Tiffany (NJ) Inc. et al v. eBay Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Tiffany (NJ) Inc. and Tiffany and Company
Defendant: eBay Inc.
Case Number: 1:2004cv04607
Filed: June 18, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: James C. Francis
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2011 Filing 93 SEALED MATERIALS RETRIEVED: Document(s) 13 and 48 were retrieved. Law Firm retrieving records: Weil, Gotshald & Manges. Person retrieving records: Mark Ribaudo on 11/02/2011.(mps)
September 27, 2011 Filing 92 SEALED MATERIALS RETRIEVED: Document(s) 47 were retrieved. Law Firm retrieving records: Arnold & Porter. Person retrieving records: Rodney Ellis on 09/26/2011.(mps)
September 20, 2010 Filing 91 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated September 10, 2010, judgment is entered on behalf of Defendant on its false advertising claim; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/20/10) (Attachments: # 1 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO APPEAL)(ml)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in this Memorandum and Order, the Court concludes once again that Plaintiffs have failed to satisfy their burden on the false advertising claim. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment on behalf of Defendants on its false advertising claim and to close this case. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/10/2010) (tro)
September 13, 2010 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 90 Order, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (tro)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney H. Peter Haveles, Jr., formerly a member of the law firm of Arnold & Porter LLP, is withdrawing as counsel in this action for plaintiffs' and requests removal from the ECF notices in this action. Attorney H. Peter Haveles, Jr terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/25/2010) (tro)
June 24, 2010 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 87 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 06/15/2010, Receipt Number 906230. (jd)
June 23, 2010 Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on June 15, 2010 3:52 p.m. before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (ajc)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Randall K Miller for Tiffany (NJ) Inc. and Tiffany and Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/16/10) (rjm)
June 15, 2010 Filing 87 MOTION for Randall K. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company.(mro)
June 15, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: The Court held a conference on June 15, 2010 at 4:00 p.m. The Court heard from the parties and reserved on the false advertising claims. (mbe)
June 1, 2010 Filing 85 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from James B. Swire dated 5/28/2010 re: Requesting that the conference on June 15, 2010 be rescheduled for mid or late afternoon. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. The conference is adjourned until 3:30 p.m. on June 15, 2010. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/28/2010) (jpo)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: It is hereby Ordered that the May 25, 2010 conference is adjourned until June 15, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/12/2010) (jfe)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: The parties shall appear for a conference on 5/25/2010 at 10:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/10/2010) (tro)
May 7, 2010 Filing 82 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 81 Notice of Appeal filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company USCA Case Number 08-3947-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED in part and REMANDED for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of this court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 05/07/2010. (nd)
May 7, 2010 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: 82 USCA Mandate,. (nd)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 23 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by eBay Inc., 68 Trial Brief filed by eBay Inc., 15 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by eBay Inc., 27 Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment, 28 Affidavit of Service Other filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., 6 Stipulation and Order, 70 Order on Motion in Limine, 39 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by eBay Inc., 63 Endorsed Letter, 34 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 61 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by eBay Inc., 35 Order, 16 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by eBay Inc., 56 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by eBay Inc., 44 Declaration in Support filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., 30 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 53 Order, 40 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by eBay Inc., 24 Certificate of Service Other filed by eBay Inc., 38 MOTION in Limine. filed by eBay Inc., 73 Post Trial Memorandum filed by eBay Inc., 12 Stipulation and Order, 54 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, 18 Scheduling Order,, 21 Stipulation and Order,,,, 60 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company, 72 Endorsed Letter, 37 Notice (Other) filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company, 79 Memorandum & Opinion, 78 Endorsed Letter,, 42 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, 52 Opposition Brief filed by eBay Inc., 66 Order, 11 Stipulation and Order, 45 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by eBay Inc., 9 Order, 26 Stipulation and Order, 64 Order, Set Hearings, 1 Complaint filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company, 71 Order on Motion in Limine, 3 Summons Returned Executed filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company, 36 Order, 67 Endorsed