen Perez, Maureen Petronis, Frank Pezzuti(parent of 9/11 decedent Kaleen Pezzuti), Frank Pezzuti(sibling of 9/11 decedent Kaleen Pezzuti), Kathleen Pezzuti..(Kreindler, James)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1505 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Corinne Krachtus(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of James Pouletsos, deceased Parent of Daphne Pouletsos), Corinne Krachtus(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Irene Pouletsos, deceased Parent of Daphne Pouletsos), Corinne Krachtus(Individually as Sibling), Elaine Miller(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of James Pouletsos, deceased Parent of Daphne Pouletsos), Elaine Miller(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Irene Pouletsos, deceased Parent of Daphne Pouletsos), Elaine Miller(Individually as Sibling), James Panatier, Anna Patterson, Kevin Patterson, Kevin Patterson, Kevin Patterson, Scott Patterson, Anne Pelino, Bennett Pelino, Douglas Pelino, Matthew Pelino, Maureen Pelino, Megan Pelino, Terrence Pelino, Steven Pollicino, Jennifer Punches Botta, Janice Kay Punches, Celeste Rose, Vicki Tureski (Personal Representative of the Estate of Steve Pollicino, Deceased), Vicki Tureski (Personal Representative of the Estate of Jane Pollicino, deceased Spouse of Steve Pollicino). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1504 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Mary Duff(Individually as Spouse), Mary Duff(Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Ortale, Deceased), Catherine Grimes(Individually as Sibling), John Hogan(Personal Representative of the Estate of Jean Palombo, deceased Spouse of Frank Palombo), Catherine Grimes(Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Ortale, deceased Parent of Peter Ortale), Mary Malitas, Gilbert Ortale, Julie Ortale, Alexandra Ortiz Reszka(Individually as Child), Alexandra Ortiz Reszka(Personal Representative of the Estate of Sonia Ortiz, Deceased), Luis Ortiz, Victor Ortiz, Maria Palombo Suazo, Anthony Palombo, Daniel Palombo, Frank Palombo, John Palombo, Joseph Palombo(Individually as Child), Joseph Palombo(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank Palombo, Deceased), Margaret Palombo, Patrick Palombo, Stephen Palombo, Thomas Palombo, Annie Panatier, Christopher Panatier. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1503 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Donald Oliver, James Oliver, Theodore Oliver, Walter Oliver, Brigid O'Neill Lamon, Katherine O'Neill Wilson, Catherine Ong, Gloria Ong, Yee Ong, Harry Ong, Jr., Eduardo Ornedo, Mario Ornedo, Robin Ornedo, Sheila Ornedo, Sheila Ornstein(sibling of 9/11 decedent Andrew Rosenblum), Jane Oswald, Kenneth Oswald, Jennifer Oswald-Chen, Caroline Otero(sibling of 9/11 decedent Edward Calderon), Vanessa Pabon, Angel Pabon, II, Mary Padilla, Irene Palazzo, Philip Palazzo, Richard Palazzo..(Kreindler, James)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1502 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mary Novotny(parent of 9/11 decedent Brian Novotny), Michael Novotny, Robert Novotny, William Novotny(sibling of 9/11 decedent Brian Novotny), Craig Nussbaum, Joan O'Brien(sibling of 9/11 decedent John Iskyan), Steven O'Brien, Charlene O'Connor, Christopher O'Connor, William O'Connor(sibling of 9/11 decedent Richard O'Connor), William O'Connor(sibling of 9/11 decedent Dennis O'Connor, Jr.), Dennis O'Connor, Sr., Maura O'Doherty Lee, Theresa O'Gara, Barbara O'gorman, James O'Grady, Sara O'Grady, Kristin O'Grady Evans, Desiree Okseniuk, Anthony Oliva, Audrey Olive, Barbara Oliver, Dale Oliver, Daniel Oliver, Donald Oliver..(Kreindler, James)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1501 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lindsey Murdock, Angela Murolo, Angelo Murolo, Dominick Murolo, Lori-Jean Murphy, Leticia Muszel, Enrica Naccarato, Richard Naiman, Russell Naiman, Edward Navarro(parent of 9/11 decedent Karen Navarro), Elizabeth Navarro, Sharon Navarro, Thomas Neary, III, Mary Nicholson(child of 9/11 decedent Mary Shearer), Mary Nicholson(child of 9/11 decedent Robert Shearer), George Nicosia, Patricia Noah, Avraham Noeth, Anne Noonan, Ashley Noonan, Kelly Noonan, Walter Noonan, Anne Noonan Robertson, Daniel Novotny, Kevin Novotny..(Kreindler, James)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1500 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mary Mercado(parent of 9/11 decedent Steve Mercado), Elizabeth Merkouris(parent of 9/11 decedent George Merkouris), Meghan Metzemaekers, Kimberly Meyer, Antonia Micko, Anna Milewska, Kamila Milewska-Podejma, Frederyk Milewski, Christina Millan, Mauricio Millan, Amber Miller(child of 9/11 decedent Karen Juday), Edward Miller, Jamie Miller(child of 9/11 decedent Karen Juday), Wayne Miller(sibling of 9/11 decedent Henry Miller, Jr.), Mark Morell, Rita Morell Shea, Harvey Morgenstern, Howard Morgenstern, Jeffrey Morgenstern, Suri Morgenstern, Brian Moroney, Kevin Moroney, Michael Moroney, Laura Morrison(child of 9/11 decedent Muriel Siskopoulos), Christopher Motroni..(Kreindler, James)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1499 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by William McCarthy(sibling of 9/11 decedent Michael McCarthy), Virginia McDermott, Wendy McEneany, Constance Mcginley, Dennis Mcginley, Martin Mcginley, Michael Mcginley, Thomas Mcginley, James McGinnis, Patricia Mcginnis-Daly, Erin McGinty James, Elizabeth McGovern, Lawrence Mcgovern, Theresa McGovern(child of 9/11 decedent Ann McGovern), Dallas Mckinney(sibling of 9/11 decedent Darryl Mckinney), Ann McLaughlin, Dorothy McLaughlin, George McLaughlin, Linda McLaughlin, Sheri McLaughlin, Joseph McNulty, Dennis McSweeney, Malka Melamed, Pamela Melton, Anthony Mercado..(Kreindler, James)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1498 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Felice Marrow, John Martin, Paul Martin, Susan Martin, Cathleen Martineau, Edward Martineau, Ronnah Martineau, Irma Martinez, Juan Martinez, Jr., Juan Martinez, Sr., Patricia Marzocchi, Arsen Mayer, Kevin Maynard, Pearl Maynard, Vernon Maynard, Ann Mcalary, Bryan Mcalary, John Mcalary, Carolyn McAllister, Betty Ann Mccarthy, Chris McCarthy, Dennis McCarthy, Lauren McCarthy, Margaret Mccarthy, William McCarthy(parent of 9/11 decedent Michael McCarthy)..(Kreindler, James)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1497 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Teresa Danko, Marianne Merritt, Joseph Morrison, Maureen Morrison, Daniel Moy, Jessica Moy, Madeline Lew Moy, Kelly-Ann Mullan, Patrick Mullan(Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Mullan, deceased Parent of Michael Mullan), Patrick Mullan(Personal Representative of the Estate of Theresa Mullan, deceased Parent of Michael Mullan), Hajdije Naples, Barbara Newton, Michael L. Newton, Michael S. Newton, Sarah Newton, Stephen A. Newton, Mark Newton-Carter, Christine O'Berg Connolly, Dennis O'Berg, Dorothy O'Berg, Michelle Orth Ankenman(Individually as Child), Michelle Orth Ankenman(Personal Representative of the Estate of Jane Marie Orth, Deceased), Daniel Orth, Elizabeth Orth, Ann-Elizabeth Rueppel. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1496 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Erin Day, Beverly DeFazio, Craig DeFazio, Jeffrey DeFazio, Lawrence DeFazio, Mary Jane Maounis(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Constance Maounis, deceased Parent of James Maounis), Mary Jane Maounis(Individually as Sibling), Mary Jane Maounis(Individually), Mary Jane Maounis(Personal Representative of the Estate of James Maounis, Deceased), Mary Jane Maounis(Personal Representative of the Estate of Nicholas Maounis, deceased Parent of James Maounis), William Maounis(Individually as Sibling), William Maounis(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Constance Maounis, deceased Parent of James Maounis), James Martello, Sheila Martello, Thomas Martello, Collin McHale, Nicholas McLaughlin, Brienne McNally, Elizabeth McNally, Shannon McNally, Joseph Mickley, Marie Mickley, Arjan Mirpuri, Agnes Moran(Individually as Sibling), Agnes Moran(Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathleen Moran, Deceased), Agnes Moran(Personal Representative of the Estate of Catherine Moran, deceased Parent of Kathleen Moran). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1495 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Dowdell, Matthew Dowdell, William Dowdell, Sara Maloney Duval, Brian Lynch, Kieran Lynch, Kerry Magee, Kevin Magee(Individually as Sibling), Kevin Magee(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Edith Magee, deceased Parent of Brian Magee), Shane Magee(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Edith Magee, deceased Parent of Brian Magee), Valerie Magee(Individually as Spouse), Valerie Magee(Personal Representative of the Estate of Brian Magee, Deceased), Edward Maloney, II, Mark Maloney, Mason Maloney, Sally Maloney, Teddy Maloney, Catherine Manning, Mairead Manning, Philip Manning, Philip Manning(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Gertrude Manning, deceased Parent of Terence John Manning), Sean Manning, Sean Manning(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Gertrude Manning, deceased Parent of Terence John Manning), Trinity Manning. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1494 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Deborah Loeffler, Jenny Lopez, Marie Lukas, David Lun, Mary Lynch, Cathy Lynn Birch, Leigh Macadlo, Anne MacFarlane(parent of 9/11 decedent Marianne MacFarlane), George Macfarlane, Joseph Macfarlane, Patricia Madamas, Andrea Maffeo(sibling of 9/11 decedent Jennieann Maffeo), Joseph Maffeo, Julie Magliulo, Kristin Maguire, Annette Mair, Lloyd Mair, Irene Mair Wells, Patricia Malatesta, Kelly Manzi, Ann Marcelliano, Anthony Marchese, Lorraine Marchese, Cathy Marchese-Collins, Patricia Marrese..(Kreindler, James)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1493 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ellen Lassman, Ira Lassman, Laura Lassman, Jeanne Lawler, Nathan Leaflight, Carolyn Leblanc, John LeBlanc, Paul LeBlanc, Philip Lee, Jeanette Legro, Maria Legro, Juan Legro Diaz, Elaine Leinung(parent of 9/11 decedent Paul Battaglia), Eric Leinung, John Leinung, Kristen Leinung, Jean Lembo, Susan Lenoir, Elizabeth Leonardi, Andrew Leveen, Margaret Leveen, Jeffrey Leveen, Jr., Cynthia Lewis, John Lewis, Melvin Lewis..(Kreindler, James)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1492 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Alison M. Kinney Lewandowski, August Larsen, Brenda Larsen, Marisa Larsen, Scott Larsen, Dennis Levi, Linda Litto, Catherine Litto-Petras, Ellen Lynch, Grace Lynch, Kieran Lynch, Lorraine Lynch, Mary Rose Lynch, Olivia Lynch, Rosetta Lynch, Sean Lynch, Jr., Christina Lynch-Burgdorf, Stephen Massell(Personal Representative of the Estate of Rosanne Lang, Deceased), Joseph J. Reitano, Joseph J. Reitano, Kimberly Rex, Michael Rogers, Kristen Serra. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1491 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Meghan Deming, Alex Iskenderian, Jason Iskenderian, Dohee Kang, Jee Won Kang, Joon Hee Kang, Frederick Kelley, Sean Kelley, Sean Kelley(Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary Kelley, deceased Parent of Frederick Kelley), Alexis Kolpak, Thaddeus Kolpak, Marina Kovalcin, Rebecca Kovalcin, Anna Kren(Personal Representative of the Estate of Marian Kren, deceased Parent of John Kren), Anna Kren(Individually as Spouse), Paula Lang(Individually as Parent), Paula Lang(Personal Representative of the Estate of William Lang, III, deceased Sibling of Rosanne Lang), Paula Lang(Personal Representative of the Estate of William Lang, III, deceased Parent of Brendan Lang), Sean Lang, Kerby Laurent, Shanna Lewis, Kristen Roberts, Andrea Sassone, Katherine Kelley Van Kirk, Janine Wentworth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1490 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Anne Earthman Salonia, Damien Earthman, Angeline Gomez, Blanca Gomez, Teresa Gomez, Enrique Gomez, Melissa Gomez, Cosimo Granitto (Individually as Parent), Cosimo Granitto (Personal Representative of the Estate of Anna Granitto, deceased Parent of Elvira Granitto), Filippa Granitto, Mario Granitto, Catherine Heller, Grace Heller, Howard Heller, John Heller, Mary Jean Heller, Michael Heller, Roberta Heller, Kara Iskenderian, Meryl Iskenderian, Mary Beth Luedtke, Colleen Rastovich, Joann Soto, Joanna Tirone, Sandra Munro. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1489 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Harrison Scott Brown, Kyle Peter Brown, Wesley Fetchet, Beverly Finnegan, Bridget Finnegan, Francis Finnegan, Frank J. Finnegan, Katherine Finnegan, Michael Finnegan, Colleen Fitzsimons, Patrick Fitzsimons, Robert Fitzsimons, Sean Fitzsimons, Barbara Genco, Peter Victor Genco, Laura Geyer, Matthew Geyer, Joseph Gilly, Paul Gilly, Phyllis Gilly, Janet Golkin, Susan Golkin, Jeannette Gomez, Jennifer Genco Harrington, Michele Geyer Meo. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1488 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Klares, Scott Klares, Richard Klares, Jr., Donna Klitzman, Susan Klitzman, Yefim Kogan, Donna Krinsky, Catherine Kross(sibling of 9/11 decedent Kevin Smith), Kathleen Kulik, Peter La Corte, Theresa Labo, Christine Lafuente, Anthony Laieta, Josephine Laieta(parent of 9/11 decedent Vincent Laieta), Steven Lamonsoff, Donald Lang, Gary Lang, Gerard Lang, James Lang(sibling of 9/11 decedent Rosanne Lang), Martin Lang, Mary Lang, Richard Lang, Timothy Lang, David Lapin(sibling of 9/11 decedent Ruth Lapin), Deborah Lasko..(Kreindler, James)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1487 NOTICE of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Diane Barnes, Gregory Dimmling, Nicholas Dimmling, Rudy Dimmling (Individually as Sibling), Rudy Dimmling (Personal Representative of the Estate of Charlotte Dimmling, deceased Parent of Wlliam Dimmling), Amanda Rose Dominguez, Maria Dominguez, Maureen Dominguez, Michelle Dominguez, Andrew Dowling(Individually as Sibling), Andrew Dowling, Andrew Dowling(Personal Representative of the Estate Mary Yolanda Dowling, Deceased), Shannon R. Droz, Joan Faughnan, Juliet Faughnan, Liam Faughnan, Siena Faughnan, Thomas Faughnan, Christopher Fetchet, Frank Fetchet, Mary Fetchet, Christina Kurinzi, Lynn Faughnan Lee, Rosaleen Shea, Ellen Sleevi, Maureen Stines. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1486 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Doreen Jurczyk, Anthoula Katsimatides, Calliope Katsimatides(parent of 9/11 decedent John Katsimatides), George Katsimatides, Suanne Kazanecki, Rose Kazi, Brandon Keller, Gavin Keller, Kathryn Keller, Richard Keller, Elizabeth Keller-Baker, Elyssa Kellerman, Pamela Kellerman Fox, Brian Kelly, James Kelly, John Kelly, Robert Kelly, Shawn Kelly, Christine Kelly Fabbri, Leigh Kennedy, Simon Kennedy, Kerry Kerin, Hwa Kim, Paul Kim, William Kim..(Kreindler, James)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1485 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Thomas Brunton, Maryann DeLuise, Kathryn Dennis, Elaine Chevalier, Tylia Chevalier Furgal, Brittany Chevalier, Steven Chu(Personal Representative of the Estate of Kenneth Chu, deceased Parent of Pamela Chu), Gloria Chu, Steven Chu(Personal Representative of the Estate of Pamela Chu, Deceased), Steven Chu(Individually as Sibling), Anthony Coladonato, Alex Coladonato, Salvatore Coladonato, Michael Cove, Gregory Cove, Ryan Cove, Sheila Morgan, Casey Davidson, Peter Davidson, Stephen Davidson, Samantha Delapenha, Robert Delapenha, Madison Delapenha, Lauren Dennis, Thomas Dennis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1484 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sheila Inserra, Addison Irby, Kenneth Irby(sibling of 9/11 decedent Stephanie Irby), Laura Iskyan, Paul Iskyan, Cindy Itzkowitz, Barbara Jackman(parent of 9/11 decedent Brooke Jackman), Erin Jackman, Ross Jackman, Claudia Jacobs(sibling of 9/11 decedent Ariel Jacobs), Ruth Jacobsen, Alan James(sibling of 9/11 decedent Katherine Wolf), Eric Joglar, Peter Jones, Scott Jones, Peter Jordan, Vincent Jordan, Anne Jordan Stewart, Kathleen Jordan-Hart, Henri Joseph, Jacqueline Joseph, Leila Joseph, Ted Joseph, Woodly Joseph(sibling of 9/11 decedent Karl Joseph), Mary Judge..(Kreindler, James)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1483 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Karine Henriquez, Wanda Hernandez, Lidia Hernandez Melendez, Esther Heymann, Karen Higdon, Coleen Hinds, Ethlyn Hinds, Wade-Roy Hinds, Dennis Hobbs, Dixie Hobbs, Reginald Hobbs, Sonya Hobbs Cuffee, Tammy Hobbs Ginsberg, Sherian Hobbs Lightfoot, Ida Holder, Brian Holland, Michele Holland Mclin, Dennis Hoorn, Kara Hoorn, Katherine Hoorn, Joseph Howard, Bridget Hunter(parent of 9/11 decedent Joseph Hunter), Sean Hunter, Gwynetta Hurst Rossi, David Ilowitz..(Kreindler, James)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1482 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Gregory, Joseph Grillo, Steven Grillo, Blanca Judith Gutierrez de Paz, Robert Haag, Lori Haag Hermann, Gordon Haberman, Kathleen Haberman, Julie Haberman Osmus, James Hagerty, Mary Haggerty, Cynthia Hansen, Deborah Harrison, Janice Hart(sibling of 9/11 decedent Jeffrey Schreier), Michael Harvey, Virginia Harvey, James Hawk, Larry Hawk(sibling of 9/11 decedent Kathleen Nicosia), Phillip Hayes, Jr., Barbara Haynes, Thomas Haynes, Katherine Haynes-Pepe, Doron Henderson, Hashim Henderson, Shirley Henderson(partner of 9/11 decedent Ronnie Henderson)..(Kreindler, James)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1481 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Karmen Garcia, Pedro Garcia, Tania Garcia, Wanda Garcia, Monica Garcia Lantigua, Antonia Gargano, Elmeda George, Kathleen Gerbasio, Brian Germain, Michael Germain, Philip Germain(parent of 9/11 decedent Denis Germain), James Giaccone(sibling of 9/11 decedent Joseph Giaccone), Michael Giaccone, Birdie Mae Glenn, Donald Glenn, James Glenn, Roosevelt Glenn, Jr., Roosevelt Glenn, Sr., Shari Goldberg, Robyn Goldstein, Mia Gonzalez(child of 9/11 decedent Lydia Bravo), Rochelle Gordon, Karen Greene(sibling of 9/11 decedent Neil Hinds), Patricia Greenleaf, Peter Greenleaf(sibling of 9/11 decedent James Greenleaf)..(Kreindler, James)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1480 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by James Barkway, David Barkway, Stacey Boehm, Jeffrey Boehm(Individually as Sibling), Jeffrey Boehm, Jeffrey Boehm(Personal Representative of the Estate of Dorothy Boehm, deceased Parent of Bruce Boehm), Magdalena Bourdier, Manuel Bourdier(Individually as Sibling), Manuel Bourdier, Manuel Bourdier(Personal Representative of the Estate of Francisco Bourdier, deceased Parent of Francisco Bourdier), Anna Brennan, Connor Brennan, Ecaterini Brennan(Individually as Parent), Ecaterini Brennan, Ecaterini Brennan(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Brennan, deceased Parent of Peter Brennan), Gary Brennan, Michael Brunton, Kathi Ezzo-Talbott, Mary Ann Falzone, Nancy Kimbell, Debra Lavender(Individually as Sibling), Debra Lavender(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Bocchino, Deceased), Debra Lavender(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael Bocchino, deceased Parent of Michael Bocchino), Debra Lavender(Personal Representative of the Estate of Lucy Bocchino, deceased Parent of Michael Bocchino), Kelly Pearn, Nancy Poulis(Individually as Sibling), Nancy Poulis(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Brennan, deceased Parent of Peter Brennan), Brittany Weber. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1479 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Folger, Robert Folger, Thomas Folger, Steven Friedlander, Laura Froehlich, Charles Fry, Lance Fry, Michael Fry, Patricia Gabriel, George Gabriel, Richard Gabriel, Wendi Gabrieli(sibling of 9/11 decedent Andrew Friedman), George Gabrielle, Monica Gabrielle, Nicole Gabrielle, Anne Galizia, Celine Gallagher, Emilio Gallo, John Gallo, Lisa Gallo, Raffaela Gallo, Kristin Galusha-Wild(partner of 9/11 decedent Michael Stewart), Christopher Ganci, Hector Garcia, Ingrid Garcia..(Kreindler, James)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1478 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Eckna, Stanley Eckna(parent of 9/11 decedent Paul Eckna), Steven Eckna, Thomas Edwards, III, Brendan Egan(sibling of 9/11 decedent Samantha Egan), David Egan(parent of 9/11 decedent Lisa Egan), David Egan(parent of 9/11 decedent Samantha Egan), Elizabeth Egan(parent of 9/11 decedent Lisa Egan), Elizabeth Egan(parent of 9/11 decedent Samantha Egan), Silvia Eiberman, Jillian Eisman, Thomas Emperor(sibling of 9/11 decedent Lisa Egan), Thomas Emperor(sibling of 9/11 decedent Samantha Egan), Jeanne Evans, Elizabeth Fallon(sibling of 9/11 decedent William Fallon, Jr.), Jean Farrell, Steven Feidelberg(sibling of 9/11 decedent Peter Feidelberg), Elisabeth Feldon, Julio Fernandez, Connie Finnicum, Joanne Fletcher(sibling of 9/11 decedent Andrew La Corte), Claudia Flyzik(sibling of 9/11 decedent Carol Flyzik), Janet Flyzik(parent of 9/11 decedent Carol Flyzik), Joanne Foley(sibling of 9/11 decedent Thomas Foley)..(Kreindler, James)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1477 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amy Dincuff, Beth Dincuff, Frank Dincuff, Ian Dincuff, Joan Dincuff, Leo DiPilato, David Distefano, Peggy Dobrinski, Catherine Donovan, William Donovan, Charles Downey(child of 9/11 decedent Raymond Downey), Joseph Downey, Raymond Downey, Mary Doyle O'Neill, Rosaleen Doyle O'Neill, Marvin Duarte, Leslie Dunlevy, Charles Dunne(sibling of 9/11 decedent Christopher Dunne), Mary Dunne, Courtney Dunne-Keenan, Cynthia Dunne-Welch, Irene Durbin(sibling of 9/11 decedent Suzanne Passaro), Erin Eagers, William Eagleson, Carol Eckna..