Marolda et al v. Frey et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that defendant Random House, Inc. published "A Million Little Pieces" as a memoir, but only after it was originally submitted as fiction.

Plaintiff: Diane Marolda
Defendant: James Frey and Random House, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2006cv01167
Filed: February 15, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Holwell
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER settling action. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/4/07) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(ml)
November 1, 2007 Filing 70 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (61 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 60 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 70 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 69 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 28, 2007 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: (66 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 75 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 76 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 65 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 65 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 67 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH) MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit A (Part II)# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit J# 8 Exhibit K# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit G# 12 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 28, 2007 Filing 68 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion for Approval of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, Memorandum of Law and Declaration in Support Thereof served on Counsel of Record on 09/28/07. Service was made by ECF. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 28, 2007 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (66 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 75 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 76 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 65 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 65 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 64 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 67 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH) MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 28, 2007 Filing 66 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 65 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Entry of Judgment served on All Counsel Of Record on 09/24/07. Service was made by ECF. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (61 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 60 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 70 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 69 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Kimberly K. Ness in Support re: (61 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 60 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 70 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 69 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Larry Drury, Esquire in Support re: (61 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 60 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 70 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 69 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: (61 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 60 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 70 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 69 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 59 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 58 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 60 MOTION to Approve Finall Settlement and Entry of Judgment. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and Final Judgment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 24, 2007 Filing 59 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Entry of Judgment. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Final Order and Judgment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
September 7, 2007 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
May 15, 2007 Filing 57 Notice of Proposed Class Action Settlement; regarding summary of the lawsuit and proposed settlement, as set forth in this Notice. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/14/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(kkc)
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting Motion for preliminary Approval of Settlement; the following class, as indicated in this Order, is conditionally certified pursuant to Rule 23(b)(3); plaintiffs Marcia Vedral and michele Snow are designated as class representatives of the Settlement Class; the final hearing to determine whether the settlement is fair, reasonable, and adequate, and whether it should be approved by the Court, will be conducted on 11/2/2007 at 10:00 am in the courtroom of the Honorable Richard J. Holwell, Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, new York, NY 10007...(Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/14/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(kkc)
May 3, 2007 Filing 55 NOTICE of Revised Exhibits to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Notice Plan re: (36 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 36 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 46 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 46 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 38 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 36 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 36 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 36 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 37 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 36 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 36 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 39 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH) Declaration in Support of Motion,,, (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
April 30, 2007 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
April 30, 2007 Filing 53 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
April 27, 2007 Filing 52 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF CONCERNING THE COURTS INQUIRY ON CLASS NOTICE. Document filed by James Frey, Random House Inc., Big Jim Industries Inc., Doubleday & Company, Inc., Random House, V.G. Inc..Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Andolina, Michael)
April 27, 2007 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
April 27, 2007 Filing 50 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
