Commonwealth of Puerto Rico v. Shell Oil Co.
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board
Defendant: Shell Oil Co., ExxonMobil Corporation, Shell Company Puerto Rico LTD, Shell Chemical Yabucoa, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Motiva Enterprises, LLC, Equilon Enterprises, LLC, Chevron Taxco Corporation, Chevron U.S.A., Inc.,, Chevron Puerto Rico, LLC, Texaco Puerto Rico, Inc., Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., Chevron International Oil Company, Inc., Texaco Refining And Marketing, Inc., Chevron Caribean, Inc., Chevron Estrella Puerto Rico, Inc., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), ConocoPhillips Company, Citgo Refining and Chemical Company, LP, Citgo International P.R., Citgo Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation, Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp., Total Oil Inc., Lyondell Chemical Company, Puerto Rico Sun Oil Company LLC, Texaco Petroleum, Inc., Chevron Corporation, Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), Hovensa L.L.C., Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Shell Enterprises, LLC, Chevron Phillips, Citgo Petroleum Corporation, Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation, Total Outre Mer, S.A., Total, S.A., Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited, Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Western Services, Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc., Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, Puma Energy Puerto Rico, Inc., Puma Energy International, B.V., Trafigura A.G., Trafigura Beheer, B.V., Petrobras America, Inc., Tauber Oil, Tenoco Oil Company, Idemitsu Apollo Corporation, Trammo Petroleum, Inc., Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Vitol, S.A., Does 1-99, Vitol, Inc. and ESSO STANDARD OIL
Special Master: Ronald J. Hedges
3Rd Party Defendant: John and Jane Does Nos. 1-99
Cross Defendant: John and Jane Does Nos. 100-200
Case Number: 1:2007cv10470
Filed: November 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 815 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #814 Order of Dismissal in favor of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. against Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated December 28, 2020, and having considered the recently filed Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4l(a)(2) as to Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. it is hereby: ORDERED Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(2), and, there being no just reason for delay, final judgment is entered dismissing all claims against that defendant in case nos. 07 Civ. 10470 and 14 Civ. 1014. Each Party to bear its own costs. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 12/29/2020) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal) (km)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 814 ORDER: Having considered the recently filed Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) as to Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. it is hereby: ORDERED Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), and, there being no just reason for delay the Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment dismissing all claims against that defendant in case nos. 07 Civ. 10470 and 14 Civ. 01014. Each Party to bear its own costs. SO ORDERED., Motions terminated: (248 in 1:14-cv-01014-VSB, 813 in 1:07-cv-10470-VSB) JOINT MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) as to Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. and Request for Entry of Partial Judgment filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico., Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp., Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation, Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation, Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation, Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation, Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. and Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. terminated. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/28/2020) (ama) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
December 3, 2020 Filing 813 JOINT MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) as to Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. and Request for Entry of Partial Judgment. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB, 1:07-cv-10470-VSB, 1:14-cv-01014-VSB.(Dema, John)
June 11, 2020 Filing 812 NOTICE of Notice of Withdrawal of Sarah Chaudhry on behalf of Vitol S.A. and Vitol Inc.. Document filed by Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A...(Chaudhry, Sarah)
April 15, 2020 Filing 811 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ETC Sunoco Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Operating L.P. for Puerto Rico Sun Oil Company LLC, Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). Document filed by Puerto Rico Sun Oil Company LLC, Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M)..(Krainin, Daniel)
April 1, 2020 Filing 810 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ETC Sunoco Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Operating L.P. for Puerto Rico Sun Oil Company LLC, Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). Document filed by Puerto Rico Sun Oil Company LLC, Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB, 1:07-cv-10470-VSB, 1:14-cv-01014-VSB.(Krainin, Daniel)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL granting #713 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion to withdraw the appearance of Moe Reyna as counsel of record for The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico through its Environmental Quality Board, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court, is hereby GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Attorney Noe Reyna terminated.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/1/2019) (rro)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL granting #712 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion to withdraw the appearance of Victor L. Cardenas, Jr., as counsel of record for The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico through its Environmental Quality Board, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court, is hereby GRANTED. (Attorney Victor Luis Cardenas, Jr terminated.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/1/2019) (rro)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 807 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #806 Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Travis James Mock terminated. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/6/2018) (rro)
September 4, 2018 Filing 806 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A.. (Mock, Travis)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 805 ORDER: granting (180) Motion in case 1:04-cv-01719-SAS; granting (183) Motion in case 1:04-cv-01720-SAS; granting (158) Motion in case 1:04-cv-01716-SAS; granting (179) Motion in case 1:04-cv-01721-SAS; granting (136) Motion in case 1:04-cv-02055-SAS; granting (133) Motion in case 1:04-cv-02057-SAS; granting (144) Motion in case 1:04-cv-02059-SAS; granting (143) Motion in case 1:04-cv-02061-SAS; granting (144) Motion in case 1:04-cv-02062-SAS; granting (139) Motion in case 1:04-cv-02066-SAS; granting (134) Motion in case 1:04-cv-02067-SAS; granting (154) Motion in case 1:04-cv-02068-SAS; granting (153) Motion in case 1:04-cv-02072-SAS; granting (170) Motion in case 1:04-cv-02390-SAS; granting (144) Motion in case 1:04-cv-03415-SAS; granting (147) Motion in case 1:04-cv-03412-SAS; granting (153) Motion in case 1:04-cv-03416-SAS; granting (721) Motion in case 1:04-cv-03417-SAS; granting (167) Motion in case 1:04-cv-03418-SAS; granting (148) Motion in case 1:04-cv-03419-SAS; granting (135) Motion in case 1:04-cv-04990-SAS; granting (151) Motion in case 1:04-cv-05421-SAS; granting (152) Motion in case 1:04-cv-05422-SAS; granting (151) Motion in case 1:04-cv-05423-SAS; granting (158) Motion in case 1:04-cv-06993-SAS; granting (804) Motion in case 1:07-cv-10470-VSB; granting (545) Motion in case 1:08-cv-00312-VSB; granting (155) Motion in case 1:09-cv-06554-SAS; granting (99) Motion in case 1:10-cv-07874-SAS; granting (96) Motion in case 1:10-cv-08182-SAS; granting (94) Motion in case 1:10-cv-08184-SAS; granting (87) Motion in case 1:10-cv-08742-SAS; granting (84) Motion in case 1:10-cv-08743-SAS; granting (119) Motion in case 1:11-cv-00479-SAS; granting (64) Motion in case 1:13-cv-07247-SAS; granting (81) Motion in case 1:13-cv-07271-SAS; granting (59) Motion in case 1:13-cv-07272-SAS; granting (66) Motion in case 1:13-cv-07299-SAS; granting (241) Motion in case 1:14-cv-01014-VSB; granting (385) Motion in case 1:14-cv-06228-VSB-DCF; granting (4502) Motion in case 1:00-cv-01898-VSB. The Motion to Remove Steven Leifer from Service Lists is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk's Office shall remove Mr. Leifer from the service lists of the MTBE MDL (00-CV-1898) and all cases within the MTBE MDL, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/25/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB et al., 4cv1715, 4cv1717, 4cv1718, 4cv2069 and 4cv2071. (ap) Modified on 4/26/2018 (ap).
April 25, 2018 Filing 804 MOTION Motion to Remove Steven Leifer from ECF Service Lists re: (4474 in 1:00-cv-01898-VSB) Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,, . Document filed by Hess Corporation(INDIVIDUALLY AND AS F/K/A, D/B/A AND/OR SUCCESSOR IN LIABILITY TO AMERADA HESS CORPORATION), Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP(INDIVIDUALLY AND AS F/K/A, D/B/A AND/OR SUCCESSOR IN LIABILITY TO MARATHON PETROLEUM COMPANY, LLC AND MARATHON ASHLAND PETROLEUM COMPANY LLC), Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Hess Corporation(formerly known as Amerada Hess Corporation), Marathon Oil Corporation(INDIVIDUALLY AND AS F/K/A, D/B/A AND/OR SUCCESSOR IN LIABILITY TO MARATHON OIL CO., MARATHON DE, MARATHON PC, MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION, MARATHON HOLDINGS, AND MARATHON PIPELINE), Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB et al.(Cassin, Vernon)
April 25, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Vernon Anthony Andrew Cassin to RE-FILE Document (384 in 1:14-cv-06228-VSB-DCF, 157 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 98 in 1:10-cv-07874-SAS, 147 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 151 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 720 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 178 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 150 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 544 in 1:08-cv-00312-VSB, 93 in 1:10-cv-08184-SAS, 150 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 152 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 152 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 142 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 166 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 63 in 1:13-cv-07247-SAS, 65 in 1:13-cv-07299-SAS, 134 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 143 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 133 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 80 in 1:13-cv-07271-SAS, 138 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 803 in 1:07-cv-10470-VSB, 173 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 154 in 1:09-cv-06554-SAS, 58 in 1:13-cv-07272-SAS, 135 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 4501 in 1:00-cv-01898-VSB, 179 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 157 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 146 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 83 in 1:10-cv-08743-SAS, 143 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 153 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 118 in 1:11-cv-00479-SAS, 169 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 86 in 1:10-cv-08742-SAS, 132 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 240 in 1:14-cv-01014-VSB, 182 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 143 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 95 in 1:10-cv-08182-SAS) MOTION Motion to Remove Steven Leifer from ECF Service Lists re: (4474 in 1:00-cv-01898-VSB) Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,, .. ERROR(S): No signature or s/. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB et al.(db)
April 24, 2018 Filing 803 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION Motion to Remove Steven Leifer from ECF Service Lists re: (4474 in 1:00-cv-01898-VSB) Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,, . Document filed by Hess Corporation(INDIVIDUALLY AND AS F/K/A, D/B/A AND/OR SUCCESSOR IN LIABILITY TO AMERADA HESS CORPORATION), Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP(INDIVIDUALLY AND AS F/K/A, D/B/A AND/OR SUCCESSOR IN LIABILITY TO MARATHON PETROLEUM COMPANY, LLC AND MARATHON ASHLAND PETROLEUM COMPANY LLC), Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Hess Corporation(formerly known as Amerada Hess Corporation), Marathon Oil Corporation(INDIVIDUALLY AND AS F/K/A, D/B/A AND/OR SUCCESSOR IN LIABILITY TO MARATHON OIL CO., MARATHON DE, MARATHON PC, MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION, MARATHON HOLDINGS, AND MARATHON PIPELINE), Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB et al.(Cassin, Vernon) Modified on 4/25/2018 (db).
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 802 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL, Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, it is hereby stipulated and agreed by the undersigned counsel that Amy E. Parker and Carlton D. Wilde, III of Bracewell LLP shall be substituted by the following as counsel of record for Defendant Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., f/k/a Atofina Petrochemicals, Inc. ("Total") in the above captioned MDL proceeding. Upon entry of this Order, Ms. Parker and Mr. Wilde shall be removed from the Court's service list, and all pleadings, notices of hearing, and other filings in the cases consolidated in this proceeding shall be served upon the aforementioned incoming counsel. Substitution of counsel will not delay the proceeding, nor will it cause prejudice to any other party. So Ordered. (Attorney Traci Leigh Lovitt for Total Petrochemicals & Refining U S A Inc, Carlton D. Wilde for Total Petrochemicals & Refining U S A Inc, Traci Leigh Lovitt for TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS AND REFINING USA, INC., Traci Leigh Lovitt for TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS AND REFINING USA, INC.,Traci Leigh Lovitt for Total Petrochemicals & Refining U S A Inc added. Attorney Amy E. Parker and Attorney Carlton D. Wilde terminated,.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/28/18) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB et al.(yv)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 801 ORDER. Came on for consideration the unopposed motion of Defendant Petrobras America Inc. ("PAI") for withdrawal of attorney. The Court, having considered the motion, the record, and applicable authorities, concludes that PAI's motion should be granted. Therefore, The Court ORDERS that PAIs unopposed motion for withdrawal of attorney be, and is hereby, GRANTED. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that David C. Schulte be, and is hereby, withdrawn as counsel of record for PAI, and that David C. Schulte be, and is hereby, relieved of any further obligations as counsel of record for PAI in this action. Granting (doc. no. 800 in case no. 07cv10470) MOTION for David C. Schulte to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed). Document filed by Petrobras America, Inc. Attorney David C. Schulte terminated in case 1:07-cv-10470-VSB. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/1/2018). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB, 1:07-cv-10470-VSB (rjm)
February 27, 2018 Filing 800 MOTION for David C. Schulte to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed). Document filed by Petrobras America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, James)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER. Having considered the recently filed Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) as to Trammo Petroleum, Inc. and Trammo Caribbean, Inc., it is hereby: ORDERED that Defendants Trammo Petroleum, Inc. and Trammo Caribbean, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: (798 in 1:07-cv-10470-VSB) JOINT MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2) as to Trammo Petroleum, Inc. and Trammo Caribbean, Inc filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Party Trammo Petroleum, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/11/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB, 1:07-cv-10470-VSB (rjm) Modified on 10/16/2017 (rjm).
September 8, 2017 Filing 798 JOINT MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2) as to Trammo Petroleum, Inc. and Trammo Caribbean, Inc. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petit, William)
July 31, 2017 Filing 797 NOTICE of Withdraw Legal Representation of Andres W. Lopez. Document filed by Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A.. (Ligh, Peter)
June 21, 2017 Filing 796 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Peter C. Condron on behalf of Equilon Enterprises L L C, Motiva Enterprises L L C, Shell Oil Co., Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum Inc, Shell Trading (U S) Co, Shell Trading (US) Company, T M R Co. New Address: Crowell & Moring LLP, 1001 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, Washington, DC, US 20004, 202-624-2558. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB et al.(Condron, Peter)
May 8, 2017 Filing 795 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 7/12/13 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the July 17, 2013 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 8, 2017 Filing 794 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 7/9/13 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the July 17, 2013 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 8, 2017 Filing 793 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 6/6/13 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the June 11, 2013 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 8, 2017 Filing 792 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 6/3/13 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the June 11, 2013 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 8, 2017 Filing 791 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 4/5/13 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the April 10, 2013 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 8, 2017 Filing 790 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 4/2/13 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the April 10, 2013 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 8, 2017 Filing 789 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 11/30/12 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the December 5, 2012 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 8, 2017 Filing 788 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 11/27/12 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the December 5, 2012 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 8, 2017 Filing 787 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 10/17/12 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the October 22, 2012 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 8, 2017 Filing 786 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 7/9/12 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the July 12, 2012 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 8, 2017 Filing 785 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 7/3/12 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the July 12, 2012 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 8, 2017 Filing 784 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 6/4/12 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the June 7, 2012 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 8, 2017 Filing 783 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 3/22/12 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the March 30, 2012 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 782 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated September 4, 2013 re: Plaintiffs' Pre-Conference Reply letter for the September 10, 2013, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D [Part 1], #4 Exhibit D [Part 2], #5 Exhibit E)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 781 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated July 20, 2015 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the July 28, 2015, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 780 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Curt D. Marshall dated April 21, 2015 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the April 24, 2015, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 779 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated April 16, 2015 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the April 24, 2015, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to D)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 778 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated January 12, 2015 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the January 15, 2015, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 777 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated January 7, 2015 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the January 15, 2015, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 776 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated September 25, 2014 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the October 1, 2014, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to C)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 775 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated September 22, 2014 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the October 1, 2014, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 774 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated August 11, 2014 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the August 14, 2014, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 4)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 773 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Curt D. Marshall dated August 6, 2014 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the August 14, 2014, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 5)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 772 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated July 10, 2014 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the July 15, 2014, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 771 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated May 5, 2014 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the May 13, 2014, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to C)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 770 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated March 14, 2014 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the March 19, 2014, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 769 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated March 11, 2014 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the March 19, 2014, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to E)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 768 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Tracey O'Reilly dated January 6, 2014 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the January 14, 2014, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 3)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 767 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Robin Greenwald dated November 13, 2013 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the November 18, 2013, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 766 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated November 8, 2013 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the November 18, 2013, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 765 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated October 10, 2013 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the October 15, 2013, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 764 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated August 30, 2013 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the September 10, 2013, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to E)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 763 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Curt D. Marshall dated July 12, 2013 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the July 12, 2013, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 5)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 762 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated July 9, 2013 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the July 17, 2013, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to G)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 761 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated June 6, 2013 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the June 11, 2013, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to D)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 760 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated June 3, 2013 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the June 11, 2013, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Exhibit C to E)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 759 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated April 5, 2013 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the April 10, 2013, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit V)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 758 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Curt D. Marshall dated April 2, 2013 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the April 10, 2013, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to U)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 757 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated February 20, 2013 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the February 25, 2013, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 756 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated February 15, 2013 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the February 25, 2013, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to I)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 755 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated November 30, 2012 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the December 5, 2012, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to D)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 754 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated November 27, 2012 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the December 5, 2012, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to U)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 753 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated October 12, 2012 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the October 22, 2012, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to H)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 752 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated August 8, 2012 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the August 16, 2012, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 14)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 751 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated July 9, 2012 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the July 12, 2012, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to J)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 750 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated July 3, 2012 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the July 12, 2012, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Q)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 749 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated May 30, 2012 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the June 7, 2012, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to F)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 748 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated March 27, 2012 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the March 30, 2012, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to F)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 747 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated February 21, 2012 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the February 24, 2012, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to F)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 746 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated January 17, 2012 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the January 20, 2012, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 745 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated March 25, 2011 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the March 30, 2011, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 744 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William A. Walsh dated November 18, 2010 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the November 23, 2010, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 743 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Robin Greenwald dated November 9, 2010 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the November 17, 2010, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 742 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Robin Greenwald dated April 9, 2010 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the April 14, 2010, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 741 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Robin Greenwald dated April 7, 2010 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the April 14, 2010, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to D)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 740 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Robin Greenwald dated February 23, 2010 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the March 2, 2010, Conference.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A and B)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 739 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Robin Greenwald dated January 4, 2010 re: Plaintiff's Pre-Conference Letter for the January 7, 2010, Conference.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to E)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 738 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Robin Greenwald dated December 31, 2009 re: Plaintiffs' Pre-Conference Letter for the January 7, 2010, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to H)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 737 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Robin Greenwald dated October 26, 2009 re: Plaintiffs' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the October 30, 2009, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to E)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 736 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Robin Greenwald dated October 23, 2009 re: Plaintiffs' Pre-Conference Letter for October 30, 2009, Conference. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Axline, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Filing 735 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 2/21/12 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the February 24, 2012 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 734 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 2/16/12 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the February 24, 2012 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 733 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 1/12/12 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the January 20, 2012 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 732 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 3/22/11 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the March 30, 2011 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 731 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 11-18-10 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the November 23, 2010 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 730 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 11-9-10 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the November 17, 2010 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 729 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 5/14/10 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the May 19, 2010 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 728 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 4/9/10 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the April 14, 2010 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 727 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 4/7/10 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the April 14, 2010 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 726 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 2/25/10 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the March 2, 2010 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 725 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 2/23/10 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the March 2, 2010 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 724 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 1/4/10 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the January 7, 2010 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 723 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 12/31/09 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the January 7, 2010 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 722 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 3/30/09 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Reply Letter for the April 2, 2009 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 5, 2017 Filing 721 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter John Sacripanti dated 3/25/09 re: Defendants' Pre-Conference Letter for the April 2, 2009 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Sacripanti, Peter)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 720 STIPULATION & ORDER PURSUANT TO JPML RULE 10.4(a): IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED AS FOLLOWS: 1. The parties request that the documents listed on Attachment A, which were previously submitted to the MDL Court but not docketed, be added to the docket for Case No. 07-cv-10470. Such documents will be promptly filed by the parties via ECF upon entry of this Order; and 2. The parties further request that, after such addition, the entirety of the docket for Case No. 07-cv-10470, with the exception of the documents listed on Attachment B, be remanded to the United States District Court for District of Puerto Rico; and 3. The parties further request that the documents listed on Attachment C, which are contained on the MDL 1358 Master Docket, Case No. 00-cv-1898, also be remanded to the United States District Court for District of Puerto Rico. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/2/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB, 1:07-cv-10470-VSB(mro)
April 28, 2017 Filing 719 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Michael Axline dated April 28, 2017 re: Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Record on Remand. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 718 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL granting (717 in case 1:07-cv-10470-VSB) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion to withdraw the appearance of Albniz Couret-Fuentes as counsel of record for defendant Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp., pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court, is hereby GRANTED. (Attorney Albeniz Couret-Fuentes terminated). (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/17/2017) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB, 1:07-cv-10470-VSB (cla)
April 14, 2017 Filing 717 MOTION for Albeniz Couret-Fuentes to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
March 14, 2017 Filing 716 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Michael Axline dated March 14, 2017 re: Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Record on Remand. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
November 10, 2016 Filing 715 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Chaudhry on behalf of Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A.. (Chaudhry, Sarah)
September 15, 2016 Filing 714 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core LLC and ConocoPhillips Company.Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company.(Dillard, Stephen)
August 25, 2016 Filing 713 MOTION for Noe Reyna to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilmour, John)
August 25, 2016 Filing 712 MOTION for Victor L. Cardenas, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilmour, John)
August 18, 2016 Filing 711 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core LLC's CORRECTED Responses to Plaintiff's 5th Request for Production.Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc..(Dillard, Stephen)
August 18, 2016 Filing 710 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core.Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc..(Dillard, Stephen)
August 18, 2016 Filing 709 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from ConocoPhillips Company.Document filed by ConocoPhillips Company.(Dillard, Stephen)
August 8, 2016 Filing 708 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by John Dalston Smith Gilmour on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. New Address: Jackson Gilmour & Dobbs, PC, 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 900, Houston, TX, USA 77027, 713-355-5000. (Gilmour, John)
August 8, 2016 Filing 707 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William James Jackson on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. New Address: Jackson Gilmour& Dobbs, PC, 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 900, Houston, TX, USA 77027, 713-355-5000. (Jackson, William)
August 8, 2016 Filing 706 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William Creeger Petit on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. New Address: Jackson Gilmour & Dobbs, PC, 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 900, Houston, TX, USA 77027, 713-355-5000. (Petit, William)
May 16, 2016 Filing 705 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (687 in 1:07-cv-10470-VSB, 4370 in 1:00-cv-01898-VSB) Notice of Appeal, filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. USCA Case Number 16-329. The parties have filed a stipulation to withdraw the above-captioned appeal with prejudice. The stipulation is SO ORDERED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 05/16/2016. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-VSB, 1:07-cv-10470-VSB(nd)
May 16, 2016 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (sjo)
May 16, 2016 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Shira A. Scheindlin is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 704 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 122: This CMO memorializes rulings made at the April 26, 2016 status conference, as well as agreements reached by the Parties regarding preliminary discovery for Phase II of this case. 1) EXCHANGE OF INITIAL DISCOVERY: a) By Plaintiffs: By July 19, 2016, Plaintiffs shall: i) Answer Defendants' March 4, 2016 First Set of Discovery on Non-Trial Sites ("First Set") as follows: A) Answer Interrogatory No. 1 as to each site. Plaintiffs need not identify defendants by each cause of action being asserted. B) Answer Interrogatory No. 2 as written to the extent Plaintiffs knows of the supplier(s). Plaintiffs shall indicate date range of supply, if known. C) Plaintiffs need not answer Interrogatory No. 3 because it merely asks Plaintiffs to identify the additional information and/or documents it needs to answer Interrogatory No. 2, which the Court determine does not require a response. D) Answer Interrogatory No. 4 as written. E) Produce the written report and laboratory report that formed the basis of Plaintiffs' answer to Interrogatory No. 4 (a) and (b). PHASE II DISCOVERY & STRUCTURE: By October 14, 2016, the parties will begin to meet and confer regarding (i) additional discovery required in Phase II; (ii) potential for stipulated dismissal of sites; and (iii) a Phase II trial structure consistent with CMO 124. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/29/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(kl)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 703 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 124: It is hereby ORDERED that any and all claims that remain following the Phase I trials shall be resolved in a single trial ("Phase II"), so long as such a trial protects the constitutional rights of all parties. The parties are directed to meet and confer on the structure of a Phase II trial in each case by the dates set in CMO No. 122 section 2 and CMO No. 123 section 6. Any dispute regarding the structure of such a trial will be resolved by the Court after full briefing, if required. Because the New Jersey and Puerto Rico I cases differ, the parties are not required to reach the same structure for a Phase II trial in each of those cases. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/29/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:08-cv-00312-SAS(kl)
April 29, 2016 Filing 702 ANSWER to #175 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Trammo Petroleum, Inc..(Goodman, Robert)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 701 OPINION AND ORDER #106426: For the foregoing reasons, the Commonwealth's Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED, the Court's December 3, 2015 opinion is VACATED as to the finding that the Court lacks personal jurisdiction over Trammo Petroleum, and Trammo Petroleum is reinstated as a defendant. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion (Dkt. No. 677). (As further set forth in this Opinion) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/15/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(kl) Modified on 5/4/2016 (ca).
