Major League Baseball Properties, Inc. v. Donruss Playoff, L.P. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Major League Baseball Properties, Inc.
Defendant: Donruss Playoff, L.P. and Donruss LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00593
Filed: January 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Trademark Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Denny Chin
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2009 Filing 10 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Major League Baseball Properties, Inc. against Donruss LLC, Donruss Playoff, L.P. that Dunruss and its subsidiaries are permanently enjoined from manufacuturing, selling etc., any item depicting Major League Baseball players or Minor League players in uniform etc.; Dunruss are permanently enjoined from using the Minor League Baseball player Images; the Court retains jurisdiction over the parties for the purposes of enforcement; all parties waive the right to appeal; and each party shall bear its own costs. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 8/14/09) (jf)
March 30, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denny Chin. (tro)
March 30, 2009 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Counsel for both parties from David Tam- Courtroom Deputy Clerk dated 3/30/09 re: Counsel for both sides are directed to attend a pretrial conference for the purpose of determining the status of the case, setting a discovery schedule, fixing a trial date, and discussion possible settlement. This conference will be held on 4/6/09 at 11:00 A.M., in Room 11A of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY, 10007. (tro)
February 27, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tonia A. Sayour on behalf of Donruss Playoff, L.P., Donruss LLC (Sayour, Tonia)
February 27, 2009 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Donruss Playoff, L.P., Donruss LLC.(Zivin, Norman)
February 27, 2009 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Donruss Playoff, L.P., Donruss LLC.(Zivin, Norman)
February 13, 2009 Filing 5 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER: The time for Defendants to serve an Answer or otherwise move in respond to the Complaint served on 1/23/09, is hereby extended, 20 (twenty) days, to 3/4/09. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 2/13/09) (tro)
January 29, 2009 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Donruss LLC served on 1/23/2009, answer due 2/13/2009. Service was accepted by Scarlett Sizer - Managing Agent. Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties, Inc.. (Mandel, Richard)
January 29, 2009 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Donruss Playoff, L.P. served on 1/23/2009, answer due 2/13/2009. Service was accepted by Scarlett Sizer - Managing Agent. Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties, Inc.. (Mandel, Richard)
January 21, 2009 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney for noncompliance with Section (14.3) of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 1 Complaint to: case_openings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (mbe)
January 21, 2009 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Major League Baseball Enterprises, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties, Inc..(mbe) (ama).
January 21, 2009 Case Designated ECF. (mbe)
January 21, 2009 Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (mbe)
January 21, 2009 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Donruss Playoff, L.P., Donruss LLC. (mbe)
January 21, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donruss Playoff, L.P., Donruss LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 675342)Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties, Inc..(mbe) (ama). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2009: # 1 exhibits, # 2 exhibits 2) (ama).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Major League Baseball Properties, Inc. v. Donruss Playoff, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major League Baseball Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Stephen Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donruss Playoff, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donruss LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?