In Re: Pfizer Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: L. Norman Showers, Paul Schapka, Christine Fleckles, Anthon Johnson, Michael Feitler and Michael Feiterland
Defendant: Joseph M. Feczko, Pfizer, Inc., Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel and Gail Cawkwell
Petitioner: Unite National Retirement Fund, Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4), Steelworkers Pension Trust, Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Ronald Hodge, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, CI Funds Group, West Virginia Investment Management Board and Hollywood Police Pension Fund
In Re: Pfizer Securities Litigation
Not Classified By Court: MICHAEL J RINIS
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Dr. Lon Schneider, Ernest J. Browne, Dr. Gerald Faich, Dr. William White, Dr. Garret FitzGerald, Alden Chace, Julie Perusse, Dr. Douglas W. Weaver, Scott Browne and Robert Makuch, Ph. D
Lead Plaintiff: Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana
Case Number: 1:2004cv09866
Filed: December 15, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Henry B Pitman
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 760 NOTICE of Declaration of Settlement Administrator Reporting on Inquiry from Claimant William R. Hess re: #754 Order on Motion for Release of Funds,,,, #728 Judgment,,,,. Document filed by Michael Feiterland, Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Eisenhofer, Jay)
July 9, 2020 Filing 759 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Mary S. Thomas. Document filed by Alden Chace, Christine Fleckles, Julie Perusse, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana..(Eisenhofer, Jay)
July 8, 2020 Filing 758 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER: The Court has received the attached communication dated June 18, 2020, from Mr. William R. Hess (the "Claimant") relating to the above-captioned matter. The Court has redacted the referenced financial account number and social security number in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(a). The unredacted original will be filed under seal. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to ascertain the status or disposition of the Claimants claim and report the results of its investigation to the Claimant and the Court by July 31, 2020. Chambers will mail a copy of this order (without the attachment) to Mr. Hess. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/1/2020) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (js)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 756 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #755 Notice (Other) filed by Julie Perusse, Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Alden Chace. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Charles Thomas Caliendo terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 1/25/2019) (ne)
January 24, 2019 Filing 755 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Charles T. Caliendo, Esq.. Document filed by Alden Chace, Christine Fleckles, Julie Perusse, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Caliendo, Charles)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF THE NET SETTLEMENT FUND AND PAYMENT OF SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR'S COSTS granting #745 Motion for Release of Funds. The procedures used and actions taken by GCG and Lead Counsel for the administration of the Settlement are hereby adjudged to have been proper and complete, and the Court hereby approves the administrative determinations of GCG in accepting and rejecting claims filed in this matter. The Court hereby approves the claims set forth in Exhibits C-1 and C-2 to the Smith Declaration. These claims include fully and partially valid claims, as well as late-filed, but otherwise valid, claims, of Class Members ("Authorized Claimants"). The Court hereby approves the payment in the amount of $2,596,794.99 to GCG for the unpaid costs of administration through the Initial Distribution, as set forth in paragraph 60 of the Smith Declaration. This payment is to be made from the Settlement Fund. This Order resolves docket entry no. 745. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/21/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ne)
November 30, 2018 Filing 753 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
November 29, 2018 Filing 752 RESPONSE re: #750 Order, Regarding Claim No. 4537370. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 29, 2018 Filing 751 RESPONSE re: #749 Order, Response Regarding Claim No. 3093818. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER. The Court has received the attached communication dated November 8, 2018, relating to the above-captioned matter. The Court has redacted the referenced financial account number in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(a). The unredacted original will be filed under seal. Lead Counsel may file a response to this submission by December 10, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/26/2018). Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rjm) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER: The Court has received the attached communication postmarked November 14, 2018, relating to the above-captioned matter. Lead Counsel may file a response to this submission by December 4, 2018. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/20/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 748 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF COMMUNICATION: On November 13, 2018, the Court received the attached November 8, 2018, communication relating to the above-captioned matter. This document is hereby filed on the public docket for informational purposes. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/20/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama)
October 24, 2018 Filing 747 DECLARATION of Michelle Smith in Support re: #745 MOTION for Release of Funds of the Net Settlement Fund.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B and C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Thomas, Mary)
October 24, 2018 Filing 746 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #745 MOTION for Release of Funds of the Net Settlement Fund. . Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Thomas, Mary)
October 24, 2018 Filing 745 MOTION for Release of Funds of the Net Settlement Fund. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. Return Date set for 11/1/2018 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Mary)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 744 ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF NON-CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS VIA DVD: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Plaintiffs' request to lodge Exhibits B and C to the Declaration of Michelle Smith via DVD to be hand-delivered to the undersigned's chambers is GRANTED; Plaintiffs shall cause two (2) copies of a DVD containing Exhibits B and C to be hand delivered to the undersigned's chambers no later than the day following the filing of the Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund; Plaintiffs shall cause an identical copy of said DVD to be delivered to counsel for Defendant Pfizer Inc. on the same date; and Plaintiffs shall make identical copies of said DVD available to settlement claimants upon request. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/22/2018) (ama)
October 18, 2018 Filing 743 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Mary S. Thomas dated 10/18/18 re: Permission to lodge with the Court a DVD containing voluminous exhibits to Motion for Disbursment of Net Settlement Proceeds. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Permitting Filing of Non-Confidential Materials Via DVD)(Thomas, Mary)
October 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Mary Sikra Thomas to RE-FILE Document #742 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Voluminous Exhibits via DVD addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Mary S. Thomas dated 10/18/18. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ldi)
October 18, 2018 Filing 742 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Voluminous Exhibits via DVD addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Mary S. Thomas dated 10/18/18. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Permitting Filing of Non-Confidential Materials Via DVD)(Thomas, Mary) Modified on 10/18/2018 (ldi).
July 11, 2017 Filing 741 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #688 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Julie Perusse, Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Alden Chace. USCA Case Number 14-2853. The parties filed a stipulation to withdraw the appeal without costs and without attorneys' fees pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). The stipulation is hereby so ordered.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 07/11/2017. (nd)
June 5, 2017 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #740 USCA Mandate. (tp)
June 5, 2017 Filing 740 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #735 Notice of Appeal filed by Scott Browne, Ernest J. Browne USCA Case Number 17-0213. The parties in the above- referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 6/5/2017. (tp)
March 20, 2017 Filing 739 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #734 Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL J RINIS. USCA Case Number 17-210.It is hereby ORDERED that the appeal is DISMISSED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 03/20/2017. (nd)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 738 ORDER: Accordingly, Amsellem's objection is overruled and his motion for reconsideration is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/27/2017) (ama)
February 23, 2017 Filing 737 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric Jann dated 2/13/2017 re: Let's see - the public turns on lights, pays the salaries from the janitor to Judge, the tort lawyers get all of this without charge and then those same lawyers get money based on claiming a surfeit of billable hours and enlarge the pot as many in the class do not respond out of frustration, and as further specified in this letter. (rjm)
February 1, 2017 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 465401173335 on 1/30/2017 re: #734 Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL J RINIS. (tp)
February 1, 2017 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 465401173357 on 1/30/2017 re: #735 Notice of Appeal filed by Scott Browne, Ernest J. Browne. (tp)
January 23, 2017 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #735 Notice of Appeal filed by Scott Browne, Ernest J. Browne were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
January 23, 2017 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #735 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
January 23, 2017 Appeal Fee Due: for #735 Notice of Appeal.$505.00 Appeal fee due by 2/6/2017. (nd)
January 23, 2017 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #734 Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL J RINIS were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
January 23, 2017 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #734 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
January 20, 2017 Appeal Fee Due: for #734 Notice of Appeal. $505.00 Appeal fee due by 2/3/2017. (nd)
January 20, 2017 Filing 735 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #727 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, #728 Judgment,,,,. Document filed by Ernest J. Browne, Scott Browne. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Verdiramo, Vincent)
January 20, 2017 Filing 734 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #727 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, #726 Order, #728 Judgment,,,,. Document filed by MICHAEL J RINIS. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Yuniver, Steven)
January 20, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Verdiramo, Vincent to RE-FILE Document No. #733 Notice of Appeal,.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filers were NOT selected for the appeal; the order/judgment being appealed was not selected;. Re-file the appeal using the event type Corrected Notice of Appeal found under the event list Appeal Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - select the correct order/judgment being appealed. (nd)
January 20, 2017 Filing 733 FILING ERROR - NO ORDER/JUDGMENT SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Scott Browne. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Verdiramo, Vincent) Modified on 1/20/2017 (nd).
January 20, 2017 Filing 731 LETTER addressed to Settlement Administrator, Pfizer Inc. Securities Litigation Settlement; By ECF to Mary S. Thomas, Esq., Lynn K. Neuner, Esq. from Judge Laura Taylor Swain dated 1/20/2017 re: The Court has received two letters from individuals alleging that they may be members of the Class in the above-captioned matter who are unable to produce the necessary documentation required by the Claims Administrator. In light of the representation by Plaintiffs' counsel that "Lead Counsel has been instructing potential Class Members to do the best they can in searching for records and to submit whatever they can provide" and that "Lead Counsel will consult with the Claims Administrator and consider whether exceptions from the documentation requirement should be recommended to the Court in connection with the submission of the motion for a distribution order" (docket entry no. 721, at p. 10), attached to this letter are copies of the two letters the Court has received, so that the individuals in question may be contacted and advised by counsel or the Claims Administrator in the manner described. (rjm)
January 19, 2017 Filing 732 LETTER from Sally B. Glenn dated 1/13/17 re: Sally Glenn submits a follow-up letter to the one dated 11/25/16(attached as indicated) regarding her objection to the settlement; and she encloses the list of entities to which she said she would forward as soon as available. (sc)
January 6, 2017 Filing 730 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/21/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 6, 2017 Filing 729 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/21/2016 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tara Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, as follows: For purposes of this Judgment, all capitalized terms used herein have the meanings as set forth and defined in the Settlement Agreement.The Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Action and over all Parties to the Action, including all members of the Class. Pursuant to and in accordance with the requirements of Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Settlement as set forth in the Settlement Agreement is fully and finally approved and the Court finds the Settlement to be, in all respects, fair, reasonable and adequate, and in the best interests of the Class, and the Class Members. The Court further finds that the Settlement as set forth in the Settlement Agreement is the result of arm's-length negotiations between experienced counsel representing the interests of the Parties. The Parties are directed to consummate the Settlement Agreement in accordance with its terms and provisions. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/21/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP et al.(ama)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 727 ORDER GRANTING LEAD COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES: granting (711) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED: Lead Counsel is hereby awarded 28% of the $486 million Settlement Amount, plus interest at the same rate earned by the Settlement Fund, to be paid from the Settlement Fund. Lead Counsel is hereby awarded the sum of $20,005,879.33 in litigation expenses, plus interest at the same rate earned by the Settlement Fund, to be paid from the Settlement Fund. Lead Counsel shall allocate the attorneys' fees and expenses awarded amongst Plaintiffs' Counsel in a manner in which it in good faith believes reflects the contribution of such counsel to the prosecution and settlement of the Action. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/21/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP et al. (ama)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED: The proposed Plan of Allocation of the Net Cash Settlement Amount, in the form attached to the Notice, is APPROVED. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/21/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP et al.(ama)
December 21, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Settlement Conference held on 12/21/2016. Court Reporter Tara Jones present. SETTLEMENT MOTION HRG held. The Court grants the Order approving settlement and final judgment, an Order approving plan of allocation, and an Order granting lead counsels motion for attorneys fees and reimbursement of expenses. (Orders to follow.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP et al.(lan)
December 21, 2016 Filing 725 NOTICE of Defendant Pfizer Inc.'s Certification Regarding CAFA Notice. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Neuner, Lynn)
December 16, 2016 Filing 724 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent Savino Verdiramo on behalf of Pfizer, Inc.. (Verdiramo, Vincent)
December 7, 2016 Filing 723 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Charles T. Caliendo dated December 7, 2016 re: Enclosing courtesy copies of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of 1) Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation, and 2) Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses; and supporting Supplemental Declaration of Charles T. Caliendo. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Caliendo, Charles)
December 6, 2016 Filing 722 DECLARATION of Charles T. Caliendo in Support re: #711 MOTION for Attorney Fees Lead Counsels Notice of Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses., #709 MOTION to Approve Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation .. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Behrman objection, #2 Exhibit 2 - Biskup objection, #3 Exhibit 3 - Blanks objection, #4 Exhibit 4 - Brownes objection, #5 Exhibit 5 - Bylsma objection, #6 Exhibit 6 - Cooper objection, #7 Exhibit 7 - Dannov/Braun objection, #8 Exhibit 8 - Glenn objection, #9 Exhibit 9 - Haeberle objection, #10 Exhibit 10 - Hobbie, #11 Exhibit 11 - McDaniel objection, #12 Exhibit 12 - Meehan objection, #13 Exhibit 13 - Muzumdar objection, #14 Exhibit 14 - Pointer objection, #15 Exhibit 15 - Rinis objection, #16 Exhibit 16 - Shapiro objection, #17 Exhibit 17 - Tompkins objection, #18 Exhibit 18 - Venning objection, #19 Exhibit 19 - Weeratunge objection, #20 Exhibit 20 - Wight objection, #21 Exhibit 21 - Ferrante Supplemental Affidavit, #22 Exhibit 22 - In re Bear Stearns hearing transcript, #23 Exhibit 23 - In re AIG hearing transcript, #24 Exhibit 24 - Fitzpatrick Declaration (In re Neurontin), #25 Exhibit 25 - In re Neurontin Memorandum and Order, #26 Exhibit 26 - G&E/TRSLA Retainer Agreement)(Caliendo, Charles)
December 6, 2016 Filing 721 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #711 MOTION for Attorney Fees Lead Counsels Notice of Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses., #709 MOTION to Approve Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation . . Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 30, 2016 Filing 719 FIFTH NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF OBJECTIONS: All of the Objections except the Meehan Objection note that they were sent to the parties as well as to the Court, and all of the Objections except the Meehan Objection included an enclosure with confidential personal information. Accordingly, only the cover letter to those Objections will be filed on the public docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/30/2016) (ama)
November 29, 2016 Filing 720 LETTER from James Cooper dated 11/19/16 re: Non-partry stockholder James Cooper informs the Court that this lawsuit should be thrown out; that the methods in which these class-action lawsuits are initiated are criminal; and that the settlements are not large enough to make a difference. (sc)
November 28, 2016 Filing 718 OBJECTION TO PROPOSED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Document filed by Class member, Mark Shapiro. (sc)
November 28, 2016 Filing 717 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #711 MOTION for Attorney Fees Lead Counsels Notice of Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. . Document filed by MICHAEL J RINIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MEMBERSHIP INTEREST, #2 Exhibit MEMBERSHIP INTEREST, #3 Exhibit MEMBERSHIP INTEREST)(Yuniver, Steven)
November 28, 2016 Filing 716 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #711 MOTION for Attorney Fees Lead Counsels Notice of Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. . Document filed by Ernest J. Browne, Scott Browne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Part 1 of 3, #3 Exhibit Part 2 of 3, #4 Exhibit Part 3 of 3)(Verdiramo, Vincent)
November 15, 2016 Filing 715 FOURTH NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF OBJECTIONS: Counsel for the parties is hereby notified of the following objections received by the Court, copies of which are attached to this Notice: 1. Objection of Rosemary B. McDaniel (received November 15, 2016) 2. Objection of Aravind S. Muzumdar (received November 15, 2016) The Muzumdar Objection was sent to this Court as well as to the parties, and included an enclosure with confidential personal information. Accordingly, only the cover letter to this Objection will be filed on the public docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/15/2016) (cf)
November 14, 2016 Filing 714 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Charles T. Caliendo dated November 14, 2016 re: Enclosing courtesy copies of Plaintiffs' 1) Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation (Dkt. nos. 709 & 710); 2) Lead Counsel's Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Law for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses (Dkt. nos. 711 & 712); and 3) Declaration of Charles T. Caliendo in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses (Dkt. no. 713). Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Caliendo, Charles)
November 11, 2016 Filing 713 DECLARATION of Charles T. Caliendo in Support re: #711 MOTION for Attorney Fees Lead Counsels Notice of Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses., #709 MOTION to Approve Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation .. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J - Part 1, #11 Exhibit J - Part 2, #12 Exhibit J - Part 3, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O)(Caliendo, Charles)
November 11, 2016 Filing 712 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #711 MOTION for Attorney Fees Lead Counsels Notice of Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. . Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 11, 2016 Filing 711 MOTION for Attorney Fees Lead Counsels Notice of Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sabella, James)
November 11, 2016 Filing 710 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #709 MOTION to Approve Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation . . Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 11, 2016 Filing 709 MOTION to Approve Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation . Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sabella, James)
November 3, 2016 Filing 708 THIRD NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF OBJECTIONS: Counsel for the parties is hereby notified of the following objection received by the Court, a copy of which is attached to this Notice: 1. Objection of John M. Wight (received November 2, 2016) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/3/2016) (cla)
October 25, 2016 Filing 707 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF OBJECTIONS Counsel for the parties is hereby notified of the following objections received by the Court, copies of which are attached to this Notice: 1. Objection of Edward J. Hobbie, Hobbie & Hobbie LLC (received October 21, 2016) 2. Objection of Frederick Haeberle (received October 24, 2016) 3. Objection of Bill Bylsma (received October 25, 2016) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/25/2016) (cf)
October 21, 2016 Filing 706 FIRST NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF OBJECTIONS: Counsel for the parties is hereby notified of the following objections received by the Court, copies of which are attached to this Notice: 1. Objection of Channa Weeratunge (received October 14, 2016) 2. Objection of Kenneth Behrman (received October 18, 2016) 3. Objection of Robert Venning (received October 20, 2016) 4. Objection of Donald Tompkins (received October 20, 2016) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/20/2016) (cf)
October 17, 2016 Filing 705 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 09/13/2016 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Jackson, Jasmine)
October 17, 2016 Filing 704 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/13/2016 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Nilsen, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2017.(Jackson, Jasmine)
September 16, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 12/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (cf)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 703 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT, DIRECTING NOTICE TO CLASS MEMBERS, AND SETTING HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT granting #698 Motion to Approve Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval of the Settlement and on Plaintiffs' Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. The Court, for the purposes of this Order, adopts all defined terms set forth in the Settlement Agreement. The Final Approval Hearing shall be held before this Court on December 21, 2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom I 2D of the Daniel Patrick MoynihanUnited States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007, as further set forth in this Order.). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/16/2016) (cf)
September 14, 2016 Filing 702 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #698 MOTION to Approve Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval of the Settlement and on Plaintiffs' Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' . Document filed by Alden Chace, Christine Fleckles, Julie Perusse, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Keable, #2 Amended Notice)(Sabella, James)
September 13, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Settlement Conference held on 9/13/2016. Court Reporter Patricia Nilsen present. SETTLEMENT MOTION HRG held. The parties are directed to submit an Amended Notice to the Class by 9/26/2016. Next Settlement Conference is scheduled for 12/21/2016 at 10:00am. ( Settlement Conference set for 12/21/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP et al.(lan)
September 2, 2016 Filing 701 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #698 MOTION to Approve Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval of the Settlement and on Plaintiffs' Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' . Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Neuner, Lynn)
August 26, 2016 Filing 700 DECLARATION of James J. Sabella in Support re: #698 MOTION to Approve Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval of the Settlement and on Plaintiffs' Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys'. Document filed by Alden Chace, Christine Fleckles, Julie Perusse, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sabella, James)
August 26, 2016 Filing 699 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #698 MOTION to Approve Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval of the Settlement and on Plaintiffs' Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. Document filed by Alden Chace, Christine Fleckles, Julie Perusse, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
August 26, 2016 Filing 698 MOTION to Approve Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval of the Settlement and on Plaintiffs' Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses . Document filed by Alden Chace, Christine Fleckles, Julie Perusse, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. Return Date set for 9/13/2016 at 12:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Sabella, James)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 697 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #688 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Julie Perusse, Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Alden Chace. USCA Case Number 14-2853.The parties jointly move for a limited remand of this case to the district court so that the district court may consider the proposed settlement, with the pending petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to be held in abeyance pending final approval of the proposed settlement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The parties must file status reports with this Court beginning on December 21, 2016, and every 90 days thereafter, until the proceedings are either resolved or reinstated. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 07/27/2016. (nd)
July 21, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Status Conference held on 7/21/2016. Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski present.STATUS CONFERENCE held. A hearing will be held on the anticipated motion for preliminary approval of the proposed settlement on 9/13/2016 at 12:30pm. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP et al.(lan)
April 15, 2016 Filing 696 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Final Pretrial Conference proceeding held on 07/12/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
April 15, 2016 Filing 695 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Final Pretrial Conference held on 7/12/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Mary Greco, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2016.(ca)
April 12, 2016 Filing 694 USCA OPINION as to #688 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Julie Perusse, Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Alden Chace. USCA Case Number 14-2853-cv. Plaintiffs appeal from a judgment of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York (Swain, J.) granting summary judgment to defendants Pfizer, Inc. and several of its officers and directors (collectively, "Pfizer"). Plaintiffs claim that Pfizer violated 10(b), 20(a), and 20A of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 by making misrepresentations that concealed cardiovascular risks associated with two of its drugs. After discovery, the district court issued an order pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702 excluding Plaintiffs' expert on loss causation and damages from testifying at trial. Without the expert's testimony, Plaintiffs could not establish essential elements of their claims, so the district court granted judgment in favor of Pfizer. We conclude that the district court's rationales for excluding the testimony were inadequate to justify excluding it in its entirety. We further conclude that the district court erred in its earlier summary judgment ruling that no reasonable jury could find Pfizer liable for certain statements made by companies that owned the drugs before Pfizer. Accordingly, the judgment of the district court is VACATED and the matter is REMANDED for further proceedings Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 04/12/2016. (nd)
February 27, 2016 Filing 693 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Alexandra M. Walsh on behalf of Pfizer, Inc.. New Address: Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz PLLC, 1900 M Street, NW, Suite 800, Washington, DC, USA 20036, 202-847-4000. (Walsh, Alexandra)
February 27, 2016 Filing 692 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Beth A. Wilkinson on behalf of Pfizer, Inc.. New Address: Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz PLLC, 1900 M Street, NW, Suite 800, Washington, DC, USA 20036, 202-847-4000. (Wilkinson, Beth)
July 6, 2015 First Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (File). Supplemental Indexed record on Appeal Files for #688 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Julie Perusse, Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Alden Chace USCA Case Number 14-2853, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
April 1, 2015 Filing 691 First Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Supplemental Index to the record on Appeal for #688 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Julie Perusse, Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Alden Chace USCA Case Number 14-2853, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Supplemental Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 690 STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed that subject to further order of the Court: (a) the parties consent to the withdrawal of Docket Entry No. 439; and (b) the parties agree that Plaintiffs will provide the Clerk of the Court with a new CD containing appropriately redacted exhibits which will be substituted in place of Docket Entry No. 439. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/24/2015) (ajs)
March 23, 2015 Filing 689 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Charles T. Caliendo dated March 23, 2015 re: Confidentiality Issue with the Record on Appeal. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order)(Caliendo, Charles)
August 7, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #688 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Julie Perusse, Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Alden Chace were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
August 7, 2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #688 Notice of Appeal,,. (nd)
August 7, 2014 Appeal Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #688 Notice of Appeal,,. Filing fee $ 505.00. Pay.gov receipt number 0208-9977501, paid on 08/07/2014. (nd)
August 7, 2014 Filing 688 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #455 Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,, #679 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #683 Clerk's Judgment,,,, #660 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,. Document filed by Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Julie Perusse, Alden Chace. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
August 7, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Note to Attorney Eisenhofer, Jay to RE-FILE Document No. #687 Notice of Appeal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason: All Filers were NOT Selected. Re-file the document as a Corrected Notice of Appeal event and select all the Filers by adding them to the docket. (nd)
August 7, 2014 Filing 687 FILING ERROR - FILERS NOT SELECTED - NOTICE OF APPEAL from #455 Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,, #679 Order on Motion in Limine,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #683 Clerk's Judgment,,,, #660 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,. Document filed by Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-9977501. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Eisenhofer, Jay) Modified on 8/7/2014 (nd).
July 9, 2014 Terminate Transcript Deadlines. (rjm)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER. The Court hereby withdraws the Order to Show Cause (docket entry no. 46) in the above-captioned case. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/9/2014). Relates to doc. no. 681 in 04-9866 and doc. no. 46 in 12-8379. (rjm)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 685 ORDER. The Court hereby withdraws the Order to Show Cause (docket entry no. 28) in the above-captioned case. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/9/2014). Relates to doc. #28 in 12-8543 and doc. #682 in 04-9866. (rjm) Modified on 7/15/2014 (rjm).
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ORDER: The Court hereby withdraws the Order to Show Cause (docket entry no. 37) in the above-captioned case. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/9/2014) (lmb)
July 9, 2014 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (dt)
July 9, 2014 Filing 683 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated July 8, 2014, Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend their damages expert report (docket entry no.667) is denied, Defendants' motion for summary judgment (docket entry no. 667) is granted, and judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendants' in the following members cases of consolidated action 04-CV-9866-LTS-HBP and multi-district litigation 05-MD-1688: 04-CV-9866-LTS-HBP, 04-CV-9967-LTS, 04-CV-10001-LTS, 04-CV-10071-LTS-HBP, 04-CV-10075-LTS, 04-CV-10085-LTS, 04-CV-10096-LTS, 04-CV-10098-LTS, 04-CV-10118-LTS, 04-CV-10141-LTS, 04-CV-10224-LTS, 04-CV-10257-LTS, 04-CV-10296-LTS, 05-CV-00051-LTS, 05-CV-0125-LTS, 05-CV-0735-LTS, 05-CVC-983-LTS, 05-CV-1308-LTS, 05-CV-1920-LTS, 05-CV-2017-LTS, 05-CV-2076-LTS, 05-CV-2510-LTS, 05-CV-2874-LTS, 05-CV-5715-LTS, 05-CV-5716-LTS, 05-CV-5717-LTS, 05-CV-5719-LTS, 05-CV-5720-LTS, 05-CV-5721-LTS, 05-CV-6327-LTS, and 12-CV-4536-LTS; accordingly, the referenced cases are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 7/9/2014) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal, #2 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS et al.(dt)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Plaintiffs are hereby directed to show cause, with copies sent to all other parties, in a written submission filed by July 22, 2014, why this case should not be dismissed in light of the Court's July 8, 2014, dismissal of the consolidated class action 4-CV-9866-LTS-HBP/ 5-MD-1688-LTS. Any opposition to Plaintiffs' submission must be filed by August 5, 2014, and any reply must be filed by August 12, 2014. Courtesy copies of the submissions must be provided for Chambers., ( Responses due by 8/5/2014., Replies due by 8/12/2014.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/8/2014) (lmb) Modified on 7/10/2014 (lmb).
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 681 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Plaintiffs are hereby directed to show cause, with copies sent to all other parties, in a written submission filed by July 22, 2014, why this case should not be dismissed in light of the Court's July 8, 2014, dismissal of the consolidated class action 4-CV-9866-LTS-HBP/ 5-MD-1688-LTS. Any opposition to Plaintiffs' submission must be filed by August 5, 2014, and any reply must be filed by August 12, 2014. Courtesy copies of the submissions must be provided for Chambers., ( Responses due by 8/5/2014., Replies due by 8/12/2014.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/8/2014) (lmb) Modified on 7/10/2014 (lmb).
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Plaintiffs are hereby directed to show cause, with copies sent to all other parties, in a written submission filed by July 22, 2014, why this case should not be dismissed in light of the Court's July 8, 2014, dismissal of the consolidated class action 4-CV-9866-LTS-HBP/ 5-MD-1688-LTS. Any opposition to Plaintiffs' submission must be filed by August 5, 2014, and any reply must be filed by August 12, 2014. Courtesy copies of the submissions must be provided for Chambers., ( Responses due by 8/5/2014., Replies due by 8/12/2014.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/8/2014) (lmb) Modified on 7/10/2014 (lmb).