Letter, 20 Declaration in Opposition to Motion filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., 69 Trial Brief filed by eBay Inc., 50 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, 17 Certificate of Service Other filed by eBay Inc., 46 Declaration filed by eBay Inc., 51 Memorandum of Law in Opposition filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company, 80 Clerk's Judgment, 65 Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment, 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint. filed by eBay Inc., 5 Stipulation and Order, 62 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by eBay Inc., 29 Endorsed Letter, 32 Scheduling Order, 55 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Purports to Create Liability Based on Trademarks First Asserted in Tiffany's Proposed Findings of Fact. filed by eBay Inc., 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company, 58 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by eBay Inc., 43 Opposition Brief filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., 7 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by eBay Inc., 81 Notice of Appeal filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company, 22 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by eBay Inc., 31 MOTION for Ashok Ramani to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Google, Inc., 41 Order, 33 Stipulation and Order, 74 Post Trial Memorandum filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company, 10 Stipulation and Order, 57 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by eBay Inc., 19 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., 59 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company, 4 Amended Complaint filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company, 8 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by eBay Inc., 25 Deposition filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., 49 Memorandum of Law in Opposition filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEAL from 80 Clerk's Judgment. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 659533. (nd)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 81 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 81 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion dated July 14, 2008, judgment is entered for the defendant; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, CLERK on 7/15/08) (Attachments: # 1 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO APPEAL)(ml)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 OPINION AFTER BENCH TRIAL # 96233: that for the reasons stated above, the Court finds that plaintiff has failed to satisfy its burden on all of its claims. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for defendant and close the case. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/14/08) (cd) Modified on 7/15/2008 (rw).
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 79 Memorandum & Opinion, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (cd)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from James B. Swire dated 7/9/08 re: Plaintiffs have decided to withdraw their submission regarding the Louis Vuitton Malletier v. eBay Inc. et al. decision issued by the Commercial Court of Paris, France. Counsel requests that the Court proceed with the completion of its decision in this action without reference to the French decision. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the above, the Court advises the parties that it intends to issue its Opinion in this matter on Monday, July 14, 2008. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/10/08) (tro)
January 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/9/07 @ 10:05AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (pr)
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/20/07 before Judge Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (es)
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/13,14,15,16/07 before Judge Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (es)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 POST TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Haveles, H.)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 POST TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by eBay Inc..(Rich, Robert)
December 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from R. Bruce Rich dated 12/5/07 re: Counsel for Defendant request that the Court grant the parties a ten-page extension for the post-trial briefs that are due this Friday- that is, to permit filings of up to 45 pages. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request for a ten-page extension is granted. Pos trial briefs shall not exceed 45 pages. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/5/07) (tro)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Bench Trial completed on 11/20/2007. (pl)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Bench Trial held on 11/15/2007. (pl)
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Bench Trial held on 11/14/2007. (pl)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Bench Trial begun on 11/13/2007. (pl)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 55 Motion in Limine. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion docketed as Document #55. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/9/07) (tro)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TRIAL BRIEF Memorandum of Defendant eBay in Support of Its Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibits 425-428 and the Portions of Caroline Naggiar's Declaration Quoting Therefrom. Document filed by eBay Inc..(Singer, Randi)
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TRIAL BRIEF Memorandum of Defendant eBay in Support of the Admissibility of Defendant's Exhibits 250 and 251. Document filed by eBay Inc..(Singer, Randi)
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan : Pretrial Conference held on 11/9/2007. (cd)