(Kreindler, James)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1476 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Geraldine Davie, Tanya Davis, Donna Dean, Malcolm Dean, Jr., Malcolm Dean, Sr.(parent of 9/11 decedent William Dean), Kristina deJong, Mariellen Delellis, Charles Demitz, Michael Demitz, Susan Demitz, Woody Demitz, Dana Deniro, Christel Desimone, Martina DeSimone-Caliso, Ila Devani, Todd DeVito(child of 9/11 decedent Jerry Devito), Joyce Devitt(parent of 9/11 decedent Robert Devitt, Jr.), Carl DiAgostino, Clara DiAgostino(parent of 9/11 decedent Michael DiAgostino), Frank DiAgostino, Paul DiAgostino, John Diaz, Milagros Diaz(parent of 9/11 decedent Lourdes Galletti), Grace Dietrich(parent of 9/11 decedent Susan Clyne), Kurt Dietrich..(Kreindler, James)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1475 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Patricia Clark, Richard Clark, Alicia Cohen, Andrew Colbert, Karen Connors, Rubina Cox-Holloway(parent of 9/11 decedent Darryl Mckinney), John Crant, Ellis Crant, Jr., Shelley Crant-Baggot (sibling of 9/11 decedent Denise Crant), Elizabeth Crawford, Linda Creamer, Eileen Cristiano, Brian Cross, Laura Cross, Denise Cross-Feldman, Edith Cruz(parent of 9/11 decedent Angela Rosario), Maria Cruz, Beverly Cryne, David Cushing, John Cushing, Pegeen Cushing, Thomas Cushing, Cathy D'Alessandro, Jeannine Daly, Louisa D'Antonio(child of 9/11 decedent Mary D'Antonio)..(Kreindler, James)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1474 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Travis Callum, Tina Cammarata, Therese Campbell, Michelle Cangelosi, Vincent Cangelosi, Richard Carney, Alexander Carroll, Eileen Carroll, Eleanor Carroll(parent of 9/11 decedent Michael Carroll), Matthew Carroll, William Carroll, Carlo Casoria, Carlo Casoria, Judith Casoria(parent of 9/11 decedent Thomas Casoria), Leonard Castrianno, Sr., Karrie Castro(child of 9/11 decedent Mary Shearer), Karrie Castro(child of 9/11 decedent Robert Shearer), Joann Castronovo, Geraldine Cefalu, Pak Chin, Suk Tan Chin, Yuet Chin, Dominic Ciafardini, Edward Ciafardini, Maggie Ciafardini..(Kreindler, James)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1473 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kathleen Burns Reed, Donna Caballero(sibling of 9/11 decedent Rosanne Lang), John Caggiano, Joseph Caggiano, Richard Caggiano, Mary Caggiano Malfi, Christopher Cahill, James Cahill, James Cahill, Kathleen Cahill(parent of 9/11 decedent Thomas Cahill), Linda Cahill, Patrick Cahill, James Cahill Jr., Anthony Calderon, Cathy Calderon, Ilene Calderon, Mariza Calderon(sibling of 9/11 decedent Edward Calderon), Vincent Calderon Jr., John Calia(sibling of 9/11 decedent Dominick Calia), Joseph Calia, Richard Calia, Christine Calia-Costa, Jeanann Calia-Kuhn, Robert Callanan, Rodney Callum(sibling of 9/11 decedent Michell Robotham)..(Kreindler, James)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1472 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alice Brady, Michael Brady, Richard Brady, Scott Brady, Richard Brady, Jr., Albert Bravo, Norma Bravo, Alexander Briley, Joanne Briley, Timothy Briley, Gwendolyn Briley-Strand, John Broghammer, Margaret Brown, David Bruce(sibling of 9/11 decedent Mark Bruce), Stephen Bruce, John Bruehert, Melissa Brunschwig, Mary Buckley, Margaret Budde, Michael Buhse, Thomas Buhse, William Buhse, Michael Burns(child of 9/11 decedent Donald Burns), Michael Burns(sibling of 9/11 decedent Donald Burns ), Patrick Burns..(Kreindler, James)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1471 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tara Bayer, Sharlene Beckwith, Lowell Bell(parent of 9/11 decedent Nina Bell), Lowell Bell(sibling of 9/11 decedent Nina Bell), Patricia Bell, Joseph Berardi, Maria Berardi, Nicholas Berardi, Tina Berardi, Rochelle Berger, Alan Biegeleisen, Regina Biegeleisen, Marcel Birnbaum, Samuel Birnbaum, Katina Blanding Carroll, Tara Blessing, Constance Blood, Linda Bodian, Alan Bordeaux, Michael Bosco, William Bosco, III, Frederick Bowers, Jr., Beata Boyarsky, James Boyle(sibling of 9/11 decedent Michael Boyle), Peter Boyle..(Kreindler, James)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1470 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sharon Arestegui, Vickie Arestegui, Vittorio Arestegui, Jeanne Arnold, Kelly Arrillaga, John Ashton, Kathleen Ashton(parent of 9/11 decedent Thomas Ashton), Darcie Bailey-Scauso, Sharon Baker-Gual, Ava Baksh, Christina Baksh(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael Baksh), James Baksh, Marvina Baksh, Maureen Baksh, Michelle Baksh, Paul Barbara, Frank Barbella(parent of 9/11 decedent James Barbella), Frank Barbella(sibling of 9/11 decedent James Barbella), Louis Barbella, Michael Barbella, Ruth Barbella(parent of 9/11 decedent James Barbella), Ruth Barbella(sibling of 9/11 decedent James Barbella), Thomas Barbella, Bernice Barletta, Lynn Baumgarten..(Kreindler, James)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1469 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ascension Abad, Rebecca Abad, Michael Adams, Kylie Adams-Floyd, Mary Adderley, Carmen Agnes, Miltiadis Ahladiotis, Effie Ahladiotis-Salloum, Roxana Alger Geffen, Colleen Amato, Nancy Amigron, Diane Ammirati, Laura Andrucki Izzo, Annmarie Angelini, Mary Angelini, Michael Angelini, Patricia Antonelle, Rafael Antonio Garcia, Alexander Aranyos, Winifred Aranyos(parent of 9/11 decedent Patrick Aranyos), Alexander Aranyos, Jr., Margaret Arce(parent of 9/11 decedent David Arce), Kristen Arestegui, Nancy Arestegui, Rosie Arestegui..(Kreindler, James)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment w/the Sovereign Immunities Act attached, Memorandum Decision and Order for Final Judgment on behalf of certain Ashton and Bauer Plaintiffs identified at Exhibit A; and Certi fication by the translator mailed to H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, by dispatch to the U.S. Department of State, ATTN: FSI A, CA/OCS/L, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI) SA-17, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20522 on 2/18/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7777 8466 1629, as per (5972 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(smc)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1468 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Kreindler, James) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1467 DECLARATION of James P. Kreindler in Support re: (1466 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 6675 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton 23 Wrongful Death Plaintiff.. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1466 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton 23 Wrongful Death Plaintiff. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (6677 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1468 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(dt)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1465 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Donna Caballero, Donna Caballero, Zaya Gooding, Alan James, Alan James, Nadadur Kumar, James Lang, James Lang, Stephen Perroncino(Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Perroncino, Sr., Deceased, surviving Parent of Joseph Perroncino, Deceased), Martin Rambousek, Martin Rambousek, Christina Rancke..(Kreindler, James)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1464 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David Bruce(Personal Representative of the Estate of Diane Bruce, Deceased, surviving parent of Mark Bruce, Deceased;), Mary Curran, Mary Curran, Daniel Dean, Malcolm Dean, Sr.(Personal Representative of the Estate of Eleanor Dean, Deceased, surviving parent of William Dean, Deceased), Joyce Devitt, Joanne Fletcher, Zhanna Galperina(Personal Representative of the Estate of Alaxander Zaltsman, Deceased, surviving parent of Arkady Zaltsman, Deceased), Zhanna Galperina(Personal Representative of the Estate of Faina Zaltsman, Deceased, surviving parent of Arkady Zaltsman, Deceased), Barbara Green, Larry Hawk, Mary Mercado, Mary Mercado, Patricia Morell(Personal Representative of the Estate of Gaspar John Morell, Jr., Deceased, surviving sibling of George Morell, Deceased), Melissa Nussbaum, Sean Passananti, Isabel Reyes, Fred Searby, Lawan Srinuan, Daniel Stan(Personal Representative of the Estate of Constantin Stan, Deceased, surviving parent of Alexandru Stan, Deceased), Daniel Stan(Personal Representative of the Estate of Elisabeta Stan, Deceased, surviving parent of Alexandru Stan, Deceased), Francis Swaine (Personal Representative of the Estate of Maryanne Swaine, Deceased, surviving parent of John Swaine, Deceased), Stanley Weinstein(Personal Representative of the Estate of Gloria Weinstein, Deceased, surviving parent of Lisa Orfi-Ehrlich, Deceased), Leslie Werdann(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frank Agnes, Deceased, surviving parent of David Agnes, Deceased)..(Kreindler, James)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1463 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Edward Brennan(Personal Representative of the Estate of Gail Brennan, Deceased, surviving parent of Edward Brennan III, Deceased; ), James Burke, Margaret Butler, Eleanor Carroll(Personal Representative of the Estate of William Carroll, Deceased, surviving parent of Michael Carroll, Deceased;), Patrick Courtney, Douglas Cruikshank(Personal Representative of the Estate of Christine Cruikshank, Deceased, surviving child of Robert Cruikshank, Deceased;), Andrew Curoe, Thomas Edwards, Elizabeth Fallon(Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth Fallon, Deceased, surviving parent of William Fallon Jr., Deceased;), Elizabeth Fallon(Personal Representative of the Estate of William Fallon, Deceased, surviving parent of William Fallon, Jr., Deceased;), Joanne Foley(Personal Representative of the Estate of Patricia Foley, Deceased, surviving parent of Thomas Foley, Deceased;), Joanne Foley(Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Foley, Deceased, surviving parent of Thomas Foley, Deceased;), Pamela Fox, Lucille Keefe, David Lapin, Theresa McDonald, William Novotny, Mary Novotny, Harry Ong, Jr., Nancy Picone(Personal Representative of the Estate of Tommaso Sereno, Deceased, surviving parent of Arturo Sereno, Deceased;), Katherine Rohner(Personal Representative of the Estate of Ronald Rohner, Deceased, surviving parent of Scott Rohner, Deceased;), Michael Santo, Barbara Theurkauf(Personal Representative of the Estate of Helen Theurkauf, Deceased, surviving parent of Thomas Theurkauf, Jr., Deceased;), Barbara Theurkauf(Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Theurkauf, Deceased, surviving parent of Thomas Theurkauf, Jr., Deceased;), Kara Walker(Personal Representative of the Estate of Caroline Coakley, Deceased, surviving parent of Steven Coakley, Deceased;)..(Kreindler, James)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (25 in 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN, 63 in 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 28 in 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN, 18 in 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN, 19 in 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN, 26 in 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN, 655 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 18 in 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN, 6654 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 58 in 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN, 478 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 18 in 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN, 26 in 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN, 894 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 18 in 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN, 25 in 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN) MOTION for Charles Ross Heyl to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-24226966. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., (17 in 1:18-cv-12118-GBD-SN, 654 in 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN, 18 in 1:18-cv-12318-GBD-SN, 893 in 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 62 in 1:19-cv-00041-GBD-SN, 26 in 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN, 17 in 1:19-cv-00026-GBD-SN, 57 in 1:19-cv-00044-GBD-SN, 24 in 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN, 25 in 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN, 6653 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 26 in 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN, 25 in 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN, 26 in 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN, 27 in 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN, 17 in 1:18-cv-12030-GBD-SN, 24 in 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN, 17 in 1:18-cv-12322-GBD-SN, 477 in 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN, 26 in 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN) MOTION for Jade A. Haileselassie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-24226953. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(aea)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1462 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Boyle(Personal Representative of the Estate of James Boyle, Deceased, surviving parent of Michael Boyle, Deceased), Michael Burns(Personal Representative of the Estate of Julia Burns, Deceased, surviving parent of Donald Burns, Deceased), Timothy Burns, John Calia, Charles Dunne, Irene Durbin, Irene Durbin, Carrie Foley, Wendi Gabriel, Wendi Gabriel, Ann Haynes, Calliope Katsimatides, James Kelly, James Kelly, Miriam Lafuente, Tawania Loyd, Wayne Miller, Wayne Miller, Laura Morrison(Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Siskopoulos, Deceased, surviving spouse of Muriel Siskopoulos, Deceased), Joan O'Brien(Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol Iskyan, Deceased, surviving parent of John Iskyan, Deceased), Anthony Oliva, Bernadette Princiotta (Personal Representative of the Estate of Anita Princiotta, Deceased, surviving parent of Vincent Princiotta, Deceased), Damali Rogers, Philip Rosenblatt(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anne Rosenblatt, Deceased, surviving parent of Muriel Siskopoulos, Deceased), Rebecca Wynne..(Kreindler, James)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1461 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joann Allen, Laura Andrucki, Gary Berger, Mariza Calderon, Joseph Callahan, Carolyn Garcia, Karen Greene, Janice Hart, Janice Hart, Claudia Jacobs, Matthew Jacobs, Erin James, Peggy Lamonsoff, Andrea Maffeo(Personal Representative of the Estate of Sam Maffeo, Deceased, surviving parent of Jennieann Maffeo, Deceased), Dallas Mckinney, Keri Murphy, Scott Naiman, Sheila Ornstein, Caroline Otero, Linda Pickford(Personal Representative of the Estate of Thomas Pickford, Deceased, surviving parent of Christopher Pickford, Deceased), Evelyn Sekzer, Barbara Sohan(Personal Representative of the Estate of Clive Sohan, Deceased, surviving parent of Astrid Sohan, Deceased), Carlton Valvo, Dianne Walsh, Raymond Wodenshek..(Kreindler, James)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1460 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dahlia Beaven(child of 9/11 decedent Alan Beaven), Jacob Biegeleisen, William Butler, Marianne Cruikshank(spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert Cruikshank), Nicole Cua, Patrick Cua, Anthony DeNiro Graffino, Kenneth Garcia, Ethlyn Hinds, Leigh Kennedy, Simon Kennedy, Roger Mair, Patricia Marrese, Felice Marrow, Alphonso Rodgers, Jr., Antoinette Steo, Sat Thackurdeen, William Theurkauf, Ellen Tiesi, John Twomey, Richard Twomey, William Twomey, Antonio Vincelli, Lucy Virgilio, Debbie Williams..(Kreindler, James)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1459 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Deborah Cassano, Beverly Cryne, Kristina deJong, Blanca Judith Gutierrez de Paz, Stuart Knox, Susan Martin, Sven Mascarenhas, Brian Moroney, Robin Ornedo, Sheila Ornedo, Ana Paz Gutierrez, Jose Paz Gutierrez, Julia Paz Gutierrez, Daniel Pelletier, Lillian Pelletier, Marcel Pelletier, Ronald Pelletier, Kevin Shah, Nikita Shah, Calvin Tull, Jennifer Tull, Francine Tull-Lindo, James Tumulty, Darren Williams, Chaniqua Wynter..(Kreindler, James)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1458 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Geisel Barrera Pocasangre, Karen Barrera Pocasangre, Linda Barrera Pocasangre, Mauricio Barrera Pocasangre, Lombardo Barrera, Diane Cuff, Lisa Della Pietra, Sandra Della Pietra, Marvin Duarte, Lauren Fregonese, Daniel Hickey, Dennis Hickey, Kevin Hickey, Frederick Ill, III, Alan James, Robert Johnston, Jennifer Kane, Jaclyn LaBarbera, Daniel Leahy, John Leahy, James Leahy, Jr., Amanda Mingione, Loretta Petronzi, Christine Sciurba, Mary Truelson..(Kreindler, James)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1457 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gerald Atwood, Margaret Atwood, Robert Atwood, Christopher Berkeley, Roger Berkeley, Jane Beyer, Mark Beyer, Michael Beyer, Shawn Beyer, Erin Durkin, Sean Geraty, Celia Gooding, Jill Regan, James Regan, Peter Regan, Shane Regan, Linda Smagala Kuzmiskas, Alexa Smagala, Andrew Smagala, Gary Smagala, James Smagala, Robert Smagala, Jillian Suarez, Daniel Wright, Jack Wright..(Kreindler, James)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1456 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elizabeth Merkouris(parent of 9/11 decedent George Merkouris), Harvey Morgenstern, George Nicosia, Barbara O'Gorman, Sheila Ornstein, Maria Paulino, Janna Pulver, William Reilly, Katherine Rohner, James Ryan, Nichole Scochemaro, Justin Sivin(stepchild of 9/11 decedent Joel Miller), Daniel Stan(sibling of 9/11 decedent Alexandru Stan), Allan Tarasiewicz, Dawn Torres-Brown, Brandon Valvo, Kara Walker, Caryn Wiley, Bette Zaccoli Cozy, Lori Zaccoli Davies, Mary Zaremba, Barbara Zion Green, Jolaine Zuccala, Sandra Zuccala, Kaylene Zuccala-Sams..(Kreindler, James)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1455 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Patricia Antonelle, James Baksh, Rochelle Berger, Richard Brady, Jr., George Burke, James Cahill, Jr., William Carroll, Christine Coates(sibling of 9/11 decedent Michael Simon), Pegeen Cushing, Clara DiAgostino(parent of 9/11 decedent Michael DiAgostino), Charles Downey, Ryan Ehrlich, Thomas Folger, Karmen Garcia, James Glenn, Kevin Hannafin, Judith Higley, Addison Irby, Mary Judge, Elizabeth King, Gary Lang, Elaine Leinung, Patricia Madamas, Kevin Maynard, Thomas Mcginley..(Kreindler, James)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1454 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrew Williams, Craig Williams, Kathleen Williams, Kenneth Williams, Scott Williams, Keith Wiswall, Robert Wiswall, Amy Wiswall Edgington, Patricia Wodenshek, Raymond Wodenshek, Florence Wodenshek Garrett, Lynn Wright, Lisa Wylie, Dawn Yamashiro, Michele Yaniz, Emily Yarembinsky, Evelyn Yeow, Misha Yoshida Gnazzo, Kjell Youngren, Nissa Youngren, Billy Yuen, Gilma Yuen, Anthony Zaccoli, Bret Zaccoli, Santo Zaccoli..(Kreindler, James)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1453 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Avery Wall, Brian Wall, Gary Wall, Jean Wall, Kevin Wall, Payton Wall, Dianne Walsh, Joseph Walsh, Kevin Walsh, Kristin Walsh, Nancy Walsh, Gerald Warner, Corrine Warnock, Amy Weaver Achilles, Judith Weil, Andrew Weinstein, Seth Weinstein, Stanley Weinstein, Anatoly Weiser, Christopher Welty, Darren Welty, William Welty, Leslie Werdann(sibling of 9/11 decedent David Agnes), J Whittaker, Lena Whittaker..(Kreindler, James)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1452 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carlton Valvo, Dante Valvo, Trenton Valvo, Elizabeth Van Duyne, Mary Vatalaro, Mary Vatalaro, Margarita Vazquez, Caterina Venuto, Salvatore Venuto, Theresa Vesnesky, Matthew Vilardo(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph Vilardo), Nicole Vilardo, Patricia Vilardo(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph Vilardo), Carlos Villa, Richard Villa, Caren Villareal, Anthony Vincelli, Anthony Viola, Vincent Viola, Jr., Thomas Virgilio, Mary Vogt, Cathy Vrachnas, Benhardt Wainio, Sarah Wainio, Thomas Wainio..(Kreindler, James)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1451 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christina Rancke..(Kreindler, James)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1450 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Judith Dalton, Tricia Marsala, Nancy Poulis, Michael Wong, Stephanie Wong, Allison Noble Works, Brian Wotton, David Stewart Wotton, Dorothea Wotton, Jean Wotton(Individually), Jean Wotton(Personal Representative of the Estate of Stewart Wotton, deceased Parent of Rodney Wotton), Christopher Wren, Christopher Wren, Christopher Wren, William Wren, William Wren, William Wren, Rodney Wotton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1449 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Lynne Caba, Clive Hopwood, Clive Hopwood, Teresa Masterson, Grace McGroarty, Andrew Petisce, Dennis Vauk, Patricia Vauk, Christine Vianna Tenaglia, Aleene Voskerijian, Isabelle Voskerijian, Shont Voskerijian, Zabel Voskerijian, Zaree Voskerijian, Mary Louise Waldie Klimm, Meredith Waldie Witherspoon, Jane Waldie Wrenshall, Carol Waldie, Jack Waldie, Jeffrey Waldie, Jonathan Waldie, Zoe Webster Ghirarduzzi, Philip Nicholas Webster, Marcia Weiss, Joyce Wong. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1448 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Rochae Clarke, Lisa Debarbrie, Cathy Guba, Susan Jenkins, Maureen OMalley, Jane Terrenzi-Spring, Jane Terrenzi-Spring, Mark Thompson, Neal Thompson, Norman Thompson, Patricia Thompson, Sharon Thorpe Hanson, Gregory Todisco, Emily Tompsett, Alexandra Tucker, Christopher Tucker, Gaffney Tucker, Joan Tucker, John Tucker, Morgan Tucker, Taylor Tucker, Thomas Tucker, Charles Vauk, Liam Vauk, Meaghan Vauk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1447 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Lisa Crowe, Jennifer Fosburgh, Jennifer Fosburgh, Stacy Lupcho, Teresa Martin, Elizabeth Richardson, Addison Spencer, Kathryn Spencer, Michael Spencer, Michael Spencer, Robert Spencer, Susan Spencer-Craig, Elizabeth Brian Terrenzi Spring, Hans Ulrich Sutter, Hans Ulrich Sutter, Hans Ulrich Sutter, Danielle Taddonio Miscioscia, Marc Taddonio, Marc Taddonio, Marc Taddonio, Michael Taddonio, Jr, Nicole Taddonio, Richard Taddonio, Richard Taddonio. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1446 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Carmen Salvaterra, Eugenia Bogado, Luis Samaniego, Carrie Spero, Jill Abbott, Carolyn San Phillip Nanfeldt, Gabrielle Silverstein, Cameron Silverstein, Laurie Simowitz, Ellen Brotman, Susan Brotman, Linda Slattery, Daniel Slattery, Erin Slattery-Appelle, George Smith, Judy Smith, Chad Michael Smith, Yongjin Song, Hyungshin Song, Frank Song, Julie Song, Christina L. Kminek, Frank Kminek, Sr, Frank Kminek, Jr., Christopher Kminek. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1445 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Richard Champion, Richard Champion, Richard Champion, Jo Ann Cohn, Michael Cohn, Dina Connelly, Wendy Irvine Toomey, Kara Marie Irvine, Stuart Irvine, Tracy Janess, Amanda Olcott, Daniel Riches, Rita Riches, Thomas Riches, Timothy Riches, Lara Ropiteau Davis, Jean-Marc Ropiteau, Barbara Ropiteau-Galloway, John Salerno, Antoinetta Salvaterra, Christian Salvaterra, Gabrielle Salvaterra, Isabelle Salvaterra, Ann Marie Santillo, Michelle Schleider. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1444 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marie Tortorici, Kevin Trant, Matthew Trant, Maureen Trant, Sally Trant, Timothy Trant, Mary Trant, Pamela Trentini, Pamela Trentini, Patti Trentini, Patti Trentini, James Trentini, II, James Trentini, II, Jason Tucker, Karen Tucker, Shawn Tumulty, Kathy Ugalde, Diane Ugolyn, Trevor Ugolyn, Victor Ugolyn, Michael Uman, Feliciana Umanzor, Katherine Umanzor, Anthony Umanzor, Jr., Eileen Valiente..(Kreindler, James)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1443 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Samantha Taylor, Rebecca Taylor Wynne, Anthony Trepedino, Evelyn Trepedino, Leland Terry, Tania Terry, Janice Testagrose, Raj Thackurdeen, Vijay Thackurdeen, Barbara Theurkauf(sibling of 9/11 decedent Thomas Theurkauf, Jr.), Charles Theurkauf, Edward Theurkauf, Patricia Theurkauf(sibling of 9/11 decedent Thomas Theurkauf, Jr.), Thomas Theurkauf, III, Marie Thomas, Sharon Thomas, Rosana Thompson(spouse of 9/11 decedent Nigel Thompson), Joseph Tiesi, Bissondai Tilkaren, Barbara Tirado, Rafael Tirado, Richard Tirado, Dean Torres, Denise Torres, Richard Torres..(Kreindler, James)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1442 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Irwin Steinman, Laura Steinman, Linda Steinman, Susan Steinman Kelleher, Liam Stewart(child of 9/11 decedent Michael Stewart), Marilyn Stufano, Angelic Suarez, Joanne Sullivan, Francis Swaine (parent of 9/11 decedent John Swaine), Hannah Swaine, Suzanne Swaine(sibling of 9/11 decedent John Reo), Edward Sweeney, Elena Sweeney, Mary Sweeney, Matthew Sweeney, Darren Snyder, Cheryl Taback, Lori Taback, Tracy Taback Catalano, Andrew Taddei, Loretta Taddei, Mary Taddei(child of 9/11 decedent Norma Taddei), Hiroyuki Takahashi, Eileen Tallon(parent of 9/11 decedent Sean Tallon), Rosaleen Tallon-Daros..(Kreindler, James)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1441 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Janet Berns, Debra Godwin, Marcy Ilena Godwin, Ruth Godwin, Jason Hochman, Nancy Holzhauer, Corinne Krachtus, Corinne Krachtus, Corinne Krachtus, Elaine Miller, Elaine Miller, Elaine Miller, Celeste Pollicino Rose, Douglas Pollicino(Individually), Douglas Pollicino(Personal Representative of the Estate of Antoinette Pollicino, deceased Parent of Steve Pollicino), Douglas Pollicino(Personal Representative of the Estate of Nicholas Pollicino, deceased Parent of Steve Pollicino), Steven Pollicino, Jennifer Punches Botta, Janice Kay Punches, Jeremy Punches, Joseph Quinn, Michael T. Quinn, Noreen Quinn, Sharon Reich, Sharon Reich. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1440 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Frank Palombo, Margaret Palombo, John Palombo, Patrick Palombo, Annie Panatier, Christopher Panatier, James Panatier, Irene Gilmore, Patricia Panatier(Individually), Patricia Panatier(Personal Representative of the Estate of Irene Panatier, deceased Parent of Christopher Panatier), Dorothy O'Neill, Anna Patterson, Scott Patterson, Kevin Patterson, Kevin Patterson, Kevin Patterson, Megan Pelino, Anne Pelino, Bennett Pelino, Maureen Pelino, Douglas Pelino, Matthew Pelino, Terrence Pelino, Vicki Tureski, Vicki Tureski. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1439 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Mary Duff, Mary Duff, Catherine Grimes, Catherine Grimes, John Hogan, Mary Malitas, Dennis O'Berg, Dorothy O'Berg, Gilbert Ortale, Julia Ortale, Michelle Orth Ankenman, Michelle Orth Ankenman, Daniel Orth, Elizabeth Orth, Alexandra Ortiz Reszka, Alexandra Ortiz Reszka, Luis Ortiz, Victor Ortiz, Maria Palombo Suazo, Anthony Palombo, Daniel Palombo, Joseph Palombo, Joseph Palombo, Stephen Palombo, Thomas Palombo. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1438 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Teresa Danko, Jeffrey DeFazio, Patricia Ferguson, Marianne Merritt, Agnes Moran, Agnes Moran, Agnes Moran, Joseph Morrison, Maureen Morrison, Daniel Moy, Jessica Moy, Madeline Lew Moy, Kelly-Ann Mullan, Patrick Mullan, Patrick Mullan, Barbara Naples, Hajdije/Heidi Naples, Hajdije Naples, Barbara Newton, Michael L. Newton, Michael S. Newton, Sarah Newton, Stephen A. Newton, Mark Newton-Carter, Christine O'Berg Connolly, Ann-Elizabeth Rueppel. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1437 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Dowdell, Matthew Dowdell, William Dowdell, Sara Maloney Duval, Kerry Magee, Kevin Magee, Kevin Magee, Mary Alice Magee, Maryann Magee, Shane Magee, Shane Magee, Valerie Magee, Valerie Magee, Valerie Magee, Edward Maloney, II, Mark Maloney, Mason Maloney, Sally Maloney, Teddy Maloney, Catherine Manning, Mairead Manning, Philip Manning, Philip Manning, Sean Manning, Sean Manning, Trinity Manning. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (1436 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 6648 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(dt)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1436 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Kreindler, James) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1435 DECLARATION of James P. Kreindler in Support re: (6646 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1434 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton XXII Wrongful Death Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1434 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton XXII Wrongful Death Plaintiffs. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1433 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maxwell Sivin, Liza Sloan, Barbara Smith, Brian Smith, LaKimmie Smith, Stephen Smith, Terence Smith, Jr., Donna Smollen, Jason Snyder, Lauren Snyder, Matthew Snyder, Nancy Snyder, Mary Snyder Coolican, Barbara Sohan, Maria Somogyi, Terri Sondak, Anne Sorge, Della-Ann Spadafora, Lawan Srinuan, Vatchpol Srinuan, Brian Stack, Dennis Stack, Kevin Stack, Michael Stack, Thomas Stack..(Kreindler, James)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1432 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elisabeth Scott, James Scullin, James Scullin, Nora Scullin, Arthur Scullin, Jr., Julia Sears, Evelyn Sekzer, Marc Sekzer, Anna Sereno, Jason Seymour, John Seymour, Niloy Shah, Leonor Shahid, Syed Shahid, Nancy Shakouri, Beniamin Shamay, Gabriel Shamay, Simon Shamay, Jaclyn Shapiro, Lori Shapiro, Evelyn Shulman, Lawrence Shulman, Eileen Simon(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael Simon), Kathleen Simon(sibling of 9/11 decedent Michael Simon), Alexandra Sinton(child of 9/11 decedent Thomas Sinton, III)..(Kreindler, James)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1431 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marie Ryan, Patricia Ryan, Paul Ryan, Robert Ryan, Robert Ryan, Scott Ryan, William Ryan, Dae Jin Ryook, Roni Salkin, Clarence Sam, Dhanmatee Sam, Gina Sam, Lisa Sam, Jeffrey Santo, Michael Santo, Carlos Santos, Barbara Scaramuzzino, Donald Scauso(stepchild of 9/11 decedent Dennis Scauso), Salvatore Scauso, Brandon Schielke, Kenneth Schielke, Patricia Schielke, Kenneth Schielke, Jr., Jessica Shoenholtz Murphy, Phyllis Schreier(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jeffrey Schreier)..(Kreindler, James)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1430 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ticey Rosario, Fern Rosenbaum, Martin Rosenbaum, Philip Rosenblatt(sibling of 9/11 decedent Muriel Siskopoulos), Adam Rosenblum, Richard Rosenblum, Allan Rosenzweig, Alison Ross, Franklin Ross, Irene Ross, Marshall Ross, Abigail Ross Goodman, Virginia Rossiter Valvo, Christine Rothschild, Frank Ruggiere, Mark Ruggiere, Kathleen Ruggiere De Paris, Claudia Ruggiere Donovan(spouse of 9/11 decedent Bart Ruggiere), Patricia Ruggiere Scavuzzo, Frank Ruggiere, Jr., Rafaela Ruiz, Gilbert Ruiz, Jr., Theresa Ruther, Deena Ryan, Francis Ryan..(Kreindler, James)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (1428 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 6641 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(dt)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1429 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Erin Day, Beverly DeFazio, Craig DeFazio, Lawrence DeFazio, Marjorie Kane, Mary Jane Maounis, Mary Jane Maounis, Mary Jane Maounis, Mary Jane Maounis, William Maounis, William Maounis, Thomas Martello, James Martello, Sheila Martello, Charles Mathers, Elizabeth Mathers, Collin McHale, Nicholas McLaughlin, Brienne McNally, Elizabeth McNally, Shannon McNally, Joseph Richard Mickley, Marie Mickley, Arjan Mirpuri, Indra Mirpuri. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1428 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2).(Kreindler, James) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1427 DECLARATION of James P. Kreindler in Support re: (1426 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 6639 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton XXI Wrongful Death Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1426 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashton XXI Wrongful Death Plaintiffs. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1425 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by August Larsen, Brenda Larsen, Marisa Larsen, Scott Larsen, Dennis Levi, Dennis Levi, Linda Litto, Catherine Litto-Petras, Brian Lynch, Ellen Lynch, Grace Lynch, Kieran Lynch, Lorraine Lynch, Mary Rose Lynch, Olivia Lynch, Rosetta Lynch, Sean Lynch, Jr., Christina Lynch-Burgdorf, Christina Lynch-Burgdorf, Joseph Reitano, Joseph Reitano, Joseph Reitano, Kimberly Rex, Kristen Serra. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1424 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Meghan Deming, Dohee Kang, Jee Won Kang, Joon Hee Kang, Kristen Kelley Roberts, Katherine Kelley Van Kirk, Frederick Kelley, Sean Kelley, Sean Kelley, Alison M. Kinney Lewandowski, Alexis Kolpak, Thaddeus Kolpak, Marina Kovalcin, Rebecca Kovalcin, Anna Kren, Anna Kren, Paula Lang, Paula Lang, Paula Lang, Paula Lang, Sean Lang, Shanna Lewis, Stephen Massell, Michael Rogers, Michael Rogers, Andrea Sassone, Janine Wentworth. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1423 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Doreen Reith, Armand Reo, Judith Reo, Mark Reo, Armando Reyes, Enoel Reyes, Isabel Reyes, Luz Reyes, Nemesio Reyes, Aidaline Reyes Concepcion, Nydia Reyes Rodriguez, Carol Richards, Paul Richards, Asher Richards Frankel, Erin Richards Frankel, Lisa Richards Keston, Marilyn Rimmele, Frederick Rimmele, Jr., Brunilda Rodriguez, Brunilda Rodriguez, Celina Rodriguez, Ivan Rodriguez, Janet Rodriguez, Pedro Rodriguez, Peter Rodriguez..(Kreindler, James)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1422 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Suzanne Bennett(Individually), Suzanne Bennett(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary MacDonald, deceased Parent of Michele Heidenberger), Alison Coffey, Karen DeNino(Individually), Karen DeNino(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary MacDonald, deceased Parent of Michele Heidenberger), Thomas Heidenberger, Catherine Heller, Grace Heller, Howard Heller, John Heller, Mary Jean Heller, Michael Heller, Robert Heller, Roberta Heller, Alex Iskenderian, Jason Iskenderian, Kara Iskenderian, Meryl Iskenderian, Jean Henold Jean-Pierre, Roudy Jean-Pierre, Sherley Jean-Pierre, Diane Johnson, Kerby Laurent, Mary Beth Luedtke, Colleen Rastovich. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1421 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mark Puopolo, Sonia Puopolo, Leah Quigley, Patricia Quigley, Rachel Quigley, Edward Radburn, Catherine Raddatz, Melissa Raggio-Granato, Gregory Rakovsky, Jean Rall, Martin Rambousek, Yvonne Ramirez, James Rand, Lisa Rand, Mary Ann Rand(parent of 9/11 decedent Adam Rand), Beth Rasweiler-Griffin, Christopher Reda, Frank Reda, John Reda, James Reed, Albert Regenhard, Catherine Regenhard, Christina Regenhard, Elizabeth Rego, Susan Reidlinger..(Kreindler, James)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1420 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Diane Barnes, Joan Faughnan, Michael Faughnan, Thomas Faughnan, Christopher Fetchet, Frank Fetchet, Mary Fetchet, Wesley Fetchet, Beverly J. Finnegan, Bridget Finnegan, Francis Finnegan, Frank J. Finnegan, Katherine Finnegan, Michael Finnegan, Colleen Fitzsimons, Patrick Fitzsimons, Robert Fitzsimons, Sean Fitzsimons, Barbara Genco, Peter Victor Genco, Jennifer Genco Harrington, Kerri Hecox, Lynn Faughnan Lee, Ellen Sleevi, Maureen Stines. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1419 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Kathryn Dennis, Thomas Dennis, Andy Dillard, Major Dillard, Gregory Dimmling, Nicholas Dimmling, Rudy Dimmling, Rudy Dimmling, Amanda Rose Dominguez, Maria Dominguez, Maureen Dominguez, Michelle Dominguez, Andrew Dowling, Andrew Dowling, Shannon R. Droz, Juliet Faughnan, Liam Faughnan, Siena Faughnan, Thomas Faughnan, Christina Kurinzi, Lisa Newton, Sekou Agard, Rosaleen Shea. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1418 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Harrison Scott Brown, Kyle Peter Brown, Damien Earthman, Laura Geyer, Matthew Geyer, Joseph Gilly, Paul Gilly, Phyllis Gilly, Janet Golkin, Susan Golkin, Angeline Gomez, Blanca Gomez, Enrique Gomez, Jeannette Gomez, Melissa Gomez, Teresa Gomez, Cosimo Granitto, Cosimo Granitto, Filippa Granitto, Mario Granitto, Michele Geyer Meo, Sandra Munro, Michele Geyer Meo, Anne Earthman Salonia, Joann Soto, Joanna Tirone. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1417 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Berkeley, Roger Berkeley, Patrick Courtney, Elizabeth Fallon, Elizabeth Fallon, Carrie Foley, Joanne Foley, Thomas Foley, Wendi Gabrieli, Wendi Gabrieli, Zaya Gooding, Nadadur S. Kumar, Wayne Miller, Wayne Miller, Joan O'Brien, Stephen Perroncino(Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Perroncino, Deceased, surviving parent of Joseph Perroncino, Deceased), Barbara Theurkauf, Barbara Theurkauf, Patricia Theurkauf, Patricia Theurkauf, Daniel Wright, Jack Wright, Chaniqua Wynter..(Kreindler, James)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1416 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Geisel Barrera Pocasangre, Karen Barrera Pocasangre, Linda Barrera Pocasangre, Mauricio Barrera Pocasangre, Lombardo Barrera, Garry Clark, Sr., Corey Cottoy, Kojo Cottoy, Conrod Cottoy, Jr., Nicole Cua, Patrick Cua, Regina Gans, Celia Gooding, Stuart Knox, Sven Mascarenhas, Sydney Pelletier-Martinelli, Kevin Shah, Nikita Shah, Niloy Shah, Barbara Theurkauf, Charles Theurkauf, Edward Theurkauf, Thomas Theurkauf, III, Patricia Theurkauf, William Theurkauf..(Kreindler, James)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1415 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by Thomas Brunton, Brittany Chevalier, Elaine Chevalier, Gloria Chu, Steven Chu, Steven Chu, Steven Chu, Alex Coladonato, Anthony Coladonato, Salvatore Coladonato, Gregory Cove, Michael Cove, Ryan Cove, Casey Davidson, Peter Davidson, Stephen Davidson, Madison Delapenha, Robert Delapenha, Samantha Delapenha, Maryann DeLuise, Lauren Dennis, Tylia Chevalier Furgal, Sheila Morgan, Terry Stella(Individually), Terry Stella(Personal Representative of the Estate of Judith Butterly, deceased Parent of Donald Delapenha). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(Granito, Frank)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1414 NOTICE of of Amendment re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Complaint. Document filed by David Barkway, James Barkway, Stacey Boehm, Jeffrey Boehm, Jeffrey Boehm, Jeffrey Boehm, Magdalena Bourdier, Manuel Bourdier, Anna Brennan, Connor Brennan, Ecaterini Brennan, Ecaterini Brennan, Gary Brennan, Michael Brunton, Thomas P. Brunton, Kathi Ezzo-Talbott, Mary Ann Falzone, Nancy Kimbell, Debra Lavender, Debra Lavender, Debra Lavender, Debra Lavender, Kelly Pearn, Nancy Poulis, Brittany Weber, Manuel Bourdier. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(O'Grady, Jeanne)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1413 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ana Arvelo, Mariano Arvelo, Jr., Robin Arvelo, Awilda Breban, William Butler, RoseMarie Delgado, Erin Durkin, Sean Geraty, Daniel Hickey, Dennis Hickey, Kevin Hickey, Beatrice Kandell, Steven Kandell, Jaclyn LaBarbera, Doris Martinez, Amanda Mingione, Loretta Petronzi, Brunilda Rodriguez, Katherine Rohner, Alexa Smagala, Vatchpol Srinuan, Mary Truelson, Calvin Tull, Jennifer Tull, Francine Tull-Lindo..(Kreindler, James)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1412 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gregory Ardison-Gardner, Deborah Cassano, Lisa Della Pietra, Sandra Della Pietra, Jessica Giordano, Jonathan Giordano, Jordan Giordano, Mary Machinski, Maxine McCrann, Christine Minardi, James Minardi, Robert Minardi, Stephanie Minardi, William Minardi, Stephen Perroncino, Joseph Pfeifer, Joanne Pitino, Doreen Reith, Mary Vogt, Judith Weil, Bette Zaccoli Cozy, Lori Zaccoli Davies, Anthony Zaccoli, Bret Zaccoli, Santo Zaccoli..(Kreindler, James)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1411 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cassandra Aiken, Kanian Aiken, Michael Aiken, Kecia Aiken-Dorismond, Stephanie Aranyos, Lorraine Betancourt, Brittany Bielfeld, Brigette Box, Dalton Box, Georgia Burgess, Sarah Clark, Ann Distefano, Frank Distefano, Sharon Distefano, Michelle Gill-Martinez, Kayla Hannafin, Thomas Hannafin, Tina Lampart, Cherilyn McMullen, Anita Moorthy, Sriarm Moorthy, Dennis Stack, Kevin Stack, Thomas Stack, Nicole Vilardo..(Kreindler, James)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1410 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Adrienne Pearl, Sydney Pelletier-Martinelli, Karen Perez, Stephen Perroncino, Maureen Petronis, Frank Pezzuti, Frank Pezzuti, Kathleen Pezzuti, Megan Pezzuti-Pelino, Helen Pfeifer(parent of 9/11 decedent Kevin Pfeifer), Joseph Pfeifer, Kevin Phillips, David Pickford, Linda Pickford, Nancy Picone, Faygee Piller, Joanne Pitino, Madeline Placek Zinzi, Bernard Polatsch, Daniel Polatsch, Anna Poulos, Bernadette Princiotta, Linda Pritchard, Chaya Protovin, Kathleen Psirogianes..(Kreindler, James)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1409 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Oswald, Kenneth Oswald, Jennifer Oswald-Chen, Caroline Otero, Vanessa Pabon, Angel Pabon, II, Mary Padilla, Aaron Pagan(nephew of 9/11 decedent Angela Rosario), Irene Palazzo, Philip Palazzo, Richard Palazzo, Robert Palazzo, Bettina Palazzo Grunke, Barbara Palazzo Sulliman, Elda Palma, Claudia Pancella, Marianne Panicola, Lula Parker, Melissa Pascuma, Michael Passananti, Sean Passananti, Kalpana Patel, Kantilal Patel, Parul Patel, Theresa Paterson..(Kreindler, James)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1408 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Patricia Noah, Avraham Noeth, Anne Noonan, Ashley Noonan, Kelly Noonan, Walter Noonan, Anne Noonan Robertson, Daniel Novotny, Kevin Novotny, Mary Novotny, Michael Novotny, Robert Novotny, William Novotny, Melinda Nugent, Craig Nussbaum, Harrison O'Neil Morell(child of 9/11 decedent George Morell), Joan O'Brien, Steven O'Brien, Charlene O'Connor, Christopher O'Connor, William O'Connor, William O'Connor, Dennis O'Connor, Sr., Maura O'Doherty Lee, Theresa O'Gara..(Kreindler, James)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1407 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Howard Morgenstern, Jeffrey Morgenstern, Suri Morgenstern, Elizabeth Moroney, Kevin Moroney, Michael Moroney, Timothy Moroney, Laura Morrison(child of 9/11 decedent Muriel Siskopoulos), Christopher Motroni, Lindsey Murdock, Angela Murolo, Angelo Murolo, Dominick Murolo, Elizabeth Murphy(sibling of 9/11 decedent Edward Brennan, III), Lori-Jean Murphy, Leticia Muszel, Enrica Naccarato, Richard Naiman, Russell Naiman, Edward Navarro, Elizabeth Navarro, Sharon Navarro, Thomas Neary, III, Mary Nicholson, Mary Nicholson..