July 8, 2014 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #679 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (lmb)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 679 MEMORANDUM ORDER terminating (514) Motion in Limine; terminating (515) Motion in Limine; terminating (516) Motion in Limine; terminating (517) Motion in Limine; terminating (518) Motion in Limine; terminating (519) Motion in Limine; terminating (520) Motion in Limine; terminating (522) Motion in Limine; terminating (523) Motion in Limine; terminating (526) Motion in Limine; terminating (533) Motion in Limine; terminating (541) Motion in Limine; terminating (545) Motion in Limine; terminating (547) Motion in Limine; terminating (549) Motion in Limine; terminating (551) Motion in Limine; terminating (553) Motion in Limine; terminating (555) Motion in Limine; terminating (556) Motion in Limine; terminating (562) Motion in Limine; terminating (566) Motion in Limine; denying (665) Motion for Leave to File Document; granting (667) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP. Plaintiffs' motion to for leave to amend their damages expert report (docket entry no. 665) is denied, and Defendants' motion for summary judgment (docket entry no. 667) is granted. The Clerk of Court is requested to terminate docket entries 514, 515, 516, 517, 518, 519, 520, 522, 523, 526, 533, 541, 545, 547, 549, 551, 553, 555, 556, 562, and 566 and to enter judgment in Defendants' favor in the following member cases of consolidated action 04-CV- 9866-LTS-HBP and multidistrict litigation 05-MD-1688: 04-CV-9866-LTS-HBP, 04-CV-9967- LTS, 04-CV-10001-LTS, 04-CV-10071-LTS-HBP, 04-CV-10075-LTS, 04-CV-10085-LTS, 04- CV-10096-LTS, 04-CV-10098-LTS, 04-CV-100118-LTS, 04-CV-10141-LTS, 04-CV-10224- LTS, 04-CV-10257-LTS, 04-CV-10296-LTS, 05-CV-00051-LTS, 05-CV-0125-LTS, 05-CV- 0735, 05-CV-0983-LTS, 05-CV-1308-LTS, 05-CV-1920-LTS, 05-CV-2017-LTS, 05-CV- 2076- LTS, 05-CV-2510-LTS, 05-CV-2874-LTS, 05-CV-5715-LTS, 05-CV-5716-LTS, 05-CV-5717- LTS, 05-CV-5719-LTS, 05-CV-5720-LTS, 05-CV-5721-LTS, 05-CV-6327-LTS, and 12-CV- 4536-LTS. The Clerk of Court is further requested to close the referenced cases. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/8/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP (lmb)
June 27, 2014 Filing 678 REPLY re: #673 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1 . Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
June 27, 2014 Filing 677 DECLARATION of Alexandra M. Walsh in Support re: #667 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wilkinson, Beth)
June 27, 2014 Filing 676 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #667 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
June 27, 2014 Filing 675 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #665 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Supplemental Expert Report of Daniel R. Fischel. . Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
June 20, 2014 Filing 674 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #665 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Supplemental Expert Report of Daniel R. Fischel. . Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
June 20, 2014 Filing 673 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #669 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
June 20, 2014 Filing 672 DECLARATION of Mary S. Thomas in Opposition re: #667 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Sabella, James)
June 20, 2014 Filing 671 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #667 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
June 6, 2014 Filing 670 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #667 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
June 6, 2014 Filing 669 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
June 6, 2014 Filing 668 DECLARATION of Geoffrey C. Jarvis in Support re: #665 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Supplemental Expert Report of Daniel R. Fischel.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, part 1, #3 Exhibit B, part 2, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Sabella, James)
June 6, 2014 Filing 667 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
June 6, 2014 Filing 666 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #665 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Supplemental Expert Report of Daniel R. Fischel. . Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Sabella, James)
June 6, 2014 Filing 665 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Supplemental Expert Report of Daniel R. Fischel. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Sabella, James)
May 29, 2014 Filing 664 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/23/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 29, 2014 Filing 663 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/23/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bridget Lombardozzi, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/23/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 23, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/23/2014. Court Reporter Bridget Lombardozzi present. FPTC held. All parties have 14 days to submit motions regarding proposed expert reports. Responses or opposition papers due with 14 days thereafter. Reply papers are due 7 days after the response/opposition. Next FPTC is scheduled for 7/18/2014 at 3:00pm. Jury Trial is scheduled to commence on 9/9/2014 at 9:00am. (lan)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine no. 8, which seeks the exclusion of "reference to claims that have been dismissed, or claims or legal theories that Plaintiffs have abandoned, changed, and/or modified," is denied without prejudice to reassertion in connection with particular arguments at trial. This Order resolves docket entry no. 558. Denying #558 Motion in Limine. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/21/2014) (rjm)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 9, which seeks the preclusion of "evidence or argument relating to affirmative defenses that were not asserted in Defendants' answer," is granted to the extent that Defendants' Answer is not to be construed to assert any affirmative defense not specifically plead therein. This order does not preclude motion practice seeking leave to amend pleadings, nor does it preclude any arguments in opposition to such motion practice or arguments with respect to the admissibility of particular evidence. This Order resolves docket entry no. 560. Granting #560 Motion in Limine. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/21/2014) (rjm)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER. Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 8 is granted and the expert testimony of Daniel R. Fischel is excluded from the trial of this action. Because the Court grants Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 8, thereby excluding the testimony of Plaintiffs' damages expert Daniel R. Fischel from the upcoming trial of this action, Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 11 (docket entry no. 538) to strike the rebuttal damages testimony of Paul A. Gompers is granted on the sole ground that, in the absence of the testimony of Fischel, Gompers' proposed testimony is irrelevant. This Order resolves docket entries no. 521 and 538. Granting #521 Motion in Limine; Granting #538 Motion in Limine. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/21/2014) (rjm)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 659 ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, the Court denies Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings, without prejudice to litigation of the issues at an appropriate time. This Order resolves docket entry no. 650. Denying #650 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/21/2014) (rjm)
May 16, 2014 Filing 658 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Sabella, James)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 657 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND ORDER UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(2) and 23(e): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned attorneys of record for all parties in this action, that Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Mar. 27, 2012) (Dkt. No. 361) against Defendant John L. LaMattina is hereby dismissed with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) and 23(e). Because the Court finds that this dismissal does not affect the rights or interests of absent class members, no notice is required. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that each party shall bear their own costs and expenses. This order resolves docket entry no. 647. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/13/2014) (rjm)
May 12, 2014 Filing 656 JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT . Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Appendix 3, #4 Appendix 4, #5 Appendix 5, #6 Appendix 6, #7 Appendix 7, #8 Appendix 8)(Sabella, James)
May 12, 2014 Filing 655 JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #654 JOINT MOTION For Use of a Juror Questionnaire at Trial re: #646 Order on Motion for Extension of Time . . Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc., Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilkinson, Beth)
May 12, 2014 Filing 654 JOINT MOTION For Use of a Juror Questionnaire at Trial re: #646 Order on Motion for Extension of Time . Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc., Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Wilkinson, Beth)
May 2, 2014 Filing 653 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #650 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. . Document filed by Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel. (Calhoon, Michael)
May 2, 2014 Filing 652 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #647 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. . Document filed by John L. LaMattina. (Rosenberg, Jonathan)
April 22, 2014 Filing 651 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #647 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings., #650 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law In Opposition to the Motion by Defendants LaMattina, Katen and McKinnell for Judgment on the Pleadings Concerning Plaintiffs' Claim Under Section 20A. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
April 21, 2014 Filing 650 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel.(Calhoon, Michael)
April 21, 2014 Filing 649 DECLARATION of Jonathan Rosenberg, Esq. in Support re: #647 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by John L. LaMattina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
April 21, 2014 Filing 648 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #647 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by John L. LaMattina. (Rosenberg, Jonathan)
April 21, 2014 Filing 647 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by John L. LaMattina.(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER granting #645 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The parties may proceed as outlined above. Motions due by 5/12/2014. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/7/2014) (lmb)
March 6, 2014 Filing 645 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Beth A. Wilkinson dated March 6, 2014. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc., Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Wilkinson, Beth)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ORDER granting #643 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Joint File Pre-trial Statement. The request is granted. This endorsement resolves docket entry no. 643. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/13/2014) (lmb) Modified on 2/13/2014 (lmb).
February 11, 2014 Filing 643 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Joint Pre-Trial Statement addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Beth A. Wilkinson dated February 11, 2014. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
February 5, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (lmb)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER granting #641 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The requests are granted. The trial date is adjourned, subject to further order of the Court, to September 9, 2014. The Court currently has a criminal trial scheduled for October; the trial date will be reinstated closer to the time. The April 4, 2014, session of the final pretrial conference is adjourned to May 23, 2014, at 11:00 AM. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/4/2014) (lmb)
January 31, 2014 Filing 641 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time / on consent of all parties requesting a brief adjournment of trial date and two interim deadlines for the exchange of exhibit lists addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Beth A. Wilkinson dated 1/31/2014. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
January 29, 2014 Filing 640 MEMO ENDORSED granting #570 Motion in Limine. ENDORSEMENT: The within, unopposed, motion is granted. This resolves docket entry 570. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/29/2014) (cd)
November 26, 2013 Filing 639 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Mary S. Thomas dated November 26, 2013 re: Courtesy copies of Plaintiffs' Reply Briefs. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Thomas, Mary)
November 22, 2013 Filing 638 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #518 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Cheryl D. Blume.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 22, 2013 Filing 637 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #514 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to Products Liability Issues.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 22, 2013 Filing 636 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony of Dr. Douglas P. Zipes.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 22, 2013 Filing 635 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #516 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of a Criminal Plea, Civil Settlements, and a Congressional Inquiry Concerning Celebrex and/or Bextra.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Wilkinson, Beth)
November 22, 2013 Filing 634 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #519 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Simon M. Helfgott.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 22, 2013 Filing 633 DECLARATION of Matthew L. Mustokoff in Support re: #538 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Paul A. Gompers., #541 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude Defendants' Expert, Dr. Eric M. Ruderman from Testifying as to Certain Matters at Trial.. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9)(Mustokoff, Matthew)
November 22, 2013 Filing 632 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #551 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to exclude evidence or argument regarding aggregate damages to the Class.. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Mustokoff, Matthew)
November 22, 2013 Filing 631 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #541 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude Defendants' Expert, Dr. Eric M. Ruderman from Testifying as to Certain Matters at Trial.. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Mustokoff, Matthew)
November 22, 2013 Filing 630 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #558 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to exclude reference to claims that have been dismissed, or claims or legal theories that Plaintiffs have abandoned, changed and/or modified.. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Mustokoff, Matthew)
November 22, 2013 Filing 629 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #538 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Paul A. Gompers.. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Mustokoff, Matthew)
November 22, 2013 Filing 628 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #523 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence Offered to Establish the Existence of Cardiovascular Risks.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 22, 2013 Filing 627 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #522 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Certain Evidence and Argument Based Upon the Court's Summary Judgment Rulings.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 22, 2013 Filing 626 DECLARATION of James J. Sabella in Support re: #553 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to exclude evidence or argument tht Defendants' counsel were involved in drafting or approving any of the false or misleading statements involved in this case., #545 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to exclude testimony from or evidence or argument concerning any of the Class representatives or any other Class members., #560 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to exclude evidence or argument relating to affirmative defenses that were not asserted in Defendants' Answer., #566 MOTION in Limine No. 13 to exclude portions of purported expert testimony of Lawrence Goldkind., #549 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to exclude all evidence or argument that providing study data to the Food and Drug Administration satisfies Defendants' disclosure obligations under the Federal Securties Laws., #551 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to exclude evidence or argument regarding aggregate damages to the Class., #555 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to exclude evidence that John Talley, Krista Fox, Paul Dodson and/or Andrew Watson recants, disavows, does not recall, or denies any statement attributed to him or her in the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint., #547 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to exclude evidence or argument concerning the April 6, 2005 Memorandum by John Jenkins and Paul Seligman of the Food and Drug Administration., #556 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to exclude evidence or argument that Plaintiffs, Defendants, Counsel, Witnesses or family members thereof, took Celebrex, Bextra, Vioxx or other NSAIDS.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L, #2 Exhibit M, #3 Exhibit N, #4 Exhibit O, #5 Exhibit P, #6 Exhibit Q, #7 Exhibit R, #8 Exhibit S, #9 Exhibit T, #10 Exhibit U)(Sabella, James)
November 22, 2013 Filing 625 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #515 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Irrelevant and Prejudicial Evidence Unrelated to Cardiovascular Risks.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 22, 2013 Filing 624 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #566 MOTION in Limine No. 13 to exclude portions of purported expert testimony of Lawrence Goldkind.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 22, 2013 Filing 623 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #521 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel R. Fischel.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 22, 2013 Filing 622 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #560 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to exclude evidence or argument relating to affirmative defenses that were not asserted in Defendants' Answer.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 22, 2013 Filing 621 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #556 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to exclude evidence or argument that Plaintiffs, Defendants, Counsel, Witnesses or family members thereof, took Celebrex, Bextra, Vioxx or other NSAIDS.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 22, 2013 Filing 620 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #555 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to exclude evidence that John Talley, Krista Fox, Paul Dodson and/or Andrew Watson recants, disavows, does not recall, or denies any statement attributed to him or her in the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 22, 2013 Filing 619 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #553 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to exclude evidence or argument tht Defendants' counsel were involved in drafting or approving any of the false or misleading statements involved in this case.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 22, 2013 Filing 618 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #549 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to exclude all evidence or argument that providing study data to the Food and Drug Administration satisfies Defendants' disclosure obligations under the Federal Securties Laws.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 22, 2013 Filing 617 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #547 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to exclude evidence or argument concerning the April 6, 2005 Memorandum by John Jenkins and Paul Seligman of the Food and Drug Administration.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 22, 2013 Filing 616 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #545 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to exclude testimony from or evidence or argument concerning any of the Class representatives or any other Class members.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 22, 2013 Filing 615 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #517 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence of Nine Alleged Misstatements.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 22, 2013 Filing 614 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #533 MOTION in Limine of Individual Defendants Hank McKinnell and Karen Katen to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Their Departures From Pfizer.. Document filed by Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel. (Calhoon, Michael)
November 22, 2013 Filing 613 DECLARATION of Michele A. Roberts in Support re: #612 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Roberts, Michele)
November 22, 2013 Filing 612 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #526 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Wealth and Compensation.. Document filed by Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel. (Roberts, Michele)
November 22, 2013 Filing 611 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Juceam in Support re: #515 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Irrelevant and Prejudicial Evidence Unrelated to Cardiovascular Risks., #518 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Cheryl D. Blume., #517 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence of Nine Alleged Misstatements., #520 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony of Dr. Douglas P. Zipes., #514 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to Products Liability Issues., #519 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Simon M. Helfgott., #522 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Certain Evidence and Argument Based Upon the Court's Summary Judgment Rulings., #523 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence Offered to Establish the Existence of Cardiovascular Risks., #521 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel R. Fischel., #516 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of a Criminal Plea, Civil Settlements, and a Congressional Inquiry Concerning Celebrex and/or Bextra.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, Part 1, #4 Exhibit 3, Part 2, #5 Exhibit 3, Part 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, Part 1, #12 Exhibit 9, Part 2, #13 Exhibit 10, Part 1, #14 Exhibit 10, Part 2, #15 Exhibit 11, Part 1, #16 Exhibit 11, Part 2, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24, #30 Exhibit 25, #31 Exhibit 26, #32 Exhibit 27, #33 Exhibit 28, #34 Exhibit 29, #35 Exhibit 30, #36 Exhibit 31, #37 Exhibit 32, #38 Exhibit 33, #39 Exhibit 34, #40 Exhibit 35, #41 Exhibit 36, #42 Exhibit 37, #43 Exhibit 38, #44 Exhibit 39, #45 Exhibit 40, #46 Exhibit 41, #47 Exhibit 42, #48 Exhibit 43, #49 Exhibit 44, #50 Exhibit 45, Part 1, #51 Exhibit 45, Part 2, #52 Exhibit 46, #53 Exhibit 47)(Wilkinson, Beth)
November 21, 2013 Filing 610 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel James Juceam on behalf of Pfizer, Inc.. (Juceam, Daniel)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER granting #607 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #514 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to Products Liability Issues., #515 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Irrelevant and Prejudicial Evidence Unrelated to Cardiovascular Risks., #520 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony of Dr. Douglas P. Zipes., #526 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Wealth and Compensation., #562 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to exclude evidence or argument that any of Plaintiffs's counsel was accused and/or sanctioned for purported Rule 11 violations., #541 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude Defendants' Expert, Dr. Eric M. Ruderman from Testifying as to Certain Matters at Trial., #521 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel R. Fischel., #549 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to exclude all evidence or argument that providing study data to the Food and Drug Administration satisfies Defendants' disclosure obligations under the Federal Securties Laws., #517 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence of Nine Alleged Misstatements., #545 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to exclude testimony from or evidence or argument concerning any of the Class representatives or any other Class members., #523 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence Offered to Establish the Existence of Cardiovascular Risks., #553 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to exclude evidence or argument tht Defendants' counsel were involved in drafting or approving any of the false or misleading statements involved in this case., #533 MOTION in Limine of Individual Defendants Hank McKinnell and Karen Katen to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Their Departures From Pfizer., #566 MOTION in Limine No. 13 to exclude portions of purported expert testimony of Lawrence Goldkind., #570 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs From Relying On His 2005 Pfizer Stock Transactions as Proof of His Alleged Scienter., #556 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to exclude evidence or argument that Plaintiffs, Defendants, Counsel, Witnesses or family members thereof, took Celebrex, Bextra, Vioxx or other NSAIDS., #519 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Simon M. Helfgott., #555 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to exclude evidence that John Talley, Krista Fox, Paul Dodson and/or Andrew Watson recants, disavows, does not recall, or denies any statement attributed to him or her in the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint., #558 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to exclude reference to claims that have been dismissed, or claims or legal theories that Plaintiffs have abandoned, changed and/or modified., #547 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to exclude evidence or argument concerning the April 6, 2005 Memorandum by John Jenkins and Paul Seligman of the Food and Drug Administration., #522 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Certain Evidence and Argument Based Upon the Court's Summary Judgment Rulings., #560 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to exclude evidence or argument relating to affirmative defenses that were not asserted in Defendants' Answer., #516 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of a Criminal Plea, Civil Settlements, and a Congressional Inquiry Concerning Celebrex and/or Bextra., #518 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Cheryl D. Blume., #551 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to exclude evidence or argument regarding aggregate damages to the Class., #538 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Paul A. Gompers. The request is granted. This resolves docket entry no. 607. Replies due by 11/22/2013. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/18/2013) (cd)
November 15, 2013 Filing 608 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE FOR JOSEPHINE A. CHEATHAM: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Josephine A. Cheatham of Allen & Overy LLP is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Defendant Joseph Feczko. The law firm of Allen & Overy LLP continues to serve as Counsel for Mr. Feczko through its attorneys listed below, and all future correspondence and papers in this action should continue to be directed to them. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 11/18/2013) (js)
November 15, 2013 Filing 607 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Beth A. Wilkinson dated November 15, 2013. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
November 12, 2013 Filing 606 DECLARATION of Charles T. Caliendo in Opposition re: #517 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence of Nine Alleged Misstatements., #522 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Certain Evidence and Argument Based Upon the Court's Summary Judgment Rulings., #523 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence Offered to Establish the Existence of Cardiovascular Risks., #521 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel R. Fischel., #515 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Irrelevant and Prejudicial Evidence Unrelated to Cardiovascular Risks., #518 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Cheryl D. Blume., #520 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony of Dr. Douglas P. Zipes., #514 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to Products Liability Issues., #519 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Simon M. Helfgott., #533 MOTION in Limine of Individual Defendants Hank McKinnell and Karen Katen to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Their Departures From Pfizer., #526 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Wealth and Compensation., #516 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of a Criminal Plea, Civil Settlements, and a Congressional Inquiry Concerning Celebrex and/or Bextra.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Exhibit 7- part 1, #3 Exhibit 7- part 2, #4 Exhibit 8-15, #5 Exhibit 16-20, #6 Exhibit 21-25, #7 Exhibit 26-29, #8 Exhibit 30-32, #9 Exhibit 33-34, #10 Exhibit 35- part 1, #11 Exhibit 35- part 2, #12 Exhibit 36, #13 Exhibit 37, #14 Exhibit 38- part 1, #15 Exhibit 38- part 2, #16 Exhibit 38- part 3, #17 Exhibit 38- part 4, #18 Exhibit 38- part 5, #19 Exhibit 38- part 6, #20 Exhibit 39-40, #21 Exhibit 41-42, #22 Exhibit 43-45, #23 Exhibit 46-51, #24 Exhibit 52, #25 Exhibit 53-55, #26 Exhibit 56-65, #27 Exhibit 66-70, #28 Exhibit 71-72, #29 Exhibit 73-74, #30 Exhibit 75, #31 Exhibit 76- part 1, #32 Exhibit 76- part 2, #33 Exhibit 77-81, #34 Exhibit 82-93, #35 Exhibit 94-101, #36 Exhibit 102-110, #37 Exhibit 111-113, #38 Exhibit 114- part 1, #39 Exhibit 114- part 2, #40 Exhibit 115, #41 Exhibit 116- part 1, #42 Exhibit 116- part 2, #43 Exhibit 116- part 3, #44 Exhibit 116- part 4, #45 Exhibit 116- part 5, #46 Exhibit 116- part 6, #47 Exhibit 117-119, #48 Exhibit 120-124, #49 Exhibit 125, #50 Exhibit 126-127, #51 Exhibit 128-130, #52 Exhibit 131-132, #53 Exhibit 133- part 1, #54 Exhibit 133- part 2, #55 Exhibit 133- part 3, #56 Exhibit 134, #57 Exhibit 135-139, #58 Exhibit 140, #59 Exhibit 141- part 1, #60 Exhibit 141- part 2, #61 Exhibit 141- part 3, #62 Exhibit 142- part 1, #63 Exhibit 142- part 2, #64 Exhibit 142- part 3, #65 Exhibit 143, #66 Exhibit 144, #67 Exhibit 145- part 1, #68 Exhibit 145- part 2, #69 Exhibit 146-148, #70 Exhibit 149- part 1, #71 Exhibit 149- part 2, #72 Exhibit 150-156, #73 Exhibit 158, #74 Exhibit 159, #75 Exhibit 160- part 1, #76 Exhibit 160- part 2, #77 Exhibit 160- part 3, #78 Exhibit 160- part 4, #79 Exhibit 160- part 5, #80 Exhibit 160- part 6, #81 Exhibit 161- part 1, #82 Exhibit 161- part 2, #83 Exhibit 162, #84 Exhibit 163, #85 Exhibit 164- part 1, #86 Exhibit 164- part 2, #87 Exhibit 164- part 3, #88 Exhibit 165-167, #89 Exhibit 168- part 1, #90 Exhibit 168- part 2, #91 Exhibit 168- part 3, #92 Exhibit 168- part 4, #93 Exhibit 168- part 5, #94 Exhibit 169- part 1, #95 Exhibit 169- part 2, #96 Exhibit 169- part 3, #97 Exhibit 170, #98 Exhibit 171- part 1, #99 Exhibit 171- part 2, #100 Exhibit 171- part 3, #101 Exhibit 171- part 4, #102 Exhibit 171- part 5, #103 Exhibit 171- part 6, #104 Exhibit 171- part 7, #105 Exhibit 171- part 8, #106 Exhibit 172, #107 Exhibit 173- part 1, #108 Exhibit 173- part 2, #109 Exhibit 174- part 1, #110 Exhibit 174- part 2, #111 Exhibit 174- part 3, #112 Exhibit 174- part 4, #113 Exhibit 175-179, #114 Exhibit 180-184, #115 Exhibit 185-187, #116 Exhibit 188-192, #117 Exhibit 193-195, #118 Exhibit 196- part 1, #119 Exhibit 196- part 2, #120 Exhibit 197- part 1, #121 Exhibit 197- part 2, #122 Exhibit 198, #123 Exhibit 199- part 1, #124 Exhibit 199- part 2, #125 Exhibit 199- part 3, #126 Exhibit 199- part 4, #127 Exhibit 199- part 5, #128 Exhibit 200-202, #129 Exhibit 203-205)(Thomas, Mary)
November 12, 2013 Filing 605 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Mary S. Thomas dated November 12, 2013 re: Corrected Caliendo Declaration. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Thomas, Mary)
November 12, 2013 Filing 604 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Josephine A. Cheatham. Document filed by Joseph M. Feczko. (Cheatham, Josephine)
November 5, 2013 Filing 603 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #545 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to exclude testimony from or evidence or argument concerning any of the Class representatives or any other Class members.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 5, 2013 Filing 602 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #538 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Paul A. Gompers.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 5, 2013 Filing 601 DECLARATION of Charles T. Caliendo in Opposition re: #517 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence of Nine Alleged Misstatements., #522 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Certain Evidence and Argument Based Upon the Court's Summary Judgment Rulings., #523 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence Offered to Establish the Existence of Cardiovascular Risks., #521 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel R. Fischel., #515 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Irrelevant and Prejudicial Evidence Unrelated to Cardiovascular Risks., #518 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Cheryl D. Blume., #520 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony of Dr. Douglas P. Zipes., #514 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to Products Liability Issues., #519 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Simon M. Helfgott., #533 MOTION in Limine of Individual Defendants Hank McKinnell and Karen Katen to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Their Departures From Pfizer., #526 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Wealth and Compensation., #516 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of a Criminal Plea, Civil Settlements, and a Congressional Inquiry Concerning Celebrex and/or Bextra.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Exhibit 7- part 1, #3 Exhibit 7- part 2, #4 Exhibit 8-15, #5 Exhibit 16-20, #6 Exhibit 21-25, #7 Exhibit 26-29, #8 Exhibit 30-32, #9 Exhibit 33-34, #10 Exhibit 35- part 1, #11 Exhibit 35- part 2, #12 Exhibit 36, #13 Exhibit 37, #14 Exhibit 38- part 1, #15 Exhibit 38- part 2, #16 Exhibit 38- part 3, #17 Exhibit 38- part 4, #18 Exhibit 38- part 5, #19 Exhibit 38- part 6, #20 Exhibit 39-40, #21 Exhibit 41-42, #22 Exhibit 43-45, #23 Exhibit 46-51, #24 Exhibit 52, #25 Exhibit 53-55, #26 Exhibit 56-65, #27 Exhibit 66-70, #28 Exhibit 71-72, #29 Exhibit 73-74, #30 Exhibit 75, #31 Exhibit 76- part 1, #32 Exhibit 76- part 2, #33 Exhibit 77-81, #34 Exhibit 82-93, #35 Exhibit 94-101, #36 Exhibit 102-110, #37 Exhibit 111-113, #38 Exhibit 114- part 1, #39 Exhibit 114- part 2, #40 Exhibit 115, #41 Exhibit 116- part 1, #42 Exhibit 116- part 2, #43 Exhibit 116- part 3, #44 Exhibit 116- part 4, #45 Exhibit 116- part 5, #46 Exhibit 116- part 6, #47 Exhibit 117-119, #48 Exhibit 120-124, #49 Exhibit 125, #50 Exhibit 126-127, #51 Exhibit 128-130, #52 Exhibit 131-132, #53 Exhibit 133- part 1, #54 Exhibit 133- part 2, #55 Exhibit 133- part 3, #56 Exhibit 134, #57 Exhibit 135-139, #58 Exhibit 140, #59 Exhibit 141- part 1, #60 Exhibit 141- part 2, #61 Exhibit 141- part 3, #62 Exhibit 142- part 1, #63 Exhibit 142- part 2, #64 Exhibit 142- part 3, #65 Exhibit 143, #66 Exhibit 144, #67 Exhibit 145- part 1, #68 Exhibit 145- part 2, #69 Exhibit 146-148, #70 Exhibit 149- part 1, #71 Exhibit 149- part 2, #72 Exhibit 150-156, #73 Exhibit 158, #74 Exhibit 159, #75 Exhibit 160- part 1, #76 Exhibit 160- part 2, #77 Exhibit 160- part 3, #78 Exhibit 160- part 4, #79 Exhibit 160- part 5, #80 Exhibit 160- part 6, #81 Exhibit 161- part 1, #82 Exhibit 161- part 2, #83 Exhibit 162, #84 Exhibit 163, #85 Exhibit 164- part 1, #86 Exhibit 164- part 2, #87 Exhibit 164- part 3, #88 Exhibit 165-167, #89 Exhibit 168- part 1, #90 Exhibit 168- part 2, #91 Exhibit 168- part 3, #92 Exhibit 168- part 4, #93 Exhibit 168- part 5, #94 Exhibit 169- part 1, #95 Exhibit 169- part 2, #96 Exhibit 169- part 3, #97 Exhibit 170, #98 Exhibit 171- part 1, #99 Exhibit 171- part 2, #100 Exhibit 171- part 3, #101 Exhibit 171- part 4, #102 Exhibit 171- part 5, #103 Exhibit 171- part 6, #104 Exhibit 171- part 7, #105 Exhibit 171- part 8, #106 Exhibit 172, #107 Exhibit 173- part 1, #108 Exhibit 173- part 2, #109 Exhibit 174- part 1, #110 Exhibit 174- part 2, #111 Exhibit 175-179, #112 Exhibit 180-188, #113 Exhibit 189-195, #114 Exhibit 196, #115 Exhibit 197-198, #116 Exhibit 199- part 1, #117 Exhibit 199- part 2, #118 Exhibit 199- part 3, #119 Exhibit 200-205)(Sabella, James)
November 5, 2013 Filing 600 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #553 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to exclude evidence or argument tht Defendants' counsel were involved in drafting or approving any of the false or misleading statements involved in this case.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 5, 2013 Filing 599 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #526 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Wealth and Compensation.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 5, 2013 Filing 598 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #533 MOTION in Limine of Individual Defendants Hank McKinnell and Karen Katen to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Their Departures From Pfizer.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 5, 2013 Filing 597 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #570 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs From Relying On His 2005 Pfizer Stock Transactions as Proof of His Alleged Scienter.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 5, 2013 Filing 596 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #523 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence Offered to Establish the Existence of Cardiovascular Risks.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 5, 2013 Filing 595 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #520 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony of Dr. Douglas P. Zipes.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 5, 2013 Filing 594 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #516 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of a Criminal Plea, Civil Settlements, and a Congressional Inquiry Concerning Celebrex and/or Bextra.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Sabella, James)
November 5, 2013 Filing 593 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #558 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to exclude reference to claims that have been dismissed, or claims or legal theories that Plaintiffs have abandoned, changed and/or modified.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 5, 2013 Filing 592 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #518 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Cheryl D. Blume.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 5, 2013 Filing 591 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #517 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence of Nine Alleged Misstatements.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 5, 2013 Filing 590 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #556 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to exclude evidence or argument that Plaintiffs, Defendants, Counsel, Witnesses or family members thereof, took Celebrex, Bextra, Vioxx or other NSAIDS.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 5, 2013 Filing 589 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #516 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of a Criminal Plea, Civil Settlements, and a Congressional Inquiry Concerning Celebrex and/or Bextra.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Sabella, James) Modified on 11/12/2013 (ka).
