Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Bloomberg L.P. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Bloomberg L.P.
Case Number: 1:2007cv08383
Filed: September 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A. Preska
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER: Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission ("EEOC") and Defendant Bloomberg L.P. ("Bloomberg") shall confer and direct the Court to portions of the record, if any, containing information regarding (1) when the EEOC became aware of the remaining twenty-nine non-intervening claimants on behalf of whom it asserts claims and (2) the extent to which each claim was investigated prior to filing the instant action. The parties shall provide the requested information to the Court, or inform the Court regarding the lack thereof, by May 23, 2013. If possible, the parties are encouraged to submit a single, joint letter in which they direct the Court to the information requested in this Order and note any relevant disagreements between the parties pertaining to that information. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/8/2013) (djc)
April 26, 2013 Filing 552 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Sherron N. Thomas McClain. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Dreiband, Eric)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 551 STIPULATION AND ORDER: WHEREAS EEOC is no longer seeking relief on behalf of Ms. Sullivan; NOW THEREFORE, it is hereby stipulated by and between the parties and ordered that the Sullivan Claims are dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/26/2013) (djc)
February 1, 2013 Filing 550 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Milo Silberstein on behalf of Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Jill Patricot. New Address: Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP, 225 Broadway, Suite 1405, New York, New York, 10007, 212-385-0066. (Silberstein, Milo)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 549 STIPULATION AND ORDER. WHEREAS EEOC is no longer seeking relief on behalf of Ms. Pelkey; NOW, THEREFORE, it is hereby stipulated by and between the parties and ordered that the Pelkey Claims are dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/11/2013) (rjm)
December 11, 2012 Filing 548 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Loretta A. Preska from Thomas H. Golden dated 12/7/2012 re: I write on behalf of defendant Bloomberg L.P. respectfully to request the Court's permission to submit a short supplement to Bloomberg's summary judgment motion as to claimant Meredith Pelkey. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel may supplement the motion. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/11/2012) (lmb)
October 9, 2012 Filing 547 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Justin Mulaire on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. New Address: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, 500 W. Madison St., Ste. 2000, Chicago, IL, 60661, 312-869-8045. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 21, 2012 Filing 546 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER: Counsel are informed that certain documents filed on September 17, 2012, lacked original signatures. In the interests of expedition, the Court ordered the Clerk's Office to accept the materials for filing. Counsel shall promptly provide the Clerk with original signature pages for any documents lacking an original signature. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/18/2012) (cd)
September 17, 2012 Filing 544 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
September 12, 2012 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: 543 Endorsed Letter,, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (jfe)
September 12, 2012 Filing 543 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jill K. Grant dated 9/12/2012 re: Bloomberg respectfully requests to file the documents set forth within in unredacted form with the sealed records clerk no later than Monday, September 17, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/12/2012) (jfe)
September 12, 2012 Filing 542 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
September 12, 2012 Filing 541 DECLARATION of Eric Dreiband re: Plaintiff-Intervenors in Support re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 115, # 2 Exhibit 116, # 3 Exhibit 117, # 4 Exhibit 118, # 5 Exhibit 119, # 6 Exhibit 120, # 7 Exhibit 121, # 8 Exhibit 122, # 9 Exhibit 123, # 10 Exhibit 124, # 11 Exhibit 125, # 12 Exhibit 126, # 13 Exhibit 127, # 14 Exhibit 128, # 15 Exhibit 129, # 16 Exhibit 130, # 17 Exhibit 131, # 18 Exhibit 132, # 19 Exhibit 133, # 20 Exhibit 134, # 21 Exhibit 135, # 22 Exhibit 136, # 23 Exhibit 137, # 24 Exhibit 138, # 25 Exhibit 139, # 26 Exhibit 140, # 27 Exhibit 141, # 28 Exhibit 142, # 29 Exhibit 143, # 30 Exhibit 144, # 31 Exhibit 145, # 32 Exhibit 146, # 33 Exhibit 147, # 34 Exhibit 148, # 35 Exhibit 149, # 36 Exhibit 150, # 37 Exhibit 151, # 38 Exhibit 152, # 39 Exhibit 153, # 40 Exhibit 154, # 41 Exhibit 155, # 42 Exhibit 156, # 43 Exhibit 157, # 44 Exhibit 158, # 45 Exhibit 159, # 46 Exhibit 160, # 47 Exhibit 161, # 48 Exhibit 162, # 49 Exhibit 163)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 540 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 539 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 538 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Zhu in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 537 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 536 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Zhu. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 535 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Zhang in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 534 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 533 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Zhang. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 532 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Zee in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 531 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 530 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Zee. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 529 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Wrobel in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 528 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 527 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Wrobel. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 526 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Walsh in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 525 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 524 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Walsh. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 523 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Wagner in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 522 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 521 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Wagner. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 520 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Vannelli in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 519 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 518 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Vannelli. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 517 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Sullivan in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 516 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 515 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Sullivan. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 514 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Staiti in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 513 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 512 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Staiti. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 511 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Singer in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 510 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 509 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Singer. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 508 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Saphir in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 507 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 506 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Saphir. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 505 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Sabena in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 504 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 503 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Sabena. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 502 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Rochford in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 501 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 500 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Rochford. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 499 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Potosky in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 498 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 497 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Potosky. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 496 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Picchi in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 495 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 494 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Picchi. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 493 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Pelkey in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 492 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 491 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Pelkey. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 490 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Park in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 489 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 488 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Park. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 487 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Munroe in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 486 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 485 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Munroe. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 484 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: McGonigle in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 483 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 482 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: McGonigle. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 481 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: McElroy in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 480 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 479 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: McElroy. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 478 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Marcus in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 477 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 476 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Marcus. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 475 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Mannino in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 474 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 473 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Mannino. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 472 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Maloney in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 471 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 470 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Maloney. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 469 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Krishnamsetty in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: 467 Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (jfe)
September 12, 2012 Filing 468 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER: In consideration of foreign privacy laws, documentation of employment discrimination complaints in foreign countries shall be deemed confidential and filed under seal in the instant case. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/12/2012) (jfe)
September 12, 2012 Filing 466 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Krishnamsetty. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER: The following documents shall be stricken from the docket: dkt. no. 235, dkt. no. 236, and dkt. no. 237. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/12/2012) (jfe)
