Travelers Casualty and Surety Company v. Dormitory Authority State of New York et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Defendant: Dormitory Authority State of New York, TDX Construction Corp. and Kohn Pedersen Fox Associates, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2007cv06915
Filed: August 1, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 626 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Travelers and Trataros's January 31, 2011 motion is granted. DASNY shall be substituted for Travelers and Trataros with respect to these parties' outstanding claims and defenses against the Terrazzo Defendants. 604 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company; Trataros Construction, Inc., New Party: Dormitory Authority of the State of New York Motion on Shortened Notice filed by Trataros Construction, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/14/11) (db)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 528 OPINION & ORDER re: 442 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dormitory Authority State of New York. Travelers' 2/19/2010 motion for summary judgment is granted in part. The Breach-of-Contract Counterclaims and Performance Bond Counterclaim are both dismissed, while the Payment Bond Counterclaim survives. DASNY's 2/19/2010 motion for summary judgment is granted in its entirety. A separate scheduling Order accompanies this Opinion. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/26/2010) (tro)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 527 OPINION & ORDER re: 422 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TDX Construction Corp., 414 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kohn Pedersen Fox Associates, P.C. TDX's and KPF's 2/19/2010 motions for summary judgment are granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/11/2010) (tro)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 526 OPINION AND ORDER: The February 19, 2010 motions for summary judgment by Harleysville, Assurance, and Ohio Casualty are granted. Harleysville, Assurance, and Ohio Casualty are dismissed as parties from this litigation. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/30/2010) (js)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER... Expert Discovery due by 10/2/2009. Summary Motions due by 10/16/2009. Reply due by 11/20/2009. Response due by 11/6/2009. At the time any reply is filed, the moving party shall provide two courtesy copies of all motion papers to Chambers by delivering them to the Courthouse Mailroom 8th flr, US Courthouse, 500 Pearl St., NY NY. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/6/09) (cd)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that counsel for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company and Trataros Construction, Inc. shall submit a status letter to the Court by August 7, 2009. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/3/2009) (jpo)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that as set forth in the July 14, 2008 Order in this case, that counsel for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company and Trataros Construction, Inc. shall file their June 5, 2009 letter identifying which parties (other than D ayton Superior Corporation) will be filing summary judgment motions. It is further ordered that the June 5, 2009 date for filing summary judgment motions is adjourned to July 17, 2009. Opposition is due August 7, 2009; replies are due August 14, 200 9. At the time any reply is filed, the moving party shall provide two courtesy copies of all motion papers to Chambers by delivering them to the Courthouse Mail room, 8th Floor, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/6/2009) (jpo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company v. Dormitory Authority State of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: David Craig Dreifuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dormitory Authority State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDX Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohn Pedersen Fox Associates, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?