March 28, 2016 Filing 700 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER AND SEPARATION OF CLAIMS AND CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...It appears that the action on the conditional transfer order regarding certain claims in the above-captioned action have been completed as to five allegedly contaminated sites ("Phase I Trial Sites") and that remand of the pending claims with respect to those sites and defendants to the transferor court, as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1407(a), is appropriate. Therefore, the pending claims concerning the five Phase I Trial Sites be separated and remanded to the transferor court. Transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of Puerto Rico. (Signed by MDL Panel on 3/18/2016) (sjo)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 699 ORDER: The Court has considered the unopposed request of Petroleum Products Corporation (now known as Pyramid LLC) to admit pro hac vice Barry Goheen, Esq., Geoffrey M. Drake, Esq., and Jonathan M. Goossen, Esq., of King & Spalding LLP and the request is hereby GRANTED; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Barry Goheen, Esq., Geoffrey M. Drake, Esq., and Jonathan M. Goossen, Esq. are admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Petroleum Products Corporation (now known as Pyramid LLC) in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $600 fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(ama)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 698 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL BRIAN J. SULLIVAN in case 1:01-cv-00704-SAS; granting (4391) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion to withdraw the appearance of Brian J. Sullivan as counsel of record for Defendants Cumberland Farms, Inc. and Gulf Oil Limited Partnership, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court, is hereby GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Brian J. Sullivan terminated in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al. (kl)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 697 JOINT SUGGESTION TO REMAND: The Court hereby finds that discovery on the Phase I Trial Sites has been substantially completed. Furthermore, the Court has issued its rulings with respect to all summary judgment motions filed concerning the Phase I Trial Sites. Accordingly, the Court hereby finds that the coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings have run their course with respect to claims related to the Phase I Trial Sites. The Court therefore suggests that the Panel remand to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico all Phase I Trial Sites identified above for all further proceedings, including additional pretrial, trial and post-trial proceedings. Such proceedings shall be consistent with CMO 1173 and with the Court's above-referenced summary judgment rulings. As of this time this Court will retain jurisdiction over the remainder of the Action in order to conduct coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/7/2016) ***A copy of the Order was forwarded via email to the MDL Clerk on 3/15/16*** Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(kl) Modified on 3/15/2016 (kl).
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 696 ORDER: The March 14, 2016 MTBE Status Conference for all cases is rescheduled for March 29, 2016 at 2:30PM. ( Status Conference set for 3/29/2016 at 02:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/3/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al., pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) Modified on 3/4/2016 (mro).
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER: Having considered the recently filed Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) as to Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation and HOVENSA L.L.C., it is hereby: ORDERED that Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation and HOVENSA L.L.C. are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). SO ORDERED. Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation and Hovensa L.L.C. terminated. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/1/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(kl)
February 29, 2016 Filing 694 JOINT MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2) as to Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation and HOVENSA L.L.C. . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dema, John)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: The request of Meghan E. Judge, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action has been granted. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/23/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(kl)
February 3, 2016 Filing 691 RESPONSE to Motion re: #677 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #656 Memorandum & Opinion,, #661 Memorandum & Opinion,, . Letter requesting that the Court not consider the reply declaration of William Petit dated February 2, 2016 on behalf of the plaintiff. Document filed by Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Goodman, Robert)
February 3, 2016 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: (687 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 4370 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF) Notice of Appeal. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS. (tp)
February 3, 2016 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for (687 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 4370 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF) Notice of Appeal, filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS. (tp)
February 2, 2016 Filing 690 DECLARATION of William C. Petit in Support re: #677 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #656 Memorandum & Opinion,, #661 Memorandum & Opinion,, .. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Petit, William)
February 2, 2016 Filing 689 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William C. Petit dated 02/02/2016 re: [677-678] MOTION for Reconsideration. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board.(Petit, William)
February 2, 2016 Filing 688 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #677 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #656 Memorandum & Opinion,, #661 Memorandum & Opinion,, . . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Petit, William)
February 2, 2016 Filing 687 NOTICE OF APPEAL from (4353 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 675 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) Clerk's Judgment,,. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-11909554. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER granting [4369 in case no. 00cv1898] MOTION for Michael Coy Connelly to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.'s Motion to Withdraw Appearance seeking to remove M. Coy Connelly as counsel of record in the above-captioned Multi-District Litigation and all cases consolidated therein pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that CM/ECF notifications should no longer be delivered to M. Coy Connelly but instead to Amy E. Parker at amy.parker@bracewelllaw.com. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/1/2016) (kl)
January 22, 2016 Filing 686 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Robert S. Goodman dated 01/22/2016 re: courtesy copies. Document filed by Trammo Petroleum, Inc..(Goodman, Robert)
January 21, 2016 Filing 685 DECLARATION of Barry R. Temkin in Opposition re: #677 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #656 Memorandum & Opinion,, #661 Memorandum & Opinion,, .. Document filed by Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Temkin, Barry)
January 21, 2016 Filing 684 DECLARATION of William E. Markstein in Opposition re: #677 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #656 Memorandum & Opinion,, #661 Memorandum & Opinion,, .. Document filed by Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7Part1, #8 Exhibit 7Part2, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(Temkin, Barry)
January 21, 2016 Filing 683 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #677 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #656 Memorandum & Opinion,, #661 Memorandum & Opinion,, . . Document filed by Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Temkin, Barry)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER granting #681 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The request for an enlarged page limit is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/19/2016) (kl)
January 19, 2016 Filing 681 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Trammo Petroleum in opposition to plaintiff's motion for reconsideration addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Robert S. Goodman dated January 19, 2016. Document filed by Trammo Petroleum, Inc..(Goodman, Robert) Modified on 1/20/2016 (db).
January 15, 2016 Filing 680 ANSWER to #175 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc..(Sanchez, Adrian)
January 14, 2016 Filing 679 DECLARATION of William C. Petit in Support re: #677 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #656 Memorandum & Opinion,, #661 Memorandum & Opinion,, .. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(Petit, William)
January 14, 2016 Filing 678 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #677 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #656 Memorandum & Opinion,, #661 Memorandum & Opinion,, . . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Petit, William)
January 14, 2016 Filing 677 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #656 Memorandum & Opinion,, #661 Memorandum & Opinion,, . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board.(Petit, William)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORDER: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. The Commonwealth shall re-file its motion for reconsideration in accordance with the docketing procedures of this Court and such re-filing shall relate back to December 17, 2015, the original date of the filing of such motion. 2. Trammo Petroleum's request for a modification of the briefing schedule is granted. 3. Trammo Petroleum's opposition to the reconsideration motion is now due to be filed on January 21, 2016 and the Commonwealth's reply on such motion is now due to be filed on February 2, 2016. (Responses due by 1/21/2016, Replies due by 2/2/2016.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/13/2016) (kl)
January 5, 2016 Filing 675 CLERK'S CORRECTED 54(B)JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated December 31, 2015, the request for a 54(b) final Judgment is granted, there is no just reason for delay, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 54(b), judgment is entered for Tauber Oil Company in 07 Civ. 10470 and 14 Civ. 01014. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 1/5/2016) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal, #2 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(dt)
January 4, 2016 Filing 674 CLERK'S RULE 54(b)JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated December 31, 2015, the request for a 54(b) final Judgment is granted, there is no just reason for delay, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 54(b), judgment is entered for Trauber Oil Company in 07 Civ. 10470 and 14 Civ. 01014. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 12/31/2015) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal, #2 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(dt)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 673 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: (176 in 1:14-cv-01014-SAS) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Tauber Oil, (652 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Tauber Oil. For the aforementioned reasons, the request for a 54(b) final judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment for Tauber Oil Company and close these motions (07 Civ. 10470, Dkt. No. 652; 14 Civ. 01014, Dkt. No. 176). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/31/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(kko)
December 31, 2015 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (673 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 4350 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 213 in 1:14-cv-01014-SAS) Memorandum & Opinion to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(kko)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 672 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: (640 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (637) Memorandum & Opinion, filed by ExxonMobil Corporation, Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico). For the reasons set forth in this Memorandum Opinion and Order, the motion is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion (Dkt. No. 640). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(tro)
December 18, 2015 Filing 671 DECLARATION of LISA GERSON in Support re: #670 Response. Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico). (Gerson, Lisa)
December 18, 2015 Filing 670 RESPONSE re: #666 Declaration, . Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico). (Gerson, Lisa)
December 18, 2015 Filing 669 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from William C. Petit dated 12/18/2015 re: Proposed Discovery Schedule. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board.(Petit, William)
December 18, 2015 Filing 668 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from James B. Harris dated 12/18/15 re: Proposed Discovery Schedule. Document filed by Petrobras America, Inc..(Harris, James)
December 17, 2015 Filing 667 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Reconsideration re; #656 Memorandum & Opinion,, #661 Memorandum & Opinion,, . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William C. Petit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibits B-D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibits E-H to Declaration)(Gilmour, John) Modified on 12/22/2015 (db).
December 15, 2015 Filing 666 DECLARATION of Bruce K. Green Regarding the Esso CO-242 Site. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Gilmour, John)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER: Having considered the recently filed Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(i) as to Trammo Caribbean, Inc. under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), it is hereby: ORDERED that Trammo Caribbean, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). SO ORDERED. Party Trammo Caribbean, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(kl) Modified on 12/15/2015 (kl).
December 14, 2015 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney John Dema to E-MAIL Document No. #664 Notice of voluntary dismissal to judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. This document is not filed via ECF. (jk)
December 11, 2015 Filing 664 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Trammo Caribbean, Inc.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dema, John) Modified on 12/14/2015 (jk).
December 9, 2015 Filing 663 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ESSO CARIBBEAN INVESTMENTS LIMITED for ESSO STANDARD OIL, Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico). Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ESSO STANDARD OIL.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Gerson, Lisa)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 662 CORRECTED OPINION AND ORDER #106114: For the foregoing reasons, the defendants' motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion (Dkt. No. 606). (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/7/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(kl) Modified on 1/6/2016 (ca).
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 661 CORRECTED OPINION AND ORDER # 106115: For the above reasons, the Orders of July 26, 2013; December 30, 2013; and May 21, 2015 (Dkt. Nos. 315, 357, 601) are VACATED as to the Dismissed Defendants, Trammo Petroleum, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is GRANTED, and the remaining Dismissed Defendants are REINSTATED. The parties are directed to submit a joint proposed discovery schedule to this Court by December 18, 2015. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/7/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(kl) Modified on 1/6/2016 (ca).
December 7, 2015 Filing 660 AMENDED ANSWER to. Document filed by Exxon Mobil Corp. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Gerson, Lisa)
December 7, 2015 Filing 659 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Gerson, Lisa) Modified on 12/9/2015 (lb).
December 4, 2015 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 658 Endorsed Letter. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kl)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL in case 1:01-cv-00704-SAS; granting (4297) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Motion for Withdrawal of Appearances of Michael Dillon and Stephen Riccardulli as counsel of record for the Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Oil Corporation, ExxonMobil Refining & Supply Company, Exxon Company, U.S.A., Mobil Oil Corporation, Exxon Caribbean Sales Inc., Exxon Mobil Sales and Supply LLC, and Esso Standard Oil Co. (Puerto Rico) (collectively, the "ExxonMobil Defendants"), pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, is hereby GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Stephen Joseph Riccardulli terminated in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/3/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al. (kl)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 656 OPINION AND ORDER #106115: For the above reasons, the Orders of July 26, 2013; December 30, 2013; and May 21, 2015 (Dkt. Nos. 315, 357, 601) are VACATED as to the Dismissed Defendants, Trammo Petroleum, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is GRANTED, Partially vacated as per Judge's Order dated 4/15/2016, Doc. #701. and the remaining Dismissed Defendants are REINSTATED. The parties are directed to submit a joint proposed discovery schedule to this Court by December 18, 2015. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/3/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(kl) Modified on 1/6/2016 (ca). Modified on 4/18/2016 (kl).
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 655 OPINION AND ORDER #106114: For the foregoing reasons, the defendants' motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion (Dkt. No. 606). (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/3/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(kl) Modified on 1/6/2016 (ca).
December 3, 2015 Filing 654 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Michael A. Walsh dated December 3, 2015 re: No Response to Tauber's Motions for Certified Final Judgment. Document filed by Tauber Oil.(Walsh, Michael)
November 18, 2015 Filing 653 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #652 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . . Document filed by Tauber Oil. (Walsh, Michael)
November 18, 2015 Filing 652 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . Document filed by Tauber Oil. Return Date set for 12/9/2016 at 04:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael)
November 6, 2015 Filing 651 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #640 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #637 Memorandum & Opinion,, . . Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Dillon, Michael)
November 2, 2015 Filing 650 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #639 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Idemitsu Apollo Corporation, Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc., Petrobras America, Inc., Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc., Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harris, James)
November 2, 2015 Filing 649 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Travis James Mock on behalf of Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A.. (Mock, Travis)
November 2, 2015 Filing 648 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meghana Shah on behalf of Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A.. (Shah, Meghana)
November 2, 2015 Filing 647 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Ligh on behalf of Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A.. (Ligh, Peter)
October 30, 2015 Filing 646 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #640 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #637 Memorandum & Opinion,, . . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Gilmour, John)
October 30, 2015 Filing 645 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from John D.S. Gilmour dated October 30, 2015 re: response to Shell Defendants' 10-23-15 letter. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board.(Gilmour, John)
October 30, 2015 Filing 644 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from John D.S. Gilmour dated October 30, 2015 re: response to Shell Defendants' 10-23-15 letter. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board.(Gilmour, John)
October 28, 2015 Filing 643 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Victor L. Cardenas, Jr. dated October 28, 2015 re: translated cases requested. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)(Cardenas, Victor)
October 23, 2015 Filing 642 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Richard E. Wallace dated 10/23/15 re: Puerto Rico Limitations. Document filed by Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Wallace, Richard)
October 15, 2015 Filing 641 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #640 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #637 Memorandum & Opinion,, . . Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation. (Dillon, Michael)
October 15, 2015 Filing 640 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #637 Memorandum & Opinion,, . Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation.(Dillon, Michael)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The above defendants (Idemitsu Apollo Corporation; Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc.; Petrobras America Inc.; Vitol, Inc.; Vitol, S.A.; Trammo Carribean, Inc.; and Trammo Petroleum, Inc.) are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this Court should not vacate and reconsider the July 16, 2013; December 30, 2013; and May 19, 2015 Orders. Defendants may submit a Memorandum of Law of no more than ten pages by November 2, 2015. SO ORDERED. (As further set forth within this Order.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/15/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ajs)
October 5, 2015 Filing 638 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Adrian Sanchez, Sr on behalf of Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc.. New Address: Sanchez-Pagan, L.L.C., P.O. Box 365006, San Juan, Puerto Rico, U.S.A. 00936, 787-579-7972. (Sanchez, Adrian)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 637 OPINION AND ORDER #105956 re: (597 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Statute of Limitations. filed by ExxonMobil Corporation, Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico). For the foregoing reasons, the defendants' motion for summary judgment is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion (Dkt. No. 597). SO ORDERED. (As further set forth within this Opinion.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/1/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ajs) Modified on 10/19/2015 (ca).
September 18, 2015 Filing 636 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to HOVENSA L.L.C. . Document filed by Hovensa L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankruptcy Petition)(Leifer, Steven)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER denying (633) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:07-cv-10470-SAS. For the reasons set forth above, the motion is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion (Docket #633). (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/4/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS (kl)
September 2, 2015 Filing 634 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #633 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #631 Memorandum & Opinion,,, . . Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. (Dillon, Michael)
September 2, 2015 Filing 633 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #631 Memorandum & Opinion,,, . Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company.(Dillon, Michael)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Stephen J. Riccardulli dated 8/27/2015 re: Extension of time. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's request is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant's opposition to the Motion for Consolidation is due 9/16/15. Defendant's reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss Island-Wide Claims and Relief is still due 9/2/15. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 9/16/2015, Replies due by 9/2/2015.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/27/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(ajs)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 631 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: (4224 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 621 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order re Design Defect and Negligence. filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, (616 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification of the Court's Opinion on Defendants' Sophisticated Purchaser Motion for Summary Judgment . filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. For the foregoing reasons, the motion for reconsideration is GRANTED, and the motion for clarification, and the relief sought therein, is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close these motions (Dkt. Nos. 616, 621). SO ORDERED. (As further set forth within in this Opinion.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ajs)
July 27, 2015 Filing 630 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (621 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order re Design Defect and Negligence., (616 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification of the Court's Opinion on Defendants' Sophisticated Purchaser Motion for Summary Judgment . Corrected to Add Missing Line in Last Paragraph on Page 4. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
July 24, 2015 Filing 629 NOTICE of Reply Local Rule 56.1 Statement re: (628 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Wallace, Richard)
July 24, 2015 Filing 628 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (606 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Wallace, Richard)
July 23, 2015 Filing 627 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (616 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification of the Court's Opinion on Defendants' Sophisticated Purchaser Motion for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
July 13, 2015 Filing 626 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #621 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order re Design Defect and Negligence., #616 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification of the Court's Opinion on Defendants' Sophisticated Purchaser Motion for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dillon, Michael)
July 10, 2015 Filing 625 DECLARATION of Victor L. Cardenas, Jr. in Opposition re: #606 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Cardenas, Victor)
July 10, 2015 Filing 624 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Cardenas, Victor)
July 10, 2015 Filing 623 RESPONSE re: #608 Notice (Other) Local Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Cardenas, Victor)
July 10, 2015 Filing 622 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #606 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Cardenas, Victor)
June 30, 2015 Filing 621 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order re Design Defect and Negligence. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
June 29, 2015 Filing 620 DECLARATION of Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz in Support re: #597 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Statute of Limitations.. Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dillon, Michael)
June 29, 2015 Filing 619 DECLARATION of Michael J. Dillon in Support re: #597 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Statute of Limitations.. Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Supplement Exhibit 5, #8 Supplement Exhibit 44)(Dillon, Michael)
June 29, 2015 Filing 618 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation. (Dillon, Michael)
June 29, 2015 Filing 617 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #597 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Statute of Limitations. . Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation. (Dillon, Michael)
June 29, 2015 Filing 616 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification of the Court's Opinion on Defendants' Sophisticated Purchaser Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
June 26, 2015 Filing 615 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from John D.S. Gilmour dated June 26, 2015 re: Certified Translation of Exhibit 4 to Gilmour Declaration. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation Exhibit 4 Gilmour Declaration)(Gilmour, John)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 614 OPINION AND ORDER #105583 re: (493 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and IV. filed by ExxonMobil Corporation, Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), (487 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense. filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. For the foregoing reasons, the Main Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and the Sophisticated Purchaser Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close these motions (Dkt. Nos. 487, 493). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/16/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ajs) Modified on 6/19/2015 (soh).
