Boyer v. Lansing et al
Plaintiff: Donald Boyer
Defendant: Chairman Viacom Head Somner Redstone, Chief Dennis Swanson, Paramount Domestic TV Films Pictures, Sherry Lansing and Jonathan Dolgen
Consolidated Defendant: CEO Patrick Austin, President Dean Valentine, NBC 4 Studios Inc., Bill Baker, Michael Lyne, Tribune Entertainment, Chairman Dick Cook, Robert Shaye, Mel Karmazin, Time Warner, Michael Eisner, CEO John K. Billock, The Walt Disney Company, King World Inc., President CEO Susan Lyne, CEO Jaime Kellner, CEO of Marvel Peter Cuned, Jeff Blake, CH Rupert Murdoch, Amy Pascal, Richard Parsons, Roger King, CH David Grant Hill, CEO Stephen Appel, USA Networks, CEO Stacy Snider, Sony Pictures Entertainment, Chris Albrect, CEO Bruce Rosenblum, CEO Daniel Brewster, Vice Chairman Roy Disney, Channel 31, Chairman Michael D. Eisner, Ted Turner, CH Dandy Grushow, President Jeff Zucker, Marvel Enterprises, President Tom Nunan, CEO Les Mooves, CEO Dick Askin, New Line Cinema, Inc., Vivendi Universal Entertainment, J. Stuart, COO Robert Iger, UPN 9 WPIX, Inc., ABC 7 Inc., Fox 5 Entertainment, WPIX 11 Inc., CEO of Channel 31, Chairman CEO John Caller, Chairman CEO Robert C. Wright, Channel 13 Inc., CEO Mchell Stern, CBS Entertainment, President Milan Chilla, CEO John Madigan, HBO Films and COO Adam Ware
Case Number: 1:2004cv02137
Filed: March 18, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Frank Maas
Referring Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2005. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2005 Filing 20 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated March 29, 2005, the report is adopted and the complaints are dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 4/13/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02137-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02138-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02139-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02140-JSR-FM, 1:04-cv-02141-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02142-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02143-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02144-JSR-FM, 1:04-cv-02145-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02146-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02147-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02148-JSR-FM, 1:04-cv-02149-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02150-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02151-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02152-JSR-FM, 1:04-cv-02153-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02154-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02155-JSR-FM(ml, )
March 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 18 Report and Recommendations,. Accordingly, the Court hereby adopts the Report and Recommendation, and, for the reasons therein, dismisses the complaint with prejudice. Clerk to enter judgment (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/29/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02137-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02138-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02139-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02140-JSR-FM, 1:04-cv-02141-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02142-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02143-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02144-JSR-FM, 1:04-cv-02145-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02146-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02147-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02148-JSR-FM, 1:04-cv-02149-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02150-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02151-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02152-JSR-FM, 1:04-cv-02153-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02154-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02155-JSR-FM(yv, )
March 30, 2005 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 19 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk for preparation of Judgment. (yv, )
March 11, 2005 Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; I therefore recommend that Boyer's claims in each of the 19 actions be dismissed with prejudice. I further recommend that Boyer be denied a certificate of appealability because any appeal from the dismissal of his claims would not be taken in good faith. The Complaints in Boyer's suits against the Moving Defendants (Channel 13, Channel 31, Sony, ABC and Walt Disney) should be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. In addition, for the same reason, Boyer's claims against the remaining defendants should be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Finally, Boyer should be denied a certificate of appealability because any appeal from the dismissal of his claims would not be taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 3/25/2005 (Signed by Judge Frank Maas on 3/9/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-02137-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02138-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02139-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02140-JSR-FM, 1:04-cv-02141-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02142-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02143-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02144-JSR-FM, 1:04-cv-02145-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02146-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02147-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02148-JSR-FM, 1:04-cv-02149-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02150-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02151-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02152-JSR-FM, 1:04-cv-02153-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02154-JSR-FM,1:04-cv-02155-JSR-FM (sac, )
March 11, 2005 Filing 17 PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated March 4, 2005 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Donald Boyer. New Address: 149095, Union County Jail, 15 Elizabeth Town Plaza, Elizabeth, New Jersey, 07207. (ll, )
August 26, 2004 Filing 16 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Sherry Lansing, et al. Received in the night deposit box on 8/26/04 at 6:56 P.M.(sac, )
August 20, 2004 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Paramount Domestic TV Films Pictures. (sac, )
August 20, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, that any courtesy copies of pleadings, Rule 7.1 statements, or motions papers should be sent to my Chambers, not to Judge Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Frank Maas on 8/19/04) (cd, )
August 6, 2004 Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Paramount Domestic TV Films Pictures. Related document: 5 Amended Complaint filed by Donald Boyer.(jco, )
August 6, 2004 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Paramount Domestic TV Films Pictures.(jco, )
July 20, 2004 Filing 11 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Paramount Domestic TV Films Pictures served on 7/16/2004, answer due 8/5/2004. Service was accepted by Hakeem Jeffries. Document filed by Donald Boyer. (dle, )
June 24, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER; denying 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel . (Signed by Judge Frank Maas on 6/23/0-4) (pl, )
June 17, 2004 Filing 9 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by Donald Boyer. (dle, )
May 28, 2004 MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: that a Summons and Complaint was issued on 5/28/04. (tp, )