(Kreindler, James)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1406 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jacob Merkouris, Meghan Metzemaekers, Kimberly Meyer, Antonia Micko, Anna Milewska, Kamila Milewska-Podejma, Frederyk Milewski, Christina Millan, Mauricio Millan, Amber Miller, Edward Miller, Jamie Miller, Wayne Miller, Christine Minardi, James Minardi, Robert Minardi, Stephanie Minardi, William Minardi, Anita Moorthy, Sriarm Moorthy, Kelsey Morell, Roberta Morell(spouse of 9/11 decedent George Morell), Mark Morell, Rita Morell Shea, George Morell, Jr...(Kreindler, James)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by James McGinnis, Patricia Mcginnis-Daly, Erin McGinty James, Elizabeth McGovern, Lawrence Mcgovern, Theresa McGovern, Margaret McInnes, Dallas Mckinney, Ann McLaughlin, Dorothy McLaughlin, George McLaughlin, Linda McLaughlin, Sheri McLaughlin, Ann McMahon, Cherilyn McMullen, Joseph McNulty, Michael McNulty, Dennis McSweeney, Joann Meehan, Madison Meehan, Damian Meehan, Jr., Malka Melamed, Pamela Melton, Anthony Mercado, Mary Mercado..(Kreindler, James)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1404 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Pearl Maynard, Vernon Maynard, Ann Mcalary, Bryan Mcalary, Carolyn McAllister, John Mcalary, Betty Ann Mccarthy, Chris McCarthy, Dennis McCarthy, Lauren McCarthy, Margaret Mccarthy, William McCarthy, William McCarthy, Maxine McCrann, Virginia McDermott, Patricia McDowell, Wendy McEneany, Mary Kate McErlean, Ryan McErlean, Timothy McErlean, Allison McErlean Gerstenfeld, Constance Mcginley, Dennis Mcginley, Martin Mcginley, Michael Mcginley..(Kreindler, James)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1403 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrea Maffeo(sibling of 9/11 decedent Jennieann Maffeo), Joseph Maffeo, Julie Magliulo, Kristin Maguire, Annette Mair, Lloyd Mair, Irene Mair Wells, Patricia Malatesta, Toni Maloney, Kelly Manzi, Ann Marcelliano, Anthony Marchese, Lorraine Marchese, Cathy Marchese-Collins, John Martin, Paul Martin, Cathleen Martineau, Edward Martineau, Ronnah Martineau, Doris Martinez, Irma Martinez, Juan Martinez, Jr., Juan Martinez, Sr., Patricia Marzocchi, Arsen Mayer..(Kreindler, James)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1402 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eric Leinung, John Leinung, Kristen Leinung, Jean Lembo, Andrew Lenoir, Courtney Lenoir, Susan Lenoir, Elizabeth Leonardi, Andrew Leveen, Margaret Leveen, Jeffrey Leveen, Jr., Cynthia Lewis, John Lewis, Melvin Lewis, Deborah Loeffler, Jenny Lopez, Marie Lukas, David Lun, Mary Lynch, Cathy Lynn Birch, Leigh Macadlo, Anne MacFarlane, George Macfarlane, Joseph Macfarlane, Mary Machinski..(Kreindler, James)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1401 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gerard Lang, James Lang, Martin Lang, Mary Lang, Richard Lang, Timothy Lang, David Lapin, Deborah Lasko, Ellen Lassman, Ira Lassman, Laura Lassman, Jeanne Lawler, Nathan Leaflight, Andrea Leblanc, Carolyn Leblanc, John LeBlanc, Paul LeBlanc, Jiunn-Yih Lee, Philip Lee, Yi Yann Lee, Zachary Lee, Ronald Lee, Jr., Jeanette Legro, Maria Legro, Juan Legro Diaz..(Kreindler, James)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1400 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephen King, Theresa King(spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert King), Thomas King, Kathleen Kinne, Douglas Klares, Scott Klares, Richard Klares Jr., Donna Klitzman, Robert Klitzman, Susan Klitzman, Yefim Kogan, Donna Krinsky, Catherine Kross(sibling of 9/11 decedent Kevin Smith), Kathleen Kulik, Peter La Corte, Theresa Labo, Edlene LaFrance, Catherine Lafuente(child of 9/11 decedent Juan Lafuente), Christine Lafuente, Colette Lafuente, Anthony Laieta, Josephine Laieta(parent of 9/11 decedent Vincent Laieta), Steven Lamonsoff, Tina Lampart, Donald Lang..(Kreindler, James)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1399 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Doreen Jurczyk, Beatrice Kandell, Steven Kandell, Anthoula Katsimatides, Calliope Katsimatides, George Katsimatides, Suanne Kazanecki, Rose Kazi, Brandon Keller, Gavin Keller, Kathryn Keller, Richard Keller, Elizabeth Keller-Baker, Elyssa Kellerman, Pamela Kellerman Fox, Brian Kelly, James Kelly, John Kelly, Robert Kelly, Shawn Kelly, Christine Kelly Fabbri, Kerry Kerin, Hwa Kim, Paul Kim, William Kim..(Kreindler, James)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1398 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kenneth Irby(sibling of 9/11 decedent Stephanie Irby), Laura Iskyan, Paul Iskyan, Cindy Itzkowitz, Barbara Jackman(parent of 9/11 decedent Brooke Jackman), Erin Jackman, Ross Jackman, Claudia Jacobs, Ruth Jacobsen, Eric Joglar, Cary Jones, Charlotte Jones(child of 9/11 decedent Arthur Jones, III), Joseph Jones, Julia Jones(child of 9/11 decedent Arthur Jones, III), Peter Jones, Scott Jones, Peter Jordan, Vincent Jordan, Anne Jordan Stewart, Kathleen Jordan-Hart, Henri Joseph, Jacqueline Joseph, Leila Joseph, Ted Joseph, Woodly Joseph..(Kreindler, James)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1397 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robin Higley, Coleen Hinds, Wade-Roy Hinds, Dennis Hobbs, Dixie Hobbs, Reginald Hobbs, Sonya Hobbs Cuffee, Tammy Hobbs Ginsberg, Sherian Hobbs Lightfoot, Ida Holder, Brian Holland, Michele Holland Mclin, Dennis Hoorn, Kara Hoorn, Katherine Hoorn, Joseph Howard, Robert Howard, Bridget Hunter(parent of 9/11 decedent Joseph Hunter), Sean Hunter, Gwynetta Hurst Rossi, Andrew Ielpi, Austin Ielpi, Lee Ielpi, David Ilowitz, Sheila Inserra..(Kreindler, James)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1396 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Patrick Hannafin, Peter Hannafin, Thomas Hannafin, Cynthia Hansen, Deborah Harrison, Janice Hart, Michael Harvey, Virginia Harvey, James Hawk, Larry Hawk, Phillip Hayes, Jr., Ann Haynes, Barbara Haynes, Thomas Haynes, William Haynes, II, Katherine Haynes-Pepe, Doron Henderson, Hashim Henderson, Shirley Henderson, Karine Henriquez, Wanda Hernandez, Lidia Hernandez Melendez, Esther Heymann, Karen Higdon, Amanda Higley..(Kreindler, James)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1395 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Roosevelt Glenn, Jr., Roosevelt Glenn, Sr., Shari Goldberg, Robyn Goldstein, Mia Gonzalez, Rochelle Gordon, Karen Greene, Patricia Greenleaf, Peter Greenleaf, John Gregory, Joseph Grillo, Steven Grillo, Robert Haag, Lori Haag Herrmann, Gordon Haberman, Kathleen Haberman, Julie Haberman Osmus, Dianne Hagerty, James Hagerty, Mary Haggerty, Floyd Han, Frank Han(sibling of 9/11 decedent Frederic Han), Dennis Hannafin, John Hannafin, Kayla Hannafin..(Kreindler, James)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1394 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Pedro Garcia, Tania Garcia, Wanda Garcia, Monica Garcia Lantigua, Dorothy Garcia-Bachler(spouse of 9/11 decedent Andrew Garcia, Jr.), Amy Gardner, Joseph Gardner, Margaret Gardner, Antonia Gargano, Elmeda George, Elmo George, St., Kathleen Gerbasio, Brian Germain, Michael Germain, Philip Germain, James Giaccone(sibling of 9/11 decedent Joseph Giaccone), Michael Giaccone, Michelle Gill-Martinez, Jessica Giordano, Jonathan Giordano, Jordan Giordano, Mary Gitto, Thomas Gitto, Birdie Mae Glenn, Donald Glenn..(Kreindler, James)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carol Francolini(spouse of 9/11 decedent Arthur Jones III), Kenneth Fried(spouse of 9/11 decedent Arlene Fried), Steven Friedlander, Patricia Friscia, Laura Froehlich, Charles Fry, Lance Fry, Michael Fry, Patricia Gabriel, George Gabriel, Richard Gabriel, Wendi Gabrieli, Monica Gabrielle, Nicole Gabrielle, Anne Galizia, Celine Gallagher, Emilio Gallo, John Gallo, Lisa Gallo, Raffaela Gallo, Kristin Galusha-Wild, Christopher Ganci, Regina Gans, Hector Garcia, Ingrid Garcia..(Kreindler, James)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1392 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Silvia Eiberman, Jillian Eisman, Thomas Emperor, Thomas Emperor, Denise Esposito(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael Esposito), Jeanne Evans, Elizabeth Fallon, Kenneth Fallon, Patrick Fanning, Sean Fanning, Colin Farrell(child of 9/11 decedent John Farrell), Jean Farrell, Maryanne Farrell(spouse of 9/11 decedent John Farrell), Molly Farrell(child of 9/11 decedent John Farrell), Patrick Farrell(child of 9/11 decedent John Farrell), Kaitlin Farrell Mullen(child of 9/11 decedent John Farrell), Steven Feidelberg, Elisabeth Feldon, Julio Fernandez, Joanne Fletcher, Claudia Flyzik, Janet Flyzik(parent of 9/11 decedent Carol Flyzik), Joanne Foley, Michael Folger, Robert Folger..(Kreindler, James)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1391 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Downey, Raymond Downey, Mary Doyle, Mary Doyle O'Neill, Rosaleen Doyle O'Neill, Leslie Dunlevy, Charles Dunne, Mary Dunne, Courtney Dunne-Keenan, Cynthia Dunne-Welch, Irene Durbin, Erin Eagers, William Eagleson, Carol Eckna, Richard Eckna, Stanley Eckna, Steven Eckna, Thomas Edwards, III, Brendan Egan, Brendan Egan, David Egan, David Egan, Elizabeth Egan, Elizabeth Egan, Myles Ehrlich..(Kreindler, James)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1390 NOTICE of Amendment. Document filed by Frank DiAgostino, Paul DiAgostino, John Diaz, Milagros Diaz, Grace Dietrich(parent of 9/11 decedent Susan Clyne), Kurt Dietrich, Amy Dincuff, Beth Dincuff, Frank Dincuff, Ian Dincuff, Joan Dincuff, Leo DiPilato, Ann Distefano, David Distefano, Frank Distefano, Sharon Distefano, Peggy Dobrinski, Brian Dolan, Charles Dolan, Mary Dolan, Susan Dolan, Thomas Dolan, Catherine Donovan, William Donovan, Nancy Doucette..(Kreindler, James)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1389 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Thomas Cushing, Cathy D'alessandro, Mariano D'alessandro, Jeannine Daly, Louisa D'Antonio, Geraldine Davie, Tanya Davis, Donna Dean, Timothy Dean, Malcolm Dean, Jr., Malcolm Dean, Sr., Mariellen Delellis, RoseMarie Delgado, Charles Demitz, Michael Demitz, Susan Demitz, Woody Demitz, Dana Deniro, Christel Desimone, Martina DeSimone-Caliso, Ila Devani, Susanne Deverson, Todd DeVito, Joyce Devitt, Carl DiAgostino..(Kreindler, James)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1388 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alicia Cohen, Andrew Colbert, Karen Connors, Jean Corbett, Joseph Corbett, Kathy Corbett, Corey Cottoy, Kojo Cottoy, Conrod Cottoy, Jr., Rubina Cox-Holloway, John Crant, Ellis Crant, Jr., Shelley Crant-Baggot (sibling of 9/11 decedent Denise Crant), Elizabeth Crawford, Linda Creamer, Eileen Cristiano, Brian Cross, Laura Cross, Denise Cross-Feldman, Dianne Crowe, Douglas Cruikshank, Edith Cruz, Maria Cruz, David Cushing, John Cushing..(Kreindler, James)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1387 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carlo Casoria, Carl Casoria, Judith Casoria, Leonard Castrianno, Sr., Karrie Castro, Karrie Castro, Joann Castronovo, Gina Cayne(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jason Cayne), Marissa Cayne(child of 9/11 decedent Jason Cayne), Raquel Cayne(child of 9/11 decedent Jason Cayne), Suzann Cayne(child of 9/11 decedent Jason Cayne), Claude Cefalu, Darren Cefalu, Geraldine Cefalu, Pak Chin, Suk Tan Chin, Yuet Chin, Dominic Ciafardini, Edward Ciafardini, Maggie Ciafardini, Patricia Clark, Richard Clark, Sarah Clark, Garry Clark, Sr., Theresa Clarner..(Kreindler, James)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1386 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anthony Calderon, Cathy Calderon, Ilene Calderon, Mariza Calderon, Vincent Calderon, Jr., John Calia, Joseph Calia, Richard Calia, Christine Calia-Costa, Jeanann Calia-Kuhn, Robert Callanan, Rodney Callum(sibling of 9/11 decedent Michell Robotham), Travis Callum, Tina Cammarata, Therese Campbell, Michelle Cangelosi, Vincent Cangelosi, Sheila Capparis, Cathy Carilli-Sinton(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas Sinton III), Richard Carney, Alexander Carroll, Brendan Carroll(child of 9/11 decedent Michael Carroll), Eileen Carroll, Eleanor Carroll, Matthew Carroll..(Kreindler, James)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1385 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by James Burke(sibling of 9/11 decedent Thomas Burke), John Burke, Matthew Burke, Suzanne Burke, Thomas Burke, Nancy Burke Salter, Michael Burns, Michael Burns, Patrick Burns, Kathleen Burns Reed, Sandra Burnside Sturiano(spouse of 9/11 decedent John Burnside), Margaret Butler, Stephen Butler, Donna Caballero, Elizabeth Caggiano(child of 9/11 decedent Michael Opperman), John Caggiano, Joseph Caggiano, Richard Caggiano, Mary Caggiano Malfi, Christopher Cahill, James Cahill, James Cahill, Kathleen Cahill, Linda Cahill, Patrick Cahill..(Kreindler, James)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1384 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Albert Bravo, Norma Bravo, Awilda Breban, Edward Brennan(parent of 9/11 decedent Edward Brennan, III), Ellen Brennan-Krebs, Alexander Briley, Joanne Briley, Timothy Briley, Gwendolyn Briley-Strand, John Broghammer, Margaret Brown, David Bruce(sibling of 9/11 decedent Mark Bruce), Stephen Bruce, John Bruehert, Melissa Brunschwig, Mary Buckley, Margaret Budde, Michael Buhse, Thomas Buhse, William Buhse, Georgia Burgess, Alexander Burke, Brian Burke(child of 9/11 decedent Thomas Burke), Brian Burke(sibling of 9/11 decedent Thomas Burke), Christopher Burke..(Kreindler, James)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1383 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lorraine Betancourt, Alan Biegeleisen, Regina Biegeleisen, Brittany Bielfeld, Marcel Birnbaum, Samuel Birnbaum, Katina Blanding Carroll, Tara Blessing, Constance Blood, Stephen Blood, William Blood, Linda Bodian, Alan Bordeaux, Michael Bosco, William Bosco, III, Frederick Bowers, Jr., Brigette Box, Dalton Box, Beata Boyarsky, James Boyle, Peter Boyle, Alice Brady, Michael Brady, Richard Brady, Scott Brady..(Kreindler, James)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1382 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paul Barbara, Frank Barbella, Frank Barbella, Louis Barbella, Michael Barbella, Ruth Barbella, Ruth Barbella, Thomas Barbella, Crystal Barkow(stepchild of 9/11 decedent Colleen Barkow), Daniel Barkow, Kayla Barkow(stepchild of 9/11 decedent Colleen Barkow), Bernice Barletta, Lynn Baumgarten, Tara Bayer, Christopher Beaven(child of 9/11 decedent Alan Beaven), John Beaven(child of 9/11 decedent Alan Beaven), Kimberly Beaven, Sharlene Beckwith, Lowell Bell, Lowell Bell, Patricia Bell, Joseph Berardi, Maria Berardi, Nicholas Berardi, Tina Berardi..(Kreindler, James)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1381 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rafael Antonio Garcia, Christopher Apostol, Alexander Aranyos, Stephanie Aranyos, Winifred Aranyos, Alexander Aranyos, Jr., Margaret Arce, Gregory Ardison-Gardner, Kristen Arestegui, Nancy Arestegui, Rosie Arestegui, Sharon Arestegui, Vickie Arestegui, Vittorio Arestegui, Jeanne Arnold, Kelly Arrillaga, Ana Arvelo, Robin Arvelo, Mariano Arvelo, Jr., John Ashton, Kathleen Ashton, Darcie Bailey-Scauso, Sharon Baker-Gual, Ava Baksh, Christina Baksh..(Kreindler, James)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1380 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ascension Abad, Jennifer Abad(child of 9/11 decedent Edelmiro Abad), Lorraine Abad(spouse of 9/11 decedent Edelmiro Abad), Rebecca Abad, Serena Abad(child of 9/11 decedent Edelmiro Abad), Michael Adams, Kylie Adams-Floyd, Mary Adderley, Carmen Agnes, Miltiadis Ahladiotis, Effie Ahladiotis-Salloum, Andre Aiken, Cassandra Aiken, Kanian Aiken, Michael Aiken, Kecia Aiken-Dorismond, Roxana Alger Geffen, Colleen Amato, Nancy Amigron, Diane Ammirati, Mary Andrucki, Laura Andrucki Izzo, Annmarie Angelini, Mary Angelini, Michael Angelini..(Kreindler, James)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1379 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gregg Atlas, Sarah Atlas, Christine Coates, Connie Crawford, Patricia Fallone, Paula Hayes Cottoy, Allison Hobbs, Maureen Kelly, Jin Hee Kim, Marion Knox, Kimberly S. Lamantia, Mei Jy Lee, Brian Leistman, Katherine Leistman, Marjorie Miller, Alfredo F. Ortiz, Victoria Pratt, Brittany Ryan, Eileen Simon(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael J. Simon), Kathleen Simon, Michael Simon, Patricia Simon, Tyler Simon..(Kreindler, James)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1378 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lori Ann Arczynski, Rodney Callum(Personal Representative of the Estate of Chester Callum, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Michell L. Robotham), Rodney Callum(Personal Representative of the Estate of Linda Hanson Callum, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Michell L. Robotham), Marianne Deluca, Lori Fletcher(spouse of 9/11 decedent Andre Fletcher), Francine Gallagher(spouse of 9/11 decedent John P. Gallagher), James Gallagher, Andrew A. Gardner, Elisabet Gardner, Lawrence Giugliano, Rachel W. Goodrich, Holly O'Neill(spouse of 9/11 decedent Sean G. C. O'Neill), Sean O'Neill, Sampath Pakkala, Nicolas Pelletier-Martinelli, Sophie Pelletier-Martinelli(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michel Pelletier), Mary Ann Rand, Paul Remenschneider, Abigail R. Shea, Colin M Shea, Ellen Shea, Margaret J. Shea, Tierney Tramontozzi, David Ziminski, Madeleine A. Zuccala(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph J. Zuccala)..(Kreindler, James)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1377 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Abigail Danz, Emily Danz, Winfred Danz, Angela Danz-Donohue(spouse of 9/11 decedent Vincent Danz), Claire Dean, Matthew Dean, Patricia Dean(spouse of 9/11 decedent William Dean), Catherine Flyzik, Janet Flyzik, Aidan Fontana, Marian Fontana, John F. Gregory(Personal Representative of the Estate of John Gregory, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Florence M. Gregory), John F. Gregory(Personal Representative of the Estate of Florence Gregory, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Florence M. Gregory), Haydee C. Lillo, Derek A. McCrann, Michelle Mccrann, Barbara Rosenblum, Derek Statkevicus, Kim Statkevicus(spouse of 9/11 decedent Derek J. Statkevicus), Tyler Statkevicus, Kimberly Trudel, Consuelo Velazquez, Jorge Velazquez, Jr., Marilyn Velazquez, Steven Velazquez..(Kreindler, James)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1376 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David Bruce, Dawn Bryfogle, John T. Crant(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Hilda E. Crant, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Denise T. Crant), John T. Crant(Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Ellis W. Crant,, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Denise T. Crant), Shelley Crant-Baggot (Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Hilda E. Crant, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Denise T. Crant), Shelley Crant-Baggot (Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Ellis W. Crant,, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Denise T. Crant), Jamie Gartenberg Pila, Jill A Gertenberg Pila, Nicole Holly Gartenberg Pila, Alexandra Giaccone, James Giaccone(Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth Giaccone, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Joseph Giaccone), James Giaccone(Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent Giaccone, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Joseph Giaccone), Max Giaccone, Sondra Giaccone, Caroline Kelly(child of 9/11 decedent Timothy C. Kelly), Kevin P. Kelly, Mary K. Kelly, Julie E. Kelly-McCormick(spouse of 9/11 decedent Timothy C. Kelly), Narasimha Sattaluri, Allen L. Warner, Kevin Warner, Patricia A. Warner-Proctor(spouse of 9/11 decedent Brian Warner), Carol Zion, Jane Zion, Zachary Zion..(Kreindler, James)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1375 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David E. Brace, Christina DiAgostino, Clara DiAgostino, Donna DiAgostino, Pauline DiAgostino, Annalisa Marie Genco, Diane Genco(spouse of 9/11 decedent Peter V. Genco, Jr.), Victoria Genco, Elinore Hartz(spouse of 9/11 decedent John C. Hartz), Barbara Jackman, Veronica Klares(spouse of 9/11 decedent Richard J. Klares), Kim L. Lasko, Jerline Lewis(Personal Representative of the Estate of Jerline Lewis, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Sherry Ann Bordeaux), Jerline Lewis(Personal Representative of the Estate of Steve Lewis, deceased Sibling of 9/11 Decedent Sherry Ann Bordeaux), Matthew Pegno, Michelle Pegno(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael P. Lunden), Autumn Ryan, Colin Ryan, Maria L. Ryan-Baldwin(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jonathan S. Ryan), Danielle Silver, Holli Silver(spouse of 9/11 decedent David Silver), Rachel Silver, Dyan Zinzi, Dean Zinzi..