June 15, 2015 Filing 613 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT., RESPONSE re: #599 Rule 56.1 Statement . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Gilmour, John)
June 15, 2015 Filing 612 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #599 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Gilmour, John)
June 15, 2015 Filing 611 DECLARATION of John D.S. Gilmour in Opposition re: #597 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Statute of Limitations.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Errata 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41)(Gilmour, John)
June 15, 2015 Filing 610 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #597 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Statute of Limitations. . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Gilmour, John)
June 12, 2015 Filing 609 DECLARATION of RUBEN F. REYNA in Support re: #606 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited. (Wallace, Richard)
June 12, 2015 Filing 608 NOTICE of RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re: #606 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited. (Wallace, Richard)
June 12, 2015 Filing 607 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #606 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited. (Wallace, Richard)
June 12, 2015 Filing 606 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited.(Wallace, Richard)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 605 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF EQUILON ENTERPRISES LLC, SHELL TRADING (US) COMPANY, AND TMR COMPANY: IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED that all claims and causes of action asserted by Plaintiff against defendants Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell Trading (US) Company, and TMR Company in the Third Amended Complaint are dismissed with prejudice and with each party bearing its own costs and attorneys' fees, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a)(2). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/11/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ajs)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 604 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CERTAIN CLAIMS AGAINST THE SHELL DEFENDANTS: IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED that Count II (nuisance) and Count III (trespass) of the Third Amended Complaint as to defendants Shell Western Supply and Trading Limited, Shell Oil Company, Motiva Enterprises LLC, and Shell Chemical Yabucoa, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice and with each party bearing its own costs and attorneys' fees, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a)(2); IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Count VIII (RCRA) of the Third Amended Complaint as to Shell Chemical Yabucoa Inc., Shell Oil Company, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell International Petroleum Company Limited, and Shell Western Supply and Trading Limited is dismissed without prejudice and with each party bearing its own costs and attorneys' fees, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 41(a)(2), as set forth within. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/11/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ajs)
June 10, 2015 Filing 603 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cardenas, Victor)
June 10, 2015 Filing 602 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cardenas, Victor)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: After having considered the Stipulation and Request by Petrobras America Inc. for Dismissal, the Court hereby ORDERS, ADJUDGES, AND DECREES that Plaintiff Commonwealth of Puerto Rico's claims against Petrobras America Inc. are hereby DISMISSED, subject to any appeal of the July 16, 2013 Opinion and Order and/or the December 30, 2013 Opinion and Order referenced in the Stipulation as well as this Order. If the Court's July 16, 2013 Opinion and Order, December 30, 2013 Opinion and Order, and this Order are affirmed on appeal, or become final because an appeal is not filed, the dismissal of the above claims against PAI shall be with prejudice. Each side shall bear its own costs. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/21/2015) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ajs)
May 15, 2015 Filing 600 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #597 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Statute of Limitations. . Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation. (Dillon, Michael)
May 15, 2015 Filing 599 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation. (Dillon, Michael)
May 15, 2015 Filing 598 DECLARATION of Michael J. Dillon in Support re: #597 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Statute of Limitations.. Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13 - Part 1, #14 Exhibit 13 - Part 2, #15 Exhibit 13 - Part 3, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Exhibit 53)(Dillon, Michael)
May 15, 2015 Filing 597 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Statute of Limitations. Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dillon, Michael)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER on WILLIE J. EPPS, JR. WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE granting 4117 Motion to Withdrawal. The request of Willie J. Epps Jr., to withdraw his appearance in the above captioned action have been granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion (Docket 4117). SO ORDERED.Motions terminated: (4117 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF) MOTION for Willie J. Epps, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma, Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P., Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(ama)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 595 OPINION AND ORDER #105739 re: (467 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants. filed by Shell Oil Company, (565 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Strike Document No. (538) DECLARATION OF LUIS PAGAN RODRIGUEZ. filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. For the foregoing reasons, the Shell Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. In addition, the Shell Defendants' motion to strike the Pagan Declaration is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close these motions (Docket Nos. 467 and 538). SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ajs) Modified on 8/4/2015 (soh).
April 28, 2015 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 538 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #595 Memorandum & Opinion,,. (ajs)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL granting #593 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion to withdraw the appearance of Isabel Frau as counsel of record for defendants Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, LLC and Conoco Phillips, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court, is hereby GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Attorney Isabel C. Frau-Nicole terminated. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/9/2015) (ajs)
March 25, 2015 Filing 593 MOTION for Isabel Frau to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company.(Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER granting (585) Motion in case 1:07-cv-10470-SAS. It is hereby ORDERED that Lyondell Chemical Company is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/19/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS (ajs)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 591 OPINION AND ORDER #105371 re: (463 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding No Injury at Texaco #800. filed by Chevron Puerto Rico, LLC. For the foregoing reasons, CPR's motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion (Docket No. 463). SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/16/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ajs) Modified on 3/24/2015 (soh).
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 590 CORRECTED OPINION AND ORDER #105369: For the foregoing reasons, the motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and the motions to strike are DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the motions (Dkt. Nos. #474 , #544 , #568 ). SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ajs) Modified on 3/24/2015 (soh).
March 5, 2015 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #590 Opinion & Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ajs)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 589 OPINION AND ORDER #105290 re: (481 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I-IV filed by Petrobras America, Inc. Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion (Docket No. 481). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/2/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(tro) Modified on 3/4/2015 (soh).
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 588 OPINION AND ORDER #105229 re: (483 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Shell Company Puerto Rico LTD. For the foregoing reasons, Sol's motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the motion (Dkt. No. 483). SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/10/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ajs) Modified on 2/17/2015 (soh).
February 2, 2015 Filing 587 NOTICE of Law Firm Name Change. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. (Dillard, Stephen)
January 26, 2015 Filing 586 DECLARATION of Ruben F. Reyna [Amended] in Support re: (467 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants.. Document filed by Equilon Enterprises, LLC, Motiva Enterprises, LLC, Shell Chemical Yabucoa, Inc., Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Oil Co., Shell Trading (US) Company, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13-15)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Wallace, Richard)
January 16, 2015 Filing 585 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2) as to Lyondell Chemical Company . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dema, John)
January 7, 2015 Filing 584 DECLARATION of Bryan Barnhart [Amended] in Opposition re: (467 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
January 7, 2015 Filing 583 DECLARATION of Tracey O'Reilly [Amended] in Opposition re: (467 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
December 19, 2014 Filing 582 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #544 MOTION to Strike Exhibit 1 to Nathan Short Declaration. . Document filed by Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C.. (Leifer, Steven)
December 19, 2014 Filing 581 DECLARATION of CARLOS M. BOLLAR in Support re: #568 MOTION to Strike Document No. #527 PLAINTIFFS' NEW THEORY OF LIABILITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF CAUSATION.. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
December 19, 2014 Filing 580 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #568 MOTION to Strike Document No. #527 PLAINTIFFS' NEW THEORY OF LIABILITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF CAUSATION. . Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
December 19, 2014 Filing 579 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #565 MOTION to Strike Document No. 538 DECLARATION OF LUIS PAGAN RODRIGUEZ. . Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
December 12, 2014 Filing 578 DECLARATION of Duane Miller in Opposition re: (568 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Strike Document No. (527) PLAINTIFFS' NEW THEORY OF LIABILITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF CAUSATION.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
December 12, 2014 Filing 577 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (568 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Strike Document No. (527) PLAINTIFFS' NEW THEORY OF LIABILITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF CAUSATION. REDACTED. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
December 12, 2014 Filing 576 DECLARATION of Justin J. Arenas in Opposition re: #565 MOTION to Strike Document No. 538 DECLARATION OF LUIS PAGAN RODRIGUEZ.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Cardenas, Victor)
December 12, 2014 Filing 575 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #565 MOTION to Strike Document No. 538 DECLARATION OF LUIS PAGAN RODRIGUEZ. . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Cardenas, Victor)
December 12, 2014 Filing 574 DECLARATION of William C. Petit in Opposition re: #544 MOTION to Strike Exhibit 1 to Nathan Short Declaration.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Gilmour, John)
December 12, 2014 Filing 573 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #544 MOTION to Strike Exhibit 1 to Nathan Short Declaration. . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Gilmour, John)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Opposition papers shall be filed on or before December 12, 2014, and Defendants' Reply papers shall be filed on or before December 19, 2014. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/8/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(mro)
December 4, 2014 Filing 571 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation of Spanish Language Document re: #551 Reply Affidavit in Support of Motion, . Document filed by Shell Company Puerto Rico LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certified Translation of Exhibit 5)(Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
November 26, 2014 Filing 570 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #568 MOTION to Strike Document No. #527 PLAINTIFFS' NEW THEORY OF LIABILITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF CAUSATION. . Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
November 26, 2014 Filing 569 DECLARATION of CARLOS M. BOLLAR in Support re: #568 MOTION to Strike Document No. #527 PLAINTIFFS' NEW THEORY OF LIABILITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF CAUSATION.. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
November 26, 2014 Filing 568 MOTION to Strike Document No. #527 PLAINTIFFS' NEW THEORY OF LIABILITY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF CAUSATION. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Gerson, Lisa)
November 26, 2014 Filing 567 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #565 MOTION to Strike Document No. 538 DECLARATION OF LUIS PAGAN RODRIGUEZ. . Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
November 26, 2014 Filing 566 DECLARATION of CARLOS M. BOLLAR in Support re: #565 MOTION to Strike Document No. 538 DECLARATION OF LUIS PAGAN RODRIGUEZ.. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
November 26, 2014 Filing 565 MOTION to Strike Document No. 538 DECLARATION OF LUIS PAGAN RODRIGUEZ. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Gerson, Lisa)
November 26, 2014 Filing 564 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #533 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
November 26, 2014 Filing 563 DECLARATION of LISA A. GERSON in Support re: #493 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and IV.. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
November 26, 2014 Filing 562 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #493 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and IV. . Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
November 26, 2014 Filing 561 REPLY re: #531 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1 . Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
November 26, 2014 Filing 560 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #526 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
November 26, 2014 Filing 559 DECLARATION of LISA A. GERSON in Support re: #474 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Lack of Causation.. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
November 26, 2014 Filing 558 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #474 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Lack of Causation. . Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
November 26, 2014 Filing 557 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. (Dillard, Stephen)
November 26, 2014 Filing 556 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #487 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense. . Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. (Dillard, Stephen)
November 26, 2014 Filing 555 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Ruben F. Reyna in Support re: (467 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants.. Document filed by Equilon Enterprises, LLC, Motiva Enterprises, LLC, Shell Chemical Yabucoa, Inc., Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Oil Co., Shell Trading (US) Company, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited, Texaco Refining And Marketing, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Wallace, Richard)
November 26, 2014 Filing 554 COUNTER STATEMENT TO (4131 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF) Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Equilon Enterprises, LLC, Motiva Enterprises, LLC, Shell Chemical Yabucoa, Inc., Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Oil Co., Shell Trading (US) Company, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited, Texaco Refining And Marketing, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Wallace, Richard)
November 26, 2014 Filing 553 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (467 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants. . Document filed by Equilon Enterprises, LLC, Motiva Enterprises, LLC, Shell Chemical Yabucoa, Inc., Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Oil Co., Shell Trading (US) Company, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited, Texaco Refining And Marketing, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Wallace, Richard)
November 26, 2014 Filing 552 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #481 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I-IV. . Document filed by Petrobras America, Inc.. (Harris, James)
November 26, 2014 Filing 551 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz in Support re: #483 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Shell Company Puerto Rico LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
November 26, 2014 Filing 550 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #521 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Shell Company Puerto Rico LTD. (Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
November 26, 2014 Filing 549 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #483 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Shell Company Puerto Rico LTD. (Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
November 26, 2014 Filing 548 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Jeremiah J. Anderson in Support re: #463 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding No Injury at Texaco #800.. Document filed by Chevron Puerto Rico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Anderson, Jeremiah)
November 26, 2014 Filing 547 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #514 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Chevron Puerto Rico, LLC. (Anderson, Jeremiah)
November 26, 2014 Filing 546 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #463 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding No Injury at Texaco #800. . Document filed by Chevron Puerto Rico, LLC. (Anderson, Jeremiah)
November 26, 2014 Filing 545 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #544 MOTION to Strike Exhibit 1 to Nathan Short Declaration. . Document filed by Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Leifer, Steven)
November 26, 2014 Filing 544 MOTION to Strike Exhibit 1 to Nathan Short Declaration. Document filed by Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C..(Leifer, Steven)
November 26, 2014 Filing 543 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Strike Exhibit 1 Attached to Nathan Short Declaration. Document filed by Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C. (Leifer, Steven) Modified on 11/26/2014 (db).
November 26, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Steven Lawerence Leifer to RE-FILE Document #542 MOTION to Strike Exhibit 1 Attached to Nathan Short's Declaration. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db)
November 25, 2014 Filing 542 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Strike Exhibit 1 Attached to Nathan Short's Declaration. Document filed by Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Leifer, Steven) Modified on 11/26/2014 (db).
November 8, 2014 Filing 541 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 8, 2014 Filing 540 COUNTER STATEMENT TO (469 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 8, 2014 Filing 539 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (467 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants. . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 8, 2014 Filing 538 DECLARATION of Luis Pagan Rodriguez in Opposition re: (467 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 8, 2014 Filing 537 DECLARATION of Nathan P. Short in Opposition re: (467 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 8, 2014 Filing 536 DECLARATION of Bryan Barnhart in Opposition re: (467 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 8, 2014 Filing 535 DECLARATION of Tracey L. O'Reilly in Opposition re: (467 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Filing 534 DECLARATION of Michael Axline in Opposition re: (493 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and IV.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 6 [redacted, #2 Exhibit 7 to 12 [redacted])Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Filing 533 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Filing 532 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (493 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and IV. . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Filing 531 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #479 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Cardenas, Victor)
November 7, 2014 Filing 530 DECLARATION of Nathan P. Short in Opposition re: #474 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Lack of Causation.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cardenas, Victor)
November 7, 2014 Filing 529 DECLARATION of Dave E. Blum in Opposition re: #474 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Lack of Causation.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cardenas, Victor)
November 7, 2014 Filing 528 DECLARATION of William C. Petit in Opposition re: #474 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Lack of Causation.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32)(Cardenas, Victor)
November 7, 2014 Filing 527 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #474 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Lack of Causation. . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Cardenas, Victor)
November 7, 2014 Filing 526 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Cardenas, Victor)
November 7, 2014 Filing 525 DECLARATION of Scott E. Kauff in Opposition re: #493 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and IV.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Cardenas, Victor)
November 7, 2014 Filing 524 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #493 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and IV. . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Cardenas, Victor)
November 7, 2014 Filing 523 DECLARATION of Victor L. Cardenas, Jr. in Opposition re: #483 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a, #2 Exhibit 1b, #3 Exhibit 1c, #4 Exhibit 1d, #5 Exhibit 2a, #6 Exhibit 2b, #7 Exhibit 2c, #8 Exhibit 2d, #9 Exhibit 2e, #10 Exhibit 3, #11 Exhibit 4a, #12 Exhibit 4b, #13 Exhibit 4c, #14 Exhibit 5, #15 Exhibit 6, #16 Exhibit 7a, #17 Exhibit 7b, #18 Exhibit 7c, #19 Exhibit 7d)(Cardenas, Victor)
November 7, 2014 Filing 522 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #483 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Cardenas, Victor)
November 7, 2014 Filing 521 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Cardenas, Victor)
November 7, 2014 Filing 520 DECLARATION of Michael Axline in Opposition re: (487 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 9, #2 Exhibit 10 to 15)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Filing 519 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Filing 518 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (487 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense. . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Filing 517 DECLARATION of Wanda Garcia Hernandez in Opposition re: (463 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding No Injury at Texaco #800.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Filing 516 DECLARATION of Anthony Brown in Opposition re: (463 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding No Injury at Texaco #800.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Filing 515 DECLARATION of Michael Axline in Opposition re: (463 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding No Injury at Texaco #800.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 3, #2 Exhibit 4 to 6, #3 Exhibit 7 to 12)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Filing 514 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Filing 513 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (463 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding No Injury at Texaco #800. . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER re: (511 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) Order. This Order responds to defendants' request that the Court direct the Clerk of Court to send additional materials to the Clerk of the Puerto Rico Supreme Court pursuant to this Court's October 24, 2014 Order and Petition for Certification to the Puerto Rico Supreme Court. The Court hereby directs the Clerk of Court to transmit this Order to the Clerk of the Puerto Rico Supreme Court with certain additional materials, which the Court deems relevant to its October 24, 2014 Order and Petition, listed in footnote 2 of this Order. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/30/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(lmb)
October 30, 2014 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: (512 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 4111 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF) Order, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(lmb)
October 28, 2014 Mailed Certified Copies of #343 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #175 Amended Complaint, #436 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, #510 Memorandum & Opinion, #445 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, #449 Memorandum & Opinion,, #276 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, #341 Response in Opposition to Motion, #322 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #309 Memorandum & Opinion, #357 Memorandum & Opinion,, #340 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, #233 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #336 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #290 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #430 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #440 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, #444 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, to the Puerto Rico Supreme Court Tribunal Supremo, Secretara PO BOX 9022392 San Juan, Puerto Rico 00902-2392 by UPS TRACKING# 1ZE22E533710029497. (ca)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER AND PETITION FOR CERTIFICATION TO THE PUERTO RICO SUPREME COURT: Are the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico's claims concerning contamination to the in situ groundwater and surface water of the Commonwealth subject to the defense of prescription?... WHERFORE, the Court will hold in abeyance all matters pertaining to prescription of claims subject to Puerto Rico law until such time as the Supreme Court of Puerto Rico is able to answer the aforementioned certified question. The Clerk of Court shall transmit this certification to the Clerk of the Puerto Rico Supreme Court pursuant to P.R. LAWS ANN. tit. 4, app. XXI-A, 25 and shall include the relevant pleadings and opinions as appendices. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 510 OPINION AND ORDER #104911: For the foregoing reasons, the Commonwealth's motion to certify the above question to the Puerto Rico Supreme Court is GRANTED. The Court will issue a separate order, containing the information required by Rule 25 of the Rules of the Puerto Rico Supreme Court, directing the Clerk of Court to transmit this certification to the Clerk of the Puerto Rico Supreme Court with the relevant appendices. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/23/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja) Modified on 10/27/2014 (soh).
October 17, 2014 Filing 509 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 10/1/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 17, 2014 Filing 508 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 10/1/2014 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2015.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 9, 2014 Filing 507 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Michael J. Dillon dated 10/8/14 re: Plaintiffs' Petition for Certification to the Puerto Rico Supreme Court. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Dillon, Michael)
October 1, 2014 Filing 506 DECLARATION of Carlos Bollar in Support re: #487 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense.. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, ExxonMobil Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C., Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Dillard, Stephen)
October 1, 2014 Filing 505 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, ExxonMobil Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C., Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Oil Company. (Dillard, Stephen)
October 1, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Stephen Cann Dillard to RE-FILE Document #499 Response in Support of Motion. Use the event type Rule 56.1 Statement found under the event list Other Answers. (db)
October 1, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Stephen Cann Dillard. Document No. [501-504] Exhibits. These documents are not filed via ECF. Exhibits are only added AS ATTACHMENTS to documents that are permitted to be filed Pursuant to the Rules of ECF. (db)
September 29, 2014 Filing 504 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #487 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense. EXHIBITS 4-6 To Declaration of Carlos M. Bollar. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, ExxonMobil Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C., Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Oil Company, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited. (Dillard, Stephen) Modified on 10/1/2014 (db).
September 29, 2014 Filing 503 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #487 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense. EXHIBIT 3-B To Declaration of Carlos M. Bollar. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, ExxonMobil Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C., Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Oil Company, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited. (Dillard, Stephen) Modified on 10/1/2014 (db).
September 29, 2014 Filing 502 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #487 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense. EXHIBIT E-A to Declaration of Carlos M. Bollar. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, ExxonMobil Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C., Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Oil Company, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited. (Dillard, Stephen) Modified on 10/1/2014 (db).
September 29, 2014 Filing 501 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #487 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense. Exhibits 1-2 to Amended Declaration of Carlos M. Bollar. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, ExxonMobil Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C., Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Oil Company, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited. (Dillard, Stephen) Modified on 10/1/2014 (db).
September 29, 2014 Filing 500 DECLARATION of Carlos M. Bollar in Support re: #487 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense.. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, ExxonMobil Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C., Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Oil Company, Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited. (Dillard, Stephen)
September 29, 2014 Filing 499 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #487 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense. First Amended Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company, ExxonMobil Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C., Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Oil Co., Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited. (Dillard, Stephen) Modified on 10/1/2014 (db).
September 29, 2014 Filing 498 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from JAMES A. PARDO dated 9/29/14 re: Defendants' Opposition to Request for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Pardo, James)
September 26, 2014 Filing 497 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #493 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and IV. . Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation. (Dillon, Michael)
September 26, 2014 Filing 496 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation. (Dillon, Michael)
September 26, 2014 Filing 495 DECLARATION of James J. Maher in Support re: #493 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and IV.. Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation. (Dillon, Michael)
September 26, 2014 Filing 494 DECLARATION of Michael J. Dillon in Support re: #493 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and IV.. Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation. (Dillon, Michael)
September 26, 2014 Filing 493 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counts I and IV. Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation.(Dillon, Michael)
September 26, 2014 Filing 492 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #487 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense. . Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. (Gerson, Lisa)
September 26, 2014 Filing 491 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. (Gerson, Lisa)
September 26, 2014 Filing 490 DECLARATION of Steven L. Leifer in Support re: #487 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense.. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. (Gerson, Lisa)
September 26, 2014 Filing 489 DECLARATION of Stephen C. Dillard in Support re: #487 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense.. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Exhibit 7-12, #3 Exhibit 13-18)(Gerson, Lisa)
September 26, 2014 Filing 488 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #506) DECLARATION of Carlos M. Bollar in Support re: #487 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense.. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company. (Gerson, Lisa) Modified on 10/7/2014 (lb).
