September 1, 2017 |
Filing
416
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: re: 409 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by Theodore H. Frank. The Court finds Frank's request for $33,412.50 in attorneys' fees and expenses to be reasonable and accordingly grants Frank's motion. The fees and expenses are to be deducted from the remaining $405,000 in undistributed settlement funds. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/01/2017) (ama)
|
December 29, 2014 |
Filing
366
MEMORANDUM OPINION. This Court has reviewed the single objection to the distribution of the reserve fund and agrees with the claims administrator's rejection of that claim as well as that of the other ineligible claims. The Court authorizes the claims administrator to distribute the reserve fund as set forth in the motion and the Stephen J. Cirami Net Settlement Fund Distribution Affidavit, dated April 24, 2014 (Dkt. No. 316). The Court also directs lead counsel to pay the claims administra tor $581,651.30 in fees and expenses incurred in administering the settlement during the period from March 16, 2014 through October 15, 2014. (See Ex. G to Cirami Aff.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/29/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02070-SHS, 1:07-cv-09901-SHS (rjm)
|
July 21, 2014 |
Filing
355
OPINION & ORDER re: (334 in 1:07-cv-09901-SHS) MOTION for Permanent Injunction . filed by Charles O. Prince, Gary L. Crittenden, Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Sallie L. Krawcheck, Vikram Pandit. The Court grants Citi group's motion to enjoin claimants from now arbitrating their claims. It is hereby ORDERED that Gary L. Burgess and Joseph Icon are permanently enjoined from pursuing the arbitration captioned Burgess et al. v. Citigroup, Inc., et al., FINRA Case No. 13-03237. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/21/2014) (kgo)
|
May 30, 2014 |
Filing
329
MEMORANDUM OPINION #104383 re: (313 in 1:07-cv-09901-SHS) MOTION to Authorize Distribution of the Net Settlement Fund. filed by ATD Group.. More than five years after this litigation began, hundreds of thousands of investors in Citigroup commo n stock are on the precipice of receiving compensation for the significant losses they suffered due to alleged misstatements by Citigroup about its subprirne exposure. The Court has reviewed the precious few objections to the distribution of the sett lement fund (see Cirami Aff. Ex. D), and the Court is confident in the determinations of the claims administrator. The Court therefore authorizes the claims administrator to distribute the settlement fund. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/30/2014) (kgo) Modified on 5/30/2014 (ca).
|
August 1, 2013 |
Filing
275
OPINION re: (165 in 1:07-cv-09901-SHS) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses filed by M. David Diamond, Carol Weil, David Whitcomb, ATD Group, Public Employees' Retirement Association of Colorado, Anthony Sedut to, Henrietta Whitcomb, Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System, Edward Claus, Jonathan Butler, Warren Pinchuk, John A. Baden, (164 in 1:07-cv-09901-SHS) MOTION to Approve Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation filed by M. David Diamond, Car ol Weil, David Whitcomb, ATD Group, Public Employees' Retirement Association of Colorado, Anthony Sedutto, Henrietta Whitcomb, Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System, Edward Claus, Jonathan Butler, Warren Pinchuk, John A. Baden. The Court fin ds that proposed $590 million settlement and the proposed plan of allocation are fair, reasonable, and adequate. The Court further finds that the class was provided with adequate notice of class certification and the settlement. The Court thus grants plaintiffs' motion for final approval of the settlement and plan of allocation. The Court also grants Lead Counsel's motion for an aware of attorneys' fees- albeit a lower fee than requested. The Court awards Lead Counsel $ 70.8 million in attorneys' fees. Finally, the Court grants Lead Counsel's motion for reimbursement of $2,842,841.59 in litigation expenses. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 8/1/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02070-SHS, 1:07-cv-09901-SHS(tro) Modified on 8/1/2013 (tro).
|
November 9, 2010 |
Filing
88
OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED with respect to 1) the Section 10(b) claims against Citigroup and the Section 10(b) and 20(a) claims against Prince, Crittenden, Druskin, Maheras, Klein , Bushnell and Rubin for the alleged misstatements and omissions relating to Citigroup's CDO exposure during the period from February 2007 through November 3, 2007; 2) the Section l0(b) claims against Citigroup and the Section lO(b) and 20(a) cl aims against Crittenden for the alleged CDO-related misstatements and omissions occurring in the period from November 4, 2007 to April 2008. Defendants' motion to dismiss the remainder of plaintiffs' claims is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/9/2010) (ae)
|