(Kreindler, James)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1374 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Margit Arias(spouse of 9/11 decedent Adam P. Arias), Maria Boisseau, Toni Ann Carroll(spouse of 9/11 decedent Peter J. Carroll), Linda Curia(spouse of 9/11 decedent Laurence Curia), Jodie Goldberg Sherer, Bridget Hunter(Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Hunter, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Joseph G. Hunter), Kenneth Irby(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frederick Irby, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Stephanie Irby), Kenneth Irby(Personal Representative of the Estate of Agnes, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Stephanie Irby), Andrea Laforte, Frances A LaForte(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael P. LaForte), Michael LaForte, Raymond Laforte, Lisanne MacKenzie(spouse of 9/11 decedent James P. O'Brien, Jr.), Pamela Ann Maggitti(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph Maggitti ), Aiden O'Brien, Delphine Saada Samuel(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thierry Saada), Lior Saada, Eileen Tallon(Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Tallon, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Sean Patrick Tallon ), Diane Wall(spouse of 9/11 decedent Glen Wall), Delia Welty(spouse of 9/11 decedent Timothy M. Welty), Jake Welty, Julia Welty, Patricia Wiswall(spouse of 9/11 decedent David Wiswall), Erica Zucker Heisler(spouse of 9/11 decedent Andrew S. Zucker), Jason Zucker..(Kreindler, James)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1373 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elizabeth Caggiano(child of 9/11 decedent Michael Opperman), Marianne Cruikshank(spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert Cruikshank), Carol Francolini(spouse of 9/11 decedent Arthur J. Jones, III), Ann R. Haynes, Ann R. Haynes, William W Haynes, II(child of 9/11 decedent William W. Haynes), Cary Jones, Charlotte Jones(child of 9/11 decedent Arthur J. Jones, III), Julia Jones(child of 9/11 decedent Arthur J. Jones, III), Joseph Jones, George W. Morell, Jr., Kelsey Jane Morell(child of 9/11 decedent George W. Morell), Nancy J Morell(child of 9/11 decedent George W. Morell), Patricia Morell(Personal Representative of the Estate of Gaspar John Morell, Jr., deceased Sibling of 9/11 Decedent George W. Morell), Roberta Morell(spouse of 9/11 decedent George W. Morell), Laura Morrison(Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Siskopoulos, deceased Spouse of 9/11 Decedent Muriel Siskopoulos), Harrison O'Neil Morell(child of 9/11 decedent George W. Morell), Elizabeth Oliva Moss(parent of 9/11 decedent Linda Oliva), Deborah Opperman(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael Opperman), Michael Opperman, Jr.(child of 9/11 decedent Michael Opperman), Philip Rosenblatt(Personal Representative of the Estate of Anne Rosenblatt Klein, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Muriel Siskopoulos), Terence M Smith, Jr.(child of 9/11 decedent William W. Haynes), Daniel Stan(Personal Representative of the Estate of Elisabeta Stan, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Alexandru Stan), Daniel Stan(Personal Representative of the Estate of Constantin Stan, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Alexandru Stan), Evelyn Siew-Sim Yeow(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael H. Waye)..(Kreindler, James)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1372 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Susan Bauer(spouse of 9/11 decedent Roger Mark Rasweiler), Susan Bauer(Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael John Rasweiler, deceased Child of 9/11 Decedent Roger Mark Rasweiler), Melissa Berger(child of 9/11 decedent Steven H. Berger), Phyllis Berger(Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Berger, deceased Parent of 9/11 decedent Steven H. Berger ), Susan Berger(spouse of 9/11 decedent Steven H. Berger), James Borsare(Personal Representative of the Estate of Mary A. Davis, deceased Sibling of 9/11 decedent Robert T. Twomey), Sofie Cirinelli(spouse of 9/11 decedent David Defeo), Maryann Colin(spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert D. Colin), Violetta Demas, Eric Jay Han(child of 9/11 decedent Frederick K. Han), Frank Han, Patricia Han(spouse of 9/11 decedent Frederick K. Han), Virginia Hayes(spouse of 9/11 decedent Phillip T. Hayes), Andrea Maffeo(Personal Representative of the Estate of Frances Maffeo, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Jennieann Maffeo), Rebecca L. Marchand, Dina Miller(child of 9/11 decedent Robert Alan Miller), Faith Miller(spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert Alan Miller), Steven Miller, Emily Velez Motroni(spouse of 9/11 decedent Marco Motroni), Melanie Pavelis(child of 9/11 decedent Robert Alan Miller), Judi A. Ross, Marie Ryan(spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert T. Twomey), Emeric R. Twomey, Robert Twomey(child of 9/11 decedent Robert T. Twomey), Vincent Twomey..(Kreindler, James)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Clyne(spouse of 9/11 decedent Susan M. Clyne), Kevin P. Clyne, Marie S. Clyne, Michael Clyne(child of 9/11 decedent Susan M. Clyne), Timothy D. Clyne, Grace Dietrich(Personal Representative of the Estate of Henry K. Dietrich deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Susan M. Clyne), Dorothy Garcia-Bachler(spouse of 9/11 decedent Andrew Garcia, Jr.), Catherine Kross(Personal Representative of the Estate of Harry Smith deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Kevin J. Smith), Catherine Lafuente(child of 9/11 decedent Juan Lafuente), Colette M. Lafuente, Jose Esteban Lafuente(sibling of 9/11 decedent Juan Lafuente), Carol Laieta(spouse of 9/11 decedent Vincent Laieta), Josephine Laieta(Personal Representative of the Estate of Vincent A. Laieta, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Vincent Laieta), Kevin Laieta(child of 9/11 decedent Vincent Laieta), Mary C Novotny(Personal Representative of the Estate of William J. Novotny, deceased Parent of 9/11 Decedent Brian C. Novotny), Jennifer M Smith Riggs(child of 9/11 decedent Kevin J. Smith), Brian K Smith(child of 9/11 decedent Kevin J. Smith), Christopher F Smith(child of 9/11 decedent Kevin J. Smith), Jerri Smith(spouse of 9/11 decedent Kevin J. Smith), Josephine M Smith(child of 9/11 decedent Kevin J. Smith), Thomas H Smith(child of 9/11 decedent Kevin J. Smith), Mary Taddei(Personal Representative of the Estate of Fermo Taddei deceased Spouse of 9/11 Decedent Norma Taddei), Mary Taddei(Personal Representative of the Estate of Elvira Conti deceased Parent of 9/11 decedent Norma Taddei ), Floyd Weil(parent of 9/11 decedent Joanne F. Weil), Debby Williams(child of 9/11 decedent Pauline Tull-Francis)..(Kreindler, James)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1370 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arlene Beyer, Jean Braca, Kelly A Butler, Martha Butler(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas M. Butler), Patrick Butler, Sean W. Butler, Patricia Carrington, David J. Chazin, Vincent Coakley, Susan Correa, Brendan Erwin, Eileen Erwin-Michael(spouse of 9/11 decedent William Erwin), Eileen Geraty, Lachanze Gooding, Carol Haran, Joanne Hatton, Marcella Leahy, Mary Jean McCarthy O'Leary, Ann McCarthy, Shane McCarthy, Michael O'Leary, Alissa Rosenberg-Torres(spouse of 9/11 decedent Luis E. Torres), Douglas Schroeder, Joshua Torres, Mary Wright..(Kreindler, James)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1369 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Berkeley, Pauline Berkeley, Bobby Griffin, Donna Hickey, Mary Ill, Joy Johnston, William Johnston, Natalya Loginova, Mark Lunden, Sharri Maio, Skylar Mercado, Virginia McKeon(spouse of 9/11 decedent Barry Mckeon), Jennifer Mingione, Joanna Ostrowski, Theresa Regan, Jennifer Reilly(spouse of 9/11 decedent Kevin O. Reilly), Vivian Reuben, Vasiliy Rijov, Susan Rossinow, Stephen Saucedo, Dena Smagala, Carmen Suarez, Barbara Ann Swat..(Kreindler, James)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1368 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ernesto Barrera, Linda Bowman, Kathleen Box(spouse of 9/11 decedent Gary Box), Christopher Della Pietra, Ngoran Dje, Rosalie B. Downey, Christy Ferer(spouse of 9/11 decedent Neil D. Levin), Helene Gnazzo(spouse of 9/11 decedent John T. Gnazzo), Jule Gnazzo, John Gnazzo, Joseph Hromada, Roberta Kellerman(spouse of 9/11 decedent Peter R. Kellerman), Maureen Kennedy, Joann Meehan, Damian Meehan, Jr., Madison Meehan, Alyssa Rosenberg, Glenna Rosenberg(spouse of 9/11 decedent Lloyd D. Rosenberg), Kaylee Rosenberg, Samantha Rosenberg, Susan Wohlforth(spouse of 9/11 decedent Martin Wohlforth), Charles G. Wolf, Cella Woo-Yuen, Nicole Yuen, Nancy Lynn Zuckerman..(Kreindler, James)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1367 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Valerie Bethke, Joann Cross, Frederick Curry, Brooke Deming, Sam Ellis, Jeanine L. Frazier, Caley Loomis Fry, Meredith Fry, Taylor McClintock Fry, Alexa Giorgetti, Armine Giorgetti(spouse of 9/11 decedent Steven A. Giorgetti), Paul Giorgetti, Gregory A. Hohmann, Matthew D. Hohmann, Rosemarie Hohmann, Christopher Howard, Emily Lizcano Vega, James Mcalary, Jeanne McAlary, Jilian Mcalary, Joseph Mcalary, Anne McNeil, Catherine Scullin, Janine Snyder Oldenhage, Robin Theurkauf(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas F. Theurkauf, Jr.)..(Kreindler, James)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1366 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joann Atlas, Irina Dubenskaya, Zhanna Galperina, Chaim Ilowitz, Lillian Ilowitz, Laura Khait, Delores Legree, Jaclyn Mascarenhas, Raynette Mascarenhas, Joviana Marcado, Nancy Moroney, Manuela Nita-Vazquez, Patricia Perroncino, Jeffrey Schorpp, Gabriella Scibetta, Jyothi Shah, Diane Starita Renzulli, Jason Starita, Kaila Starita, Emily Swaine, Sarah Swaine, Suzanne Swaine, Cyann Ceylon Taylor, Frank Taylor, Imani Jasmine Taylor..(Kreindler, James)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Julie Burke, Mariann Coyle, Debra Geller, Hali Geller, James S. Hoffman, Jan Kandell, Rosemary Kempton, Karen Lee, Reinaldo Martinez, Mary Beth McErlean, Elizabeth Murphy(sibling of 9/11 decedent Charles A. Murphy), Joseph O'Keefe, Yvette Pabon, Josephine Perrotta, Susan Prunty, Geoffrey Robson, Katherine Robson, Scott Robson, Michele Sand, Linda Sarle, Marie Takahashi, Midori Takahashi, Shusaku Takahashi, Thomas E. Tighe, Mary Tselepis..(Kreindler, James)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1364 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Terrease Aiken, Deborah Amato, Gail S. Clark, Felicia Corbett Jones, Lisa B. Crawford(spouse of 9/11 decedent James L. Crawford, Jr.), Isabelle Crawford, Christine Leveen, Kathryn Lee LeVeen, Susan McDermott, Alana McGovern, Jill McGovern, Nicole McGovern, Austin Mercado, Diane Monahan, Elvira P. Murphy Trayner, Margaret Jane Murphy, Sean Timothy Murphy, Jonathan S. Myhre, Jean Oslyn Powell(spouse of 9/11 decedent Shawn E. Powell), Joshua Powell, Alexander W. Trant, Daniel J. Trant, Jessica Trant, Kathleen Trant, Kim Trimingham-Aiken..(Kreindler, James)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1363 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Louanne Baily(spouse of 9/11 decedent Brian P. Dale), James Barbella(child of 9/11 decedent James W. Barbella), Monica Barbella(spouse of 9/11 decedent James W. Barbella), Sarah Barbella(child of 9/11 decedent James W. Barbella), Stacey Lee Chmil, Robert Clark(sibling of 9/11 decedent Eugene Clark), Jacob E. Dale(child of 9/11 decedent Brian P. Dale), Rachel T. Dale(child of 9/11 decedent Brian P. Dale), Russell B. Dale, Mary L. Ferguson(spouse of 9/11 decedent George J. Ferguson, III), Matthew Ferguson(child of 9/11 decedent George J. Ferguson, III), Wanda Ferguson, Tracy O'Keefe(spouse of 9/11 decedent Alexander Steinman), Danielle Riverso(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph R. Riverso), Esther A. Romanoff(child of 9/11 decedent Daniel Ilkanayev), Yelena Romanoff(spouse of 9/11 decedent Daniel Ilkanayev), Jason Schoenholtz(stepsibling of 9/11 decedent Alexander Steinman), Eileen A Shanahan, Gregory Earl Shanahan(child of 9/11 decedent Earl Shanahan), Elizabeth Anne Vandevander(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jon C. Vandevander), Jane A. Vandevander(child of 9/11 decedent Jon C. Vandevander), Jon C. Vandevander(child of 9/11 decedent Jon C. Vandevander), Mary E. Vandevander(child of 9/11 decedent Jon C. Vandevander), Rema Waiser, Janice C. Williams..(Kreindler, James)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1362 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eric M. Berkeley, Jason A. Berkeley(child of 9/11 decedent Michael J. Berkeley), Christina Caporicci(child of 9/11 decedent Louis Caporicci), Lauren Caporicci(child of 9/11 decedent Louis Caporicci), Lori Caporicci(spouse of 9/11 decedent Louis Caporicci), Bob Cheatham(spouse of 9/11 decedent Delrose Forbes Cheatham), James Deblase(child of 9/11 decedent James V. Deblase, Jr.), Joseph Deblase(child of 9/11 decedent James V. Deblase, Jr.), Marion Deblase(spouse of 9/11 decedent James V. Deblase, Jr.), Nicholas Deblase(child of 9/11 decedent James V. Deblase, Jr.), Kayla Fallon Arestivo, Kathleen Fallon(child of 9/11 decedent William L. Fallon, Jr.), Laura Fallon(spouse of 9/11 decedent William L. Fallon, Jr.), Maureen Fanning(spouse of 9/11 decedent John Fanning), Harlene Larry(spouse of 9/11 decedent Hamidou S. Larry), Rasheed Larry(child of 9/11 decedent Hamidou S. Larry), Sheriffa Larry, Christine Ann Lopez, Elizabeth Merkouris(child of 9/11 decedent George Merkouris), Jack Merkouris(child of 9/11 decedent George Merkouris), Koula Merkouris(spouse of 9/11 decedent George Merkouris), Steve Merkouris(child of 9/11 decedent George Merkouris), Joy Ou(child of 9/11 decedent Michael C. Ou), Susan Ou(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael C. Ou), Lourdes Perez-Berkeley(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael J. Berkeley )..(Kreindler, James)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1361 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Deborah Basham, Jennifer E Brady Cieszko, Erin K. Brady, Grace A. Brady, Mark R. Brady, Matthew D. Brady, Erin Coughlin, Kayle Coughlin, Patricia Coughlin(spouse of 9/11 decedent John G. Coughlin), Tara Coughlin, Amanda Deloughery, Michael Deloughery, Bettyann Martineau, Chelsea E. Martineau, Scott Martineau, Olga Merino(spouse of 9/11 decedent George L. Merino), Tania Merino, Amy Polmar, Brittany Barbara Rancke, Alfred Todd Rancke, II, Alexandra Robotham, Gabrielle S. Scauso, Janlyn Scauso(spouse of 9/11 decedent Dennis Scauso), Juliette L. Scauso..(Kreindler, James)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1360 NOTICE of Amendment of re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) Complaint. Document filed by Ryan A. Vasel, Heather Vulpone, Margaret Wager, Melissa Wilson, Erica Wisniewski, Jessica Wisniewski, Kathleen Wisniewski, Matthew Wisniewski, Est of Muriel Wisniewski, Laura Wyatt, Chiemi York, Aidan York, Connor York, John York, Timothy York, Anthony Zisa, Christina Zisa, Est of Joseph Zisa, Joseph Zisa, Josephine Zisa, Roseann Zisa. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1359 NOTICE of Amendment of re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) Complaint. Document filed by Elizabeth Smith, Mary Smith, Mccarthy Smith, Michael Smith, Sean P. Smith, Valerie Speller, Dayna Spordone, Laura Spordone-Bustillo, Barbara Stang, Catherine A. Stover, Elsa G. Strong, Giana Tanner, Kenneth C. Tanner, Est of Mary Tanner, Michele Tanner, Nicole Tanner-D'Ambrosio, Holly Ann Tanz, Jason J. Tarantino, Jennifer Tarantino, Kenneth James Tarantino, Lisa Torres, Amy C. Vasel, Est of Charles Vasel, Est of Mynda Vasel, Matthew J Vasel. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1358 NOTICE of Amendment of re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) Complaint. Document filed by Jane Presto, Jennifer Price-Salkever, Barbara Rachko, Teresa Reller, Ellen Robb, Brendan Rooney, Brian Rooney, Est of Rosemary Rooney, Maura Rooney, Sheila Rooney, Sally F. Ryan, JOHN SANDERS, Martha Sanders, Filomena G. Santorelli, June Saslow, Jacqueline Scales, Dakota Schlag, Donald Schlag, Garrett Schlag, Patricia Schlag, Tomoko Schlag, Sierra Schlag, Grace P. Sherwood, Est of Paul Sisolak, Est of Thomas Sisolak. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1357 NOTICE of Amendment of re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) Complaint. Document filed by Joan Brady, Karen Mee, Heidi Mennona, Charles Meyers, Kristine Meyer, Margaret Meyer, Dawn Meyer-Fuchs, Frank Montanaro, Jamie Montanaro, Karen Montanaro, Beth Murphy, Caitlyn Murphy, Connor J. Murphy, John F. Murphy, Michael J. Murphy, Est of Timothy F. Murphy, Jr., Timothy P. Murphy, Jean Nebbia, Arlene Orsini, Robert Orsini, Danielle Pandolfi, Aubrey Parris, Pamela Passaretta, Suzanne J. Penavic, Anna Powell. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1356 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Eva Bartels, Jane Bartels(spouse of 9/11 decedent Carlton Bartels), Melina Bartels, Abigail R. Bosco, Richard E. Bosco, Jr., Traci Bosco-Myhal, Hillary A. Briley(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jonathan E. Briley), Yuko Clark(spouse of 9/11 decedent Gregory A. Clark), Julia Collins(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas J. Collins), Ildefonso A. Cua(spouse of 9/11 decedent Grace Cua), Kurt Foster(spouse of 9/11 decedent Claudia Foster), Helen Friedlander Del Sindaco, Regan Grice, Ingrid Lenihan, Evan W. Lozier, Karoline E. Lozier, Kathleen K. Lozier, Olivia M. Lozier, Diane Miller, Alexis Perez, Anthony Perez, Mary Gola Perez, James Seymour, Ruby Vega, Jasmine Victoria(child of 9/11 decedent Celeste Torres-Victoria)..(Kreindler, James)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Meg Bloom, Elizabeth Burns, Dominick R. Calia, Jaclyn N. Calia, Janet Calia-Donahue, Jeanna Calia-Micallef, Michele Iavarone, Yesenia Ielpi(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jonathan Ielpi), Nicole Klein Girluard, Jason Klein, Richard Klein, Maryclair Leistman, Julian Perez, Dominic J. Puopolo, Sr., Joyce Quinn, Lauren Rosenzweig Morton, Max Rosenzweig, Matthew L. Ryan, Jr., Margaret Ryan, Meaghan Ryan, David Spampinato, Donald Spampinato, Laurie Spampinato(spouse of 9/11 decedent Donald F. Spampinato, Jr.), Peter Spampinato, Theresa Stack..(Kreindler, James)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1354 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Boyle, Christina Bruehert, Danielle Bruehert, Jo Anne Bruehert, Jason A. Bruno, Juan B. Bruno(spouse of 9/11 decedent Rachel Tamares), Robert J. Bruno, Antonio D'antonio, Elizabeth D'antonio, Elizabeth Gardner(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas Gardner), Rene B. Hannafin, Jennifer Harvey-Trainor, Dorothy Mauro-Jastremski, Anne Mcginley, Madeline Mcginley, Margaret Mcginley, Patrick McGinley, Peter Mcginley, Terence Mcginley, Barbara Minervino(spouse of 9/11 decedent Louis J. Minervino), Laina Minervino, Marisa Minervino, Christina M. Princiotta, Karen Princiotta(spouse of 9/11 decedent Vincent Princiotta), Nancy Sparozic..(Kreindler, James)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1353 NOTICE of Amendment of re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) Complaint. Document filed by Jason B. Kane, Lori Kane, Rochelle Kane, Joseph D. Keller, Sydnie R. Keller, Phyllis Kelly, Arthur Lewis, Caroline Lewis, Geraldine S. Lewis, Patricia Lewis, Reilly Lewis, Sophia Lewis, Jennifer Lutz, Ann B. MacRae, Ann C. MacRae, Cameron F. MacRae, III, Mary Beth Magee, Audrey Magnsuon, Jeffrey Magnuson, Knut Magnuson, Sheryl Magnuson, Est of Jeanne Maher, James Maher, Est of Raymond Maher, Maria Marasciulo. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1352 NOTICE of Amendment of re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) Complaint. Document filed by Est of Doris Gronlund, Eileen Hannaford, Kevin J. Hannaford, Jr., Patrick J. Hannaford, Bernadette T. Hayes, Kathryn Hebert, Jennifer J. Henry, Susan Hicks, Est of Richard Hoadley, Est of Virginia A. Hoadley, Est of Walter E. Hoadley, Ellen Hughes, Est of Helen M. Jack, Est of James H. Jack, James T. Jack, Margaret A. Johnson, Est of Thomas P. Johnson, Thomas S. Johnson, Est of Donald T. Jones, Sr., Donald T. Jones, III, Judith Jones, Taylor N. Jones, William B. Jones, II, Adam Kane, Est of Bruce Kane. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1351 NOTICE of Amendment of re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) Complaint. Document filed by Sandra V. Felt, Shirley Felt, Michele Ferrell, Megan Foster, Nancy Foster, Nicole Foster, Alyssa Gallucci, Angela Gallucci, Barbara Gallucci, Est of Joseph Gallucci, Joseph D. Gallucci, Michael Giordano, Emerson Glick, Jared Glick, Jed Glick, Jennifer Glick, Joan Glick, Jonah Glick, Lloyd Glick, Lyzbeth Glick-Best, Joanna Glick-Danino, Hanna Goldstein, Harris Goldstein, Jill Goldstein, Est of Arthur G. Gronlund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1350 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alexandria N. Bradshaw(child of 9/11 decedent Sandra W. Bradshaw), Nathan G. Bradshaw, Phillip G. Bradshaw, Shenan M. Bradshaw, Warren Colodner, Alexis Colon, Benito Colon, Shayla Colon, Brett Eagleson, Gail Eagleson, Kyle Eagleson, Timothy Eagleson, Roxann Giordano, Susan Hutchins, Christopher Pascuma, Linda Pascuma, Michael Pascuma, Helen Pfeifer, William Pfeifer, Akiko Takahashi, Harumi Takahashi, Alexander T. Uman, Anna I. Uman, Julie Uman, Yun Yu Zheng..(Kreindler, James)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1349 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Boris Basin(child of 9/11 decedent Inna Basina), Vladimir Basin(spouse of 9/11 decedent Inna Basina), Jolanta Boyarsky(spouse of 9/11 decedent Gennady Boyarsky), Michael Boyarsky(child of 9/11 decedent Gennady Boyarsky), Brett Cahill(child of 9/11 decedent John Cahill), Sean Cahill(child of 9/11 decedent John Cahill), Griffin C. Gelinas(child of 9/11 decedent Peter Gelinas), Jack G. Gelinas(child of 9/11 decedent Peter Gelinas), Michelle Gelinas(spouse of 9/11 decedent Peter Gelinas), Ella Khalif(spouse of 9/11 decedent Boris Khalif), Steven Khalif(child of 9/11 decedent Boris Khalif), Elizabeth Ladley(child of 9/11 decedent James P. Ladley), James Ladley(child of 9/11 decedent James P. Ladley), Sheri Anne Ladley-Calamusa, Joseph Owens(child of 9/11 decedent Peter Owens, Jr.), Kathleen Owens(spouse of 9/11 decedent Peter Owens, Jr.), Maryellen Owens(child of 9/11 decedent Peter Owens, Jr.), Thomas Owens(child of 9/11 decedent Peter Owens, Jr.), Kimberly Reyes(child of 9/11 decedent Eduvigis Reyes, Jr.), Tiffany Reyes(child of 9/11 decedent Eduvigis Reyes, Jr.), Stephanie Villarin(child of 9/11 decedent Eduvigis Reyes, Jr.), Helen Zaccoli(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph Zaccoli), James Zaccoli(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph Zaccoli), Joseph Zaccoli(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph Zaccoli), Regina Zaccoli(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph Zaccoli)..(Kreindler, James)
