Cartier Internation, et al v. Liu, et al
Plaintiff: Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, Baume & Mercier S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, ABC, IWC International Watch Co. A.G. and Richemont International S.A.
Defendant: Central Great Corp., Huann Wayne Tran, Kenny Liu, Song Wu Jiang, Phoenix Creation, Inc., Xiang Qing Chen, Golden Lake Co., EPS Express, Q's Global Shipping, Lin Chao Hua, Lu Q Huy, NU Image Communications, Inc., Chun Yin Yung, New World Top Trading, Inc., Hu Yu Corp., Uprise Mark, Inc., Boa Huy James Pham, Various Jane Does, Various John Does, Huy Lu, KYA International, Inc., Tony Lu, Optimum, Inc., Kien Lu, Speedy Shipping Services Inc., Hai I. Xai, Best Run Trading, Khai Vinh Quach, Sam Liu, KTU International, Inc., Sung Yop Yi, Soon J. Pyo, Muoi That Tran Kwok, Heng Tai International, Inc., Huy T. Pham, Phuong Long, Ming Tong Zhu, DEF, Hopex Trading, CDX, Timeway Asia Trading, Infiniti Fashion, Inc., David's 99 Trading Corp., Jian Rong Jiang, Fei Xiang International Trading, Inc., Da Yi Huang, Nhan Phoi Hoynh, Jiang Hua Chen, Tony Luo, Chao H. Lin d/b/a Lin Watches, Jin Da Trading, Inc., Yu Cheng Xiong, Kim Pham, Giant Start Furnitue Corporation, H & N Furniture Corporation, Smarttime Commerical Trading, Charlie Pham, C. Ph Hoa, J &Choi Design, Inc., Chao :H. Lin, Nhan Phoi Huynh, Ching Tat Wu, Golden Mark Trading Co., GLT of California, Inc., Si Lung Chung, Wen Da Trading, Inc., Thanh Nam Huynh, Laurent Co., San Boa Hu, Hoi Fung Trading Corp., Zhu Cheng Zhao, Kwoc Chung Poon, 252 Trading, Inc., Qing Wen Chen, Lan Boa Duong, Jia Jin Lin, Sunny Ascent Trading Corp., Rong Cheng International Trading, Inc., Qu Yong, VICC Corp, Jin's Fashion, Inc., Hsi Feng Li, Sunny Ascent Trading Corp, Amadou Ba, GKY, Inc., Charlie Pham d/b/a J.A.C. Services, Jung S. Kim, Yim Chee Kwan, Lin Jun Jin, Chen Xiu Fen, Nghia Van Le, XYZ Companies, Chun Xu, JPX Corp., Fabulous Trading Corp., Long River International Trading, Inc., Megawati Tjong, Lai Yun Trading, Inc., Jian Hai Liu, Fansway International Trading Co., Van Duc Tran, Nu B Quan, Jian Min Huang, Yun Kon Huang, Wen Hao Tang, Phoung Thieu Tran, Kilman Choi, Min Chen, Jin Cheng Zhen, Victa Investments & Capital Corp, Ling Ling Chang, De Li Trading, Inc., Hai Lei Xia, Wu's Group Corp., Pan Qi, Full Service Express, Jian Hai Liu d/b/a L.J. Jewelry Co., Huang Da Xin, Dong Yu Ma, Allied Famous Trading Corp, Charlie Pham doing business as J.A.C., Services, Jerry Qu, SMY International Trading Corp., Tom Liu, Vivi Trading, Inc., Jian Guo Liu and Billion Fortune Corp
Case Number: 1:2002cv07926
Filed: October 4, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Griesa
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125la
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting 255 Motion. ORDERED, that the Motion is granted as provided for herein; and it is further ORDERED, that FSE and UOB be and hereby are relieved of this Court's Order, dated August 19, 2003; and it is further ORDERED, that within three business days of UOB receiving this Order with notice of its entry, UOB be and hereby is directed to deliver and pay to FSE, by FSE's attorneys, Wayne Greenwald, P.C. 475 Park Avenue South, 26th floor, New York, New York 10016, all funds of FSE which UOB has in its possession or control with interest thereon from August 19, 2003, until the date UOB makes the payment directed by this Order, at such rates of interest as UOB pays to depositors with day-to-day accounts at UOB during that period; and it is further ORDERED, that this Court retains jurisdiction over this Order and compliance with this Order. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/05/2015) (ama)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER WITH NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. (lmb)
February 6, 2015 Filing 255 NOTICE OF VERIFIED MOTION FOR ORDERS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(B)(5) AND 69, C.P.L.R 5239 AND 5240, RELIEVING FULL SERVICE EXPRESS, INC, OF THIS COURT'S ORDER RESTRAINING ITS BANK ACCOUNT AND DIRECTING UNTIED ORIENT BANK TO RELEASE AND RETURN FULL SERVICE EXPRESS INC'S FUNDS AS THE JUDGMENT FOR WHICH THOSE FUNDS ARE HELD IS SATISFIED. Document filed by Full Service Express. Return Date set for 2/19/2015 at 09:30 AM.(tn)
April 6, 2009 Filing 254 NOTICE of Satisfaction of Judgment as to Hai Lei Xia a/k/a Sam Liu. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (Bookbinder, Julie)
March 31, 2009 Filing 253 NOTICE of Satisfaction of Judgment by Muoi That Tran Kwok. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (Bookbinder, Julie)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MINUTE ORDER PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM FROM THE ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. COURTS, DATED JUNE 15TH, 1973....Case Closed administratively pursuant to Memorandum from the Administrative Office of the United States Courts dated June 15th, 1973.... (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/26/09) (tro)
May 1, 2008 Filing 251 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re: 230 Judgment in the amount of $$18,000,000.00. Judgment satisfied on 5/1/08.. Document filed by Cartier International B.V..(pl)
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MEMO ENDORSED 235 Motion to Vacate. Motion withdrawn. See letter of Scott Gelin, Esq. March 14, 2008. The court approves. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/18/08) (rw)
March 18, 2008 Filing 249 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to the Honorable Thomas P. Griesa from Scott Gelin dated 3/14/2008 re: We represent Plaintiffs in the above-captioned matter. We write to inform you that the Plaintiffs have reached a settlement with Defendant Hai Lei Xia. ENDORSEMENT: To be docketed. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/17/2008) (rw)
January 24, 2008 Filing 248 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re: 230 Judgment entered In favor of Cartier International B.V. Against Tony Lu, In favor of Cartier International B.V. Against Speedy Shipping Services Inc. in the amount of $18,000,000.00. Judgment satisfied on 1/24/08. Document filed by Cartier International B.V.(cd)
January 8, 2008 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #247 USCA Mandate Withdrawing Appeal,. (nd)
January 8, 2008 Filing 247 MANDATE of USCA WITHDRAWING APPEAL (Certified Copy) as to 231 Notice of Appeal filed by Speedy Shipping Services Inc., Tony Lu USCA Case Number 07-2072-cv....that the appeal is hereby WITHDRAWN pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 1/7/2008. (nd)
December 13, 2007 Filing 246 DECLARATION of Kimberly McCarthy in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition re: 235 MOTION to Vacate. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (cd)
November 28, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 11/28/2007. (ae)
November 2, 2007 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #245 USCA Order,. (nd)
November 2, 2007 Filing 245 TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to 231 Notice of Appeal filed by Speedy Shipping Services Inc., Tony Lu USCA Case Number 07-2072-cv. Stipulation withdrawing appeal from active consideration, without prejudice, with leave to reactivate. If not thus timely reactivated, the appeal shall be subject to dismissal. Withdrawal of the appeal from active consideration shall not operate as a dismissal of the appeal under F.R.A.P 42(b). Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 10/29/2007. (nd)
October 18, 2007 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #244 Appeal Reinstated,. (nd)
October 18, 2007 Filing 244 MANDATE of USCA REINSTATING APPEAL (Certified Copy) as to 231 Notice of Appeal filed by Speedy Shipping Services Inc., Tony Lu USCA Case Number 07-2072. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the order is VACATED; and it is further noted that the appeal is reinstated. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 10/16/2007. (nd)
October 5, 2007 Filing 243 SURREPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 235 MOTION to Vacate. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (djc)
October 4, 2007 Filing 242 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Scott Gelin dated 9/26/07 re: Plaintiffs request for leave to file a surreply in response to defendant Xia's reply in support of his motion to vacate default judgment. ENDORSEMENT: Permission granted. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/1/07) (cd)
September 21, 2007 Filing 241 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 235 MOTION to Vacate. Document filed by Hai Lei Xia. (cd)
September 18, 2007 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #240 USCA Mandate Withdrawing Appeal. (nd)
September 18, 2007 Filing 240 MANDATE of USCA WITHDRAWING APPEAL (Certified Copy) as to 231 Notice of Appeal filed by Speedy Shipping Services Inc., Tony Lu USCA Case Number 07-2072-cv. Stipulation withdrawing appeal from active consideration, without prejudice, with leave to reactivate. If not thus timely reactivated, the appeal shall be subject to dismissal. Withdrawal of the appeal from active consideration shall not operate as a dismissal of the appeal under F.R.A.P 42(b). Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 9/14/2007. (nd)
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 239 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENDING TIME TO REPLY: Defendant, Hai Lei Xia's, time to reply to Plaintiff's opposition in response to Defendant's motion to vacate the default judgment shall be extended until up to and including September 21, 2007. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/5/07) (js)
August 28, 2007 Filing 238 DECLARATION of Kimberly J. McCarthy in Support of Plt's Opposition to Dft Hai Lei Xia's Motion to Vacate Default Judgment. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (jar)
August 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENDING TIME TO OPPOSE MOTION: plaintiffs' time to oppose defendant Hai Lei Xia's motion to set aside the default judgment is extended to 8/27/2007. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/16/07) (kco)
July 24, 2007 Filing 236 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 235 MOTION to Vacate. (dle)
July 23, 2007 Filing 235 Motion for an order dismissing the default judgment entered against him purs. to FRCP 55(c) and Rule 60(b). Document filed by Hai Lei Xia.(dle)