September 26, 2014 Filing 487 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Sophisticated Purchaser Defense. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company.(Gerson, Lisa)
September 26, 2014 Filing 486 DECLARATION of ALEJANDRO J. CEPEDA-DIAZ in Support re: #483 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Shell Company Puerto Rico LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit 02, #3 Exhibit 03, #4 Exhibit 04, #5 Exhibit 05, #6 Exhibit 06, #7 Exhibit 07, #8 Exhibit 08, #9 Exhibit 09, #10 Exhibit 10)(Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
September 26, 2014 Filing 485 NOTICE of RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re: #483 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Shell Company Puerto Rico LTD. (Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
September 26, 2014 Filing 484 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #483 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Shell Company Puerto Rico LTD. (Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
September 26, 2014 Filing 483 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by Shell Company Puerto Rico LTD.(Cepeda-Diaz, Alejandro)
September 26, 2014 Filing 482 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #481 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I-IV. . Document filed by Petrobras America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James B. Harris)(Harris, James)
September 26, 2014 Filing 481 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I-IV. Document filed by Petrobras America, Inc..(Harris, James)
September 26, 2014 Filing 480 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #474 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Lack of Causation. . Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
September 26, 2014 Filing 479 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
September 26, 2014 Filing 478 DECLARATION of James J. Maher in Support re: #474 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Lack of Causation.. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
September 26, 2014 Filing 477 DECLARATION of Steven L. Leifer in Support re: #474 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Lack of Causation.. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
September 26, 2014 Filing 476 DECLARATION of Lisa A. Gerson in Support re: #474 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Lack of Causation.. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-9)(Gerson, Lisa)
September 26, 2014 Filing 475 DECLARATION of Stephen C. Dillard in Support re: #474 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Lack of Causation.. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Gerson, Lisa)
September 26, 2014 Filing 474 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Lack of Causation. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Gerson, Lisa)
September 26, 2014 Filing 473 DECLARATION of Ruben Reyna in Support re: #467 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants.. Document filed by Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 4-5, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 6-7, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 8-10)(Wallace, Richard)
September 26, 2014 Filing 472 DECLARATION of Patrick Bloomer in Support re: #467 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants.. Document filed by Shell Oil Company. (Wallace, Richard)
September 26, 2014 Filing 471 DECLARATION of Juan M. Lopez in Support re: #467 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants.. Document filed by Shell Oil Company. (Wallace, Richard)
September 26, 2014 Filing 470 DECLARATION of Ian Charman in Support re: #467 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants.. Document filed by Shell Oil Company. (Wallace, Richard)
September 26, 2014 Filing 469 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Shell Oil Company. (Wallace, Richard)
September 26, 2014 Filing 468 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #467 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants. . Document filed by Shell Oil Company. (Wallace, Richard)
September 26, 2014 Filing 467 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment of the Shell Defendants. Document filed by Shell Oil Company. Responses due by 11/7/2014(Wallace, Richard)
September 26, 2014 Filing 466 DECLARATION of Jeremiah J. Anderson in Support re: #463 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding No Injury at Texaco #800.. Document filed by Chevron Puerto Rico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Anderson, Jeremiah)
September 26, 2014 Filing 465 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Chevron Puerto Rico, LLC. (Anderson, Jeremiah)
September 26, 2014 Filing 464 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #463 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding No Injury at Texaco #800. . Document filed by Chevron Puerto Rico, LLC. (Anderson, Jeremiah)
September 26, 2014 Filing 463 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding No Injury at Texaco #800. Document filed by Chevron Puerto Rico, LLC.(Anderson, Jeremiah)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 462 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CLAIMS FOR RECOVERY OF DAMAGES WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT-SELECTED TRIAL SITES: IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED that the Commonwealth hereby dismisses with prejudice all claims and causes of action against any and all Defendants for damages or other relief asserted, or that might have been asserted, based upon MTBE, TBA, and/or gasoline containing MTBE and/or TBA discharged, released, leaked and/or migrating from the Maysonet Service Station and the Manati Municipal Garage prior to the date of this stipulation as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(lmb)
September 23, 2014 Filing 461 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Lisa A. Gerson dated September 23, 2014. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Gerson, Lisa)
September 22, 2014 Filing 460 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher Donald Amore on behalf of Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. New Address: Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass, One New York Plaza, New York, NY, United States 10004, 2128044200. (Amore, Christopher)
September 22, 2014 Filing 459 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Barry R. Temkin on behalf of Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. New Address: Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass, One New York Plaza, New York, NY, United States 10004, 2128044200. (Temkin, Barry)
September 19, 2014 Filing 458 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sara Nicole Lewis on behalf of Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. New Address: Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass, One New York Plaza, New York, New York, USA 10004, 212 804 4200. (Lewis, Sara)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 457 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #117:... After considering the foregoing and the Phase 1 Trial Site Matrix attached hereto as Exhibit A, it is hereby ORDERED that: Plaintiffs may assert claims at the Phase 1 Trial Sites only against the Defendant(s) identified for each site in the Phase 1 Trial Site Matrix attached hereto as Exhibit A ("Identified Defendant(s)") and only for the causes of action identified at each site for each Identified Defendant in the Phase 1 Trial Site Matrix. The Phase 1 Trial Site Matrix may be modified to delete sites, and/or claims and/or Identified Defendants as to each site, but cannot be revised to add sites and/or claims and/or Defendants to a site at which they are not currently listed. All claims as to the Phase 1 Trial Sites against all other Defendants not listed on the Phase 1 Trial Site Matrix are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All claims as to the Phase 1 Trial Sites as against the Identified Defendants, other than as specifically listed in the Phase 1 Trial Site Matrix, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Defendants not listed on the Phase 1 Trial Site Matrix shall not file summary judgment motions as to the trial sites in Phase 1 of the case, except to the extent stipulated above. Identified Defendants listed on the Phase 1 Trial Site Matrix may file summary judgment motions for sites where they are specifically identified except to the extent limited above. Notwithstanding the foregoing, or anything else to the contrary in this Order, Defendants Shell Oil Company, Shell Trading US Company, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Equilon Enterprises LLC, TMR Company, Shell Chemical Yabucoa, Inc., Shell International Petroleum Company Limited, and Shell Western Supply and Trading Limited, collectively may file a single summary judgment motion on all claims asserted against them subject to the limitations set forth above, and as further set forth herein. *See page six. *No motions for summary judgment may be made until the moving party has complied with the Court's pre-motion conference procedure. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/15/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja) Modified on 9/16/2014 (ja).
September 5, 2014 Filing 456 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from James B. Harris dated Septebmer 5, 2014 re: motion for summary judgment. Document filed by Petrobras America, Inc..(Harris, James)
September 5, 2014 Filing 455 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from James A. Pardo dated 9/5/14 re: partial summary judgment based on extinctive prescription. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Pardo, James)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER GRANTING (453) WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL, in case 1:07-cv-10470-SAS. The motion to withdraw the appearance of Deliris Ortiz-Torres as counsel of record for defendant Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp., pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court, is hereby GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/4/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS (ja)
September 3, 2014 Filing 453 MOTION for Deliris Ortiz Torres to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
September 2, 2014 Filing 452 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 8/14/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 2, 2014 Filing 451 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 8/14/2014 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Michael Axline dated 8/22/2014 re: Extension of time. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's request is hereby granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/29/2014) (ajs)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 449 OPINION AND ORDER #104679 re: (429 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION Revise Prior Orders filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. For the foregoing reasons, the Commonwealth's motion is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion (Doc. No. 429). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/29/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ft) (Main Document 4084 replaced on 8/29/2014) (lmb). Modified on 9/4/2014 (ca).
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: granting (447) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion to withdraw the appearance of Heidi Bundren as counsel of record for The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico through its Environmental Quality Board, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court, is hereby GRANTED., Attorney Heidi Katrina Bundren terminated in case 1:07-cv-10470-SAS. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/27/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS (lmb)
August 22, 2014 Filing 447 MOTION for Heidi K. Bundren to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jackson, William)
August 14, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Status Conference held on 8/14/2014. (Bloomfield, Clifford)
August 1, 2014 Filing 446 AMENDED REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #429 MOTION Revise Prior Orders . Amended Exhibits F & G. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gilmour, John)
July 31, 2014 Filing 445 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #429 MOTION Revise Prior Orders . as to Trammo Defendants. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John D.S. Gilmour, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Errata Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E1, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E2, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Gilmour, John)
July 31, 2014 Filing 444 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #429 MOTION Revise Prior Orders . . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John D.S. Gilmour, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Gilmour, John)
July 23, 2014 Filing 443 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/15/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 23, 2014 Filing 442 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/15/2014 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 23, 2014 Filing 441 DECLARATION of Michael J. Dillon in Opposition re: #429 MOTION Revise Prior Orders .. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Sacripanti, Peter)
July 23, 2014 Filing 440 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #429 MOTION Revise Prior Orders . . Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Sacripanti, Peter)
July 22, 2014 Filing 439 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from John D.S. Gilmour dated July 22, 2014 re: #429 MOTION Revise Prior Orders . . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Gilmour, John)
July 22, 2014 Filing 438 DECLARATION of Barry R. Temkin in Opposition re: #429 MOTION Revise Prior Orders .. Document filed by Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Amore, Christopher)
July 22, 2014 Filing 437 DECLARATION of William E. Markstein in Opposition re: #429 MOTION Revise Prior Orders .. Document filed by Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Amore, Christopher)
July 22, 2014 Filing 436 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #429 MOTION Revise Prior Orders . . Document filed by Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Amore, Christopher)
July 22, 2014 Filing 435 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Donald Amore on behalf of Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Amore, Christopher)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 434 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE WITH RESPECT TO RECOVERY OF DAMAGES FOR INJURY TO NATURAL RESOURCES AT TRIAL SITE NO. 1: IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED that Plaintiffs hereby dismiss with prejudice all claims and causes of action for damages or other relief asserted, or that might have been asserted, based upon contamination from MTBE, TBA, and/or gasoline containing MTBE and/or TBA at or beneath the Core Facility, and/or migrating from a discharge, release and/or leak of MTBE, TBA, and/or gasoline containing MTBE and/or TBA at the Core Facility; IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that the Core Facility will not be a Trial Site in the first trial of the above-captioned action or in any trial thereafter and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/15/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(lmb)
July 16, 2014 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #433 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, in the amount of $200.00, paid on 7/16/2014, Receipt Number 465401100217. (lcu)
July 15, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Status Conference held on 7/15/2014. (Bloomfield, Clifford)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. It is Hereby Ordered that David C. Schulte is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action in the United District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. Attorney David C. Schulte for Petrobras America, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/11/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(lmb)
July 11, 2014 Filing 432 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter Sacripanti dated 7/11/14 re: Summary of Defendants' Pre-Motion Letters for the 7/15/14 Conference. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Riccardulli, Stephen)
July 3, 2014 Filing 431 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from John D.S. Gilmour dated 06/02/2014 re: Applicability of Law No. 53-2014 to Pending Cases. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board.(Gilmour, John)
July 2, 2014 Filing 430 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #429 MOTION Revise Prior Orders . . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John D.S. Gilmour, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Gilmour, John)
July 2, 2014 Filing 429 MOTION Revise Prior Orders . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. Return Date set for 7/22/2014 at 05:00 PM.(Gilmour, John)
July 2, 2014 Filing 428 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Charles C. Correll, Jr. dated July 2, 2014 re: #413 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Duane Miller dated June 24, 2014. re: Chevron Defendants' Experts Anthony Daus and John Connor. Document filed by Chevron Caribean, Inc., Chevron Corporation, Chevron Estrella Puerto Rico, Inc., Chevron International Oil Company, Inc., Chevron Puerto Rico, LLC, Chevron U.S.A., Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Anderson, Jeremiah)
July 2, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney John Dalston Smith Gilmour to RE-FILE Document #427 MOTION Revise Prior Orders . Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. ***REMINER*** - First refile the #426 Notice AS THE MOTION, then file and link the Memorandum in Support. (db)
July 1, 2014 Filing 427 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION Revise Prior Orders . Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. Return Date set for 7/22/2014 at 05:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John D.S. Gilmour, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Gilmour, John) Modified on 7/2/2014 (db).
July 1, 2014 Filing 426 NOTICE of Motion to Revise Prior Orders. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Gilmour, John)
June 27, 2014 Filing 425 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Michael Axline dated June 27, 2014 re: Request to Postpone Hearing Now Set For July 8, 2014. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
June 27, 2014 Filing 424 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Richard E. Wallace, Jr. dated 6/26/2014 re: Shell Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter for Summary Judgment. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Sacripanti, Peter)
June 27, 2014 Filing 423 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter Sacripanti dated 6/26/2014 re: Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter re: Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Lack of Damages. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Sacripanti, Peter)
June 27, 2014 Filing 422 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter Sacripanti dated 6/26/2014 re: Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter re: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Puerto Rico v. S.S. Zoe Colocotroni. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Sacripanti, Peter)
June 27, 2014 Filing 421 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter Sacripanti dated 6/26/2014 re: Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter re: Partial Summary Judgment on Counts V and VIII. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Sacripanti, Peter)
June 27, 2014 Filing 420 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter Sacripanti dated 6/26/2014 re: Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter re: Partial Summary Judgment Motion on Count I (Strict Liability for Defective Design) and Count IV (Negligent Design). Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Sacripanti, Peter)
June 27, 2014 Filing 419 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter Sacripanti dated 6/26/2014 re: Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter re: Partial Summary Judgment Motion on Causation. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Sacripanti, Peter)
June 27, 2014 Filing 418 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter Sacripanti dated 6/26/2014 re: Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter re: Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Justiciability. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Sacripanti, Peter)
June 27, 2014 Filing 417 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter Sacripanti dated 6/26/2014 re: Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter re: Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Nuisance and Trespass Claim. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Sacripanti, Peter)
June 27, 2014 Filing 416 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter Sacripanti dated 6/26/2014 re: Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter re: Partial Summary Judgment Motion on Plaintiffs' Failure to Warn Claims. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Sacripanti, Peter)
June 27, 2014 Filing 415 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter Sacripanti dated 6/26/2014 re: Defendants' Pre-Motion Letter re: Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant-Selected Trial Sites and Plaintiffs' Trial Site No. 1. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Sacripanti, Peter)
June 27, 2014 Filing 414 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Stephen J. Riccardulli dated 6/26/2014 re: Defendants' Pre-Motion Letters for Summary Judgment. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Riccardulli, Stephen)
June 24, 2014 Filing 413 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Duane Miller dated June 24, 2014. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Q to Letter to Hon. Shira A. Scheindlin)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
June 18, 2014 Filing 412 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/10/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
June 18, 2014 Filing 411 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/10/2014 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
June 10, 2014 Filing 410 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/2/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
June 10, 2014 Filing 409 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/2/2014 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
June 10, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Status Conference held on 6/10/2014. (Bloomfield, Clifford)
June 5, 2014 Filing 408 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from James A. Pardo dated June 5, 2014 re: Reply Letter in advance of the June 10 Conference. Document filed by Exxonmobil Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Pardo, James)
June 5, 2014 Filing 407 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Barry R. Temkin dated 6/5/2014 re: Applicability of Law 53-2014. Document filed by Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc..(Lewis, Sara)
June 5, 2014 Filing 406 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from John D.S. Gilmour dated June 5, 2014 re: Applicability of Law No. 53-2014 to Pending Cases. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-2)(Gilmour, John)
June 3, 2014 Filing 405 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from James A. Pardo dated 6/2/14 re: Defendants' pre-conference letter in advance of the 6/10/14 conference. Document filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Pardo, James)
June 2, 2014 Filing 404 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Duane Miller dated June 2, 2014 re: Opposition to Motion to Quash May 23 Deposition Notices of 26(a)(2)(C) Designees and Motion to Strike Improper Designations. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
June 2, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Status Conference held on 6/2/2014. (Bloomfield, Clifford)
May 30, 2014 Filing 403 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Stephen J. Riccardulli dated May 30, 2014 re: Untimely Deposition Notices. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Riccardulli, Stephen)
May 21, 2014 Filing 402 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Stephen J. Riccardulli dated 5/21/2014 re: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Summary Judgment. Document filed by Exxonmobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Riccardulli, Stephen)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 401 STIPULATED ORDER ON POZO CLUB DE LEONES TRIAL SITE: IT IS STIPULATED AND AGREED that the Pozo Club de Leones will not be a Trial Site in the first trial of the above-captioned action; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Plaintiffs do not dismiss any claims as to Pozo Club de Leones or waive any right to pursue such claims in a later phase of the above-captioned action; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants do not waive any defenses or objections to Plaintiffs' claims as to Pozo Club de Leones or Plaintiffs' reliance on the commingled product theory of liability. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/14/2014) (lmb)
May 9, 2014 Filing 400 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/1/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 9, 2014 Filing 399 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/1/2014 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 398 OPINION AND ORDER 104297 re: (364 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 3927 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 34 in 1:14-cv-01014-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tauber Oil. For the foregoing reasons, Tauber's motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion (Doc. No. 364 in 07 Civ. 10470; Doc. No. 34 in 14 Civ. 1014). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/5/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(lmb) Modified on 5/6/2014 (nt).
May 5, 2014 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: (98 in 1:14-cv-01014-SAS, 398 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) Memorandum & Opinion, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(lmb)
May 1, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Status Conference held on 5/1/2014. (Bloomfield, Clifford)
April 30, 2014 Filing 397 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Stephen J. Riccardulli dated 4/29/2014 re: plaintiff's request regarding witness disclosures and designations. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Riccardulli, Stephen)
April 29, 2014 Filing 396 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Tracey O'Reilly dated April 29, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Letter Regarding Deadlines and Request for Relief. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
April 29, 2014 Filing 395 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Charles C. Correll, Jr. dated April 29, 2014 re: Depositions of the Chevron Defendants' Expert Witnesses. Document filed by Chevron Caribean, Inc., Chevron Corporation, Chevron Estrella Puerto Rico, Inc., Chevron International Oil Company, Inc., Chevron Puerto Rico, LLC, Chevron U.S.A., Inc.,, Texaco Petroleum, Inc., Texaco Puerto Rico, Inc., Texaco Refining And Marketing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Anderson, Jeremiah)
April 28, 2014 Filing 394 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Duane C. Miller dated April 28, 2014 re: Depositions of Chevron Expert Witnesses. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board.(Axline, Michael)
April 28, 2014 Filing 393 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Duane C. Miller dated April 28, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' Request to Strike Overly Broad Percipient Expert Designations. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board.(Axline, Michael)
April 28, 2014 Filing 392 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Stephen J. Riccardulli dated 4/28/2014 re: Plaintiffs request to exclude data from the reports of certain defense experts. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation.(Riccardulli, Stephen)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER: In accordance with the Court's April 11, 2014 Order, Plaintiffs must produce Anthony Brown's revised report and model by April 28, 2014. In addition, all expert depositions must take place before the May 30, 2014 expert discovery deadline., ( Deposition due by 5/30/2014.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/25/2014) (lmb)
April 23, 2014 Filing 390 NOTICE of CHANGE OF FIRM NAME. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Axline, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER: In January 2014, Plaintiffs' expert, Anthony Brown, submitted a report and created visual models based on groundwater flow. Defendants object that Brown's report and models improperly include wells outside the delineated areas that were not subject to discovery ("Outside Wells"). Had Defendants known that Brown would include these wells, they would have conducted the necessary discovery before the December 20, 2013 fact discovery deadline. To fairly respond to Brown's models, Defendants' experts would require real-world data on the wells' (1) actual pumping rates, (2) current operating status, (3) screen depth and length, and (4) hydraulic conductivity/geology in which the well is drilled. Even after Plaintiffs gather and produce this information - assuming they are able to do so - Defendants' experts will need time to supplement their reports. On April 7, Defendants submitted their expert reports, assuming the Outside Wells were out. The fact discovery deadline was December 20, 2013, and discovery cannot proceed endlessly in this seven-year-old case. Because expert discovery closes on May 30 and Defendants' experts would need extensive data to supplement their reports, Plaintiffs are ordered to strike the Outside Wells from Brown's report and modeling. The wells will be treated as in the New Jersey case. Brown may testify generally about the benefits of remediation. But he may not mention the Outside Wells unless Defendants open the door by asking him specifically about those wells on cross-examination. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/11/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(lmb)
April 10, 2014 Filing 388 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/4/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
April 10, 2014 Filing 387 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/4/2014 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
April 10, 2014 Filing 386 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/1/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
April 10, 2014 Filing 385 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/1/2014 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
April 10, 2014 Filing 384 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from LISA GERSON dated 3/9/14 re: EXPERT A. BROWN WELLS OUTSIDE DELINEATED AREAS. Document filed by ExxonMobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gerson, Lisa)
April 9, 2014 Filing 383 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Michael Axline dated April 9, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding Wells in Anthony Brown's Modeling. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
April 4, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Status Conference held on 4/4/2014. (Bloomfield, Clifford)
April 1, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Status Conference held on 4/1/2014. (Bloomfield, Clifford)
March 25, 2014 Filing 382 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Amanda Collazo Maguire dated 3/21/2014 re: Peerless requests a pre-motion conference prior to filing a motion to dismiss, in accordance with Your Honor's Individual Rule IV(A); and, pending the conference, requests a 60-day extension to either move the Court to dismiss the complaint against it or file its answer, currently due on March 27, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: As with Trammo, Peerless's request for a 60 day extension to move or answer the complaint is hereby granted. Peerless's motion or answer is due on May 26, 2014. Peerless is invited to join the pre-motion conference scheduled for April 16 at 4:30., Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc. answer due 5/26/2014.( Motions due by 5/26/2014.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/25/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(lmb)
March 25, 2014 Filing 381 DECLARATION of Kevin Wilson in Support re: (364 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 34 in 1:14-cv-01014-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Tauber Oil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Walsh, Michael)
March 25, 2014 Filing 380 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Tauber Oil. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Walsh, Michael)
March 25, 2014 Filing 379 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (364 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 34 in 1:14-cv-01014-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Tauber Oil. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Walsh, Michael)
March 25, 2014 Filing 378 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Michael Axline dated March 25, 2014 re: Dismissal Requests by Trammo and Peerless Defendants. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Axline, Michael)
March 21, 2014 Filing 377 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Barry R. Temkin dated 3/20/2014 re: Defendants Trammo Petroleum, Inc. ("TP") and Trammo Caribbean, Inc. ("Caribbean") (collectively, the "Trammo Defendants") respectfully request a pre-motion conference in the foregoing matter, in accordance with Rule IV(A) of Your Honor's Individual Rules.Pending such conference, we respectfully request a 60-day extension of the time these defendants have to move or answer, which is currently due on March 27, to avoid the parties' incurring unnecessary legal fees in drafting a motion to dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: Trammo's request for a 60 day extension is granted. Trammo has until May 26, 2014 to move or answer the Complaint. The parties may raise this issue at the conference scheduled for April 16 at 4:30 p.m., Trammo Caribbean, Inc. answer due 5/26/2014; Trammo Petroleum, Inc. answer due 5/26/2014.( Motions due by 5/26/2014.), ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/16/2014 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/21/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(lmb)
March 19, 2014 Filing 376 DECLARATION of Attorney Justin Arenas in Opposition re: #364 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Dema, John)
March 19, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Note to Attorney John K. Dema to RE-FILE Document #374 Declaration in Opposition to Motion. (db)
March 18, 2014 Filing 375 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #366 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Dema, John)
March 18, 2014 Filing 374 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Attorney Justin Arenas in Opposition re: #364 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Dema, John) Modified on 3/19/2014 (db).
