Wilson et al v. McConnell et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Valerie Plame Wlson and Simon & Schuster, Inc. sued defendants J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, and Gen. Michael V. Hayden seeking a declaratory judgment that the Executive Branch of government cannot restrain publication of previously unclassified or currently unclassifiable information documenting Ms. Wilson\'s dates of federal service disclosed in 2006 by the Central Intelligence Agency in an official, authorized, and unclassified letter now in the Congressional Record and available world-wide on the Library of Congress website.

Plaintiff: Valerie Plame Wilson and Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Defendant: J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency and Michael V. Hayden
Case Number: 1:2007cv04595
Filed: May 31, 2007
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Barbara S. Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2008 37 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER at the request of the parties in this matter, the Court reviewed Exhibit B to the Declaration of David B. Smallman in Support in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, which was previously filed under seal on 6/29/07, to determine whether one page had been inadvertently omitted as a result of a copying error. Having determined that the page in question was included in Exhibit B, the Court has re-sealed and re-filed this Exhibit in its original form. The parties have informed the Court that this Exhibit B will also be filed publicly subject to certain redactions. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 1/16/08) (cd)
December 26, 2007 34
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Carolina Fornos dated 12/19/07 re: Request to extend time until 1/4/08 to enable AUSA Torrence to respond to Plaintiffs' letter (to unseal an exhibit). ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 12/20/07) (cd)
October 3, 2007 33
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David Brian Smallman on behalf of Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. New Address: Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP, 500 Fifth Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10110, 212-382-3300. (Smallman, David)
September 28, 2007 32
NOTICE OF APPEAL from 30 Clerk's Judgment, 29 Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 628352. (nd)
September 27, 2007 31
NOTICE of Notice of Correction of Affiliation and Address of Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Smallman, David)
August 1, 2007 28 Opinion or Order of the Court
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Beth E. Goldman dated 7/27/07 re: Counsel writes to request an adjournment of time to answer the complaint be adjourned to 8/2/07. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The defendants' time to answer is extended to 8/2/07. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 7/30/07) (jco)
July 20, 2007 27
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 18 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment., 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment and For A Permanent Injunction of Plaintiffs Valerie Plame Wilson and Simon & Schuster, Inc.. Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, Permanent Injunctive Relief and In Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Smallman, David)
July 18, 2007 24
COUNTER STATEMENT TO 13 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden. (Torrance, Benjamin)
July 17, 2007 20
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 7/13/2007 re: request an extension until 7/18/2007, to file the govt's statement of undisputed facts and response to plts' statement of undisputed facts under Local Rule 56.1, and a classified declaration ( to be submitted ex parte) in support of the motion. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted.. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 7/13/2007) (jar)
July 13, 2007 19
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 18 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden. (Torrance, Benjamin)
July 3, 2007 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER (re: proposed stipulation and protective order and 7/2/07 letters): first, whether certain material is "classified" is at the heart of this matter......No protective Order is necessary to preserve plaintiff's rights in that regard, or in any other regard specified in the stipulation. Second, the stipulation is inherently inconsistent with respect to whether the plaintiffs deem the manuscript, or any portions thereof, proprietary and commercial information. Finally, to the extent that the parties have reached agreement concerning other matters contained in the stipulation, i.e., (1) quoting from the manuscript, and (2) designation of confidential information - no seperate Court order is necessary as further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 7/3/07) Copies Faxed by Chambers.(db)
June 29, 2007 14
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from David B. Smallman dated 6/28/2007 re: plaintiff are requesting an additional twelve hours to file their opening brief with the COurt, on or before 12 noon Friday, June 29, 2007. No other filing dates would be affected. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(jmi) Modified on 7/6/2007 (Miles, Janeen).
June 28, 2007 9
NOTICE of Filing of Classified Document. Document filed by J. Michael McConnell, Central Intelligence Agency, Michael V. Hayden. (Torrance, Benjamin)
June 26, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATED REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER SCHEDULING ORDER: plntfs shall serve upon defts and file their motion for summary judgment and any application for injunctive relief no later than 6/28/07. Defts shall serve upon plntfs and file their opposition to plntfs' motion and any application by plntfs for injunctive relief no later than 7/13/07, and defts shall also serve upon plntfs and file their cross-motion for summary judgment no later than 7/13/07. Plntfs shall serve upon defts and file their reply and opposition papers no later than 7/20/07.Motions due by 6/28/2007. Cross Motions due by 7/13/2007. Responses due by 7/13/2007. Replies due by 7/20/2007. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 6/25/07) (cd)
June 22, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER:Motion for summary judgment due by 6/26/2007. Responses due by 7/11/2007; Replies due by 7/18/2007. Defendants shall also serve upon plaintiffs and file their cross-motion for summary judgment no latere than 7/11/07. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 6/18/07) (jco)
June 1, 2007 4
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. J. Michael McConnell served on 5/31/2007, answer due 7/30/2007; Michael V. Hayden served on 5/31/2007, answer due 7/30/2007. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson; Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Smallman, David)
May 31, 2007 2
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying CBS Corporation (Delaware Corporation), CBS Operations Inc. (a Delaware Corporation), French Street Management LLC (a Delaware limited liability Company) as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Valerie Plame Wilson, Simon & Schuster, Inc..(mbe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. McConnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Plame Wilson
Represented By: David Brian Smallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Represented By: David Brian Smallman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Michael McConnell
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael V. Hayden
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?