International Media Films, Inc. v. Lucas Entertainment, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: International Media Films, Inc.
Defendant: Lucas Entertainment, Inc., Lucas Distribution, Inc. and Andrei Treivas Bregman
Case Number: 1:2007cv01178
Filed: February 15, 2007
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: John G. Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For all of the reasons explained above, the defendants' application for attorney's fees and costs is denied. However, it should be noted that in the papers submitted, the defendants point to the fact that they submitted an Offer of Judgment pursuant to Rule 68 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on July 5, 2007, which was plainly not accepted. The defendants may therefore be entitled to subsequently incurred costs under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 68(d), although the defendants have not moved for such costs on this motion. Therefore, the denial of the current motion is without prejudice to any application under Rule 68. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/21/2011) (mro)
April 21, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The motion to withdraw is granted unless the plaintiff interposes any objection by April 28, 2010. The plaintiff, as a corporation, can only appear by new counsel. Therefore, the action is stayed until May 19, 2010 to al low the plaintiff to obtain new counsel. If the plaintiff fails to obtain new counsel, any motions against it may be granted by default. The time to respond to the motion for attorneys' fees is extended to June 3, 2010. The defendants' repl y, if any, is due on June 14, 2010. The application for reconsideration of the Court's denial of the defendants' motion for a bond is denied. The defendantshave failed to point to any controlling decisions or facts that reasonably be expected to alter the Court's decision. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/20/10) (db)
April 13, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The motion to require the posting of a bond is therefore denied. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/12/2010) (tro)
March 31, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted. The plaintiff's trademark claims and copyright claims are dismissed. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's st ate law claims and those claims are dismissed without prejudice. The plaintiff's motion to strike is denied as moot. The defendants' counterclaim is dismissed without prejudice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/31/2010) (js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Media Films, Inc. v. Lucas Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Media Films, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen A. McCallion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Mason Andrew Weisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Mason Andrew Weisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrei Treivas Bregman
Represented By: Mason Andrew Weisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?