November 5, 2013 Filing 588 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #515 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Irrelevant and Prejudicial Evidence Unrelated to Cardiovascular Risks.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
November 5, 2013 Filing 587 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #547 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to exclude evidence or argument concerning the April 6, 2005 Memorandum by John Jenkins and Paul Seligman of the Food and Drug Administration.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 5, 2013 Filing 586 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #560 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to exclude evidence or argument relating to affirmative defenses that were not asserted in Defendants' Answer.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 5, 2013 Filing 585 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #514 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to Products Liability Issues.. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Mustokoff, Matthew)
November 5, 2013 Filing 584 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #519 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Simon M. Helfgott.. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Mustokoff, Matthew)
November 5, 2013 Filing 583 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #549 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to exclude all evidence or argument that providing study data to the Food and Drug Administration satisfies Defendants' disclosure obligations under the Federal Securties Laws.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 5, 2013 Filing 582 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #551 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to exclude evidence or argument regarding aggregate damages to the Class.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 5, 2013 Filing 581 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #522 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Certain Evidence and Argument Based Upon the Court's Summary Judgment Rulings.. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Mustokoff, Matthew)
November 5, 2013 Filing 580 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #521 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel R. Fischel.. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Mustokoff, Matthew)
November 5, 2013 Filing 579 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #555 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to exclude evidence that John Talley, Krista Fox, Paul Dodson and/or Andrew Watson recants, disavows, does not recall, or denies any statement attributed to him or her in the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 5, 2013 Filing 578 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #566 MOTION in Limine No. 13 to exclude portions of purported expert testimony of Lawrence Goldkind.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 5, 2013 Filing 577 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #541 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude Defendants' Expert, Dr. Eric M. Ruderman from Testifying as to Certain Matters at Trial.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 5, 2013 Filing 576 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #562 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to exclude evidence or argument that any of Plaintiffs's counsel was accused and/or sanctioned for purported Rule 11 violations.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
November 5, 2013 Filing 575 DECLARATION of Karen R. King in Opposition re: #538 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Paul A. Gompers., #560 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to exclude evidence or argument relating to affirmative defenses that were not asserted in Defendants' Answer., #558 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to exclude reference to claims that have been dismissed, or claims or legal theories that Plaintiffs have abandoned, changed and/or modified., #556 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to exclude evidence or argument that Plaintiffs, Defendants, Counsel, Witnesses or family members thereof, took Celebrex, Bextra, Vioxx or other NSAIDS., #553 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to exclude evidence or argument tht Defendants' counsel were involved in drafting or approving any of the false or misleading statements involved in this case., #541 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude Defendants' Expert, Dr. Eric M. Ruderman from Testifying as to Certain Matters at Trial., #545 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to exclude testimony from or evidence or argument concerning any of the Class representatives or any other Class members., #566 MOTION in Limine No. 13 to exclude portions of purported expert testimony of Lawrence Goldkind., #549 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to exclude all evidence or argument that providing study data to the Food and Drug Administration satisfies Defendants' disclosure obligations under the Federal Securties Laws., #551 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to exclude evidence or argument regarding aggregate damages to the Class., #555 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to exclude evidence that John Talley, Krista Fox, Paul Dodson and/or Andrew Watson recants, disavows, does not recall, or denies any statement attributed to him or her in the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint., #547 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to exclude evidence or argument concerning the April 6, 2005 Memorandum by John Jenkins and Paul Seligman of the Food and Drug Administration., #562 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to exclude evidence or argument that any of Plaintiffs's counsel was accused and/or sanctioned for purported Rule 11 violations.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, Part 1, #31 Exhibit 30, Part 2, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62)(Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 574 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #521 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel R. Fischel.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 573 DECLARATION of Jonathan Rosenberg, Esq. in Support re: #570 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs From Relying On His 2005 Pfizer Stock Transactions as Proof of His Alleged Scienter.. Document filed by John L. LaMattina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
September 30, 2013 Filing 572 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #523 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence Offered to Establish the Existence of Cardiovascular Risks.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 571 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #570 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs From Relying On His 2005 Pfizer Stock Transactions as Proof of His Alleged Scienter.. Document filed by John L. LaMattina. (Rosenberg, Jonathan)
September 30, 2013 Filing 570 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs From Relying On His 2005 Pfizer Stock Transactions as Proof of His Alleged Scienter. Document filed by John L. LaMattina.(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
September 30, 2013 Filing 569 DECLARATION of Mary S. Thomas in Support re: #566 MOTION in Limine No. 13 to exclude portions of purported expert testimony of Lawrence Goldkind.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thomas, Mary)
September 30, 2013 Filing 568 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #566 MOTION in Limine No. 13 to exclude portions of purported expert testimony of Lawrence Goldkind.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Thomas, Mary)
September 30, 2013 Filing 567 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #516 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of a Criminal Plea, Civil Settlements, and a Congressional Inquiry Concerning Celebrex and/or Bextra.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 566 MOTION in Limine No. 13 to exclude portions of purported expert testimony of Lawrence Goldkind. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Thomas, Mary)
September 30, 2013 Filing 565 DECLARATION of James J. Sabella in Support re: #553 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to exclude evidence or argument tht Defendants' counsel were involved in drafting or approving any of the false or misleading statements involved in this case., #545 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to exclude testimony from or evidence or argument concerning any of the Class representatives or any other Class members., #560 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to exclude evidence or argument relating to affirmative defenses that were not asserted in Defendants' Answer., #549 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to exclude all evidence or argument that providing study data to the Food and Drug Administration satisfies Defendants' disclosure obligations under the Federal Securties Laws., #551 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to exclude evidence or argument regarding aggregate damages to the Class., #555 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to exclude evidence that John Talley, Krista Fox, Paul Dodson and/or Andrew Watson recants, disavows, does not recall, or denies any statement attributed to him or her in the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint., #558 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to exclude reference to claims that have been dismissed, or claims or legal theories that Plaintiffs have abandoned, changed and/or modified., #547 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to exclude evidence or argument concerning the April 6, 2005 Memorandum by John Jenkins and Paul Seligman of the Food and Drug Administration., #562 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to exclude evidence or argument that any of Plaintiffs's counsel was accused and/or sanctioned for purported Rule 11 violations., #556 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to exclude evidence or argument that Plaintiffs, Defendants, Counsel, Witnesses or family members thereof, took Celebrex, Bextra, Vioxx or other NSAIDS.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 564 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #555 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to exclude evidence that John Talley, Krista Fox, Paul Dodson and/or Andrew Watson recants, disavows, does not recall, or denies any statement attributed to him or her in the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 563 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #562 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to exclude evidence or argument that any of Plaintiffs's counsel was accused and/or sanctioned for purported Rule 11 violations.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 562 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to exclude evidence or argument that any of Plaintiffs's counsel was accused and/or sanctioned for purported Rule 11 violations. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 561 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #560 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to exclude evidence or argument relating to affirmative defenses that were not asserted in Defendants' Answer.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 560 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to exclude evidence or argument relating to affirmative defenses that were not asserted in Defendants' Answer. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 559 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #558 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to exclude reference to claims that have been dismissed, or claims or legal theories that Plaintiffs have abandoned, changed and/or modified.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 558 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to exclude reference to claims that have been dismissed, or claims or legal theories that Plaintiffs have abandoned, changed and/or modified. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 557 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #556 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to exclude evidence or argument that Plaintiffs, Defendants, Counsel, Witnesses or family members thereof, took Celebrex, Bextra, Vioxx or other NSAIDS.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 556 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to exclude evidence or argument that Plaintiffs, Defendants, Counsel, Witnesses or family members thereof, took Celebrex, Bextra, Vioxx or other NSAIDS. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 555 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to exclude evidence that John Talley, Krista Fox, Paul Dodson and/or Andrew Watson recants, disavows, does not recall, or denies any statement attributed to him or her in the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 554 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #553 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to exclude evidence or argument tht Defendants' counsel were involved in drafting or approving any of the false or misleading statements involved in this case.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 553 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to exclude evidence or argument tht Defendants' counsel were involved in drafting or approving any of the false or misleading statements involved in this case. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 552 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #551 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to exclude evidence or argument regarding aggregate damages to the Class.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 551 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to exclude evidence or argument regarding aggregate damages to the Class. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 550 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #549 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to exclude all evidence or argument that providing study data to the Food and Drug Administration satisfies Defendants' disclosure obligations under the Federal Securties Laws.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 549 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to exclude all evidence or argument that providing study data to the Food and Drug Administration satisfies Defendants' disclosure obligations under the Federal Securties Laws. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 548 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #547 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to exclude evidence or argument concerning the April 6, 2005 Memorandum by John Jenkins and Paul Seligman of the Food and Drug Administration.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 547 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to exclude evidence or argument concerning the April 6, 2005 Memorandum by John Jenkins and Paul Seligman of the Food and Drug Administration. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 546 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #545 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to exclude testimony from or evidence or argument concerning any of the Class representatives or any other Class members.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 545 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to exclude testimony from or evidence or argument concerning any of the Class representatives or any other Class members. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Sabella, James)
September 30, 2013 Filing 544 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #514 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to Products Liability Issues.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 543 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #541 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude Defendants' Expert, Dr. Eric M. Ruderman from Testifying as to Certain Matters at Trial.. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Mustokoff, Matthew)
September 30, 2013 Filing 542 DECLARATION of Matthew L. Mustokoff in Support re: #541 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude Defendants' Expert, Dr. Eric M. Ruderman from Testifying as to Certain Matters at Trial.. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mustokoff, Matthew)
September 30, 2013 Filing 541 MOTION in Limine No. 12 to Preclude Defendants' Expert, Dr. Eric M. Ruderman from Testifying as to Certain Matters at Trial. Document filed by Christine Fleckles.(Mustokoff, Matthew)
September 30, 2013 Filing 540 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #538 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Paul A. Gompers.. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Mustokoff, Matthew)
September 30, 2013 Filing 539 DECLARATION of Matthew L. Mustokoff in Support re: #538 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Paul A. Gompers.. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, part 2, #3 Exhibit 1, part 3, #4 Exhibit 1, part 4, #5 Exhibit 1, part 5, #6 Exhibit 1, part 6, #7 Exhibit 1, part 7, #8 Exhibit 1, part 8, #9 Exhibit 1, part 9, #10 Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit 3, #12 Exhibit 4)(Mustokoff, Matthew)
September 30, 2013 Filing 538 MOTION in Limine No. 11 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Paul A. Gompers. Document filed by Christine Fleckles.(Mustokoff, Matthew)
September 30, 2013 Filing 537 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #518 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Cheryl D. Blume.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 536 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #515 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Irrelevant and Prejudicial Evidence Unrelated to Cardiovascular Risks.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 535 DECLARATION of Julie B. Rubenstein in Support re: #533 MOTION in Limine of Individual Defendants Hank McKinnell and Karen Katen to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Their Departures From Pfizer.. Document filed by Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rubenstein, Julie)
September 30, 2013 Filing 534 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #533 MOTION in Limine of Individual Defendants Hank McKinnell and Karen Katen to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Their Departures From Pfizer.. Document filed by Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel. (Calhoon, Michael)
September 30, 2013 Filing 533 MOTION in Limine of Individual Defendants Hank McKinnell and Karen Katen to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Their Departures From Pfizer. Document filed by Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel.(Calhoon, Michael)
September 30, 2013 Filing 532 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #522 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Certain Evidence and Argument Based Upon the Court's Summary Judgment Rulings.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 531 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #520 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony of Dr. Douglas P. Zipes.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 530 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #519 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Simon M. Helfgott.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 529 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #517 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence of Nine Alleged Misstatements.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 528 DECLARATION of Michele A. Roberts in Support re: #526 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Wealth and Compensation.. Document filed by Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Roberts, Michele)
September 30, 2013 Filing 527 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #526 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Wealth and Compensation.. Document filed by Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel. (Roberts, Michele)
September 30, 2013 Filing 526 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Wealth and Compensation. Document filed by Karen L. Katen, Henry A. McKinnel.(Roberts, Michele)
September 30, 2013 Filing 525 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
September 30, 2013 Filing 524 DECLARATION of Andrew J. Ehrlich, Esq. in Support re: #517 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence of Nine Alleged Misstatements., #522 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Certain Evidence and Argument Based Upon the Court's Summary Judgment Rulings., #523 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence Offered to Establish the Existence of Cardiovascular Risks., #521 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel R. Fischel., #515 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Irrelevant and Prejudicial Evidence Unrelated to Cardiovascular Risks., #518 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Cheryl D. Blume., #520 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony of Dr. Douglas P. Zipes., #514 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to Products Liability Issues., #519 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Simon M. Helfgott., #516 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of a Criminal Plea, Civil Settlements, and a Congressional Inquiry Concerning Celebrex and/or Bextra.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, part 1, #3 Exhibit 2, part 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, part 1, #9 Exhibit 7, part 2, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, part 1, #14 Exhibit 11, part 2, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Exhibit 40, #44 Exhibit 41, #45 Exhibit 42, #46 Exhibit 43, #47 Exhibit 44, #48 Exhibit 45, #49 Exhibit 46, #50 Exhibit 47, #51 Exhibit 48, #52 Exhibit 49, #53 Exhibit 50, #54 Exhibit 51, #55 Exhibit 52, #56 Exhibit 53, #57 Exhibit 54, #58 Exhibit 55, #59 Exhibit 56, #60 Exhibit 57, #61 Exhibit 58, #62 Exhibit 59, #63 Exhibit 60, #64 Exhibit 61, #65 Exhibit 62, #66 Exhibit 63, #67 Exhibit 64, #68 Exhibit 65, #69 Exhibit 66, #70 Exhibit 67, #71 Exhibit 68, #72 Exhibit 69, #73 Exhibit 70, #74 Exhibit 71, #75 Exhibit 72, part 1, #76 Exhibit 72, part 2, #77 Exhibit 73, #78 Exhibit 74, #79 Exhibit 75, #80 Exhibit 76, #81 Exhibit 77, #82 Exhibit 78, part 1, #83 Exhibit 78, part 2, #84 Exhibit 79, #85 Exhibit 80, #86 Exhibit 81, #87 Exhibit 82, #88 Exhibit 83, #89 Exhibit 84, #90 Exhibit 85, #91 Exhibit 86, #92 Exhibit 87, #93 Exhibit 88, #94 Exhibit 89, #95 Exhibit 90, #96 Exhibit 91, #97 Exhibit 92, #98 Exhibit 93, part 1, #99 Exhibit 93, part 2, #100 Exhibit 94)(Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 523 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence Offered to Establish the Existence of Cardiovascular Risks. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 522 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Certain Evidence and Argument Based Upon the Court's Summary Judgment Rulings. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 521 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel R. Fischel. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 520 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Portions of the Expert Testimony of Dr. Douglas P. Zipes. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 519 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Simon M. Helfgott. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 518 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Cheryl D. Blume. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 517 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Hearsay Evidence of Nine Alleged Misstatements. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 516 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of a Criminal Plea, Civil Settlements, and a Congressional Inquiry Concerning Celebrex and/or Bextra. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 515 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Irrelevant and Prejudicial Evidence Unrelated to Cardiovascular Risks. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 514 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence and Argument Related to Products Liability Issues. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wilkinson, Beth)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 513 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW REQUESTS FOR EXCLUSION AND REJOIN THE CLASS: The Individual Plaintiffs may withdraw their requests for exclusion and rejoin the Class. If the Court enters and approves this Stipulation, the Individual Plaintiffs shall cause to dismiss without prejudice their respective Individual Actions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees, and the Individual Plaintiffs will be permitted to opt back into the Pfizer Class Action as members of the Class without prejudice to any claims brought on behalf of the Class. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/29/2013) (ft)
July 22, 2013 Filing 512 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from James J. Sabella dated 7/19/2013 re: As discussed at the July 12 conference, the parties have conferred and agreed, subject to Your Honor's approval, on the attached schedule for the briefing of pretrial motions and the submission of other pre-trial documents. ENDORSEMENT: The attached schedule is approved. (Motions due by 9/30/2013, Responses due by 11/5/2013, Replies due by 11/19/2013.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/22/2013) (ft)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #509 Motion for Bridget M. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 7/16/2013) (ft)
July 15, 2013 Filing 510 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
July 15, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #509 MOTION for Bridget M. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8688717. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 15, 2013 Filing 509 MOTION for Bridget M. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8688717. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Karen L. Katen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Moore, Bridget)
July 12, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Final Pretrial Conference held on 7/12/2013. FPTC held. Next FPTC is scheduled for 4/4/2014 at 2:15pm. The final FPTC is scheduled for 5/23/2014 at 11:00am. Jury Trial is scheduled to commence on 6/2/2014 at 9:30am. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP et al.(lan)
July 12, 2013 Filing 508 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ross Bradley Galin on behalf of John L. LaMattina. (Galin, Ross)
July 12, 2013 Filing 507 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leah Godesky on behalf of John L. LaMattina. (Godesky, Leah)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR JOHN LAMATTINA: IT IS ORDERED that O'Melveny & Myers LLP (Jonathan Rosenberg, trial counsel) be substituted in the above captioned action as counsel of record for Defendant John LaMattina, in the place and stead of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP, DLA Piper LLP, and Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appearance of O'Melveny & Myers LLP as counsel for Defendant John LaMattina in this case shall be entered on the Court's docket. A notation of Jonathan Rosenberg, Ross Galin, Leah Godesky, and Nate Asher of O'Melveny & Myers LLP, located at 7 Times Square, New York, New York 10036, will be made on the roll of attorneys in the above-captioned action. Attorney Jonathan Rosenberg; Ross Galin; Leah Godesky; Nate Asher added. Attorney Michael D. Hynes; Gregory Arthur Markel; Shannon Kyle McGovern; Lynn Katherine Neuner; Patrick Timothy Shilling; Jonathan D Smith; Rachel Stevens; George S Wang; Loren H. Brown and Cara Dyonne Edwards terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 7/11/2013) (ft) Modified on 7/12/2013 (ft).
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR KAREN KATEN granting #497 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appearance of BAKER BOTTS L.L.P., as counsel in this case shall be entered on the Court's docket. A notation of Michael Calhoon, Bridget Moore, and Julie B. Rubenstein of BAKER BOTTS L.L.P., 1299 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20004, will be made on the roll ofattomeys for the above-captioned action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order shall be served on all counsel of record in this action. Attorney Leah Godesky; Jonathan Rosenberg; Nathaniel Owen Asher and Ross Bradley Galin terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 7/11/2013) (ft)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #499 Motion for Michael Calhoon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 7/11/2013) (ft)
July 11, 2013 Filing 503 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bradley Stephen Pensyl on behalf of Joseph M. Feczko. (Pensyl, Bradley)
July 11, 2013 Filing 502 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Franklin Westfal on behalf of Joseph M. Feczko. (Westfal, Michael)
July 11, 2013 Filing 501 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Josephine Alice Cheatham on behalf of Joseph M. Feczko. (Cheatham, Josephine)
July 11, 2013 Filing 500 PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT Joint Submisssion of the Parties Pursuant to the Court's July 8, 2013 Order. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Sabella, James)
July 11, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #499 AMENDED MOTION for Michael Calhoon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 10, 2013 Filing 499 AMENDED MOTION for Michael Calhoon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Karen L. Katen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Calhoon, Michael)
July 10, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #495 MOTION for Michael Calhoon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8677607. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Certificate of Good Standing. Certificate of Good Standing must be issued from the State Court of Texas not from the State Bar. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a valid Certificate of Good Standing, issued within the past 30 days. (bcu)
July 10, 2013 Filing 498 DECLARATION of Michael Calhoon in Support re: #497 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP, New Attorney: BAKER BOTTS LLP (Michael Calhoon, Bridget Moore, Julie Rubenstein, trial counsel).. Document filed by Karen L. Katen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Karen Katen, #2 Exhibit Consent to Substitution of Counsel, #3 Exhibit Text of Proposed Order)(Rubenstein, Julie)
July 10, 2013 Filing 497 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP, New Attorney: BAKER BOTTS LLP (Michael Calhoon, Bridget Moore, Julie Rubenstein, trial counsel). Document filed by Karen L. Katen.(Rubenstein, Julie)
July 10, 2013 Filing 496 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie B. Rubenstein on behalf of Karen L. Katen. (Rubenstein, Julie)
July 10, 2013 Filing 495 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael Calhoon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8677607. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Karen L. Katen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Calhoon, Michael) Modified on 7/10/2013 (bcu).
July 10, 2013 Filing 494 DECLARATION of Jonathan Rosenberg in Support re: #493 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: CADWALADER, WICKERSHAM & TAFT LLP, DLA PIPER LLP, SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP, New Attorney: O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP (Jonathan Rosenberg, Trial Counsel). MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: CADWALADER, WICKERSHAM & TAFT LLP, DLA PIPER LLP, SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP, New Attorney: O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP (Jonathan Rosenberg, Trial Counsel).. Document filed by John L. LaMattina. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John LaMattina in Support, #2 Consent to Substitution of Counsel, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
July 10, 2013 Filing 493 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: CADWALADER, WICKERSHAM & TAFT LLP, DLA PIPER LLP, SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP, New Attorney: O'MELVENY & MYERS LLP (Jonathan Rosenberg, Trial Counsel). Document filed by John L. LaMattina.(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 492 STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR JOSEPH FECZKO: The undersigned attorneys hereby stipulate and agree that Pamela Rogers Chepiga, a partner at ALLEN & OVERY LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10020, hereby appears in the above-captioned action as counsel of record for Defendant Joseph Feczko, in the place in stead of CADWALADER, WICKERSHAM & TAFT LLP, One World Financial Center, New York, New York 10281, DLA PIPER LLP, 1251 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10020 and SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP, 425 Lexington Avenue, New York, New York 10017. Attorney Pamela Rogers Chepiga for Joseph M. Feczko added. Attorney Jason Michael Halper; Michael D. Hynes; Gregory Arthur Markel; Shannon Kyle McGovern; Lynn Katherine Neuner; Patrick Timothy Shilling; Jonathan D Smith; Rachel Stevens; George S Wang; Loren H. Brown and Cara Dyonne Edwards terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 7/9/2013) (ft)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER: A conference in the above-captioned matter is currently scheduled for Friday, July 12, 2013, at 11:00 a.m. The parties are directed, in advance of the conference, to prepare a brief joint submission addressing the following issues: Trial readiness. Parties' availability for trial. Anticipated length of trial. Nature of any anticipated motions in limine. Status of settlement discussions, if any. Any other disputes the parties wish to raise with the Court. A redacted version of this submission must be filed on ECF by Thursday, July 11, 2013, at 12:00 p.m., with an unredacted courtesy copy provided to Chambers. Status Conference set for 7/12/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/8/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP(ft)
June 24, 2013 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #490 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (ft)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR GAIL CAWKWELL granting #485 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Baker & Hostetler LLP (George A. Stamboulidis, trial counsel) shall be substituted in the above-captioned action as counsel of record for Defendant Gail Cawkwell, in the place and stead of Allen & Overy LLP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appearance of Baker & Hostetler LLP as counsel in this case shall be entered on the Court's docket. A notation of George A. Stamboulidis, Eric R. Fish, and Kathryn M. Zunno of Baker & Hostetler LLP, located at 45 Rockefeller Plaza, New York, New York, 10111, will be made on the roll of attorneys for the above-captioned action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order shall be served on all counsel of record in this action. Added attorney Eric Robert Fish,Kathryn M Zunno for Gail Cawkwell. Attorney Michael Franklin Westfal; Josephine Alice Cheatham and Pamela Rogers Chepiga terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 6/24/2013) (ft)
June 21, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Pamela Rogers Chepiga to E-MAIL Document No. #489 Consent to Substitute Counsel to judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. This document is not filed via ECF. (db)
June 21, 2013 Filing 489 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP; DLA Piper LLP; and Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, New Attorney: Pamela Rogers Chepiga, Address: Allen & Overy LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, USA 10020, (212) 610-6300. Document filed by Joseph M. Feczko. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela Rogers Chepiga Pursuant to Local Rule 1.4, #2 Stipulation and Proposed Order of Substitution)(Chepiga, Pamela) Modified on 6/21/2013 (db).
June 21, 2013 Filing 488 DECLARATION of Gail Cawkwell in Support re: #485 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Allen & Overy LLP, New Attorney: Baker & Hostetler LLP (George A. Stamboulidis, Trial Counsel).. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Substitution, #2 Proposed Order)(Stamboulidis, George)
June 21, 2013 Filing 487 DECLARATION of George A. Stamboulidis in Support re: #485 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Allen & Overy LLP, New Attorney: Baker & Hostetler LLP (George A. Stamboulidis, Trial Counsel).. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell. (Stamboulidis, George)
June 21, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document # to RE-FILE Document #486 Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db)
June 21, 2013 Filing 486 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of George A. Stamboulidis in Support re: #485 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Allen & Overy LLP, New Attorney: Baker & Hostetler LLP (George A. Stamboulidis, Trial Counsel). Document filed by Gail Cawkwell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gail Cawkwell, #2 Consent to Substitution of Counsel, #3 Proposed Order)(Stamboulidis, George) Modified on 6/21/2013 (db).
June 21, 2013 Filing 485 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Allen & Overy LLP, New Attorney: Baker & Hostetler LLP (George A. Stamboulidis, Trial Counsel). Document filed by Gail Cawkwell.(Stamboulidis, George)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER ON THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MICHAEL S. BAILEY granting #480 Motion for Michael S. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in this case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 5/17/2013) (ft) Modified on 5/20/2013 (ft).
