Heeb et al v. The Republic of Argentina
Plaintiff: Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Plaintiffs, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Bibiana Della Flora, Casimiro Kornas, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Elena Graciela Martinez, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, AJU S.A. and Juan Domingo Balestrelli
Defendant: The Republic of Argentina
Interested Party: Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Banco Central de la Republica Argentina, Origenes AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Consolidar AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Maxima AFJP S.A. and Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.
Appellant: Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social
Case Number: 1:2007cv10656
Filed: November 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332oc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT: NOW, THEREFORE, full satisfaction of plaintiffs' Final Judgment is hereby acknowledged, and the Clerk of the Court is hereby authorized and directed to make an entry of full satisfaction on the docket. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/27/2020) (jwh)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: NOW, THEREFORE, plaintiffs, by their attorneys Milberg Phillips Grossman LLP, and the Republic, by its attorneys Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, HEREBY STIPULATE AND AGREE THAT: 1. Plaintiffs' claims are hereby dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with prejudice and without costs. The Clerk of the Court shall mark this action closed and all pending motions denied as moot. (The Republic of Argentina terminated.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/27/2020) (jwh)
April 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #100 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
April 24, 2020 Filing 100 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina..(Boccuzzi, Carmine) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 24, 2020 Filing 99 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO INFORM THE REPUBLIC OF ARGENTINA AS TO STATUS OF CLAIMS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Counsel for all plaintiffs in the above-captioned actions must inform counsel for the Republic as to (a) whether, as of the date of their submission to the Republic, any of the plaintiffs in their cases have settled, transferred, and/or otherwise disposed of all or any portion of the bond interests that are the subjects of plaintiffs' claims and/or judgments against the Republic, and, if so, confirm the amounts and bond identification numbers (ISINs) for any interests no longer held, and (b) the amounts and ISINs for any bond interests still held by plaintiffs in the above-captioned actions and still subject to litigation as of the date of their submission to the Republic. 2. The information described in Schedule A must be transmitted to counsel for the Republic, Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr., Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, One Liberty Plaza, New York, New York 10006, by no later than August 30, 2019; and 3. The Clerk of the Court is directed to cause this Order to be entered into all cases listed in this Order, including both ECF and non-ECF cases. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/17/2019) (jwh)
July 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #97 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 97 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Boccuzzi, Carmine) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 16, 2019 Filing 96 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. dated July 16, 2019 re: status of claims in non-dismissed actions with enclosed proposed order. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
July 7, 2017 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Thomas P. Griesa is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
June 11, 2013 Filing 95 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gary Steven Snitow on behalf of AJU S.A., Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Maria Esther Ferrer, Bibiana Della Flora, Michael Heeb, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Casimiro Kornas, Ana Lidia Leivas, Elena Graciela Martinez, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Plaintiffs. New Address: Snitow, Kanfer & Holtzer, 575 Lexington Avenue, 14th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10022, 212-317-8500. (Snitow, Gary)
May 4, 2012 Filing 94 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Writ of Execution served on Banco de la Nacion Argentina on 4/14/10. Service was accepted by Mr. H. Barrientos. ***Judgment unsatisfied pursuant to Amaury Pena as of 4/24/12. Document filed by Michael Heeb. (mro)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO INFORM THE REPUBLIC OF ARGENTINA AS TO PARTICIPATION IN THE 2010 EXCHANGE OFFER: Counsel for all plaintiffs in the above-captioned actions must inform counsel to the Republic as to (a) whether any of the plaintiffs in their cases are Tendering Holders who participated in the 2010 Exchange Offer, and, if so, confirm the amounts and bond identification numbers (ISINs ) for any interests tendered into the 2010 Exchange Offer, and (b) the amounts and ISINs for any interests still held by plaintiffs in the above-captioned actions and still subject to litigation. The above-described information must be transmitted to counsel for the Republic, Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, One Liberty Plaza, New York, New York 10006, by no later than November 5, 2010; and The Clerk of the Court is directed to cause this Order to be entered into all cases listed in this Order, including both ECF and non-ECF cases. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1019/2010) (jpo)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 OPINION: For the reasons stated in this Opinion, Plaintiffs' motions to confirm the various orders are denied. Defendants' cross-motion to vacate is granted. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 6/11/2010) (jpo) (jpo).