March 18, 2014 Filing 373 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #364 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Dema, John)
March 12, 2014 Filing 372 DECLARATION of Daniel Boone in Opposition re: (224 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 371 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (224 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 370 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Michael A. Walsh dated 3/3/2014 re: Pursuant to the Court's Individual Rules and Procedure IV(D) Tauber Oil, Company ("Tauber") proposes that the briefing schedule for Tauber's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction in the above-referenced causes of action to be set to conform with the deadlines provided in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this Court's Local Rule 6.1(b). ENDORSEMENT: Tauber's request is hereby granted. Plaintiffs are required to file an opposition by March 18, 2014. Tauber's reply is due on March 25, 2014., ( Responses due by 3/18/2014., Replies due by 3/25/2014.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/12/2014) (lmb)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SUBMIT NEW REDACTED VERSIONS OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH PROTECTIVE AND SEALING ORDER: granting #324 Motion to Comply. Upon consideration of TOM and TPPRC Motion to Submit New Redacted Versions of Documents in Compliance with Protective and Sealing Order (Doc. No. 324), TOM and TPPRC are deemed in compliance with the Court's July 12 Order regarding the re-filing of documents used in connection with TOM's motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/11/2014) (lmb)
March 3, 2014 Filing 368 DECLARATION of Kevin Wilson in Support re: (364 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 3927 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 34 in 1:14-cv-01014-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Tauber Oil. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Walsh, Michael)
March 3, 2014 Filing 367 DECLARATION of Michael A. Walsh in Support re: (364 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 34 in 1:14-cv-01014-SAS, 3927 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Tauber Oil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Walsh, Michael)
March 3, 2014 Filing 366 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Tauber Oil. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Walsh, Michael)
March 3, 2014 Filing 365 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (364 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 34 in 1:14-cv-01014-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Tauber Oil. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Walsh, Michael)
March 3, 2014 Filing 364 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Document filed by Tauber Oil.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:14-cv-01014-SAS(Walsh, Michael)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER: ORDERED that Trafigura Beeher, B.V. and Trafigura A.G. are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). The Clerk is directed to close document #361. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/6/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(cd)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER: ORDERED that Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, Puma Energy Puerto Rico, Inc., and Puma Energy International, B.V. are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/6/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(cd)
January 31, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney John Dema Document #360 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for approval. (jno)
January 30, 2014 Filing 361 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) As To Trafigura Beheer, B.V. and Trafigura A.G.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board.(Dema, John)
January 30, 2014 Filing 360 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, Puma Energy International, B.V., Puma Energy Puerto Rico, Inc.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dema, John) Modified on 1/31/2014 (jno).
January 22, 2014 Filing 359 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/14/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
January 22, 2014 Filing 358 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/14/2014 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
January 14, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Status Conference held on 1/14/2014. (Bloomfield, Clifford)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 357 OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons in this Opinion and Order, both motions are GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close these motions (Doc. Nos. 332 and 342). re: (332 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A., (342 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Summary Judgment of Idemitsu Apollo Corporation filed by Idemitsu Apollo Corporation. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/30/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS (rjm)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY Theodore Dorenkamp III PRO HAC VICE. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(cd)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 355 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #113 re rulings made during the 11/18/2013 status conference: Motions by defendants for summary judgment in the City of Fresno case, due by 1/10/2014. Responses due by 1/30/2014 Replies due by 2/14/2014. Depositions due by 12/20/2013. Discovery due by 12/20/2013. Tesoro and Kern are dismissed with prejudice for the stations at issue in the City of Fresno case. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/25/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ATTORNEY, upon payment of the appropriate fee to the Cashier's Office. Attorney Jorge L. Flores De Jesus for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico,Jorge L. Flores De Jesus for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board,Jorge L. Flores De Jesus for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/22/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(cd)
November 21, 2013 Filing 353 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Idemitsu Apollo Corporation.. Document filed by Idemitsu Apollo Corporation. (Wilson, Robert)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 352 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 112 (EXPERT DISCOVERY PROTOCOL): With respect to testifying experts in this litigation: The parties shall produce the required expert reliance materials (hereinafter, the "Reliance Materials") no later than five business days after the deadline to serve each relevant expert report pursuant to Case Management Order entered September 30, 2013, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/15/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(cd)
November 15, 2013 Filing 351 AMENDED ANSWER to. Document filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(Gerson, Lisa)
November 15, 2013 Filing 350 AMENDED ANSWER to. Document filed by Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco, Incorporated (R&M), Sunoco, Incorporated, Puerto Rico Sun Oil Company LLC, Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Sunoco Inc., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M),. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(Krainin, Daniel)
November 15, 2013 Filing 349 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #344 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Jackson, William)
November 15, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney William James Jackson to RE-FILE Document #348 Response in Opposition to Motion. Use the event type Counter Statement to Rule 56.1 found under the event list Other Answers. (db)
November 14, 2013 Filing 348 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #342 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Idemitsu Apollo Corporation. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Idemitsu Apollo Corporation's Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Jackson, William) Modified on 11/15/2013 (db).
November 14, 2013 Filing 347 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #342 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Idemitsu Apollo Corporation. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Idemitsu Apollo Corporation. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Jackson, William)
November 5, 2013 Filing 346 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #332 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A.. (Langlois, David)
October 31, 2013 Filing 345 AFFIDAVIT in Support re: #342 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Idemitsu Apollo Corporation.. Document filed by Idemitsu Apollo Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Wilson, Robert)
October 31, 2013 Filing 344 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Idemitsu Apollo Corporation. (Wilson, Robert)
October 31, 2013 Filing 343 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #342 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Idemitsu Apollo Corporation.. Document filed by Idemitsu Apollo Corporation. (Wilson, Robert)
October 31, 2013 Filing 342 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Idemitsu Apollo Corporation. Document filed by Idemitsu Apollo Corporation. Responses due by 11/14/2013(Wilson, Robert)
October 22, 2013 Filing 341 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #332 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Vitol Defendants Rule 56.1 Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Jackson, William)
October 22, 2013 Filing 340 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #332 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Objections to Motion for Summary Judgment Evidence Offered by Defendants Vitol, S.A. and Vitol, Inc.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Jackson, William)
October 22, 2013 Filing 339 DECLARATION of Michael D. Axline in Opposition re: #332 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Jackson, William)
October 22, 2013 Filing 338 AFFIDAVIT of Ramon Cruz Diaz in Opposition re: #332 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Jackson, William)
October 22, 2013 Filing 337 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #332 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Vitol, S.A. and Vitol, Inc.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Jackson, William)
October 18, 2013 Filing 336 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #332 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A.. (Langlois, David)
October 18, 2013 Filing 335 AFFIDAVIT of Zimmerman in Support re: #332 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A.. (Langlois, David)
October 18, 2013 Filing 334 AFFIDAVIT of Fransen in Support re: #332 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A.. (Langlois, David)
October 18, 2013 Filing 333 AFFIDAVIT of Langlois in Support re: #332 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A.. (Langlois, David)
October 18, 2013 Filing 332 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Vitol, Inc., Vitol, S.A..(Langlois, David)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from David N. Lutz dated 9/30/2013 re: We respectfully write on behalf of our client, Idemitsu Apollo Corporation ("IAC"), to request that a Pre-Motion Conference be held to discuss the Motion for Summary Judgment that we are prepared to file on behalf of IAC, IAC's Motion for Summary Judgment will ask this Court to reach the same decision for the same reasons as this Court found in its July 16, 2013 Order (Doc. 3766) dismissing Plaintiffs' claims against Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc. and Trammo Petroleum, Inc., on the basis of statute of limitations.ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's Request is hereby Granted. Defendants may file a motion for summary judgment by October 31, 2013. The motion may not exceed 15 pages. Plaintiff may file a response by November 14, not to exceed 15 pages. Defendant the file a reply by November 21, not to exceed 7 pages. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 10/31/2013., Responses due by 11/14/2013, Replies due by 11/21/2013.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/17/2013) (ama)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: The requests of James F. Bennett, Willie J. Epps, Jr. and Selena L. Evans, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action have been granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company-California,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company-Louisiana,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy, Inc.,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy, Inc.,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy, Inc.,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy, Inc.,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy, Inc.,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero RefiningTexas,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corp.,James F. Bennett for Valero Mktg & Supply Co,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining & Mktg Co,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, LP,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company (Doe 2),,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing & Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas LP,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oaklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, L.P.,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company - Oklahoma,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company Texas, LP,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining & Marketing Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company [DOE 1],James F. Bennett for Valero Energy Corporation,James F. Bennett for Valero Marketing and Supply Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining Company,James F. Bennett for Valero Refining and Marketing Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/07/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(ama)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 329 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.: The parties shall abide by the following schedule, which dates supersede those set forth in CMO 110 as further set forth within this order. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Fact Discovery due by 12/6/2013. Expert Discovery due by 5/30/2014. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/27/2013) (rsh)
September 10, 2013 Filing 328 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, from David P. Langlois, dated 8/26/2013, re: Defendants Vitol, S.A. and Vitol, Inc. (collectively "Vitol Defendants") request a pre-motion conference seeking leave to file a Motion for Summary Judgment dismissing Counts I-V of the Third Amended Complaint, the only Counts alleged against them; on the grounds that said claims are barred by the one-year statute of limitations for actions arising out of fault or negligence under Puerto Rico law. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' request is hereby granted. Defendants may file a motion for summary judgment by October 1, 2013. The motion may not exceed fifteen pages. Plaintiffs may file a response by October 22, 2013. This may not exceed fifteen pages. Defendants may then file a reply by November 5, 2013. This may not exceed seven pages. (Motions due by 10/1/2013, Responses due by 10/22/2013, Replies due by 11/5/2013.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/10/2013) (ja)
September 5, 2013 Filing 327 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Elaine Maldonado-Matias in Support re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz)
September 5, 2013 Filing 326 DECLARATION of Christophe Jacquet in Support re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz)
September 5, 2013 Filing 325 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz)
September 5, 2013 Filing 324 MOTION to Comply Motion to Submit New Redacted Versions of Documents in Compliance with Protective and Sealing Order. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A., Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation.(Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz)
August 26, 2013 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #297 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 06/27/2013, Receipt Number 465401070837. (jd)
August 26, 2013 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #315 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, in the amount of $200.00, paid on 07/26/2013, Receipt Number 465401073073. (jd)
August 26, 2013 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #264 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 05/31/2013, Receipt Number 465401068729. (jd)
August 26, 2013 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #288 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 06/07/2013, Receipt Number 465401069196. (jd)
August 26, 2013 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #177 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, in the amount of $1,200.00, paid on 02/15/2013, Receipt Number 465401060172, 465401060175, 465401060176, 465401060177, 465401060179, 465401060180. (jd)
August 26, 2013 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #190 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $200.00, paid on 03/26/2013, Receipt Number 465401063500. Payment for Adrian Sanchez-Pagan. (jd)
August 26, 2013 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #249 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $600.00, paid on 05/14/2013, Receipt Number 465401067467, 465401067468, 465401067469. (jd)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Isabel C. Frau-Nicole is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of the named Defendants in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $200.00 fee per applicant ($200.00 total) to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/22/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(lmb)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying (319) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:07-cv-10470-SAS; denying Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/2/2013). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
July 31, 2013 Filing 321 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #319 MOTION for Reconsideration or in the Alternative for Certification of Questions to the Supreme Court of Puerto Rico.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Axline, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 320 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Reconsideration re; #319 MOTION for Reconsideration or in the Alternative for Certification of Questions to the Supreme Court of Puerto Rico. Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael) Modified on 7/31/2013 (db).
July 31, 2013 Filing 319 MOTION for Reconsideration or in the Alternative for Certification of Questions to the Supreme Court of Puerto Rico. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 318 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Reconsideration. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, For Certification of Questions to the Supreme Court of Puerto Rico)(Axline, Michael) Modified on 7/31/2013 (db).
July 31, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Michael D. Axline to RE-FILE Document #317 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #316 Notice (Other) or in the Alternative for Certification of Questions to the Puerto Rico Supreme Court. MOTION for Reconsideration re; #316 Notice (Other) or in the Alternative for Certification of Questions to the Puerto Rico Supreme Court. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. ***REMINDER*** - First refile the #316 Notice AS THE MOTION for Reconsideration, then file and link any supporting documents. (db)
July 31, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Michael D. Axline to RE-FILE Document #318 MOTION for Reconsideration. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. Supporting documents are found under the Event Type - Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. Refile 2 documents. (db)
July 31, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Michael D. Axline to RE-FILE Document #320 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #319 MOTION for Reconsideration or in the Alternative for Certification of Questions to the Supreme Court of Puerto Rico. Memorandum of Points and Authorities. MOTION for Reconsideration re; #319 MOTION for Reconsideration or in the Alternative for Certification of Questions to the Supreme Court of Puerto Rico. Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents, then link to #319 Motion. (db)
July 30, 2013 Filing 317 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Reconsideration re; #316 Notice (Other) or in the Alternative for Certification of Questions to the Puerto Rico Supreme Court. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael) Modified on 7/31/2013 (db).
July 30, 2013 Filing 316 NOTICE of mOTION FOR rECONSIDERATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR CERTIFICATION OF QUESTIONS TO THE SUPREME COURT OF PUERTO RICO. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Axline, Michael)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER: The Court has considered the unopposed request of defendants Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, LLC and ConocoPhillips Company to admit pro hac vice Jessica Farley, of Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP, and there being no opposition thereto, the pro hac admission of the attorney listed below is hereby GRANTED, upon payment of the appropriate fee to the Cashier's Office. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/24/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER: The Court has considered the unopposed request of defendants Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, LLC and ConocoPhillips Company to admit pro hac vice Jessica Farley, of Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP, and there being no opposition thereto, the pro hac admission of the attorney listed below is hereby GRANTED, upon payment of the appropriate fee to the Cashier's Office (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/23/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ft) Modified on 7/24/2013 (ft).
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: The court has considered the unopposed request of Plaintiffs The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico through the Environmental Quality Board for pro hac vice admission of Justin J. Arenas and the request is hereby GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Justin J. Arenas is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of the above named Plaintiffs in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $200.00 fee per applicant ($200.00 total) to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/22/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ft)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Andres W. Lopez is admitted to practice before this Court Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the above-named defendants in the above-captioned matter upon the deposit of the required fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/15/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 311 AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated above, the Commonwealth's motion is denied, Defendants' relevance objections to discovery of its profits from MTBE-containing products are sustained, and all other discovery related to this remedy is quashed. The parties are directed to file all briefs, exhibits, and stipulated translations discussed in this Order on the docket of the case within five business days of the date of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ama)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER: The July 10, 2013 Opinion and Order incorrectly attributed statements that were made by William Jackson, Esq. at a June 11,2013 Conference to Daniel Boone, Esq., another attorney for the Plaintiffs. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(a), I am issuing an Amended Opinion and Order to correct this error. The Clerk is directed to docket this Order and the Amended Opinion and Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ama)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 309 OPINION AND ORDER re: (215 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint, filed by Total, S.A., (224 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion, filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A., (207 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Trammo Petroleum, Inc., Trammo Caribbean, Inc., (231 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, filed by Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc. For the foregoing reasons all of these motions are GRANTED: (1) Total Umbrella's motion is GRANTED; (2) TOM's motion is GRANTED; (3) Peerless' motion is GRANTED; and (4) the Trammo Defendants' motions are GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close these motions (Doc. Nos. 207, 215, 224, 231). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/16/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
July 16, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. #304 HAS BEEN REJECTED. Note to Attorney William James Jackson : THE CLERK'S OFFICE DOES NOT ACCEPT LETTERS FOR FILING, either through ECF or otherwise, except where the judge has ordered that a particular letter be docketed. Letters may be sent directly to a judge. (ka)
July 16, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. #303 HAS BEEN REJECTED. Note to Attorney William James Jackson : THE CLERK'S OFFICE DOES NOT ACCEPT LETTERS FOR FILING, either through ECF or otherwise, except where the judge has ordered that a particular letter be docketed. Letters may be sent directly to a judge. (ka)
July 15, 2013 Filing 308 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Unjust Enrichment Response; (2) Defendants' Unjust Enrichment Surreply; (3) Declaration of Daniel Krainin with accompanying exhibits on 7/15/2013. Document filed by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). (Krainin, Daniel)
July 15, 2013 Filing 307 DECLARATION of Dan Krainin containing Certified Translation. Document filed by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). (Krainin, Daniel)
July 15, 2013 Filing 306 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition Regarding Unjust Enrichment. Document filed by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). (Krainin, Daniel)
July 15, 2013 Filing 305 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition Regarding Unjust Enrichment., MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition. Document filed by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). (Krainin, Daniel)
July 15, 2013 Filing 304 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - BRIEF Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Unjust Enrichment and Disgorgement Damages. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Jackson, William) Modified on 7/16/2013 (ka).
July 15, 2013 Filing 303 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - BRIEF Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Unjust Enrichment and Disgorgement as a Measure of Damages. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Jackson, William) Modified on 7/16/2013 (ka).
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 OPINION AND ORDER re: (289 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Protective Order Motion for Entry of Protective and Sealing Order, filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation. For the foregoing reasons, TPPRC's motion for protective and sealing order is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the motion (Doc. No. 289). The parties are directed to re-file the fourteen documents at issue, redacted only to the extent permitted above, when I issue a ruling on the pending motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/12/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
July 12, 2013 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: (302 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) Memorandum & Opinion to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 301 OPINION AND ORDER: At a Case Management Conference held on April 10, 2013, I denied the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico's motion seeking leave to amend its Complaint to add a claim for unjust enrichment, on the grounds that it would be prejudicial given the advanced age of the case. However, I permitted letter briefing on whether unjust enrichment might be permissible as a remedy for one of the claims alleged in the Complaint. Presently before the Court on the parties' letter briefs is the Commonwealth's motion requesting that it be allowed to conduct written discovery and depositions on the income gained and expense avoided by Defendants through their sale and use of MTBE in Puerto Rico. The Commonwealth asserts that it is entitled to this discovery because, under the law of Puerto Rico, disgorgement of profits and expenses avoided is available as a remedy for its claims. Defendants dispute this assertion and object to the discovery. For the reasons stated herein, the Commonwealth's motion is denied, Defendants' relevance objections to discovery of their profits from MTBE containing products are sustained, and all other discovery related to this remedy is quashed. The parties are directed to file all briefs, exhibits, and stipulated translations discussed in this Order on the docket of the case within five business days of the date of this Order. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER: Here, the Commonwealth has offered no basis to conclude that the additional briefing it requests more than a month after the full submission of the matters in question would be anything more than the opening shot in an "endless volley of briefs." For this reason, and for the reasons stated above, the Commonwealth's request for additional briefing is denied. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/26/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ft)
June 27, 2013 Filing 299 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply to Response to Motion served on all parties on June 27, 2013. Document filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.. (Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
June 27, 2013 Filing 298 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #289 MOTION for Protective Order Motion for Entry of Protective and Sealing Order.. Document filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.. (Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Amanda Collazo-Maguire for Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Attorney James B. Harris for Petrobras America, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
June 17, 2013 Filing 295 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (289 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION for Protective Order Motion for Entry of Protective and Sealing Order. ; Declaration of Daniel Boone. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting (275) Motion for Leave to File Document; granting (281) Motion to Produce; granting (248) Motion to Produce in case 1:07-cv-10470-SAS; granting Motion for Leave to File Document; granting Motion to Produce; granting Motion to Produce in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF. Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc. ("Peerless") and Total Outre Mer, S.A ("TOM") have filed motions seeking leave to submit certified translations of certain documents (the "Translation Motions") in connection with their currently pending motions to dismiss. The motions are granted. It is hereby ordered that, going forward, a party shall be permitted to submit English translations of Spanish-language documents offered in connection with the briefing of a motion within a reasonable time of the entry of the Spanish-language document, so long as opposing counsel stipulates and agrees to the delay. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the Translation Motions (Doc. Nos. 236, 248, 275, 281). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/14/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is directed to replace: 1) the Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry No. 261); 2) the Affidavit of Daniel Boone in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry No. 262); and 3) the Notice of Index of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Trammo Petroleum, Inc. and Trammo Caribbean, Inc. Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion (Docket Entry No. 263), which were conditionally under seal, with redacted versions of Docket Entry Nos. 261, 262, and 263 to be supplied by plaintiffs. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to then unseal all three docket entries in their entirety. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/14/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER: that Document Nos. [283, 284, 286 and 287] is stricken from the record. For the following three reasons, the Objections are procedurally improper, and will be stricken from the record. First, there is no procedural device for filing 'objections' to a reply declaration or affirmation. The question of whether the Moving Defendants have presented materials that cannot support their pending motions under the Federal Rules of Evidence was fully submitted to the Court upon the filing of their reply briefs. Second, the Objections violate Rule 7.1(a)-(b) of the Local Rules of the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York ("Local Rules"). They seek judicial notice of materials beyond the relief sought by the pending motions, but do not "specify the applicable rules or statutes pursuant to which" they are brought. Finally, the Objections violate Rule IV.G of my Individual Rules and Procedures to the extent that they are sur-replies and/or supplemental briefing filed without this Court's prior permission. For these reasons, I order the Objections stricken from the record. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/14/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
June 14, 2013 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: (293 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) Order to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
June 14, 2013 Filing 291 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. for Sunoco Inc.. Document filed by Sunoco Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:08-cv-00312-SAS(Krainin, Daniel)
June 12, 2013 Filing 290 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #231 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc.. (Sanchez, Adrian)
June 7, 2013 Filing 289 MOTION for Protective Order Motion for Entry of Protective and Sealing Order. Document filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
June 6, 2013 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (287) from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to (292 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) Order Striking Document from Record. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
June 6, 2013 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (286) from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to (292 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) Order Striking Document from Record. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION. Attorney Eugene N. Hansen for Total, S.A. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/6/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS (ja)
June 5, 2013 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (284) from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to (292 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) Order Striking Document from Record. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
June 5, 2013 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (283) from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to (292 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) Order Striking Document from Record. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is directed to replace the Affidavit filed with plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry # 261), which is conditionally under seal, with a redacted Affidavit to be supplied by plaintiff. The Clerk of the Court is then directed to unseal the entire docket entry. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/5/2013) (ft) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ft).