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jay W. Eisenhofer dated 5/14/2013 re: We are in receipt of Michelle Roberts' May 13, 2013 letter to Your Honor on behalf of Defendant McKinnell, joined by Defendants Cawkwell and Katen, requesting a 60-day adjournment of the pre-trial deadlines that Your Honor scheduled in March of this year. See March 28, 2013 Pre-Trial Scheduling Order. We submit this letter to explain briefly why we oppose the request. This case is ripe for trial. To that end, Plaintiffs have been working to and will meet the Court's current pretrial deadlines. We respectfully request that they remain intact. ENDORSEMENT: The final pretrial conference has been adjourned to 9/20/13 and the related deadlines are modified accordingly. The parties are nonetheless directed to appear on July 12, 2013, at 11:00 AM to discuss trial scheduling. The parties must confer with each other as to length, timing and availability beforehand. (Status Conference set for 7/12/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/15/2013) (ft)
May 16, 2013 Filing 482 Letter addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Michele A. Roberts, Dr. Henry McKinnell, Jonathan Rosenberg, Karen Katen, Pamela Rogers Chepiga, and Gail Cawkwell dated 5/13/2013 re: We represent Defendant Henry McKinnell as counsel in the above-captioned matter. Pursuant to the Court's March 28, 2013 Pre-Trial Scheduling Order (Dkt. No. 454) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, we write jointly with counsel for Defendants Karen Katen and Gail Cawkwell to request a sixty (60) day adjournment of the deadlines in the Pre-Trial Scheduling Order. Document filed by Henry A. McKinnell.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP(ft)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 481 AMENDED PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court hereby makes the following provisions for scheduling and trial in this matter. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. ENDORSEMENT: No further FPTC adjournments. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/15/2013) (ft)
May 16, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #480 MOTION for Michael S. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8516716. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
May 16, 2013 Filing 480 MOTION for Michael S. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8516716. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bailey, Michael)
May 13, 2013 Filing 479 NOTICE of Filing Of Consent To Substitution Of Counsel. Document filed by Henry A. McKinnel. (Roberts, Michele)
April 30, 2013 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #478 Order, Add and Terminate Attorneys to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (ft)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR HENRY MCKINNELL: IT IS ORDERED that SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM, LLP (Michele Roberts and Charles Andrewscavage, trial counsel) be substituted in the above-captioned action as counsel of record for Defendant Henry McKinnell, in the place and stead of CADWALADER, WICKERSHAM & TAFT LLP, DLA PIPER LLP and SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appearance of SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM, LLP as counsel in this case shall be entered on the Court's docket. A notation of Michele A. Roberts, located at 1440 New York Avenue, N.W., Washington, D.C. 20005 and Charles Andrewscavage, located at 4 Times Square, New York, New York 10036, will be made on the roll of attorneys for the above-captioned action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order shall be served on all counsel of record in this action. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 4/30/2013) (ft)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 477 STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR HENRY MCKINNELL: The undersigned attorneys hereby stipulate and agree that Michele A. Roberts and Charles Andrewscavage, a partner and associate, respectively, at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP, hereby appear in the above-captioned action as counsel of record for Defendant Henry McKinnell, in the place and stead of CADWALADER, WICKERSHAM & TAFT LLP, One World Financial Center, New York, New York 10291, DLA PIPER LLP, 1251 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10020 and SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP, 425 Lexington Avenue, New York, New York 10017. Attorney Jason Michael Halper; Michael D. Hynes; Gregory Arthur Markel; Shannon Kyle McGovern; Lynn Katherine Neuner; Patrick Timothy Shilling; Jonathan D Smith; Rachel Stevens; George S Wang; Loren H. Brown and Cara Dyonne Edwards terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 4/30/2013) (ft) Modified on 5/1/2013 (ft).
April 30, 2013 Filing 476 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Michele A. Roberts dated 4/24/2013 re: Counsel requests that the Court convene a status hearing to address scheduling matters and a trial date. ENDORSEMENT: Trial scheduling can be discussed at the July 12, 2013 final pretrial conference. The Court's schedule will not accommodate a trial commencing in late July. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/29/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP(ft) Modified on 5/6/2013 (ft).
April 30, 2013 Filing 475 Letter addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jay W. Eisenhofer dated 4/25/2013 re: Accordingly, Plaintiffs respectfully request that trial should commence as contemplated by Your Honor's Order and Defendant McKinnell's request for a status conference in advance of the July 12, 2013 pretrial conference be denied. (cd)
April 30, 2013 Filing 474 Letter addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Beth A. Wilkinson dated 4/26/2013 re: We believe a status conference would be beneficial in order to set a firm date for trial. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.(cd)
April 30, 2013 Filing 473 Letter addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Pamela Rogers Chepiga dated 4/26/2013 re: We are now counsel of record for individual defendant Gail Cawkwell. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell.(cd)
April 30, 2013 Filing 472 Letter addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jay W. Eisenhofer dated 4/29/2013 re: We write in response to the letter submitted on Friday afternoon by counsel for individual defendant Gail Cawkwell re Gail Cawkwell's decision to obtain new counsel on the verge of trial. Document filed by Michael Feiterland et al.(cd)
April 30, 2013 Filing 471 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Franklin Westfal on behalf of Gail Cawkwell (Westfal, Michael)
April 30, 2013 Filing 470 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Josephine Alice Cheatham on behalf of Gail Cawkwell (Cheatham, Josephine)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER ON THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MICHELE A. ROBERTS granting #463 Motion for Michele A. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in this case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 4/25/2013) (ft) Modified on 4/25/2013 (ft).
April 24, 2013 Filing 468 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathaniel Owen Asher on behalf of Karen L. Katen (Asher, Nathaniel)
April 24, 2013 Filing 467 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leah Godesky on behalf of Karen L. Katen (Godesky, Leah)
April 24, 2013 Filing 466 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ross Bradley Galin on behalf of Karen L. Katen (Galin, Ross)
April 24, 2013 Filing 465 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Andrewscavage on behalf of Henry A. McKinnel (Andrewscavage, Charles)
April 24, 2013 Filing 464 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michele Antoinette Roberts on behalf of Henry A. McKinnel. New Address: Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, 1440 New York Ave., N.W., Washington, D.C., USA 20005, 202-661-8250. (Roberts, Michele)
April 24, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #463 MOTION for Michele A. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8448954. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bwa)
April 24, 2013 Filing 463 MOTION for Michele A. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8448954. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Roberts, Michele)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 462 STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR GAIL CAWKWELL: The undersigned attorneys hereby stipulate and agree that Pamela Rogers Chepiga, a partner at ALLEN & OVERY LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10020, hereby appears in this action as counsel of record for Defendant Gail Cawkwell, in the place and stead of CADWALADER, WICKERSHAM & TAFT LLP, One World Financial Center, New York, New York 10281. DLA PIPER LLP, 1251 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York 10020 and SIMPSON THACHER & BARTLETT LLP, 425 Lexington Avenue, New York, New York 10017. Attorney Pamela Rogers Chepiga for Gail Cawkwell added. Attorney Jason Michael Halper; Michael D. Hynes; Gregory Arthur Markel; Shannon Kyle McGovern; Lynn Katherine Neuner; Patrick Timothy Shilling; Jonathan D Smith; Rachel Stevens; George S Wang; Loren H. Brown and Cara Dyonne Edwards terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 4/22/2013) (ft)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR KAREN KATEN: O'Melveny & Myers LLP (Jonathan Rosenberg, trial counsel) be substituted in the above-captioned action as counsel of record for Defendant Karen Katen, in the place and stead of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP, DLA Piper LLP, and Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appearance of O'Melveny & Myers LLP as counsel in this case shall be entered on the Court's docket. A notation of Jonathan Rosenberg, Ross Galin, Leah Godesky, and Nate Asher of O'Melveny & Myers LLP, located at 7 Times Square, New York, New York 10036, will be made on the roll of attorneys for the above-captioned action. IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED that a copy of this Order shall be served on all counsel of record in this action. Attorney Jason Michael Halper; Michael D. Hynes; Gregory Arthur Markel; Shannon Kyle McGovern; Lynn Katherine Neuner; Patrick Timothy Shilling; Jonathan D Smith; Rachel Stevens; George S Wang; Loren H. Brown and Cara Dyonne Edwards terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 4/22/2013) (ft) Modified on 4/23/2013 (ft).
April 19, 2013 Filing 460 DECLARATION of Jonathan Rosenberg in Support re: #459 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP, DLA Piper LLP, and Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, New Attorney: O'Melveny & Myers LLP (Jonathan Rosenberg, Trial Counsel). MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP, DLA Piper LLP, and Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, New Attorney: O'Melveny & Myers LLP (Jonathan Rosenberg, Trial Counsel).. Document filed by Karen L. Katen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Katen, #2 Consent to Substitution of Counsel, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
April 19, 2013 Filing 459 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP, DLA Piper LLP, and Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, New Attorney: O'Melveny & Myers LLP (Jonathan Rosenberg, Trial Counsel). Document filed by Karen L. Katen.(Rosenberg, Jonathan)
April 19, 2013 Filing 458 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Gregory Arthur Markel, John R. Wellschlager, and Lynn Katherine Neuner, New Attorney: Pamela Rogers Chepiga, Address: Allen & Overy LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, United States 10020, 212-610-6300. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela Rogers Chepiga, #2 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Chepiga, Pamela)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #456 Motion for Alexandra M. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 4/16/2013) (ft) (Main Document 457 replaced on 4/16/2013) (ft).
April 15, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #456 MOTION for ALEXANDRA M. WALSH to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8416144. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bwa)
April 12, 2013 Filing 456 MOTION for ALEXANDRA M. WALSH to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8416144. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Walsh, Alexandra)
April 12, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 4/12/2013. (bh)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 455 OPINION: Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted as to Plaintiffs' claims that are based on the November 4, 2004, National Post of Canada disclosure and the October 20, 2005, Dow Jones and New York Times disclosures; as to Plaintiffs' claims against Individual Defendants LaMattina, Katen, Feczko and Cawkwell insofar as they are based on alleged misstatements in the following Pfizer SEC filings -- Second Quarter 2002 Form 10-Q, Third Quarter 2002 Form 10-Q, First Quarter 2004 Form 10-Q, Second Quarter 2004 Form 10-Q, and Third Quarter 2004 Form 10-Q; and as to Plaintiffs claims based on nine of the statements issued by Pharmacia Corporation. (See CCAC 348, 363, 372(b), (c), (d), and (f), 386, 389, and 390.) Defendants motion is denied in all other respects. This Opinion and Order resolves docket entry no. 380. A Final Pre-trial Conference will be held on July 12, 2013, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17C. The parties must meet with Magistrate Judge Pitman or an outside mediator to work on settlement prior to that date, and must consult and file submissions in advance of the conference in accordance with the Pre-Trial Scheduling Order issued simultaneously herewith. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/28/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS et al.(ft)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 454 PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court hereby makes the following provisions for scheduling and trial in this matter. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/28/2013) (ft)
February 27, 2013 Filing 453 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Jay W. Eisenhofer dated 2/27/2013 re: Counsel writes to request permission to participate in the upcoming telephonic conference. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/27/2013) (ft)
January 28, 2013 Filing 452 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura T. Swain from Lynn K. Neuner; John R. Wellschlager; & Beth A. Wilkinson dated 01/25/2013 re: Based on our teleconference with the Court on January 23 in one of the MDL-related ERlSA cases, we understand it would be appropriate for the pre-trial conference currently scheduled in this matter for February 8 to be adjourned given the pendency of Defendants' motion for summary judgment. We are prepared to appear before the Court for a rescheduled conference at the Court's convenience. We have conferred with Plaintiffs' counsel about this scheduling issue and are copying them here. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned pending the resolution of the motion. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 01/28/2013) (jcs)
January 28, 2013 Filing 451 Letter addressed to Judge Laura T. Swain from J. W. Eisenhofer dated 01/25/2013 re: We represent the certified Class in the above-captioned action and write in response to Defendants' letter of today's date requesting adjournment of the pre-trial conference presently scheduled for February 8, 2013. Therefore, subject, of course, to Your Honor's wishes, our preference would be for the conference to go forward. (jcs)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 450 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF BENJAMIN J. SWEET: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT Benjamin J. Sweet is no longer associated with Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP and is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Christine Fleckles, JuliePerusse and Alden Chace ("Plaintiffs"). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/11/2013) (ama)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 449 OPINION AND ORDER re: #102813 #422 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Henry A. McKinnel, John L. LaMattina, Gail Cawkwell, Pfizer, Inc., Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, #425 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Pfizer filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions is denied in its entirety (Docket Item 425), and Pfizer's motion for sanctions (Docket Item 422) is denied in its entirety. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 1/8/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers. (lmb) Modified on 1/18/2013 (jab).
January 3, 2013 Filing 448 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Benjamin J. Sweet. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Zivitz, Andrew)
January 3, 2013 Filing 447 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Leo Mustokoff on behalf of Christine Fleckles (Mustokoff, Matthew)
December 18, 2012 Filing 446 EXHIBITS (in CD form) relating to Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation and Sanctions and Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions were previously filed under seal on 10/10/12. Document filed by the Plaintiffs. ***Accepted for filing by the Honorable Laura Taylor Swain on 12/14/2012.(mro)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura T. Swain from Mary S. Thomas dated 12/13/2012 re: We write to request Your Honor's permission for Plaintiffs to send a CD with copies of the public versions of the exhibits to Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation and Sanctions (Dkt. #425) and Opposition Brief to Defendants' Motion fat Sanctions (Dkt. #433) to the Court's Docketing Office so that the Office can upload the exhibits onto PACER. ENDORSEMENT: The request is Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/14/2012) (ama)
December 5, 2012 Filing 444 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen R. King on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (King, Karen)
December 5, 2012 Filing 443 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew James Ehrlich on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
December 5, 2012 Filing 442 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Edward Davidow on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Davidow, Charles)
December 5, 2012 Filing 441 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Beth A. Wilkinson on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Wilkinson, Beth)
December 3, 2012 Filing 440 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Thomas Caliendo on behalf of Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (Caliendo, Charles)
December 3, 2012 Filing 439 EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PUBLIC VERSION) FILED OCTOBER 19, 2012 (CD FORM). Document filed by the Plaintiffs. ***Accepted for filing by the Honorable Laura Taylor Swain on 11/19/2012, document #438. (mro) Modified on 3/26/2015 (ca). *** As per Judge Swain's Order #690, a new CD containing appropriately redacted exhibits has replaced the old version in court file. Old CD has been forwarded to chambers***
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jay W. Eisenhofer dated 11/16/2012 re: we write to request Your Honor's permission for Plaintiffs to send a CD with copies of the public versions of the exhibits to Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' summary judgment motion (which were filed under seal) to the Court's Docketing Office so that the Office can upload the exhibits onto PACER. ENDORSEMENT: The request is Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/19/2012) (ama)
November 16, 2012 Filing 437 DECLARATION of Patrick T. Shilling, Esq. (Reply Declaration) - PUBLIC VERSION. in Support re: #422 MOTION for Sanctions.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 55-63)(Shilling, Patrick)
November 16, 2012 Filing 436 DECLARATION of George S. Wang, Esq. - PUBLIC VERSION. in Support re: #422 MOTION for Sanctions.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14, #2 Exhibit 15-34, #3 Exhibit 35-38, #4 Exhibit 39-40, #5 Exhibit 41-44, #6 Exhibit 45-49, #7 Exhibit 50-54)(Wang, George)
November 16, 2012 Filing 435 DECLARATION of Mary S. Thomas in Opposition re: #422 MOTION for Sanctions.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
November 16, 2012 Filing 434 DECLARATION of Geoffrey C. Jarvis in Opposition re: #422 MOTION for Sanctions.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
November 16, 2012 Filing 433 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #422 MOTION for Sanctions. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions (Public Version). Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
November 16, 2012 Filing 432 DECLARATION of Mary S. Thomas in Support re: #425 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Pfizer.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exh 1, Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exh 1, Part 3, #4 Exhibit Exh 1, Part 4, #5 Exhibit Exh 1, Part 5, #6 Exhibit Exh 2, #7 Exhibit Exh 3, Part 1, #8 Exhibit Exh 3, Part 2, #9 Exhibit Exhs. 4-6)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
November 16, 2012 Filing 431 DECLARATION of John R. Wellschlager. PUBLIC VERSION. in Opposition re: #425 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Pfizer.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6-10, #3 Exhibit 11-17, #4 Exhibit 18-19, #5 Exhibit 20 (Part 1 of 4), #6 Exhibit 20 (Part 2 of 4), #7 Exhibit 20 (Part 3 of 4), #8 Exhibit 20 (Part 4 of 4), #9 Exhibit 21-23, #10 Exhibit 24 (Part 1 of 6), #11 Exhibit 24 (Part 2 of 6), #12 Exhibit 24 (Part 3 of 6), #13 Exhibit 24 (Part 4 of 6), #14 Exhibit 24 (Part 5 of 6), #15 Exhibit 24 (Part 6 of 6) - 25, #16 Exhibit 26 (Part 1 of 2), #17 Exhibit 26 (Part 2 of 2), #18 Exhibit 27, #19 Exhibit 28-37, #20 Exhibit 38, #21 Exhibit 39-42, #22 Exhibit 43-48, #23 Exhibit 49 (Part 1 of 3), #24 Exhibit 49 (Part 2 of 3), #25 Exhibit 49 (Part 3 of 3), #26 Exhibit 50-62, #27 Exhibit 63-71)(Neuner, Lynn)
November 16, 2012 Filing 430 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #425 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Pfizer. PUBLIC VERSION. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Neuner, Lynn)
November 16, 2012 Filing 429 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #425 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Pfizer. Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Further Support Of Motion for Spoliation and Other Sanctions (Public Version). Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
November 16, 2012 Filing 428 AFFIDAVIT of Samuel Salamone in Support re: #425 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Pfizer.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
November 16, 2012 Filing 427 DECLARATION of Mary S. Thomas in Support re: #425 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Pfizer.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
November 16, 2012 Filing 426 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #425 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Pfizer.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
November 16, 2012 Filing 425 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation and Other Sanctions Against Defendant Pfizer. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Eisenhofer, Jay)
November 16, 2012 Filing 424 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #422 MOTION for Sanctions. PUBLIC VERSION. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Neuner, Lynn)
November 16, 2012 Filing 423 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #422 MOTION for Sanctions. REDACTED. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Neuner, Lynn)
November 16, 2012 Filing 422 MOTION for Sanctions. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Neuner, Lynn)
October 19, 2012 Filing 421 DECLARATION of Mary S.Thomas in Opposition re: #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Caliendo, Charles)
October 19, 2012 Filing 420 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Caliendo, Charles)
October 19, 2012 Filing 419 RESPONSE re: #381 Rule 56.1 Statement Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts (Redacted, Public Version). Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Caliendo, Charles)
October 19, 2012 Filing 418 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Public Version. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Caliendo, Charles)
October 10, 2012 Filing 417 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
October 10, 2012 Filing 416 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
October 10, 2012 Filing 415 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
October 5, 2012 Filing 414 DECLARATION of Stephanie Thurin re: #395 Declaration, #413 Declaration Second Supplemental Declaration of Notice Administrator. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Opt-Out List)(Thomas, Mary)
October 1, 2012 Filing 413 DECLARATION of Stephanie Thurin-Notice Administrator re: #395 Declaration,. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thomas, Mary)
October 1, 2012 Filing 412 DECLARATION of Stephanie Thurin-Notice Administrator re: #395 Declaration, Supplemental Declaration of Notice Administrator. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Thomas, Mary)
October 1, 2012 Filing 411 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #377 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. APPLICATION GRANTED. Attorney Dylan Cook Black terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 10/1/2012) (ft)
October 1, 2012 Filing 410 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #376 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. APPLICATION GRANTED. Attorney Clyde Whittaker Steineker terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 10/1/2012) (ft)
October 1, 2012 Filing 409 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #375 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. APPLICATION GRANTED. Attorney Fred M. (Tripp) Haston, III terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 10/1/2012) (ft)
September 25, 2012 Filing 408 NOTICE OF EXCLUDE: that, on behalf of Brain Paul Howell, and Rose Howell, and the marital community thereof, this Answer to the Notice of Pendency of CLASS ACTION is as follows: Brian Howell chooses to be excluded from this and any /all Class Actions. Document filed by John F. Niblack. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP et al.(pl)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Mary S. Thomas dated 9/18/2012 re: At Plaintiffs' request (due to a death in counsel's family), the parties to the above referenced action have agreed to proposed modifications to the briefing schedule on the parties' respective spoliation/sanctions motions as follows: opposition reliefs to be submitted and served by 3:00 pm on Tuesday, September 25, 2012; and reply briefs by 3:00 pm on Wednesday, October 10,2012. We hope that this proposed modification to the schedule is satisfactory to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: The Scheduled Proposed Herein is Approved. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 9/25/2012, Replies due by 10/10/2012.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 9/19/2012) (ama)
September 19, 2012 Filing 406 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Statement of Additional Material Facts as to which there Exists a Genuine Issue to be Tried Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Neuner, Lynn)
September 19, 2012 Filing 405 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Neuner, Lynn)
September 18, 2012 Filing 404 DECLARATION of George S. Wang, Esq. (Reply Declaration) in Support re: #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 151-154, #2 Exhibit 155, #3 Exhibit 156-157, #4 Exhibit 158-159, #5 Exhibit 160-163, #6 Exhibit 164-168, #7 Exhibit 169, #8 Exhibit 170, #9 Exhibit 171-174, #10 Exhibit 175-178, #11 Exhibit 179-181, #12 Exhibit 182-183, #13 Exhibit 184, #14 Exhibit 185-190, #15 Exhibit 191-193, #16 Exhibit 194-202)(Wang, George)
September 18, 2012 Filing 403 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Lisa H. Rubin. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Neuner, Lynn)
September 12, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2013 at 11:30 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (pl)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the conference scheduled for September 14, 2012, is rescheduled for Friday, February 8, 2013, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11C. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/11/2012) (pl)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Lynn K. Neuner and John R. Wellschlager dated 9/5/2012 re: Defendants respectfully request permission to file a brief of 25 pages in length in order to respond to Plaintiffs' 55-page opposition brief. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 9/7/2012) (rjm)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Mary S. Thomas dated 8/28/2012 re: The parties to the above-referenced action have agreed to a proposed briefing schedule on the parties' respective spoliation/sanctions motions as further specified in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: The schedule proposed herein is approved. So ordered. (Motions due by 8/28/2012. Responses due by 9/21/2012. Replies due by 10/5/2012.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 8/29/2012) (rjm)
August 22, 2012 Filing 399 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Mark S. Danek. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Zivitz, Andrew)
August 22, 2012 Filing 398 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Karen E. Reilly. Document filed by Christine Fleckles. (Zivitz, Andrew)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain, from Jay W. Eisenhofer, dated 8/14/2012, re: Plaintiffs' intention to move pursuant to the Court's inherent powers for an adverse inference jury instruction and monetary sanctions against Defendant Pfizer Inc. ("Pfizer") in connection with Pfizer's delayed production and failure to produce documents and information (the "Spoliation Motion"). Since the Spoilation Motion would impact the course of the trial in this case, Plaintiffs are unsure whether to file the motion directly with Your Honor or to file it with Magistrate Judge Pitman pursuant to the Court's May 7, 2010 Referral Order, Dkt. 208. ENDORSEMENT: The motion should be filed with Judge Pitman, who will also rule on the requested page limit extension. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/14/2012) (ja)
August 14, 2012 Filing 396 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
August 10, 2012 Filing 395 DECLARATION of Stephanie Thurin-Claims Administrator re: #245 MOTION to Certify Class., #357 Order on Motion to Certify Class,,, Declaration of Notice Administrator on Notice of Implementation and Publication. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summary Notice of Pendency of Class Action, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Pendency of Class Action)(Thomas, Mary)
August 10, 2012 Filing 394 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Mary S. Thomas dated 8/10/2012 re: request an extension of time until 8/14/2012 to file Plaintiff's opposition brief and supporting papers in response to defendants' motion... Plaintiffs have agreed that defendants time to file their reply brief may be extended to 9/18/2012. ENDORSEMENT: The schedule proposed herein is approved. (Responses due by 8/14/2012, Replies due by 9/18/2012.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 8/10/2012) (jar)
August 9, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Mary Sikra Thomas to RE-FILE Document #393 Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Use the event type Declaration (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (ldi)
August 9, 2012 Filing 393 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice Implementation and Publication re: #245 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summary Notice of Pendency of Class Action, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Pendency of Class Action)(Thomas, Mary) Modified on 8/10/2012 (ldi).
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B Pitman from Jay W Eisenhofer dated 8/2/2012 re: Plaintiffs' request for their spoliation motion before Judge Swain. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs' request to file their spoliation motion before Judge Swain is essentially an application for a limited modification of Judge Swain's Order of Reference. Accordingly, counsel should raise with Judge Swain in the first instance the question of whether she wants to address the motion or whether she wishes me to do so. The length of the briefs to be submitted in connection with the motion should be decided by the judicial officer who will resolve the motion. If defendants wish to file their spoliation before me, they may do so. With respect to all spoliation motions made before me, the opening and opposition briefs are to be limited to 30 pages, exclusive of the table of contents and table of authorities. Reply briefs are limited to 18 pages. All briefs are to be prepared in 12-point, non-proportional type (text and footnotes) with one-inch margins on all sides. Text is to be double spaced; footnotes may be single-spaced. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 8/8/2012) Copies Sent By Chambers(cd)
August 7, 2012 Filing 391 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Jay W. Eisenhofer dated 7/27/2012 re: Plaintiff's attorney requests that the Court permit them a 75 page brief in opposition to Defendant's motion. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's are granted leave to file a 55 page brief. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 8/7/2012) (ago) Modified on 8/9/2012 (ago).
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER APPROVING NOTICE AND SUMMARY NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF CLASS ACTION: The Court approves the form, substance and requirements of the Notice of Pendency of Class Action (the "Notice") and the Summary Notice of Pendency of Class Action (the "Summary Notice" and together with the Notice, the "Notices"), attached hereto as Exhibits 1 and 2, respectively. The form and content of the proposed Notice meet the requirements of Rule 23(c)(2)(B) as the Notice states in plain and easily understood language: (a) The nature of the action and the relevant procedural history; (b) The definition of the Class certified; (c) The claims alleged by the Class and Defendants' potential defenses thereto;, (d) The date of the final pre-trial conference; (e) That a Class member may enter an appearance through an attorney if the member so desires; (f) That the Court will exclude from the Class any member who timely requests exclusion and the time and manner for making such a request; and (g) The binding effect of any settlement or judgment on Class members under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(c)(3). The Notice and Summary Notice, as well as the method and schedule set forth herein for notifying Class Members of the pendency of this Action as a class action, meet the requirements of Rule 23 and due process, constitute the best notice practicable under the circumstances, and shall constitute due and sufficient notice to all persons and entities entitled thereto. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/3/2012) (ft)
July 5, 2012 Filing 389 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon Kyle McGovern on behalf of Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc. (McGovern, Shannon)
July 5, 2012 Filing 388 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Timothy Shilling on behalf of Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc. (Shilling, Patrick)
July 3, 2012 Filing 387 DECLARATION of George S. Wang (Part 3) in Support re: #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 100, #2 Exhibit 101, #3 Exhibit 102, #4 Exhibit 103, #5 Exhibit 104, #6 Exhibit 105, #7 Exhibit 106, #8 Exhibit 107, #9 Exhibit 108, #10 Exhibit 109, #11 Exhibit 110, #12 Exhibit 111, #13 Exhibit 112, #14 Exhibit 113, #15 Exhibit 114, #16 Exhibit 115, #17 Exhibit 116, #18 Exhibit 117, #19 Exhibit 118, #20 Exhibit 119, #21 Exhibit 120, #22 Exhibit 121, #23 Exhibit 122, #24 Exhibit 123, #25 Exhibit 124, #26 Exhibit 125, #27 Exhibit 126, #28 Exhibit 127, #29 Exhibit 128, #30 Exhibit 129, #31 Exhibit 130, #32 Exhibit 131, #33 Exhibit 132, #34 Exhibit 133, #35 Exhibit 134, #36 Exhibit 135, #37 Exhibit 136, #38 Exhibit 137, #39 Exhibit 138, #40 Exhibit 139, #41 Exhibit 140, #42 Exhibit 141, #43 Exhibit 142, #44 Exhibit 143, #45 Exhibit 144, #46 Exhibit 145, #47 Exhibit 146, #48 Exhibit 147, #49 Exhibit 148, #50 Exhibit 149, #51 Exhibit 150)(Wang, George)
July 3, 2012 Filing 386 DECLARATION of George S. Wang (Part 2) in Support re: #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 50, #2 Exhibit 51, #3 Exhibit 52, #4 Exhibit 53, #5 Exhibit 54, #6 Exhibit 55, #7 Exhibit 56, #8 Exhibit 57, #9 Exhibit 58, #10 Exhibit 59, #11 Exhibit 60, #12 Exhibit 61, #13 Exhibit 62, #14 Exhibit 63, #15 Exhibit 64, #16 Exhibit 65, #17 Exhibit 66, #18 Exhibit 67, #19 Exhibit 68, #20 Exhibit 69, #21 Exhibit 70, #22 Exhibit 71, #23 Exhibit 72, #24 Exhibit 73, #25 Exhibit 74, #26 Exhibit 75, #27 Exhibit 76, #28 Exhibit 77, #29 Exhibit 78, #30 Exhibit 79, #31 Exhibit 80, #32 Exhibit 81, #33 Exhibit 82, #34 Exhibit 83, #35 Exhibit 84, #36 Exhibit 85, #37 Exhibit 86, #38 Exhibit 87, #39 Exhibit 88, #40 Exhibit 89, #41 Exhibit 90, #42 Exhibit 91, #43 Exhibit 92, #44 Exhibit 93, #45 Exhibit 94, #46 Exhibit 95, #47 Exhibit 96, #48 Exhibit 97, #49 Exhibit 98, #50 Exhibit 99)(Wang, George)
July 3, 2012 Filing 385 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of George S. Wang in Support re: #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 100, #2 Exhibit 101, #3 Exhibit 102, #4 Exhibit 103, #5 Exhibit 104, #6 Exhibit 105, #7 Exhibit 106, #8 Exhibit 107, #9 Exhibit 108, #10 Exhibit 109, #11 Errata 110, #12 Errata 111, #13 Exhibit 112, #14 Exhibit 113, #15 Exhibit 114, #16 Exhibit 115, #17 Exhibit 116, #18 Exhibit 117, #19 Exhibit 118, #20 Exhibit 119, #21 Exhibit 120, #22 Exhibit 121, #23 Exhibit 122, #24 Exhibit 123, #25 Exhibit 124, #26 Exhibit 125, #27 Exhibit 126, #28 Exhibit 127, #29 Exhibit 128, #30 Exhibit 129, #31 Errata 130, #32 Exhibit 131, #33 Exhibit 132, #34 Exhibit 133, #35 Exhibit 134, #36 Exhibit 135, #37 Exhibit 136, #38 Exhibit 137, #39 Exhibit 138, #40 Exhibit 139, #41 Exhibit 140, #42 Exhibit 141, #43 Exhibit 142, #44 Exhibit 143, #45 Exhibit 144, #46 Exhibit 145, #47 Exhibit 146, #48 Exhibit 147, #49 Exhibit 148, #50 Exhibit 149, #51 Exhibit 150)(Wang, George) Modified on 7/3/2012 (db).
