Gallop v. Cheney et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: April Gallop
Defendant: Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, Richard Myers and John Does
Case Number: 1:2008cv10881
Filed: December 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Denny Chin
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2010 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number E 899939 on 04/12/2010 at 4:42 PM re: 28 Notice of Appeal filed by April Gallop. (nd)
April 5, 2010 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 11 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Richard Myers, Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, 16 Endorsed Letter, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, 10 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Richard Myers, Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, 21 Certificate of Service Other filed by Richard Myers, Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, 7 MOTION for Dennis Cunningham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by April Gallop, 18 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by April Gallop, 26 Clerk's Judgment, 22 Endorsed Letter, 20 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Richard Myers, Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, 27 Amended Judgment, 19 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion filed by April Gallop, 12 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Richard Myers, Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, 9 Order, Set Hearings,, 13 Certificate of Service Other, filed by Richard Myers, Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, 6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 5 MOTION for William Veale to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by April Gallop, 28 Notice of Appeal filed by April Gallop, 23 Reply Affirmation in Opposition to Motion filed by April Gallop, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by April Gallop, 24 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 25 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 17 Affirmation in Opposition to Motion, filed by April Gallop, 4 Waiver of Service Executed filed by April Gallop, 8 Notice of Appearance filed by April Gallop were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
April 5, 2010 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 28 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
April 5, 2010 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 28 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
April 1, 2010 Appeal Remark as to 28 Notice of Appeal filed by April Gallop. $455.00 APPEAL FILING FEE DUE.(nd)
April 1, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEAL from 27 Corrected Judgment,. Document filed by April Gallop for Herself and as Mother and Next Friend of Elisha Gallop, A Minor. (nd)
March 18, 2010 Filing 27 CORRECTED JUDGMENT amending 26 Clerk's Judgment, That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision dated March 15, 2010, defendants' motion to dismiss is granted, and the complaint is dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, CLERK on 3/18/10) (Attachments: # 1 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO APPEAL)(ml)
March 16, 2010 Filing 26 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision dated March 15, 2010, defendants' motion to dismiss is granted, and the complaint is dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 3/16/10) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml)
March 15, 2010 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 25 Order on Motion to Dismiss, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (tve)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM DECISION: granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. For the foregoing reasons, defendants' motion to dismiss is granted, and the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 3/15/2010) (tve)
August 26, 2009 Filing 23 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Plaintiff in Opposition re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by April Gallop. (Veale, William)
August 14, 2009 Filing 22 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from William Veale dated 8/12/09 re: counsel for plaintiffs writes to request permission to submit a sur-reply to Defendants' reply-memorandum of law in further support of defendants' motion to dismiss, dated July 24, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted, but the sur-reply shall be strictly limited to the issue of intra-military immunity. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 8/14/09) (pl)
July 24, 2009 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss served on Dennis Cunningham on July 24, 2009. Document filed by Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, Richard Myers. (McShain, Heather)
July 24, 2009 Filing 20 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, Richard Myers. (McShain, Heather)
June 29, 2009 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by April Gallop. (Veale, William)
June 29, 2009 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of David Ray Griffin in Opposition re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by April Gallop. (Veale, William)
June 29, 2009 Filing 17 AFFIRMATION of William Veale, Esq. in Opposition re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by April Gallop. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A. Book List, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B. Learned Supporters, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C. Affidavit of Hordon, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D. Affidavit of Balsamo, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E. WTC and Flight 93 Evid., # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F. WTC Testimonials)(Veale, William)
June 5, 2009 Filing 16 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Mustapha Ndanusa dated 6/1/09 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs April Gallop and Elisah Gallop requests that plaintiff's time to oppose the motion to dismiss be extended to 6/29/09 and for defendants time to reply thereafter be extended to 7/17/09. ENDORSEMENT: Approved., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss : ( Responses due by 6/29/2009, Replies due by 7/17/2009.) (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 6/5/09) (ae)
May 12, 2009 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/8/2009 before Judge Denny Chin. (jfe)
May 6, 2009 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Memorandum of Law, Declaration of Heather McShain (and accompanying exhibits) served on Dennis Cunningham, Esq. on May 6, 2009. Document filed by Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, Richard Myers. (McShain, Heather)
May 6, 2009 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Heather K. McShain in Support re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, Richard Myers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (part 1), # 3 Exhibit B (part 2), # 4 Exhibit C)(McShain, Heather)
May 6, 2009 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, Richard Myers. (McShain, Heather)
May 6, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, Richard Myers. Responses due by 6/8/2009(McShain, Heather)
May 1, 2009 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on April 8, 2009 before Judge Denny Chin. (mro)
April 3, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 03/18/2009, Receipt Number 681857. (jd)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER It is hereby ordered as follows: A pre-motion conference shall be held on April 8, 2009 at 12 p.m. The parties shall appear before the Court in Courtroom 11A, United States Court House, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007; Defendants time to respond to the complaint is stayed; and All discovery is stayed pending further order from the Court.. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 4/1/09) (mme)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 7 Motion for Dennis Cunningham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 3/24/2009) (jpo)
March 19, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William W. Veale on behalf of April Gallop (Veale, William)
March 18, 2009 Filing 7 MOTION for Dennis Cunningham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by April Gallop.(dle)
March 6, 2009 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 02/24/2009, Receipt Number 678615. (jd)
March 6, 2009 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (mme)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 5 Motion for William Veale to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 3/5/09) (mme)
February 26, 2009 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Dick Cheney waiver sent on 1/23/2009, answer due 3/24/2009. Document filed by April Gallop. (Ndanusa, Mustapha)
February 24, 2009 Filing 5 MOTION for William Veale to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by April Gallop.(dle)
February 5, 2009 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Dick Cheney served on 1/22/2009, answer due 2/11/2009. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by April Gallop. (Ndanusa, Mustapha)
January 21, 2009 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mustapha Lakpene Ndanusa on behalf of April Gallop (Ndanusa, Mustapha)
December 15, 2008 Case Designated ECF. (jmi)
December 15, 2008 Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman is so designated. (jmi)
December 15, 2008 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, Richard Myers. (jmi)
December 15, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dick Cheney, Donald Rumsfeld, Richard Myers. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 672413)Document filed by April Gallop.(jmi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallop v. Cheney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Gallop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Cheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Rumsfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?