Lennon et al v. Premise Media Corporation, L.P. et al Featured Case

Copyright suit against Premise Media by Yoko Ono concerning use of John Lennon\'s song \"Imagine\" in documentary \"Expelled: No Intelligence Allowed\" http://cyberlaw.stanford.edu/case/Lennon-v-Premise-Media

Plaintiff: Yoko Ono Lennon, Sean Ono Lennon, Julian Lennon and EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Defendant: C&S Production, L.P., Premise Media Corporation, L.P., Premise Media Distribution, L.P. and Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv03813
Filed: April 22, 2008
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Sidney H. Stein
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:501 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER: that the Plaintiffs' third claim for relief arising under 15 U.S.C. 1125(a) shall be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 F.R.C.P. Defendants reserve their right to seek costs and fees in connection with the third claim. Plaintiffs reserve all of their defenses and objections to any claim by Defendant for costs or fees in connection with the third claim. ENDORSEMENT: The pending motion by defendants to dismiss the third claim for relief 51 is dismissed with prejudice. Motions terminated: 51 MOTION to Dismiss (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/16/2008) (tve)
July 2, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER setting Deadlines as to 51 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Claim for Relief in the Complaint: ( Response due by 7/14/2008. Reply due by 7/28/2008.) All Discovery except expert discovery due by 10/31/2008.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 7/1/08) (cd)
June 20, 2008 53
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF PREMISE MEDIA CORPORATION, L.P., C&S PRODUCTION L.P. D/B/A RAMPANT FILMS, PREMISE MEDIA DISTRIBUTION L.P., AND ROCKY MOUNTAIN PICTURES, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS, and the MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS served on Dorothy M. Weber on June 20, 2008. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Premise Media Corporation, L.P., C&S Production, L.P., Premise Media Distribution, L.P., Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc.. (Wasserman, Allen)
June 11, 2008 50
NOTICE OF APPEAL from 46 Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by Yoko Ono Lennon, Sean Ono Lennon, Julian Lennon, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 653808. (tp)
June 9, 2008 49 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Brandy Karl for Premise Media Corporation, L.P., C&S Production, L.P., Premise Media Distribution, L.P. and Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/3/2008) (jfe)
June 2, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court
OPINION & ORDER # 96101: Because defendants are likely to prevail on their fair use defense, plaintiffs have failed to show, on the basis of the record developed to date, a clear likelihood of success or even a simple likelihood of success on the merits of their copyright infringement claim. Plaintiffs have also not shown that the balance of hardships tips decidedly in their favor. Accordingly, plaintiffs' motions for a preliminary injunction is denied. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 6/2/08) (tro) Modified on 6/2/2008 (rw).
May 30, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 44 Motion for Brandy Karl to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants Premise Media Corporation, L.P., C&S Production, L.P., Premise Media Distribution, L.P., Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/30/08) (db)
May 28, 2008 44
MOTION for Brandy Karl to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Premise Media Corporation, L.P., C&S Production, L.P., Premise Media Distribution, L.P., Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc..(dle)
May 23, 2008 43
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Premise Media Corporation, L.P., C&S Production, L.P., Premise Media Distribution, L.P., Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc.(Froehlich, Joseph)
May 19, 2008 41 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER; It is hereby ordered that as set forth on the record today during the oral argument on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction; The temporary restraining order issued April 30, 2008, shall continue in effect until the determination of the currently pending motion for a preliminary injunction; and plaintiffs shall post security in the amount of $20,000.00 on or before May 21, 2008, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(c). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/19/2008) (mme)
May 16, 2008 38
DECLARATION of Walter "Chip" Cronkite III in Support re: 35 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support. Document filed by Yoko Ono Lennon, Sean Ono Lennon, Julian Lennon, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Weber, Dorothy)
May 15, 2008 34
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Declarations served on Plaintiffs on May 14, 2008. Service was accepted by Dorothy M. Weber, Attorney. Document filed by Premise Media Corporation, L.P., C&S Production, L.P., Premise Media Distribution, L.P., Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc.. (Casamento, Gregory)
May 14, 2008 29
ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Premise Media Corporation, L.P., C&S Production, L.P., Premise Media Distribution, L.P., Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc..(Casamento, Gregory)
May 13, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER: The time for defendants to move, answer or otherwise respond (3rd claim) is extended to 6/13/08. Defendants will serve their answer to the first and second claim by 5/14/08. Premise Media Corporation, L.P. answer due 6/13/2008; C&S Production, L.P. answer due 6/13/2008; Premise Media Distribution, L.P. answer due 6/13/2008; Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc. answer due 6/13/2008. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/13/08) (db)
May 12, 2008 28
MOTION for Anthony Falzone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Premise Media Corporation, L.P., C&S Production, L.P., Premise Media Distribution, L.P., Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc.(dle)
May 8, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 23 Motion for April R. Terry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. April R. Terry is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants, Premise Media Corporation, L.P., C&S Production L.P. d/b/a Rampant Films, Premise Media Distribution, L.P. and Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc. in the above captioned case. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/8/08) (tro)
May 7, 2008 23
MOTION for April Terry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Premise Media Corporation, L.P., C&S Production, L.P., Premise Media Distribution, L.P., Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc..(dle)
May 5, 2008 21
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Thomas Casamento on behalf of Premise Media Corporation, L.P., C&S Production, L.P., Premise Media Distribution, L.P., Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc. (Casamento, Gregory)
May 1, 2008 9
FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - DECLARATION of Dorothy M. Weber in Support re: 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. MOTION for Discovery (Expedited). Document filed by Yoko Ono Lennon, Sean Ono Lennon, Julian Lennon, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D Part 1, # 5 Exhibit D Part 2, # 6 Exhibit D Part 3)(Weber, Dorothy) Modified on 5/1/2008 (KA).
April 30, 2008 7
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie Angela Ahrens on behalf of Premise Media Corporation, L.P., C&S Production, L.P., Premise Media Distribution, L.P., Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc. (Ahrens, Julie)
April 25, 2008 6
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc. served on 4/23/2008, answer due 5/13/2008. Service was accepted by Ronald C. Rogers. Document filed by Yoko Ono Lennon; Sean Ono Lennon; Julian Lennon; EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.. (Weber, Dorothy)
April 22, 2008 2
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by EMI Blackwood Music, Inc..(tve) Modified on 4/29/2008 (tve).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lennon et al v. Premise Media Corporation, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&S Production, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premise Media Corporation, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premise Media Distribution, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Pictures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoko Ono Lennon
Represented By: Dorothy M Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Ono Lennon
Represented By: Dorothy M Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Lennon
Represented By: Dorothy M Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Represented By: Dorothy M Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?