January 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1348 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anne K. Brewer, Curtis F. Brewer, Brian Flannery(spouse of 9/11 decedent Christina Flannery), James Gabriel, Anne Gabriel(spouse of 9/11 decedent Richard P. Gabriel), Christopher Gabriel, Carol L. Gies, Robert E. Gies, Ronnie J. Gies, Thomas W. Gies, Kathryn E. Healey, Matthew A. Healey, Michael J. Healey, Theresa Healey(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael Healey), Caitlyn H. Holohan, Colleen M. Holohan, Thomas P Holohan III, Liam M. Holohan, Isa S. Martin, William Nelson, Donna Smith Yule, Caroline Smith, Kristen Smith, Robert Smith, William Smith..(Kreindler, James)
January 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1347 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jennifer Abad, Lorraine Abad, Serena Abad, Terrence Adderley, Crystal Barkow, Daniel F. Barkow(spouse of 9/11 decedent Colleen Barkow), Kayla Barkow, Edward Brennan, Gail Brennan, Sandra Burnside Sturiano, Mariano D'Alessandro, Anthony D. Deniro Graffino, Robert Devitt, Sr., Kenneth Fried, Elizabeth A. King, Stephen J. King, Theresa King, Thomas C. King, Andrew R. Lenoir, Courtney A. Lenoir, Asher Richards Frankel, Erin P. Richards Frankel, Claudia Ruggiere Donovan, Matthew Vilardo, Patricia Vilardo..(Kreindler, James)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1346 NOTICE of Amendment of re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) Complaint. Document filed by Paul Cunningham, Sean Cunningham, Teresa Cunningham, William Cunningham, Rose D'Alessandro, Domenick Dambola,, Est of Jessamine D'Ambola, Dean D'Ambrosi, Emily Dambrosi, Est of Jack L. D'Ambrosi, Sr., Karen D'Ambrosi, Alison M. Danahy, Grace A. Danahy, Kathleen T. Danahy, Mary Danahy, Janyne V. Dembicki, Daniel Dimeglio, John DiMeglio, Patti S. DiMeglio, Mary Beth Dougherty, Est of Beverly Eckert, Adrienne P. Felt, Gordon Felt, Kathryn Felt, Lawrence Felt. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1345 NOTICE of Amendment of re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) Complaint. Document filed by John O. Brennan, John V. Brennan, Michael Brennan, Paul Brennan, Thomas M. Brennan, Jr., Jennifer Brennan Waterhouse, Alessandra Bustillo, Dissa Bustillo, Est. of Gilberto Bustillo, Sr., Gilberto Bustillo, Jr., Henry Bustillo, Mirna Bustillo, Sasha Butler, Elizabeth Candela, John A. Candela, Est. of John C. Candela, Joseph G. Candela, Juliette Candela, Est of Phyllis Candela, Est of Marie Carlino, Mary Carlino, Salvatore Carlino, Andrew Cunningham, Julieanne Cunningham. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1344 NOTICE of Amendment of re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) Complaint. Document filed by Susan Beatini, Thomas Beatini, Margarita Better, Pandora Po Bharvaney, Cynthia Blest, Cathyann Bonnett, Heather Bonnett, Julia Bonnett, Kody Bonnett, Denise Bonoli, James F. Bowden, Alyson Bowden-Hart, Deborah Bowden-Hart, Sara Bowden-Hart, Carol A. Bowman, James E. Bowman, Shawn E Bowman, Sr.,, Liam E. Bowman Henry, Jack Bowman Henry, Jeanne Brandofino, Anita Brennan, Catherine A. Brennan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1343 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Angelica Allen(spouse of 9/11 decedent Eric Allen), Kathleen Allen, Dennis Eulau, Eric Eulau, Mark Eulau, Matthew Eulau, Carolynn Iskyan, Margaret Iskyan, Peter Iskyan, Christopher Mascali, Jennifer Mascali, Katelyn Mascali, Lori Mascali(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph Mascali), Corbin Mayo, Meryl Mayo(spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert Mayo), Lauren Murphy Lewis, Merrilly E. Noeth(parent of 9/11 decedent Michael Noeth), Diane Ryan(spouse of 9/11 decedent Edward Ryan), Edward Ryan, Joseph Ryan, Kelly Ryan, Megan Ryan, Andrija Tomasevic(parent of 9/11 decedent Vladimir Tomasevic), Radmila Tomasevic(parent of 9/11 decedent Vladimir Tomasevic), Jelena Watkins..(Kreindler, James)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1342 NOTICE of Amendment of re: (1 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1 in 1:02-cv-07236-GBD) Complaint. Document filed by Renee Abbate, Gretchen Abernathy, Elaine Barrett, Dorothy Bauer, Jacqueline Bauer, Robert Bauer, Stephen Bauer, Virginia Bauer, Est of Walter D. Bauer, Sr, Walter D. Bauer, III, Heidi Bauer-Pollard, Andrew T. Beamer, David Beamer, David P. Beamer, Lisa K. Beamer, Margaret Beamer, Morgan K Beamer, Michele Beamer-Sorensen, Daria Beatini, Est of Doris Beatini, Julia Beatini, Mark Beatini, Est. of Michael C. Beatini, Est. of Michael L. Beatini, Nanda Beatini. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07236-GBD.(Capone, Dorothea)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1341 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Evelyn Aron(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jack C. Aron), Timothy Aron, Joanne Barbara(spouse of 9/11 decedent Gerard Barbara), Susan E Buhse Whelan, Sloan Buhse, William F. Buhse, Edgette Tara Feinberg, Michael Feinberg, Wendy S. Feinberg, Angela Gitto(spouse of 9/11 decedent Salvatore Gitto), Gregory Gitto, Stephen Gitto, Caitlin McGinnis, Iliana Mcginnis-Guibert, Cynthia F. McGinty(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michael McGinty), Daniel McGinty, David McGinty, Charles Noonan, Dana Noonan McGowan, Melissa Pescatore, Jill Rosenblum(spouse of 9/11 decedent Andrew I. Rosenblum), Jordan Rosenblum, Kyle Rosenblum, Jaime Shulman, Lori Shulman(spouse of 9/11 decedent Mark Shulman)..(Kreindler, James)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1340 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ethan Baron, Jeannine P. Baron(spouse of 9/11 decedent Evan J. Baron), Julia Baron, Israel J. Biegeleisen, Miriam Biegeleisen, Mordechai Biegeleisen, Moshe J. Biegeleisen, Ursula Broghammer(spouse of 9/11 decedent Herman C. Broghammer), Alexandria Catalano, Anamarie Catarelli, Santa Catarelli(spouse of 9/11 decedent Richard G. Catarelli), Adina Gewirezman, John J. Gill, Jr, Aleesia C. Gillis, Rodney C. Gillis, II, Jonique C. Gillis, Elyse R. Harrell, Marissa R. Harrell, Rachel R. Harrell(spouse of 9/11 decedent Harvey L. Harrell), Kelly Hayes(spouse of 9/11 decedent Scott J. O'Brien), Joann T. Howard(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph L. Howard), Janice Howard-Battaglia, Francine Raggio(spouse of 9/11 decedent Eugene J. Raggio), Dvora Rotberg, Amy B. Stabile..(Kreindler, James)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1339 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Benjamin Blanding, Deborah Blanding, Hayley Blanding, Jeremy Blanding, Louis Francisco Cortes-Lauterbach, Ricardo Cortes-Rodriguez, Alicia Cortes-Rodriguez, Julio Cortes-Rodriguez, Maria Claudia Cortes-Rodriguez, Maria Elvira Cortes-Rodriguez, Martha Helena Cortes-Rodriguez, Mercedes Cortes-Rodriguez, Laurie S. Lauterbach(spouse of 9/11 decedent Carlos Cortes-Rodriguez), Erin O'Connor, Lauren O'Connor, Lynne O'connor, Matthew O'Connor, Donna Paolillo(spouse of 9/11 decedent John Paolillo), Ella Paolillo, Jake Paolillo, Nancy Raeside Shea, Peter Raeside Shea, Catherine Ellen Shea, Daniel F. Shea, Patrick J. Shea..(Kreindler, James)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1338 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David L. Albert, Donna L. Albert, Stephen L. Albert, Christine Baione, Nicole DeAngelis, Patricia J. Deangelis, Dori E. Freund, Julie A. Freund, Peter C. Freund, Robin A. Freund, Joanne Modafferi(spouse of 9/11 decedent Louis J. Modafferi), Joseph Modafferi, Michael Modafferi, Anna Mojica(spouse of 9/11 decedent Manuel Mojica Jr.), Letty Mojica, Manny Mojica, Stephanie Mojica, Amanda R. O'Connor, William O'Connor, Anne Wodenshek, Haley Wodenshek, Mollie Wodenshek, Sarah Wodenshek, William Wodenshek, Zachary Wodenshek..(Kreindler, James)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1337 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Ashton Berry, Nile Philip Berry, Paula Berry, Reed Nicholas Berry, Susan Calcagno, Christian Espinoza, Luis Espinoza, Stephanie Espinoza, Candy Glazer, Nathan Glazer, Eva Mallery Gurian, Susan Mallery Gurian, Tyler Douglas Gurian, Daniel Henry Kates, Hannah Kates, Lucy Kates, Libby Kristen Palazzo, Kaitlin Elizabeth Palazzo, Keri Ann Palazzo, Lisa Palazzo(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas A. Palazzo), Emily Terry, Patricia Wik Farese, Daniel Wik, Kathleen Wik, Kathleen Wik..(Kreindler, James)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1336 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Anne Angelini(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph J. Angelini, Sr), Justin Apostol(child of 9/11 decedent Faustino Apostol Jr), Kathleen Apostol(spouse of 9/11 decedent Faustino Apostol, Jr), Caroline Kelly(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph A. Kelly), Catherine Kelly(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph A. Kelly), Christopher Kelly(child of of 9/11 decedent Joseph A. Kelly), Susan Kelly(spouse of of 9/11 decedent Joseph A. Kelly), Thomas Kelly(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph A. Kelly), Timothy Kelly, David Dwight Nelson(child of 9/11 decedent Kerene Gordon), Delroy Nelson(child of 9/11 decedent Kerene Gordon), Andrea O'Hagan(spouse of 9/11 decedent Thomas G. O'Hagan), Patrick O'Hagan(child of 9/11 decedent Thomas G. O'Hagan), Pierce O'Hagan(child of 9/11 decedent Thomas G. O'Hagan), Christopher Ake Olson(child of 9/11 decedent Maureen L. Olson), John Eric Olson(spouse of 9/11 decedent Maureen L. Olson), Maeve Elizabeth Olson(child of 9/11 decedent Maureen L. Olson), Sara Tumulty(child of 9/11 decedent Lance Tumulty), Cynthia Tumulty-Ollerman(spouse of 9/11 decedent Lance Tumulty), Cynthia Tumulty-Ollerman(parent and legal guardian on behalf of C.T., minor child of 9/11 decedent Lance Tumulty), Darren Williams(spouse of 9/11 decedent Debbie L. Williams), Payton Williams(child of 9/11 decedent Debbie L. Williams), Dorota Zois(spouse of 9/11 decedent Prokopios Zois), Theofanis Zois(child of 9/11 decedent Prokopios Zois), Stefania Zois-Geol(child of 9/11 decedent Prokopios Zois)..(Kreindler, James)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1335 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cristina Alger Wang, Josephine Alger(spouse of 9/11 decedent David D. Alger), Mary Anderson, Lisa DiLallo Clark, Matthew J. Clark, Whitney Clark, Joseph Coppo III, John Coppo, Matthew Coppo, Patricia Coppo(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph J. Coppo, Jr.), Samantha Dolan, Sarah Dolan, Stacey Dolan, Danielle Ganci Cowan, Peter J. Ganci III, Kathleen Ganci, Craig Harris, Elissa Harris, Sheila Harris, Joseph Holland IV, Kathleen Holland(child of 9/11 decedent Joseph Holland III), Kathryn J. Hussa(spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert R. Hussa), Robert Hussa, Thomas Hussa, Kathleen N. Zapata..(Kreindler, James)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1334 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brendan Carroll, Nancy Carroll, Olivia Carroll, Mary Jo Grillo, Matthew Grillo, Timothy Grillo, Digna Hernandez, Christina Hughes, Karen Hughes, Kenneth Hughes, Timothy Hughes, Christopher Jakubiak, Joanna Jakubiak, Kazimierz Jakubiak, Pawel Jakubiak, Debra McSweeney(spouse of 9/11 decedent Timothy Patrick McSweeney), Dennis T. McSweeney, Katherine McSweeney, Margaret M MsSweeney, Patrick McSweeney, Matthew A Reda, Nicholas G Reda, Nicole Reda, James Vider Rivers, Ricky Vider..(Kreindler, James)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1333 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Badagliacca, Nancy Badagliacca(spouse of 9/11 decedent John Badagliacca), Nikki Badagliacca, Christine Bini(spouse of 9/11 decedent Carl Bini), Kris Blood, Madeline Blood, Michael Blood, Christopher Cannizzaro, Jackie Cannizzaro, Sharon Cobb-Glenn(spouse of 9/11 decedent Harry Glenn), Desiree Didonna, Joseph DiPilato, Maria DiPilato(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph DiPilato), Daniel Friedman, Mike Friedman, Lisa Friedman-Clark, Lynnette Giannelli, Jalen L Glenn, Pamela Hohlweck, Saradha Moorthy(spouse of 9/11 decedent Krishna Moorthy), Stefanie Parish, Derek Rodriguez, Evelyn Rodriguez, Lauren Rodriguez, Morgan Rodriguez..(Kreindler, James)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1332 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Bergin, Katie Bergin, Madeline Bergin(spouse of 9/11 decedent John Bergin), Shannon Bergin, Dorothy A. Bogdan(spouse of 9/11 decedent Nicholas Bogdan), Emily Bogdan, Nicholas Bogdan, Jessica Fiore Lacasse, Cristen Fiore Staiano, Charlene Fiore(spouse of 9/11 decedent Michel Fiore), Michael Fiore, Cameron Kellett, Julie Anne Kellett, Patricia Kellett(spouse of 9/11 decedent Joseph P. Kellett), Natalie Makshanov(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jason M. Sekzer), Lisa Palazzo(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jeffery M. Palazzo), Nicole Palazzo, Samantha Palazzo, Alec Russin, Andrea Russin(spouse of 9/11 decedent Steven Russin), Ariella Russin, Olivia Russin, Melissa Tarasiewicz, Patricia Tarasiewicz(spouse of 9/11 decedent Allan Tarasiewicz), Rambascia Thackurdeen..(Kreindler, James)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1331 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Beaven, Dahlia Beaven, John Beaven, Kimberly K. Beaven, Cathy Carilli-Sinton, Gina Cayne(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jason Cayne), Marissa Cayne, Raquel Cayne, Suzann Cayne, Kaitlin Farrell Mullen, Colin Farrell, Maryanne Farrell(spouse of 9/11 decedent John Farrell), Molly Farrell, Patrick Farrell, Edlene C. LaFrance(spouse of 9/11 decedent Alan LaFrance), Andrea N. LeBlanc(spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert LeBlanc), Aaron Pagan, Phyllis Schreier(spouse of 9/11 decedent Jeffrey Schreier), Alexandra Sinton, Liam Stewart, Rosana Thompson, Dante G. Valvo, Virginia Lorene Rossiter Valvo, Melissa Van Ness Fatha, Amy L. Weaver Achilles..(Kreindler, James)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1330 NOTICE of Amendment re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Deborah Calderon(spouse of 9/11 decedent Edward Calderon), Jeremy Calderon(child of 9/11 decedent Edward Calderon), James Della Bella(stepchild of 9/11 decedent Andrea Della Bella), James Della Bella(personal representative of the estate of Vincent Della Bella, deceased spouse of 9/11 decedent Andrea Della Bella), Andy Dinnoo(spouse of 9/11 decedent Rena Dinnoo), Charles Greene, Claudette B Greene, Jody Greene(child of 9/11 decedent Donald Greene), Kevin T. Haag(child of 9/11 decedent Gary Haag), Mary Haag(spouse of 9/11 decedent Gary Haag), Michael P. Haag(child of 9/11 decedent Gary Haag), Molly M. Haag(child of 9/11 decedent Gary Haag), Jameer Hinds(child of 9/11 decedent Neil Hinds), Jennifer Jacobs(spouse of 9/11 decedent Ariel L. Jacobs), Gabriel Jacobs, Roberta J. Levine(spouse of 9/11 decedent Robert M. Levine), Edward Oliver(child of 9/11 decedent Edward K. Oliver), Emily Oliver(child of 9/11 decedent Edward K. Oliver), Sheryl Jane Oliver, Aneesa Rasool(child of 9/11 decedent Amenia Rasool), Aseefa Rasool(child of 9/11 decedent Amenia Rasool), Farhaad N. Rasool(child of 9/11 decedent Amenia Rasool), Sadiq Rasool(spouse of 9/11 decedent Amenia Rasool), Saeed N. Rasool(child of 9/11 decedent Amenia Rasool)..(Kreindler, James)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1329 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jeanne M. O'Grady dated December 18, 2020 re: Request for new action to be made part of the MDL pursuant to the Court's Dec. 1, 2020 Order. Document filed by Susan Nolan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(O'Grady, Jeanne)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation. 2)a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 default judgment on liability with certified Farsi translation. 3)a true and certified copy of the February 14, 2020 Memorandum Decision and Order (ECF Doc No. 5954), February 18, 2020 Partial Final Default Judgment (ECF Doc. No 5971) and the moving papers of Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgmen t and Plaintiffs motion papers; and 4)a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 2/28/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7778 0031 4533, as per (6027 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN.(smc)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for 1)the Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation. 2) a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 default judgment on liability with certified Farsi translation. 3) a true and certif ied copy of the February 14, 2020 Memorandum Decision and Order (ECF Doc No. 5947), February 18, 2020 Partial Final Default Judgment (ECF Doc. No 5974) and the moving papers of Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgm ent and Plaintiffs motion papers; and 4) a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomei ni Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran C/O Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2 201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 02/28/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7778 0030 5219, as per (6024 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing,,,,, (112 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing,. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(JVR)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1328 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; granting (6526) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (561) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; granting (511) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; granting (735) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; granting (147) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; granting (132) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; granting (135) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; granting (112) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; granting (131) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; granting (96) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN; granting (91) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11876-GBD-SN; granting (88) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN; granting (27) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11880-GBD-SN; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11885-GBD-SN; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11888-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11904-GBD-SN; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11926-GBD-SN; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11941-GBD-SN; granting (27) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11946-GBD-SN; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11950-GBD-SN; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11964-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11965-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11966-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11967-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11969-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11970-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11971-GBD-SN; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12270-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12272-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12273-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12274-GBD-SN; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12275-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12381-GBD-SN; granting (89) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN; granting (18) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:19-cv-11767-GBD-SN; granting (18) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:19-cv-11776-GBD-SN; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:19-cv-11865-GBD-SN. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Stephen Wah terminated.