June 5, 2013 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #285 Order to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (ft)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION. Attorney Dustin Fossey for Idemitsu Apollo Corporation admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/3/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
May 30, 2013 Filing 281 MOTION to Produce Certified English Translation. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Translation)(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
May 29, 2013 Filing 280 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #207 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lewis, Sara)
May 29, 2013 Filing 279 DECLARATION of William E. Markstein in Support re: #207 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lewis, Sara)
May 28, 2013 Filing 278 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Objections to Declaration of Luis R. Vazquez in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Peerless Oil & Chemicals, Inc.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
May 28, 2013 Filing 277 DECLARATION of Daniel Boone in Opposition re: (231 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
May 28, 2013 Filing 276 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (231 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
May 24, 2013 Filing 275 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish Language Documents. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A..(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
May 24, 2013 Filing 274 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Elaine Maldonado-Matias in Support re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
May 24, 2013 Filing 273 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
May 24, 2013 Filing 272 REPLY re: #257 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Reply to Plaintiffs' Objections to the Declaration of Christophe Jacquet. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
May 24, 2013 Filing 271 AFFIRMATION of Elaine Maldonado-Matias in Support re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
May 24, 2013 Filing 270 DECLARATION of Christophe Jacquet in Support re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
May 24, 2013 Filing 269 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT PEERLESS OIL & CHEMICALS' MOTION TO DISMISS: that Plaintiff's opposition memorandum to the Motion, together with any supporting papers, shall be filed and served no later than May 28, 2013; and that Defendant Peerless' reply memorandum in support of the Motion, together with any supporting documents and any certified translations, shall be filed and served no later than June 12, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: No further extensions will be granted. ( Responses due by 5/28/2013, Replies due by 6/12/2013.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/23/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja) Modified on 5/29/2013 (ja).
May 22, 2013 Filing 267 DECLARATION of Peter Herbel in Support re: #215 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Total, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Polebaum, Elliot)
May 22, 2013 Filing 266 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #215 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Total, S.A.. (Polebaum, Elliot)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. The motion to withdraw the appearance of Lauren E. Handel as counsel of record for the Exxon Mobil Corporation defendants, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court is hereby GRANTED: in case 1:03-cv-09544-SAS; granting (3732) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:07-cv-04012-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05916-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05943-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:07-cv-02405-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-00877-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03752-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:07-cv-08360-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05960-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05903-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:05-cv-09070-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-05422-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:07-cv-04009-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:07-cv-04011-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:07-cv-10470-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:08-cv-06306-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:09-cv-03739-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:09-cv-03738-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-01379-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-01381-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03750-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03742-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03753-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03751-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03754-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-03741-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:11-cv-04072-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05496-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05924-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05925-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05927-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05928-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05930-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05931-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05932-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05959-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05958-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05957-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05956-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05933-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05963-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05962-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05961-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05919-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05917-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05915-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05914-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05913-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05937-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05920-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05921-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05922-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05938-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05923-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05939-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05901-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05940-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05902-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05941-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05905-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05906-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05942-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05907-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05911-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05912-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05945-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05946-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05947-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05948-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05949-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05950-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05951-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05952-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05953-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05954-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05955-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:06-cv-05926-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04974-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04973-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04969-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04971-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04972-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04970-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-04975-SAS; granting [] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-01719-SAS; granting [] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-01718-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-01721-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-01722-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-01723-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-03412-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-03413-SAS; granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Erica Handel terminated in case 1:04-cv-01725-SAS; granting Moti
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION. Attorney Albeniz Couret-Fuentes for Total Outre Mer, S.A. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/14/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
May 13, 2013 Filing 263 NOTICE of Index of Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss By Defendants Trammo Petroleum, Inc. and Trammo Carribbean, Inc. re: (261 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael) (sdi).
May 13, 2013 Filing 262 AFFIDAVIT of Daniel Boone in Opposition re: (207 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael) (sdi).
May 13, 2013 Filing 261 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (207 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael) (sdi).
May 13, 2013 Filing 260 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Equity, L.P. for Sunoco Inc.. Document filed by Sunoco Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:08-cv-00312-SAS(Krainin, Daniel)
May 13, 2013 Filing 259 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT # 3726) - AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Equity L.P., Heritage ETC L.P., La Grange Acquisition L.P., HPL Consolidation LP for Sunoco, Inc.. Document filed by Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:08-cv-00312-SAS(Krainin, Daniel) Modified on 5/13/2013 (lb).
May 10, 2013 Filing 258 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Total Outre-Mer, S.A. served on All Counsel on May 10, 2013. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
May 10, 2013 Filing 257 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Objections to the Declaration of Christophe Jacquet, in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Total Outre-Mer. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
May 10, 2013 Filing 256 NOTICE of Index of Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Total Outre-Mer S.A. [redacted]. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
May 10, 2013 Filing 255 DECLARATION of DANIEL BOONE in Opposition re: (224 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
May 10, 2013 Filing 254 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (224 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
May 8, 2013 Filing 253 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Def. Total S.A. served on All Counsel on May 8, 2013. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
May 8, 2013 Filing 252 Exhibit List Index of Evidence. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
May 8, 2013 Filing 251 DECLARATION of DANIEL BOONE in Opposition re: (215 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
May 8, 2013 Filing 250 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (215 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Axline, Michael)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION. Attorney David N. Lutz, Shane V. Bohnen and Mary T. Novacheck for Idemitsu Apollo Corporation admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/6/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
May 6, 2013 Filing 248 MOTION to Produce Certified Translation of Documents in Spanish. Document filed by Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc..(Sanchez, Adrian)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR THE MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS TRAMMO PETROLEUM, INC. AND TRAMMO CARIBBEAN, INC.: The Trammo Defendants filed their notice of motion to dismiss, memorandum of law and supporting papers on April 12, 2013. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's opposition memorandum to the Motion, together with any supporting papers, shall be filed and served no later than May 13, 2013; and it is further ORDERED that the Trammo Defendants' reply memorandum in support of the Motion, if any, together with any supporting papers, shall be filed and served no later than May 29, 2013. ( Responses due by 5/13/2013, Replies due by 5/29/2013.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/1/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
April 29, 2013 Filing 246 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noe Reyna on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board (Reyna, Noe)
April 29, 2013 Filing 245 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Victor Luis Cardenas, Jr on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board (Cardenas, Victor)
April 29, 2013 Filing 244 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heidi Katrina Bundren on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board (Bundren, Heidi)
April 29, 2013 Filing 243 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Total, S.A. for Total Outre Mer, S.A.. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A..(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
April 29, 2013 Filing 242 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Creeger Petit on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico (Petit, William)
April 26, 2013 Filing 241 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A..(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine) Modified on 4/26/2013 (lb).
April 26, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Elaine M. Maldonado-Matias to RE-FILE Document #241 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (lb)
April 24, 2013 Filing 240 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William James Jackson on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board (Jackson, William)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT TOTAL OUTRE-MER, S.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS: TOM filed its Notice of Motion together with a memorandum of law and other supporting documents on April 17, 2013. The parties agreed upon the following schedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED: That Plaintiff's opposition to the Motion to Dismiss together with any supporting documents shall be filed and served no later than May 10, 2013; That Defendant TOM's reply memorandum in support of Motion, together with any supporting documents, shall be filed and served no later than May 24, 2013. ( Responses due by 5/10/2013, Replies due by 5/24/2013.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/23/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
April 23, 2013 Filing 238 FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES to Defendants.Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board.(Gilmour, John)
April 23, 2013 Filing 237 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Dalston Smith Gilmour on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico (Gilmour, John)
April 23, 2013 Filing 236 MOTION to Authorize Submit certified translations of Spanish documents. Document filed by Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc..(Sanchez, Adrian)
April 22, 2013 Filing 235 AFFIRMATION of Adrian Sanchez-Pagan in Support re: #231 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc.. (Sanchez, Adrian)
April 22, 2013 Filing 234 DECLARATION of Luis R. Vazquez in Support re: #231 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc.. (Sanchez, Adrian)
April 22, 2013 Filing 233 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #231 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc.. (Sanchez, Adrian)
April 22, 2013 Filing 232 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc..(Sanchez, Adrian)
April 22, 2013 Filing 231 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc..(Sanchez, Adrian)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT TOTAL S.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS: Defendant Total S.A. filed its notice of motion to dismiss, memorandum of law, and supporting declarations on April 17, 2013. The parties having agreed upon the following schedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' opposition memorandum to the Motion, together with any supporting papers, shall be filed and served no later than May 8, 2013; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant Total S.A.'s reply memorandum in support of the Motion, if any, together with any supporting papers, shall be filed and served no later than May 22, 2013. ( Responses due by 5/8/2013, Replies due by 5/22/2013.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/22/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
April 19, 2013 Filing 229 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Petroleo Brasileiro S.A. - Petrobras for Petrobras America, Inc.. Document filed by Petrobras America, Inc..(Katz, William)
April 17, 2013 Filing 228 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on April 17, 2013. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
April 17, 2013 Filing 227 AFFIRMATION of Elaine Maldonado-Matias in Support re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
April 17, 2013 Filing 226 DECLARATION of Christophe Jacquet in Support re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
April 17, 2013 Filing 225 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #224 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 12(B)(2) and (6). Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A.. (Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
April 17, 2013 Filing 224 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. Document filed by Total Outre Mer, S.A..(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
April 17, 2013 Filing 223 ANSWER to #175 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Petrobras America, Inc..(Katz, William)
April 17, 2013 Filing 222 DECLARATION of Peter Herbel in Support re: #215 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Total, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Polebaum, Elliot)
April 17, 2013 Filing 221 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trafigura Beheer, B.V..(Jarashow, Richard)
April 17, 2013 Filing 220 ANSWER to #175 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Trafigura Beheer, B.V..(Jarashow, Richard)
April 17, 2013 Filing 219 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Total, S.A..(Polebaum, Elliot)
April 17, 2013 Filing 218 DECLARATION of Elliot E. Polebaum in Support re: #215 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Total, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Polebaum, Elliot)
April 17, 2013 Filing 217 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - (SEE CORRECTED ENTRY# 222)
April 17, 2013 Filing 216 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #215 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Total, S.A.. (Polebaum, Elliot)
April 17, 2013 Filing 215 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Total, S.A..(Polebaum, Elliot)
April 16, 2013 Filing 214 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Vitol Holding SARL (Geneva) for Vitol, Inc.. Document filed by Vitol, Inc..(Langlois, David)
April 16, 2013 Filing 213 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Vitol Holding SARL, Geneva for Vitol, S.A.. Document filed by Vitol, S.A..(Langlois, David)
April 15, 2013 Filing 212 ANSWER to #175 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Trafigura A.G..(Allen, Brent)
April 15, 2013 Filing 211 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Trafigura Beheer B.V., Corporate Parent Trafigura Trade Investments B.V., Corporate Parent Trafigura Trade Holdings B.V., Corporate Parent Trafigura B.V., Corporate Parent Trafigura Holdings S.A R.L., Corporate Parent Trafigura Group Pte. Ltd. for Trafigura A.G.. Document filed by Trafigura A.G..(Allen, Brent)
April 12, 2013 Filing 210 AFFIRMATION of Mark S. Katz in Support re: #207 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Katz, Mark)
April 12, 2013 Filing 209 DECLARATION of William E. Markstein in Support re: #207 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Katz, Mark)
April 12, 2013 Filing 208 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #207 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Katz, Mark)
April 12, 2013 Filing 207 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Katz, Mark)
April 12, 2013 Filing 206 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Transammonia, Inc. for Trammo Petroleum, Inc.. Document filed by Trammo Petroleum, Inc..(Katz, Mark)
April 12, 2013 Filing 205 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Transammonia, Inc. for Trammo Caribbean, Inc.. Document filed by Trammo Caribbean, Inc..(Katz, Mark)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 STIPULATION AND ORDER: that the deadline for TAG to file any responsive pleading in the above-captioned case shall be extended to and including April 15, 2013. Trafigura A.G. answer due 4/15/2013. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
April 9, 2013 Filing 203 ANSWER to #175 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Vitol, Inc..(Langlois, David)
April 9, 2013 Filing 202 ANSWER to #175 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Vitol, S.A..(Langlois, David)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER: Through a letter submitted to the Court on March 28, 2013, defendant Total Outre-Mer, S.A. ("TOM, S.A.") requests an extension of time to respond to the Third Amended Complaint until May 14, 2013. Plaintiffs have previously offered to extend TOM, S.A.'s time to respond to the Third Amended Complaint to April 17, 20l3, but oppose TOM S.A.'s present request. The parties' present contentions are substantially identical to those considered by the Court in ruling on the recent request for an extension of time made by Total, S.A., TOM, S.A.'s affiliate. For the same reasons given in that Order, TOM, S.A.'s request for an extension of time is granted in part and denied in part. TOM, S.A. may have until April 17, 2013 to answer or otherwise plead to the Third Amended Complaint. No further extensions of time will be granted. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/3/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
April 4, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Total Outre Mer, S.A. answer due 4/17/2013. (ja)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER: On March 25, 20l3, Defendant Total, S.A. ("Total") submitted a letter to the Court requesting that its time to answer or otherwise plead to the Third Amended Complaint be extended to May 14,2013. For the reasons set forth herein and in light of the foregoing, Total's request for an extension of time is granted in part and denied in part. Total may have until April 17, 2013 to answer or otherwise plead to the Third Amended Complaint. No further extensions of time will be granted. Total, S.A. answer due 4/17/2013. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
April 2, 2013 Filing 199 NOTICE of Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer. Document filed by Petrobras America, Inc.. (Katz, William)
March 26, 2013 Filing 198 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adrian Sanchez, Sr on behalf of Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc. (Sanchez, Adrian)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendant Trafigura Beheer, B.V. ("TBBV"), by counsel, hereby stipulate that the deadline for TBBV to file any responsive pleading in the above-captioned case shall be extended to and including April 17, 2013. Trafigura Beheer, B.V. answer due 4/17/2013. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/22/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja) Modified on 3/22/2013 (ja).
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs, the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, and Defendant, Trafigura Beheer, B.V. ("TBBV"), by counsel, hereby stipulate that the deadline for TBBV to file any responsive pleading in this case shall be extended to and including April 17, 2013. Defendant TBBV submits this Stipulation and Order by way of special appearance and expressly reserves its right to challenge personal jurisdiction and service in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: No further adjournments will be granted. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/21/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ft)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Mark S. Katz dated 3/21/2013 re: Counsel requests a 30-day extension of time in which to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Third Amended Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Trammo Caribbean, Inc. and Trammo Petroleum, Inc. are hereby granted a twenty-one (21) day extension of time to answer or otherwise plead with respect to the Third Amended Complaint. No further adjournment for any reason. A responsive pleading must be filed by April 12, 2013. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/21/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ft)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 110: The parties shall abide by the following schedule, as well as any subsequently entered CMOs or orders of the Court: Joinder of Parties due by 7/12/2013. Fact Discovery due by 10/18/2013. Expert Discovery due by 4/25/2014. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ft)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 109: WHEREAS, on September 19, 2012 plaintiffs identified the 377 sites listed on Exhibit A hereto as the sites where plaintiffs had no evidence of MTBE contamination as of that time; and therefore, IT IS ORDERED that all sites listed on Exhibit A are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ft)
March 21, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Trafigura Beheer, B.V. answer due 4/17/2013. (ft)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CARLOS A. DEL VALLE CRUZ for plaintiff Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(cd)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION. Attorney Carlos A. Del Valle Cruz for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ja)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: Jaime Sifre-Rodriguez and Adrian Sanchez-Pagan are admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above caption case in the United District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/13/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ft)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs, the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, and Defendant, Tauber Oil Company, by counsel, hereby stipulate that the deadline for Tauber Oil Company to file any responsive pleading in the above-captioned case shall be extended to and including April 16, 2013. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/12/2013) (mt)
March 12, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines: Tauber Oil answer due 4/16/2013. (mt)
March 8, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Michael Andrew Walsh to E-MAIL Document No. #187 Stipulation, to judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. This document is not filed via ECF. (db)
March 7, 2013 Filing 188 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tauber Oil.(Walsh, Michael)
March 7, 2013 Filing 187 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation and Order Extending Time for Tauber Oil to File Responsive Pleading to and including April 16, 2013. Document filed by Tauber Oil.(Walsh, Michael) Modified on 3/8/2013 (db).
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER APPROVING ALTERNATE SERVICE OF PROCESS: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(f)(3), Plaintiffs are permitted to effectuate service on those foreign defendants, whose States of destination have not objected under the Hague Convention to service through postal channels, by using international couriers, such as Federal Express International or DHL Global Mail, which service is reasonably calculated to give defendants notice of the pendency of this action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/27/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ft)
February 27, 2013 Filing 185 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME: that the time for defendants, TRAMMO CARIBBEAN INC. and TRAMMO PETROLEUM INC. to answer, move and/or otherwise appear in response to the plaintiff's third amended complaint has been extended up to and including March 22, 2013. Trammo Caribbean, Inc. answer due 3/22/2013; Trammo Petroleum, Inc. answer due 3/22/2013. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/26/2013) (ja)
February 26, 2013 Filing 184 ANSWER to #175 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Idemitsu Apollo Corporation.(Wilson, Robert)
February 26, 2013 Filing 183 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. for Idemitsu Apollo Corporation. Document filed by Idemitsu Apollo Corporation.(Wilson, Robert)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: This Court has considered the unopposed request of Defendants Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., and BP Corporation North America Inc. to admit pro hac vice Jeffrey J. Freeman of Kirkland & Ellis LLP, and the request is hereby GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that Jeffrey J. Freeman is admitted to practice before the Court pro hac vice on behalf of the above named Defendants in these civil actions upon payment by each party of the required $200.00 to the Clerk of Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/22/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(ft)
February 15, 2013 Filing 181 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Stephen Katz on behalf of Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc. (Katz, Mark)
February 15, 2013 Filing 180 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Nicole Lewis on behalf of Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc. (Lewis, Sara)
February 15, 2013 Filing 179 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry R. Temkin on behalf of Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Trammo Petroleum, Inc. (Temkin, Barry)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appendix A is to be attached to the Third Amended Complaint, and it is to be deemed filed on December 3, 2012. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/28/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(js)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: The application to withdraw the appearance for plaintiffs in this matter of the firm of Richardson, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, and its attorneys, Aaron Dias and Gordon C. Rhea, is hereby GRANTED, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. Attorney Aaron R. Dias and Gordon C. Rhea terminated. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/25/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(pl)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: Upon application of Counsel for Plaintiffs and there being no opposition thereto, the pro hac vice admission of the following attorneys to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in this matter is hereby GRANTED, upon payment of the appropriate fee to the Cashier's Office: William J. Jackson; John D.S. Gilmour; Victor L. Cardenas, Jr.; William C. Petit; Heidi Bundren; Noe Reyna. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 01/25/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(jcs)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 174 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: PROTOCOL GOVERNING RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS: Parties shall provide 21 days notice for any Rule 30(b)(6) deposition. The notice shall identify, with reasonable particularity, the topics to be addressed at the deposition. Written objections, if any, to a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition notice, or any portion thereof, shall be served at least 7 days prior to the deposition. Objections to the deposition notice not provided in writing will be deemed waived. The parties shall use best efforts to resolve any differences concerning compliance with this Agreement. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(ft) Modified on 12/6/2012 (ft).
December 4, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8030101.(Garcia-Diaz, Jorge)
December 3, 2012 Filing 175 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 23 Amended Complaint against Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., Chevron Caribean, Inc., Chevron Corporation, Chevron Estrella Puerto Rico, Inc., Chevron International Oil Company, Inc., Chevron Puerto Rico, LLC, Chevron U.S.A., Inc.,, Citgo International P.R., Citgo Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation, Citgo Refining and Chemical Company, LP, ConocoPhillips Company, Equilon Enterprises, LLC, Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), ExxonMobil Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Hovensa L.L.C., Motiva Enterprises, LLC, Puerto Rico Sun Oil Company LLC, Shell Chemical Yabucoa, Inc., Shell Company Puerto Rico LTD, Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Texaco Petroleum, Inc., Texaco Puerto Rico, Inc., Texaco Refining And Marketing, Inc., Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board, Shell Oil Company, Shell Enterprises, LLC, Chevron Phillips, Citgo Petroleum Corporation, Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation, Total Outre Mer, S.A., Total, S.A., Shell Western Supply and Trading, Limited, Shell International Petroleum Company, Limited, Shell Western Services, Peerless Oil and Chemicals, Inc., Puma Energy Caribe, LLC, Puma Energy Puerto Rico, Inc., Puma Energy International, B.V., Trafigura A.G., Trafigura Beheer, B.V., Petrobras America, Inc., Tauber Oil, Tenoco Oil Company, Idemitsu Apollo Corporation, Trammo Petroleum, Inc., Trammo Caribbean, Inc., Vitol, S.A., Does 1-99 with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Through The Environmental Quality Board. Related document: 23 Amended Complaint filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Environmental Quality Board, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(ft) Modified on 12/7/2012 (ft).
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Jorge J. Garcia-Diaz, Esq., is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of the Shell Company (Puerto Rico) Limited, now known as Sol Puerto Rico Limited in this civil action upon payment of the required $200 fee to the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/30/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(mro)
November 30, 2012 Filing 172 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/22/2012 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 26, 2012 Filing 171 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/11/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 26, 2012 Filing 170 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/11/2012 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/20/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
October 15, 2012 Filing 169 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Total Raffinage Marketing for Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.. Document filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp..(Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER. On August 27, 2012, defendants in the above matter moved to compel plaintiffs to supplement certain of their April 9, 2012 Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Regarding Plaintiffs' Trial Sites. This motion (which has been fully briefed) is referred to Special Master Kenneth J. Warner for resolution. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(rjm)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from John K. Dema dated 10/4/2012 re: Based on the foregoing, plaintiffs respectfully requests that the Court order a pre-motion conference to address Sol's ongoing discovery deficiencies. ENDORSEMENT: The issues raised in this letter will be addressed at the October 22 Status Conference. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/5/2012) (js)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER: As discussed at the status conference held in this matter on August 16, 2012: (1) defendant Total is ordered to produce to plaintiffs an unredacted version of the document titled "Remediation Projects," Bates stamped TPPRC.GENERAL000456 through 000589; (2) defendant Shell is ordered to send Mr. Michael-GENERAL-000456 through 000589; (2) defendant Shell is ordered to send Mr. Michael Axline, counsel for plaintiffs, an unredacted version of the document "Non-Exclusive Sales Contract for Branded Products" - this version is not to be considered produced, and plaintiffs may only use it to formulate arguments as to why additional unredacted portions should be produced to them; and (3) for each of the "non-test" sites discussed at the April 12, 2012 and May 2, 2012 status conferences, defendants are ordered to identify - conferences, defendants are ordered to identify - whether MTBE testing was done and whether the test was positive for MTBE. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/29/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(pl)
August 10, 2012 Filing 165 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 6/7/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 10, 2012 Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 6/7/2012 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER: As discussed at the status conference held in this matter on July 12, 2012, plaintiffs are ordered to confirm by September 12, 2012 the list of sites at which MTBE has been tested for and detected. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/25/2012) (djc)
July 12, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Status Conference held on 7/12/2012. Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:08-cv-00312-SAS(djc)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 102: AGREEMENT ON THE DISCOVERY AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI). This Agreement on the Discovery and Production of Electronically Stored Information ("Agreement"), is by and between the plaintiffs and the defendants hereto, in the action presently pending in the District Court of the Southern District of New York entitled In Re: Methyl Tertiary Butyl Ether ("MTBE") Products Liability Litigation, Master File c.A. No. 1 :00-1988 (SAS) M21-88, MDL No. 1358, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, et al. v. Shell Oil Co., et al., No. 07 -CIV -10470. This Agreement governs the production of hard copy documents and ESI subsequent to the execution of the Agreement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/08/2012) (ama) Modified on 6/18/2012 (ama).