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 38 Motion in Limine. The Court hereby DENIES the defendant's motion in limine. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/9/07) (tro)
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Erik C. Walsh dated 11/9/2007 re: This firms represents the plaintiffs in the above-referenced action. We write this letter to respectfully request that internet access be allowed in Your Honor's courtroom for the duration of this trial. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/9/2007) (jmi)
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO ALLOW MULTIMEDIA EQUIPMENT AND TRIAL MATERIALS INTO COURTROOM 21C: counsel and their respective technology coordinators shall be permitted to bring into the Courthouse from Friday, 11/9/2007 through the conclusion of trial, currently scheduled for Wednesday 11/21/2007 certain multimedia equipment as stated in this order. Parties will have Courtroom access Monday through Friday from 9 AM to 5 PM. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/5/07) (kco)
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Conference held on 10/23/2007; motion argument set for 10/30 at 2:30 pm. (cd)
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan : Parties present;Conference held on 10/23/2007. Motion Argument set for 10/30/2007 at 02:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (tro)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Francis : Settlement Conference held on 10/10/07. (kco)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan : Conference held on 9/21/2007. Bench trial 11/13/07. Rulings on inlimine motions and Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (tro)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (jeh)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER, that the conference previously scheduled for June 15, 2007 is adjourned to September 21, 2007 at 10:30 am. Status Conference set for 9/21/2007 at 10:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/12/2007) (jmi)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Karas from Randi Singer dated 6/7/07 re deft eBay request for permission to file a reply memo not to exceed 15 pages (consented to by plaintiffs): so ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/11/07) (cd)
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DECLARATION of Randi W. Singer in Support re: 55 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Purports to Create Liability Based on Trademarks First Asserted in Tiffany's Proposed Findings of Fact.. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D# 2 Exhibit E-G)(Singer, Randi)
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 55 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Purports to Create Liability Based on Trademarks First Asserted in Tiffany's Proposed Findings of Fact.. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Rich, Robert)
June 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DECLARATION of Erik C. Walsh in Opposition re: 55 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Purports to Create Liability Based on Trademarks First Asserted in Tiffany's Proposed Findings of Fact.. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P)(Boccanfuso, Anthony)
June 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 55 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Purports to Create Liability Based on Trademarks First Asserted in Tiffany's Proposed Findings of Fact.. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
May 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DECLARATION of Lori M. Schiffer in Support re: 55 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Purports to Create Liability Based on Trademarks First Asserted in Tiffany's Proposed Findings of Fact.. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Rich, Robert)
May 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DECLARATION of Lori M. Schiffer in Support re: 55 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Purports to Create Liability Based on Trademarks First Asserted in Tiffany's Proposed Findings of Fact.. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit A Part 1# 3 Exhibit A Part 2# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D)(Rich, Robert)
May 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 55 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Purports to Create Liability Based on Trademarks First Asserted in Tiffany's Proposed Findings of Fact.. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Rich, Robert)
May 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence that Purports to Create Liability Based on Trademarks First Asserted in Tiffany's Proposed Findings of Fact. Document filed by eBay Inc..(Rich, Robert)
May 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/7/07) (cd)
May 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas : Pretrial Conference held on 5/5/2007. Case to be referred to MJ Francis for settlement. Further conf set for 6/15/07 at 12:15 pm; trial adjourned due to Judge Karas' trial schedule; defts' in limine motions due 5/18; response 6/1; reply 6/8. (cd)
May 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: the 4/27/07 conference is adjourned to 5/4/07 at 2:30 p.m. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/30/07) (db)
May 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2007 02:30 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. (db)
April 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPPOSITION BRIEF to Tiffany's Pretrial Memorandum. Document filed by eBay Inc..(Rich, Robert)
April 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Defendant's Pretrial Memorandum (Corrected). Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Haveles, H.)
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Defendant's Pretrial Memorandum. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company. (Haveles, H.)