September 12, 2012 Filing 464 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Hewitt in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 463 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 462 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Hewitt. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 461 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Fernandez in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 460 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 459 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Fernandez. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 458 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Cutrupi in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 457 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 456 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Cutrupi. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 455 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Cherpelis in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 454 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 453 REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Cherpelis. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 452 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Batcho-Lino in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 451 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 450 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Batcho-Lino. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 449 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Barros in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 448 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 447 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Barros. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 446 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Alexander-Abraham in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 445 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 444 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Alexander-Abraham. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 443 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ, # 44 Exhibit RR, # 45 Exhibit SS, # 46 Exhibit TT)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 442 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 441 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 440 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
September 12, 2012 Filing 439 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 438 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 437 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Rochford. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 436 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 435 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 434 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Potosky. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 433 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 432 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 431 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Picchi. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 430 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 429 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 428 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Pelkey. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 427 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 Part A, # 6 Exhibit 5 Part B, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21 Part A, # 23 Exhibit 21 Part B, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26)(Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 426 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 425 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 424 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Sabena. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 423 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Sabena. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 422 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 421 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 420 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Saphir. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 419 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 418 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 417 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Singer. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 416 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 415 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 414 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 413 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Staiti. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 412 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 411 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit)(Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 410 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 409 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Sullivan. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 408 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 407 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Park. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 406 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 405 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Munroe. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 404 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 403 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 Part A, # 5 Exhibit 4 Part B, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 402 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 401 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Surlis. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 400 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 399 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 398 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 397 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Vannelli. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 396 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Vannelli. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 395 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 394 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 393 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. McGonigle. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 392 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Wagner. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 391 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 390 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 389 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Marcus. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 388 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 387 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 386 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 385 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Walsh. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 384 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 383 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 382 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 381 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Mannino. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 380 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Wrobel. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 379 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 378 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 377 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 376 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 375 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Zee. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 374 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Maloney. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 373 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 372 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 371 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Zhang. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 370 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Errata, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 369 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 368 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 367 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Krishnamsetty. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 366 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 365 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 364 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 363 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31 Part A, # 2 Exhibit 31 Part B, # 3 Exhibit 32, # 4 Exhibit 33, # 5 Exhibit 34, # 6 Exhibit 35, # 7 Exhibit 36, # 8 Exhibit 37, # 9 Exhibit 38, # 10 Exhibit 39, # 11 Exhibit 40, # 12 Exhibit 41, # 13 Exhibit 42, # 14 Exhibit 43, # 15 Exhibit 44, # 16 Exhibit 45, # 17 Exhibit 46, # 18 Exhibit 47, # 19 Exhibit 48, # 20 Exhibit 49, # 21 Exhibit 50, # 22 Exhibit 51, # 23 Exhibit 52, # 24 Exhibit 53, # 25 Exhibit 54, # 26 Exhibit 55, # 27 Exhibit 56, # 28 Exhibit 57, # 29 Exhibit 58, # 30 Exhibit 59, # 31 Exhibit 60, # 32 Exhibit 61, # 33 Exhibit 62, # 34 Exhibit 63, # 35 Exhibit 64, # 36 Exhibit 65, # 37 Exhibit 66, # 38 Exhibit 67, # 39 Exhibit 68, # 40 Exhibit 69, # 41 Exhibit 70, # 42 Exhibit 71, # 43 Exhibit 72, # 44 Exhibit 73, # 45 Exhibit 74, # 46 Exhibit 75, # 47 Exhibit 76, # 48 Exhibit 77, # 49 Exhibit 78)(Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 362 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Zhu. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 361 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Hewitt. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 360 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 359 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 358 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Fernandez. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 357 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 356 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 355 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Barros. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 354 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Cutrupi. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 353 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 352 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 351 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Cherpelis. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 350 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 349 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Stefanie Batcho-Lino. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 348 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 347 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit)(Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 346 DECLARATION of Richard Roth in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Maria Mandalakis, Monica Prestia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Part 3, # 4 Exhibit Part 4, # 5 Exhibit Part 5, # 6 Exhibit Part 6)(Silberstein, Milo)
September 12, 2012 Filing 345 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 12, 2012 Filing 344 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Alexander-Abraham. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 343 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Rose, Robert)
September 12, 2012 Filing 342 AFFIRMATION of Milo Silberstein Part 12 in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Jill Patricot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 166, # 2 Exhibit 167, # 3 Exhibit 168, # 4 Exhibit 169, # 5 Exhibit 170, # 6 Exhibit 171, # 7 Exhibit 172, # 8 Exhibit 173, # 9 Exhibit 174, # 10 Exhibit 175, # 11 Exhibit 176, # 12 Exhibit 177, # 13 Exhibit 178, # 14 Exhibit 179)(Silberstein, Milo)
September 12, 2012 Filing 341 DECLARATION of Milo Silberstein Part 11 in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Jill Patricot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 151, # 2 Exhibit 152, # 3 Exhibit 153, # 4 Exhibit 154, # 5 Exhibit 155, # 6 Exhibit 156, # 7 Exhibit 157, # 8 Exhibit 158, # 9 Exhibit 159, # 10 Exhibit 160, # 11 Exhibit 161, # 12 Exhibit 162, # 13 Exhibit 163, # 14 Exhibit 164, # 15 Exhibit 165)(Silberstein, Milo)
September 12, 2012 Filing 340 DECLARATION of Milo Silberstein Part 10 in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Jill Patricot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 136, # 2 Exhibit 137, # 3 Exhibit 138, # 4 Exhibit 139, # 5 Exhibit 140, # 6 Exhibit 141, # 7 Exhibit 142, # 8 Exhibit 143, # 9 Exhibit 144, # 10 Exhibit 145, # 11 Exhibit 146, # 12 Exhibit 147, # 13 Exhibit 148, # 14 Exhibit 149, # 15 Exhibit 150)(Silberstein, Milo)
September 12, 2012 Filing 339 DECLARATION of Milo Silberstein Part 9 in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Jill Patricot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 121, # 2 Exhibit 122, # 3 Exhibit 123, # 4 Exhibit 124, # 5 Exhibit 125, # 6 Exhibit 126, # 7 Exhibit 127, # 8 Exhibit 128, # 9 Exhibit 129, # 10 Exhibit 130, # 11 Exhibit 131, # 12 Exhibit 132, # 13 Exhibit 133, # 14 Exhibit 134, # 15 Exhibit 135)(Silberstein, Milo)
September 12, 2012 Filing 338 DECLARATION of Milo Silberstein Part 8 in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Jill Patricot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 106, # 2 Exhibit 107, # 3 Exhibit 108, # 4 Exhibit 109, # 5 Exhibit 110, # 6 Exhibit 111, # 7 Exhibit 112, # 8 Exhibit 113, # 9 Exhibit 114, # 10 Exhibit 115, # 11 Exhibit 116, # 12 Exhibit 117, # 13 Exhibit 118, # 14 Exhibit 119, # 15 Exhibit 120)(Silberstein, Milo)