July 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Valerie Wong for Hai Lei Xia admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/12/07)- Part I(tro)
July 11, 2007 Filing 233 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/19/07 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. (jbe)
July 10, 2007 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 232 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 06/22/2007, Receipt Number 619079. (jd)
June 22, 2007 Filing 232 MOTION for Nicholas G. Yokos to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Hai Lei Xia.(jar)
May 14, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 231 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
May 14, 2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 231 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
May 14, 2007 Filing 231 NOTICE OF APPEAL from 230 Judgment. Document filed by Speedy Shipping Services Inc., Tony Lu. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 614723. Copies sent to attorney(s) of record: G. Roxanne Elings. (tp)
May 1, 2007 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: 230 Judgment to Attorney(s) of Record: James H. Donoian, Martin S. Dorfman, G. Roxanne Elings, Marcia Janice Goffin, Harley Irwin Lewin, Allison Leslie Lucas, Laurence H. Pearson, Jonathan D. Reichman, Jeffrey J. Ruan, Allan Steven Schiller, Todd S. Sharinn, Charles Paul Spinner, Lawrence F. Spirn, Lawrence F. Spirn, Alexander Kwok-Ho Yu. (tve)
April 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER OF JUDGMENT and permanent injunction #07,0749 in favor of Cartier International B.V. against Speedy Shipping Services Inc., Huy Lu, Tony Lu in the amount of $ 18,000,000. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/20/07) (jf)
April 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting 190 Motion for Summary Judgment. See transcript of 4/19/2007. SO ORDERED. [Endorsed Memo on Doc. #190, Motion for Summary Judgment]. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/20/2007) (jar)
April 13, 2007 Received returned mail re: 227 Consent Judgment. Mail was addressed to Martin S. Dorfman at 311 Crossway Park Drive, Woodbury, NY 11797 and was returned for the following reason(s): Not Deliverable as Addressed. (rdz)
April 3, 2007 Received returned mail re: 227 Consent Judgment. Mail was addressed to Lawrence F. Spirn at 311 Crossways Park Drive, Woodbury, NY 11797 and was returned for the following reason(s): not deliverable as addressed. (tve)
April 3, 2007 Filing 228 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Megawati Tjong.(cd)
March 30, 2007 Received returned mail re: 227 Consent Judgment. Mail was addressed to Charles Paul Spinner of Law Offices of Charles P. Spinner at 401 Broadway, New York,NY 10013 and was returned for the following reason(s): insufficient address. (tve)
March 29, 2007 Received returned mail re: 227 Consent Judgment. Mail was addressed to Jeffrey J. Ruan at 401 Broadway, Suite 2303, New York, NY 10013 and was returned for the following reason(s): fowarding time expired. (tve)
March 23, 2007 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: 227 Consent Judgment to Attorney(s) of Record: James H. Donoian, Martin S. Dorfman, G. Roxanne Elings, Marcia Janice Goffin, Harley Irwin Lewin, Allison Leslie Lucas, Laurence H. Pearson, Jonathan D. Reichman, Jeffrey J. Ruan, Allan Steven Schiller, Todd S. Sharinn, Charles Paul Spinner, Lawrence F. Spirn, Lawrence F. Spirn, Alexander Kwok-Ho Yu. (tve)
March 23, 2007 Filing 227 CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of plaintiffs against Lan Boa Duong a/k/a Lan Bao Doong a/k/a Kevin Duong and Best Run Trading. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/22/07) (ml)
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 226 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to defendant Hoa C. Phung dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/14/2007) (jmi)
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 225 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL... pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P., plaintiffs Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GmbH and Lange Uhren GmbH dismiss their complaint with prejudice against defendants Lan Boa Duong and Best Run Trading. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/12/07) (rag)
March 12, 2007 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 224 Memorandum & Opinion,, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (ae)
March 9, 2007 Filing 224 OPINION # 94379; On 1/19/06, this Court entered a default judgment against defendant Megawati Tjong. Tjong now moved under FRCP 55(c) and 60(b) to vacate that judgment because plaintiffs failed to make service upon her. The motion is granted; the default judgment is hereby vacated. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/7/07) (ae) Modified on 3/12/2007 (Espinell, Antonia).
December 8, 2006 Filing 223 AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO DEFENDANT MEGAWATI TJONG'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT. (jco, )
November 27, 2006 Filing 222 DECLARATION of Harley I. Lewin in Support Plaintiffs opposition to dft. Megawati Tjong's motion to vacate default judgment. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (pl, )
November 27, 2006 Filing 221 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 202 MOTION to Stay. MOTION for Hearing. MOTION to Stay. MOTION for Hearing.. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (pl, )
November 14, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 206 MOTION to Set Aside Default.. Replies due by 12/8/2006. (db, )
November 14, 2006 Filing 220 STIPULATION: defendants reply to plaintiffs answering papers to defendants Lan Bao Duong and Best Run Trading's motion to set aside the default judgment shall be extended by one onth to 12/8/06. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/13/06) (db, )
November 14, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 206 MOTION to Set Aside Default. Responses due by 11/27/2006 (jco, )
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 219 STIPULATION AND ORDER plaintiffs Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GmbH, and Lange Uhren GmbH's time to opposing defendant Megawatti Tjong's pending motion to vacate shall be extended up to and including 11/27/06. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/13/06) (jco, )
October 20, 2006 Set Deadlines as to 206 MOTION to Set Aside Default. Replies due by 11/3/2006. (kco, )
October 20, 2006 Filing 218 STIPULATION; defendants time to reply to plaintiffs answering papers is extended by one month up to and including 11/3/2006. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/16/06) (kco, )
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 217 STIPULATION AND ORDER The parties, throught their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate that: Defendants time to reply to Plaintiffs' answering papers to Defednants' Lan Bao Duong and Best Run Trading's motion to set aside the deault judgment shall be extended by two weeks up to and including October 6, 2006. So Ordered Motions due by 10/6/2006. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/28/2006) (jmi, )
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 216 STIPULATION AND ORDER to stay proceedings as to Defendant Megawati Tjong's motion to vacate default judgment shall be stayed by thirty days (30) in order to explore settlement options. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/27/2006) (jmi, )
September 26, 2006 Filing 215 STIPULATION; Dft's time to reply to plaintiffs' answering papers to dft's motion to set asided is extended to and including 9/25/2006. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/25/06) (pl, )
September 6, 2006 Received returned mail re: 214 Consent Judgment. Mail was addressed to Martin S. Dorfman at 311 Crossways Park Drive, Woodbury, NY 11797 and was returned for the following reason(s): fowarding time expired. (tve, )
September 6, 2006 Received returned mail re: 214 Consent Judgment. Mail was addressed to Lawrence F. Sprin at 311 Crossways Park Drive, Woodbury, NY 11797 and was returned for the following reason(s): fowarding time expired. (tve, )
August 28, 2006 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: 214 Consent Judgment and to Attorney(s) of Record: James H. Donoian, Martin S. Dorfman, G. Roxanne Elings, Marcia Janice Goffin, Harley Irwin Lewin, Allison Leslie Lucas, Laurence H. Pearson, Jonathan D. Reichman, Jeffrey J. Ruan, Allan Steven Schiller, Todd S. Sharinn, Charles Paul Spinner, Lawrence F. Spirn, Lawrence F. Spirn, Alexander Kwok-Ho Yu. (lma, )
August 25, 2006 Filing 214 PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND CONSENT JUDGMENT # 06,1896 in favor of plaintiffs against Vicc Corp., Victa Investment and Capital Corp. and Soon J. Pyo in the amount of $ 550,000.00. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/24/06) (ml, )
August 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 213 STIPULATION AND ORDER, the parties, through their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate that: Plaintiffs time to oppose Defendants Lan Bao Duong and Best Run Trading's motion to set aside the default judgment shall be extended by two weeks until up to and including August 24, 2006. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/22/2006) (jmi, )
August 23, 2006 Filing 212 DECLARATION of Alfonso Herrera in Support re: 211 Declaration in Support. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A. (cd, )
August 23, 2006 Filing 211 DECLARATION of Harley Lewin in Support re: 210 Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A.. (cd, )
August 23, 2006 Filing 210 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 206 MOTION to Set Aside Default.. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A. et al. (cd, )
August 11, 2006 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Scott Gelin to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Stipulation and Order for extending time to oppose motion, Document No. 209. This case is not ECF. (kg)
August 11, 2006 Filing 209 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Motion. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (Gelin, Scott) Modified on 8/11/2006 (kg ).
