Romeo & Juliette Laser Hair Removal, Inc. v. Assara I LLC et al
Plaintiff: Romeo & Juliette Laser Hair Removal, Inc.
Defendant: Assara I LLC, Assara Laser, Manhattan Laser Hair Removal, Jay Shuman, Will Shuman and Sam Tayer
Case Number: 1:2008cv00442
Filed: January 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas P. Griesa
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER......The May 20, 2016 motion to stay the May 20, 2016 Judgment pending appeal is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/24/2016) (gr)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 314 OPINION & ORDER....The plaintiffs motion for attorneys fees and costs is granted against defendants Shuman and Assara, jointly and severally. The plaintiff is awarded fees in the amount of $30,000. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/5/2016) (gr)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 281 OPINION AND ORDER.....The plaintiffs April 6, 2015 summary judgment motion is granted as to liability on Counts Five, Six, Seven, Eight, and Nine against defendants Assara and Will Shuman, and otherwise denied. An injunction shall issue against thes e defendants pursuant to this Opinion. The plaintiffs motion is denied as to the remaining defendants. The defendants June 8, 2015 motion for summary judgment is granted as to defendants Jay Shuman and Dr. Sam Tayar, and otherwise denied. The defendants February 9, 2016 motion to dismiss is denied. A separate Order will be issued as to the plaintiffs remaining claims and the proceedings against David Tayar. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/29/2016) (gr)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 OPINION: If plaintiff desires to move for judgment on the pleadings, and if there are grounds for such a motion, then that motion can be made. What has been requested in this regard in earlier correspondence does not constitute a proper motion. What has been stated above constitutes the court's ruling on the requests now before it. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/10/2015) (ajs)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 OPINION re: 165 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Assara Laser, Assara I LLC, David Tayer, Sam Tayer, Will Shuman, Jay Shuman. As set forth within, defendants' motion to dismiss is denied with regard to c ounts one, two, four, five, six, seven, eight, and nine. The motion to dismiss is granted with regard to counts three, ten, and eleven. This opinion resolves the motion listed as document number 165 in this case. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/23/2014) (ajs)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. For the reasons in this Memorandum Decision and Order, Romeo's fee application (ECF No. 113) is granted, but the award is reduced to the amount of $6,945. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 7/2/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers to Honorable Thomas P. Griesa United States District Judge. All counsel (via ECF).(rjm)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPINION:# 97277 Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment and defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment are denied. Defendants' motion for sanctions is also denied. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/20/2009) (jpo) Modified on 3/25/2009 (jab). Modified on 4/7/2009 (jpo).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romeo & Juliette Laser Hair Removal, Inc. v. Assara I LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romeo & Juliette Laser Hair Removal, Inc.
Represented By: David Kent Fiveson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assara I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assara Laser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manhattan Laser Hair Removal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Tayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?