May 21, 2010 Filing 91 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #84 MOTION to Vacate and Quash Ex Parte Orders.. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Blackman, Jonathan)
May 21, 2010 Filing 90 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #84 MOTION to Vacate and Quash Ex Parte Orders.. Document filed by Banco Central de la Republica Argentina. (Neuhaus, Joseph)
May 7, 2010 Filing 89 JOINDER to join Milberg Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law In Opposition to The Republic of Argentina's Motion to Vacate and Quash Ex Parte Orders and Joinder in The EM and NML Plaintiffs' and The Aurelius Plaintiffs' May 7, 2010 Submissions. Document filed by Plaintiffs.(Spencer, Michael)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER AUTHORIZING TENDER OF BENEFICIAL INTERESTS FOR PURPOSES OF PARTICIPATION IN THE 2010 EXCHANGE OFFER that 1) Any plaintiff in the above-listed cases who holds a judgment and wishes to participate in the 2010 Exchange Offer may tender the beneficial interests in the Eligible Securities underlying such judgment in accordance with the terms of the 2010 Exchange Offer, and 2) The Clerk of the Court is directed to cause this Order to be entered into all cases listed in this Order, including both ECF and non-ECF cases. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/29/10) (cd)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER, The 2/11 Ex Parte Order is hereby vacated in all respects and replaced by this Order. The 1/10 Ex Parte Orders are hereby vacated as to contract carriers that transport or deliver paper and coin currency from the FRBNY to BCRA, including without limitation the contract-carrier arm of Brinks, with respect to the physical transportation of paper and coin currency from the FRBNY to BCRA in Argentina. In all other respects, the 1/10 Ex Part Orders remain in effect as of the date they were served, pending further order of the Court. The 2/11 Ex Parte Motion and all supporting papers, all papers in opposition to the 2/11 Ex Parte Motion, and all related motions to confirm or vacate the relief granted herein, shall be treated by all parties as "Highly Confidential Information" and filed under seal in accordance with the provisions of the Stipulated Protective Order dated 9/10/08 attached hereto as Annex A.....Nothing herein shall constitute an express or implied waiver of sovereign immunity, nor consent by any party to personal or subject matter jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/8/20) (cd)
March 29, 2010 Filing 86 JOINDER to join /The Republic of Argentina's Joinder in Banco Central de la Republica Argentina's Response to Plaintiffs' New Alter Ego Allegations, dated March 26, 2010. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina.(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
March 29, 2010 Filing 85 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
March 29, 2010 Filing 84 MOTION to Vacate and Quash Ex Parte Orders. Document filed by Banco Central de la Republica Argentina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Neuhaus, Joseph)
March 29, 2010 Filing 83 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' New Alter Ego Allegations. Document filed by Banco Central de la Republica Argentina. (Neuhaus, Joseph)
March 26, 2010 Filing 82 JOINDER to join The Republic of Argentina's Joinder in Banco Central de la Republica Argentina's March 26, 2010 Submissions and Memorandum of Law in Further Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Confirm Ex Parte Attachment Orders, dated March 26, 2010. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina.(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
March 22, 2010 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #81 USCA Mandate,. (nd)
March 22, 2010 Filing 81 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #36 Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, #8 Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, #52 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, #44 Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., #40 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social USCA Case Number 08-2837-cv(L). The undersigned counsel for plaintiffs-appellees and Defendants-Appellants the Republic of Argentina (the "Republic") and the Province of Buenos Aires (the "Province") hereby stipulate that the above-captioned appeals (the "Deactivated Appeals") are hereby withdrawn from active consideration from the Court pending the resolution of the following five consolidated appeals: Seijas v. Republic of Argentina, 08-2847-cv, Aurelius Captial Partners LP v. Republic of Argentina, 08-2864-cv, Catto v. Republic of Argentina, 08-2922-cv, Macrotecnic Int`l Corp. v. Republic of Argentina, 08-2926-cv, and Mazzini v. Republic of Argentina, 08-2943-cv (collectively, the "Consolidated Appeals"). The parties agree that the Courts resolution of the Consolidated Appeals shall resolve the deactivated appeals; provided however that the Republic and Province shall have the right to reactivate its appeal within 60 days of the Courts decision in the Consolidated Appeals in the event that plaintiff in the Deactivated Appeals does not have a judgment and the Courts order in the Consolidated Appeals does not determine the applicability here of Grupo Mexicano de Dessarrollo S.A. v. Alliance Bond Fund, Inc., 527 U.S 308 (1999). Withdrawal if the Deactivated Appeals from active consideration shall not operate as dismissal of the appeals under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). SO ORDERED: On the understanding that the reactivation contemplated by this stipulation will be accomplished by notice to the Clerk of this Court, and, upon such notice, the Clerk will offer the appeal to the panel adjudicating the Consolidated Appeals, which may either accept the appeal (with or without oral argument) or direct scheduling of the appeal before a subsequent panel. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 03/22/2010. (nd)
March 15, 2010 Filing 80 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
March 3, 2010 Filing 79 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (29 in 1:05-cv-10383-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (107 in 1:05-cv-02434-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (41 in 1:07-cv-05593-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (36 in 1:07-cv-10656-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (34 in 1:05-cv-10383-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A, (38 in 1:07-cv-06563-TPG) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, (31 in 1:04-cv-03313-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (145 in 1:03-cv-08845-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (51 in 1:07-cv-02690-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (20 in 1:07-cv-00098-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (125 in 1:05-cv-02434-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (195 in 1:03-cv-02507-TPG) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (129 in 1:03-cv-08845-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (25 in 1:05-cv-04299-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (55 in 1:08-cv-02541-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (67 in 1:02-cv-03804-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (47 in 1:02-cv-03808-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Argentina Republic, (23 in 1:05-cv-10636-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (41 in 1:07-cv-02693-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (46 in 1:03-cv-08120-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (34 in 1:05-cv-10380-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A, (39 in 1:05-cv-02521-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (57 in 1:07-cv-02715-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (56 in 1:07-cv-02715-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (102 in 1:05-cv-04085-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Republic of Argentina, (27 in 1:05-cv-06002-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (72 in 1:06-cv-06466-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (19 in 1:06-cv-06221-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (33 in 1:05-cv-03089-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (133 in 1:03-cv-08845-TPG) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A, (48 in 1:08-cv-03302-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (65 in 1:06-cv-06466-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A, (19 in 1:07-cv-11495-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (58 in 1:07-cv-11327-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (54 in 1:08-cv-03302-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (20 in 1:06-cv-06221-TPG) Notice of Appeal, (27 in 1:07-cv-05593-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (46 in 1:08-cv-06978-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (32 in 1:05-cv-10382-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A, (18 in 1:06-cv-14299-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (43 in 1:04-cv-03314-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (46 in 1:07-cv-01910-TPG) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (59 in 1:07-cv-11327-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (99 in 1:05-cv-04085-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (18 in 1:06-cv-03198-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (22 in 1:06-cv-06221-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, (17 in 1:07-cv-00689-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (26 in 1:05-cv-06200-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (60 in 1:07-cv-11327-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (19 