August 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 208 STIPULATION AND ORDER; time for plaintiffs, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A. Nontblanc-Simplo GmbH, and Lange Uhren shall be extended by two weeks so that Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to set Aside the Default Judgment originally due on July 11, 2006, is adjourned now shall be served to Defendant's office on July 25, 2006 and that Defendant's reply originally due on July 18, 2006, is adjourned now shall be served to Plaintiffs' attorney office on August 2, 2006. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/2/06) (djc, )
July 17, 2006 Filing 207 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 206 MOTION to Set Aside Default and default judgment entered herein on January 19, 2006 for the reason that said judgment is pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.55(c) and 60(b)(4), void as to the moving defendants Lan Bao Duong and Best Run Trading, in that at no time were they ever served with process as more fully apppears in the attached affidavit. Document filed by Lan Boa Duong, Best Run Trading. (jar, )
July 17, 2006 Filing 206 MOTION to Set Aside Default and default judgment entered herein on January 19, 2006 for the reason that said judgment is pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.55(c) and 60(b)(4), void as to the moving defendants Lan Bao Duong and Best Run Trading, in that at no time were they ever served with process as more fully apppears in the attached affidavit. Document filed by Lan Boa Duong, Best Run Trading. (jar, )
July 14, 2006 Filing 205 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence F. Spirn on behalf of Lan Boa Duong, Best Run Trading. (jco, )
July 12, 2006 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Scott Gelin to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Motion to extend time, Document No. 204. This case is not ECF. (kg)
July 11, 2006 Filing 204 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION for Extension of Time to File OPPOSITION AND REPLY TO DEFENDANT MEGAWATI TJONG'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (Gelin, Scott) Modified on 7/12/2006 (kg).
June 30, 2006 Filing 203 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 202 MOTION to Stay. MOTION for Hearing. MOTION to Stay. MOTION for Hearing. Document filed by Megawati Tjong. (djc, )
June 30, 2006 Filing 202 MOTION Staying the Plaintiffs from taking any further proceedings to enforce such improperly obtained judgment or in the alternative MOTION for a Traverse Hearing to determine the validity of personal service upon Defendant Megawati Tjong and staying the Plaintiffs from any further enforcement of such judgment until further Order of the Court. Document filed by Megawati Tjong. (djc, )
May 26, 2006 Filing 201 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW to Defendants Speedy Shipping Services, Inc.'s and Tony Lu's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (djc, )
May 23, 2006 Filing 200 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Scott Gelin dated 5/19/06 re: Counsel writes to request that Your Honor extend the date for plaintiffs' reply to defendants opposition to 5/26/06. Approved. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 5/22/06) (jco, )
May 23, 2006 Filing 199 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Charles Spinner dated 5/10/06 re: Counsel writes to request an extension of time to respond to motion for summary judgment until 5/17/06. Approved. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 5/19/06) (jco, )
May 18, 2006 Filing 198 DECLARATION of Tony Lu in Opposition re: 190 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Speedy Shipping Services Inc.. (djc, )
May 18, 2006 Filing 197 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 190 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Speedy Shipping Services Inc., Tony Lu. (djc, )
May 15, 2006 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Dean Fong to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Memorandum of Law, Document No. 195 and 196. This case is not ECF. (gf, )
May 12, 2006 Filing 196 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF CASE - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 190 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Speedy Shipping Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tony Lu)(Fong, Dean) Modified on 5/15/2006 (gf, ).
May 11, 2006 Filing 195 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF CASE - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 190 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Tony Lu. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tony Lu)(Fong, Dean) Modified on 5/15/2006 (gf, ).
April 12, 2006 Filing 191 NOTICE of of Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (djc, )
April 11, 2006 Filing 194 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (djc, )
April 11, 2006 Filing 193 DECLARATION of Scott Gelin in Support re: 190 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (djc, )
April 11, 2006 Filing 192 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 190 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (djc, )
April 11, 2006 Filing 190 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (djc, )
January 23, 2006 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal re: 189 Default Judgment and to Attorney(s) of Record: James H. Donoian, Martin S. Dorfman, G. Roxanne Elings, Marcia Janice Goffin, Harley I. Lewin, Harley Lewin Lewin, Allison Leslie Lucas, Jonathan D. Reichman, Jeffrey J. Ruan, Allan Steven Schiller, Todd S. Sharinn, Charles Paul Spinner, Lawrence F. Spirn, Alexander Kwok-Ho Yu. (lma, )
January 19, 2006 Filing 189 DEFAULT JUDGMENT # 06,0087 in favor of plaintiffs against the defaulting defendants in the amount of $ 18,000,000.00 each. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/21/04) (JUDGMENT VACATED, SEE DOC. #224) (ml, )
October 26, 2005 Filing 187 REPLY BRIEF in support of re: 171 MOTION for contempt against defts Pyo, Victa Investment and Vicc Corp.. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH.(djc, )
May 27, 2005 Filing 186 AFFIDAVIT of Soon J. Pyo in Opposition re: 171 MOTION for contempt against defts Pyo, Victa Investment and Vicc Corp.. Document filed by Soon J. Pyo. (mde, )
May 27, 2005 Filing 185 DECLARATION of Steven Lesser in Opposition re: 171 MOTION for contempt against defts Pyo, Victa Investment and Vicc Corp.. Document filed by Victa Investments & Capital Corp, VICC Corp, Soon J. Pyo. (mde, )
May 27, 2005 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 171 MOTION for contempt against defts Pyo, Victa Investment and Vicc Corp.. Document filed by Victa Investments & Capital Corp, VICC Corp, Soon J. Pyo. (mde, )
May 12, 2005 Filing 183 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jin Cheng Zhen. Related document: 170 Amended Complaint filed by Montblanc-Simplo GMBH,, Cartier International B.V.,, Lange Uhren GmbH,, Richemont International S.A.,.(kw, )
April 21, 2005 Filing 182 ANSWER to Fifth Amended Complaint. Document filed by Golden Lake Co., Wen Hao Tang. Related document: 170 Amended Complaint, filed by Montblanc-Simplo GMBH,, Cartier International B.V.,, Lange Uhren GmbH,, Richemont International S.A.,.(pl, )
April 21, 2005 Filing 181 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Golden Lake Co., Wen Hao Tang.(pl, )
April 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. DOCUMENT ORIGINALLY FILED UNDER SEAL. DOCUMENT UNSEALED AS PER ORDER DATED 04/07/05 DOCUMENT NUMBER 180. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/21/04) (jco, )
April 7, 2005 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: 180 Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (jsa, )
April 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER It is hereby ordered that the Clerk of Court shall unseal the file in the above-captioned civil action. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/5/2005) (jsa, ) Modified on 4/11/2005 (jsa, ).