May 8, 2012 Filing 161 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/2/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 8, 2012 Filing 160 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 5/2/2012 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tara Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs by Thomas P. Gressette, Jr., who has appeared in this case as counsel for Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico through the Environmental Quality Board, and the Motion to Withdraw is hereby GRANTED. Attorney Thomas P. Gressette terminated. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(pl)
April 26, 2012 Filing 158 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 4/12/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 26, 2012 Filing 157 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 4/12/2012 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 12, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Status Conference held on 4/12/2012. (djc)
March 5, 2012 Filing 156 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/24/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 5, 2012 Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 2/24/2012 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #99:This Order memorializes the rulings made at the February 24, 2012 conference in this matter. A status conference is scheduled for March 30, 2012 at 4:30 p.m. 1. New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection: a. Defendants intend to file a motion challenging approximately seventy-five (75) entries in Plaintiffs' privilege logs dated November 17, 2011 and December 1, 2011. Defendants' moving papers are due February 28, 2012. Plaintiffs shall respond by March 13, 2012. Defendants shall reply by March 20, 2012. All of this Court's individual rules of practice regarding page limits, both for briefs and exhibits, shall apply. b. In advance of deposing certain key NJDEP witnesses, Defendants intend to file a motion to determine whether the deliberative process privilege, even if properly asserted, is overcome by their need to know about Plaintiffs' deliberations regarding the risks and benefits of certain oxygenates, including MTBE. Defendants' moving papers are due March 2, 2012. Plaintiffs shall respond by March 16, 2012, and Defendants shall reply by March 23, 2012. In their moving papers, Defendants shall clearly and concisely delineate the questions they intend to ask the NJDEP witnesses. All of this Court's individual rules of practice regarding page limits, both for briefs and exhibits, shall apply. 2. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico: a. Defendants assert that they made certain focus site designations based on inaccurate information that Plaintiffs provided to them. On this basis, Defendants intend to move for a discovery sanction ordering Plaintiffs to dismiss five of their trial site designations. Defendants' moving papers are due March 2, 2012. Plaintiffs shall respond by March 12, 2012, and Defendants shall reply by March 19, 2012. All of this Court's individual rules of practice regarding page limits, both for briefs and exhibits, shall apply. b. Defendants are entitled to designate up to seven additional trial sites in advance of the next status conference. c. The parties shall jointly submit a proposed order dismissing all remaining "non-detect" sites from this case, without prejudice. d. All PRASA-owned wells for which GIS location co-ordinates were not provided by July 2011 are dismissed from this case, with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/28/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 1:08-cv-00312-SAS(mro) Modified on 2/29/2012 (mro).
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER: This Order memorializes the ruling made during the status conference held on January 20, 2012.WHEREAS, Plaintiffs were unable to produce evidence of MTBE contamination at eighteen (18) of Defendants' twenty (20) "focus sites," Plaintiffs have agreed to dismiss the following sites: set forth in this order. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the eighteen (18) "focus sites", for which Plaintiffs were unable to produce evidence of MTBE contamination, are dismissed from the case without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(js)
February 17, 2012 Filing 150 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/15/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 17, 2012 Filing 149 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/15/2011 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/12/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER: Benjamin L. Snowden, Esq., is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Chevron U.S.A, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a/ Shell Oil Products US), Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Oil Products Company, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Texaco Inc., TMR Company (f/k/a/ Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc.), Texaco Refining and Marketing (East) Inc., and TRMI Holdings, Inc. in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $200 fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(ft)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER: Marie S. Dennis, Esq., is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Chevron U.S.A, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a Shell Oil Products US), Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Oil Products Company, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Texaco Inc., TMR Company (f/k/a Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc.), Texaco Refining and Marketing (East) Inc., and TRMI Holdings, Inc. in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $200 fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(ft)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL in case 1:03-cv-09544-SAS granting (3401) MOTION for Anthony A. Orlandi to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P. and SFPP, L.P.: The motion to withdraw the appearance of Anthony A. Orlandi as counsel of record for Defendants Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P. and SFPP, L.P. is hereby granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion [Docket No. 3401]. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al. (ab)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: Donald B. Mooney is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of the Plaintiffs The Administrator of the New Jersey Spill Fund, The Commissioner of the New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, the New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico through the Environmental Quality Board. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS (ab)
December 16, 2011 Minute Order Proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Status Conference held on 12/16/2011. (cd)
December 13, 2011 Filing 146 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/15/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 13, 2011 Filing 145 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/15/2011 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 17, 2011 Filing 144 PRETRIAL ORDER #67 (Defendants' Motion to Compel Properly Prepared 30(b)(6) Witness): Defendants' motion to compel is granted. Plaintiffs "must produce someone familiar with" the "subject matter" identified in defendants' 30(b)(6) Notices of Deposition, Reilly, 181 F.3d at 269, and they are "obligated to prepare [the witness or witnesses] so that they may give knowledgeable and binding answers for" plaintiffs, including covered persons, with regard to the identified issues. Jajari, 206 F.R.D. at 127. Plaintiffs must therefore produce awitness or witnesses properly prepared to speak on behalf of plaintiffs, including all covered persons, to the eight issues identified in defendants' Notices of Deposition for each of the 20 focus sites. These 30(b)(6) depositions shall be completed by no later than November 30, 2011. If any problem arises in connection with this timing, the parties should contact me immediately.- (Signed by Kenneth E Warner, Special Master on 11/4/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(cd)
November 14, 2011 Filing 143 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/15/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 14, 2011 Filing 142 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/15/2011 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/8/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2012.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Keena M. Hausmann dated 10/7/2011 re: Counsel for defendant writes with the consent of Mr. Rosenthal, respectfully requesting that he be relieved as counsel for defendant ConocoPhillips Company in the above referenced action. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' request to relieve Mr. Rosenthal as counsel for ConocoPhilips is granted. So Ordered. (Spread to all cases as per chambers instruction) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/17/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(js)
September 20, 2011 Filing 140 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/25/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 20, 2011 Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/25/2011 before Judge Leonard B. Sand. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 25, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Discovery Hearing held on 8/25/2011. (pl)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: It is hereby Ordered that Maria D. Trelles-Hemandez, Nestor M. M6ndez-G6mez, Diego Murgia.Dlaz and Edwin R. Cruz-Figueroa granting (132) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (133) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (134) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (135) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:07-cv-10470-SAS. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/19/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(jfe) Modified on 8/29/2011 (jfe).
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting (3444) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion to withdraw the appearances of Anthony F. King, Alec C. Zacaroli and Rebecca L Schuller as counsel pro hac vice for defendants Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC (individually and a/k/a Shell Oil Products US), Equiva Trading Company, Four Star Oil & Gas Company, Gulf Oil Corp., Motiva Enterprises LLC, TRMI Holdings, Inc., Texaco Inc., Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc., Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company, Shell Petroleum, Inc., and Star Enterprise is GRANTED. Attorney Anthony Frazier King and Alec C. Zacaroli terminated in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/17/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(mro) Modified on 8/19/2011 (mro).
August 12, 2011 Filing 136 OPPOSITION BRIEF TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ESI DISCOVERY. Document filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico.(Axline, Michael)
August 9, 2011 Filing 135 MOTION for Edwin R. Cruz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company.(pgu)
August 9, 2011 Filing 134 MOTION for Nestor M. Mendez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company.(pgu)
August 9, 2011 Filing 133 MOTION for Diego Murgia Diaz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company.(pgu)
August 5, 2011 Filing 132 MOTION for Maria D. Trelles-Hernandez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc., ConocoPhillips Company.(pgu)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER, that Mari C. Spears, Esq., is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Chevron U.S.A, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a/ Shell Oil Products US), Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Oil Products Company, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Texaco Inc., TMR Company (f/k/a/ Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc.), Texaco Refining and Marketing (East) Inc., and TRMI Holdings, Inc. in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $25.00 fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/23/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(pl)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 (MEMO ENDORSEMENT) ORDER in case 1:03-cv-09544-SAS; granting (664) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas G. Campins terminated in case 1:04-cv-03417-SAS; granting (72) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas G. Campins terminated in case 1:09-cv-01419-SAS; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule lA, please withdraw the appearance of Nicholas G. Campins as counsel of record in All MDL 1358 Cases, including City of New York v. Amerada Hess Corp., et at, Case No. 04-CIV-3417; City of Pomona v, Chevron USA, Inc et ai, No, CIVMSC08-032 14; Yosemite Springs Park Utility District v. Chevron, US.A., et 01., Case No.09-CIV-1419. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted. The Clerk is directed to close this motion (docket #3410) So Ordered. Attorney Nicholas G. Campins terminated in case 1:09-cv-03738-SAS; granting (3411) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas G. Campins terminated in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/3/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(tro)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: The motion to withdraw the appearance of Nicole L. Picard as counsel of record for Defendant Gulf Oil Limited Partnership, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court, is hereby GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/2/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jfe)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Stephen J. Riccarduill, dated 5/19/2011, re: Counsel on behalf of Defendants writes to propose October 31, 2011, which would provide the parties the same amount of time that was afforded in the New Jersey matter to narrow the discovery sites to trial sites. ENDORSEMENT: Trial site selection must be completed by October 31, 2011 - Defendants proposed date - but all parties are forewarned that the October 31, date will not be extended for any reason. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/20/2011) (lnl)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL, that the motion to withdraw the appearance of Anthony A. Orlandi as counsel of record for Defendant Gulf Oil Limited Partnership, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of this Court, is hereby GRANTED. in case 1:03-cv-09544-SAS; granting (3400) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anthony A. Orlandi terminated in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/19/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(pl)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Daniel Alberstone for All Plaintiffs admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jfe)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Ronland K. Tellis for All Plaintiffs admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jfe)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE: Attorney Mitchell McCrea for All Plaintiffs admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jfe)
May 13, 2011 Filing 123 AMENDED ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint,,,,., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against John and Jane Does Nos. 1-99., CROSSCLAIM against John and Jane Does Nos. 100-200. Document filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.. (Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER: The Court has considered the unopposed request of ChevronTexaco Corporation (now known as Chevron Corporation), Chevron U.S.A. Inc., TRMI Holdings Inc., Texaco Inc., Union Oil Company of California, and Unocal Corporation, and "all predecessor companies named herein" (hereinafter "Chevron Defendants") to admit pro hac vice Sara G. Noel, Esq. of King & Spalding LLP and the request is hereby GRANTED. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/4/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(js)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #89: This Order memorializes the rulings made during the status conference held on March 30, 2011. (See ORDER as set forth) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/5/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al. (lnl)
March 17, 2011 Filing 120 AMENDED ANSWER to. Document filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation,, Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Exxon Corporation, Exxonmobil Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(Gerson, Lisa)
February 28, 2011 Filing 119 AMENDED ANSWER to. Document filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(Gerson, Lisa)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER ADMITTING FRANK A. DANTE PRO HAC VICE: It is hereby Ordered that Frank A. Dante is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Lyondell Chemical Company and Equistar Chemicals, LP in this matter. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jfe)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 CASE MANAGEMENT (PLAN) ORDER: 1. Crescenta Valley Water District: A pre-motion conference for the defendants' contemplated dispositive motions is scheduled for March 11, 2011 at 4:30 pm. Defendants' pre-conference letter is due on February 25, 2011; plaintiff's reply letter is due on March 4, 2011. 2. California cases: The parties will meet and confer prior to March 11, 2011 to discuss mediation. Specifically, the parties will talk about which cases would be included in a structured settlement effort, and attempt to identify a mutually acceptable mediator. 3. The next status conference is scheduled for March 30, 2011 at 4:30 pm, subject to change. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 3/11/2011 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Status Conference set for 3/30/2011 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/18/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(db)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER, that David A. Grenardo, Esq. is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of the Chevron Defendants and "all predecessor companies named herein" in this civil action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/7/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al. (lnl)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER, that Samuel D. Davis, Esq. is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of the Chevron Defendants and "all predecessor companies named herein" in this civil action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/7/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al. (lnl)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE: Attorney Cheryl A. Sabnis' request is GRANTED, and is permitted to appear Pro Hac Vice for ChevronTexaco Corporation (now known as Chevron Corporation), Chevron U.S.A. Inc, TRMI Boldings Inc., Texaco Inc., Union Oil Company of California. and Unocal Corporation. Attorney Cheryl A. Sabnis for Chevron Corporation,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Chevron Corporation,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Chevron U.S.A., Inc.,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Chevron U.S.A., Inc.,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Chevrontexaco Corporation,Cheryl A. Sabnis for TRMI Holdings Inc.,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Texaco Inc.,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Union Oil Company of California,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Union Oil Company of California,Cheryl A. Sabnis for Unocal Corporation admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/14/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(db)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: Attorney P. Renee Wicklund for Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., and BP Products North America, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/9/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al. (lnl)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: Attorney Krenice M. Roseman for Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., and BP Products North America, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/9/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al. (lnl)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION: Attorney Andrew R. Running for Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., and BP Products North America, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/9/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al. (lnl)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER: James J. Maher, Esq. is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of the Chevron Defendants and "all predecessor companies named herein" in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $25 fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/1/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jpo)
January 31, 2011 Filing 109 AMENDED ANSWER to (1 in 1:11-cv-00479-SAS) Complaint, (15 in 1:10-cv-08742-SAS) Amended Complaint, (12 in 1:10-cv-08743-SAS) Amended Complaint, (23 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS) Amended Complaint,,,, (1202 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF) Amended Complaint,,,, (23 in 1:10-cv-08184-SAS) Amended Complaint, (62 in 1:09-cv-06554-SAS) Third Party Complaint, (21 in 1:10-cv-08182-SAS) Amended Complaint, (21 in 1:10-cv-07874-SAS) Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendants Sunoco, Inc. and Sunoco, Inc. (R&M)(Bridgewater Water Dep't), #2 Supplement Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendants Sunoco, Inc. and Sunoco, Inc. (R&M)(City of Kennett), #3 Supplement Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendants Sunoco, Inc. and Sunoco, Inc. (R&M)(City of Pattonsburg))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(Krainin, Daniel)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 84. This Case Management Order sets the schedule for the selection of discovery sites in the above referenced matter and supersedes the schedule as previously set by CMO 65. A. The parties shall each designate 12 discovery sites by March 1, 2011. B. The parties shall each designate 8 additional discovery sites by April 15, 2011. C. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding the additional dates set in CMO 65 and to submit a proposed order for the Court's consideration. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/26/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(rjm)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE: The Court has considered the unopposed request of Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Valero Refining Company-Oklahoma, Valero Refining Company-Texas, L.P., Valero Refining Company-New Jersey. Valero Refining Company-Delaware, Valero Refining Company-California, Ultramar Inc. and The Premcor Refining Group Inc. (hereinafter "Valero Defendants") to admit pro hac vice Eduardo S. Perez, Amy E. Parker, and Benjamin H. Patton of Bracewell & Giuliani LLP and the request is hereby GRANTED; Eduardo S. Perez, Amy E. Parker, and Benjamin H. Patton are admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of the Valero Defendants and "all predecessor companies named herein" in civil action upon the deposit of the required $25 per admission to the Clerk of this Court. Attorneys Eduardo S. Perez; Amy E. Parker; Benjamin H. Patton added. The applicants contact information is attached to this order. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/20/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(db)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION Attorney Sylvia Nichole Winston for Atlantic Richfield Company,Sylvia Nichole Winston for BP Corporation North America Inc.,Sylvia Nichole Winston for BP Products North America, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/4/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(cd)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION. Attorney Christina Lynn Henk for Atlantic Richfield Company,Christina Lynn Henk for BP Corporation North America Inc.,Christina Lynn Henk for BP Products North America, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/14/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(cd)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: The Court hereby approves of the withdrawal of Russell D. Workman as counsel for Defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc. and Chevron Corporation (f/k/a ChevronTexaco Corporation)( collectively, "Chevron Defendants"). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/3/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jpo)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: The Court hereby approves of the withdrawal of Russell D. Workman as counsel for Defendants Chevron USA, Inc. and Chevron Corporation (f/k/a Chevron Texaco Corporation). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/3/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(jpo)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Jeremiah J. Anderson for Chevron Corporation,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Chevron Corporation,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Chevron U.S.A., Inc.,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Chevron U.S.A., Inc.,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Chevrontexaco Corporation,Jeremiah J. Anderson for TRMI Holdings Inc.,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Texaco Inc.,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Texaco Inc.,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Union Oil Company of California,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Union Oil Company of California,Jeremiah J. Anderson for Unocal Corporation admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/17/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(cd)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #79: 1. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico: Each party will choose twenty (20) focus sites for discovery. The parties shall propose the focus sites in two waves i.e., both parties will propose twelve (12) sites on one date and then both parties will propose eight (8) additional sites on a later date. The parties will meet and confer to discuss the number of trial sites and will propose an amendment to the discovery schedule in CM0 #65 to accommodate the staggered selection of focus sites. 2. Orange County Water District: A pre-motion conference for plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment is scheduled for December 16, 2010 at 2:30 pm. Plaintiffs pre-conference letter is due on December 8, 2010; defendants' reply letter is due December 13, 2010. The page limit for both letters is five (5) pages. 3. Crescenta Valley: The Hamner Institute is directed to supply plaintiffs with data from its MTBE study in Excel format. The Hamner Institute will provide plaintiff with a progress report by December 6, 2010 explaining the time frame of production and any issues that may have arisen. The Hamner Institute will also provide an affidavit from a representative from Instem concerning which data, if any, it was unable to export. 4. New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection: A. Parties will submit a proposed CMO governing discovery, experts, pre-trial, and trial matters by February 28, 20ll. B. Defendants will be permitted to take up to eighteen (18) depositions of NJDEP case managers for defense focus sites in anticipation of trial site selection. These depositions will be limited to seven (7) hours in duration, and will take place in Trenton, New Jersey. C. Defendants are directed to provide plaintiffs with a revised list of possible topics for the proposed deposition of a witness from the Office of Natural Resource Restoration. If the parties still cannot agree, they are referred to Special Master Warner to resolve the dispute. D. The parties are directed to disclose the criteria they used to identify the receptors impacted by release sites by December 6, 2010. E. By December 13, 2010, plaintiffs will provide defendants with the number of private wells on each street that plaintiffs have identified as impacted by plaintiffs' release sites. F. The parties are directed to exchange proposed keywords for the search of case managers' emails by December 2, 2010; to meet and confer regarding the proposed keywords by December 8, 2010; and any dispute over the keywords is referred to Special Master Warner, to be resolved by December 15, 2010. Plaintiffs will then propose a schedule for production of case manager emails to defendants by December 20,2010. G. The parties are each directed to select their ten (10) trial sites by February 1, 2011. H. Defendants are directed to submit, by December 6, 2010, a list of ten (10) individuals whose hard drives they propose to search for the purpose of sampling. 5. Village of Bethalto, Town of Kouts, Coraopolis: Plaintiffs shall have until December 31, 2010 to file amended complaints. Defendants will have thirty (30) days after the amended complaints are filed to file a motion to dismiss or to answer. Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2010. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2010. Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/16/2010 at 02:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/1/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(db)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #79, This Order memorializes the rulings made during the status conference held on November 23, 2010. 1. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico: Each party will choose twenty (20) focus sites for discovery. The parties shall propose the focus sites in two waves i.e., both parties will propose twelve (12) sites on one date and then both parties will propose eight (8) additional sites on a later date. The parties will meet and confer to discuss the number of trial sites and will propose an amendment to the discovery schedule in CM0 #65 to accommodate the staggered selection of focus sites. 2. Orange County Water District: A pre-motion conference for plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment is scheduled for December 16, 2010 at 2:30 p.m. Plaintiffs pre-conference letter is due on December 8, 2010; defendants' reply letter is due December 13, 2010. The page limit for both letters is five (5) pages. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/1/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(pl)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SUPPLEMENTAL CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND ORDER regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/23/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(rjm)
October 27, 2010 Filing 98 AMENDED ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Puerto Rico Sun Oil Company LLC, Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). (Krainin, Daniel)
October 20, 2010 Filing 97 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lesley K Lawrence-Hammer on behalf of Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company, Coastal Oil New England, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company. New Address: Greenberg Traurig LLP, 2101 L Street, NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, USA 20037, 202-331-3100. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley)
October 19, 2010 Filing 96 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lesley K Lawrence-Hammer on behalf of Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company, Coastal Oil New England, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company. New Address: Greenberg Traurig LLP, 2101 L Street, NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, USA 20037, 202-331-3100. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley)
October 19, 2010 Filing 95 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lesley K Lawrence-Hammer on behalf of Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company, Coastal Oil New England, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company. New Address: Greenberg Traurig LLP, 2101 L Street, NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, USA 20037, 202-331-3100. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley)
October 19, 2010 Filing 94 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lesley K Lawrence-Hammer on behalf of Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Coastal Mobile Refining Company, Coastal Oil New England, El Paso CGP Company, El Paso Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company. New Address: Greenberg Traurig LLP, 2101 L Street, NW, Suite 1000, Washington, DC, USA 20037, 202-331-3100. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS -DCF et al.(Lawrence-Hammer, Lesley)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION; Upon the motion of Christine M. Riley and said sponsor attorney's affidavit in support; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Michelle A. Burr is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Southern Counties Oil Company, Inc., in the above captioned Counsel shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/29/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(djc) Modified on 8/9/2010 (djc).
