NBC Universal, Inc. et al v. Redlasso, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiffs NBC Universal, Inc. Fox News Network, LLC and Fox Television Stations, Inc. alleged that Defendant Redlasso, Inc. copied Plaintiffs' programming and made it available on Defendant's website. Plaintiffs also alleged that Defendant permitted users to make clips of Plaintiff's programming for posting on third-party websites.

Plaintiff: NBC Universal, Inc., Fox News Network, LLC and Fox Television Stations, Inc.
Defendant: Redlasso, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv06544
Filed: July 23, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Copyright Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A. Kaplan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2008 Filing 6 CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION in favor of Fox News Network, LLC, Fox Television Stations, Inc., and NBC Universal, Inc. against Redlasso, Inc.. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/21/08) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/24/2008. Joinder of Parties due by 10/24/2008. Deposition due by 2/20/2009. Discovery due by 2/20/2009. Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/20/2009. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/23/08) (js)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/11/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/11/08) (cd)
July 29, 2008 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Redlasso, Inc. served on 7/23/2008, answer due 8/12/2008. Service was accepted by Gil Edwards, Office Manager. Document filed by NBC Universal, Inc.; Fox News Network, LLC; Fox Television Stations, Inc.. (Penchina, Robert)
July 29, 2008 Mailed notice to Register of Copyrights to report the filing of this action. (mbe)
July 23, 2008 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying News Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fox News Network, LLC, Fox Television Stations, Inc..(mbe)
July 23, 2008 Case Designated ECF. (mbe)
July 23, 2008 Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (mbe)
July 23, 2008 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Redlasso, Inc.. (mbe)
July 23, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Redlasso, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 657524)Document filed by NBC Universal, Inc., Fox News Network, LLC, Fox Television Stations, Inc..(mbe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NBC Universal, Inc. et al v. Redlasso, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBC Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Penchina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox News Network, LLC
Represented By: Robert Penchina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox Television Stations, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Penchina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redlasso, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?