in 1:07-cv-11496-TPG) Notice of Appeal, (37 in 1:05-cv-10380-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (108 in 1:05-cv-04085-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (41 in 1:08-cv-06978-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (44 in 1:07-cv-02693-TPG) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (57 in 1:05-cv-10380-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (20 in 1:07-cv-02788-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (18 in 1:07-cv-00937-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (19 in 1:08-cv-00440-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (51 in 1:03-cv-09538-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (46 in 1:07-cv-02690-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (35 in 1:05-cv-10382-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (34 in 1:04-cv-07056-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (9 in 1:08-cv-06625-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (9 in 1:08-cv-05436-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (58 in 1:06-cv-00207-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (37 in 1:04-cv-06594-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (50 in 1:08-cv-02541-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (22 in 1:06-cv-06032-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (59 in 1:07-cv-02715-TPG) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (45 in 1:07-cv-01910-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (46 in 1:07-cv-06563-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by The Republic of Argentina, (29 in 1:05-cv-02943-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (34 in 1:05-cv-00178-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (24 in 1:05-cv-08687-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (37 in 1:07-cv-06563-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (51 in 1:08-cv-02541-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A, (27 in 1:05-cv-10382-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (42 in 1:07-cv-02693-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (64 in 1:06-cv-06466-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (98 in 1:05-cv-02434-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (28 in 1:05-cv-00177-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (21 in 1:06-cv-07100-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (194 in 1:03-cv-02507-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (51 in 1:02-cv-03808-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESTRAINING ORDER, that Plaintiffs' motion for a restraining order is granted in its entirety and that the amount to be secured by this Restraining Order shall be the sum of $325,103,968.09 and 1,077,041.58 comprised of the amount of the Milberg Plaintiffs' final judgments plus accrued post-judgment interest. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that you, your agents, subdivisions, servants, officers, employees, and attorneys, and all persons in possession of property in which Argentina or BCRA have an interest, and all persons acting in concert or participation with the foregoing, and all persons receiving actual notice of this Restraining Order by personal service or otherwise, are hereby ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED until further Order from this Court from directly or indirectly transferring, or ordering, directing, or requesting the transfer of any property on deposit with them or held under their control, such as will satisfy the above- mentioned sum of $325,103,968.09 and 1,077,041.58. Additional terms and conditions are as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/15/10) (pl)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REFILED ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the Milberg Plaintiffs' attorneys and their respective employees are hereby specially appointed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure ("Fed. R. Civ. P.") 4.1, in addition to the U.S. Marshals Service for the Southern District of New York (the "U.S. Marshal"), to serve on any garnishee located within the jurisdiction of this Court, an Attachment Order issued on this date pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 64 & 69, 6201, 6202 & 6211 of the New York Civil Practice Law and Rules ("CPLR"), and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1601 et seq., thereby levying upon each such garnishee pursuant to CPLR 6214(a) so as to maintain priority pursuant to CPLR 5234 in relation to other creditors of Argentina while Plaintiffs' application is pending; FURTHER ORDERED that the Attachment Order shall specify in accordance with CPLR 6202 that it applies to any property in the United States (whether real or personal, tangible or intangible presently existing or hereafter arising), which could be assigned or transferred as provided in N.Y. C.P.L.R. 520 I, including but not limited to cash, gold, special drawing rights, deposits, real property, instruments, securities, security entitlements, security accounts, equity interests, claims and contractual rights, and interests of any kind in the foregoing (collectively, the "Property"), directly or indirectly held or maintained in the name of, in a trust held by, or for the use or benefit of Banco Central de la Republica Argentina ("BCRA"), whether for its own account or for the benefit of Defendant the Republic of Argentina ("Argentina"), EXCLUDING: (a) property belonging to the embassy, consulate, or permanent mission to the United Nations of Argentina; and (b) any property that is, or is intended to be, used in connection with a military activity, and is of a military character or is under the control of a military or defense agency. FURTHER ORDERED that no Property shall be taken into actual custody by any enforcement officer pursuant to the Attachment Order pending further order of this Court; FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to CPLR 6214(e), the levy effected pursuant to service of the Attachment Order on each garnishee is extended until 30 days following final resolution of Plaintiffs' application, including any related appeals. proceedings on remand, and any subsequent appeals; FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 64 & 69, CPLR 5230, and 28 U.S.c. 161O(c), the Milberg Plaintiffs' attorneys and their respective employees are authorized to deliver to the U.S. Marshal writs of execution or orders of attachment directed to the Property, which are to be levied by service immediately pursuant to CPLR 5232 upon any located garnishee within the jurisdiction of this Court, so as to maintain priority pursuant to CPLR 5234 in relation to other creditors of Argentina while Plaintiffs' application is pending; FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshal is directed to defer seizure of any Property from any garnishee located within the jurisdiction of this Court pending further order of this Court; FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to CPLR *5232(a), the levies effected pursuant to service of the writs of execution on any garnishee located within the jurisdiction of this Court are extended until 30 days following final resolution of Plaintiffs' application, including any related appeals, proceedings on remand, and any subsequent appeals; FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to CPLR 5230(c), the time for the U.S. Marshal to serve the writs of execution and to return said executions to the Clerk of the Court is extended an additional 60 days; FURTHER ORDERED that the Milberg Plaintiffs' attorneys and their respective employees shall effect personal service of this Omnibus order upon counsel for Argentina -Cleary, Gottlieb Stern & Hamilton One Liberty Plaza, New York, New York 10006, attention Carmine Boccuzzi, Esq., and BCRA -- Sullivan & Cromwell LLP, 125 Broad Street, New York, New York, 10004, attention Joseph E. Neuhaus, Esq. (or such other counsel as BCRA may designate); and FURTHER ORDERED that opposing papers, if any, are to be served upon counsel for the Milberg Plaintiffs, Milberg LLP, One Pennsylvania Plaza, New York, New York 10119, attention Michael C. Spencer, Esq. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/19/2010) (jpo)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OMNIBUS ORDER: that the Milberg Plaintiffs' attorneys and their respective employees are hereby specially appointed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure ("Fed. R. Civ. P.") 4.1, in addition to the U.S. Marshals Service for the Southern District of New York (the "U.S. Marshal"), to serve on any garnishee located within the jurisdiction of this Court, an Attachment Order issued on this date pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 64 & 69, 6201,6202 & 6211 of the New York Civil Practice Law and Rules ("CPLR"), and the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, 28 U.S.c. 1601 et seq., thereby levying upon each such garnishee pursuant to CPLR 6214(a) so as to maintain priority pursuant to CPLR 5234 in relation to other creditors of Argentina while Plaintiffs' application is pending and as further set forth in this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that no Property shall be taken into actual custody by any enforcement officer pursuant to the Attachment Order pending further order of this Court; FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to CPLR 6214(e), the levy effected pursuant to service of the Attachment Order on each garnishee is extended until 30 days following final resolution of Plaintiffs' application, including any related appeals, proceedings on remand, and any subsequent appeals. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/19/2010) (tve) Modified on 1/26/2010 (tve).
