Faulkner et al v. Arista Records LLC

Plaintiff: Eric Faulkner, Duncan Faure, Alan Longmuir, Derek Longmuir, Leslie McKeown and Stuart Wood
Defendant: Arista Records LLC
Intervenor: Ian Mitchell
Case Number: 1:2007cv02318
Filed: March 20, 2007
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: Deborah A. Batts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2014 204 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons in this Opinion and Order: (1) Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Wayne C. Coleman [dkt. no. 189] is GRANTED with regard to Mr. Coleman's opinions on the status of Arista's records, th e release-based damages estimate, and the interpolation damages estimate and DENIED with regard to the minimum royalties owed damages estimate; (2) Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Tom Nilsen [dkt. no. 187] is DENIED with regar d to the minimum royalties owed damages estimate; and (3) the Court need not decide Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Tom Nilsen [dkt. no. 187] on the subjects of Arista's records, the release-based estimate, or the interpo lation estimate because it is moot in light of (1). So ordered. re: 189 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Wayne C. Coleman filed by Arista Records LLC, 187 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Tom Nilsen filed by Alan Longmuir, Stuart Wood, Leslie McKeown, Eric Faulkner, Derek Longmuir, Duncan Faure. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/15/2014) (rjm)
May 26, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION: Arista's motion for partial summary judgment [dkt. no. 125] is DENIED. The Rollers, cross-motion for partial summary judgment [dkt. no. 130] is GRANTED. The Rollers, motion to strike [dkt. no. 137] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties shall confer and inform the Court by letter no later than April 7, 2011, how they wish to proceed. (This document was previously filed under seal in envelope # 156 and unsealed by document # 159 on 5/26/2011.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/23/2011) (tro)
July 9, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, counsel shall appear for a conference on 7/15/09 at 3:00 pm, either in person in Courtroom 12A or by telephone. ( Status Conference set for 7/15/2009 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/9/09) (cd)
March 5, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons stated above, Movants' Motion to Intervene in this action is hereby DENIED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 3/5/2009) (jpo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faulkner et al v. Arista Records LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Faulkner
Represented By: Christelette Angelika Hoey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duncan Faure
Represented By: Gillian Rattray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Longmuir
Represented By: Gillian Rattray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Longmuir
Represented By: Gillian Rattray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie McKeown
Represented By: Gillian Rattray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Wood
Represented By: Gillian Rattray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arista Records LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Desow Melber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ian Mitchell
Represented By: Wolfgang Heimerl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?