Romano et al v. The Republic of Argentina
Plaintiff: Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion, Grazia Valentini, Carlo Regazzoni, Romano Organizzazione Srl, La Societa Umus Srl. and Ape Organizzazione Srl.
Defendant: The Republic of Argentina
Case Number: 1:2007cv11331
Filed: December 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2017 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re: #29 Judgment entered in favor of Romano Organizzazione Srl, et al., and against The Republic of Argentina. Plaintiffs and the Republic have consummated a settlement pursuant to the terms of the Republic's February 5, 2016 Proposal and Plaintiffs agreed, inter aila, to accept an amount agreed-upon by the parties in full discharge and satisfaction in respect of any claim or court judgment in connection with the Bonds. In accordance with the settlement agreement, Plaintiffs received the settlement amount. Judgment fully satisfied on 07/17/2017. (km)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: NOW, THEREFORE, plaintiffs, by their attorneys Law Offices of Eric J. Grannis, and the Republic, by its attorneys Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, HEREBY STIPULATE AND AGREE THAT: 1. Plaintiffs' claims are hereby dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with prejudice and without costs. 2. This Stipulation and Order may be signed in counterparts which, when taken as a whole, shall constitute one and the same document; and a facsimile or copy signature shall have the same force and effect as an original signature. The Clerk of the Court shall mark this action closed and all pending motions denied as moot. (The Republic of Argentina terminated.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/13/2017) (jwh) Modified on 7/17/2017 (jwh).
July 17, 2017 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #30 Order to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (jwh)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT: WHEREAS, plaintiffs' Final Judgment has been fully satisfied by the Republic's payment to plaintiffs; NOW, THEREFORE, full satisfaction of plaintiffs' Final Judgment is hereby acknowledged, and the Clerk of the Court is hereby authorized and directed to make an entry of full satisfaction on the docket. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/13/2017) (jwh)
July 7, 2017 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Thomas P. Griesa is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
March 1, 2013 Filing 29 JUDGMENT #13,0438 in favor of Elazar Romano against The Republic of Argentina in the amount of $7,500,000.00; in favor of Carlo Ragazzino against The Republic of Argentina in the amount of $2,043,222.00; in favor of Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion against The Republic of Argentina in the amount of $6,156,550.00; in favor of La Societa Umus Srl against The Republic of Argentina in the amount of $448,075.00; and in favor of Grazia Valentini against The Republic of Argentina in the amount of $206,114.00. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/1/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE ELAZAR ROMANO AS REAL PARTY IN INTEREST: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Romano and Ape, Elazar Romano, and the Republic, through their respective counsel,as follows: 1. Pursuant to Rule 25(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Elazar Romano is here by substituted for Romano and Ape as the real party in interest with respect to all claimspreviously asserted by Romano and Ape in this matter.2. The caption in this matter is hereby amended as follows: ELAZAR ROMANO, CARLO REGAZZONI, TOMASO ZAPPOLI THYRION, LA SOClETA UMUS SRL, and GRAZIA VALENTINI v. Republic of China (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/21/2013) (js)
February 21, 2013 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #27 Memorandum & Opinion, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (js)
February 21, 2013 Filing 27 OPINION #102934: The motion for summary judgment is granted. Judgment will be entered for the principal amount of the bonds issued under the DPB FAA plus accrued interest (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/21/2013) (js) Modified on 2/28/2013 (rsh).
January 29, 2013 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Grazi Valentini in Support re: #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Ape Organizzazione Srl., La Societa Umus Srl., Carlo Regazzoni, Romano Organizzazione Srl, Grazia Valentini, Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion. (Grannis, Eric)
January 29, 2013 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion in Support re: #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Ape Organizzazione Srl., La Societa Umus Srl., Carlo Regazzoni, The Republic of Argentina, Grazia Valentini, Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion. (Grannis, Eric)
January 29, 2013 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Elazar Romano in Support re: #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Ape Organizzazione Srl., La Societa Umus Srl., Carlo Regazzoni, Romano Organizzazione Srl, Grazia Valentini, Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion. (Grannis, Eric)
January 29, 2013 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Carlo Regazzoni in Support re: #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Ape Organizzazione Srl., La Societa Umus Srl., Carlo Regazzoni, Romano Organizzazione Srl, Grazia Valentini, Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion. (Grannis, Eric)
January 29, 2013 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Paolo Orsi in Support re: #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Ape Organizzazione Srl., La Societa Umus Srl., Carlo Regazzoni, Romano Organizzazione Srl, Grazia Valentini, Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion. (Grannis, Eric)
January 29, 2013 Filing 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Ape Organizzazione Srl., La Societa Umus Srl., Carlo Regazzoni, Romano Organizzazione Srl, Grazia Valentini, Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion.(Grannis, Eric)
January 28, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Eric Joseph Grannis to RE-FILE Document #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment. ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
January 28, 2013 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Ape Organizzazione Srl., La Societa Umus Srl., Carlo Regazzoni, Romano Organizzazione Srl, Grazia Valentini, Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Orsi Declaration, #2 Affidavit Regazzoni Declaration, #3 Affidavit Romano Declaration, #4 Affidavit Thyrion Declaration, #5 Affidavit Valentini Declaration, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Judgment, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Opinion, #8 Supplement Email from Cleary Gottlieb Consenting to Summary Judgment, #9 Supplement Cover Letter re Motion for Summary Judgment)(Grannis, Eric) Modified on 1/29/2013 (ldi).