September 12, 2012 Filing 337 DECLARATION of Milo Silberstein Part 7 in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Jill Patricot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 91, # 2 Exhibit 92, # 3 Exhibit 93, # 4 Exhibit 94, # 5 Exhibit 95, # 6 Exhibit 96, # 7 Exhibit 97, # 8 Exhibit 98, # 9 Exhibit 99, # 10 Exhibit 100, # 11 Exhibit 101, # 12 Exhibit 102, # 13 Exhibit 103, # 14 Exhibit 104, # 15 Exhibit 105)(Silberstein, Milo)
September 12, 2012 Filing 336 DECLARATION of Milo Silberstein Part 6 in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Jill Patricot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 76, # 2 Exhibit 77, # 3 Exhibit 78, # 4 Exhibit 79, # 5 Exhibit 80, # 6 Exhibit 81, # 7 Exhibit 82, # 8 Exhibit 83, # 9 Exhibit 84, # 10 Exhibit 85, # 11 Exhibit 86, # 12 Exhibit 87, # 13 Exhibit 88, # 14 Exhibit 89, # 15 Exhibit 90)(Silberstein, Milo)
September 12, 2012 Filing 335 DECLARATION of Raechel L. Adams in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Adams Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 2 to Adams Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exh. 3 to Adams Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exh. 4 to Adams Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exh. 5 to Adams Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exh. 6 to Adams Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exh. 7 to Adams Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exh. 8 to Adams Declaration, # 9 Exhibit Exh. 9 to Adams Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Exh. 10 to Adams Declaration, # 11 Exhibit Exh. 11 to Adams Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Exh. 12 to Adams Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Exh. 13 to Adams Declaration, # 14 Exhibit Exh. 14 to Adams Declaration, # 15 Exhibit Exh. 5, Part A, to Adams Declaration, # 16 Exhibit Exh. 15, Part B, to Adams Declaration, # 17 Exhibit Exh. 16 to Adams Declaration, # 18 Exhibit Exh. 17 to Adams Declaration, # 19 Exhibit Exh. 18 to Adams Declaration, # 20 Exhibit Exh. 19 to Adams Declaration, # 21 Exhibit Exh. 20 to Adams Declaration, # 22 Exhibit Exh. 21 to Adams Declaration, # 23 Exhibit Exh. 22 to Adams Declaration, # 24 Exhibit Exh. 23 to Adams Declaration, # 25 Exhibit Exh. 24 to Adams Declaration, # 26 Exhibit Exh. 25 to Adams Declaration, # 27 Exhibit Exh. 26 to Adams Declaration, # 28 Exhibit Exh. 27 to Adams Declaration, # 29 Exhibit Exh. 28 to Adams Declaration, # 30 Exhibit Exh. 29 to Adams Declaration, # 31 Exhibit Exh. 30 to Adams Declaration)(Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 334 DECLARATION of Milo Silberstein Part 5 in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Jill Patricot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 61, # 2 Exhibit 62, # 3 Exhibit 63, # 4 Exhibit 64, # 5 Exhibit 65, # 6 Exhibit 66, # 7 Exhibit 67, # 8 Exhibit 68, # 9 Exhibit 69, # 10 Exhibit 70, # 11 Exhibit 71, # 12 Exhibit 72, # 13 Exhibit 73, # 14 Exhibit 74, # 15 Exhibit 75)(Silberstein, Milo)
September 12, 2012 Filing 333 DECLARATION of Milo Silberstein Part 4 in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Jill Patricot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 46, # 2 Exhibit 47, # 3 Exhibit 48, # 4 Exhibit 49, # 5 Exhibit 50, # 6 Exhibit 51, # 7 Exhibit 52, # 8 Exhibit 53, # 9 Exhibit 54, # 10 Exhibit 55, # 11 Exhibit 56, # 12 Exhibit 57, # 13 Exhibit 58, # 14 Exhibit 59, # 15 Exhibit 60)(Silberstein, Milo)
September 12, 2012 Filing 332 DECLARATION of Milo Silberstein Part 3 in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Jill Patricot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31, # 2 Exhibit 32, # 3 Exhibit 33, # 4 Exhibit 34, # 5 Exhibit 35, # 6 Exhibit 36, # 7 Exhibit 37, # 8 Exhibit 38, # 9 Exhibit 39, # 10 Exhibit 40, # 11 Exhibit 41, # 12 Exhibit 42, # 13 Exhibit 43, # 14 Exhibit 44, # 15 Exhibit 45)(Silberstein, Milo)
September 12, 2012 Filing 331 DECLARATION of Milo Silberstein Part 2 in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Jill Patricot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16, # 2 Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit 19, # 5 Exhibit 20, # 6 Exhibit 21, # 7 Exhibit 22, # 8 Exhibit 23, # 9 Exhibit 24, # 10 Exhibit 25, # 11 Exhibit 26, # 12 Exhibit 27, # 13 Exhibit 28, # 14 Exhibit 29, # 15 Exhibit 30)(Silberstein, Milo)
September 12, 2012 Filing 330 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 329 DECLARATION of Milo Silberstein Part 1 in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Jill Patricot. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Silberstein, Milo)
September 12, 2012 Filing 328 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to EEOC Memorandum of Law)(Martinez, Ana)
September 12, 2012 Filing 327 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Maria Mandalakis, Jill Patricot, Monica Prestia. (Braverman, Marc)
September 12, 2012 Filing 326 COUNTER STATEMENT TO 324 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Marina Kushnir, Tanys Lancaster, Janet Loures, Maria Mandalakis, Jill Patricot, Monica Prestia. (Braverman, Marc)
September 12, 2012 Filing 325 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Plaintiff-Intervenors in Support re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit 67, # 68 Exhibit 68, # 69 Exhibit 69, # 70 Exhibit 70, # 71 Exhibit 71, # 72 Exhibit 72, # 73 Exhibit 73, # 74 Exhibit 74, # 75 Exhibit 75, # 76 Exhibit 76, # 77 Exhibit 77, # 78 Exhibit 78, # 79 Exhibit 79, # 80 Exhibit 80, # 81 Exhibit 81, # 82 Exhibit 82, # 83 Exhibit 83, # 84 Exhibit 84, # 85 Exhibit 85, # 86 Exhibit 86, # 87 Exhibit 87, # 88 Exhibit 88, # 89 Exhibit 89, # 90 Exhibit 90, # 91 Exhibit 91, # 92 Exhibit 92, # 93 Exhibit 93, # 94 Exhibit 94, # 95 Exhibit 95, # 96 Exhibit 96, # 97 Exhibit 97, # 98 Exhibit 98, # 99 Exhibit 99, # 100 Exhibit 100, # 101 Exhibit 101, # 102 Exhibit 102, # 103 Exhibit 103, # 104 Exhibit 104, # 105 Exhibit 105, # 106 Exhibit 106, # 107 Exhibit 107, # 108 Exhibit 108, # 109 Exhibit 109, # 110 Exhibit 110, # 111 Exhibit 111, # 112 Exhibit 112, # 113 Exhibit 113, # 114 Exhibit 114)(Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 324 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 323 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Claims of the Plaintiff-Intervenors. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 237 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to 465 Order. (jfe) Modified on 9/12/2012 (jfe).
September 11, 2012 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 236 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to 465 Order. (jfe) Modified on 9/12/2012 (jfe).
September 11, 2012 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 235 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to 465 Order. (jfe) Modified on 9/12/2012 (jfe).