March 31, 2005 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 6/1/2005. Responses due by 5/25/2005 (jsa, )
March 31, 2005 Filing 179 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Griesa from Michael P. Joseph dated 3/23/2005 re: request the Court for an enlargement of time to respond to the plaintiffs' motion for contempt until 5/25/2005, with plaintiffs' reply due on 6/1/2005 and that the conference scheduled with the Court for April 20th 2005 be adjourned to a date convenient to the Court on or after 6/6/2005. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/30/2005) (jsa, )
March 25, 2005 Filing 178 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 171 MOTION for contempt against defts Pyo, Victa Investment and Vicc Corp.. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (djc, )
March 25, 2005 Filing 177 DECLARATION of G. Roxanne Elings in Support re: 171 MOTION for contempt against defts Pyo, Victa Investment and Vicc Corp.. Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (djc, )
March 24, 2005 Filing 176 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. COUNTERCLAIM against Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. Document filed by H & N Furniture Corporation, Kwoc Chung Poon. Related document: 170 Amended Complaint filed by Montblanc-Simplo GMBH,, Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Richemont International S.A.(db, )
March 24, 2005 Filing 175 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by H & N Furniture Corporation.(db, )
March 21, 2005 Filing 174 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 171 MOTION for contempt against defts Pyo, Victa Investment and Vicc Corp.. Document filed by Richemont International S.A., Cartier International B.V.. (cd, )
March 21, 2005 Filing 173 DECLARATION of Raymond Sloane in Support re: 171 MOTION for contempt against defts Pyo, Victa Investment and Vicc Corp.. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A.. (cd, )
March 21, 2005 Filing 172 DECLARATION of G. Roxanne Elings in Support re: 171 MOTION for contempt against defts Pyo, Victa Investment and Vicc Corp.. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A.. (cd, )
March 21, 2005 Filing 171 MOTION for contempt against defts Pyo, Victa Investment and Vicc Corp. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A.. (cd, )
February 22, 2005 Filing 169 ANSWER to Fifth Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Victa Investments & Capital Corp, VICC Corp, Soon J. Pyo.(yv, )
February 17, 2005 Filing 170 FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 82 Amended Complaint, against 252 Trading, Inc., CDX, Ling Ling Chang, Jiang Hua Chen, Min Chen, Qing Wen Chen, Xiang Qing Chen, Kilman Choi, Si Lung Chung, David's 99 Trading Corp., De Li Trading, Inc., EPS Express, Fabulous Trading Corp., Fei Xiang International Trading, Inc., Chen Xiu Fen, Full Service Express, Giant Start Furnitue Corporation, GKY, Inc., GLT of California, Inc., Golden Lake Co., H & N Furniture Corporation, Heng Tai International, Inc., Hu Yu Corp., San Boa Hu, Lin Chao Hua, Da Yi Huang, Jian Min Huang, Lu Q Huy, Nhan Phoi Huynh, Infiniti Fashion, Inc., J &Choi Design, Inc., Jian Rong Jiang, Song Wu Jiang, Jin Da Trading, Inc., Jin's Fashion, Inc., Lin Jun Jin, JPX Corp., Jung S. Kim, KTU International, Inc., Yim Chee Kwan, KYA International, Inc., Lai Yun Trading, Inc., Laurent Co., Nghia Van Le, Hsi Feng Li, Jia Jin Lin, Jian Guo Liu, Long River International Trading, Inc., Phuong Long, Kien Lu, Tony Lu, Tony Luo, Dong Yu Ma, New World Top Trading, Inc., Optimum, Inc., Boa Huy James Pham, Phoenix Creation, Inc., Kwoc Chung Poon, Q's Global Shipping, Pan Qi, Jerry Qu, Rong Cheng International Trading, Inc., SMY International Trading Corp., Wen Hao Tang, Uprise Mark, Inc., Vivi Trading, Inc., Wen Da Trading, Inc., Wu's Group Corp., Ching Tat Wu, Hai Lei Xia, Huang Da Xin, Yu Cheng Xiong, Chun Xu, Sung Yop Yi, Qu Yong, Chun Yin Yung, Zhu Cheng Zhao, Jin Cheng Zhen, Ming Tong Zhu, Jian Hai Liu, Chao H. Lin, Huy T. Pham, Amadou Ba, Various John Does, Various Jane Does, XYZ Companies, Kim Pham, Charlie Pham, Speedy Shipping Services Inc., NU Image Communications, Inc., Van Duc Tran, Khai Vinh Quach, Huann Wayne Tran, Lan Boa Duong, Phoung Thieu Tran, Muoi That Tran Kwok, Nu B Quan, Megawati Tjong, Hoi Fung Trading Corp., Central Great Corp., Smarttime Commerical Trading, Golden Mark Trading Co., Allied Famous Trading Corp, Timeway Asia Trading, Fansway International Trading Co., Best Run Trading, Hopex Trading, Huy Lu, Victa Investments & Capital Corp, VICC Corp, Soon J. Pyo.Document filed by Lange Uhren GmbH, Cartier International B.V., Richemont International S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. Related document: 82 Amended Complaint, filed by Montblanc-Simplo GMBH,, Cartier International B.V.,, Lange Uhren GmbH,, Richemont International S.A.,.(jco, )
January 26, 2005 Filing 168 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Huy Lu.(dle, )
December 15, 2004 Filing 166 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Plaintiffs' re: 162 MOTION for Leave to File leave to file fifth amended complt... Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A.. (jmi, )
November 24, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for defendants Billion Fortune Corp. and Thanh Nam Huynh to reply to plaintiffs' default motion is hereby adjourned to 12/1/04. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/19/04) (jco, )
November 22, 2004 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 162 MOTION for Leave to File leave to file fifth amended complt... Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A.. (pa, )
November 22, 2004 Filing 163 DECLARATION of G. Roxanne Elings in Support re: 162 MOTION for Leave to File fifth amended complt... Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A.. (pa, ) Modified on 11/23/2004 (pa, ).
November 22, 2004 Filing 162 NOTICE OF MOTION for Leave to File fifth amended complt.. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A.. (pa, ) Modified on 11/23/2004 (pa, ).