January 19, 2010 Filing 75 Writ of Execution Issued as to The Republic of Argentina on 1/19/10 # 09,0211 in the amount of $ 5,141,319.87. (Signed by Judge Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/15/10) (dt)
December 7, 2009 Filing 74 TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to Notice of Appeal,, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A.; Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social USCA Case Number 08-5621-cv(L). The Court's December 2, 2009 order granting the Aurelius parties' motion to stay the mandate in order to petition the Supreme Court to grant a writ of certiorari is hereby vacated. The Aurelius parties' motion to stay the mandate in order to petition the Supreme Court to grant a writ of certiorari is construed as a motion to recall the mandate and to stay the mandate. So construed, it is granted and the mandate is recalled and stayed for twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order. The stay of the mandate will be terminated automatically twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 12/4/2009. [ORIGINAL ENTERED IN CASE : 07cv2715, DOC # 265]. (nd)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (29 in 1:05-cv-10383-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (221 in 1:03-cv-02507-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (59 in 1:07-cv-02693-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (55 in 1:05-cv-10382-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (36 in 1:07-cv-10656-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (106 in 1:08-cv-06978-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (31 in 1:04-cv-03313-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (33 in 1:07-cv-11497-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (21 in 1:07-cv-11495-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (129 in 1:07-cv-11327-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (45 in 1:07-cv-06563-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (33 in 1:05-cv-10636-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (195 in 1:03-cv-02507-TPG) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (99 in 1:07-cv-06563-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (25 in 1:05-cv-04299-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (31 in 1:05-cv-06002-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (47 in 1:02-cv-03808-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Argentina Republic, (46 in 1:03-cv-08120-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (154 in 1:03-cv-08845-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (34 in 1:05-cv-10380-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A, (26 in 1:08-cv-06625-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (58 in 1:05-cv-10383-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (80 in 1:06-cv-00207-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Republic of Argentina, (27 in 1:05-cv-08687-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (29 in 1:08-cv-00440-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (102 in 1:05-cv-04085-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Republic of Argentina, (71 in 1:08-cv-06978-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (168 in 1:03-cv-08845-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (48 in 1:08-cv-03302-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (23 in 1:07-cv-05807-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (65 in 1:06-cv-06466-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A, (19 in 1:07-cv-11495-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (58 in 1:07-cv-11327-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (24 in 1:06-cv-07100-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (36 in 1:05-cv-05197-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (25 in 1:07-cv-11497-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (20 in 1:06-cv-06221-TPG) Notice of Appeal, (27 in 1:07-cv-05593-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (47 in 1:03-cv-08120-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (32 in 1:05-cv-10382-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A, (168 in 1:05-cv-02434-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (39 in 1:04-cv-06594-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (31 in 1:07-cv-05807-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (46 in 1:07-cv-01910-TPG) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (31 in 1:05-cv-05197-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (153 in 1:03-cv-08845-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal,, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (120 in 1:08-cv-02541-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (59 in 1:07-cv-11327-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (99 in 1:05-cv-04085-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (22 in 1:06-cv-06221-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, (75 in 1:07-cv-11327-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Previsol AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (60 in 1:07-cv-11327-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (234 in 1:03-cv-02507-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (44 in 1:07-cv-02693-TPG) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (57 in 1:05-cv-10380-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (108 in 1:07-cv-01910-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (51 in 1:03-cv-09538-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (113 in 1:07-cv-02715-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (46 in 1:07-cv-02690-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (35 in 1:05-cv-10382-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, (9 in 1:08-cv-06625-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (47 in 1:04-cv-01077-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (9 in 1:08-cv-05436-TPG) Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (81 in 1:06-cv-00207-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (28 in 1:06-cv-14299-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (40 in 1:05-cv-10380-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (38 in 1:05-cv-10383-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (29 in 1:05-cv-06200-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (34 in 1:04-cv-06137-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (39 in 1:04-cv-01077-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (31 in 1:07-cv-02607-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (33 in 1:05-cv-05197-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Republic of Argentina, (45 in 1:07-cv-01910-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (35 in 1:05-cv-08195-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (56 in 1:05-cv-10382-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (129 in 1:06-cv-06466-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (44 in 1:04-cv-07056-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (42 in 1:05-cv-10382-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (71 in 1:07-cv-01910-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., (32 in 1:04-cv-06137-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (33 in 1:04-cv-03313-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (29 in 1:05-cv-02943-TPG) Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (37 in 1:05-cv-00178-TPG) Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, (34 in 1:05-cv-00178-TPG) N
December 3, 2009 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #72 USCA Mandate. (tp)
December 1, 2009 Filing 72 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #36 Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, #52 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, #44 Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., #40 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social USCA Case Number 08-5708-cv(CON); 09-0160-cv(CON). It is Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is REVERSED and all of the associated orders as well as its opinion confirming those orders are VACATED, in accordance with the opinion of this Court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 11/30/2009. (tp)
November 19, 2009 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Steven Snitow on behalf of Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas (Snitow, Gary)
November 19, 2009 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leigh Smith on behalf of Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas (Smith, Leigh)
