Bailey v. Pataki et al
Plaintiff: |
Kenneth Bailey |
Defendant: |
George Pataki, Eileen Consilvio and John Doe |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv08563 |
Filed: |
October 7, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Civil Rights: Other Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
Jed S. Rakoff |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 26, 2010 |
Filing
108
OPINION: For the foregoing reasons, the Court issued its "bottomline" Order of May 19, 2010. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/26/2010) (jfe)
|
July 7, 2010 |
Filing
104
OPINION AND ORDER; #99157 This Opinion and Order details the Courts reasons for denying defendants contention on summary judgment that they are entitled to qualified immunity as a matter of law and formally confirms that determination. Accordingly, f or the reasons that are set forth in this Opinion and Order, the Court hereby confirms its determination, in the form of this Opinion and Order from which an interlocutory appeal may be taken, that the defendant officials are not entitled to summary judgment on their defense of qualified immunity. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/6/10) (pl) Modified on 7/7/2010 (ajc).
|
June 15, 2010 |
Filing
101
ORDER: The Court hereby orders the consolidation of the above captioned cases under docket number 08 Civ. 8563. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/14/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-08563-JSR et al.(jpo)
|
January 19, 2010 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 39 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 39 Motion to Strike. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/19/10) (djc)
|
November 30, 2009 |
Filing
52
ORDER: To assist the Court in reaching a decision regarding plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, the Court hereby directs defense counsel to submit to the Court by no later than December 7, 2009 an affidavit or declaration indicating, first, whether any of the aforementioned defendant officials intends to move for dismissal of the claims against him or her on grounds of qualified immunity, and if so, whether any part of that motion would include affidavits or testimony from said defendants and, second, whether defense counsel intends to call any of the defendant officials as witnesses at trial and, if so, the purpose(s) for which said defendants would be called. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/30/2009) (jpo)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing
51
ORDER....the Court hereby modifies the protective order as follows: the deposition testimony of each of the above named plaintiffs can be made available to the state attorneys involved in any legal proceedings regarding the corresponding plaintiff co nducted pursuant to Article 10 of the NYS Mental Hygiene Law, provided that proffered portions of such deposition testimony can only be introduced in a given proceeding if the judge presiding at that proceeding make a determination that it is admissible for the purpose of impeaching plaintiff's testimony in that proceeding. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/22/09) (cd)
|
July 20, 2009 |
Filing
31
OPINION AND ORDER:#97775 For the foregoing reasons, the Court hereby reaffirms its previous order denying defendant's motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/10/2009) (jfe) Modified on 7/27/2009 (jab).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?