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Erik C. Walsh dated 4/10/07 re: plaintiff request that the Court grant a short extension to file its opposition to dft eBays Inc.s Pretrial Memorandum until 4/13/07. So Ordered. Tiffany may file its opposition to eBays Inc.s Pretrial Memorandum by 4/13/07. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/10/07) (pl)
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Responses due by 4/13/2007 (pl)
April 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECLARATION of Randi W. Singer in Support of Pretrial Memorandum. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Meyer, Bruce)
December 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James C. Francis : Telephone Conference held on 12/20/2006. (cd, )
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 38 MOTION in Limine.. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Rich, Robert)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DECLARATION of JAMES B. SWIRE in Support. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPPOSITION BRIEF PLAINTIF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE PROPOSED EXPERT TESTIMONY OF GEORGE MANTIS. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc..(Boccanfuso, Anthony)
November 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/7/06) (db, )
November 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that deft has already fld a motion in limine. Plntfs' response must be submitted no later than 11/20/06. Deft's reply is due no later than 12/15/06. The parties must submit any proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law by 4/2/07. The court will hold a ptc at 10:45 am on 4/13/07. Trial will begin on 5/14/07, subject to changes in the court's schedule. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/6/06) (cd, )
November 3, 2006 Opinion or Order MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: a conference was held on 11/3/2006 before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Case called for conference. Bench trial set for 5/14/2007. Final pretrial conference and rulings on in limine motions set for 4-13 at 10:45 a.m. Case to be referred to MJ Francis for settlement. (kco, )
October 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 38 MOTION in Limine.. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1# 2 Exhibit A Part 2# 3 Exhibit B Part 1# 4 Exhibit B Part 2)(Meyer, Bruce)
October 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DECLARATION of Denise Alvarez in Support re: 38 MOTION in Limine.. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Meyer, Bruce)
October 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION in Limine. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Meyer, Bruce)
October 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Proposed Joint Pretrial Order. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Haveles, H.)
June 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED ORDER: Pretrial order to be filed by 10/6/2006. Copies of pre-marked exhibits to be submitted to Chambers by 10/6/2006. Final Pre-trial conference set for 11/3/2006 at 10:30 a.m. Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be filed by 12/11/2006. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/27/2006) (lb, )
June 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Pretrial order to be filed by 10/6/2006. Copies of pre-marked exhibits to be submitted to Chambers by 10/6/2006. Final Pre-trial conference set for 11/3/2006 at 10:30 a.m. Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be filed by 12/10/2006. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/26/2006) (lb, )
May 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Ashok Ramani to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/10/06) (jco, )
May 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 34 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jco, )
May 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the trial of this case shall be by the court sitting without a jury. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/3/06) (kco, )
May 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REIVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions for summary judgment due by 7/1/2006. Replies due by 9/1/2006. Additional deadlines are as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/28/06) (pl, )
April 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas : Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/25/2006; further conf set for 6/23 at 10 am. (cd, )
April 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Ashok Ramani to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc. (jco, )
March 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 14 Motion to Amend/Correct. the Clerk of the Court is instructed to terminate the motion . (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/31/06) (cd, )
March 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Karas from James B. Swire dated 3/15/06: the parties are directed to appear at a conference on 4/19/06 at 2:30 pm. The parties should be prepared to discuss the media issues, as well as the two outstanding motions. Thus, the parties are directed to advise counsel for Google to appear at the conference as well. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/20/06) (cd, )
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Mailed notice to the attorney(s) of record. (laq, )
November 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald no longer assigned to the case. (laq, )
October 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER; DISCOVERY... shall commence on 10/22/05; All fact discovery shall be completed by 10/28/05; see document for further discovery deadlines.... All potentially dispositive motions shall be filed by 02/03/06; (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/11/05) (djc, )
October 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DEPOSITION.Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc..(Boccanfuso, Anthony)
September 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Ebay's Reply brief in Support of Its Motion to Amend Its Answer and The Supplemental Declaration of R. Bruce Rich served on H. Peter HavelesJr., Esq. on 9/13/05. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Rich, Robert)
September 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION of R. Bruce Rich in Support re: 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint.. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Rich, Robert)
September 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint.. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Rich, Robert)
