Reinhardt v. Wal-mart Stores, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Richard Reinhardt (p/k/a Richie Ramone) alleges that Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Apple, Inc., RealNetworks, Inc., Taco Tunes, Inc., Ramones Productions, Inc., Estate of John Cummings, Herzog & Strauss and Ira Herzog infringed on Plaintiff\'s copyright to six songs he authored while a member of The Ramones. Plaintiff alleges that he never licensed or authorized the use of his compositions in any digital formats.

Plaintiff: Richard Reinhardt
Defendant: Wal-mart Stores, Inc., Apple, Inc., RealNetworks, Inc., Taco Tunes, Inc., Ramones Productions, Inc., Estate of John Cummings, Herzog & Strauss and Ira Herzog
Case Number: 1:2007cv08233
Filed: September 21, 2007
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Shira A. Scheindlin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #96236 re: 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. Section 505, denying and the parties shall bear their own costs. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the motion (document no. 14) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/10/08) (cd)
June 6, 2008 21
DECLARATION of Cynthia S. Arato in Support re: 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. Section 505.. Document filed by Wal-mart Stores, Inc., RealNetworks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Arato, Cynthia)
May 28, 2008 19
FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. Section 505.. Document filed by Richard Reinhardt. (Sanders, Jeff)
May 9, 2008 18
NOTICE OF APPEAL from 13 Clerk's Judgment, 12 Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by Richard Reinhardt. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 650291. (tp)
March 5, 2008 11
FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 5 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Estate of John Cummings, Herzog & Strauss, Ira Herzog, Taco Tunes, Inc., Ramones Productions, Inc.. (Levy, Stewart)
February 20, 2008 10
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 5 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. CORRECTED TABLE OF AUTHORITIES. Document filed by Richard Reinhardt. (Sanders, Jeff)
February 19, 2008 9
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 5 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Richard Reinhardt. (Sanders, Jeff)
January 22, 2008 8
JOINDER to join re: 5 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Wal-mart Stores, Inc., Apple, Inc., RealNetworks, Inc..(Arato, Cynthia)
January 18, 2008 7
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 5 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Estate of John Cummings, Herzog & Strauss, Ira Herzog, Taco Tunes, Inc., Ramones Productions, Inc.. (Levy, Stewart)
January 9, 2008 4
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Estate of John Cummings, Herzog & Strauss, Ira Herzog, Wal-mart Stores, Inc., Apple, Inc., RealNetworks, Inc., Taco Tunes, Inc., Ramones Productions, Inc. Document filed by Richard Reinhardt. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Richard Reinhardt.(db) (db).
November 1, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER: Counsel are directed to appear at the United States Couthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, Courtroom 15C, on November 27 at 4:00 p.m., for the initial pretrial conference. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/1/07) (js)
October 18, 2007 2 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/20/2007 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/17/2007) (jar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reinhardt v. Wal-mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Reinhardt
Represented By: Jeff Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RealNetworks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Tunes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramones Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Stewart L. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of John Cummings
Represented By: Stewart L. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herzog & Strauss
Represented By: Stewart L. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira Herzog
Represented By: Stewart L. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?