October 22, 2004 Filing 161 DECLARATION of Allison L. Lucas in Support re: 159 MOTION for Attorney Fees. MOTION for Default Judgment as to. MOTION for Default Judgment as to. MOTION for Default Judgment as to. MOTION for Default Judgment as to. MOTION for Default Judgment as to. MOTION for Permanent Injunction. MOTION for Permanent Injunction. MOTION for Permanent Injunction. MOTION for Permanent Injunction. MOTION for Permanent Injunction.. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A.. (jge, )
October 22, 2004 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 159 MOTION for Attorney Fees. MOTION for Default Judgment as to Sam Liu, Jian Hai Liu, a/k/a Kenny Liu, Jian Hai Liu, d/b/a L.J. Jewelry Co., Chao H. Lin, a/k/a H. L. Chao, Chao H. Lin, d/b/a Lin Watches, Billion Fortune Company, Thanh Nam Huynh, Van Duc Tran, Khai Vinh Quach, Huann Wayne Tran, Lan Boa Duong, C. Hung Hoa, Huy T. Pham, Amadou Ba, Muoi That Tran Kwok, Nghia Van Le, Nu Be Quan, Nhan Phoi Huynh, Megawati Tjong, Phoung Thieu Tran, Phoung Long, Sunny Ascent Trading Corp., Timeaway Asia Trading Corp., Allied Famous Trading Corp., Golden Mark Trading Corp., Smart Time Commercial Trading, Inc., Hoi Fung Trading, Inc., Hopex Trading, Inc., Fansway International Trading Corp., Central Great Corp. and Best Run Trading. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A.. MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A.. (jge, )
October 22, 2004 Filing 159 MOTION for Attorney Fees., MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sam Liu, Jian Hai Liu, a/k/a Kenny Liu, Jian Hai Liu, d/b/a L.J. Jewelry Co., Chao H. Lin, a/k/a H. L. Chao, Chao H. Lin, d/b/a Lin Watches, Billion Fortune Company, Thanh Nam Huynh, Van Duc Tran, Khai Vinh Quach, Huann Wayne Tran, Lan Boa Duong, C. Hung Hoa, Huy T. Pham, Amadou Ba, Muoi That Tran Kwok, Nghia Van Le, Nu Be Quan, Nhan Phoi Huynh, Megawati Tjong, Phoung Thieu Tran, Phoung Long, Sunny Ascent Trading Corp., Timeaway Asia Trading Corp., Allied Famous Trading Corp., Golden Mark Trading Corp., Smart Time Commercial Trading, Inc., Hoi Fung Trading, Inc., Hopex Trading, Inc., Fansway International Trading Corp., Central Great Corp. and Best Run Trading. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A..., MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A.. (jge, )
October 18, 2004 Filing 158 AMENDED ANSWER to Fourth Amended Complaint; with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Victa Investments & Capital Corp, VICC Corp, Soon J. Pyo. (djc, )
October 14, 2004 Filing 157 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Dfts' Soon J. Pyo, Vicc Corp. and Victa Investments & Capital Corp. Related document: 91 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Tony Lu, Speedy Shipping Services Inc..(pl, )
October 14, 2004 Filing 156 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT VICC Corp. and Victa Investments. (pl, )
September 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND ORDER, defts' time to Answer the Fourth Amended Complaint is adjourned to 10/12/04 and to be fld by 10/13/04. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/28/04) (cd, )
September 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER that the clerk of the court shall unseal the file of this action. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/29/04) (dle, )
September 22, 2004 Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/17/04 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa.(pa, )
September 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 152 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER that the TRO against Victa Defendants, as well as their agents, servants and employees and any persons in active concert or participation with them, is extended ten (10) days or until the Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction can be heard, except that the TRO is lifted with respect to Victa Defendants' New Jersey operations; and that Victa Defendants are to provide an accounting no later than 3 p.m. today, 8/30/04, of the #1,057,000 obtained from Wachovia Bank on 8/20/04; that Victa Defendants are to immediately return the $1,057,000 to plaintiffs to be restrained pursuant to the August 17, 2004 Orders. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/17/04) (jco, )
September 21, 2004 Filing 151 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/17/04 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa.(pa, )
September 16, 2004 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal to Attorney(s) of Record: James H. Donoian, Martin S. Dorfman, Harley I. Lewin, Allison Leslie Lucas, Jonathan D. Reichman, Todd S. Sharinn, Charles Spinner, Lawrence F. Spirn, Lawrence F. Spirn. (snu, )
September 14, 2004 Filing 149 FINAL CONSENT JUDGMENT # 04,1682 AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of plaintiffs against Q's Global Inc., d/b/a Q's Global Shipping and trading and Xingmao Qu a/k/a Jerry Qu in the amount of $ 150,000.00. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/13/04) (ml, )
September 8, 2004 Filing 148 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 8/30/04 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa.(dfe, )
August 31, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER that the TRO against Victa dfts is extended ten days or until the order to show cause for preliminary injunction can be heard, except that the TRO is lifted with respect to Victa dfts' New Jersey operations; Victa dfts are to provide an accounting of the $1,057,000 obtained from Wachovia Bank on 8/20/04; Victa dfts are to return the $1,057,000 to be restrained pursuant to the 8/17/04 and any further order of this court.(Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/30/04) (dle, )
August 26, 2004 Filing 146 AFFIRMATION of Soon J. Pyo in Support of Motion to Remove Temporary Restraining Order and Seizure Order. (ps, )
August 26, 2004 Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of dissolving temporary restraining and seizure orders and in Opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injuction and to file fourth Amended Complaint. (ps, )
August 25, 2004 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: 136 Order,, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (djc, )
August 24, 2004 Set Answer Due Date purs. to 144 Stipulation and Order, as to Huy Lu answer due on 8/19/2004. (yv, )
August 24, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs Cartier International, B.V., Et Al and defendant HUY LU a/k/a ATON, hereby request that the Court extend defendant's time to plead or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint to Thursday, 8/19/04. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/20/04) (yv, )
August 20, 2004 Filing 143 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of fourth amended complaint. Service was accepted by soon J. Pyo for VICC. Document filed by ABC, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme. (djc, )
August 20, 2004 Filing 142 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Fourth Amended Complaint as to YOm O. Kim. Service was accepted by Yom O. Kim. Document filed by ABC, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme. (djc, )
August 20, 2004 Filing 141 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Fourth amended complaint as to Soon J. Pyo. Accepted by personal service upon Soon J. Pyo Document filed by ABC, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme. (djc, )
August 20, 2004 Filing 140 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Fourth Amended complaint as to V.I.C.C. Corp, Victa Investment Capital Corp and Soon J. Pyo. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by ABC, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. (djc, )
August 19, 2004 Filing 138 ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Huy Lu. Related document: 82 Amended Complaint, filed by Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Richemont International S.A..(djc, )
August 19, 2004 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: 137 USCA Mandate. (tp, )
August 19, 2004 Filing 137 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 43 Notice of Appeal, filed by Billion Fortune Corp, Thanh Nam Huynh USCA Case Number 03-7509. it is Ordered that the appeal is hereby DISMISSED. Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk USCA. Certified: 8/12/04. (tp, )
August 18, 2004 Filing 139 MOTION for enty of default against defendants. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
August 17, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER to PARTIALLY SEAL THE FILE; the Clerk of the Court shall maintain Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint, Order to Show Cause for a Temporary Restraining Order and all documents filed in support thereof as of the date of this Order under seal pending further order of the Court. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/17/04) (djc, )
August 16, 2004 Filing 135 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Hopex Trading served on 10/9/2002, answer due 10/29/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Cartier International B.V. (kw, )
August 16, 2004 Filing 134 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Best Run Trading served on 10/9/2002, answer due 10/29/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (kw, )
July 29, 2004 Filing 104 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. NU Image Communications, Inc. served on 9/18/2003, answer due 10/8/2003. Service was accepted by Lucy Wang. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 132 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Fansway International Trading Co. served on 12/5/2002, answer due 12/25/2002. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 131 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Timeway Asia Trading served on 12/10/2002, answer due 12/30/2002. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 130 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Allied Famous Trading Corp served on 12/5/2002, answer due 12/25/2002. Service was accepted by Lee Sin Fong and Huynh Nhan. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 129 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Golden Mark Trading Co. served on 12/10/2002, answer due 12/30/2002. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 128 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Smarttime Commerical Trading served on 12/10/2002, answer due 12/30/2002. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 127 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Central Great Corp. served on 12/5/2002, answer due 12/25/2002. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 126 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Hoi Fung Trading Corp. served on 12/10/2002, answer due 12/30/2002. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 125 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Billion Fortune Corp served on 10/8/2002, answer due 10/28/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 124 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Sunny Ascent Trading Corp served on 10/9/2002, answer due 10/29/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 123 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Megawati Tjong served on 12/11/2002, answer due 12/31/2002. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 122 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Nhan Phoi Hoynh served on 10/10/2002, answer due 10/30/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 121 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Nu B Quan served on 10/10/2002, answer due 10/30/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 120 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Yun Kon Huang served on 10/8/2002, answer due 10/28/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 119 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Muoi That Tran Kwok served on 12/10/2002, answer due 12/30/2002. Service was made by Mailbox. Document filed lfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, ) Modified on 8/3/2004 (jco, ).
July 28, 2004 Filing 118 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Phoung Thieu Tran served on 12/17/2002, answer due 1/6/2003. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 117 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Amadou Ba served on 10/8/2002, answer due 10/28/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 116 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Huy T. Pham served on 10/8/02, answer due 10/28/02. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, ) Modified on 8/12/2004 (jco, ).
July 28, 2004 Filing 115 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. C. Ph Hoa served on 10/8/2002, answer due 10/28/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 114 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Lan Boa Duong served on 12/10/02, answer due 12/30/2002. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, ) Modified on 8/12/2004 (jco, ).
July 28, 2004 Filing 113 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Huann Wayne Tran served on 12/10/2002, answer due 12/30/2002. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 112 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Khai Vinh Quach served on 12/11/02, answer due 12/31/02. Service was made by served at 35 Rock Street #26, Jersey City. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, ) Modified on 8/12/2004 (jco, ).
