January 6, 2020 |
Filing
469
ORDER. In accordance with the parties' Confidential Stipulation and Order, the parties are directed to file forthwith a stipulation and order of dismissal with prejudice in the form attached as Exhibit A to the Confidential Stipulation and Order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the Settlement Conference that was scheduled for Friday, January 3, 2020 at 10:00 am. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 1/6/20) (yv)
|
January 2, 2020 |
Filing
468
ORDER, A Settlement Conference is scheduled for Friday, January 3, 2020 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Subject to the definitions, obligations, and restrictions imposed pursuant to Standing Order M10-468, as re vised, all attorneys attending the conference are authorized to bring their cell phones and laptops into the Courthouse for use during the conference. The parties are expected to engage in good-faith negotiations before the settlement conference a nd notify the Court in writing if they resolve their settlement disputes before the conference date. SO ORDERED. (Settlement Conference set for 1/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 1/2/20) (yv)
|
December 30, 2019 |
Filing
466
ORDER granting 465 Letter Motion to Seal Document. The parties' Letter-Motion to file the Stipulation and Order under seal (ECF No. 465) is GRANTED. The parties are ordered to file an unredacted copy of the Stipulation and Order under seal with the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 465. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 12/30/19) (yv)
|
December 9, 2019 |
Filing
464
ORDER, A Settlement Conference is scheduled for Wednesday, December 18, 2019 at 4:00 pm in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. The parties are directed to submit a confidential joint pre-conference letter to the Court by close of business on Tuesday, December 17, 2019, via email at Cave_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The parties are expected to engage in good-faith negotiations before the settlement conference and notify the Court in writing if they resolve their set tlement disputes before the conference date. SO ORDERED. (Settlement Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 12/9/19) (yv)
|
December 6, 2019 |
Filing
463
ORDER. Plaintiff is directed to send a copy of the NAM Post-Mediation Agreement to the Court by close of business today, December 6, 2019, via email at Cave_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov, with a copy to relevant counsel in accordance with the agreements confidentiality provision. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 12/6/19) (yv)
|
November 19, 2019 |
Filing
458
ORDER: In light of the parties' joint report that they have a mediation session scheduled for Sunday, November 24, 2019, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report regarding the outcome of their mediation session by Wednesday, November 27, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 11/19/2019) (rro)
|
September 18, 2017 |
Filing
395
OPINION, ORDER AND CERTIFICATION OF FACTS re: 366 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman from Ira Daniel Tokayer, Esq. dated January 27, 2017, filed by RKO Properties, Ltd., 359 LETTER MOTION to C ompel Ira Tokayer, Esq. to serve supplemental interrogatory responses in accordance with Magistrate Judge Pitman's September 29, 2016 Order, among other relief requested, addressed to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman filed by Nimkoff Rosenfeld & Schechter, LLP. (1) The Nimkoff Parties' motion to compel supplemental interrogatory responses from Tokayer (D.I. 359) is granted; (2) I certify the facts set forth above in Section III(A) (2) as accurate; (3) Tokayer's motion for Rule 11 sanctions against the Nimkoff Parties (D.I. 361) is denied and (4) RKO's motion to compel and for reconsideration (D.I. 366) is denied. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to mark Docket Items 359 and 366 closed. I furt her recommend that if, within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, Tokayer fails to provide written answers under oath (or under penalty of perjury pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1746) as directed above in Section III (A)(2), that your Honor issue an Order directing Tokayer to show cause why he should not be held in contempt, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 9/18/2017) Copies Transmitted By Chambers. (ras)
|
March 24, 2014 |
Filing
309
OPINION AND ORDER re: 212 MOTION to Disqualify IRA D. TOKAYER filed by Nimkoff Rosenfeld & Schechter, LLP, 206 MOTION for Sanctions Against Ira Tokayer filed by Nimkoff Rosenfeld & Schechter, LLP. For all the foregoing reasons, I de ny the Nimkoff Firm's (1) motion for contempt and sanctions, except that Tokayer is ordered to submit an affidavit within seven (7) days as outlined above, and (2) motion for disqualification of Tokayer, without prejudice to its renewal, should the case survive summary judgment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close docket items 206 and 212. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 3/24/2014) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ajs)
|
February 25, 2013 |
Filing
162
OPINION AND ORDER: The deposition of Herbert Rubin is closed and Nimkoff and RKO are limited to 20 written interrogatories to obtain further discovery from H&R attorneys Ian Ceresney and Arthur Strauss. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 2/25/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ft)
|
September 6, 2012 |
Filing
138
ADOPTION OF REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: for 88 Report and Recommendations, having conducted the appropriate levels of review of the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman dated April 7, 2011, the Court APPROVES, ADOPTS, and RATIFIES the Report as modified herein. NRS shall pay Defendant RKO $1,234.48 in costs within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. As NRS has not made a strong showing that it is likely to succeed on appeal, nor put forward any other sufficient justification for a stay, NRS's request to stay the award pending appeal is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 9/6/2012) (ja)
|