November 19, 2009 Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter George Safirstein on behalf of Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas (Safirstein, Peter)
November 16, 2009 Filing 68 TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to #8 Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina USCA Case Number 08-2900-cv. The undersigned counsel for plaintiffs-appellees and Defendants-Appellants the Republic of Argentina (the "Republic") and the Province of Buenos Aires (the "Province") hereby stipulate that the above-captioned appeals (the "Deactivated Appeals") are hereby withdrawn from active consideration from the Court pending the resolution of the following five consolidated appeals: Seijas v. Republic of Argentina, 08-2847-cv, Aurelius Captial Partners LP v. Republic of Argentina, 08-2864-cv, Catto v. Republic of Argentina, 08-2922-cv, Macrotecnic Int`l Corp. v. Republic of Argentina, 08-2926-cv, and Mazzini v. Republic of Argentina, 08-2943-cv (collectively, the "Consolidated Appeals"). The parties agree that the Courts resolution of the Consolidated Appeals shall resolve the deactivated appeals; provided however that the Republic and Province shall have the right to reactivate its appeal within 60 days of the Courts decision in the Consolidated Appeals in the event that plaintiff in the Deactivated Appeals does not have a judgment and the Courts order in the Consolidated Appeals does not determine the applicability here of Grupo Mexicano de Dessarrollo S.A. v. Alliance Bond Fund, Inc., 527 U.S 308 (1999). Withdrawal if the Deactivated Appeals from active consideration shall not operate as dismissal of the appeals under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). SO ORDERED: On the understanding that the reactivation contemplated by this stipulation will be accomplished by notice to the Clerk of this Court, and, upon such notice, the Clerk will offer the appeal to the panel adjudicating the Consolidated Appeals, which may either accept the appeal (with or without oral argument) or direct scheduling of the appeal before a subsequent panel. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 11/12/2009. (nd)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Elena Graciela Martinez. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Maria Esther Ferrer. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Sebastian Jorge Palacio. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Aju S.A. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Casimiro Kornas. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Bibiana Della Flora. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Miguel Alberto Balestrini. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Carlos Alberto Melconian. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Ana Lidia Leivas. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Lidia Florinda Pioli. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Juan Domingo Balestrelli. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro) Modified on 11/12/2009 (tro).
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Attorney Michael Champlin Spencer is substituted in place of Joel Andrew Chernov as counsel for Michael Heeb. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/09) (tro)
April 6, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #52 Amended Notice of Appeal. (tp)
April 6, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #52 Amended Notice of Appeal. (tp)
April 3, 2009 Filing 52 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: #36 Notice of Appeal, #40 Amended Notice of Appeal, #49 Order. Document filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social. Copies mailed to attorney(s) of record: Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton; Chadbourne & Parke LLP; and Dreier LLP. (tp)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: It is directed that the following error in the opinion of December 11, 2008 be corrected. In the last sentence of the first paragraph on page 25, the word "grant" should be changed to "waiver." The Court will issue an Amended Opinion with this correction, bearing the same date, December 11, 2008. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/12/09) (js)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED OPINION: The Court holds that the various forms of process described in this opinion, which were authorized as to the FJP Funds located in New York and any ANSES property located in New York, were legally valid at the time they were ordered by the Court and remain legally valid, for the reasons set forth in this opinion. The process as to FJP Funds remains in effect now that the assets of these funds are transferred to ANSES pursuant to the new law. This holding is based on the record now before the court. It appears that more discovery will take place, resulting in further development of the facts. This may make additional rulings of the court necessary. However, the court deemed it essential to issue an opinion now on the basis of the present record, and it is doing so. Plaintiffs are directed to submit, on notice, proposed orders specifically dealing with the various motions which have been made. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/11/08) (js)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The motions made in the Orders to Show Cause of October 29, November 5, November 6, November 7, November 12, and November 19, 2008, to authorize service of Writs of Execution and to permit the issuance of Restraining Notices, are granted. The Writs of Execution may be served, but no property may be seized except upon further order of the court. The court considers that its December 11, 2008 opinion applies to this additional Order to Show Cause, and the applications therein are granted, in a similar fashion as stated above. The motion for an attachment and for the issuance of Restraining Notices contained in one of the November 6,2008 Orders to Show Cause is granted. The motion of plaintiff NML Capital to confirm the Order of Attachment with regard to its eight cases (05 Civ. 2434, etc.) is granted. The court affirms the continued validity of its October 31, 2008 Order, as modified, permitting restraints and levies in 03 Civ. 2507 and 03 Civ. 8845. Insofar as the Republic moves to vacate the modified October 31, 2008 order in 03 Civ. 2507 and 03 Civ. 8845, that motion is denied. Insofar as the Republic moves to vacate the temporary relief granted to the plaintiffs pending the hearing of their main motions, the motion of the Republic regarding the temporary relief is denied as moot. NML's motion for expedited discovery is denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/4/2009) (jpo)
February 6, 2009 Filing 48 JUDGMENT #09,0211 in favor of AJU S.A., Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Ana Lidia Leivas, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Casimiro Kornas, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Maria Esther Ferrer, Michael Heeb, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, and Sebastian Jorge Palacio against The Republic of Argentina in various amounts. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/6/09) (Attachments: #1 notice of right to appeal)(ml)
February 6, 2009 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #47 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (js)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER AND OPINION #97042: The motion for summary judgment is granted. Judgment will be entered for the principal amount of the bonds issued under the 1994 FAA, the 1993 FAA, the FRB Agreement and the DPB FAA plus accrued interest. The parties shall consult with one another concerning the form of the judgment and theamounts of interest that should be awarded in the judgment. If the parties are able to reach agreement. they shall jointly submit an agreed proposed judgment to the Court to be entered on a date agreed to by the parties upon consultation with Chambers. If the parties arc unable to reach agreement on those subjects, plaintiff shall submit a proposed judgment to the Court, and the Republic shall submit any objections to the proposed judgment within five business days thereafter. The Court will then resolve any remaining disagreements. Proposed judgments submitted to the Court should include the following language: "It is further ORDERED that,until further notice from the Court, plaintiffs must refrain from selling or otherwise transferring their beneficial interest in the bond(s) involved in this action without advising the Court in advance and obtaining permission of the Court." So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/6/09) (js) Modified on 2/9/2009 (mro).