July 28, 2004 Filing 111 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Van Duc Tran served on 12/10/2002, answer due 12/30/2002. Service was made by at the residence. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 110 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Charlie Pham d/b/a J.A.C. Services served on 10/8/2002, answer due 10/28/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 109 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Pham Kim served on 10/8/2002, answer due 10/28/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 108 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Thanh Nam Huynh served on 10/9/2002, answer due 10/29/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 107 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Chao H. Lin served on 10/8/2002, answer due 10/28/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 106 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Jian Hai Liu served on 10/8/2002, answer due 10/28/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 28, 2004 Filing 105 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Hai I. Xai served on 10/8/2002, answer due 10/28/2002. Service was accepted by personal service. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd. ; Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie ; Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron ; Baume & Mercier S.A. ; Cartier International B.V. ; Constantin Sopciete Anonyme ; IWC International Watch Co. A.G. ; Lange Uhren GmbH ; Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A. ; Montblanc-Simplo GMBH ; Richemont International S.A. (jco, )
July 8, 2004 Mailed notice of Right to Appeal to Attorney(s) of Record: James H. Donoian, Martin S. Dorfman, Harley I. Lewin, Todd S. Sharinn, Charles Spinner, Lawrence F. Spirn. (snu, )
July 1, 2004 Filing 103 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re: 102 Consent Judgment in the amount of $1,000,000.00.i in favor of judgment creditor Cartier International BV et al, and against judgment debtors JAC Services, Charles Pham, Kim ham and James Pham in the amount of $1,000,000.00; Judgment satisfied on 6/30/04.(djc, )
June 28, 2004 Filing 102 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION # 04,1225 in the amount of $ 1,000,000. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 6/24/04) (jf, )
June 23, 2004 Filing 101 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint on Kien Lu on 6/18/04. Service was accepted by Dora Lay. Document filed by ABC, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A.. (dle, )
June 23, 2004 Filing 100 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint on Huy Lu a/k/a Anton. Service was accepted by Dora Lay. Document filed by ABC, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A.. (dle, )
April 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ALLOWING FILING UNDER SEAL; that the Clerk of the Court shall maintain Plaitniffs' Reply Memorandum of Law and Declaration of George Arnold and all exhibits thereto as of the date of this Order under seal pending further order of the Court. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/19/04) (sac, )
April 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER, extension of the temporary restraining order on consent; that the TRO against Full Service Express a/k/a EPS Express and Qing Wen Chen a/k/a Charlie Chen as well as its agents, servants and employees and any persons in active concert or participation with them, is exnteded through the disposition of Plaitniffs' Motion for Contempt. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/19/04) (sac, )
April 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER. Regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential matters. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/5/04) (yv, )
April 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, SEIZURE ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CONTEMPT, ORDER FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY and ORDER SEALING FILE. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/19/03. Document unsealed pursuant to Order, #71. (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SEIZURE ORDER, ASSET RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CONTEMPT, ORDER FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, ORDER AMENDING THE COMPLAINT AND ORDER SEALING FILE.(Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/5/04) Document unsealed pursuant to Order, #71.(sb, )
April 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER to partially seal the file; The Clerk of the Court shall maintain Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, Order to Show Cause for Contempt and all documents filed in support as of the date of this Order under seal pending further order of the Court. Document unsealed pursuant to Order, Document # 71. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/5/04) (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 92 DECLARATION of George J. Arnold in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71. (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 91 ANSWER to SECOND AMENDED Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A. Document filed by Speedy Shipping Services Inc., Tony Lu. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71.(sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Tony Lu in Opposition to Preliminary Injunction, Temporary Restraining Order, Seizure Order. (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining and Seizing Order, Order Sealing File, Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction, Order for Expedited Discovery and Order to Amend the Amended Order for Expedited Discovery and Order to Amend the Amended Complaint. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71. (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 88 TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to 43 Notice of Appeal, filed by Billion Fortune Corp, Thanh Nam Huynh USCA Case Number 03-7509. Motion for permission to file C and D forms out of time. The motion is granted. Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk USCA. Certified: 8/11/03. (sb, ) Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71.
April 1, 2004 Filing 87 DECLARATION of George J. Arnold III in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71. (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Allison L. Lucas in Support of Contempt. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71. (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 78 Application for Ex Parte Seizure Order, Order to Show Cause for Contempt, Order for Expedited Discovery and Order Sealing File. Document filed by Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Montblanc-Simplo GMBH, Richemont International S.A. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71. (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING AND SEIZURE ORDER, ORDER SEALING FILE, ORDER to SHOW CAUSE for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ORDER for EXPEDITED DISCOVERY and ORDER TO AMEND the AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/19/03) Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71.(sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 82 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 6 Complaint against Amadou Ba, C. Ph Hoa, Yun Kon Huang, Chao H. Lin, Chao H. Lin, Jian Hai Liu, Kenny Liu, Sam Liu, Tom Liu, Charlie Pham, Huy T. Pham, Kim Pham, Various Jane Does, Various John Does, XYZ Companies.Document filed by Richemont International S.A., Cartier International B.V., Lange Uhren GmbH, Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. Related document: 6 Complaint.(sb, ) Modified on 4/7/2004 (sb, ). Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71.
April 1, 2004 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 78 Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Order of Seizure, Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction, Expedited Discovery, Order to Amend the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71. (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 80 DECLARATION of Allison Lucas in Support of 78 Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Order of Seizure, Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction, Expedited Discovery, Order to Amend the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71. (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 78 Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Order of Seizure, Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction, Expedited Discovery, and Order to Amend the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71. (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 78 Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Order of Seizure, Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction, Expedited Discovery, Order to Amend the Amended Complaint and Declarations of George J. Arnold III and Allison L. Lucas. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71. (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 77 DECLARATION of George J. Arnold III in Support of Application for Ex Parte Seizure Order, Order to Show Cause for Contempt, Order for Expedited Discovery and Order Sealing File. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71.(sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Allison Lucas in Support of Application for Ex Parte Seizure Order, Order to Show Cause for Contempt, Order for Expedited Discovery and Order Sealing File. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH.Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71.(sb, )
April 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 75 AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, SEIZURE ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for CONTEMPT, ORDER for Expedited Discovery and ORDER Seaing File. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/31/03) (sb, ) Modified on 4/7/2004 (sb, ). Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71.
April 1, 2004 Filing 74 DECLARATION of George J. Arnold III in Support of Application for Ex Parte Seizure Order, Order to Show Cause for Contempt, Order for Expedited Discovery and Order Sealing File. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71.(sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Gregory Bishop in Support of Application for Ex Parte Seizure Order, Order to Show Cause for Contempt, Order for Expedited Discovery and Order Sealing File. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71. (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Application for Ex Parte Seizure Order, Order to Show Cause for Contempt, Order for Expedited Discovery and Order Sealing File. Document filed by Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie, Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron, Baume & Mercier S.A., Cartier International B.V., Constantin Sopciete Anonyme, IWC International Watch Co. A.G., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A., Montblanc-Simplo GMBH. Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71. (sb, )
April 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER. The Clerk of the Court shall unseal the action in its entirety. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/31/04) (yv, )
March 19, 2004 Filing 70 CERTIFICATION OF Andy Wong. (djc, )
March 19, 2004 Filing 69 CERTIFICATION of of Qing Wen Chen. (djc, )
March 5, 2004 MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: that a Preliminary Injunction/TRO Hearing was held on 3/5/04. (tp, )
March 4, 2004 Filing 66 CONSENT JUDGMENT of permanent injunction enjoining the defendants from using plaintiff's trademark's etc.;defendants shall pay plaintiffs the sum of $20,000 by wire transdfer immediately; and in the event the defendants violate the injunction, additional damages shall be entered in the amount of $10,000 and the Court retains jurisdiction of the parties and subject matter of the action. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 03/03/04) (jf, )
November 14, 2003 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Allison L. Lucas by Cartier Internation, Richemont International, Montblanc-Simplo, Lange Uhren GmbH in support of motion for contempt against defendants Jac Services, Charlie Pham, Kim Pham and Bao Huy James Pham. (sac)
November 14, 2003 Filing 64 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Cartier Internation, Richemont International, Montblanc-Simplo, Lange Uhren GmbH in support of Contempt. (sac)
November 10, 2003 Filing 63 Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Thomas P. Griesa . (df)
November 3, 2003 Filing 62 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Huy T. Pham, Kim Pham, Charlie Pham : amends [54-1] complaint answer (yv)
October 24, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: pursuant to Rule 65, dfts, their agents, employees, and any persons acting in active concert or participation with them are preliminarily enjoined and restrained from using pltffs trademarks as further set forth in said order , the seal is hereby removed from this action . ( signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa ) (db)
October 14, 2003 Filing 60 ANSWER by Cartier Internation, Montblanc-Simplo, Lange Uhren GmbH to counterclaims of Tony Lu and Speedy Shipping; Firm of: Greenberg Traurig by attorney Harley Lewin. (moc)
September 29, 2003 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Paul A. Juergensen by Cartier Internation, Richemont Int'l S.A., Montblanc-Simplo, Lange Uhren GmbH in further support of plaintiffs' application for an Ex Parte Seizure Order, temporary restraing order and asset restraining order. (sb)
September 29, 2003 Filing 56 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Cartier Internation, Montblanc-Simplo, Lange Uhren GmbH in support of their application for a TRO and seizure order. (sb)
September 22, 2003 Filing 55 AFFIRMATION of Lawrence F. Spirn in opposition to plaintiffs' order to show cause for contempt. (jco)
September 19, 2003 Filing 54 ANSWER by Kim Pham, Charlie Pham to SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Attorney Lawrence F. Spirn, Martin S. Dorfman ). (cd)
September 19, 2003 Filing 53 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv)
September 12, 2003 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint by Q's Global Shippin and Jerry Qu (Attorney Frederick L. Sosinsky); jury demand. (moc)
September 12, 2003 Filing 58 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by Q's Global Shipping. (moc)
August 31, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER to Seal File. The Clerk of the Court shall maintain the file of this civil action in its entirety under seal pending further order of the Court at which time the Clerk is directed to remove the seal on this action.(Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/19/03) (sb) Document unsealed pursuant to Order dated 3/31/04, # 71.