July 2, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney George S Wang to RE-FILE Document #385 Declaration in Support of Motion, #384 Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Duplicated Docket Entries. Re-File As Supplemental Declarations in Support; or Declaration in Support Part 2 and Part 3. (db)
July 2, 2012 Filing 384 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of George S. Wang in Support re: #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, Robert Makuch, PhD, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 50, #2 Exhibit 51, #3 Exhibit 52, #4 Exhibit 53, #5 Exhibit 54, #6 Exhibit 55, #7 Exhibit 56, #8 Exhibit 57, #9 Exhibit 58, #10 Exhibit 59, #11 Exhibit 60, #12 Exhibit 61, #13 Exhibit 62, #14 Exhibit 63, #15 Errata 64, #16 Exhibit 65, #17 Exhibit 66, #18 Exhibit 67, #19 Exhibit 68, #20 Exhibit 69, #21 Exhibit 70, #22 Exhibit 71, #23 Exhibit 72, #24 Exhibit 73, #25 Exhibit 74, #26 Exhibit 75, #27 Exhibit 76, #28 Exhibit 77, #29 Exhibit 78, #30 Exhibit 79, #31 Exhibit 80, #32 Exhibit 81, #33 Exhibit 82, #34 Exhibit 83, #35 Exhibit 84, #36 Exhibit 85, #37 Exhibit 86, #38 Exhibit 87, #39 Exhibit 88, #40 Exhibit 89, #41 Exhibit 90, #42 Exhibit 91, #43 Exhibit 92, #44 Exhibit 93, #45 Exhibit 94, #46 Exhibit 95, #47 Exhibit 96, #48 Exhibit 97, #49 Errata 98, #50 Exhibit 99)(Wang, George) Modified on 7/3/2012 (db).
July 2, 2012 Filing 383 DECLARATION of George S. Wang in Support re: #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Errata 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Errata 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Errata 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Errata 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49)(Wang, George)
July 2, 2012 Filing 382 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #380 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Neuner, Lynn)
July 2, 2012 Filing 381 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Neuner, Lynn)
July 2, 2012 Filing 380 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Neuner, Lynn)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from John R. Wellschlager and Lynn K. Neuner dated 6/27/2012 re: We write on behalf of Defendants in the above-captioned action to seek clarification of certain deadlines. ENDORSEMENT: Pretrial motions and submissions are not required in advance of the September 14, 2012 conference, at which such matters can be addressed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/29/2012) (ama)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between undersigned counsel, that Dr. Bennett will not be called at trial, that his opinions will not be offered at trial, and that no other Plaintiffs' expert will rely on his opinions. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants will forego an additional deposition of Dr. Bennett. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 6/19/2012) (jfe)
June 5, 2012 Filing 377 MOTION for Dylan Cook Black to Withdraw as Attorney for Pfizer Inc. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc..(Black, Dylan)
June 5, 2012 Filing 376 MOTION for Clyde Whittaker Steineker to Withdraw as Attorney for Pfizer Inc. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc..(Black, Dylan)
June 5, 2012 Filing 375 MOTION for Fred M. (Tripp) Haston, III to Withdraw as Attorney for Pfizer Inc. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc..(Black, Dylan)
June 1, 2012 Filing 374 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Mary S. Thomas, Lyan K. Neuner, Andrew L. Zivitz and John R. Wellschlager dated 5/25/2012 re: The parties jointly request that the deadlines be modified as follows: Dispositive motions by 7/2/12. Briefs in opposition by 8/10/12. Reply brief by 9/12/12. The parties also agree that the current final pre-trial conference scheduled for 9/14/12 should not be affected. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. ( Motions due by 7/2/2012., Responses due by 8/10/2012, Replies due by 9/12/2012.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 5/31/2012) (jfe) Modified on 6/7/2012 (jfe).
May 30, 2012 Filing 373 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Michael J. Chepiga, Chad H. Atlas, Nicholas F. Cohen, and Abigail A. Hazlett. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Neuner, Lynn)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jay W. Eisenhofer dated 5/24/2012 re: We represent the recently-certified Class in the above-referenced action. In accordance with Your Honor's April 6, 2012 Amended Order Granting Motion For Class Certification, we submit the following proposed timetable for class notice submissions as further set forth in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed timetable is approved. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/29/2012) (lmb)
May 21, 2012 Filing 371 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Attorney John R. Wellschlager dated May 17, 2012 re: Defendants request to file an opening brief of forty (40) pages in length. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 5/21/2012) (bw)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 370 PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR DATABASE-RELATED INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION... regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 5/14/2012) (rjm)
May 10, 2012 Filing 369 ANSWER to #361 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Hynes, Michael)
May 4, 2012 Filing 368 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a status conference proceeding held on 4/18/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
May 4, 2012 Filing 367 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: status conference held on 4/18/2012 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2012.(tro)
April 18, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 4/18/2012. (cd)
April 17, 2012 Filing 366 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a status conference proceeding held on 4/10/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
April 17, 2012 Filing 365 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: status conference held on 4/10/2012 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2012.(tro)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER: that, 1. Plaintiffs' motion for a protective order limiting the scope of certain expert witness depositions to events and work performed after the Daubert hearing in this matter is denied. 2. The deposition questioning of Dr. Baruch at his deposition shall be limited to those opinions upon which Drs. Madigan and Jewell have relied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 4/10/2012) Copies Transmitted By Chambers. (pl) Modified on 4/10/2012 (pl).
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 363 STIPULATION AND ORDER: that Defendants' time to answer Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint in the above-captioned action is extended to May 10, 2012. All Defendants. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 4/10/2012) (pl)
April 10, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 4/10/2012, order to follow. (cd)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 362 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: For the reasons set forth in the Court's Opinion of March 29, 2012: The Court hereby certifies pursuant to Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure a main class consisting of all persons or entities who purchased and/or otherwise acquired common stock issued by Pfizer, Inc., between and including October 31, 2000 and October 19, 2005, with the exception of the following set forth within this Order. The Court hereby certifies, pursuant to Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure a Rule 20A subclass consisting of all members of the main class who purchased contemporaneously with sales of Pfizer common stock by Individual Defendants Henry McKinnell, Karen Katen and John LaMattina on any of the following dates: 10/26/00, 11/6/00, 10/19/01, 10/23/01, 10/29/01, 02/21/02, 02/25/02, 02/27/03, 11/18/03, 2/26/04, 2/24/05, 05106105, and 05/10/05 and 8/16/05. Lead Plaintiff TRSL and named Plaintiffs Christine Feckles, Julie Perusse and Alden Chace are hereby designated Class Representatives for the main class and the 20A Subclass. Grant & Eisenhofer is hereby appointed Class Counsel. The parties are directed to consult with each other and meet promptly with Judge Pitman to discuss settlement and the timing and content of class notice and opt-out procedures, and must provide a proposed timetable to the undersigned for class notice submissions by May 25, 2012. This Order resolves docket entry nos. 234 and 245. (Pursuant to Chambers request). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/6/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP(jfe) Modified on 4/6/2012 (jfe).
March 30, 2012 Filing 360 NOTICE of Corrected Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jeffrey S. Grand. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Seeger, Christopher)
March 30, 2012 Filing 359 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jeffrey S. Grand to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Seeger, Christopher) Modified on 3/30/2012 (ldi).
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 358 OPINION: Plaintiffs' motion for class certification is granted. A separate order will be entered. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/29/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS et al.(ft)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION granting (234) Motion to Certify Class; granting (245) Motion to Certify Class in case 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP, as further set forth in this document. This Order resolves docket entry nos. 234 and 245. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/29/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP(cd)
March 27, 2012 Filing 361 AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT amending #51 Complaint, against Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by L. Norman Showers, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Michael Feiterland, Christine Fleckles, Anthon Johnson. Related document: #51 Complaint, filed by Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Paul Schapka, Michael Feiterland.(ft)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: #101600 re: (343 in 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Unredacted Pubilc Version. filed by Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. CONCLUSION: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion is granted. Plaintiffs are directed to file their Amended Complaint by April 4, 2012. This Memorandum Opinion and Order resolves docket entry no. 343. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/22/2012) (ama) Modified on 3/27/2012 (jab).
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: re: (304 in 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP) MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). filed by Henry A. McKinnel, John L. LaMattina, Gail Cawkwell, Pfizer, Inc., Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen. CONCLUSION: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion is denied. This Memorandum Opinion and Order resolves docket entry no. 304. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/22/2012) (ama)
March 15, 2012 Filing 354 Letter addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jay W. Eisenhofer dated 3/13/2012 re: We represent Plaintiffs in the above-captioned matter and write in response to Defendants' March 12, 2012 letter request for leave to file a sur-reply to Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Further Support of their Motion for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. For the above reasons, the Court should reject Defendants' improper and belated attempt to present their sur-reply under the guise of requesting permission to submit it or, alternatively, reject the arguments made in Defendants' letter. Document filed by Michael Feiterland, Christine Fleckles, Anthon Johnson, L. Norman Showers, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(lmb)
March 15, 2012 Filing 353 Letter addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from John R. Wellschlager and Lynn K. Neuner dated 3/12/2012 re: We represent Defendants and write to request Your Honor's permission to submit this two-page letter as a sur-reply to Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Further Support of their Motion for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.(lmb)
March 7, 2012 Filing 352 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Reconsideration Of The Decision On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss and the Declaration Of James J. Sabella with accompanying exhibits served on Defendants on December 22, 2011. Service was made by electronic mail. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
March 7, 2012 Filing 351 DECLARATION of James J. Sabella (Unredacted, public version) in Opposition re: #304 MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service).. Document filed by Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 12-1, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Errata 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 29-1, #32 Exhibit 29-2, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 32-1, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34, #39 Exhibit 35, #40 Exhibit 36, #41 Exhibit 37, #42 Exhibit 38, #43 Exhibit 39, #44 Exhibit 40)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
March 7, 2012 Filing 350 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #304 MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). Plaintiffs' Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Reconsideration Of The Decision On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss. (Unredacted, public version). Document filed by Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
March 7, 2012 Filing 349 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #304 MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). Plaintiffs' Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Reconsideration Of The Decision On Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (Unredacted, Public Version). Document filed by Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
March 5, 2012 Filing 348 JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #343 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Unredacted Pubilc Version. -PUBLIC VERSION. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Neuner, Lynn)
March 2, 2012 Filing 347 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Mary S. Thomas dated 2/27/2012 re: Plaintiffs respectfully request leave to file a reply memorandum of law in further support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Class Action Complaint (due to be filed on March 1, 2012) that exceeds the standard page limits. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/29/2012) (lmb)
March 2, 2012 Filing 346 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend The Consolidated Class Actio Complaint; and Declaration Of Charles T. Caliendo In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To Amend The Consolidated Class Action Complaint and accompanying documents. served on Defendants on January17, 2012. Service was made by electronic mail. Document filed by Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
March 2, 2012 Filing 345 DECLARATION of Charles Caliendo [Unredacted Public Version] in Support re: #343 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Unredacted Pubilc Version.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
March 2, 2012 Filing 344 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #343 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Unredacted Pubilc Version. Unredacted Public Version. Document filed by Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
March 2, 2012 Filing 343 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint Unredacted Pubilc Version. Document filed by Christine Fleckles, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Eisenhofer, Jay)
March 1, 2012 Filing 342 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to compel the production of server logs related to eRooms, as described in their December 19, 2011 letter, is denied. Defendants shall search and produce, from the "GDMS" and "DLTS" systems, documents containing the agreed upon search terms. The defendant shall de-duplicate the documents retrieved from the "GDMS" and "DLTS" systems so that identical copies of documents previously produced are not produced a second time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/24/2012) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ft)
February 24, 2012 Filing 340 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a status conference proceeding held on 2/17/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
February 24, 2012 Filing 339 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: status conference held on 2/17/2012 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2012.(tro)
February 24, 2012 Filing 338 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a status conference proceeding held on 2/16/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
February 24, 2012 Filing 337 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: status conference held on 2/16/2012 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2012.(tro)
February 17, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 2/17/2012, order to follow. (mro)
February 16, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Discovery Telephone Conference held on 2/16/2012. (ft)
February 16, 2012 Filing 336 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
February 16, 2012 Filing 335 DECLARATION of Lynn K. Neuner, Esq. in Opposition re: 325 Sealed Document. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Neuner, Lynn)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER: 1. Plaintiffs are directed to produce the programs their expert, Dr. Madigan, used to extract medical codes and data from the relevant studies, as referenced in defendants' February 8, 2012 letter, no later than February 21, 2012. 2. The existing schedule in this case is modified as follows as set forth in this order. ( Expert Discovery due by 5/4/2012., Motions due by 6/1/2012., Responses due by 7/13/2012., Replies due by 8/16/2012.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/16/2012) Copies Sent By Chambers. (lmb)
February 15, 2012 Filing 333 Letter addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Lynn K. Neuner and John R. Wellschlager dated 2/13/2012 re: We jointly represent the Defendants in this action and are writing in response to the February 10, 2012 letter to Your Honor from Plaintiffs' counsel. We advised Plaintiffs last week that we believe a request for a trial date is premature. (rjm)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jay W. Eisenhofer dated 2/10/2012 re: We write to request a status conference with the Court to discuss scheduling a trial date for this case, which has been pending since 2004. ENDORSEMENT: The conference request is denied as premature in light of ongoing discovery activity and pending motions. The case remains referred to Judge Pitman for general pretrial management. The March 2, 2012, final pre-trial conference date is adjourned to a control date of September 14, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. So ordered. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/15/2012) (rjm)
February 10, 2012 Filing 331 DECLARATION of Charles Caliendo in Support re: #245 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhs. A-O, #2 Exhibit Exhs. P-BB)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
February 10, 2012 Filing 330 DECLARATION of Mary S. Thomas in Support re: #245 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
February 10, 2012 Filing 329 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #245 MOTION to Certify Class. with certificate of service. Unredacted Public version. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
February 8, 2012 Filing 328 NOTICE of Lead Plaintiff's Notice of Additional Authority In Support Of Its Motion For Class Certification And Appointment Of Class Representative re: #246 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #245 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
January 23, 2012 Filing 327 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Mary S. Thomas dated 1/19/2012 re: We represent Plaintiffs in the above-referenced action, and write to request leave to file a reply memorandum of law in further support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Representatives that exceeds the standard page limits. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 1/20/2012) (ama)
January 17, 2012 Filing 325 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
January 6, 2012 Filing 324 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
December 29, 2011 Filing 323 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a status conference proceeding held on 12/13/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
December 29, 2011 Filing 322 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: status conference held on 12/13/2011 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2012.(tro)
December 28, 2011 Filing 321 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Stevens on behalf of Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel (Stevens, Rachel)
December 28, 2011 Filing 320 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael D. Hynes on behalf of Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel (Hynes, Michael)
December 22, 2011 Filing 318 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
December 22, 2011 Filing 317 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Mary S. Thomas dated 12/21/11 re: Counsel for the Lead Plaintiff seeks leave from the Court to file affidavits or declarations attaching evidentiary material in support of its opposition to defendant's motion. ENDORSEMENT: In light of Lead Plaintiff's failure to comply with paragraph 1.A of the Individual Practices Rules of the undersigned, the request is granted without prejudice to any motion to strike the material. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/21/2011) (mro)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 316 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW THEREFORE, it is ORDERED that any motions for amendments to the pleadings shall be made no later than thirty (30) days after the completion of the depositions of Dr. Elizabeth Kitsis and Dr. Mona Wahba (whichever occurs later); that any opposition thereto shall be filed no later than thirty (30) days after the filing of any motion for amendment; and that any reply brief in support of any motion for amendment shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after the filing of any opposition brief. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 12/20/2011) (jfe)
December 19, 2011 Filing 315 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Keith M. Fleischman. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Fleischman, Keith)
December 19, 2011 Filing 314 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a status conference proceeding held on 12/6/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
December 19, 2011 Filing 313 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: status conference held on 12/6/2011 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2012.(tro)
December 14, 2011 Filing 312 DECLARATION of George S. Wang, Esq. (Public-Redacted Version) in Opposition re: #234 MOTION to Certify Class., #245 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7, #2 Exhibit 8-12, #3 Exhibit 13-17, #4 Exhibit 18-27, #5 Exhibit 28-33, #6 Exhibit 34-46, #7 Exhibit 47-53, #8 Exhibit 54-67, #9 Exhibit 68-79, #10 Exhibit 80-83)(Wang, George)
December 14, 2011 Filing 311 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #234 MOTION to Certify Class., #245 MOTION to Certify Class. Public - Redacted Version. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Wang, George)
December 14, 2011 Filing 310 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #304 MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). Public Version. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Wang, George)
December 13, 2011 Filing 319 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Status conference held on 12/13/2011 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. (cd)
December 13, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Discovery Telephone Conference held on 12/13/2011. Order to follow. (mro)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 309 STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve and file their opposition to Defendants' pending motion for reconsideration on or before December 22, 2011, and Defendants shall serve and file their reply brief in further support of the motion for reconsideration on or before January 6, 2012. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #304 MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). :( Responses due by 12/22/2011, Replies due by 1/6/2012.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 12/12/2011) (jfe)
December 8, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (304 in 1:04-cv-09866-LTS -HBP) MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). Responses due by 12/12/2011 (cd)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER: Plaintiffs' application to depose Dr. Mona Wahba for two days is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs are directed to commence the deposition of Dr. Dr. Wahba, and as further set forth in this document. Plaintiffs' time to serve and file their opposition to the defendants' pending motion for reconsideration no later than 12/12/2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 12/8/2011) Copies Sent By Chambers. (cd)
December 6, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 12/6/2011. Discovery teleconference held. (lmb)
November 28, 2011 Filing 307 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mary Sikra Thomas on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Grant & Eisenhofer P.A., 123 Justison Street, Wilmington, DE, United States 19801, 302-622-7100. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09866-LTS -HBP et al.(Thomas, Mary)
November 23, 2011 Filing 306 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
November 23, 2011 Filing 304 MOTION for Reconsideration of Opinion and Order Granting and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service). Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc..(Wang, George)
November 22, 2011 Filing 305 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
November 22, 2011 Filing 303 DECLARATION of Paul A. Gompers in Opposition re: #234 MOTION to Certify Class., #245 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-E, #2 Exhibit 1-9, #3 Exhibit 10-14, #4 Exhibit 15-28, #5 Exhibit 29, #6 Exhibit 30-50)(Wang, George)
November 22, 2011 Filing 302 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a status conference proceeding held on 11/15/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
November 22, 2011 Filing 301 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: status conference held on 11/15/2011 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012.(tro)
November 22, 2011 Filing 300 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a status conference proceeding held on 11/10/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro) (tro). (Main Document 300 replaced on 11/22/2011) (tro).
November 22, 2011 Filing 299 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: status conference held on 11/10/2011 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012.(tro)
November 18, 2011 Filing 298 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Mary S. Thomas dated 11/16/2011 re: The parties hereby respectfully request that Your Honor permit us to continue to meet and confer process and to report on our progress at the next scheduled status conference. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 11/18/2011) (lmb)
November 18, 2011 Filing 297 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Mary S. Thomas dated 11/16/2011 re: The parties have agreed and request that the Court approve a schedule whereby Plaintiffs shall file their opening brief on Tuesday, November 22, 2011 and Defendants shall file their opposition brief on Monday, December 5, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: The schedule proposed herein is approved. ( Motions due by 11/22/2011. Responses due by 12/5/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 11/18/2011) (lmb)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 296 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 11/15/2011) (cd)
November 16, 2011 Filing 295 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a discovery dispute proceeding held on 10/31/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
November 16, 2011 Filing 294 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: discovery dispute held on 10/31/2011 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ruth Ann Hager. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2012.(tro)
November 15, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 11/15/2011. (lmb)
November 15, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Discovery Telephone Conference held on 11/15/2011. (rjm)
November 10, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 11/10/2011. (lmb)
November 10, 2011 Filing 293 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George S Wang on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Wang, George)
November 4, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #291 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 10/28/2011, Receipt Number 1020414. (jd)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting #291 Motion for Mark S. Danek to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for the Plaintiffs' in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/4/2011) (pl)
October 31, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Discovery Hearing held on 10/31/2011 and a Status Conference set for 11/10/2011 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (mro)
October 28, 2011 Filing 291 MOTION for Mark S. Danek to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Michael Feiterland, Michael Feitler, Christine Fleckles, Anthon Johnson, Paul Schapka, L. Norman Showers.(wb) (pgu).
October 21, 2011 Filing 290 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a status conference proceeding held on 9/28/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
October 21, 2011 Filing 289 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a status conference proceeding held on 7/8/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
October 21, 2011 Filing 288 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: status conference held on 9/28/2011 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2012.(tro)
October 21, 2011 Filing 287 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: status conference held on 7/8/2011 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2012.(tro)
September 30, 2011 Filing 286 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Ferris Cohen on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Cohen, Nicholas)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER: Defendants' Counsel shall submit a letter brief no later than October 5, 2011 concerning Pfizer's assertion of work product with respect to certain witness interview notes; plaintiffs shall submit responsive letter briefs no later than October 12, 2011. Counsel for the securities plaintiffs shall submit a letter brief no later than October 5, 2011 concerning (a) plaintiffs application to depose several current and former "high-level" Pfizer executives and (b) plaintiffs' application to compel production of documents in response to Item of five of plaintiff's Sixth Request for the Production of Documents. Pfizer is to submit its response no later than October 12, 2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 9/29/2011) (rdz)
September 29, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #276 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 09/13/2011, Receipt Number 1016251. (jd)
September 29, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #275 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 09/09/2011, Receipt Number 1016043. (jd)
September 28, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/28/2011. (mro)
September 19, 2011 Filing 284 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a hearing proceeding held on 9/7/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
September 19, 2011 Filing 283 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: hearing held on 9/7/2011 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/13/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2011.(tro)
September 19, 2011 Filing 282 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a hearing proceeding held on 8/31/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
September 19, 2011 Filing 281 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: hearing held on 8/31/2011 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/13/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2011.(tro)
September 15, 2011 Filing 280 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order for an Order Establishing a Protocol for Production of Documents Without Waiver of Potentially Applicable Privileges. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc., Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hynes, Michael)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #275 Motion for Michael Bhargava to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for non-parties Dr. Lon Schneider, Dr. Garret FitzGerald, Dr. Gerald Faich, Robert Makuch, Ph.D., Dr. W. Douglas Weaver, and Dr. William White. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/14/2011) (djc)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #276 Motion for Dylan Cook Black to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/14/2011) (djc) Modified on 9/15/2011 (djc).
September 13, 2011 Filing 277 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Clyde Whittaker Steineker on behalf of Pfizer Securities Litigation, Pfizer, Inc.. New Address: Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, 1819 Fifth Avenue North, One Federal Place, Birmingham, Alabama, USA 35203, 205/521-8000. (Steineker, Clyde)
September 13, 2011 Filing 276 MOTION for Dylan Cook Black to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.(pgu)
September 9, 2011 Filing 275 MOTION for Michael Bhargava to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Gerald Faich, Garret FitzGerald, Robert Makuch, PhD, Lon Schneider, Douglas W. Weaver, William White.(pgu)
September 7, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/7/2011. Another Telephone Status Conference set for 9/16/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (mro)
August 31, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 8/31/2011. (mro)
August 24, 2011 Filing 274 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abigail Alicia Hazlett on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Hazlett, Abigail)
August 23, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (234 in 1:04-cv-09866-LTS -HBP) MOTION to Certify Class., (245 in 1:04-cv-09866-LTS -HBP) MOTION to Certify Class., (130 in 1:04-cv-10071-LTS -HBP) MOTION to Certify Class.. Responses due by 10/14/2011 Replies due by 12/16/2011. (jfe)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 273 STIPULATION AND ORDER It is hereby Stipulated and agreed that the schedule pertaining to the above captioned actions is hereby modified such that the deadline are now as follows: Defendants' opposition to securities class certification motion by 10/14/11. Defendants' opposition to ERISA class certification motion by 10/14/11. Completion of fact discovery by 11/16/11. Securities plaintiffs' reply in support of class certification motions by 12/16/11. ERISA plaintiffs' reply in support of class certification motion by 12/16/11. Deadline for expert reports of party with burden of proofs by 1/13/12. Deadline for expert and/or rebuttal expert reports of opposing party by 2/17/12. Deadline for rebuttal expert reports of party with burden of proof by 3/16/12. Completion of all expert discovery by 3/30/12. Deadline for dispositive motions by 4/9/12. Deadline for briefs in opposition to dispositive motions by 5/29/12. Deadline for reply briefs by 6/29/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 8/22/2011) (jfe) Modified on 8/29/2011 (jfe).
August 5, 2011 Filing 272 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a hearing proceeding held on 7/28/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
August 5, 2011 Filing 271 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: hearing held on 7/28/2011 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ruth Ann Hager. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2011.(tro)
July 29, 2011 Filing 270 Letter addressed to Ruby J Krajick from Whitt Steineker dated 7/25/11 re: Pro Hac Vice Admission of M. Tripp Haston. (cd)
July 28, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Discovery Hearing held on 7/28/2011. Status telephone conference set for August 31 at 2:00 p.m. (Landers, Rigoberto)
July 22, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #267 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 07/15/2011, Receipt Number 11781. (jd)
July 21, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #265 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 07/07/2011, Receipt Number 10994. (jd)
July 20, 2011 Filing 269 MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON #267 Motion for Fred M. Tripp Haston, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice; ENDORSEMENT: The within motion is denied without prejudice to reopening upon the submission of state bar certificate(s) of good standing as required by SDNY Local Civil Rule 1.3(c). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/20/11) (djc)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #265 Motion for Michelle M. Newcomer to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/19/11) (cd)
July 18, 2011 Filing 267 MOTION for Fred M. "Tripp" Haston III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.(pgu)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER: Counsel for the parties shall submit opening letter briefs concerning discovery pending disputes that require judicial resolution no later than 7/14/2011. Opposing letter briefs due 7/21/2011. Reply letter briefs due 7/22/2011. Oral Argument set for 7/28/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 7/11/2011) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ab)
July 8, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 7/8/2011. Remaining discovery issues to be fully briefed by 7/22/11 (Landers, Rigoberto)
July 7, 2011 Filing 265 MOTION for Michelle M. Newcomer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Michael Feiterland, Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka, L. Norman Showers.(pgu)
July 7, 2011 Filing 264 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Clyde Whittaker Steineker on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Steineker, Clyde)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 263 STIPULATION AND ORDER, 1. Defendants' Opposition to Securities Class Certification Motion and Defendants' Opposition to ERISA Class Certification Motion are due on August 15, 2011. 2. Securities Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Class Certification Motion and ERISA Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of C]ass Certification Motion are due on October 14, 2011. 3. All other deadlines set forth in the April 15, 2011 Scheduling Order are undisturbed without prejudice to any party's right to apply to this Court for an extension thereof.( Responses due by 8/15/2011, Replies due by 10/14/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 6/29/11) (pl) Modified on 7/1/2011 (pl). Modified on 7/12/2011 (pl).