September 11, 2012 Filing 321 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Cutrupi in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 320 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 319 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Cutrupi. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 318 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Zhu in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 317 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 316 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Zhu. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 315 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Zhang in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 314 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 313 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Zhang. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 312 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Zee in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 311 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 310 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Zee. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 309 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Wrobel in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 308 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 307 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Wrobel. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 306 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Walsh in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 305 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 304 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Walsh. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 303 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Wagner in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 302 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 301 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Wagner. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 300 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Vannelli in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 299 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 298 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Vannelli. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 297 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Sullivan in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 296 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 295 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Sullivan. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 294 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Staiti in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 293 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 292 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Staiti. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 291 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Singer in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 290 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 289 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Singer. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 288 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Saphir in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 287 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 286 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Saphir. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 285 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Sabena in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 284 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 283 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Sabena. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 282 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Rochford in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 281 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 280 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Rochford. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 279 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Potosky in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 278 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 277 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Potosky. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 276 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Picchi in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 275 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 274 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Picchi. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 273 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Pelkey in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 272 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 271 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Pelkey. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 270 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Park in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 269 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 268 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Park. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 267 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Munroe in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 266 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 265 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Munroe. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 264 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: McGonigle in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 263 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 262 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: McGonigle. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 261 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: McElroy Surlis in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 260 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 259 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: McElroy Surlis. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 258 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Marcus in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 257 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 256 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Marcus. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 255 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Mannino in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 254 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 253 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Mannino. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 252 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Maloney in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 251 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 250 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Maloney. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 249 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Krishnamsetty in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 248 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 247 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Krishnamsetty. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 246 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Hewitt in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 245 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 244 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Hewitt. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 243 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Fernandez in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 242 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 241 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Fernandez. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 240 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Dodd in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 239 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 238 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Dodd. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 234 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Cherpelis in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 233 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 232 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Cherpelis. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 231 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Batcho-Lino in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 230 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 229 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Batcho-Lino. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 228 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Barros in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 227 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 226 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Barros. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 225 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden re: Alexander-Abraham in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 224 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 223 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. re: Alexander-Abraham. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 222 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Golden in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43)(Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 221 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 220 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants.. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Golden, Thomas)