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (DUPLICATE) MINUTE ORDER PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM FROM THE ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. COURTS, DATED JUNE 15TH, 1973....Case Closed administratively pursuant to Memorandum from the Administrative Office of the United States Courts dated June 15th, 1973.... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/1/2011) ***Original filed in 00-cv-8869.(jfe)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO INFORM THE REPUBLIC OF ARGENTINA AS TO PARTICIPATION IN THE 2010 EXCHANGE OFFER: Counsel for all plaintiffs in the above-captioned actions must inform counsel to the Republic as to (a) whether any of the plaintiffs in their cases are Tendering Holders who participated in the 2010 Exchange Offer, and, if so, confirm the amounts and bond identification numbers (ISINs ) for any interests tendered into the 2010 Exchange Offer, and (b) the amounts and ISINs for any interests still held by plaintiffs in the above-captioned actions and still subject to litigation. The above-described information must be transmitted to counsel for the Republic, Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, One Liberty Plaza, New York, New York 10006, by no later than November 5, 2010; and The Clerk of the Court is directed to cause this Order to be entered into all cases listed in this Order, including both ECF and non-ECF cases. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1019/2010) (jpo)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by the parties, through their respective counsel, that the plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment, filed October 5, 2009, is withdrawn without prejudice to renewal. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/7/2010) (jpo)
October 6, 2009 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Eric J. Grannis, Esq. in Support re: #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Romano Organizzazione Srl. (Grannis, Eric)
October 5, 2009 Filing 15 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Romano Organizzazione Srl. (Grannis, Eric)
October 5, 2009 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Grazia Valentinin in Support re: #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Romano Organizzazione Srl. (Grannis, Eric)
October 5, 2009 Filing 13 DECLARATION of PAOLO ORSI in Support re: #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Romano Organizzazione Srl. (Grannis, Eric)
October 5, 2009 Filing 12 DECLARATION of TOMASO ZAPPOLI THYRION in Support re: #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Romano Organizzazione Srl. (Grannis, Eric)
October 5, 2009 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Elazar Romano in Support re: #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Romano Organizzazione Srl. (Grannis, Eric)
October 5, 2009 Filing 10 AFFIRMATION of Carlos Reggazoni in Support re: #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Romano Organizzazione Srl. (Grannis, Eric)
October 5, 2009 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Eric J. Grannis, Esq. in Support re: #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Romano Organizzazione Srl. (Grannis, Eric)
October 5, 2009 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Romano Organizzazione Srl. (Grannis, Eric)
October 5, 2009 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Romano Organizzazione Srl.(Grannis, Eric)
February 20, 2008 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer to the Amended Complaint served on Eric J. Grannis, Esq. on February 19, 2008. Service was made by First Class Mail. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
February 19, 2008 Filing 5 ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by The Republic of Argentina. Related document: #2 Amended Complaint, filed by Grazia Valentini, La Societa Umus Srl., Ape Organizzazione Srl., Romano Organizzazione Srl, Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion, Carlo Regazzoni.(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
January 11, 2008 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The Republic of Argentina served on 12/20/2007, answer due 1/9/2008. Service was accepted by Martha Perez, Compliance Officer Assistant. Document filed by Romano Organizzazione Srl; Carlo Regazzoni; Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion; La Societa Umus Srl.; Grazia Valentini; Ape Organizzazione Srl. (jar)
January 9, 2008 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jeh)
January 9, 2008 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (jeh)
January 9, 2008 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:06-cv-01590-TPG. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jeh)
December 21, 2007 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against The Republic of Argentina.Document filed by Romano Organizzazione Srl, Carlo Regazzoni, Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion, La Societa Umus Srl., Grazia Valentini, Ape Organizzazione Srl. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Grazia Valentini, La Societa Umus Srl., Ape Organizzazione Srl., Romano Organizzazione Srl, Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion, Carlo Regazzoni.(db)
December 17, 2007 Case Designated ECF. (jeh)
December 17, 2007 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Thomas P. Griesa as possibly related to 06cv1590. (jpo)
December 17, 2007 SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Republic of Argentina. (jpo)
December 17, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Republic of Argentina. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 636279)Document filed by Romano Organizzazione Srl, Carlo Regazzoni, Tomaso Zappoli, La Societa Umus Srl., Grazia Valentini, Ape Organizzazione Srl.(jpo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romano et al v. The Republic of Argentina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomaso Zappoli Thyrion
Represented By: Eric Joseph Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grazia Valentini
Represented By: Eric Joseph Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlo Regazzoni
Represented By: Eric Joseph Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romano Organizzazione Srl
Represented By: Eric Joseph Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Societa Umus Srl.
Represented By: Eric Joseph Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ape Organizzazione Srl.
Represented By: Eric Joseph Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Republic of Argentina
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?