June 29, 2011 Filing 262 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a status conference proceeding held on 6/2/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(tro)
June 29, 2011 Filing 261 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Status Conference held on 6/2/2011 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2011.(tro)
June 29, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference set for 7/8/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (ft) Modified on 6/29/2011 (ft).
June 29, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 6/29/2011. (ft)
June 15, 2011 Filing 260 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 6/15/2011, ( Telephone Conference set for 6/29/2011 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman.). (mbe)
June 15, 2011 Filing 259 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen E. Reilly on behalf of Christine Fleckles (Reilly, Karen)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER that no later than the close of business on 6/3/11, counsel for Pfizer is to provide counsel for plaintiffs with the last known addresses of the 20 former Pfizer employees that plaintiffs are seeking to depose, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 6/2/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-09866-LTS -HBP, 1:04-cv-10071-LTS Copies sent by chambers(cd)
June 2, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Status Conference held on 6/2/2011, ( Telephone Conference set for 6/15/2011 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman.). (mbe)
June 1, 2011 Filing 257 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rae Caroline Adams on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Adams, Rae)
May 13, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Status Conference (Telephonic) held on 5/13/2011, ( Telephone Conference set for 5/20/2011 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman.). (mbe)
May 12, 2011 Filing 256 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chad Henry Atlas on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Atlas, Chad)
May 12, 2011 Filing 255 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Heather Rubin on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Rubin, Lisa)
May 12, 2011 Filing 254 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Joseph Chepiga on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Chepiga, Michael)
May 12, 2011 Filing 253 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lynn Katherine Neuner on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Neuner, Lynn)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 252 STIPULATION AND ORDER: The deadlines pertaining to the above captioned actions are hereby modified as follows: Defendants' opposition to Securities Class Certification Motion is due 6/30/2011. Defendants' opposition to ERISA Class Certification Motion is due 6/30/2011. Securities Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Class Certification Motion due 8/30/2011. ERISA Plaintiffs' Reply in support of Class Certification Motion due 8/30/2011. Completion of all fact discovery by 9/16/2011. Deadline for Expert Reports of Party with Burden of Proof by 10/17/2011. Deadline for Expert and/or Rebuttal Expert Reports of Opposing Party due 12/1/2011. Deadline for Rebuttal Expert Reports of Party with burden of Proof by 1/5/2012. Completion of All Expert Discovery by 1/19/2012.Deadline for Dispositive Motions is 1/30/2012. Deadline for Briefs in Opposition to Dispositive Motions is 3/19/2012. Deadline for Reply Briefs is 4/20/2012. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 4/15/2011) (jpo)
April 14, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Discovery Conference held on 4/14/2011, ( Conference set for 5/13/2011 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman.). (mbe)
April 13, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #250 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 03/31/2011, Receipt Number 933682. (jd)
April 12, 2011 Filing 251 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Fleischman, Keith)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that John R. Wellschlager is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Pfizer in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/11/2011) (rjm)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT NED C. WEINBERGER PRO HAC VICE granting #244 Motion for Ned C. Weinberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/29/2011) (jpo)
March 29, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #244 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 03/23/2011, Receipt Number 933013. (jd)
March 28, 2011 Filing 248 DECLARATION of Mary S. Thomas in Support re: #245 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39)(Fleischman, Keith)
March 28, 2011 Filing 247 DECLARATION of Daniel R Fischel in Support re: #245 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Fleischman, Keith)
March 28, 2011 Filing 246 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #245 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Fleischman, Keith)
March 28, 2011 Filing 245 MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Fleischman, Keith)
March 23, 2011 Filing 244 MOTION for Ned C. Weinberger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(mro)
March 23, 2011 Filing 243 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Stevens on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Stevens, Rachel)
March 23, 2011 Filing 242 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Caleb Dougherty on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Dougherty, John)
March 23, 2011 Filing 241 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael D. Hynes on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Hynes, Michael)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER> Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to file appropriately redacted versions of the affidavits and memorandum of law in the public file no later than March 28, 2011, and to file a revised Notice of Motion including the requisite certification by the same date. the parties' further filings in this matter must conform to the governing orders, federal and local procedural rules, and published individual practices. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP(js)
March 17, 2011 Filing 238 DECLARATION of Alden B. Chace, Jr. in Support re: #234 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Fleischman, Keith)
March 17, 2011 Filing 237 DECLARATION of Christine Fleckles in Support re: #234 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Fleischman, Keith)
March 17, 2011 Filing 236 DECLARATION of Julie Perusse in Support re: #234 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Fleischman, Keith)
March 17, 2011 Filing 235 DECLARATION of Maureen Westgard in Support re: #234 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Fleischman, Keith)
March 16, 2011 Filing 239 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm) Modified on 3/18/2011 (nm).
March 16, 2011 Filing 234 MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Fleischman, Keith)
March 15, 2011 Filing 233 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Keith Fleischman dated 3/14/11 re: Request to enlarge page limit requirement for the Motion for Class Certification to 45 pages, opposition to 45 pages and reply to 25 pages. ENDORSEMENT: The requests are granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/15/11) (cd)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER: It is hereby Ordered that with respect to the ERISA plaintiffs' application to compel a response to their document requests 46-48, plaintiffs shall submit a letter brief in support of their position no later than March 14, 2011; Pfizer shall submit its response no later than March 25, 2011 and plaintiffs shall submit their reply no later than April 1, 2011. The ERISA plaintiffs' application to compel production of the documents previously produced by defendants in Alaska Elec. Pension Fund v. Pharmacia Corp., No. 03-1519 (D.N.J.) is granted. Pfizer has withdrawn its Interrogatory No.3 to the ERISA plaintiffs. Pfizer's application to compel production of documents concerning the ERISA plaintiffs' non-Plan investments is granted to the extent it seeks documents concerning investments in pharmaceutical companies and denied in all other respects. A discovery conference will be held in this matter on March 31, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel are directed to submit a joint letter setting outlining their respective positions regarding discovery disputes that the parties seek to have addressed at the March 31 conference no later than March 25, 2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 3/8/2011) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jfe)
March 7, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Status Conference held on 3/7/2011. Discovery conference held another conference is set for March 31, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. (mbe)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 231 STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by the parties in the above captioned action, by and through their undersigned counsel, as follows: Lead Plaintiff shall file and serve its Motion for Class Certification no later than Wednesday, March 16, 2011. Defendants shall file and serve their opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification no later than Thursday, June 16, 2011. Lead Plaintiff shall file and serve its reply in support of its Motion for class certification no later than, Monday, August 15, 2011. So Ordered (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/11/2011) (js)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 230 STIPULATION AND ORDER WITHDRAWING MICHAEL FEITLER AND PAUL SCHAPKA AS NAMED PLAINTIFFS AND ADDING ANTHON JOHNSON AS A NAMED PLAINTIFF. It is ordered that Mr. Feitler and Mr. Schapka shall be permitted to withdraw, effectively immediately, as named plaintiffs for the putative class in this Action; Mr. Johnson is added, effectively immediately, as a named plaintiff for the putative class in this Action; The written discovery served upon Messrs. Feitler and Schapka is withdrawn; Mr. Johnson shall respond to the written discovery propounded on Mr. Feitler and Mr. Schapka in accordance with the schedule agreed to by the parties; and Defendants reserve and may assert all objections to Mr. Johnson as a plaintiff and as a representative plaintiff at any stage of this litigation. Anthon Johnson added. Michael Feitler and Paul Schapka terminated. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/5/11) (rjm)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 229 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the parties in the above-captioned action, by and through their undersigned counsel, as follows: Lead Plaintiff shall file and serve its Motion for Class Certification no later than Wednesday, February 16, 2011. Defendants shall file and serve their opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification no later than Monday, May 16, 2011. Lead Plaintiff shall file and serve its reply in support of its Motion for class certification no later than Friday, July 15, 2011. ( Motions due by 2/16/2011., Responses due by 5/16/2011, Replies due by 7/15/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 12/21/10) (mro)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SCHEDULING ORDER: The application of the securities plaintiffs to compel defendant to complete production with respect to the forty additional custodians requested by Plaintiffs by February 15, 2011 is denied. Defendant is, however, directed to continue to devote sufficient resources to its document production efforts such that documents are assessed by the attorney reviewers at the rate of at least approximately 600,000 pages per week. Until defendant's production is complete, within five business days of the end of every month, defendant is to advise plaintiffs' counsel in writing of the approximate number pages (to the nearest 10,000) assessed by the attorney reviewers in the preceding month. 2. No later than December 31, 2010, defendant shall provide plaintiff with dates for the first twenty depositions sought by plaintiffs. If defendant is unable to provide dates for any of the depositions sought by plaintiffs defendant is directed to describe its efforts to obtain a deposition date from the witness. 3. A follow-up discovery/status conference will be held on January 18, 2011 in Courtroom 18A, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Any party wishing to raise a discovery or scheduling issue at the January 18 conference, is directed to fax me a letter no later than December 29, 2010 identifying the issue and setting forth that party's position. Responsive letters are to be submitted no later than January 13, 2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 12/9/2010) Copies Sent by Chambers (lnl)
December 8, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Status Conference held on 12/8/2010. Discovery Hearing set for 1/13/2011 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (mro)
December 2, 2010 Filing 227 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Traci L. Goins. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Fleischman, Keith)
November 8, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Discovery Hearing held on 11/8/2010. Another Conference set for 12/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (mro)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 226 SCHEDULING ORDER: The computer search consultants retained by each party are directed to meet promptly (either with or without counsel) to discuss what steps can be taken to increase the efficiency of Pfizer's search for relevant, responsive documents and to expedite the production of Pfizer's documents. To the extent the documents exist in files other than custodial files, Pfizer is to produce the press releases and financial statements requested by plaintiffs no later than November 12, 2010. No later than November 12, 2010, Pfizer's counsel is to confer with Pfizer's counsel in the products liability actions concerning CELEBREX and BEXTRA and either produce the marketing and sales material requested by plaintiffs, confirm that such materials exist only in custodial files or confirm that such materials have already been produced. No later than November 12, 2010, Pfizer is to provide dates for the 30(b)(6) depositions noticed by the securities and ERISA plaintiffs. No later than November 1, 2011, counsel for Pfizer is to advise plaintiffs' counsel of the custodial files currently uploaded and how long it would take to generate a "hit count" for those files. Counsel are directed to appear for a follow-up discovery conference on November 8, 2010 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 18-A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 10/29/2010) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jfe)
October 27, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Status Conference held on 10/27/2010, ( Discovery Hearing set for 11/8/2010 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman.). (mbe)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 225 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs' application to compel production of unredacted versions of PFE ERISA 004668-71 and PFE ERISA 004864-68 is denied. Resolution of plaintiffs' application to compel production of unredacted versions of PFE ERISA 004727-30 and PFE ERISA 005632-35 is adjourned pending further discussions among counsel. A follow-up discovery conference will be held on October 27, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 10/19/2010) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jpo)
October 15, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Status Conference held on 10/15/2010. Another Conference set for 10/27/2010 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (mro)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 224 STIPULATION AND ORDER AND AGREED by the parties in the above-captioned ation, by and through their undersigned counsel as follows: Lead Plaintiff shall file and serve its Motion for Class Certification no later than Friday, January 14, 2011. Defendants shall file and serve their opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification no later than Friday, April 15, 2011. Lead Plaintiff shall file and serve its reply in support of its Motion for class certification no later than Wednesday, June 15, 2011. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 1/14/2011, Responses due by 4/15/2011, Replies due by 6/15/2011.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 9/22/10) (jmi)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER: All fact discovery shall be completed no later than June 1, 2011. Counsel shall report for a status conference at 10:00 a.m. on October 15, 2010 in Courtroom 18A, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Except for (a) 30(b) (6) depositions concerning non-case specific issues such as corporate structure, corporate filing systems, etc., or (b) depositions conducted with the consent of all parties, no depositions shall be conducted prior to September 8, 2010. Defendants were ordered commence production of their documents no later than August 16, 2010. All expert discovery shall be completed by September 23, 2011. The plaintiffs in the ERISA action shall serve and file their motion for class certification no later than September 15, 2010. Defendants' opposition papers shall be served and filed no later than December 15, 2010. The ERISA plaintiffs' reply papers shall be served and filed no later than February 15, 2011. The non-ERISA plaintiffs' motion class certification shall be served and filed no later than November 1, 2010. Defendants' opposition papers shall be served and filed no later than January 31, 2011. Reply papers shall be served and filed no later than March 31, 2011. Dispositive motions, if any, shall be filed no later than October 3, 2011. Briefs in opposition to dispositive motions shall be filed no later than November 17, 2011. Reply briefs shall be filed by December 22, 2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 8/20/2010) Copies Sent By Chambers. (jpo)
July 29, 2010 Filing 222 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jonathan R. Cagan. Document filed by Michael Feitler, Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka. (Sweet, Benjamin)
July 23, 2010 Filing 221 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Benjamin J. Hinerfeld. Document filed by Michael Feitler, Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka. (Sweet, Benjamin)
June 16, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Discovery Hearing held on 6/16/2010. Order to follow. (mro)
June 2, 2010 Filing 220 EXHIBIT 1 to Declaration of Gregory A. Markel and unredacted pages of Defendants' Memorandum In Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint to be filed with the sealed records clerk. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. This Document was originally filed under seal, document #64. (rjm)
June 2, 2010 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: (219 in 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP, 34 in 1:05-md-01688-LTS) Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP(rjm)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER. On May 5, 2010, the Court directed the parties in the above-captioned matter to file submissions as to why docket entry number 64, filed on May 11, 2006, should not be unsealed in light of the common law right of access to judicial documents and the qualified First Amendment right of access to judicial records. The Court is in receipt of the parties' May 28, 2010, submissions. Both parties consent to the unsealing of docket entry number 64. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to unseal docket entry number 64. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/1/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-HBP(rjm)
May 27, 2010 Filing 218 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Jay Hinerfeld on behalf of Michael Feitler, Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka (Hinerfeld, Benjamin)
May 11, 2010 Filing 217 REPLY re: #215 Brief, #200 Order,,,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, #192 Order to Show Cause,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, (Reply Submission re Unsealed Documents). Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Eisenhofer, Jay)
May 11, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Jay Eisenhofer to RE-FILE Document #215 Brief. Use the event type Reply(non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (KA)
May 11, 2010 Filing 216 LETTER: addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gregory A. Markel dated 5/10/2010 re: Counsel for defendants write in connection with the Court's order to show cause dated March 29, 2010. In their Response, Plaintiffs proposed to post those documents unsealed by the Court "on a website that proposed class members can access to obtain information about the lawsuit Plaintiffs Response at 3. While Defendants do not believe this is a proper use of Pfizer's documents, Defendants will not interpose an objection to plaintiffs' proposed posting of those documents unsealed by the Court.. Document filed by Michael Feiterland, Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka, L. Norman Showers, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(js)
May 10, 2010 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to James L. Cott. I hereby close the above Order of Reference for magistrate judge statistical purposes. This case remains open. Reason: On March 2, 2010, this case was assigned to me by the Assignment Committee. On May 6, 2010, I received a copy of a Memorandum dated May 5, 2010 from Judge Swain requesting that this case be reassigned to Magistrate Henry B. Pitman. On May 7, 2010, this case was reassigned to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (mro)
May 10, 2010 Filing 215 FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - BRIEF re: #200 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #192 Order to Show Cause,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Plaintiffs' Reply Submission re Issue of Posting Unsealed Documents). Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Eisenhofer, Jay) Modified on 5/11/2010 (KA).
May 7, 2010 Filing 208 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman, for General Pretrial ( includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Magistrate Judge James L. Cott no longer referred to the case. (ldi)
May 5, 2010 Filing 214 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support of the Pfizer Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc., et al. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #187 and unsealed by doc. #200) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 0821, #2 Exhibit 1615) *NOTE: Exhibits 1515 and 1524 could not be attached because they exceeded the 2.5 MB limit.(tro)
May 5, 2010 Filing 213 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support re: 212 Proposed Findings of Fact, with Respect to: (1) Pfizer Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Plaintiffs' Experts' Opinions Regarding Celebrex and Bextra; and (2) Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony by Defendants' Expert Dr. Lee-Jen Wei. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc., et al. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #179 and unsealed by doc. #200) *NOTE: CD-ROM not provided, unable to attach PDFs. (tro) Modified on 5/7/2010 (tro).
May 5, 2010 Filing 212 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, et al. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #178 and unsealed by doc. #200) *NOTE: CD-ROM not provided, unable to attach PDFs. (tro)
May 5, 2010 Filing 211 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support of Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of their Motion to Exclude Certain Plaintiffs' Experts' Opinions Regarding Celebrex and Bextra. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #164 and unsealed by doc. #200) Document filed by Pfizer, Inc., et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 210, #2 Exhibit 213, #3 Exhibit 416, #4 Exhibit 417, #5 Exhibit 418, #6 Exhibit 419)(tro)
May 5, 2010 Filing 210 DECLARATION of Geoffrey C. Jarvis in Further Support re: #209 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony by Defendants' Expert Dr. Lee-Jen Wei. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #156 and unsealed by doc. #200). Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 25, #2 Exhibit 26, #3 Exhibit 27, #4 Exhibit 28, #5 Exhibit 29, #6 Exhibit 30, #7 Exhibit 31, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 33, #10 Exhibit 34, #11 Certificate of Service)(tro)
May 5, 2010 Filing 209 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #144 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Lee-Jen Wei. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #159 and unsealed by doc. #200) Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (tro)
May 5, 2010 Filing 207 DECLARATION of Lee-Jen Wei in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Bar Testimony. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #156 and unsealed by doc. #200) Document filed by Pfizer, Inc., et al. (tro) *NOTE: PDF not provided.
May 5, 2010 Filing 206 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support of Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony by Defendants' Expert Dr. Lee-Jen Wei. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #156 and unsealed by doc. #200) Document filed by Pfizer, Inc., et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 184, #2 Exhibit 185, #3 Exhibit 186, #4 Errata 187, #5 Exhibit 188, #6 Exhibit 189, #7 Exhibit 194, #8 Exhibit 197, #9 Exhibit 198, #10 Exhibit 200)(tro)
May 5, 2010 Filing 205 DECLARATION of Geoffrey C. Jarvis in Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Plaintiffs' Experts' Opinions regarding Celebrex and Bextra. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #148 and unsealed by doc. #200) Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 003 Conference Call Transcript, #2 Exhibit Pfizer Press Release, #3 Exhibit 005- Maurat-C, #4 Exhibit 006- New York Time Article 11.19.04, #5 Exhibit 007- Motion to Dismiss Hearing, #6 Exhibit 008- Verbur-K, #7 Exhibit 009- Weiner-E, #8 Exhibit 010- Verbur-K, #9 Exhibit 012- Cawkwe-G, #10 Exhibit 013- New York Times Brandt Quote, #11 Exhibit 014- Ex 13 to Form 10-K File Date 03-01-06, #12 Exhibit 015- Baruch May 2009 Rebuttal Report - no appendices, #13 Exhibit 016- Baruch, Lawrence (July 2, 2009), #14 Exhibit 017- Bennett March 2009 Expert Report Signed, #15 Exhibit 018- Bennett May 2009 Rebuttal Report, #16 Exhibit 019- Bennett, Joel (August 18, 2009) Deposition Transcript, #17 Exhibit 020- Bennett ND Cal MDL Deposition of June 11-12, 2007, #18 Exhibit 022- Fitzpatrick April 17, 2009 Expert Report- no appendices, #19 Exhibit 023- Fitzpatrick (8/25/09) deposition tra, #20 Exhibit 024- Furberg March 2009 Expert Report with appendices, #21 Exhibit 025- Furberg, Curt (May 28 & 29, 2009) Deposition Transcript, #22 Exhibit 027- Furberg, Curt (7-11-2009) Deposition Transcript, #23 Exhibit 028- Jewell May 2009 Rebuttal Report, #24 Exhibit 029- Jewell, Nicholas (June 17, 2009) Depo Transcript, #25 Exhibit 030- Kornmal Expert Report, #26 Exhibit 031- Kronmal Rebuttal Report (May 16, 2009), #27 Exhibit 032- Kronmal, Richard (June 3-4, 2009) Depo Transcript, #28 Exhibit 033- Madigan-09, #29 Exhibit 036, #30 Exhibit 037, #31 Exhibit 038, #32 Exhibit 039, #33 Exhibit 040, #34 Exhibit 042, #35 Exhibit 044, #36 Exhibit 046, #37 Exhibit 047, #38 Exhibit 048, #39 Exhibit 049, #40 Errata 050, #41 Exhibit 051, #42 Exhibit 052, #43 Exhibit 053, #44 Exhibit 054, #45 Exhibit 055, #46 Exhibit 056, #47 Errata 057, #48 Exhibit 058, #49 Exhibit 059, #50 Exhibit 060, #51 Exhibit 061, #52 Errata 062, #53 Exhibit 063, #54 Exhibit 064, #55 Exhibit 065, #56 Exhibit 066, #57 Exhibit 069, #58 Exhibit 070, #59 Exhibit 071, #60 Exhibit 072, #61 Exhibit 074, #62 Exhibit 075, #63 Exhibit 076, #64 Exhibit 077, #65 Exhibit 078, #66 Exhibit 079 Vol I, #67 Exhibit 079- Vol II, #68 Exhibit 079 Vol III, #69 Exhibit 082, #70 Exhibit 083, #71 Exhibit 085, #72 Errata 086, #73 Exhibit 089, #74 Exhibit 090, #75 Exhibit 092, #76 Exhibit 093, #77 Exhibit 094, #78 Exhibit 095, #79 Exhibit 096, #80 Exhibit 098, #81 Exhibit 102, #82 Exhibit 103, #83 Exhibit 104, #84 Exhibit 105, #85 Exhibit 106, #86 Exhibit 107, #87 Exhibit 108, #88 Exhibit 109, #89 Exhibit 110, #90 Exhibit 111, #91 Exhibit 112, #92 Exhibit 113, #93 Exhibit 114, #94 Exhibit 115, #95 Exhibit 116, #96 Errata 117, #97 Exhibit 119, #98 Exhibit 120, #99 Exhibit 121, #100 Exhibit 122, #101 Exhibit 123, #102 Exhibit 124, #103 Exhibit 125, #104 Exhibit 126, #105 Exhibit 127, #106 Exhibit 129, #107 Exhibit 130, #108 Exhibit 131) *NOTE: Exhibits 001, 011, 021, 025, 034, 035, 041, 043, 045, 067, 073, 080, 081, 084, 087, 088, 091, 097, 099, 100, 101, 133, and 134 could not be attached because they exceeded the 2.5 MB limit. * SYSTEM ERRORS * in attaching; Exhibit 079- Final Minutes of Feb 16-18 2005 *Document is malformed or contains code which may cause an external action (such as launching an application). This PDF document cannot be accepted. (tro)
May 5, 2010 Filing 204 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Plaintiffs' Experts' Opinions Regarding Celebrex and Bextra.(This document was previously sealed in envelope #148 and unsealed by doc. #200) NOTE: PDF provided on cd-rom could not be attached because it exceeded the 2.5 MB limit. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (tro)
May 5, 2010 Filing 203 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #144 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Lee-Jen Wei. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #147 and unsealed by doc. #200) Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01- Part 1 of 5, #2 Exhibit 01- Part 2 of 5, #3 Exhibit 01- Part 3 of 5, #4 Exhibit 01- Part 4 of 5, #5 Exhibit 01- Part 5 of 5, #6 Exhibit 02, #7 Exhibit 03, #8 Exhibit 04, #9 Exhibit 05, #10 Exhibit 06, #11 Exhibit 07, #12 Exhibit 08, #13 Exhibit 09, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11- Part 1 of 2, #16 Exhibit 11- Part 2 of 2) (tro)
May 5, 2010 Filing 202 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Plaintiffs' Experts' Opinions Regarding Celebrex and Bextra. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc., et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 007, #4 Exhibit 008, #5 Exhibit 009, #6 Exhibit 012, #7 Exhibit 013, #8 Exhibit 019, #9 Exhibit 025, #10 Exhibit 051, #11 Exhibit 061, #12 Exhibit 066, #13 Exhibit 076, #14 Exhibit 078, #15 Exhibit 079, #16 Exhibit 080, #17 Exhibit 085, #18 Exhibit 086, #19 Exhibit 088, #20 Exhibit 097, #21 Exhibit 098, #22 Exhibit 102, #23 Exhibit 103, #24 Exhibit 120, #25 Exhibit 128, #26 Exhibit 132) *NOTE: Exhibits 018, 028, 071, 077, 099, and 127 could not be attached because they exceeded the 2.5 MB limit. * SYSTEM ERRORS * in attaching; Exhibit 133- This document has security measures in effect, such as password protection or access restrictions. This PDF document cannot be accepted; and Exhibit 161- Document is malformed or contains code which may cause an external action (such as launching an application). This PDF document cannot be accepted.)(tro) (This document was previously sealed in envelope #142 and unsealed by doc. #200) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2010: #27 EXHIBIT 1- Expert Report of Prof. Curt. D. Furberg, M.D., PH. D) (tro).
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT MARY S. THOMAS PRO HAC VICE, granting #197 Motion for Mary S. Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/5/10) (pl)
May 5, 2010 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: (33 in 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 33 in 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 200 in 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-JLC, 200 in 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-JLC) Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-JLC(rjm)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER. On March 29, 2010, this Court issued an Order to Show Cause as to why all documents filed under seal in connection with the parties' cross-motions to preclude expert testimony should not be unsealed in light of the common law right of access to judicial documents and the qualified First Amendment right of access to judicial records. In their responses to the Court's Order, neither party objects to unsealing the above-referenced documents. However, Defendants request, with the consent of Plaintiffs, permission to file a reply by May 10, 2010, with respect to the issue of posting unsealed documents on a website. Defendants' submission states that "[t]he [requested] extension [of time to file a reply] would not delay unsealing of the documents." Defendants' request is hereby granted. Any reply to address the issue of posting unsealed documents on a website must be filed and served, with a courtesy copy for Chambers, by Monday, May 10, 2010. The parties are further directed to file submissions (with courtesy copies for Chambers) by Friday, May 28, 2010, as to why docket entry number 64, filed on May 11, 2006, should not be unsealed in light of the common law right of access to judicial documents and the qualified First Amendment right of access to judicial records. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to unseal docket entry numbers 142, 147, 148, 156, 159, 164, 178, 179, and 187. (Replies due by 5/10/2010.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/5/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-JLC(rjm)
April 27, 2010 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #197 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 04/23/2010, Receipt Number 901573. (jd)
April 26, 2010 Filing 199 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #192 Order to Show Cause, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
April 26, 2010 Filing 198 BRIEF re: #192 Order to Show Cause, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Eisenhofer, Jay)
April 23, 2010 Filing 197 MOTION for Mary S. Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(mro)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gregory A. Markel dated 4/9/2010 re: Counsel request a two week adjournment of the time to respond to the Order to Show Cause issued on 3/29/2010 until 4/26/2010. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/9/2010) (tro)
April 9, 2010 Filing 195 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Keith Martin Fleischman on behalf of Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (Fleischman, Keith)
April 9, 2010 Filing 194 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brenda F. Szydlo on behalf of Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (Szydlo, Brenda)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 193 AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER. #98702 The extensive submissions that are the subject of the instant motions satisfy the standards of qualification and reliability established by Federal Rule of Evidence 702 and elucidated in Daubert. While the cross-motions raise significant issues with respect to potential flaws, limitations, and the credibility of the experts' opinions, these concerns go ultimately to the weight of the opinions. Because the Daubert standard is satisfied with respect to all experts whose preclusion was sought, both parties' motions are denied in their entirety. This order resolves docket entry nos. 139 and 144. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/29/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-JLC(rjm) Modified on 4/1/2010 (ajc).