August 27, 2003 Filing 52 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv)
August 22, 2003 Filing 51 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv)
August 20, 2003 Filing 50 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv)
August 20, 2003 Filing 49 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv)
August 20, 2003 Filing 48 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv)
August 20, 2003 Filing 47 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv)
August 20, 2003 Filing 46 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv)
June 27, 2003 Filing 45 MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) Re: DISMISS [43-1] appeal by Thanh Nam Huynh, Billion Fortune Corp. ORDERED that the appeal from the order of 4/17/03 USDC, SDNY, is DISMISSED. MANDATE CERTIFIED 6/23/03, 03-7509. MACKECHNIE, CLERK, USCA. (pr)
June 3, 2003 Filing 44 Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Thomas P. Griesa for the date(s) of April 3, 2003. (dt)
May 15, 2003 Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [43-1] appeal by Thanh Nam Huynh, Billion Fortune Corp ; Copy of notice of appeal sent to District Judge. (pr)
May 14, 2003 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Billion Fortune Corp, Thanh Nam Huynh from [41-1] judgment order . Copies of notice of appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: G. Roxanne Elings,(Greenberg & Traurig LLP). $105.00 APPEAL FILING FEE PAID ON 5/14/03, RECEIPT # E 473660. (pr)
April 17, 2003 Filing 42 OPINION #88382; the Court confirms that there was justification for entering the preliminary injunction against JAC. There was and is a sufficient showing of JAC's contributory liability to justify both the injunctive relief and freeze of the assets. JAC has shown no basis for vacating or for dissolving the restraint on the transfer of assets in whole or in part. ( signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa ); (sac)
April 17, 2003 Filing 41 JUDGMENT #03,0738. The current preliminary injunction should be extended in scope to add the language further set forth in this Judgment. Plaintiffs are entitled to, and a judgment in the sum of $4,851,599.85 shall be, entered as against each of the Contemnors jointly and severally ( signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa ); Mailed copies and notice of right to appeal. Entered On Docket: 4/18/03. (yv) Modified on 04/23/2003
April 4, 2003 Filing 40 Memorandum to Docket Clerk: Hearing begun and concluded on 04/03/03; (djc)
April 3, 2003 Filing 39 DECLARATION of G. Roxanne Elings by Cartier Internation, Baume & Mercier S.A., Ancienne Fabrique, IWC International, Montblanc-Simplo, Ancienne Fabrique Va, Constantin Societe, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture S.A. in support of contempt. (db)
April 3, 2003 Filing 38 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Cartier Internation, Baume & Mercier S.A., Ancienne Fabrique, IWC International, Montblanc-Simplo, Ancienne Fabrique Va, Constantin Societe, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture S.A. in support of contempt. (db)
April 2, 2003 Filing 37 Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Thomas P. Griesa for the date(s) of February 28, 2003. (dt)
April 2, 2003 Filing 36 Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Thomas P. Griesa for the date(s) of February 10, 2003. (dt)
February 28, 2003 Motion Hearing before Judge Thomas P. Griesa held on 2/28/03. (ph)
February 28, 2003 Filing 35 Memorandum to Docket Clerk: Motion hearing held on 2/28/03. (ph)
February 20, 2003 Filing 33 Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Griesa from Joseph Milano, dated 2/18/03; Counsel writes to request that the hearing be adjourned to 2/27/03. Approved . ( signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa ); (jco)
February 18, 2003 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Cartier Internation, Baume & Mercier S.A., Ancienne Fabrique, IWC International, Montblanc-Simplo, Ancienne Fabrique Va, Constantin Societe in support of Contempt (cd)
February 6, 2003 Filing 32 CORRECTED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Assignment, et al as to Phuong Long by Sherry Mason on 1/17/03. (sb) Modified on 02/10/2003
February 5, 2003 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of amended summons and complaint as to Nghia Van Le (a/k/a Uncle Van, a/k/a "NG") by "Jane Smith" on 2/1/03. (db)
January 31, 2003 Filing 29 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv)
January 31, 2003 Filing 28 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv)
January 29, 2003 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of asset restraining order & preliminary injunction as to Phuong Long by Sherry Mason, doorperson on 1/17/03. (db)
January 21, 2003 Filing 27 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Billion Fortune Corp, Thanh Nam Huynh by Joseph Milano. (jco)
January 17, 2003 Filing 26 ANSWER by Charlie Pham, Charlie Pham, Kim Pham, Charlie Pham to [15-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Martin S. Dorfman, Lawrence F. Spirn). (ae)
January 17, 2003 Filing 25 RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Charlie Pham, Charlie Pham d/b/a J.A.C. Services, Kim Pham, Charlie Pham d/b/a Pham Kim. (ae)
January 17, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSENT ORDER, substituting attorney Lawrence F. Spirn and Martin S. Dorfman for Robert A. Horne for deft Charlie Pham ( signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa ); (cd)
January 9, 2003 Filing 23 Letter filed addressed to Clerks Office from Gary Sundin, dated 1/8/03, re: notice of appearance on behalf of Phuong Thieu Tran. (db)
December 16, 2002 Filing 22 DECLARATION of George J. Arnold, III by Cartier Internation, Baume & Mercier S.A., Ancienne Fabrique, IWC International, Montblanc-Simplo, Ancienne Fabrique Va, Constantin Societe, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture S.A. in opposition Re: [13-1] motion to vacate the preliminary injunction against deft Pham in its entirety, [13-2] motion modifying the Preliminary Injunction to (a) release $340,015.20 of Pham's enjoined assets at Chase Bank . (dle)
December 10, 2002 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Bao Huy James Pham by Kim Pham, Charlie Pham Re: [20-1] motion response . (cd)
December 10, 2002 Filing 20 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Lawrence Spirn by Kim Pham, Charlie Pham in opposition re: [16-1] opposition memorandum . (cd)
December 5, 2002 Filing 19 Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Griesa from Lawrence F. Spirn, dated 12/3/02. Granting counsel for defendants' request that defendants' time to reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' [13-1,2] motion to vacate be extended, on consent, from 12/4/02 until 12/9/02. ( signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa ) (sb)
December 2, 2002 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Sudipta Rao by Cartier Internation, Baume & Mercier S.A., Ancienne Fabrique, IWC International, Montblanc-Simplo, Ancienne Fabrique Va, Constantin Societe, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture S.A. in opposition Re: [13-1] motion to vacate the preliminary injunction against deft Pham in its entirety, [13-2] motion modifying the Preliminary Injunction to (a) release $340,015.20 of Pham's enjoined assets at Chase Bank. (tp)
December 2, 2002 Filing 17 DECLARATION of George J. Arnold, III by Cartier Internation, Baume & Mercier S.A., Ancienne Fabrique, IWC International, Montblanc-Simplo, Ancienne Fabrique Va, Constantin Societe, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture S.A. in opposition Re: [13-1] motion to vacate the preliminary injunction against deft Pham in its entirety, [13-2] motion modifying the Preliminary Injunction to (a) release $340,015.20 of Pham's enjoined assets at Chase Bank. (tp)
December 2, 2002 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Cartier Internation, Baume & Mercier S.A., Ancienne Fabrique, IWC International, Montblanc-Simplo, Ancienne Fabrique Va, Constantin Societe, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture S.A. in opposition to [13-1] motion to vacate the preliminary injunction against deft Pham in its entirety, [13-2] motion modifying the Preliminary Injunction to (a) release $340,015.20 of Pham's enjoined assets at Chase Bank. (tp)
December 2, 2002 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Cartier Internation, Baume & Mercier S.A., Ancienne Fabrique, IWC International, Montblanc-Simplo, Ancienne Fabrique Va, Constantin Societe, Alfred Dunhill Ltd., Lange Uhren GmbH, Manufacture S.A. (Answer due 12/12/02 for XYZ Companies, for Various Jane Does, for Various John Does, for Sunny Ascent Trading, for Yun Kon Huang, for C. Ph Hoa, for Amadou Ba, for Huy T. Pham, for Nhan Phoi Hoynh, for Charlie Pham, for Charlie Pham, for Thanh Nam Huynh, for Billion Fortune Corp, for Chao H. Lin, for Chao :H. Lin, for Jian Hai Liu, for Jian Hai Liu, for Tom Liu, for Kenny Liu, for Sam Liu, for DEF ) amending [6-1] complaint against Kim Pham, Charlie Pham. (tp)
November 18, 2002 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (jol)
November 18, 2002 Filing 14 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Thomas P. Griesa . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Robert A. Horne, Robert A. Horne, Robert A. Horne, Todd S. Sharinn, James H. Donoian, Harley I. Lewin . (jol)
November 18, 2002 Case accepted as related to 1:01cv8357. Notice of assignment to follow. (jol)
November 1, 2002 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION by Charlie Pham, Charlie Pham to vacate the preliminary injunction against deft Pham in its entirety ; modifying the Preliminary Injunction to (a) release $340,015.20 of Pham's enjoined assets at Chase Bank ; Return Date 11/1/02 at 9:30. (cd)
November 1, 2002 Filing 12 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Charlie Pham by Robert A. Horne. (cd)
November 1, 2002 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Charlie Pham (Attorney Robert A. Horne from the Firm: Goldberger & Dubin) . (cd)
October 18, 2002 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (js)
October 15, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, restraining and impoundment order re defts assets, as further set forth in this document ( signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa ); (cd)
October 15, 2002 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (js)
October 11, 2002 Filing 9 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Charlie Pham, Charlie Pham by Robert A. Horne. (cd)
October 11, 2002 Filing 8 RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Cartier Internation, Baume & Mercier S.A., Ancienne Fabrique, IWC International, Montblanc-Simplo, Ancienne Fabrique Va, Constantin Societe . (cd)
October 11, 2002 Filing 7 BOND #CGB 08672688 in the sum of $ 10,000.00 entered by Cartier Internation, Baume & Mercier S.A., Ancienne Fabrique, IWC International, Montblanc-Simplo, Ancienne Fabrique Va, Constantin Societe . (cd)
October 11, 2002 Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cd)
