Sanders v. Madison Square Garden, L.P. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Anucha Browne Sanders alleged that defendant Isiah Lord Thomas III sexually harassed plaintiff and that defendant Madison Square Garden, L.P. discharged her in retaliation for her complaints of discrimination.

Plaintiff: Anucha Browne Sanders
Defendant: Madison Square Garden, L.P., Isiah Lord Thomas, III and James L. Dolan
Case Number: 1:2006cv00589
Filed: January 24, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Debra C. Freeman
Presiding Judge: Gerard E. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2007 Filing 127
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 126 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial.. Document filed by Isiah Lord Thomas, III. (Pechman, Louis)
October 12, 2007 Filing 123
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION to Continue (Post Trial Briefing Schedule)(LETTER). Document filed by Isiah Lord Thomas, III.(Pechman, Louis) Modified on 10/15/2007 (KA).
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 119
ORDER: This order address the dfts' objections and counter-designations to plt's deposition designations, and certain related matters, as set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 9/5/2007) (jar)
September 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 118
OPINION AND ORDER #95139: Accordingly, plaintiff's motion to exclude evidence of the settlement discussions is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 9/4/07) (js) Modified on 9/6/2007 (Martin, Leslie).
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 117
ORDER: Accordingly, the parties various motions in limine are disposed of as set forth above with respect to each such motion. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 9/4/07) (js)
August 15, 2007 Filing 116
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gerard E. Lynch from Kevin T. Mintzer dated 8/15/07 re: Counsel writes concerning a discovery issue. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's application is denied. The issue of plaintiff's alleged tax misconduct has been in this case since (at the latest) plaintiff's production of her tax returns in November 2006, many months before discovery closed in March 2007. Plaintiff's belated effort to reopen discovery relating to this issue nearly six months after the close of discovery and less than a month before trial, is without merit. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 8/15/07) (jco)
August 13, 2007 Filing 115
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gerard E. Lynch from kevin Mintzer dated 8/10/07 re: Plaintiff request that the Court extend the deadline to file the pre trial order, motions in limine, requests to charge and proposed voir dire questions until 8/22. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered.Motions in limine due by 8/22/2007. Pretrial Order due by 8/22/2007. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 8/10/07) (cd)
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114
OPINION AND ORDER # 95006 re: denying 61 FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Isiah Lord Thomas, III, denying 54 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Anucha Browne Sanders, denying 67 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by James L. Dolan, Madison Square Garden, L.P. The parties are directed to submit a joint pre-trial order by 8/17/07. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 8/6/07) (pl) Modified on 8/7/2007 (rw).
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 113
ORDER granting 53 Motion for Kathleen L. Bogas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close the motion (Doc. #53) for all internal statistical purposes. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 8/2/07) (jco)
July 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 109
OPINION AND ORDER # 94858 re: 81 MOTION to Amend/Correct MSG's Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Madison Square Garden, L.P. For the forgoing reasons, MSG's motion to amend its answer is denied. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 7/2/2007) (jar) Modified on 7/3/2007 (rw).
June 29, 2007 Filing 99
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Miguel Angel Estrada on behalf of Madison Square Garden, L.P., James L. Dolan (Estrada, Miguel)
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52
ORDER; The parties are instructed to file the redacted motions in the Court's public docket, and to file unredacted copies of the motion papers under seal, by June 29, 2007. Oral argument on the motions will be held on July 3, 2007 at 10 a.m. Plaintiff also requests permission to hand file, rather than electronically file the Declaration of Kevin T. Mintzer in Opposition to MSG's and Dolan's motion for Partial Summary Judgment, due to the size of the electronic file. Plaintiff's request is granted. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 6/25/07) (djc)
June 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51
ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Kathleen L. Bogas for Isiah Lord Thomas, III admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 6/21/2007) (jar)
June 20, 2007 Filing 53
MOTION for Kathleen L. Bogas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Isiah Lord Thomas, III.(jco)
May 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50
STIPULATION AND ORDER substituting counsel of Record for dft. Isiah Lord Thomas III. Berke-Weiss & Pechman LLP shall substitute for the firm of Manatt, Phelps & Phillips LLP. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 5/2/07) (pl)
April 26, 2007 Filing 49
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laurie Berke-Weiss on behalf of Isiah Lord Thomas, III (Berke-Weiss, Laurie)
April 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46
ORDER; By letter dated April 2, 2007, Defendants have requested (a) an opportunity to inspect the original pages of Plaintiff's journal that Plaintiff has produced in discovery in photocopied form, and (b) that the court order Plaintiff's cousnel to produce, in response to a subpoena to counsel, copies of bills from, and checks isued to, the accountant (Leon Reimer) who prepared Plaintiff's amended 2003 tax returns. The Court has considered all parties' positions with respect to these disputes, which are resolved as set forth herein....; (Signed by Judge Debra C. Freeman on 4/5/07) (djc)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45
ORDER; that plaintiff is directed to return to dft. MSG the unredacted versions of the documents Bates-numbered MSG 5376,5378, 5335. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 5/23/07) (pl)
March 7, 2007 Filing 42
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Teresa M. Holland on behalf of Madison Square Garden, L.P., James L. Dolan (Holland, Teresa)
March 6, 2007 Filing 43
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Debra C. Freeman from Ronald M. Green dated 2/26/07 re: Counsel writes to request that Your Honor reconsider that portion of the Order dated 2/16/07 wherein Your Honor denied defendants' request that the Court direct plaintiff to provide authorizations for the release of her 2000-2004 tax returns by the IRS. Application for reconsideration denied. Defendants have not raised any facts or legal opinions overlooked by the Court. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Debra C. Freeman on 3/6/07) (jco)
February 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41
ORDER;.. resolution of discovery disputes (1)regarding the scope and significance of a potential privilege waiver by a former co-worker of Plaintiffs; (2) a request by Defendants to reopen Plaintiff's deposition and to require Plaintiff to produce additional documents regarding her tax returns; and (3) a request by Plaintiff that Defendants be precluded from deposing certain witnesses; This Order will address each of those disputes, in turn as set forth herein...; (Signed by Judge Debra C. Freeman on 2/16/07) (djc)
February 1, 2007 Filing 40
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lynch from Kevin Mintzer dated 1/29/07 re an extension of discovery until 2/28/07 and that the conf set for 2/2/07 be adjourned consistent with a new discovery deadline: granted. Conference adjourned to 3/2/07, at 2:00 pm. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 1/31/07) (cd).
