Knight v. LaVandeira Featured Case

Photographer Ken Knight alleges that Mario Lavandeira posted a photo of Jason Allen Alexander on the website www.perezhilton.com. Plaintiff asserts that he holds the copyright to the photo and that it was published on the website without permission.

Plaintiff: Ken Knight
Defendant: Mario LaVandeira
Case Number: 1:2007cv03751
Filed: May 11, 2007
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Leonard B. Sand
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2007 9
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Cindy McBennett dated 9/10/07 re: that the complaint having been withdrawn, the motion to dismiss scheduled for oral argument on 9/11/07 has been removed from the calendar and that no further action is required regarding the motion. ENDORSEMENT: Confirmed. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/11/07) (cd)
August 14, 2007 8
STIPULATION: regarding document # 5 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint. : Responses due by 9/2/2007 Replies due by 9/10/2007. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2007 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 15A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Leonard B. Sand. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/13/07) (kco)
August 13, 2007 7
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 5 MOTION to Dismiss the complaint.. Document filed by Mario LaVandeira. (Eilender, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2007 4
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Edward Charles Greenberg on behalf of Ken Knight. New Address: EDWARD C. GREENBERG, P.C., 570 LEXINGTON AVENUE, 17TH FLOOR, NEW YORK, NY, 10022, 212-697-8777. (Greenberg, Edward)
July 12, 2007 3
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mario LaVandeira served on 5/22/2007, answer due 6/11/2007. Service was accepted by ELY UGARTE - TELLER. Document filed by Ken Knight. (Greenberg, Edward)
May 11, 2007 1
COMPLAINT against Mario LaVandeira. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 614627)Document filed by Ken Knight.(laq) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2007 (tro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. LaVandeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Knight
Represented By: Edward Charles Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario LaVandeira
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Eilender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?