March 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. The parties are directed to appear for Oral Argument on the pending motion for preliminary approval of settlement, certification of settlement class, and approval of notice plan on Friday, 4/6/2007 10:00 AM. The conference will be held in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/12/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(rjm)
March 20, 2007 Filing 48 NOTICE of Order for Oral Argument on 04-06-07 at 10:00 AM, Courtroom 17B. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
March 2, 2007 Filing 47 NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Stone, Ralph)
February 8, 2007 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of AMLP Reply Memorandum of Law in further Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement; Reply Declaration of Evan Smith in Further Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval and Proof of Mailing served on All Counsel of Record on February 8, 2007. Service was made by Mail and ECF. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
February 8, 2007 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
February 8, 2007 Filing 44 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Smith, Evan)
February 8, 2007 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan. (Response to Opposition of Plaintiff Sara Rubenstein to Address First Amendment Issues). Document filed by James Frey, Random House Inc., Big Jim Industries Inc., Doubleday & Company, Inc., Random House, V.G. Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Blocker, Mark)
January 19, 2007 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (35 in 1:06-cv-00693-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-05402-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04645-RJH, 42 in 1:06-md-01771-RJH, 34 in 1:06-cv-01167-RJH, 33 in 1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04644-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04646-RJH, 42 in 1:06-cv-00669-RJH, 32 in 1:06-cv-04642-RJH) MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH et al.(Bonner, James)
January 4, 2007 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Memorandum of Law, Declarations of Evan J. Smith; Larry D. Drury, and Thomas Mullaney, all in support of AMLP Plaintiffs' Group's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Clas Action Settlement, Class Certification and Notice Plan; and Proof of Mailing on January 4, 2007. Service was made by ECF and Mail. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: 42 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B (Part I)# 2 Exhibit B (Part II)# 3 Exhibit B (Part III)# 4 Exhibit B (Part IV)# 5 Exhibit B (Part V))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: 42 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement)# 2 Executed Signature Pages to Settlement Agreement (Exhibit A above)# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: 42 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement)# 2 Executed Signature Pages to Settlement Agreement# 3 Full Exhibit B (including newspaper listings) to Settlement Agreement (Exhibit A above) (Part I)# 4 Full Exhibit B (including newspaper listings) to Settlement Agreement (Exhibit A above) (Part II)# 5 Full Exhibit B (including newspaper listings) to Settlement Agreement (Exhibit A above) (Part III)# 6 Exhibit C# 7 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Thomas M. Mullaney, Esquire in Support re: 42 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Larry D. Drury, Esquire in Support re: 42 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 42 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
January 4, 2007 Filing 34 MOTION to Approve Preliminarily a Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Notice Plan. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Return Date set for 1/26/2007 09:00 AM. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
December 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting 39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (for attorneys Jocelyn D. Franceour and Derek J. Meyer). (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/31/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(rjm, )
October 27, 2006 Filing 32 Notice of MOTION filed by admitted attorney Ann E. Schofield,Esq, for Jocelyn D.Francoeur to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant James Frey, w/Affidavit in Support and Certificate of Good Standing, Wisc. Sup. Court.Document filed by James Frey.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJHrmc,)Forwarded to Chambers Holwell 10/27/06
October 27, 2006 Filing 31 Notice of MOTION by admitted attorney Ann E. Schofield, Esq.,for Derek J. Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant - James Freyw/Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing Sup Ct Illinois.Document filed by Ann E Schofield, Esq.,.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJHrmc,)Forwarded to Chambers 10/27/06
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of "Confidential Information". (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/27/06) This document relates to: ALL ACTIONS.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(sn)
October 12, 2006 Filing 29 DECLARATION of James P. Bonner in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as interim counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
October 12, 2006 Filing 28 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as interim counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorneys Michael C. Andolina, Mark Bruce Blocker and Marissa J. Reich for Defendants Alfred A. Knopf Inc., Anchor Books, Bantam Doubleday Dell Publishing Group, Barnes and Noble Booksellers, Inc., Barnes and Noble Publishing, Inc., Barnes and Noble, Inc., Knopf Publishing Group, Inc., Nan A. Talese/Doubleday, Random House, V.G. Inc., Nan A. Talese, Vintage Anchor Publishing, Inc. (added in case no. 06md1771), admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/9/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(rjm, )
October 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY Larry D. Drury PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Plaintiff Marcia Vedral. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/9/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(rjm, )
October 4, 2006 Filing 25 DECLARATION of James P. Bonner in Opposition re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
October 4, 2006 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
October 4, 2006 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Service was made by Mail and ECF. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