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Oliver J. Armas dated 1/13/09 re: The parties request that he Court So Order it as well, and Order by endorsing this letter that the Clerk of the Court docket the Stipulation in each of the fifty cases set forth in Exhibit B. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/16/09) (mme)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED THAT: Any decision by the Court of Appeals with respect to the Appeals or Consolidated Appeals shall apply with equal force to the Additional Orders; To the extent any decision by the Court of Appeals with respect to the Appeals or Consolidated Appeals distinguishes between prejudgment plaintiffs and post-judgment plaintiffs, such distinction shall apply with equal force to the Additional Orders; The plaintiffs in the above-captioned actions and the Fund Managers shall take any and all necessary steps with respect to the Additional Orders to effect any decision issued by the Court of Appeals with respect to the Appeals or Consolidated Appeals. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/16/09) (mme)
January 12, 2009 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #38 Notice of Appearance filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., #37 Order,, #42 Stipulation and Order,,, #44 Notice of Appeal, filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP, Consolidar AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., #39 Memorandum & Opinion,,, #40 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, #41 Endorsed Letter, #36 Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, #22 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Bibiana Della Flora, Michael Heeb, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #32 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, #25 Order to Show Cause, filed by AJU S.A., #27 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, #4 Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment, #34 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Carlos Alberto Melconian, #15 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #20 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #6 Certificate of Service Other filed by The Republic of Argentina, #18 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #5 Answer to Complaint filed by The Republic of Argentina, #33 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Michael Heeb, #19 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #21 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #12 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #8 Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, #31 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Casimiro Kornas, #1 Complaint, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #30 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by AJU S.A., #7 Order to Show Cause, filed by AJU S.A., #26 Affidavit of Service Other,, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #16 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #23 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #35 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Juan Domingo Balestrelli, #11 Rule 56.1 Statement, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #28 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, #29 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, #17 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #9 Protective Order, #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #24 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #3 Summons Returned Executed,, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #13 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,,,, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
January 12, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #44 Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
January 12, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #44 Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
January 9, 2009 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #25 Order to Show Cause, #39 Memorandum & Opinion,,,. Document filed by Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 674370. (nd)
January 6, 2009 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Marco E. Schnabl Attaching Previously Submitted Materials. Document filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social. (ae)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Any decision by the Court of Appeals with respect to the Appeals or Consolidated Appeals, including, but not limited to, any decision regarding the status of ANSES under the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act, shall apply with equal force to the Additional Orders. To the extent any decision by the Court of Appeals with respect to the Appeals or Consolidated Appeals distinguishes between prejudgment plaintiffs and post-judgment plaintiffs, such distinction shall apply with equal force to the Additional Orders. The parties and interested non-party ANSES shall take any and all necessary steps with respect to the Additional Orders to effect any decision issued by the Court of Appeals with respect to the Appeals or Consolidated Appeals. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/5/09) (tro)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr. dated 12/22/08 re: Counsel submits a Stipulation and Proposed Order entered into by the Republic of Argentina, interested non-party ANSES, and the plaintiffs represented by Dreier LLP in the forty-nine cases listed in Annex A (herein). Plaintiffs in the Dreier Cases moved by Order to Show Cause on 11/6/08 regarding Argentine pension fund assets and obtained orders similar to the 10/29/08 Aurelius Order and 11/7/08 NML Orders, which the Republic and ANSES are currently appealing (among other related orders). Plaintiffs, the Republic, and ANSES have agreed that the outcome of the appeals referenced in the stipulation (e.g., Aurelius Capital Partners, LP, et al. v. Republic of Argentina, 07 Civ. 2715 (TPG); NML Capital Ltd. v. Republic of Argentina, 05 Civ. 2434 (TPG)) shall apply to the Dreier Cases. The parties to the stipulation respectfully request that the Court "So Order" the stipulation, and further Order by endorsing this letter that the Clerk of the Court shall docket the stipulation in each of the forty-nine cases listed in Annex A. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/5/09) (tro)
December 29, 2008 Transmission of Amended Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #40 Amended Notice of Appeal. (nd)
December 29, 2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #40 Amended Notice of Appeal. (nd)
December 23, 2008 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Edward Grossman on behalf of Arauca Bit AFJP S.A., Consolidar AFJP S.A., Futura AFJP S.A., Maxima AFJP S.A., Met AFJP S.A., Origenes AFJP S.A., Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A., Unidos S.A. AFJP (Grossman, Robert)
December 18, 2008 Filing 40 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: #36 Notice of Appeal, #39 Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social. (nd)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION # 96854. The court holds that the various forms of process described in this opinion, which were authorized as to the FJP Funds located in New York and any ANSES property located in New York, were legally valid at the time they were ordered by the court and remain legally valid, for the reasons set forth in this opinion. The process as to FJP Funds remains in effect now that the assets of these funds are transferred to ANSES pursuant to the new law. This holding is based on the record now before the court. It appears that more discovery will take place, resulting in further development of the facts. This may make additional rulings of the court necessary. However, the court deemed it essential to issue an opinion now on the basis of the present record, and it is doing so. Plaintiffs are directed to submit, on notice, proposed orders specifically dealing with the various motions which have been made. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/11/08) (mme)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is directed to make entries on the dockets of the cases listed in the Annex to this order that indicate that the following documents, which were filed in the above-captioned cases, also apply to the cases listed in the Annex: The documents filed as entry nos. 49, 50, 51, 52, 53, 58, 60, and 63 on the docket of case 07-cv-2715; and The documents filed as entry nos. 47, 49, 50, and 51 on the docket of case 07-cv-11327; and The court's opinion dated December 11, 2008, which has been filed under case 07-cv-2715. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/11/2008) (kkc)