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #75: For each case currently pending in MDL 1358, those defendants who remain a party and who owned or leased property with underground storage tanks (USTs) or owned or leased USTs during the relevant time period and in the relevant geographic area at issue (as defined by the Court) shall provide declarations in that case identifying such property and underground storage tanks they owned or leased, and the dates of such ownership or leasing, within the relevant geographic area. If a defendant owns or owned, or leases or leased more than 50 USTs or properties with USTs, such defendant may provide a printout from a database or other electronically available information together with a declaration describing the meaning of the printout. If a defendant would have to review numerous paper files or otherwise has data gaps based on the age of the information, the defendant may seek relief based on burden from theSpecial Master. For those cases where the use of "focus sites" has been ordered by the Court, a defendant shall provide a declaration regarding ownership and leasing information for properties and USTs for the focus sites that have been or will be selected in the case. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/22/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(db)
June 22, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Aaron R. Dias for noncompliance with Section (14.3) of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 23 Amended Complaint,,,, to: case_openings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (rdz)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 73: The parties in the above referenced matter have agreed that the revised Rules 26(b)(4)(B)&(C), which go into effect in December, will apply to expert discovery in this case, as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/11/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #72 This Order memorializes the rulings made during the status conference held on 5/19/10. ExxomMobil is granted leave to notice de bene esse depositions of three ExxonMobil employees-Mr. Robert Biles, Mr. Vic Dugan, and Mr. Thomas Eizember-in all cases in this multi-district litigation, and as further set forth in this document. The next all-cases status conference is scheduled for 9/8/10 at 10:30. Status Conference set for 9/8/2010 at 10:30 AM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/27/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
May 27, 2010 Filing 89 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Beth Haas of Blank Rome, LLP as Counsel for Lyondell Chemical Company and Equistar Chemicals, L.P.. Document filed by Lyondell Chemical Company. (Haas, Beth)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Alec C. Zacaroli,Esq., is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Chevron U.S.A, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC (d/b/a Shell Oil Products US), Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Oil Products Company, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Texaco Inc., TMR Company (f/k/a Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc.), Texaco Refining and Marketing (East) Inc., and TRMI Holdings, Inc. in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $25.00 fee to the Clerk of this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/26/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(rjm)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #65: re discovery rulings made during the status conference held on 4/14/10 as to The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and New Jersey cases, see document. All Cases Status Conference set for 5/19/2010 at 10:30 AM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL that John J. Amberg is no longer associated with Kirkland & Ellis LLP and should be removed from the service list. Kirkland & Ellis LLP continues to serve as counsel for the BP Defendants through their attorney(s) J. Andrew Langan, Wendy L. Bloom, Peter Bellacosa and Christopher Esbrook and all future correspondence and papers in this action should continue to be directed to them. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/12/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY David T. Ritter PRO HAC VICE for all plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/24/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #60: re rulings made at the 3/4/10 status conference, see document for various deadlines..... In Incorporated Village of Mineola, West Hempstead Water District, Carle Place Water District, Town of Southhampton, Village of Hempstead, Town of East Hampton, Westbury Water District: Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2010. Motion for summary judgment by defendant Barco in the West Hempstead case, due by 4/15/2010. Responses due by 5/13/2010 Replies due by 5/27/2010. Discovery due by 10/1/2010. All-cases Status Conference set for 4/14/2010 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/9/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #57: 1. Village ofHempstead and West Hempstead: A. A conference is scheduled for February 10, 2010 at lOAM to discuss preparation for the West Hempstead trial scheduled to begin on June 21, 2010. This conference may be converted to an "all cases" status conference if the parties identify a sufficient number of issues that should be decided by the Court.B. Plaintiffs are directed to supply defendants with the "Village of Hempstead spill documents" requested by defendants. If defendants are not satisfied with the documents produced, they may identify what documents they believe are missing to Special Master Warner. C. Plaintiffs are directed to supply defendants with the Bates numbers ofthe "West Hempstead Analyte Data and Laboratory Procedures" documents requested by defendants. 2. New Jersey:A. Plaintiffs are directed to produce the "Oracle" database in native format. If the parties cannot resolve the other electronic discovery disputes in this case, including whether portions of the "Oracle" database should be redacted, with ten (10) days, these disputes are referred to Special Master Warner.B. Plaintiffs are directed to produce the non-site-specific discovery requested by defendants. If plaintiffs object to any of these requests as being overbroad, the matter is referred to Special Master Warner. C. Plaintiffs are directed to produce a list of sites for which they have not identified specific MTBE release points. If defendants, with plaintiffs' direction, are unable to extract the other sites at issue in this case - i.e., those sites where specific lVITBE release points have been identified - from the databases already produced by plaintiffs, the parties are directed to meet with Special Master Warner to determine how to proceed with extracting a list ofMTBE release sites. D. The parties are directed to meet and confer to discuss ajoint proposedcase management order for the selection of focus sites. If the parties cannot agree upon ajoint proposal, they shall submit individual proposed case management orders. The parties shall not limit the selection of focus sites to a single county or geographic region and shall not use a "strike" process in selecting focus sites. In addition, the parties shall not sequence the proposal of focus sites between parties, but shall propose focus sites in two waves - e.g., both parties will propose eight (8) sites on one date and then both parties will propose four (4) additional sites on a later date. The parties mayselect a larger number of focus sites for discovery than for trial. The number of discovery sites shall be no greater than fifty (50), and the number of trial sites shall be no greater than twenty (20). E. Defendants shall be given limited discovery on the entire set of sites at issue in this case. The discovery should be aimed at providing defendants with the information needed to select focus sites for trial. The parties shall meet with Special Master Warner to determine the scope of this limited discovery. F. Plaintiffs are directed to provide short interrogatories to defendants requesting information regarding the refineries from which each defendant has shipped gasoline products into the State ofNew Jersey, the terminals that each defendant has used in doing so, the stations that each defendant owned in New Jersey, the underground storagetanks used at those stations, and the periods of time during whichdefendants had ownership of each one of those stations. Each defendant shall answer these interrogatories separately and retains the right to make objections as appropriate. F. The time for asserting third party claims is stayed. A deadline for asserting third party claims relating to focus sites will be set after those sites are chosen. As to all other sites, the time for asserting third party claims is stayed indefinitely. 2. Puerto Rico: A. Plaintiffs are directed to produce a list of sites for which they have notidentified specific MTBE release points. If defendants, with plaintiffs' direction, are unable to extract the other sites at issue in this case - i.e., those sites where specific MTBE release points have been identified - from the databases already produced by plaintiffs, the parties are directed to meet with Special Master Wan1er to determine how to proceed with extracting a list of MTBE release sites. B. The parties shall inform the Court of their progress following the parties' scheduled visit to Puerto Rico on January 14 and 15.C. The parties are directed to be ready to discuss the process of choosing focus sites for trial by the next status conference. The parties shouldlook to the Court's rulings in the New Jersty case for guidance on how to proceed with discovery and the selection of focus sites. 3. Exxon Mobil shall be permitted to take de bene esse fact depositions of Mr. Robert Reynolds, Mr. Robert Scala, and Mr. Sullivan D. Curran. Mr. Reynolds is already scheduled to be deposed in the Napoli Bern cases. Unless that deposition is cancelled, Exxon Mobil shall be permitted to take its deposition of Mr. Reynolds following the deposition relating to the Napoli Bern cases. 4. In the Napoli Bern cases, the defendants are directed to inform plaintiffs by January 11, 2010 which scheduled expert depositions, if any, they are waiving. 5. Tampa Bay Water, City ofCrystal River, City ofInverness Water District, and City of Homosassa: Plaintiffs are directed, no later than January 15, 2010, to serve interrogatories and/or document requests on Gulf Oil Limited Partnership ("GOLP") in anticipation of GOLP filing a motion for summary judgment in these cases. Defendants shall either respond to these requests or explain to Special Master Warner why the requested documents do not exist. After any such issues are settled, GOLP shall submit a proposed schedule for briefing its summary judgment motion. 6. Riverhead Water District case: Plaintiff is directed to amend its interrogatory responses as directed at the status conference by January 20, 2010. 7. Town ofSouthampton: Plaintiff was directed to amend its interrogatory responses by January 8, 2010. 8. Orange County Water District: the parties are directed to select the ten (10) focus plumes that will be used for trial. The parties shall exchange their lists of five (5) focus plumes by January 15, 2010. The parties are directed to complete fact discovery by the end of August, and to submit a proposed expert discovery schedule for approval by the Court. Status Conference set for 2/10/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/14/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(db)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN #55, this Order memorializes the rulings made during the status conference held on 10/29/09, see document as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/4/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Nicole L. Picard for Gulf Oil Limited Partnership admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/23/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
October 23, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (12 in 1:09-cv-03739-SAS, 67 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 75 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 207 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 91 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 81 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 72 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 74 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 91 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 101 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 99 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 91 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 89 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 87 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 88 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 90 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 47 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 110 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 69 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 47 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 98 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 71 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 121 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 49 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 53 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 50 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 41 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 103 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 45 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 68 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 79 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 58 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 73 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 41 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 52 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 87 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 74 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 54 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 490 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 92 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 47 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 41 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 67 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 17 in 1:09-cv-03738-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 49 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 40 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 47 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 2867 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 47 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 22 in 1:09-cv-01419-SAS, 103 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 67 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 67 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 75 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 119 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 6 in 1:09-cv-06554-SAS, 72 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 73 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 290 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 50 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 90 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 54 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 97 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 47 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 70 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 90 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 55 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 257 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 109 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 49 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 103 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 105 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 85 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 82 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 73 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 108 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 72 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 92 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Anthony A. Orlandi for Getty Oil Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/1/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(jpo)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Anthony A. Orlandi for Gulf Limited Liability Partnership, Gulf Oil Limited Partnership, Gulf Limited Liability Partnership, Gulf Oil, Limited Partnership, and Gulf Oil Limited Partnership admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/25/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
September 25, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (37 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 69 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 73 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 85 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 88 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 45 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 473 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 50 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 47 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 48 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 117 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 70 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 79 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 89 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 71 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 43 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 101 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 10 in 1:09-cv-03739-SAS, 45 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 51 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 101 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 39 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 54 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 38 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 86 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 107 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 87 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 103 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 75 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 108 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 4 in 1:09-cv-06554-SAS, 2847 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 38 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 52 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 72 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 47 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 89 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 68 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 96 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 203 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 106 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 45 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 66 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 72 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 45 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 88 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 47 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 53 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 90 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 73 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 85 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 99 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 253 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 88 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 288 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 48 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 90 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 54 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 67 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 97 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 36 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 95 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 45 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 80 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 71 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 15 in 1:09-cv-03738-SAS, 61 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 89 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 51 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 71 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 101 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 118 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 20 in 1:09-cv-01419-SAS, 45 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 37 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 83 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
July 27, 2009 Filing 78 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL that Khara Coleman is no longer associated with Kirkland & Ellis LLP and should be removed from the service list. Kirkland & Ellis LLP continues to serve as counsel for the BP Defendants... (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/27/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER....Therefore, the parties have requested-and consented to the appointment of a special discovery master. Accordingly, I am appointing, pursuant to FRCP 53(a)(1)(A) and (a)(1)(C) (as amended effective 12/1/03), after giving the parties notice and an opportunity to be heard (including the opportunity to recommend candidates), Ronald J. Hedges, Esq to serve as Special Master, until further order of this Court...The Special master's appointment is therefore effective immediately. The Special Master is directed "to proceed with all reasonable diligence" in the performance of his duties, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/8/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
May 18, 2009 Filing 74 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core Holdings LLC as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(cd)
May 14, 2009 Filing 73 DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY'S DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE STRUCTURE PURSUANT TO SECTION III OF PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, defendant's parent corporation is ConocoPhillips, which is a publicly traded company... Document filed by ConocoPhillips Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(cd)
May 14, 2009 Filing 72 DEFENDANT CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL PUERTO RICO CORE LLC'S DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE STRUCTURE PURSUANT TO SECTION III OF PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, that defendant's parent corporation is Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core Holdings LLC, which is not a publicly traded company. Document filed by Chevron Phillips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(cd)
May 7, 2009 Filing 76 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hess Oil Virgin islands Corp and PDVSA V.I. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hovensa L.L.C.Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(cd)
May 7, 2009 Filing 75 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hess Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation.Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(cd)
May 1, 2009 Filing 70 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying ESSO Standard Oil Company S.A. Limited, Exxon Mobil Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Esso Standard Oil Company (Puerto Rico), Exxon Mobil Corporation.Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Handel, Lauren)
May 1, 2009 Filing 69 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation.Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(Handel, Lauren)
April 28, 2009 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 68 Notice of Appearance. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kkc)
April 28, 2009 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 67 Notice of Appearance. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kkc)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that TOl/ATMI is hereby dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) and according to the terms of the agreement of the parties as evidenced by the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(2) and Joint Stipulation as to TOVATMI filed on January 9, 2009. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/27/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 1:07-cv-10470-SAS(jpo)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. Attorney Keara L. Kelley for El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy Petroleum Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Company, El Paso Merchant Energey-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Piont Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Piont Oil Company and El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/27/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Grace Leigh Chan for El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy Petroleum Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Company, El Paso Merchant Energey-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy- Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Piont Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company, Coastal Eagle Piont Oil Company and El Paso Merchant Energy -Petroleum Company admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/27/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
April 27, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (61 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 87 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 82 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 238 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 100 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 48 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 100 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 49 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 39 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 39 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 64 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 277 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 83 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 87 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 4 in 1:09-cv-03738-SAS, 58 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 16 in 1:09-cv-01419-SAS, 34 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 95 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 109 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 83 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 103 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 43 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 81 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 39 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 2337 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 97 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 37 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 82 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 79 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 83 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 41 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 44 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 67 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 4 in 1:09-cv-03739-SAS, 67 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 59 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 42 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 69 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 118 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 192 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 52 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 42 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 97 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 95 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 82 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 84 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 97 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 78 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 43 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 60 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 81 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 80 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 65 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 81 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 76 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 61 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 75 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 79 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 39 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 35 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 60 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 59 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 41 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
April 27, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (35 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 40 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 82 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 49 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 59 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 44 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 101 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 68 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 83 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 42 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 43 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 101 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 80 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 81 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 40 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 96 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 193 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 61 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 98 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 84 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 40 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 50 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 36 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 278 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 82 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 5 in 1:09-cv-03738-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 64 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 2338 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 35 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 76 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 61 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 60 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 65 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 35 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 96 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 44 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 66 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 98 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 119 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 88 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 104 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 85 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 84 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 60 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 239 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 84 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 47 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 82 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 36 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 80 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 110 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 36 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 5 in 1:09-cv-03739-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 66 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 43 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 98 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 65 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 38 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 83 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 83 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 17 in 1:09-cv-01419-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 42 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 45 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 59 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 88 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 40 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 35 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 79 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 49 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION Lesley K. Lawrence-Hammer is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for defendants El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company and Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company in the above captioned case. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/27/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(mme)
April 27, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: (32 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 36 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 99 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 66 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 64 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 38 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 60 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 48 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 60 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 38 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 3 in 1:09-cv-03738-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 40 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 41 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 41 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 86 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS, 99 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 82 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 94 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 102 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 2330 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 62 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 79 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 43 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 3 in 1:09-cv-03739-SAS, 62 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 80 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 83 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 78 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 42 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 40 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 113 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 237 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 78 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 68 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 61 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 82 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 81 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 82 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 81 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 31 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 34 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 47 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 32 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS) Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(mme)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN #52: In the New Jersey case, plaintiff shall identify, not later than 4/10/09, every discovery request to which it objects on the ground that the request call for site-specific discovery. If the parties are unable to resolve any dispute, they may bring the matter to this Court for resolution. Plaintiff shall provide non-site specific discovery by 5/15/09. In the City of NY case, the City shall respond to Shell's motion to exclude punitive damages by 4/30/09 and Shell shall reply by 5/11/09....This court will hold a hearing in the City of NY case on 4/24/09 at 10:30 am and in the Orange County Water District case on 5/15/09 at 11 am....In the recently filed Oyster Bay and Garden City case, defendants' unopposed motion for this Court to decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims is granted. Defendants shall submit proposed Order reflecting this ruling. When necessary, the parties shall contact this Court to schedule the next omnibus status conference. Response due by 4/30/2009. Reply due by 5/11/2009. Oral Argument/hearing set for 4/24/2009 at 10:30 AM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/17/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION OF DELIRIS ORTIZ-TORRES: It is hereby ordered that Deliris Ortiz-Torres, Esq, is admitted to practice before this Court pro hac vice on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corporation and Atlantic Trading Marketing, Inc. (formerly known as Total Oil, Inc.) in this civil action upon the deposit of the required $25 fee to the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/2/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(jpo)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the following motions on the master docket for MDL 1358, No. 00civ.1898 #2090, 2092, 2155, 2185. terminating (73) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:03-cv-09544-SAS; terminating (78) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:03-cv-09543-SAS; terminating (41) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01727-SAS; terminating (40) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01726-SAS; terminating (56) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01718-SAS; terminating (62) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01719-SAS; terminating (65) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01720-SAS; terminating (65) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01725-SAS; terminating (61) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-01721-SAS; terminating (43) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-02068-SAS; terminating (43) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-02072-SAS; terminating (87) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-02389-SAS; terminating (59) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-02390-SAS; terminating (60) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-02388-SAS; terminating (34) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-03415-SAS; terminating (41) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-03416-SAS; terminating (36) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-03419-SAS; terminating (39) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-05421-SAS; terminating (41) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-05422-SAS; terminating (40) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-05423-SAS; terminating (254) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-05424-SAS; terminating (47) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-06993-SAS; terminating (21) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:05-cv-04018-SAS; terminating (21) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:05-cv-09070-SAS; terminating (20) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:06-cv-01381-SAS; terminating (22) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:06-cv-03741-SAS; terminating (2090) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; terminating (2092) Motion to Dismiss; terminating (2155) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/20/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER TO AMEND, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to amend the caption of the order in In Re Methyl Tertiary Butyl Ether Products Liability Litigation, No. 00-1898, which was entered on 3/16/09 (document no. 2299), to read as follows: "CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #51" (change in italics) re: (50 in 1:04-cv-02061-SAS, 78 in 1:04-cv-01719-SAS, 61 in 1:06-cv-05496-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05927-SAS, 91 in 1:07-cv-02406-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05921-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05931-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05932-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05924-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-05916-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-01726-SAS, 76 in 1:03-cv-10057-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05947-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05946-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-03752-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05950-SAS, 75 in 1:03-cv-10051-SAS, 91 in 1:07-cv-02407-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05911-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-05421-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-03750-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05937-SAS, 69 in 1:04-cv-03418-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-05422-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05906-SAS, 70 in 1:04-cv-01716-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-01723-SAS, 42 in 1:06-cv-03753-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05955-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05922-SAS, 54 in 1:08-cv-07766-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05912-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05902-SAS, 97 in 1:07-cv-02405-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05905-SAS, 103 in 1:04-cv-02389-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-01722-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05941-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05957-SAS, 38 in 1:06-cv-03741-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05907-SAS, 81 in 1:04-cv-01725-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05943-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05917-SAS, 89 in 1:04-cv-04968-SAS, 52 in 1:04-cv-03412-SAS, 36 in 1:07-cv-04009-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-02072-SAS, 82 in 1:04-cv-03417-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-02055-SAS, 76 in 1:03-cv-10055-SAS, 32 in 1:08-cv-06306-SAS, 37 in 1:05-cv-04018-SAS, 42 in 1:04-cv-01724-SAS, 35 in 1:07-cv-04011-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05959-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05923-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-05423-SAS, 76 in 1:03-cv-10056-SAS, 59 in 1:04-cv-02068-SAS, 40 in 1:04-cv-02057-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05945-SAS, 43 in 1:04-cv-04973-SAS, 41 in 1:04-cv-02056-SAS, 77 in 1:04-cv-01721-SAS, 214 in 1:03-cv-09050-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05901-SAS, 94 in 1:03-cv-09543-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-01379-SAS, 29 in 1:06-cv-00877-SAS, 33 in 1:07-cv-06848-SAS, 54 in 1:04-cv-03420-SAS, 91 in 1:07-cv-02403-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05940-SAS, 36 in 1:06-cv-01381-SAS, 10 in 1:09-cv-01419-SAS, 58 in 1:08-cv-07764-SAS, 46 in 1:04-cv-02067-SAS, 72 in 1:04-cv-01718-SAS, 186 in 1:03-cv-08248-SAS, 76 in 1:04-cv-02388-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05914-SAS, 43 in 1:08-cv-00278-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05928-SAS, 33 in 1:05-cv-01310-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05951-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05956-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-03754-SAS, 89 in 1:03-cv-09544-SAS, 35 in 1:07-cv-04012-SAS, 61 in 1:04-cv-02070-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05963-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05939-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-04974-SAS, 73 in 1:03-cv-10054-SAS, 56 in 1:04-cv-04969-SAS, 2299 in 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF, 74 in 1:03-cv-10053-SAS, 57 in 1:04-cv-01727-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05925-SAS, 37 in 1:05-cv-09070-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05948-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05920-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05961-SAS, 53 in 1:04-cv-02060-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-02059-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-02066-SAS, 75 in 1:03-cv-10052-SAS, 29 in 1:06-cv-05903-SAS, 75 in 1:04-cv-02053-SAS, 29 in 1:05-cv-10259-SAS, 41 in 1:04-cv-04971-SAS, 94 in 1:04-cv-04972-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-03415-SAS, 59 in 1:07-cv-10470-SAS, 55 in 1:04-cv-04975-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05915-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-03742-SAS, 73 in 1:04-cv-04970-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05933-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05962-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05960-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-10205-SAS, 41 in 1:04-cv-04990-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05942-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05949-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05930-SAS, 75 in 1:04-cv-02390-SAS, 58 in 1:04-cv-03416-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05913-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05954-SAS, 50 in 1:04-cv-02062-SAS, 31 in 1:07-cv-08360-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05952-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-03419-SAS, 51 in 1:04-cv-03413-SAS, 81 in 1:04-cv-01720-SAS, 271 in 1:04-cv-05424-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05919-SAS, 33 in 1:06-cv-03751-SAS, 63 in 1:04-cv-06993-SAS, 50 in 1:08-cv-00312-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05953-SAS, 28 in 1:06-cv-05938-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05926-SAS, 28 in 1:07-cv-09453-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-05958-SAS) Case Management Plan,,, (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/17/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #48 re rulings made during the status conference held on 2/26/09: In the New Jersey and Puerto Rico cases, the parties shall meet and confer in order to submit a joint pre-trial scheduling order at the next status conference. In the City of NY case, the City seeks an order from this Court finding a limited waiver of Shell's assertion of attorney-client privilege with respect to certain documents identified on its privilege logs, and as further set forth in this document.....The next status conference is scheduled for 4/2/09 at 10 am. Status Conference set for 4/2/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/16/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:00-cv-01898-SAS-DCF et al.(cd)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Khara A. A. Coleman for Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc., BP Corporation