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE... ORDERED, that the parties shall show cause, by written submissions filed and served, with courtesy copies for the Chambers of the undersigned, by Monday, April 12, 2010, as to why all documents filed under seal in connection with this motion practice should not be unsealed in whole or in part in light of the common law right of access to judicial documents and the qualified First Amendment right of access to judicial records. See Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 119 (2d Cir. 2006); United States v. Amodeo, 71 F.3d 1044, 1049 (2d Cir. 1995). Any replies to these initial submissions must be filed and served, with courtesy copies for Chambers, by Monday, April 19, 2010. (Replies due by 4/19/2010.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/29/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS, 1:04-cv-09866-LTS-JLC(rjm)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 OPINION AND ORDER:#98702 The extensive submissions that are the subject of the instant motions satisfy the standards of qualification and reliability established by Federal Rule of Evidence 702 and elucidated in Daubert. While the cross-motions raise significant issues with respect to potential flaws, limitations, and the credibility of the experts' opinions, these concerns go ultimately to the weight of the opinions. Because the Daubert standard is satisfied with respect to all experts whose preclusion was sought, both parties' motions are denied in their entirety. This order resolves docket entry nos. 139 and 144. Motions terminated - #144 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Lee-Jen Wei. #139 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs From Offering Testimony or Opinions From Their Experts. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/22/10) (db) Modified on 3/23/2010 (eef).
March 2, 2010 Filing 190 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott, for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton no longer referred to the case. (ldi)
January 21, 2010 Filing 189 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jay W. Eisenhofer dated 1/15/2010 re: We represent Plaintiffs in the above-referenced action. We write to follow up on our letter dated January 8, 2010, indicating our potential objection to Defendants' filing of new exhibits in connection with defendants' Proposed Findings of Facts and Conclusion of Law, filed on Friday January 8, 2010. Even though the issue to which the new exhibits relates has been fully addressed, and the proposed exhibits adds nothing new, your honor made it clear on October 29, 2009 at the hearing that in their PFF&CL both side were restricted to exhibits on their respective exhibit lists. Document filed by Michael Feiterland, Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka, L. Norman Showers.(mbe)
January 12, 2010 Filing 188 PFIZER DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; Attached hereto is a CD containing additional Exhibits. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (mro)
January 12, 2010 Filing 187 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura T. Swain from Jason M. Halper dated 1/7/2010 re: Defendants request permission to file and serve their Reply Submission in the format further set forth in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: The requested permission is granted, without prejudice to any application to strike material that was not on the prior exhibit list. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/11/2010) (tve)
January 8, 2010 Filing 185 BRIEF re: #175 Proposed Findings of Fact. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
January 8, 2010 Filing 184 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support of the Pfizer Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
January 8, 2010 Filing 183 REPLY /Pfizer Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
December 9, 2009 Filing 181 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW with Plaintiffs' Exhibits (on accompanied USB flash drive). Document filed by Michael Feiterland, Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka, L. Norman Showers. (Filed in hard copy pursuant to Docket Number 180)(mro)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Geoffrey C. Jarvis dated 12/4/2009 re: Plaintiffs respectfully request permission to file and serve the materials requested at the hearing in the format further set forth in this Letter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/8/2009) (tve)
December 8, 2009 Filing 179 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
December 7, 2009 Filing 178 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
December 4, 2009 Filing 182 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura T. Swain from Jason M. Halper dated 12/3/2009 re: At the conclusion of the hearing, the Court stated on the record that the parties could also file the requested USB drives with the Clerk's Office, rather than filing these voluminous exhibits via ECF system or filing paper copies of such exhibits. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel.(mbe)
December 4, 2009 Filing 177 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
December 4, 2009 Filing 176 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support re: #175 Proposed Findings of Fact. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
December 4, 2009 Filing 175 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel.(Markel, Gregory)
December 4, 2009 Filing 174 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jason M. Halper dated 12/3/2009 re: Requesting permission to file and serve the materials requested at the Hearing, as set forth in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: The procedures attached in the final paragraph of the letter are approved. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/3/2009) (jpo)
December 4, 2009 Filing 173 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jason M. Halper dated 12/3/09 re: Defendants respectfully request permission to file and serve the materials requested at the Hearing in the following format: (i) Defendant will electronically file and serve (via the ECF system) their Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law ("PFF&CL") on 12/4/09; (ii) Defendants will serve a hard copy of their PFF&CL, together with a USB Drive containing all of the exhibits Defendants cited at the Hearing, and all exhibits referenced in Defendants' PFF&CL on counsel for Plaintiffs by FedEx on 12/4/09; (iii) Defendants will file a hard copy of their PFF&CL together with a USB drive containing all of the exhibits Defendants cited at the Hearing and all exhibits referenced in Defendants' PFF&CL with the Clerk's Office on 12/7/09; and (iv) Defendants will deliver to the Court on 12/7/09 a hard copy of their PFF&CL together with a USB drive containing all of the exhibits Defendants cited at the Hearing and all exhibits referenced in Defendants' PFF&CL, as well as a complete set of paper copies of the exhibits contained on the USB Drive. As the court requested on 10/4/09, Defendants will certify at the time of filing that the USB drives delivered to the Court and the Clerk's Office on 12/7/09 are free from viruses, spyware and other types of malware. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. The procedures outlined in the final paragraph of the letter are approved. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/3/09) (tro)
November 23, 2009 Filing 172 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on October 29, 2009 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (eef)
November 23, 2009 Filing 171 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on October 19, 20, 21, 22, 2009 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (eef)
October 29, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Daubert Hearing completed on 10/29/2009. The Court reserved it's decision. The Court orders parties to file their proposed findings of facts and conclusions of law (not to exceed 50 pages) by 12/4/09 and responsive papers (not to exceed 30 pages) by 1/8/2010. (mro)
October 22, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Daubert Hearing continued on 10/22/2009. (mro)
October 21, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Daubert Hearing continued on 10/21/2009. (mro)
October 20, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Daubert Hearing continued on 10/20/2009. (mro)
October 19, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Daubert Hearing held on 10/19/2009. (mro)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gregory A. Markel and Jay W. Eisenhofer dated 10/14/2009 re: Requesting an Order authorizing Plaintiffs' and Defendants' counsel and their consultants to bring certain electronic devices into the Courthouse Monday October 19 through Thursday October 22, 2009, in connection with the Daubert hearing to be held before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will authorize the specified items of electronic equipment (i.e. cell phone, blackberry, laptop) for three individuals for each side only. The parties are directed to provide the names of three designees for each side to chambers by October 15, 2009, so that the necessary order can be entered. The request to use the Courtroom Connect service is granted. Contact the District Executive's Office for set up instructions and information. The request to utilize the display and printing devices described in the first full paragraph of page 2 is granted. The parties may have access to the Courtroom for set up on 10/16/2009 at 11:00 a.m. Mr. Reinheimer will be the Chambers contact for the Courtroom access. The use of document protocols proposed are acceptable to the Court. Option 2(i) is preferred. With respect to item 4, the parties are responsible for making the transcript record clear at all times as to what exhibits are being discussed. With respect to item 3, the parties must certify that the USB drives have been checked and are free of viruses, spyware and malware and other types of Malware when they are submitted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/14/2009) (jpo)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jay W. Eisenhofer dated 9/25/2009 re: Accordingly, Plaintiffs request that Defendants be ordered to submit Professor Wei for an immediate, one-half day deposition or, alternatively, order that he be precluded from testifying regarding any of the matters in the Wei September 4 Declaration. The parties have conferred by telephone regarding this issue but have been unable to reach an agreement. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to take this matter up with Magistrate Judge Eaton. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/25/2009) (rw)
September 28, 2009 Filing 169 EXHIBITS to the Reply Declaration of Gregory A. Markel, dated September 25, 2009, in support of defendants' motion to exclude certain plaintiffs' experts' opinion regarding Celebrex and Bextra (Volume 4 of 4). Document filed by Pfizer, Inc..(mbe)
September 28, 2009 Filing 168 EXHIBITS to the Reply Declaration of Gregory A. Markel, dated September 25, 2009, in support of defendants' motion to exclude certain plaintiffs' experts' opinion regarding Celebrex and Bextra (Volume 3 of 4). Document filed by Pfizer, Inc..(mbe)
September 28, 2009 Filing 167 EXHIBITS to the Reply Declaration of Gregory A. Markel, dated September 25, 2009, in support of defendants' motion to exclude certain plaintiffs' experts' opinion regarding Celebrex and Bextra (Volume 2 of 4). Document filed by Pfizer, Inc..(mbe)
September 28, 2009 Filing 166 EXHIBITS to the Reply Declaration of Gregory A. Markel, dated September 25, 2009, in support of defendants' motion to exclude certain plaintiffs' experts' opinion regarding Celebrex and Bextra (Volume 1 of 4). Document filed by Pfizer, Inc..(mbe)
September 28, 2009 Filing 164 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jri)
September 25, 2009 Filing 163 DECLARATION of Geoffrey C. Jarvis in Support re: #144 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Lee-Jen Wei.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26 Sweeting Article, #2 Exhibit 32 Tian Article, #3 Exhibit 33 Nissen Article, #4 Errata ISI Web Report)(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
September 25, 2009 Filing 162 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #144 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Lee-Jen Wei.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Jarvis, Geoffrey)
September 25, 2009 Filing 161 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support re: #139 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs From Offering Testimony or Opinions From Their Experts.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 160 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #139 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs From Offering Testimony or Opinions From Their Experts.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
September 25, 2009 Filing 159 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jri)
September 25, 2009 Filing 158 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jason M. Halper dated 9/24/09 re: Defendants request permission to file and serve the exhibits accompanying their reply brief in support of their Daubert Motion in hard copy format rather than burdening the ECF system with dozens of separate filings. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/25/09) (tro)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: The Court has made the following determinations with respect to the disputed matters and other related issues. The hearing will commence each day at 9:30 a.m., rather than 10:00 a.m. and, in the absence of emergencies or criminal matters requiring immediate attention, will conclude at 5:00 p.m. each day. The midday break will ordinarily be from 12:45 p.m. to 2:00 p.m. Plaintiffs will have a total of 11 hours for opening statement, direct and cross-examination; Defendant will have a total of 9 hours for opening statement, direct and cross-examination. Each side can divide its allocated time as it sees fit. If a party chooses to present all or part of its direct examination of a witness through an affidavit or the designation of portions of the expert's written report(s), such affidavit or designations must be provided to opposing counsel and the Court at least one full business day prior to the day on which the individual is expected to testify. The Court reserves the right to count inordinate delays or unnecessarily extended colloquies against the responsible party's time allocation, in the Court's discretion. The Courtroom Deputy will be the official time keeper. Demonstratives must be disclosed to the opposing party by 3:00 p.m. on the business day prior to the day on which the demonstrative is expected to be used. If necessary, closing arguments will be heard on October 29, 2009, between 9:30 a.m. and 11:30 a.m. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/21/2009) (tve)
September 8, 2009 Filing 156 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jri) Modified on 9/9/2009 (jri).
September 8, 2009 Filing 155 DECLARATION of Dr. Lee-Jen Wei in Opposition re: #144 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Lee-Jen Wei.. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Markel, Gregory)
September 8, 2009 Filing 154 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Opposition re: #144 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Lee-Jen Wei.. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Markel, Gregory)
September 8, 2009 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #144 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Lee-Jen Wei. Pfizer Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony by Defendants' Expert Dr. Lee-Jen Wei. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Markel, Gregory)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jason M. Halper dated 9/3/2009 re: Defendants request permission ro file and serve the exhibits accompanying their Opposition Brief in hard copy format rather than burdening the ECF system with numerous separate filings. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/3/2009) (tve)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Geoffrey C. Jarvis dated 8/25/2009 re: Plaintiffs respectfully request permission to file and serve the exhibits supporting their opposition in hard copy fromat rather than via ECF system. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/31/2009) (tve) Modified on 9/9/2009 (lan).
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STIPULATION AND ORDER; Plaintiff shall file and serve their opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Plaintiffs' Expert Opinions Regarding Celebrex and Bextra no later than Friday, August 28, 2009, with a page limit of no longer than 100 pages. Defendants shall file and serve their opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony by Defendants' Expert Dr. Lee-Jen Wei, Friday, no later than 9/4/2009, with a page limit of no longer than 45 pages. Plaintiffs shall file and serve their reply in support of their motion to Exclude Expert Testimony By Defendants' Expert Dr. Lee-Jen Wei no later than Friday, 9/25/2009, with a page limit of no longer than 20 pages. Defendants shall file and serve their reply in support of their motion to Exclude Certain Plaintiffs' Expert Opinions Regarding Celebrex and Bextra, no later than Friday, 9/25/2009, with a page limit of no longer than 40 pages. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the foregoing extension requests the Daubert hearing is adjourned from 10/5-8/2009, to 10/19-22/2009. The 10/19 proceedings will begin at 10:00 AM. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/31/2009) (tve)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Geoffrey C. Jarvis dated 8/27/09 re: Request Your Honor to endorse this Letter so it will be explicit to the Clerk's office that we have permission to file under seal. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan, part I on 8/28/09) (db)
August 28, 2009 Filing 148 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jri)
July 27, 2009 Filing 147 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jri)
July 23, 2009 Filing 146 DECLARATION of Geoffrey C. Jarvis in Support re: #144 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Lee-Jen Wei.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12 - Conducting a Clinical Safety Review of a New Product Application, #2 Exhibit 13 - Website - Pfizer - How Is Epidemiology Used, #3 Exhibit 14 - Reference Manual on Scientific Evidence, #4 Exhibit 15 - Article - Berlin - A comparison of statistical, #5 Exhibit 16 - Article - Caldwell - Risk of cardiovascular events, #6 Exhibit 17 - Article - Chen & Ashcroft - Risk of myocardial, #7 Exhibit 18 - Article - Dahabreh - Meta-analysis of rare events, #8 Exhibit 19 - Article - Egger - Meta-Analysis, #9 Exhibit 20 - Article - Feinstein - Meta-analysis, statistical alchemy, #10 Exhibit 21 - Jenkins - FDA Memo from FDA Website, #11 Exhibit 22 - Article - Kearney - Do selective cyclo-oxygenase, #12 Exhibit 23 - Article - Sterne - Publication and related bias, #13 Exhibit 24 - Article - Vandenbroucke - In defense of Farr and Nightingale)(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
July 23, 2009 Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #144 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Lee-Jen Wei.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Banko, James)
July 23, 2009 Filing 144 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Lee-Jen Wei. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Banko, James)
July 22, 2009 Filing 143 EXHIBITS (To the Declaration of Gregory A. Markel in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude certain Plaintiffs' Experts' Opinions Regarding Celebrex and Bextra Volume I of VII) (Exhibits 1-161). Document filed by Pfizer, Inc..(mbe)
July 20, 2009 Filing 142 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jri)
July 17, 2009 Filing 141 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support re: #139 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs From Offering Testimony or Opinions From Their Experts.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
July 17, 2009 Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #139 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs From Offering Testimony or Opinions From Their Experts.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
July 17, 2009 Filing 139 MOTION to Preclude Plaintiffs From Offering Testimony or Opinions From Their Experts. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel.(Markel, Gregory)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jason M. Halper dated 7/16/2009 re: Defendants request permission to file and serve the exhibits accompanying their Daubet Motion in hard copy rather than burdening the ECF system with dozens of separate filings. ENDORSEMENT: Permission granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/17/2009) (tve)
July 13, 2009 Filing 137 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jason M. Halper dated 7/9/09 re: Defendants request permission to file an opening memorandum of law not to exceed eighty pages. ENDORSEMENT: The request and reciprocal request are granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/13/09) (tro)
July 1, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #134 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 06/15/2009, Receipt Number 691009. (jd)
June 25, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #132 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 06/04/2009, Receipt Number 690123. (jd)
June 25, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #130 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 06/02/2009, Receipt Number 689726. (jd)
June 22, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #136 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (tro)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting #134 Motion for Jonathan D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jonathan D. Smith is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants in this action. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/22/09) (tro)
June 17, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #135 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jfe)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting #132 Motion for Jonathen R. Cagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/15/2009) (jfe)
June 15, 2009 Filing 134 MOTION for Jonathan D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel.(mbe)
June 9, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #133 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jmi)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Charles Q. Socha to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/8/2009) (jmi)
June 5, 2009 Filing 131 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jay W. Eisenhofer dated 5/27/09 re: Counsel for the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, the Court-appointed Lead Plaintiff, and the proposed Class in this action write in connection with Your Honor's Order of 5/22/09, regarding a potential dispute between the parties that was presented, ex parte, by counsel for defendants to Magistrate Judge Eaton at the recent settlement conference, related to the scope of the hearing that is scheduled to begin on October 5, 2009. Plaintiffs believe that there was no need for the defendants to raise this issue ex parte with Magistrate Judge Eaton during an off-the record settlement conference. Plaintiffs continue to believe that this issue will be resolved without any need for the Court to become involved. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(tro)
June 4, 2009 Filing 132 MOTION for Jonathen R. Cagan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Michael Feiterland, Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka.(tro)
June 2, 2009 Filing 130 MOTION for Charles Q. Socha to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel.(dle)
May 27, 2009 Filing 129 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (Buchanan, David)
May 27, 2009 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Adam Seeger on behalf of Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (Seeger, Christopher)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that after my 5/20/09 conference, I advised Judge Swain as follows: Plaintiffs' expert reports have opined that it was medically unethical for Pfizer not to publicize or circulate certain of the early studies of Celebrex and Bextra. Pfizer wants a ruling on whether such opinions are within the scope of the Daubert hearing that will be held by Judge Swain in October. If the are within the scope, then Pfizer wants to serve additional expert reports opining to the contrary. Judge Swain says that the attorneys should submit this dispute about the scope directly to her. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton on 5/22/09) Copies mailed by chambers. (dle)
May 22, 2009 Filing 126 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cara Dyonne Edwards on behalf of Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel (Edwards, Cara)
May 22, 2009 Filing 125 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Loren H. Brown on behalf of Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel (Brown, Loren)
May 20, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton: Settlement Conference held on 5/20/2009. The parties were unable to reach a settlement. (mro)
April 27, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #124 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 04/09/2009, Receipt Number 683608. (jd)
April 14, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #124 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jfe)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting #123 Motion for Traci Goins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/14/2009) (jfe)
April 6, 2009 Filing 123 MOTION for Traci Goins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana.(dle)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: I enclose a copy of my Standing Order for Discovery Disputes. The Standing Order sets out my rules [or disputes about discovery, including disputes about scheduling. Unless the parties choose a different mediator, I plan to hold a settlement conference prior to June. The attorneys should confer with each other about possible dates and then, at least a month in advance, should place a telephone conference call to my courtroom deputy, Helen Lewis, at 212-805-6183, to schedule a firm date for the settlement conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton on 1/29/2009) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jpo)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Cross Motions due by 8/24/2009, Motions due by 7/13/2009, Replies due by 9/18/2009, Responses due by 8/24/2009, Daubert Hearing set for 10/5/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. All other deadlines are as further set forth in this said order. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/9/2009) (jmi)
December 8, 2008 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 12/1/08 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (pl)
December 3, 2008 Filing 118 NOTICE of of Filing. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lead Plaintiff's 11-25-08 letter to the Court)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
December 3, 2008 Filing 117 NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a - 1, #2 Exhibit a - 2, #3 Exhibit a - 3, #4 Exhibit a - 4, #5 Exhibit a - 5, #6 Exhibit a - 6, #7 Exhibit a - 7, #8 Exhibit a - 8)(Halper, Jason)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER The Court directs the parties in the above-captioned action to file electronically copies of their November 25, 2008, letters, submitted in advance of the December 1, 2008, conference. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/2/2008) (jmi)
December 1, 2008 Filing 121 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton, for General Pretrial. Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger no longer referred to the case. (laq)
December 1, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 12/1/2008. Court Reporter Eve Giniger present. Parties are to submit a schedule update to the Court. (mro)
November 26, 2008 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Joseph Sabella on behalf of Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (Sabella, James)
November 21, 2008 Filing 113 NOTICE of Notice of Change of Firm Name. Document filed by Michael Feiterland. (Zivitz, Andrew)
November 20, 2008 Filing 112 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name. Document filed by Peter F. Muffie, Peter F. Muffie. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS et al.(Torell, Catherine)
November 18, 2008 Filing 114 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for General Purpose. Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (mbe) (mbe).
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial ( includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/3/08) (tro)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/30/2008) (jpo)
October 9, 2008 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #105 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #106 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #107 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $75.00, paid on 9/26/08, Receipt Number 664179. (Quintero, Marcos)
October 7, 2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #108 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #109 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (tro)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #106 Motion for David Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David Kessler is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for the Plaintiffs in this action. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/6/08) (tro)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 Motion for Benjamin J. Sweet to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Benjamin J. Sweet is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for the Plaintiffs in this action. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/6/08) (tro)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Andrew L. Zivitz for Michael Feiterland, Christine Fleckles and Paul Schapka admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/30/2008) (tve)
September 26, 2008 Filing 107 MOTION for Benjamin J. Sweet to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka.(pl)
September 26, 2008 Filing 106 MOTION for David Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka.(pl)
September 26, 2008 Filing 105 MOTION for Andrew Zivitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Feitler, Christine Fleckles, and Paul Schapka. Document filed by Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka.(pl)
September 18, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 9/18/2008 at 4:00pm. Next PTC is scheduled for 11/25/2008 at 4:00pm. (jmi)
September 17, 2008 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharan Nirmul on behalf of Michael Feiterland, Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka (Nirmul, Sharan)
September 15, 2008 Filing 102 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel.(Markel, Gregory)
September 15, 2008 Filing 101 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marc Ira Machiz on behalf of Peter F. Muffie, Peter F. Muffie. New Address: Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C., 225 South 17th Street, Suite 1307, Philadelphia, PA, United States 19103, 267-773-4680. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS et al.(Machiz, Marc)
September 11, 2008 Filing 100 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Marc Ira Machiz on behalf of Peter F. Muffie, Peter F. Muffie. New Address: Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C., 255 S. 17th Street, Suite 1307, Philadelphia, Pennsylvannia, United States 19103, 267-773-4682. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-LTS et al.(Machiz, Marc) Modified on 9/12/2008 (jar).
September 11, 2008 Filing 99 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Michael Feiterland, Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka, Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, L. Norman Showers, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel.(Markel, Gregory)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER: Defendants have failed to satisfy the strict reconsideration standard and the motion for reconsideration is denied. The Court finds that Defendants have failed to satisfy the strict standard required for certification pursuant to Section 1292(b) as to either issue and Defendants' motion for certification is denied. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/4/2008) (jpo)
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jason M. Halper dated 8/7/2008 re: Counsel request permission to submit a reply memorandum of law in further support of Defendant's Reconsideration Brief of up to 5 additional pages. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/11/2008) (jfe)
August 11, 2008 Filing 96 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #93 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #90 Memorandum & Opinion,,,.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Halper, Jason)
July 30, 2008 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #93 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #90 Memorandum & Opinion,,,. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal of the Court's July 1, 2008 Opinion and Order. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
July 16, 2008 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #93 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #90 Memorandum & Opinion,,,. / Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and to Certify an Interlocutory Appeal. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Halper, Jason)
July 16, 2008 Filing 93 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #90 Memorandum & Opinion,,,. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel.(Halper, Jason)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed that the time for defendant's time to file and serve their answer to the consolidated class action complaint be extended through and including September 15, 2008. There have been no prior requests to extend the time for defendant's to answer the complaint. This stipulation and order may be executed in any number of counterparts and shall constitute one agreement binging upon all parties thereto as if parties signed the same document. Facsimile or pdf signatures shall be treated as originals for all purposes. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/16/2008) (jfe)
July 1, 2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2008. (tro)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/18/2008 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/1/08) (tro)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 OPINION AND ORDER #96192: Defendants' motion to dismiss (docket entry #56) is granted as to Counts II, IV, V, and VI, with leave to re-plead all Counts except for Count VI, and is denied in all other respects. Plaintiffs' motion to strike (Docket entry #68) is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate Docket Entry Nos. 56 and 68. Any amended consolidated class action complaint must be filed and served by 7/21/08, with a courtesy copy provided for chambers, and Defendants' response must be served and filed, with a courtesy copy provided for chambers, and Defendants' response must be served and filed, with a courtesy copy provided for chambers, 8/4/08. An order scheduling a pretrial conference will be issued. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/1/08) (tro) (lan). Modified on 7/2/2008 (mr).
June 20, 2008 Filing 89 RESPONSE re: #87 Brief, Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Addendum to Their Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Eisenhofer, Jay)
June 3, 2008 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel re: #87 Brief, / Declaration of Gregory A. Markel in Support of Defendants' Addendum to Their Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Markel, Gregory)
June 3, 2008 Filing 87 BRIEF re: #59 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #57 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #56 MOTION to Dismiss. / Defendants' Addendum to Their Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Markel, Gregory)
May 22, 2008 Filing 86 NOTICE of of LETTER from Jay W. Eisenhofer, Esq. to Judge Laura T. Swain re: #85 Order,,. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - E)(Banko, James)
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER The court has received a copy of Plaintiff's May 12, 2008, letter in the above captioned action. Having reviewed the letter, the court authorizes Plaintiff to electronically file the May 12, 2008, letter. However, the court ORDERS that any future submission to the court by any party to the above captioned action that contains legal argument be submitted in a captioned format as an addendum to the relevant motion papers. Such submissions must be filed electronically with a courtesy copy to this court. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/21/2008) (mme)
May 13, 2008 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. #84 HAS BEEN REJECTED. Note to Attorney James Richard Banko: THE CLERK'S OFFICE DOES NOT ACCEPT LETTERS FOR FILING, either through ECF or otherwise, except where the judge has ordered that a particular letter be docketed. Letters may be sent directly to a judge. (db)
May 12, 2008 Filing 84 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE of LETTER from Jay W. Eisenhofer, Esq. to Judge Laura T. Swain. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - E)(Banko, James) Modified on 5/13/2008 (db).
May 1, 2008 Filing 83 NOTICE of LETTER from James R. Banko, Esq. to Judge Laura T. Swain enclosing previously un-docketed letters re: #82 Order,. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit June 8, 2007 letter - Part 1, #2 Exhibit June 8, 2007 letter - Part 2, #3 Exhibit June 14, 2007 letter - Part 1, #4 Exhibit June 14, 2007 letter - Part 2, #5 Exhibit June 14, 2007 letter - Part 3, #6 Exhibit June 14, 2007 letter - Part 4, #7 Exhibit July 18, 2007 letter, #8 Exhibit July 27, 2007 letter - Part 1, #9 Exhibit July 27, 2007 letter - Part 2, #10 Exhibit November 26, 2007 letter, #11 Exhibit December 5, 2007 letter)(Banko, James)
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: The Court authorizes Plaintiff to electronically file the letters identified in Plaintiff's 1/10/08, letter to the Court. Defendants' counsel will also be permitted to file un-docketed letters that were previously submitted to Judge Casey after identifying the letters it intends to file in a written submission to the Court. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/29/08) (tro)
February 22, 2008 Filing 81 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Richard Owen is no longer assigned to the case. (rdz)
October 16, 2006 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Notice of Additional Authority in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike on 10/13/06. Service was made by FEDEX. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
October 13, 2006 Filing 79 NOTICE of / Defendants' Notice of Additional Authority in Support of their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Markel, Gregory)
September 14, 2006 Filing 78 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Owen from Geoffrey Jarvis dated 9/14/06: the oral argument set for 9/15/06 is rescheduled for 10/13/06 at 2:30 pm. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 9/14/06) (cd, )
September 11, 2006 Filing 77 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #68 MOTION to Strike Document No. [Docket No. 58-62; Exhibits 1, 1a, 2 and 3].. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
September 11, 2006 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT of Gregory A. Markel in Support re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 50#2 Certificate of Service)(Markel, Gregory)
August 18, 2006 Filing 75 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #68 MOTION to Strike Document No. [Docket No. 58-62; Exhibits 1, 1a, 2 and 3]. Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum Of Law In Further Support Of Their Motion To Strike. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jarvis, Geoffrey)
August 2, 2006 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
August 2, 2006 Filing 73 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
August 2, 2006 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #68 MOTION to Strike Document No. [Docket No. 58-62; Exhibits 1, 1a, 2 and 3].. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
August 2, 2006 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41#2 Exhibit 42#3 Exhibit 42-a#4 Exhibit 43#5 Exhibit 44#6 Exhibit 45#7 Exhibit 46#8 Exhibit 47#9 Exhibit 48#10 Exhibit 49)(Markel, Gregory)
June 28, 2006 Filing 70 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Owen from Ronit Setton dated 6/23/06: granting request that oral argument will be held on 9/15/06 re plntfs' Motion to Strike. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 6/27/06) (cd, )
June 20, 2006 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #68 MOTION to Strike Document No. [Docket No. 58-62; Exhibits 1, 1a, 2 and 3].. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Banko, James)
June 20, 2006 Filing 68 MOTION to Strike Document No. [Docket No. 58-62; Exhibits 1, 1a, 2 and 3]. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. Return Date set for 8/11/2006 02:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Banko, James)
June 20, 2006 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney James Richard Banko to RE-FILE Document #66 MOTION to Strike Document No. [Docket No. 62, Exhibits 1, 1a, 2 and 3]. ERROR(S): Filing Error of Attachments. Supporting Documents must be filed separately. Memorandum of Law in support of motion Event Code found under Responses and Replies. (kg)
June 19, 2006 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint (pages 30-59)#2 Certificate of Service)(Banko, James)
June 19, 2006 Filing 66 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Strike Document No. [Docket No. 62, Exhibits 1, 1a, 2 and 3]. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. Return Date set for 8/11/2006 02:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Strike Certain Exhibits Attached to the Declaration of Gregory A. Markel and Related Portions of the Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss#2 Certificate of Service)(Banko, James) Modified on 6/20/2006 (kg).