November 24, 2008 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #36 Notice of Appeal filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social, #22 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Bibiana Della Flora, Michael Heeb, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #32 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, #25 Order to Show Cause, filed by AJU S.A., #27 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, #4 Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment, #34 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Carlos Alberto Melconian, #15 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #20 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #6 Certificate of Service Other filed by The Republic of Argentina, #18 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #5 Answer to Complaint filed by The Republic of Argentina, #33 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Michael Heeb, #19 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #21 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #12 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #8 Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, #31 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Casimiro Kornas, #1 Complaint, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #30 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by AJU S.A., #7 Order to Show Cause, filed by AJU S.A., #26 Affidavit of Service Other,, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #16 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #23 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #35 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Juan Domingo Balestrelli, #11 Rule 56.1 Statement, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #28 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, #29 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, #17 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #9 Protective Order, #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #24 Order to Show Cause,,,,,, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #3 Summons Returned Executed,, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #13 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,,,, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
November 24, 2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #36 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
November 24, 2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #36 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
November 21, 2008 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #24 Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 670542. (nd)
November 20, 2008 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Juan Domingo Balestrelli in further support - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Juan Domingo Balestrelli. (Alter, Regina)
November 20, 2008 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Carlos Alberto Melconian in further support - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Carlos Alberto Melconian. (Alter, Regina)
November 20, 2008 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Michael Heeb in further support - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Michael Heeb. (Alter, Regina)
November 20, 2008 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Miguel Alberto Balestrini in further support - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini. (Alter, Regina)
November 20, 2008 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Casimiro Kornas in further support - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Casimiro Kornas. (Alter, Regina)
November 20, 2008 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Miguel Angel Innocenti - Aju S.A. in further support with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by AJU S.A.. (Alter, Regina)
November 20, 2008 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Enrique Sebastian Palacio Minetti in further support - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti. (Alter, Regina)
November 20, 2008 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Alberto Guillermo Hillcoat in further support - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat. (Alter, Regina)
November 20, 2008 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle in further support - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle. (Alter, Regina)
November 11, 2008 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause and Declaration of Joel A. Chernov served on Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, attorneys for defendant on November 6, 2008. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Chernov, Joel)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Defendant shall show cause as to why an order should not be made and entered regarding procedures to be followed that govern the handling of this order to show cause. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/14/2008 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 26B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/6/08) (mme) Modified on 11/17/2008 (mme).
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. LET THE DEFENDANT HEREIN SHOW CAUSE, before Judge Thomas P. Griesa Room 26B, at the United States Courthouse located at 500 Pear Street, New York, on the 14th day of November, 2008 at 4:30 pm, or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why an order should not be made and entered, granting an attachment on any present future or contingent interest of the Republic of Argentina, Citibank, N.A., Standard Americas, Inc., Standard New York, Inc., Standard New York Securities, Inc. and/or any potential garnishee subsequently determined through discovery to be within the jurisdiction of the Court, with respect to any property in the United States (whether real or personal, tangible or intangible, presently existing or hereafter arising) which could be assigned or transferred, including but not limited to cash, deposits, real property, instruments, securities, security entitlements, security accounts, equity interests, claims, and contractual rights, and interests of any kind in the foregoing, held or maintained in the name of or for the use or benefit in the manner as set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/6/08). (pl)
October 22, 2008 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Juan D. Balestrelli - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Alter, Regina)
October 22, 2008 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Carlos A. Melconian - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Alter, Regina)
October 22, 2008 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Miguel A. Belestrini - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Alter, Regina)
October 22, 2008 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Casimiro Kornas - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Alter, Regina)
October 22, 2008 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Miguel A. Innocenti - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Alter, Regina)
October 22, 2008 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Enrique S.P. Minetti - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Alter, Regina)
October 22, 2008 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Alberto G. Hillcoat - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Alter, Regina)
October 22, 2008 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Roberto C.P. Elle - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Alter, Regina)
October 22, 2008 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Michael Heeb - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Alter, Regina)
September 26, 2008 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Regina Alter to RE-FILE Document #14 Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Each Declaration in Support of the Motion must be filed individually. (jar)
September 26, 2008 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Michael Heeb - with annexed exhibits in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Elle - with annexed exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Hillcoat - with annexed exhibits, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Minetti - with annexed exhibits, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Innocenti, in behalf of Aju S.A. - with annexed exhibits, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Kornas - with annexed exhibits, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Balestrini - with annexed exhibits, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Melconian - with annexed exhibits, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Balestrelli - with annexed exhibits)(Alter, Regina) Modified on 9/29/2008 (jar).