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/10/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (ras)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1325 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Nicole Erb dated October 13, 2020 re: Sudan's Response to Plaintiffs' Letter at ECF No. (6493). Document filed by Republic of the Sudan, Republic of the Sudan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Erb, Nicole)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1324 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (6487 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Letter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/9/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN (jwh)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1323 OPINION & ORDER re: (5361 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1115 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (5180 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1085 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Memorandum & Opinion, Motion for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of Decision Establishing a Common Benefit Fund Solely in Favor of Havlish Co filed by, All Plaintiffs, (6216 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 6216 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Serve Limited Discovery on the PEC and on Holders of Judgments against the Islamic Republic of Iran in this MDL, MOTION for Discovery on the PEC and on Holders of Judgments against the Islamic Republic of Iran in this MDL, filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. The Court DENIES Responding and Federal Plaintiffs' motions for reconsideration. The parties are directed to submit sworn declarations and supporting evidence to the Court within 30 days with (1) detailed information concerning their time and expenses for the common benefit in securing the original Iran default judgment, and (2) information detailing the percentages and dollar amounts that all parties and their counsel have recovered from the USVSST Fund. Responding Plaintiffs' request for oral argument is DENIED as moot. Havlish Plaintiffs' May 15, 2020 motion for discovery is also DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the gavels at ECF Nos. 5359, 5361, and 6216. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN. (ras)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the 1) Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; 2) a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 default judgment on liability with certified Farsi translation; 3) a true and certified copy of the December 5, 2018 Iran Short Form Complaint with certified Farsi translation 4) a true and certified copy of the January 8, 2020 Partial Final Judgment and the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion with certified Farsi translations. 5 ) The Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 2/4/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7776 7035 8213, as per (5828 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN(smc)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the 1) the Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; 2) a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 default judgment on liability with certified Farsi translation; 3) a true and certified copy of the September 12, 2018 Iran Short Form Complaint with certified Farsi translation 4) a true and certified copy of the January 8, 2020 Partial Final Judgment and the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion with certified Farsi translations. 5) The Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 2/4/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7776 7034 5143, as per (5827 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN(smc)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1322 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Nicole Erb dated September 18, 2020 re: Sudan's Objection to Plaintiffs' Unauthorized Filing of "Supplemental Pleadings" against Sudan. Document filed by Republic of the Sudan, Republic of the Sudan.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al..(Erb, Nicole)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1321 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Final Judgments and Notice of Default Judgment served on Republic of Iran on July 12 and 14, 2020. Document filed by Virginia Bauer, et al., Kristen Carpenter, Kristen Carpenter, Joan Parker, Joan Parker, Stephanie Parker, Bryan Suarez, Bryan Suarez, Carol Suarez, Carol Suarez, Manuel Suarez, Manuel Suarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN.(Capone, Dorothea)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment with Foreign Service Immunities Act; 2)Parker Suarez Order of Final Judgment for Compensat1y Damages for Conscious Pain and Suffering dated January 7, 2020; 3)Bauer Ill Order of Final Judgment for Economic Damages dated January 30, 2020; 4)Bauer IV Order of Final Judgment for Economic Damages dated January 30, 2020; 5)Bauer V Order of Final Judgment for Economic Damages dated January 30, 2020; 6)Bauer VI Order of Final Judgment for Economic Damages dated January 30, 2020; 7)Bauer VII Order of Final Judgment for Economic Damages dated January 30, 2020; 8)Bauer VIII Order of Final Judgment for Economic Damages dated January 30, 2020; 9)Bauer IX Order of Final Judgment for Economic Damages dated January 30, 2020; 10)Bauer X Order of Final Judgment for Economic Damages dated January 30, 2020;and 11)Certification by the Translator mailed to H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, by dispatch to U.S. Department of State, ATTN: FSIA, CA/OCS/L, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI) SA-17, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20522 on 2/14/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7777 5349 8070, as per (5961 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN(smc)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; 2)a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 Default Judgment on Liability with certified Farsi translation. See attachment A to the Notice; 3)a true and certified copy of the February 12, 2020 Final Order of Judgment, the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Final Orders of Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers. See attachment B to the Not ice; and 4)a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation, See attachment C to the notice mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20520, on 2/20/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7777 9781 2111, as per (5994 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(smc)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the 1) Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; 2) a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 Default Judgment on Liability with certified Farsi translation. See attachment A to the Notice; 3) a true and certified copy of the Judgment (2/18/2020), Memorandum Decision and Order granting Final Order of Judgment(2/14/2020) Report and Recommendation (2/11/2020), the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Final Orders of Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers. See attachment B to the Notice; and 4) a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation, See attachment C to the notice mailed to Islamic Republic o f Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 2/27/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7778 5419 3701,as per (6018 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(smc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; 2)a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 Default Judgment on Liability with certified Farsi translation. See attachment A to the Notice; 3)a true and certified copy of the February 12, 2020 Final Order of Judgment the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers. See attachment B to the Notice; and 4)a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation, See attachment C to the notice mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Str eet, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services,(CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20522 on 2/20/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7777 9751 3830, as per (5996 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(smc)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the 1) Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation. 2) a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 default judgment on liability with certified Farsi translation. 3) a true and certified copy of the January 7, 2020 Partial Final Default Judgment and the moving papers of Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers; and 4) a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 2/4/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7776 7035 4170, as per (5829 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN(smc)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the 1) Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; 2) a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 Default Judgment on Liability with certified Farsi translation. See attachment A to the Notice; 3) a true and certified copy of the Judgment (2/18/2020), Memorandum Decision and Order granting Final Order of Judgment(2/14/2020), moving papers for Plaintiffs July 31, 2019 Motion, and certified Farsi translations. See attachment B to notice; 4) a true and certified copy of the Judgment (2/18/2020), Memorandum Decision and Order granting Final Order of Judgment(2/14/2020) Report and Recommendation (1/21/2020), moving papers for Plaintiffs January 3, 2020 Motion, with certified Far si translations. See attachment C to the Notice; and 5) a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation, See attachment C to the notice mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520 on 2/27/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 8106 7858 8741, as per (6020 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(smc)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1320 FINAL JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF THE EST ATE OF BEVERLY CURRY ONLY: ORDERED that the February 12, 2020 Order of Judgment for compensatory and punitive damages as to the Estate of Beverly Curry Only (MDL ECF No. 5926 (02-cv-6977 ECF No. 1262) at 5, line 97) is VACATED and that the February 12, 2020 Order of Judgment (MDL ECF No. 5926 (02-cv-6977 ECF No. 1262)) is otherwise intact and undisturbed. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/13/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN (jwh)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1319 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton..(Kreindler, James) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1318 DECLARATION of James P. Kreindler in Support re: (6387 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1317 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION to Vacate (5926 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, .. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1317 MOTION to Vacate (5926 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,, . Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. (1319 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 6389 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(dt)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1316 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claire Angela DeLelle on behalf of Republic of the Sudan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN.(DeLelle, Claire)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1315 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Erb on behalf of Republic of the Sudan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN.(Erb, Nicole)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1314 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Mark Curran on behalf of Republic of the Sudan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN, 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN, 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN.(Curran, Christopher)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1313 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Caroline Breitweiser, Kristen Breitweiser, Katherine Maher, Katherine Maher, Patricia Ryan, Patricia Ryan. Related Document Number: 6350 ..(Pantazis, Dennis) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1312 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (197 in 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN) MOTION File New Associated Case Under A Short Form Complaint and to Adopt Ashton for Claims Against Defendant Republic of the Sudan . . Document filed by Caroline Breitweiser, Kristen Breitweiser, Katherine Maher, Katherine Maher, Patricia Ryan, Patricia Ryan. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN.(Pantazis, Dennis)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1311 MOTION File New Associated Case Under A Short Form Complaint and to Adopt Ashton for Claims Against Defendant Republic of the Sudan . Document filed by Caroline Breitweiser, Kristen Breitweiser, Katherine Maher, Katherine Maher, Patricia Ryan, Patricia Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Doc 5017 Breitweiser Motion to Substitute Counsel, #2 Exhibit B Doc 5165 Maher Motion to Substitute Counsel, #3 Exhibit C Doc 5164 Ryan Motion to Substitute Counsel, #4 Exhibit D Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E Clerk's Certificate of Default, #6 Exhibit F Doc 5312 Order Granting Motion Substitute Counsel, #7 Exhibit G Maher et al Short Form Complaint, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN.(Pantazis, Dennis)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Notice of Suit, Summons, Complaint ECF notification, Complaint, Complaint Appendix, Civil Cover Sheet ECF notification, Civil Cover Sheet, Related Case Statement ECF notification and Related Case Statement (along with attached affidavit of translator and Farsi translations mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran on 6/22/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RB596281405US, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN.(smc)
June 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1326 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; granting (6280) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (502) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; granting (729) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; granting (133) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; granting (118) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; granting (126) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; granting (103) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; granting (122) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11837-GBD-SN; granting (82) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11876-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN; granting (22) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11880-GBD-SN; granting (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11885-GBD-SN; granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11888-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11904-GBD-SN; granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11926-GBD-SN; granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11941-GBD-SN; granting (22) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11946-GBD-SN; granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11950-GBD-SN; granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11964-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11965-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11966-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11967-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11969-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11970-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-11971-GBD-SN; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12114-GBD-SN; granting (23) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12270-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12272-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12273-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12274-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12275-GBD-SN; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vianny Maria Pichardo terminated in case 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (ras)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1327 ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; granting (6277) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; granting (499) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; granting (726) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; granting (130) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; granting (115) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; granting (123) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; granting (100) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; granting (119) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11870-GBD-SN; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11875-GBD-SN; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11876-GBD-SN; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-11880-GBD-SN; granting (57) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12114-GBD-SN; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12276-GBD-SN; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12277-GBD-SN; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, in case 1:18-cv-12387-GBD-SN. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, et al. (Attorney Kanishka Agarwala terminated.) (ras)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1309 FINAL JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF ASHTON PLAINTIFF IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that the March 8, 2016 Amended Order of Judgment for compensatory and punitive damages for conscience pain and suffering as to decedent Thomas Hughes (MDL ECF No. 3226, filed March 8, 2016 at p. 5 line 307) is VACATED and that the March 8, 2016 Amended Order of Judgment (MDL ECF No. 3226) is otherwise undisturbed; and it is further ORDERED that based on the reasons stated in the May 18, 2020 Declaration of James P. Kreindler, Esq., the Ashton Plaintiffs' original complaint and prior motions for damages, together with the entire record in this case, 9/11 decedent Timothy Hughes will replace decedent Thomas Hughes, as set forth in Exhibit A. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/8/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN (jwh)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1308 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Kreindler, James) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1307 DECLARATION of James P. Kreindler in Support re: (6231 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1306 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION to Vacate (3226 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Amended Judgment,,,, .. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1306 MOTION to Vacate (3226 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Amended Judgment,,,, . Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1305 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Benett, Megan) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1304 DECLARATION of Megan W. Benett in Support re: (6123 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Objection to Report and Recommendations,. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1303 FINAL ORDER OF JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF ASHTON PLAINTIFF IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: it is hereby; ORDERED that the August 15, 2019 Order of Final Judgment for Solatium Damages only as to plaintiff Marion Knox (MDL ECF No. 4880 at p. 32, line 15) is VA CA TED and that the August 15, 2019 Order (MDL ECF No. 4880) is otherwise undisturbed; and ORDERED that based on the reasons stated in the Ashton Plaintiffs' prior motions for solatium damages, including the July 31, 2019 Motion for Final Judgment on behalf of the Ashton XII Plaintiffs (including Marion Knox) and the Declaration of James P. Kreindler, Esq., submitted on May 4, 2020, together with the entire record in this case, Marion Knox, as the parent of an individual killed on September 11, 2001 in the terrorist attacks, is awarded a final judgment of solatium damages in the amount of $8.5 million, as set forth on Exhibit A, plus prejudgment interest to be calculated at a rate of 4.96% per annum; all interest compounded annually. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: (1299 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) MOTION to Vacate (4880 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Judgment,,,,, . filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/5/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN (ks)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (1302 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(ad)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1302 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Kreindler, James) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1301 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Kreindler, James) Proposed Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1300 DECLARATION of James P. Kreindler in Support re: (1299 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 6174 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION to Vacate (4880 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Judgment,,,,, .. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1299 MOTION to Vacate (4880 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) Judgment,,,,, . Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Kreindler, James)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1298 OBJECTION to (5387 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1124 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN), (5701 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1222 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Report and Recommendations re non-immediate family members Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Megan Wolfe Benett to RE-FILE Document (1297 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 6047 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN) MOTION for Report and Recommendations Objections to Report and Recommendations re Non-Immediate Family Members. Use the event type Objection to Report and Recommendations found under the event list Other Answers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(ldi)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1297 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Report and Recommendations Objectionsto Report and Recommendations re Non-Immediate Family Members. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan) Modified on 4/6/2020 (ldi).