October 11, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER, defts, their officers, agents, servants etc are preliminarily enjoined and restrained from using plntfs' trademarks etc as further set forth in this action ; the seal is hereby removed form this action ; the bond posted by plntfs is hereby released with respect to defts ( signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa ); (cd)
October 7, 2002 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (js)
October 4, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER, sealing this action . ( signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa ); (gmo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cartier Internation, et al v. Liu, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lange Uhren GmbH
Represented By: Allison Leslie Lucas
Represented By: James H. Donoian
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Represented By: G. Roxanne Elings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cartier International B.V.
Represented By: Allison Leslie Lucas
Represented By: James H. Donoian
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Represented By: G. Roxanne Elings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manufacture Jaeger-Lecoultre S.A.
Represented By: James H. Donoian
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Represented By: Allison Leslie Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constantin Sopciete Anonyme
Represented By: James H. Donoian
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Represented By: Allison Leslie Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baume & Mercier S.A.
Represented By: James H. Donoian
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Represented By: Allison Leslie Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montblanc-Simplo GMBH
Represented By: Allison Leslie Lucas
Represented By: James H. Donoian
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Represented By: G. Roxanne Elings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Dunhill Ltd.
Represented By: James H. Donoian
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Represented By: Allison Leslie Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ancienne Fabrique Georges Piaget Et Cie
Represented By: James H. Donoian
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Represented By: Allison Leslie Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ancienne Fabrique Vacheron
Represented By: James H. Donoian
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Represented By: Allison Leslie Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IWC International Watch Co. A.G.
Represented By: James H. Donoian
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Represented By: Allison Leslie Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richemont International S.A.
Represented By: Allison Leslie Lucas
Represented By: Harley Irwin Lewin
Represented By: G. Roxanne Elings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Great Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huann Wayne Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Song Wu Jiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Creation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiang Qing Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Lake Co.
Represented By: Allan Steven Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPS Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q's Global Shipping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lin Chao Hua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lu Q Huy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NU Image Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chun Yin Yung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New World Top Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hu Yu Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uprise Mark, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boa Huy James Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huy Lu
Represented By: Jonathan D. Reichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYA International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optimum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kien Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedy Shipping Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hai I. Xai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Run Trading
Represented By: Lawrence F. Spirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khai Vinh Quach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTU International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sung Yop Yi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soon J. Pyo
Represented By: Marcia Janice Goffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muoi That Tran Kwok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heng Tai International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huy T. Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phuong Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ming Tong Zhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopex Trading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timeway Asia Trading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infiniti Fashion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David's 99 Trading Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Rong Jiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fei Xiang International Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Da Yi Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nhan Phoi Hoynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiang Hua Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Luo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chao H. Lin d/b/a Lin Watches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jin Da Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yu Cheng Xiong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Pham
Represented By: Martin S. Dorfman
Represented By: Lawrence F. Spirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant Start Furnitue Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & N Furniture Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smarttime Commerical Trading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Pham
Represented By: Martin S. Dorfman
Represented By: Lawrence F. Spirn
Represented By: Robert Allen Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Ph Hoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J &Choi Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chao :H. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nhan Phoi Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ching Tat Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Mark Trading Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLT of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Si Lung Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wen Da Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thanh Nam Huynh
Represented By: Joseph Milano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurent Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Boa Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoi Fung Trading Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhu Cheng Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwoc Chung Poon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 252 Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qing Wen Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lan Boa Duong
Represented By: Lawrence F. Spirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jia Jin Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny Ascent Trading Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rong Cheng International Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qu Yong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICC Corp
Represented By: Marcia Janice Goffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jin's Fashion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hsi Feng Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny Ascent Trading Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amadou Ba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GKY, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Pham d/b/a J.A.C. Services
Represented By: Martin S. Dorfman
Represented By: Robert Allen Horne
Represented By: Lawrence F. Spirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jung S. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yim Chee Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lin Jun Jin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chen Xiu Fen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nghia Van Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chun Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPX Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabulous Trading Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long River International Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megawati Tjong
Represented By: Laurence H.enry Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lai Yun Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Hai Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fansway International Trading Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Duc Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu B Quan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Min Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yun Kon Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wen Hao Tang
Represented By: Allan Steven Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoung Thieu Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilman Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Min Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jin Cheng Zhen
Represented By: Alexander Kwok-Ho Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victa Investments & Capital Corp
Represented By: Marcia Janice Goffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ling Ling Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Li Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hai Lei Xia
Represented By: Nicholas G. Yokos
Represented By: Valerie Ying chen Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wu's Group Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan Qi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Full Service Express
Represented By: Wayne Michael Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Hai Liu d/b/a L.J. Jewelry Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huang Da Xin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dong Yu Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Famous Trading Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Pham doing business as J.A.C., Services
Represented By: Martin S. Dorfman
Represented By: Lawrence F. Spirn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Qu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMY International Trading Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivi Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Guo Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billion Fortune Corp
Represented By: Joseph Milano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?