Gabayzadeh v. Brafman et al
Plaintiff: Mehdi Gabayzadeh
Defendant: Benjamin Brafman, Brafman & Ross, P.C., Brafman & Associates, P.C., Robert F. Katzberg, Kaplan & Katzberg, Jennifer A. Liang and Deborah A. Schwartz
Case Number: 1:2009cv04095
Filed: April 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Paul A. Crotty
Presiding Judge: James C. Francis
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER ADOPTING R&R for 68 Motion to Dismiss filed by Brafman & Ross, P.C., Benjamin Brafman, Jennifer A. Liang, Brafman & Associates, P.C. The Court has considered Plaintiff's additional objections and finds them to be without merit. Having c onsidered Magistrate Judge Francis's and the accompanying objections, Defendant's motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and close this case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/11/2011) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: (1) Plaintiff's motion to extend time (Docket no. 70) is granted. Plaintiff shall submit answering papers by January 26, 2010. The Brafman defendants shall reply by February 15, 2010. (2) Plaintiff's motion suggests that he has not been served with the Brafman defendants' motion papers (Motion 8). This appears anomalous, given that plaintiff has requested additional time to respond. Nevertheless, to ensure that plaintiff has all relevant documents, a copy of the motion pap ers are being forwarded to him along with this order. (3) Plaintiff's "Motion to Refile Plaintiff's Objections in the Magistrate Judge 9/29/09 Order Preventing the Filing of the First Amended Complaint That Was Served on Defendants on 8/11/09" (Docket no. 58) is denied as moot. By Order dated September 22, 2009, Judge Crotty identified the operative pleading and provided for its filing. (4) Plaintiff's motion for a default judgment (Docket no. 59) is denied. (5) Plainti ff's motion for declaratory relief (Docket no. 62) is denied. (6) Plaintiff's motion to "correct" the docket (Docket no. 63) is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/14/2009) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tve) Modified on 12/14/2009 (tve).
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER, that the motion (by plaintiff to change venue) is denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/6/09) Copies sent by chambers.(cd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabayzadeh v. Brafman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehdi Gabayzadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Brafman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brafman & Ross, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brafman & Associates, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F. Katzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaplan & Katzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer A. Liang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah A. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?