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNEXECUTED for two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 default judgment on liability with certified Farsi translation; a true and certified copy of the September 9, 2019 Partial Final Judgment and the moving papers of Plaintiffs' Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgment and Plaintiffs' motion papers; and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran, H.E. Dr. Mohammed Javad Zarif, Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square, Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4) on 9/26/2019 by Federal Express tracking # 7762 0106 4978, as per 1087 Clerk Certificate of Mailing. Confirmation that delivery was executed was not received by the Clerk's Office..(smc)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1296 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation. 2)a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 default judgment on liability with certified Farsi translation. 3)a true and certified copy of the February 14, 2020 Memorandum Decision and Order (ECF Doc No. 5954), February 18, 2020 Partial Final Default Judgment (ECF Doc. No 5971) and the moving papers of Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers; and 4)a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation. mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4) on 2/28/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7778 0031 4533. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN(smc)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1295 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of 1)the Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation. 2) a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 default judgment on liability with certified Farsi translation. 3) a true and certified copy of the February 14, 2020 Memorandum Decision and Order (ECF Doc No. 5947), February 18, 2020 Partial Final Default Judgment (ECF Doc. No 5974) and the moving papers of Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers; and 4) a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation. mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4)on 2/28/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7778 0030 5219. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN(smc)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1294 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1) Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; 2) a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 Default Judgment on Liability with certified Farsi translation. See attachment A to the Notice; 3) a true and certified copy of the Judgment (2/18/2020), Memorandum Decision and Order granting Final Order of Judgment(2/14/2020), moving papers for Plaintiffs July 31, 2019 Motion, and certified Farsi translations. See attachment B to notice; 4) a true and certified copy of the Judgment (2/18/2020), Memorandum Decision and Order granting Final Order of Judgment(2/14/2020) Report and Recommendation (1/21/2020), moving papers for Plaintiffs January 3, 2020 Motion, with certified Farsi translations. See attachment C to the Notice; and 5) a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation, See attachment C to the notice. mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4)on 2/27/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7778 5432 6364. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(smc)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1293 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; 2) a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 Default Judgment on Liability with certified Farsi translation. See attachment A to the Notice; 3) a true and certified copy of the February 18, 2020 Final Order of Judgment and the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion, and the certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers. See attachment B to the Notice; and 4) a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation, See attachment C to the notice. mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4)on 2/27/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # 7778 5423 4462. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(smc)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1292 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1) Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; 2) a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 Default Judgment on Liability with certified Farsi translation. See attachment A to the Notice; 3) a true and certified copy of the Judgment (2/18/2020), Memorandum Decision and Order granting Final Order of Judgment(2/14/2020) Report and Recommendation (2/11/2020), the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Final Orders of Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers. See attachment B to the Notice; and 4) a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation, See attachment C to the notice. mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4)on 2/27/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7778 5419 3701Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(smc)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1291 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Judgment served on Islamic Republic of Iran on 02/26/2020. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1290 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Judgment served on Islamic Republic of Iran on 02/26/2020. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1289 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Judgment served on Islamic Republic of Iran on 2/26/2020. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1288 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment Two Certified Copies of Order of Supplemental, Partial Final Judgment, dated January 7, 2020 A Copy of U.S.C. 1330, 28 U.S.C 1391, 28 U.S.C. 1441, and Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act (28 U.S.C. 1602, et seq.); and Certification of Accuracy of Farsi translations by translator mailed to Minister of Foreign Affairs Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran Iman Khomeini Avenue Tehran, Iran Attn: H.E Mohammad Javid Zarif by dispatch, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4)on 02/24/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 8138 7350 5910.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN(smc)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; 2)a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 Default Judgment on Liability with certified Farsi translation. See attachment A to the Notice; 3)a true and certified copy of the February 5, 2020 Final Order of Judgment the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers. See attachment B to the Notice; and 4)a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation, See attachment C to the notice mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), on 2/20/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7777 9756 6385.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(smc)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; 2)a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 Default Judgment on Liability with certified Farsi translation. See attachment A to the Notice; 3)a true and certified copy of the February 12, 2020 Final Order of Judgment the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers. See attachment B to the Notice; and 4)a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation, See attachment C to the notice. mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services,(CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20522, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4) on 2/20/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7777 9751 3830. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(smc)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1285 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; 2)a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 Default Judgment on Liability with certified Farsi translation. See attachment A to the Notice; 3)a true and certified copy of the January 30, 2020 Order Modifying the August 15, 2019 Final Order Judgment as to Theresa Ragan Only, The moving papers for Plaintiffs Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Final Orders of Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers. See attachment B to the Notice; and 4)a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation, See attachment C to the notice mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, (CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20522, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), on 2/20/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7777 9804 3284, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, (CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20522, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(smc)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1284 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation; 2)a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 Default Judgment on Liability with certified Farsi translation. See attachment A to the Notice; 3)a true and certified copy of the February 12, 2020 Final Order of Judgment, the moving papers for Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Final Orders of Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers. See attachment B to the Notice; and 4)a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation, See attachment C to the notice, mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4), on 2/20/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7777 9781 2111. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(smc)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1283 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the 1)Notice of Default Judgment with certified Farsi translation. 2)a true and certified copy of the August 31, 2015 default judgment on liability with certified Farsi translation. 3)a true and certified copy of the February 5, 2020 Partial Final Default Judgment and the moving papers of Plaintiffs Motion, with certified Farsi translations of the Default Judgment and Plaintiffs motion papers; and 4)a copy of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act with certified Farsi translation mailed to Islamic Republic of Iran H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, on 2/20/2020 by dispatch to the Secretary of State, Attn: Director of Consular Services, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI), U.S. Department of State, SA-29, 4th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20520, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Federal Express tracking # 7778 0032 2976.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN(smc)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Judgment served on Islamic Republic of Iran on 2/18/2020. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1281 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Judgment served on Islamic Republic of Iran on 2/18/2020. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1280 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Judgment served on Islamic Republic of Iran on 2/18/2020. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1279 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Judgment served on Islamic Republic of Iran on 2/18/2020. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 NOTICE of Amendment (Re: 3237 in Case No. 03-MDL-1570 (GBD)(SN)). Document filed by Elizabeth Moroney, Timothy Moroney..(Kreindler, James)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 FINAL ORDER OF JUDGMENT ON BEHALF OF ASHTON XVIII PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFIED AT EXHIBIT A: ORDERED that final judgment is entered against Iran and on behalf of the Plaintiffs in Ashton, as identified in the attached Exhibit A, who are the immediate family members of an individual killed in the terrorist attacks on September 11, 2001, as described in Exhibit A; ORDERED that Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded: solatium damages in the amount as set forth in Exhibit A; ORDERED that the Ashton Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are awarded prejudgment interest of 4.96 percent per annum, compounded annually, running from September 11, 2001 until the date of judgment, and as further set forth in this judgment. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/18/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN (jwh)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (5947 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 112 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 72 in 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN, 1265 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN). It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated February 14, 2020, Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn's January 21, 2020 Report and Recommendation (the "Report"), recommending that this Court grant in part and deny in part Plaintiffs' motions; (Report, ECF No.5701, at 10), is adopted, as it pertains to Plaintiffs Christopher Dowdell, Willima Dowdell, Matthew Dowdell, Dayna Spordone, Christopher Michael Ruggieri, Phylicia Ruggieri, Justin Sivin, and Donald Scause. Plaintiffs motion for Final Judgments (ECF Nos. 5402, 5407, 5420, and 5428), are granted as they pertain to Christopher Dowdell, Willima Dowdell, Matthew Dowdell, Dayna Spordone, Christopher Michael Ruggieri, Phylicia Ruggieri, Justin Sivin, and Donald Scause. it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgment for pain and suffering damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent per annum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages awards may submit in later stages applications for solatium and/or economic damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffs Appearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. In favor of Christopher Dowdell against al Qaeda Islamic Army Bin Laden, and the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 4,250,000.00, in favor of William Dowdell against al Qaeda Islamic Army Bin Laden, and the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 4,250,000.00, in favor of Matthew Dowdell against al Qaeda Islamic Army Bin Laden, and the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 8,500,000.00, in favor of Dayna Spordone against al Qaeda Islamic Army Bin Laden, and the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 8,500,000.00, in favor of Christopher Michael Ruggieri against al Qaeda Islamic Army Bin Laden, and the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 8,500,000.00, in favor of Phylicia Ruggieri against al Qaeda Islamic Army Bin Laden, and the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 4,250,000.00, in favor of Justin Sivin against al Qaeda Islamic Army Bin Laden, and the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 4,250,000.00, and in favor of Donald Scauso against al Qaeda Islamic Army Bin Laden, and the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN, 1:18-cv-11878-GBD-SN (dt) Modified on 2/18/2020 (dt).
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1275 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Notice of Default Judgment w/the Sovereign Immunities Act attached, Memorandum Decision and Order for Final Judgment on behalf of certain Ashton and Bauer Plaintiffs identified at Exhibit A; and Certification by the translator mailed to H.E. Dr. Mohammad Javad Zarif Foreign Minister of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs Imam Khomeini Street, Imam Khomeini Square Tehran, Islamic Republic of Iran, by dispatch to the U.S. Department of State, ATTN: FSIA, CA/OCS/L, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/PRI) SA-17, 10th Floor, Washington, DC 20522 on 2/18/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 7777 8466 1629, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN(smc)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1274 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (1268 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 5954 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 113 in 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN) Order on Motion for Default Judgment. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated February 14, 2020, Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn's February 11, 2020 Report and Recommendation (the "Report"), recommending that this Court grant Plaintiffs' motion and recommending the amounts in which each Plaintiff should be awarded pain and suffering damages; (Report, ECF No.5915, at 6-7)), is adopted. Plaintiffs motion for Final Judgments (ECF No. 4718), is granted. it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgmentfor pain and suffering damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent perannum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages awards may submit in later stages applications for punitive, economic, and/or other damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those PlaintiffsAppearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. In favor of Virginia DiChiara against al Qaeda Islamic Army and Osama Bin Laden, in the amount of $12,000,000.00, in favor of Ling N. Young against al Qaeda Islamic Army and Osama Bin Laden, in the amount of $12,000,000.00, in favor of Kathy Cordero against al Qaeda Islamic Army and Osama Bin Laden, in the amount of $10,000,000.00, in favor of Edward A. Nicholls against al Qaeda Islamic Army and Osama Bin Laden, in the amount of $10,000,000.00, and in favor of Valecia Parker against al Qaeda Islamic Army and Osama Bin Laden, in the amount of $7,000,000.00..... (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN (dt)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1273 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Megan W. Benett dated 2/18/2020 re: in connection with ECF No. 5542 and its corrected proposed judgment ECF No. 5565. Document filed by Kathleen Ashton.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN.(Benett, Megan)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1272 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (5953 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1267 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Order on Motion for Default Judgment. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated February 14, 2020, Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn's February 11, 2020 Report and Recommendation (the "Report"), recommending that this Court grant in part and deny in part Plaintiffs' motion, and for those Plaintiffs whose motions should be granted, recommending the amounts in which each should be awarded pain and suffering damages. (Report, ECF No. 5914, at 3-4) is adopted; Plaintiffs motion for Final Judgments (ECF No. 5792), is granted. it is ORDERED that the Ashton Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgmentfor pain and suffering damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent perannum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages may submit in later stages applications for punitive, economic, and/or damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those Plaintiffsappearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. in favor of Leonard Ardizzone, against al Oaeda Islamic Army, and the Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $ 7,000,000.00. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN (dt)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1271 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (5950 in 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1266 in 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN) Order. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated February 14, 2020, Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn's December 19, 2019 Report and Recommendation (the "Report"), recommending that this Court grant in part and deny in part Plaintiffs motion; (Report, ECF No.5387, at 8), is adopted as it pertains to Plaintiffs James Della Bella, Jason Schoenholtz, and Terrence M. Smith, Jr. Plaintiffs motion for Final Judgments (ECF No. 4718), is granted as it pertains to Plaintiffs James Della Bella, Jason Schoenholtz, and Terrence M. Smith Jr., it is ORDERED that the Ashton Plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A are awarded judgmentfor solatium damages as set forth in Exhibit A; and it is ORDERED that prejudgment interest is awarded to be calculated at a rate of 4.96 percent perannum, all interest compounded annually over the same period; and it is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs not appearing on Exhibit A and who were not previously awarded damages awards that may be approved on the same basis as currently approved for those PlaintiffsAppearing on Exhibit A or in prior filings. In favor of James Della Bella against Al Qaeda Islamic Army, Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00, in favor of Jason Schoenholtz against Al Qaeda Islamic Army, Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $2,125,000.00, and in favor of Terrence M. Smith, Jr., against Al Qaeda Islamic Army, Islamic Republic of Iran in the amount of $8,500,000.00. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 02/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN, 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN (dt)
February 18, 2020