September 26, 2008 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Regina Alter in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1A - 1993 Fiscal Agency Agreement, #3 Exhibit 1B - Exhibit 1 to 1993 FAA, #4 Exhibit 1C - 1994 FAA, Part 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit 1C - 1994 FAA, Part 2 of 2, #6 Exhibit 1D - USD Discount Bond and Par Bond FAA, Part 1 of 4, #7 Exhibit 1D - USD Discount Bond and Par Bond FAA, Part 2 of 4, #8 Exhibit 1D - USD Discount Bond and Par Bond FAA, Part 3 of 4, #9 Exhibit 1D - USD Discount Bond and Par Bond FAA, Part 4 of 4 (No Exhibit 1E cited), #10 Exhibit 1F - FRB Agreement, Part 1 of 6, #11 Exhibit 1F - FRB Agreement, Part 2 of 6, #12 Exhibit 1F - FRB Agreement, Part 3 of 6, #13 Exhibit 1F - FRB Agreement, Part 4 of 6, #14 Exhibit 1F - FRB Agreement, Part 5 of 6, #15 Exhibit 1F - FRB Agreement, Part 6 of 6, #16 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 1 of 15, #17 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 2 of 15, #18 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 3 of 15, #19 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 4 of 15, #20 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 5 of 15, #21 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 6 of 15, #22 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 7 of 15, #23 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 8 of 15, #24 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 9 of 15, #25 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 10 of 15, #26 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 11 of 15, #27 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 12 of 15, #28 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 13 of 15, #29 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 14 of 15, #30 Exhibit 1G - FRB Agreement Exhibits, Part 15 of 15, #31 Exhibit 2 - Answer to Complaint, #32 Exhibit 3 - Defendant's First Request for the Production of Documents, #33 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Request for the Production of Documents, #34 Exhibit 5 - DCA Decision, #35 Exhibit 6 - EM Ltd Decision, #36 Exhibit 7 - Lightwater Decision, #37 Exhibit 8 - Mazzini Decision, #38 Exhibit 9 - March 28, 2006 Transcript, #39 Exhibit 10 - Mazoral Decision, #40 Exhibit 11 - March 5, 2004 Transcript, Part 1 of 3, #41 Exhibit 11 - March 5, 2004 Transcript, Part 2 of 3, #42 Exhibit 11 - March 5, 2004 Transcript, Part 3 of 3)(Alter, Regina)
September 26, 2008 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Alter, Regina)
September 26, 2008 Filing 11 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas. (Alter, Regina)
September 26, 2008 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas.(Alter, Regina)
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/24/08)- Part I (tro)
June 11, 2008 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #4 Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment, #6 Certificate of Service Other filed by The Republic of Argentina, #5 Answer to Complaint filed by The Republic of Argentina, #8 Notice of Appeal filed by The Republic of Argentina, #1 Complaint, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Bibiana Della Flora, Michael Heeb, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #7 Order to Show Cause, filed by AJU S.A., #2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, #3 Summons Returned Executed,, filed by AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Ana Lidia Leivas, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Elena Graciela Martinez, Maria Esther Ferrer, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Bibiana Della Flora, Sebastian Jorge Palacio were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
June 11, 2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #8 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
June 11, 2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #8 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
June 6, 2008 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #7 Order to Show Cause. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 653396. (nd)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant shall show cause as to why an order should not be made and entered subject to (b) below, preliminary restraining and enjoining pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 64 and 65(a) as set forth in this order. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/30/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 26B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/22/08) (js)
January 29, 2008 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer to Complaint on January 28, 2008. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
January 28, 2008 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina.(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
January 14, 2008 Mailed notice to the attorney(s) of record. (laq)
January 9, 2008 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (laq)
January 9, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
January 9, 2008 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:07-cv-02788-TPG. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
December 5, 2007 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. The Republic of Argentina served on 11/29/2007, answer due 12/19/2007. Service was accepted by Martha Perez, Compliance Department. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini; Bibiana Della Flora; Carlos Alberto Melconian; Lidia Florinda Pioli; Ana Lidia Leivas; Juan Domingo Balestrelli; Michael Heeb; Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle; Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat; Elena Graciela Martinez; Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti; Sebastian Jorge Palacio; Maria Esther Ferrer; AJU S.A.; Casimiro Kornas. (Alter, Regina)
November 28, 2007 Case Designated ECF. (mbe)
November 28, 2007 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas.(mbe)
November 28, 2007 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Thomas P. Griesa as possibly related to 1:07-cv-2788. (mbe)
November 28, 2007 SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Republic of Argentina. (mbe)
November 28, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Republic of Argentina. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 634549)Document filed by Miguel Alberto Balestrini, Bibiana Della Flora, Carlos Alberto Melconian, Lidia Florinda Pioli, Ana Lidia Leivas, Juan Domingo Balestrelli, Michael Heeb, Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle, Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat, Elena Graciela Martinez, Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti, Sebastian Jorge Palacio, Maria Esther Ferrer, AJU S.A., Casimiro Kornas.(mbe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heeb et al v. The Republic of Argentina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Sebastian Pa Minetti
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Gillermo Hillcoat
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Florinda Pioli
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Lidia Leivas
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Alberto Melconian
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bibiana Della Flora
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casimiro Kornas
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Alberto Balestrini
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena Graciela Martinez
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastian Jorge Palacio
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Esther Ferrer
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Heeb
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Claudio Pitronaci Elle
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJU S.A.
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Domingo Balestrelli
Represented By: Regina Malka Alter
Represented By: Michael Champlin Spencer
Represented By: Joel Andrew Chernov
Represented By: Gary Steven Snitow
Represented By: Marc S. Dreier
Represented By: Leigh Smith
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A.
Represented By: Robert Edward Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Banco Central de la Republica Argentina
Represented By: Joseph Emanuel Neuhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Origenes AFJP S.A.
Represented By: Robert Edward Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Met AFJP S.A.
Represented By: Robert Edward Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Futura AFJP S.A.
Represented By: Robert Edward Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Consolidar AFJP S.A.
Represented By: Robert Edward Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Unidos S.A. AFJP
Represented By: Robert Edward Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Maxima AFJP S.A.
Represented By: Robert Edward Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.
Represented By: Robert Edward Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Republic of Argentina
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social
Represented By: Lauren Emily Aguiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?