October 4, 2006 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Exvan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit D# 3 Exhibit E# 4 Exhibit I# 5 Exhibit J)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
October 4, 2006 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C (Part I)# 4 Exhibit C (Part II)# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit D# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
October 4, 2006 Filing 20 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Service was made by MAIL and ECF. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Evan J. Smith, Esquire in Support re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Scott Frost, Esquire in Support re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06-0669, 06-0693, 06-1167, 06-4642, 06-4643, 06-4644, 06-4645, 06-4646, 06-4647, 06-4648, 06-5402, and Appoint Co-Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by "A Million Little Pieces" Plaintiffs' Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Smith, Evan)
September 22, 2006 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion for Appointment of Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as Interim Counsel and Supporting Documents on September 22, 2006. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
September 22, 2006 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Mitch Kalcheim in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as interim counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
September 22, 2006 Filing 10 DECLARATION of James P. Bonner in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as interim counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
September 22, 2006 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as interim counsel.. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
September 22, 2006 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Shalov Stone & Bonner LLP and Kalcheim Salah as interim counsel. Document filed by Sara Rubenstein. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(Bonner, James)
September 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1: All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case, shall complete & file a CM/ECF attorney registration form (which can be found on the court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov.); All attorneys who wish to be admitted for purposes of this case shall send a motion to be admitted pro hac vice to John Sacco at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, Room 249, New York, NY 10007. In addition to the documentation required by the Local Rules for the Southern & Eastern Districts of NY, Civil Rule 1.3, attorneys wishing to appear pro hac vice must also include w/their motion a check for $25.00 payable to the Clerk of the Court & a completed CM/ECF attorney registration form; All documents filed in the MDL case & the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov; Amended complaints & supplemental pleadings shall provide a list of the additional parties & indicate the action or actions to which they are being added. Similarly, a filing removing parties shall indicate the parties being removed and the action or actions from which they are being removed. A filing which adds a party or parties who has not been named in any of the consolidated actions shall provide a separate listing of such parties, indicating that they have not yet been named. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(rjm, )
September 5, 2006 Filing 6 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Mark B. Blocker dated 8/22/06 re: application granted, the 9/13/06 conference is adjourned to 2:30 pm on 9/13/06. Conference set for 9/13/2006 02:30 PM before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 8/25/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH,1:06-cv-04643-RJH, 1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH,1:06-cv-04648-RJH, 1:06-cv-05402-RJH. Also entered as Doc. #14 in 06cv669.(rjm, ).
July 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The initial pretrial conference currently scheduled in this multidistrict litigation for 8/2/06, 2:30pm is adjourned. Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2006 10:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/26/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01771-RJH,1:06-cv-00669-RJH,1:06-cv-00693-RJH,1:06-cv-01167-RJH,1:06-cv-04642-RJH, 1:06-cv-04643-RJH,1:06-cv-04644-RJH,1:06-cv-04645-RJH,1:06-cv-04646-RJH,1:06-cv-04647-RJH, 1:06-cv-04648-RJH,1:06-cv-05402-RJH(rjm, )
June 16, 2006 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED TO 06md1771. (jeh, )
June 16, 2006 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Case consolidated with 06md1771. (jeh, )
June 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the action(s) listed... and pending... be, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York and, with consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard J. Holwell, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district... (Signed by Judge MDL Panel on 06/14/2006) (jeh, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2006 (jeh, ).
March 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER that in light of the MDL motion and in order to preserve thee resources of the court and litigators and avoid inconsistent pretrial rulings in the AMLP actions all proceedings in this action shall be stayed pending a final determination of the MDL motion. (Signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna on 3/2/06) (dle, )
February 27, 2006 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Holwell. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (jeh, )
February 27, 2006 Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (jeh, )
February 27, 2006 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED TO 06cv669. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jeh, )
February 15, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Frey, Random House, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 570091)Document filed by Diane Marolda(Individually), Diane Marolda(an on behalf of all others similarly situated).(es, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2006 (jmi, ).
February 15, 2006 SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Frey, Random House, Inc.. (es, )
February 15, 2006 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Richard J. Holwell as possibly related to 06-cv-669. (es, )
February 15, 2006 Case Designated ECF. (es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marolda et al v. Frey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Marolda
Represented By: Thomas M. Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Random House, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?