Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft v. Onebeacon America Insurance Company et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP sued defendants OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Seaton Insurance Company and Cavell USA Inc. for refusing to pay for legal services rendered, as well as engaging in unfair and deceptive trade practices to coerce plaintiff to settle for substantially less than it was owed.

Plaintiff: Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft
Defendant: Onebeacon America Insurance Company, Seaton Insurance Company and Cavell USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2005cv04244
Filed: April 28, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Richard M. Berman
Presiding Judge: Ronald L. Ellis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 14
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; the first and sixth causes of action, the two claims remaining, are dismissed with prejudice without costs to either party. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 11/16/05) (dle, )
August 24, 2005 Filing 13
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Berman from Michael K. Robles dated 8/23/05 re: request that the Court stay its 8/12/05 Order of Discontinuance. No problem (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 8/24/05) (yv, )
August 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 12
ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE; that this action shall be and the same hereby is, discontinued. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 8/12/05) (pl, )
July 15, 2005 Filing 11
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Peter C. Contino dated 7/13/05 re: take up issue of further extension with Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (Time - (pre-motion conference) - extended to 7/26/05). (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/15/05) (db, )
July 13, 2005 Filing 10
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard M. Berman from Peter C. Contino dated 7/12/05 re: Counsel for defendants writes to request that the Court schedule a pre-motion conference. Conference on 8/10/05 @ 9:45 a.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/13/05) (jco, )
July 7, 2005 Filing 9
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Extension of Time Correspondence to Judge Berman regarding request to so-order stipulation extending defendant's time to answer. Document filed by Onebeacon America Insurance Company, Seaton Insurance Company, Cavell USA Inc.(Contino, Peter) Modified on 7/8/2005 (kg).
June 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 8
ORDER that a pretrial conference will be held in this case by the Judge on 7/26/05 at 2:30 p.m. in courtroom 20A, 500 Pearl Street as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 6/24/05) (dle, )
June 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 7
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for general pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 6/20/05) (djc, )
May 6, 2005 Filing 5
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Seaton Insurance Company served on 5/2/2005, answer due 5/23/2005. Service was accepted by John Partridge. Document filed by Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft. (cd, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2005 (tr, ).
April 28, 2005 Filing 1
COMPLAINT against Onebeacon America Insurance Company, Seaton Insurance Company, Cavell USA Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 541957)Document filed by Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft.(jog, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2005 (tr, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft v. Onebeacon America Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft
Represented By: John Francis Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onebeacon America Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter C. Contino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaton Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter C. Contino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavell USA Inc.
Represented By: Peter C. Contino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?