May 27, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSOLIDATION ORDER; On March 18, 2004, Chief Judge Mukasey issued an order which consolidated the above actions filed by plaintiff Donald Boyer solely for the purpose of directing that the plaintiff submit amended complaints stating Title VII claims. After the plaintiff purportedly did so on April 23, 2004, the actions ( 04 CV 2139, 2141, 2143, 2145, 2147, 2149, 2151, 2153, 2155, 2138, 2140, 2142, 2144, 2146, 2148, 2150, 2152, 2154) were assigned to Judge Rakoff, who referred them to me for General Pretrial purposes on May 6, 2004. Inasmuch as Judge Mukasey evidently concluded that the amended complaints complied with his order, I hereby direct that these nineteen actions be consolidated for pretrial purposes under Docket Number 04 cv 2137. (Signed by Judge Frank Maas on 5/26/04) (djc, )
May 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial and Dispositive motion. Referred to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/6/04) (pa, )
May 3, 2004 Mailed notice to the attorney(s) of record. (gf, )
April 30, 2004 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Judge Michael B. Mukasey no longer assigned to the case. (gf, )
April 23, 2004 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2 Complaint against Paramount Domestic TV Films Pictures.Document filed by Donald Boyer. Related document: 2 Complaint filed by Donald Boyer.(sac, )
April 23, 2004 Set Answer Due Date re: 5 Amended Complaint as to Paramount Domestic TV Films Pictures answer due on 5/3/2004. (sac, )
March 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 4 60 DAYS ORDER (Consolidating cases 04 civ 2137 (MBM) (as Lead Case) with 04 civ 2138 (MBM) through 04 civ 2155 (MBM) for all purposes.) I grant plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis, consolidate these nineteen actions solely for the purpose of this Order, and direct the Clerk of Court to assign a docket number to each complaint. I further direct plaintiff to submit nineteen amended complaints, each bearing the docket number assigned to the particular complaint, within 60 days of the instant order as detailed further in the Order. The plaintiff is hereby directed to file an amended complaint for each of the nineteen cases...it must be submitted to this Court's Pro Se Office within 60 days of the date of this order...No summons shall be issued at this time and all further proceedings shall be stayed for sixty days or until plaintiff has complied with this order. If plaintiff fails...the complaints will be dismissed. Once submitted, the amended complaints shall be reviewed for compliance with this order and substantive sufficiency and then, if proper, the case shall be reassigned to a district judge in accordance with the procedures of the Clerk's Office. We certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3)that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. (Signed by Judge Michael B. Mukasey on 3/18/04) (jjm, )
March 18, 2004 Filing 3 NOTICE of Motion. Document filed by Donald Boyer. (jjm, )
March 18, 2004 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jonathan Dolgen, Sherry Lansing, Paramount Domestic TV Films Pictures, Somner Redstone, Dennis Swanson. Document filed by Donald Boyer.(jjm, )
March 18, 2004 Filing 1 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Donald Boyer.(jjm, )
March 18, 2004 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jonathan Dolgen, Sherry Lansing, Paramount Domestic TV Films Pictures, Somner Redstone, Dennis Swanson. (jjm, )
March 18, 2004 Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (jjm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyer v. Lansing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CEO Patrick Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: President Dean Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: NBC 4 Studios Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Bill Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Michael Lyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Tribune Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Chairman Dick Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Robert Shaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Mel Karmazin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Time Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Michael Eisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CEO John K. Billock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Walt Disney Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: King World Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: President CEO Susan Lyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CEO Jaime Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CEO of Marvel Peter Cuned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Jeff Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CH Rupert Murdoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Amy Pascal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Richard Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Roger King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CH David Grant Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CEO Stephen Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: USA Networks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CEO Stacy Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Chris Albrect
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CEO Bruce Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CEO Daniel Brewster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Vice Chairman Roy Disney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Channel 31
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Chairman Michael D. Eisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Ted Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CH Dandy Grushow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: President Jeff Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Marvel Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: President Tom Nunan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CEO Les Mooves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CEO Dick Askin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: New Line Cinema, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Vivendi Universal Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: J. Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: COO Robert Iger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: UPN 9 WPIX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ABC 7 Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Fox 5 Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: WPIX 11 Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CEO of Channel 31
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Chairman CEO John Caller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Chairman CEO Robert C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Channel 13 Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CEO Mchell Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CBS Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: President Milan Chilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CEO John Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: HBO Films
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: COO Adam Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chairman Viacom Head Somner Redstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Dennis Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Domestic TV Films Pictures
Represented By: Hakeem Sekou Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Lansing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Dolgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?