September 11, 2012 Filing 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Remaining Section 706 Claims Asserted by EEOC on Behalf of the 32 Non-Intervening Claimants. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER: Having considered the parties' submissions on the issue of sealing and redacting certain confidential information, the Court orders the parties to redact the following information from their respective papers in support and in opposition to the Motions as set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following documents shall be temporarily filed under seal in their entirety until further order from the Court as set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file their papers consistent with this Order within five business days of entry of this Order. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/4/2012) (ja)
June 14, 2012 Filing 217 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Eric Dreiband dated 6/13/2012 re: Defendant respectfully requests that this Court permit Defendant to serve its reply papers on June 28, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/14/2012) (lmb)
May 15, 2012 Filing 216 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Stephanie Holmes. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P.. (Dreiband, Eric)
May 15, 2012 Filing 215 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/5/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 15, 2012 Filing 214 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/5/2012 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Joanne Mancari, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 5, 2012 Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Case Management Conference held on 4/5/2012. (djc)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Justin Mulaire dated 3/20/2012 re: At the request of your chambers' staff, I write to advise the Court that counsel to the EEOC and Bloomberg are available for a conference in the above-noted action on Aprils, 2012, in the afternoon, concerning Bloomberg's application to seal or redact portions of its summary judgment papers. Your clerk stated that the conference would likely be set for 2:00 p.m. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel Shall appear for a conference on April 5, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 4/5/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/21/2012) (ama)
February 6, 2012 Filing 212 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/21/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 6, 2012 Filing 211 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 11/21/2011 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda Fisher, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 SCHEDULING ORDER: The briefing schedule is hereby amended as follows: January 18, 2012: Bloomberg serves its opening papers in support of its motions for summary judgment (as to both the Plaintiff-Intervenors as well as EEOC), with courtesy copies delivered to the Court no later than the following day. May 7, 2012: EEOC and Plaintiff-Intervenors serve their papers in opposition to Bloomberg's motions, with courtesy copies delivered to the Court no later than the following day. June 21, 2012: Bloomberg serves its reply papers in further support of its motions, wish courtesy copies delivered to the Court no later than the following day. The form, substance, and relevant page limits applicable to all submissions, as discussed and set by the parties before the Court at its November 21, 2011 conference, remain undisturbed. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/12/2012) (jfe)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER: THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:The claims of EEOC are dismissed to the extent that they include the allegations set forth in Appendix A; and as set forth in this order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/21/2011) (ama)
December 5, 2011 Filing 208 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/21/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 5, 2011 Filing 207 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 11/21/2011 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda Fisher, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/8/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 21, 2011 Minute Order Proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Conference held on 11/21/2011. (cd)
November 17, 2011 Filing 206 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ana Consuelo Martinez on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Martinez, Ana)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties shall, on or before November 7, 2011, submit either a joint or separate letters informing the Court of the status of any stipulation and proposed manner of proceeding on any claims the EEOC is or is not pursuing; The parties shall appear for a conference on November 21, 2011 at 2:30 p.m. in courtroom 12A to discuss the proposed briefing schedule and procedures on confidential information referenced in the October 28, 2011 letter. (Status Conference set for 11/21/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/1/2011) (djc)
October 17, 2011 Filing 204 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Justin Mulaire on behalf of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. New Address: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, 33 Whitehall St., Floor 5, New York, NY, USA 10004, 212-336-3722. (Mulaire, Justin)
September 16, 2011 Filing 203 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Raechel L. Adams dated 9/16/2011 re: Counsel writes on behalf of all parties to request permission to submit a joint proposal with respect to the remaining individual claims of discrimination on 10/7/2011. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/16/2011) (jfe)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 OPINION & ORDER #100672 granting 179 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties shall confer and inform the Court by letter no later than September 16, 2011, how they propose to proceed with respect to the remaining individual claims of discrimination. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/17/2011) (ft) Modified on 8/18/2011 (ajc).
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER, that any and all claims made in this action by or on behalf of the following claimants, all of whom ended their employment at Bloomberg before May 28, 2005, are dismissed as time-barred. It is further ORDERED, that the following discrimination claims, all of which are based on discrete acts that occurred before May 28, 2005, are dismissed as time barred. It is further ORDERED, that all discrimination claims brought by EEOC based on discrete acts that may have happened prior to May 28, 2005, whether or not listed above, are dismissed as time-barred. It is further ORDERED, that Bloomberg retains the right to challenge the timeliness of claims asserted by Plaintiffs-Intervenors. (See ORDER as set forth) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/22/2010) (lnl)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 169 Motion for Reconsideration. Upon reconsideration, the Court clarifies its prior opinion and order to exclude from summary judgment claims based on compensation decisions that took place prior to 5/28/05, pursuant to the Ledbetter Act. The parties shall confer and inform the Court by letter no later than 12/10/10, how they propose to proceed. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/2/10) (cd)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 OPINION AND ORDER #99592 The upshot is as follows. Any of the EEOC's discrimination claims, whether based on section 706 or 707, that are based on conduct that happened prior to May 28, 2005, are time-barred. In the alternative to the Court's dismissal of the retaliation claims for failure to conciliate, any of the EEOC's retaliation claims that are based on conduct that happened prior to April 5, 2007, are time barred. Specifically, fourteen discrimination claimants ended their employment relationships with Bloomberg prior to May 28, 2005. (See EEOC Facts paragraphs 25-38; Bloomberg Br. at 2 n.2 (listing claimants).) It is therefore impossible that they experienced actionable discrimination, and their claims are dismissed. The EEOC's suit contains thirty discrimination claimants (see Bloomberg Br. at 11 n.3) with allegations involving discrete acts that may have happened prior to May 28, 2005. Any of their claims based on such acts are time-barred and dismissed on the same basis. Because the record is unclear as to the specific claimants and claims that fall within the charge filing period, the Court leaves it to the parties to vet out the untimely claims. Finally, the EEOC alleges retaliation based on events that occurred prior to April 5, 2007, on behalf of seventeen claimants. See Bloomberg Br. at 18 n.4.) To the extent that these retaliation claims are based on such events, they are dismissed as time barred in the alternative to their dismissal for failure to conciliate. Here again, the record is not clear as to which claims and claimants fall within the charge-filing period. The Court leaves it to the parties to determine which claims are timely. For the reasons stated above, Bloomberg's Motion 99 for Summary Judgment as to Time Barred Claims [dkt. no. 99] is GRANTED. The parties shall confer and inform the Court by letter no later than November 8, 2010 how they propose to proceed. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/25/10); (djc) Modified on 10/26/2010 (ajc). Modified on 10/28/2010 (djc).
December 3, 2007 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Bloomberg L.P..(Golden, Thomas)
September 27, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bloomberg L.P.Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(db) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2007 (Rodriguez, Tiffany).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Bloomberg L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Robert David Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomberg L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?