Licci v. American Express Bank Ltd.
Plaintiff: Yaakov Licci
Defendant: American Express Bank Ltd. and Lebanese Canadian Bank, SAL
Case Number: 1:2008cv07253
Filed: August 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: George B. Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 175 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 8/1/2022) (vfr)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Therefore, a substantial amount of discovery in this case will be obtained from non-parties. There is little burden to the Defendants in proceeding with such discovery, which should commence at once. For the above reasons, Defendants' request for a stay is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/7/2022) (vfr)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES: A series of Case Management conferences in these matters are hereby scheduled for the following dates in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. The parties sha ll file a joint status letter that includes agenda items three business days in advance of each conference. The letters shall be no more than four pages in length. Tuesday, September 14, 2022 at 4:00 p.m.; Thursday, October 20, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. ; Tuesday, November 15, 2022 at 11:00 a.m.; Thursday, December 15, 2022 at 11:00 a.m.; Thursday, January 12, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. ; Thursday, February 9, 2023 at 10:00 a.m.; Thursday, March 9, 2023 at 10:00 a.m.; SO ORDERED. ( Case Management Conferenc e set for 9/14/2022 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2022 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 bef ore Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker., Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 6/30/2022) (vfr)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting 163 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. APPLICATION GRANTED. The Case Management Conference scheduled for May 17, 2022 is hereby rescheduled for June 30, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Initial Conference set for 6/30/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/27/2022) (ate)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER: denying 127 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 149 Motion to Vacate 127 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Lebanese Canadian Bank., 149 MOTION to Vacate 126 Clerk's Certificate of Default. Defendant's mo tion pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(c), (ECF No. 149), to vacate the Clerk's entry of a certificate of default, (ECF No. 126), is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion for entry of final judgment by default, (ECF No. 127), is hereby DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/14/2022) (ama)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER: Defendant's March 1, 2022 letter requests that the Court set a briefing schedule for Defendant to oppose Plaintiffs' pending motion for default judgment and to file a motion to vacate the Clerk's certificate of defa ult. (ECF No 145.) Plaintiffs oppose Defendant's request. (ECF No. 146.) Since the timeliness of Defendant's proposed opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for default is in dispute, Defendants' request to set a future briefing schedule is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/07/2022) (ama)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER denying 134 Motion to Stay re: 134 MOTION to Stay. Defendant's motion for an order staying this action in its entirety pending further developments in Lelchook v. Lebanese Canadian Bank, SAL, No. 18-cv-12401, a closely-related action also pending before this Court, (ECF No. 134), is hereby DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/28/2022) (va)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER, A status conference is scheduled for May 25, 2022 at 9:45 a.m. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 5/25/2022 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/10/22) (yv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Licci v. American Express Bank Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaakov Licci
Represented By: David Jaroslawicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Bank Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Galena Schnieders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lebanese Canadian Bank, SAL
Represented By: Lawrence Steven Hirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?