January 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for resolution of discovery disputes. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 1/19/07) (kco)
December 1, 2006 Filing 37
ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Isiah Lord Thomas, III. Related document: 30 Amended Complaint, filed by Anucha Browne Sanders,.(Parcher, L.)
November 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 38
ORDER Discovery due by 1/30/2007. The parties shall appear for a conference on 2/2/07 at 2:30 p.m. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 11/30/06) (ae, )
November 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34
ORDER defendant Madison Square Garden LP seeks discovery of notes taken by two of plaintiff's attorneys during an interview with a witness, Karin Buchholz. MSG's application is denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 11/29/6) (jco, )
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33
ORDER granting 32 Motion for Lucetta V. Franco to Appear Pro Hac Vice for deft Thomas. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 11/27/06) (cd, )
November 16, 2006 Filing 32
MOTION for Lucetta V. Franco to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Isiah Lord Thomas, III. (jco, )
November 10, 2006 Filing 30
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 21 Amended Complaint, against Madison Square Garden, L.P., Isiah Lord Thomas, III, James L. Dolan.Document filed by Anucha Browne Sanders. Related document: 21 Amended Complaint, filed by Anucha Browne Sanders.(jco, )
November 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 29
ORDER Defendants' renewed request for an extension of the discovery period is denied, expect to the extent implicit in the rulings below. Defednants' proposed scheduling of the depsitions of Dolan, Thomas and Marbury is approved. Defendants' request for prior leave to take a three-day deposition of plaintiff is denied. Plaintiff's request that defendants be required to provide information about other complaints of sex discrimination, sexual harassment or retaliation made by their employees is granted. Plaintiff's request that defendants be ordered to comply with plaintiff's document request number 63 is granted. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 11/7/2006) (jmi, )
November 6, 2006 Filing 28
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gerard E. Lynch from Kevin T. Mintzer dated 10/31/2006 re: requesting the Court's permission to file the enclosed Second Amended Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 11/6/2006) (lb, )
November 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 10/31/06) (kco, )
September 1, 2006 Filing 26
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Cacace on behalf of Anucha Browne Sanders (Cacace, Karen)
August 21, 2006 Filing 25
ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Madison Square Garden, L.P..(Green, Ronald)
August 8, 2006 Filing 23
ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Isiah Lord Thomas, III. Related document: 21 Amended Complaint, filed by Anucha Browne Sanders,.(Parcher, L.)
July 25, 2006 Filing 21
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against James L. Dolan, Madison Square Garden, L.P., Isiah Lord Thomas, III.Document filed by Anucha Browne Sanders. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Anucha Browne Sanders,.(db, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2006 (db, ).
July 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 20
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gerard E. Lynch from Kevin T. Mintzer dated 7/14/06 re: a request to file an amended complaint. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 7/24/06) (kco, )
March 24, 2006 Filing 19
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2006. Joinder of Parties due by 6/15/2006. Motions due by 11/3/2006. Responses due by 12/1/2006 Replies due by 12/15/2006. Discovery due by 6/29/2006. Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2006 02:00 PM before Judge Gerard E. Lynch. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 3/23/2006) (jmi, )
March 17, 2006 Filing 18
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by O. Peter Sherwood on behalf of Isiah Lord Thomas, III (Sherwood, O.)
March 14, 2006 Filing 17
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carl G. Guida on behalf of Madison Square Garden, L.P. (Guida, Carl)
March 10, 2006 Filing 14
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Madison Square Garden, L.P..(Green, Ronald)
February 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Sue Ellen Eisenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/27/2006) (lb, )
February 22, 2006 Filing 7
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne C. Vladeck on behalf of Anucha Browne Sanders (Vladeck, Anne)
February 21, 2006 Filing 6
MOTION for an order, admitting Sue Ellen Eisenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Isiah Lord Thomas, III. (sac, )
February 1, 2006 Filing 5
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Todd Mintzer on behalf of Anucha Browne Sanders (Mintzer, Kevin)
January 31, 2006 Filing 4
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michele Elizabeth Host on behalf of Anucha Browne Sanders (Host, Michele)
January 30, 2006 Filing 3
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Isiah Lord Thomas, III served on 1/27/2006, answer due 2/16/2006. Service was accepted by Marc Schoenfeld, Senior VP Legal & Business Affairs, MSG. Document filed by Anucha Browne Sanders. (Host, Michele)
January 24, 2006 Filing 1
COMPLAINT against Madison Square Garden, L.P., Isiah Lord Thomas, III. (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 568323)Document filed by Anucha Browne Sanders.(es, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2006 (mbe, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Madison Square Garden, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anucha Browne Sanders
Represented By: Judith P. Vladeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Square Garden, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher Paul Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isiah Lord Thomas, III
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Dolan
Represented By: Teresa M. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?