Murawski v. New York State Board of Elections et al Featured Case

Plaintiff William E. Murawski sued defendants the New York State Board of Elections and the New York City Board of Elections seeking to enjoin the general election held on November 7, 2006 because the State Board of Election refused to place his name on the ballot as a gubernatorial candidate. Plaintiff later sought a declaration that the New York State Election Law was largely unconstitutional and added former governor George Pataki, former mayor Rudolph Giuliani, former attorney general Eliot Spitzer, mayor Michael Bloomberg as defendants. Plaintiff also sued IAC/Interactive Corp., Ronald M. Gunzberger, and Yahoo! Inc. because they undermined his master election plan to be elected governor. Plaintiff alleged that defendant Ronald Gunzburger declined to list plaintiff on his website, http://Politics1.com, and also that Gunzberger defamed him by placing plaintiff's name in a list directly below a member of the Communist Party. Plaintiff alleged that Ask.com erroneously showed plaintiff to be associated with the Communist Party as a result of the alleged statement on the Politics1.com website, and that defendant Yahoo! Inc. refused to permit him to post e-mail messages to various Yahoo! Groups, thus denying him access to millions of voters.

Additional Resources

Plaintiff: William E. Murawski
Defendant: New York State Board of Elections, George Pataki and Eliot Spitzer
Case Number: 1:2006cv12965
Filed: November 6, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Ronald L. Ellis
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Holwell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: for reasons further set forth in said Order, the State BOE's motion to dismiss 13 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. All other motions to dismiss [8,12,16,21 and 22] are GRANTED in their entirety. Defendant Gunzburger's motion for sanctions [15] is DENIED. The Complaint is dismissed against the City and private defendants in its entirety and the Clerk is directed to terminate those defendants from the caption of this case. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/26/07) (db)
August 10, 2007 Filing 41
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to [29] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by William E. Murawski USCA Case Number 07-0671. Appellant, pro se, moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is denied and the appeal is dismissed because it lacks ans arguable basis in law or fact. See Neitzke v Willianms, 490 U.S. 319, 325 (19189); U.S.C. 1915(e). Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 8/9/2007. (nd)
April 20, 2007 Filing 40
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to [29] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by William E. Murawski USCA Case Number 07-0671-cv. It is Ordered that the appeal from the 1/27/07 USDC-SDNY be, and it hereby is DISMISSED. Thomas Asreen, Acting Clerk USCA. Certified: 4/18/07. (tp)
February 23, 2007 Filing 30
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for [29] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by William E. Murawski 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2007 (Thomas, Dave).
February 14, 2007 Filing 28
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronald L. Ellis. Judge Andrew J. Peck is no longer assigned to the case. (jmi)
January 6, 2007 Filing 13
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by New York State Board of Elections. Responses due by 2/2/2007 (Murray, Patricia) Modified on 1/8/2007 (kg).
January 5, 2007 Filing 12
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Document filed by IAC/Interactive Corp.. Responses due by 1/22/2007 Return Date set for 1/29/2007 10:00 AM. (Cheah, Michael) Modified on 1/8/2007 (kg).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murawski v. New York State Board of Elections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Murawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Board of Elections
Represented By: Patricia Lynn Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Pataki
Represented By: Joel Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliot Spitzer
Represented By: Joel Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?