September 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDERin order to expedite production of the documents, eBay may designate all of the documents as restricted materials in accordance with the Confidentiality Stipulation and Order entered herein, provided that eBay shall promptly withdraw such designation upon the request of Tiffany with respect to any documents that does not fall within the definition for such materials. To the extent that eBay later concludes that any of the documents are actually privileged, eBay does not waive the right to make such assertion, provided that, if Tiffany Disagrees with such assertion, the burden will be on eBay to make a motion to the District Court to retrieve any such documents, for which motion eBay shall bear the burden of proof. This Stipulation shall apply only in this action, and eBay does not waive the right to assert outside of and unrelated to this action that such documents are privileged and that the privilege attaching to them has not been waived. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/6/05) (jco, )
August 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of DOROTHY N. GIOBBE in Opposition re: 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
August 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint. PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND ITS ANSWER. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
August 23, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery in the form of requests for production of documents, interrogatories and/or notices of deposition shall commence on 10/22/04. All fact discovery shall be completed by 10/7/05. Initial expert reports pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2) shall be served no later than 10/26/05, and rebuttal expert reports shall be served no later than 11/18/05. All potentially dispositive motions shall be filed by 1/13/2006. All expert discovery, including depositions, shall be completed by 12/16/2005 (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/17/05) (yv, )
August 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Amend and Supporting Papers served on H. Peter Haveles Jr., Esq. on 8/11/05. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Rich, Robert)
August 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of R. Bruce Rich in Support re: 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint.. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-M)(Rich, Robert)
August 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint.. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Rich, Robert)
August 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct 8 Answer to Amended Complaint. Document filed by eBay Inc.. (Rich, Robert)
April 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/25/05) (jco, )
April 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: All expert discovery due by 11/4/2005. All potentially dispositive motions due by 12/2/2005. (jco, )
March 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding procedures that will govern the handling of confidential information. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/24/05) (cd, )
February 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Arnold & Porter LLP may be substituted in the place and stead of Dorsey & Whitney LLP as the attorneys of record for plaintiffs, Tiffany (NJ) Inc. and Tiffany and Company, in the action. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/17/05) (jco, )
October 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald : Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/18/2004. (cd, )
October 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: counsel are directed to appear for a pretrial conference at 2:15 p.m. on 10/14/04 in courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/4/04) (kw, )
October 5, 2004 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2004 02:15 PM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (kw, )
October 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by eBay Inc.. Related document: 4 Amended Complaint filed by Tiffany and Company, Tiffany (NJ) Inc..(Rich, Robert)
October 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by eBay Inc..(Rich, Robert)
September 27, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER: defendant's time to respond to the complaint is extended to 10/1/04. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/24/04) (kw, )
September 27, 2004 Opinion or Order Set Answer Due Date purs. to 6 Stipulation and Order as to eBay Inc. answer due on 10/1/2004. (kw, )
September 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER: defendant's time to respond to the complaint is extended to 9/17/04. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/13/04) (kw, )
September 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Set Answer Due Date purs. to 5 Stipulation and Order as to eBay Inc.; answer due on 9/17/2004. (kw, )
July 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against eBay Inc..Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Tiffany and Company, Tiffany (NJ) Inc.. (Attachments:, # 1, # 2, # 3, # 4)(kw, )
July 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Set Answer Due Date re: 4 Amended Complaint as to eBay Inc. answer due on 7/26/2004. (kw, )
June 22, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. eBay Inc. served on 6/21/2004, answer due 7/12/2004. Service was accepted by Theresa Festa. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc. ; Tiffany and Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Swire, James)
June 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (jjm, )
June 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company.(jjm, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2004 (jjm, ).
June 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against eBay Inc. (Filing Fee $ 150.00, Receipt Number 512436)Document filed by Tiffany (NJ) Inc., Tiffany and Company.(jjm, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2004 (jjm, ).
June 18, 2004 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to eBay Inc. (jjm, )
June 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jjm, )
June 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James C. Francis is so designated. (jjm, ) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiffany (NJ) Inc. et al v. eBay Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany (NJ) Inc.
Represented By: James B. Swire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany and Company
Represented By: James B. Swire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay Inc.
Represented By: Robert Bruce Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?