June 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions due by 5/5/2006. Responses due by 6/19/2006 Replies due by 8/2/2006. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 6/6/06) (pl, )
May 6, 2006 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss, Memorandum of Law, Declaration served on Lead Plaintiff on 05/05/2006. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Markel, Gregory)
May 6, 2006 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31#2 Exhibit 32#3 Exhibit 33#4 Exhibit 34 Part 1 of 5#5 Exhibit 34 Part 2 of 5#6 Exhibit 34 Part 3 or 5#7 Exhibit 34 Part 4 of 5#8 Exhibit 34 Part 5 of 5#9 Exhibit 35 Part 1 of 2#10 Exhibit 35 Part 2 of 2#11 Exhibit 36-a#12 Exhibit 36-b#13 Exhibit 36-c#14 Exhibit 36-d#15 Exhibit 37A#16 Exhibit 37B#17 Exhibit 37C#18 Exhibit 37D#19 Exhibit 37E#20 Exhibit 38 Part 1 of 2#21 Exhibit 38 Part 2 of 2#22 Exhibit 39 Part 1 of 2#23 Exhibit 39 Part 2 of 2#24 Exhibit 40 Part 1of 5#25 Exhibit 40 Part 2 of 5#26 Exhibit 40 Part 3 of 5#27 Exhibit 40 Part 4 of 5#28 Exhibit 40 Part 5 of 5)(Markel, Gregory)
May 6, 2006 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21-g#2 Exhibit 21-h#3 Exhibit 21-i#4 Exhibit 22#5 Exhibit 23-a#6 Exhibit 23-b#7 Exhibit 23-c#8 Exhibit 23-d#9 Exhibit 23-e#10 Exhibit 23-f#11 Exhibit 23-g#12 Exhibit 23-h#13 Exhibit 24#14 Exhibit 25 Part 1 of 4#15 Exhibit 25 Part 2 of 4#16 Exhibit 25 Part 3 of 4#17 Exhibit 25 Part 4of 4#18 Exhibit 26 Part 1 of 2#19 Exhibit 26 Part 2 of 2#20 Exhibit 27#21 Exhibit 28#22 Exhibit 29#23 Exhibit 29a#24 Exhibit 30A#25 Exhibit 30B)(Markel, Gregory)
May 5, 2006 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16-a#2 Exhibit 16-b#3 Exhibit 16-c#4 Exhibit 17#5 Exhibit 18#6 Exhibit 19#7 Exhibit 20#8 Exhibit 21-a#9 #10 Exhibit 21-c#11 Exhibit 21-d#12 Exhibit 21-e#13 Exhibit 21-f)(Markel, Gregory)
May 5, 2006 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Dismiss - Part 2 of 5#2 Motion to Dismiss - Part 3 of 5#3 Motion to Dismiss - Part 4 of 5#4 Motion to Dismiss - Part 5 of 5)(Markel, Gregory)
May 5, 2006 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Markel in Support re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 1a#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5-a#7 Exhibit 5-b#8 Exhibit 6#9 Exhibit 7#10 Exhibit 8-a#11 Exhibit 8-b#12 Exhibit 8-c#13 Exhibit 8-d#14 Exhibit 8-e#15 Exhibit 8-f#16 Exhibit 8-g#17 Exhibit 9#18 Exhibit 10#19 Exhibit 11#20 Exhibit 12#21 Exhibit 13#22 Exhibit 14#23 Exhibit 15)(Markel, Gregory)
May 5, 2006 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Dismiss - Part 2 of 5#2 Motion to Dismiss - Part 3 of 5#3 Motion to Dismiss - Part 4 of 5#4 Motion to Dismiss - Part 5 of 5)(Markel, Gregory)
May 5, 2006 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. Responses due by 6/19/2006 Return Date set for 9/15/2006 02:30 PM. (Markel, Gregory)
April 25, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #55 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 4/25/2006, Receipt Number 577577. (jd, )
April 19, 2006 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #55 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (db, )
April 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Geoffrey C. Jarvis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 4/19/06) (db, )
March 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 05-6492-op(L); 06-0033-op(CON). It is Ordered that the petitions for writs of mandamus are DENIED because petitoners do not present exceptional cases warranting the requested relief. Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk USCA. Certified: 3/14/06. (tp, )
March 17, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #52 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #49 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 3/14/2006, Receipt Number 572615. (jd, )
February 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: lead plaintiff shall file the complaint on or before 2/16/06; defendants shall answer to the complaint by 4/28/06; should defendants file a motion to dismiss the complaint, lead plaintiff shall file a response thereto on 6/12/06; defendants shall file a reply to lead plaintiff's response on or before 7/21/06. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 2/22/06) (jco, )
February 23, 2006 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #52 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jco, )
February 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Brian M. Rostocki to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 2/22/06) (jco, )
February 16, 2006 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Michael Feiterland, Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana(sac, )
February 16, 2006 Filing 51 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Gail Cawkwell, Joseph M. Feczko, Karen L. Katen, John L. LaMattina, Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel. Document filed by Michael Feiterland, Christine Fleckles, Paul Schapka, Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. Received in the night deposit box on 2/16/06 at 8:21 p.m.. (Attachments: #1 #2)(sac, )
February 7, 2006 Filing 50 MOTION for an order, admitting Brian M. Rostocki to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (sac, )
February 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Stephen G. Grygiel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 2/2/06) (js, )
January 26, 2006 Filing 48 MOTION for an order, admitting Stephen G. Grygiel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (sac, )
January 26, 2006 Filing 47 MOTION for Geoffrey C. Jarvis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (dle, )
January 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Now therefore Lead plaintiff and defendants agree to the following schedule for the filing of the complaint and any reponses thereto, subject to the approval of the Court. The plaintiff shall file the complaint on or before 2/2/06. Defendants shall answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 4/6/06 Responses due by 6/5/2006 Replies due by 7/7/2006. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 1/20/06) (js, )
January 20, 2006 Non-Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Non-Appeal Electronic Files USCA Case Number 06-0003, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp, )
December 16, 2005 Filing 45 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Mario Alba, Jr on behalf of Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund, West Virginia Investment Management Board. New Address: Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP, 58 South Service Road, Suite 200, Melville, NY, United States 11747, 631-367-7100. (Alba, Mario)
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 3/27/2006. Responses due by 5/26/2006 Replies due by 6/27/2006. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 11/16/2005) (jmi, )
October 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION & ORDER, # 92319 re: #8 MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana And Fjarde AP Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Notice of Motion to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana And Fjarde AP Fonden (AP4) For Consolidati filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4); #34 MOTION for Donald J. Enright to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by L. Norman Showers; #35 MOTION for Stuart L. Berman, Darren J. Check, and Sean M. Handler to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana, Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4).The actions are hereby consolidated under the caption "In re Pfizer Inc. Securities Litigation." under File Number 04cv9866 (RO) with following Member Cases: 04civ9967, 04civ10001, 04civ10224, 04civ10296 and 05civ125, 05civ983, 05civ2076, 05civ5715, 05civ5716 and 05civ5717. The Court appoints TRSL as lead plaintiff and designates Grant & Eisenhofer P.A. as lead counsel. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 10/21/05) (sac, ) Modified on 10/25/2005 (sao, ).
September 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1: All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case, shall complete & file a CM/ECF attorney registration form (which can be found on the court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov.); All attorneys who wish to be admitted for purposes of this case shall send a motion to be admitted pro hac vice to John Sacco at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, Room 249, New York, NY 10007. In addition to the documentation required by the Local Rules for the Southern & Eastern Districts of NY, Civil Rule 1.3, attorneys wishing to appear pro hac vice must also include w/their motion a check for $25.00 payable to the Clerk of the Court & a completed CM/ECF attorney registration form; All documents filed in the MDL case & the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov; Amended complaints & supplemental pleadings shall provide a list of the additional parties & indicate the action or actions to which they are being added. Similarly, a filing removing parties shall indicate the parties being removed and the action or actions from which they are being removed. A filing which adds a party or parties who has not been named in any of the consolidated actions shall provide a separate listing of such parties, indicating that they have not yet been named. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 9/15/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-RO,1:04-cv-09866-RO,1:04-cv-09967-RO,1:04-cv-10001-RO,1:04-cv-10071-RO, 1:04-cv-10075-RO,1:04-cv-10085-RO,1:04-cv-10096-RO,1:04-cv-10098-RO,1:04-cv-10118-RO, 1:04-cv-10141-RO,1:04-cv-10224-RO,1:04-cv-10257-RO,1:04-cv-10296-RO,1:05-cv-00051-RO, 1:05-cv-00125-RO,1:05-cv-00735-RO,1:05-cv-00983-RO,1:05-cv-01308-RO,1:05-cv-01920-RO, 1:05-cv-02017-RO,1:05-cv-02076-RO,1:05-cv-02510-RO,1:05-cv-02874-RO,1:05-cv-05715-RO, 1:05-cv-05716-RO,1:05-cv-05717-RO,1:05-cv-05719-RO,1:05-cv-05720-RO,1:05-cv-05721-RO, 1:05-cv-06327-RO(rjm, )
September 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE on attached Motion GRANTING Admission pro hac vice of attorney Marc I. Machiz, an attorney of the firm Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, PLLC, counsel to the plaintiff in this action. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 9/15/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-RO,1:04-cv-09866-RO,1:04-cv-09967-RO,1:04-cv-10001-RO,1:04-cv-10071-RO, 1:04-cv-10075-RO,1:04-cv-10085-RO,1:04-cv-10096-RO,1:04-cv-10098-RO,1:04-cv-10118-RO, 1:04-cv-10141-RO,1:04-cv-10224-RO,1:04-cv-10257-RO,1:04-cv-10296-RO,1:05-cv-00051-RO, 1:05-cv-00125-RO,1:05-cv-00735-RO,1:05-cv-00983-RO,1:05-cv-01308-RO,1:05-cv-01920-RO, 1:05-cv-02017-RO,1:05-cv-02076-RO,1:05-cv-02510-RO,1:05-cv-02874-RO,1:05-cv-05715-RO, 1:05-cv-05716-RO,1:05-cv-05717-RO,1:05-cv-05719-RO,1:05-cv-05720-RO,1:05-cv-05721-RO, 1:05-cv-06327-RO(rjm, )
September 14, 2005 Filing 40 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Avi Rosenfeld on behalf of L. Norman Showers. New Address: Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP, 655 West Broadway, Suite 1900, San Diego, CA, USA 92101, 619-231-1058. (Rosenfeld, David)
August 22, 2005 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance of Arvind Khurana served on 1. John Emerson of Emerson Poynter, LLP; 2. David M. Goldstein; 3. Geoffrey M. Johnson; 4. Edwin Mills of Stull, Stull & Brody; 5. Scott Poynter of Emerson Poynter, LLP; 6. Gerald L. Rutledge; 7. Michael Swick of The Law Offices of Michael A. Swick, PLLC; 8. Paul Warner of Reich & Binstock; 9. Alfred Yates of The Law Offices of Alfred G. Yates Jr. on August 22, 2005. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Dennis R. Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance of Arvind Khurana)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-RO,1:04-cv-09866-RO,1:04-cv-09967-RO,1:04-cv-10001-RO,1:04-cv-10071-RO, 1:04-cv-10075-RO,1:04-cv-10085-RO,1:04-cv-10096-RO,1:04-cv-10098-RO,1:04-cv-10118-RO, 1:04-cv-10141-RO,1:04-cv-10224-RO,1:04-cv-10257-RO,1:04-cv-10296-RO,1:05-cv-00051-RO, 1:05-cv-00125-RO,1:05-cv-00735-RO,1:05-cv-00983-RO,1:05-cv-01308-RO,1:05-cv-01920-RO, 1:05-cv-02017-RO,1:05-cv-02076-RO,1:05-cv-02510-RO,1:05-cv-02874-RO,1:05-cv-05715-RO, 1:05-cv-05716-RO,1:05-cv-05717-RO,1:05-cv-05719-RO,1:05-cv-05720-RO,1:05-cv-05721-RO(Khurana, Arvind)
August 22, 2005 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance of Arvind Khurana served on 1. John Emerson of Emerson Poynter, LLP; 2. David M. Goldstein; 3. Geoffrey M. Johnson; 4. Edwin Mills of Stull, Stull & Brody; 5. Scott Poynter of Emerson Poynter, LLP; 6. Gerald L. Rutledge; 7. Michael Swick of The Law Offices of Michael A. Swick, PLLC; 8. Paul Warner of Reich & Binstock; 9. Alfred Yates of The Law Offices of Alfred G. Yates Jr. on August 22, 2005. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Frank Bambino. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance of Arvind Khurana)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01688-RO,1:04-cv-09866-RO,1:04-cv-09967-RO,1:04-cv-10001-RO,1:04-cv-10071-RO, 1:04-cv-10075-RO,1:04-cv-10085-RO,1:04-cv-10096-RO,1:04-cv-10098-RO,1:04-cv-10118-RO, 1:04-cv-10141-RO,1:04-cv-10224-RO,1:04-cv-10257-RO,1:04-cv-10296-RO,1:05-cv-00051-RO, 1:05-cv-00125-RO,1:05-cv-00735-RO,1:05-cv-00983-RO,1:05-cv-01308-RO,1:05-cv-01920-RO, 1:05-cv-02017-RO,1:05-cv-02076-RO,1:05-cv-02510-RO,1:05-cv-02874-RO,1:05-cv-05715-RO, 1:05-cv-05716-RO,1:05-cv-05717-RO,1:05-cv-05719-RO,1:05-cv-05720-RO,1:05-cv-05721-RO(Khurana, Arvind)
June 21, 2005 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED TO 1:05-md-1688. (kkc, )
June 21, 2005 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Case consolidated with 1:05-md-1688. (kkc, )
June 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - Southern District of New York, Case Number: 1:04-cv-9866, MDL Number: MDL 1688. (Signed by Judge MDL Panel on 6/16/5) (laq, )
April 27, 2005 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/8/05 before Judge Richard Owen. (mo, )
April 11, 2005 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DOCUMENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Sidney Liebesman that Document #11 MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana and Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Proposed Order Granting The Motion Of The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) For C. have been attached to Document # 8 Notice of Motion. Proposed Orders are not docketed separately. (lan, )
April 11, 2005 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DOCUMENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Sidney Liebesman to RE-FILE Document #10 MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana and Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman In Further Support Of The Motion Of The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana. Use the document type Declaration in Support of Motion found under the document list Response and Replies. (lan, )
April 11, 2005 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DOCUMENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Sidney Liebesman to RE-FILE Document #9 MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana's and Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Memorandum of Law In Support of The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana's And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP. Use the document type Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion found under the document list Responses and Replies. (lan, )
April 8, 2005 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Owen : Motion Hearing held on 4/8/2005; Remark: re: #7 MOTION to Appoint CI Funds Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). filed by CI Funds Group, #12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia In filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, West Virginia Investment Management Board, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund, Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund,, #8 MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana And Fjarde AP Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Notice of Motion to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana And Fjarde AP Fonden (AP4) For Consolidati filed by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana,, Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4),, #5 MOTION to Appoint Hollywood Police Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s). filed by Hollywood Police Pension Fund,, #6 MOTION to Appoint Steelworkers Pension Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s). filed by Steelworkers Pension Trust,, #23 MOTION to Appoint Thomas Kuntz and John Rovegno to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Originally Filed In 05-CV-00125 on 2/15/05. filed by Ronald Hodge,. Decision is Reserved. (Court Reporter: Toni Stanley) (ae, )
April 7, 2005 Filing 35 MOTION for Stuart L. Berman, Darren J. Check, Sean M. Handler and Richard S. Schiffrin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4), Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (cd, )
April 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that Pfizer's rquest to stay tomorrow's motion for consolidation and appointment of lead plntf dated 4/5/05 pending the resolution of their motion pending before the MDL is denied. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 4/7/05) (cd, )
April 6, 2005 Filing 34 MOTION for Donald J. Enright to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiff. Document filed by L. Norman Showers. (cd, )
March 23, 2005 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Michael Halper on behalf of all defendants (Halper, Jason)
March 23, 2005 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Arthur Markel on behalf of Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel (Markel, Gregory)
March 23, 2005 Filing 30 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Pfizer, Inc., Henry A. McKinnel.(Markel, Gregory)
March 16, 2005 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Sidney S. Liebesman in Support re: #9 MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana's and Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Memorandum of Law In Support of The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana's And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP. Document filed by Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4), Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N)(Liebesman, Sidney)
March 16, 2005 Filing 28 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana's and Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Memorandum of Law In Support of The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana's And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP And In Opposition To Various Competing Motions For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff. Document filed by Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4), Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A#2 Appendix B)(Liebesman, Sidney)
March 16, 2005 Filing 27 FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia In The Institutional Investor Group's Consolidated Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Its Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff. Document filed by Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Joint Declaration#2 Supplement Condon Declaration#3 Supplement Partnoy Declaration#4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Partnoy Declaration)(Rosenfeld, David)
March 16, 2005 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman in Support re: #12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia In. Document filed by Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A#2 Exhibit Ex B#3 Exhibit Ex C#4 Exhibit Ex D#5 Exhibit Ex E#6 Exhibit Ex F#7 Exhibit Ex G)(Rosenfeld, David)
March 16, 2005 Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION to Appoint CI Funds Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by CI Funds Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 4)#4 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 4)#5 Exhibit B (Part 3 of 4)#6 Exhibit B (Part 4 of 4)#7 Exhibit C#8 Exhibit D#9 Exhibit E#10 Exhibit F#11 Certificate of Service)(Isquith, Frederick)
March 16, 2005 Filing 24 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #23 MOTION to Appoint Thomas Kuntz and John Rovegno to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Originally Filed In 05-CV-00125 on 2/15/05.. Document filed by Ronald Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Trinko, Curtis)
March 9, 2005 Filing 23 MOTION to Appoint Thomas Kuntz and John Rovegno to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Originally Filed In 05-CV-00125 on 2/15/05. Document filed by Ronald Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion of Thomas Kuntz and John Rovegno for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, and for Approval of Selection of Co-Lead Counsel#2 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Silverstein In Support Of Motion of Thomas Kuntz and John Rovegno for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, and Approval of Selection of Co-Lead Counsel#3 Exhibits to Declaration of Jeffrey B. Silverstein#4 Certificate of Service)(Trinko, Curtis)
March 4, 2005 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Frank Partnoy in Support of the Institutional Investor Group in Support re: #12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia In. Document filed by Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A#2 Exhibit Ex. B)(Rosenfeld, David)
March 4, 2005 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Samuel Rudman in Support re: #12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia In. Document filed by Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A#2 Exhibit Ex. B#3 Exhibit Ex. C#4 Exhibit Ex. D#5 Exhibit Ex. E#6 Exhibit Ex. F#7 Exhibit Ex. G#8 Exhibit Ex, H#9 Exhibit Ex. I#10 Exhibit Ex. J#11 Exhibit Ex. K#12 Exhibit Ex. L#13 Exhibit Ex. M#14 Exhibit Ex. N#15 Exhibit Ex. O#16 Exhibit Ex. P#17 Exhibit Ex. Q#18 Exhibit Ex. R)(Rosenfeld, David)
March 4, 2005 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #7 MOTION to Appoint CI Funds Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., #12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia In, #5 MOTION to Appoint Hollywood Police Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., #6 MOTION to Appoint Steelworkers Pension Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s). CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the Motion by Teachers' Retirement System of LA and Fjarde AP-Fonden for Their Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and in Opposition to Various Competing Motions For Appointment as Lead Plaintiff with Declaration of S. Liebesman in Support of TRSL and Fjarde AP-Fonden and in Opposition to Competing Motions. Document filed by Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4), Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Liebesman, Sidney)
March 4, 2005 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support re: #12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia In The Institutional Investor Group's Consolidated Memorandum of Law In Opposition to the Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff. Document filed by Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund. (Rosenfeld, David)
March 4, 2005 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Sidney S. Liebesman in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia In, #5 MOTION to Appoint Hollywood Police Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., #6 MOTION to Appoint Steelworkers Pension Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., #7 MOTION to Appoint CI Funds Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4), Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O#16 Exhibit P#17 Exhibit Q)(Liebesman, Sidney)
March 4, 2005 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #7 MOTION to Appoint CI Funds Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., #12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia In, #5 MOTION to Appoint Hollywood Police Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., #6 MOTION to Appoint Steelworkers Pension Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Memo of Law in Further Support of the Motion by Teachers Retirement System of LA and Fjarde AP-Fonden for their Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and in Opposition to Various Competing Motions For Appointment as Lead Plaintiff. Document filed by Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4), Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Liebesman, Sidney)
March 4, 2005 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia In, #5 MOTION to Appoint Hollywood Police Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., #6 MOTION to Appoint Steelworkers Pension Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., #8 MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana And Fjarde AP Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Notice of Motion to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana And Fjarde AP Fonden (AP4) For Consolidati, #9 MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana's and Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Memorandum of Law In Support of The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana's And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP, #10 MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana and Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman In Further Support Of The Motion Of The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana, #11 MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana and Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Proposed Order Granting The Motion Of The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) For C. Document filed by CI Funds Group. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration In Support#2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration#3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration#4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration#5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration#6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration#7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration#8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration#9 Certificate of Service)(Isquith, Frederick)
March 4, 2005 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia In, #5 MOTION to Appoint Hollywood Police Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., #6 MOTION to Appoint Steelworkers Pension Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., #7 MOTION to Appoint CI Funds Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., #8 MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana And Fjarde AP Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Notice of Motion to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana And Fjarde AP Fonden (AP4) For Consolidati. Document filed by Ronald Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Trinko, Curtis)
February 14, 2005 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman in Support re: #12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia In. Document filed by Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund, West Virginia Investment Management Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - notice#2 Exhibit B - loss chart#3 Exhibit C - certification#4 Exhibit C - certification#5 Exhibit C - certification#6 Exhibit C - certification#7 Exhibit C - certification#8 Exhibit D - firm resume)(Alba, Mario)
February 14, 2005 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia In. Document filed by Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund, West Virginia Investment Management Board. (Alba, Mario)
February 14, 2005 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund and West Virginia Investment Management Board to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Amalgamated Bank, as Trustee for the Longview Collective Investment Fund, Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Unite National Retirement Fund, West Virginia Investment Management Board. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alba, Mario)
February 14, 2005 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana and Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Proposed Order Granting The Motion Of The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) For Consolidation, The Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff And For The Approval Of Its Selection Of Counsel. Document filed by Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4), Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Liebesman, Sidney) Modified on 4/11/2005 (lan, ).
February 14, 2005 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana and Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman In Further Support Of The Motion Of The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) For Consolidation, The Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff And For The Approval Of Its Selection Of Counsel. Document filed by Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4), Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman In Further Support Of The Motion Of The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) For Consolidation, The Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff And For The Approval Of Its Selection Of Counsel#2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman In Further Support Of The Motion Of The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) For Consolidation, The Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff And For The Approval Of Its Selection Of Counse#3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman In Further Support Of The Motion Of The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) For Consolidation, The Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff And For The Approval Of Its Selection Of Counse#4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman In Further Support Of The Motion Of The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) For Consolidation, The Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff And For The Approval Of Its Selection Of Counse#5 Exhibit Exhibit Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman In Further Support Of The Motion Of The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) For Consolidation, The Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff And For The Approval Of Its Selection Of Counsel#6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration of Sidney S. Liebesman In Further Support Of The Motion Of The Teachers' Retirement System Of Louisiana And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) For Consolidation, The Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff And For The Approval Of Its Selection Of Counse)(Liebesman, Sidney) Modified on 4/11/2005 (lan, ).
February 14, 2005 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana's and Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Memorandum of Law In Support of The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana's And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4)'s Motion For Consolidation, The Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff And For The Approval Of Its Selection Of Counsel. Document filed by Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4), Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana's And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4)'s Motion For Consolidation, The Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff And For The Approval Of Its Selection Of Counsel#2 Certificate of Service for Memorandum of Law In Support of The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana's And Fjarde AP-Fonden (AP4)'s Motion For Consolidation, The Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff And For The Approval Of Its Selection Of Counsel)(Liebesman, Sidney) Modified on 4/11/2005 (lan, ).
February 14, 2005 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana And Fjarde AP Fonden (AP4) to serve as lead plaintiff(s) as Notice of Motion to Appoint The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana And Fjarde AP Fonden (AP4) For Consolidation, The Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and For the Approval Of Its Selection Of Counsel. Document filed by Fjarde AP- Fonden (AP4), Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion of The Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana And Fjarde AP Fonden (AP4) for Consolidation, The Appointment of Lead Plaintiff And For The Approval Of Its Selection of Counsel)(Liebesman, Sidney)
February 14, 2005 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint CI Funds Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by CI Funds Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order#2 Memorandum In Support#3 Certificate of Service#4 Declaration in Support#5 Exhibit A to Declaration#6 Exhibit B to Declaration#7 Exhibit C to Declaration#8 Exhibit D to Declaration#9 Exhibit E to Declaration#10 Exhibit F to Declaration#11 Exhibit G to Declaration#12 Exhibit H to Declaration#13 Exhibit I to Declaration#14 Exhibit J to Declaration#15 Exhibit K to Declaration#16 Exhibit L to Declaration#17 Exhibit M to Declaration#18 Exhibit N to Declaration#19 Exhibit O to Declaration)(Isquith, Frederick)
February 14, 2005 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Steelworkers Pension Trust to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Steelworkers Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order#2 Memorandum in Support#3 Declaration in Support#4 Exhibit A to Declaration#5 Exhibit B to Declaration#6 Exhibit C to Declaration#7 Exhibit D to Declaration#8 Exhibit E to Declaration#9 Certificate of Service)(Isquith, Frederick)
February 14, 2005 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Hollywood Police Pension Fund to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Hollywood Police Pension Fund. Return Date set for 3/4/2005 02:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C)(Prussin, H.)
February 10, 2005 Mailed notice to the attorney(s) of record. (gf, )
February 7, 2005 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard Owen. Judge Harold Baer no longer assigned to the case. (gf, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2005 (gf, ).
January 27, 2005 Mailed notice to the attorney(s) of record. (gf, )
January 21, 2005 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Harold Baer. Judge Louis L. Stanton no longer assigned to the case. (gf, )
January 13, 2005 Mailed notice to the attorney(s) of record. (laq, )
January 12, 2005 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Michael B. Mukasey no longer assigned to the case. (laq, )
December 15, 2004 Case Designated ECF. (gf, )
December 15, 2004 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (gf, )
December 15, 2004 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (gf, )
December 15, 2004 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Henry A. McKinnel, Pfizer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 150.00, Receipt Number 529086)Document filed by L. Norman Showers.(gf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Pfizer Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Pfizer Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MICHAEL J RINIS
Search News