Securities and Exchange Commission v. Boock et al

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Irwin Boock, Stanton B.J. Defreitas, Nicolette D. Loisel, Roger L. Shoss and Jason C. Wong
Relief Defendant: Birte Boock and 1621566 Ontario, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv08261
Filed: September 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Denise L. Cote
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, it is hereby ORDERED that the Boocks February 28, 2019 motion to void judgments is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Boocks may not file any additional motion in this case related to the 2012 and 2015 judgments without prior leave of Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/10/2019) Copies mailed to: Irwin Boock Birte Boock 500 Hidden Trail Toronto, Ontario M2R 3R5 Irwin Boock Birte BoockP.O. Box 8173 RPO The Concourse North York, Ontario M2R 3X1 (jca)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 CORRECTED OPINION AND ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION.....The Magistrate Judges Report is adopted in full. This case shall be reopened solely for the purpose of entry of this judgment, and the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment, jointly and severally, against Birte Boock and Ontario, Inc. in the amount of $828,184. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/31/2015) Copies Mailed By Chambers To Birte Boock (gr)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 OPINION AND ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: re: 220 MOTION for Judgment as to Relief Defendants Birte Boock and 1621566 Ontario, Inc. filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. The Magistrate Judge's Report is adopte d in full. This case shall be reopened solely for the purpose of entry of this judgment, and the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment, jointly and severally, against Birte Boock and Ontario, Inc. in the amount of $828,184. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/21/2015) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 OPINION AND ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The injunction, penny stock bar, and disgorgement award portions of the October 27, 2014 Report as well as the November 24, 2014 Supplemental Report are adopted. Shoss is hereby permanently en joined from violating Sections 5 and 17(a) of the Securities Act, Section 10(b) of the Exchange Act, and Rule 10b-5; he is also permanently barred from any future participation in the offer or sale of penny stocks. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter a judgment against Boock and Shoss for $2,750,000, jointly and severally, plus prejudgment interest calculated from March 20, 2006 at the IRS rate. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to enter judgments against Boock and Shoss in the amount of $2,860,000 each. Because defendants failed to file timely objections to Magistrate Judge Freeman's Reports, they have waived the right to appeal this decision. See Wagner & Wagner, LLP v. Atkinson, Haskins, Nellis, Brittingham, Gladd & Carwile, P.C., 596 F.3d 84, 92 (2d Cir. 2010). (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/16/2015) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: re: 181 MOTION. The SEC's March 1, 2013 motion for judgment on the pleadings, or in the alternative for summary judgment, as to relief defendant Alena Dubinsky is granted. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/9/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (js)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 OPINION AND ORDER re: 167 on MOTION for Reconsideration. filed by Birte Boock, 169 on MOTION for Reconsideration. filed by Irwin Boock, 153 on MOTION for Judgment Establishing Remedies As To Defendants Boock, Wong, DeFreitas. filed by Se curities and Exchange Commission. CONCLUSION: The SEC's April 12 motion for judgments is granted. The May 25 and June 1 motions for reconsideration of Birte Boock and Irwin Boock, respectively, are denied. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/02/2012) (ama)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 OPINION AND ORDER: Wong's September 8, 2011 motion for reconsideration is denied. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/9/2011) (js)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 92 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion to Strike Document No. 110 . The SEC's February 25, 2011 motion for summary judgment is granted in part, Wong's February 25, 2011 motion for partial summary judgment is denied, and the SEC's April 14, 2011 motion to strike is granted in part. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/25/2011) (ft)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPINION AND ORDER re: 18 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Quash filed by Nicolette D. Loisel. Loisel's 1/27 motion to dismiss is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/15/2010) (tve)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR DAMAGES INQUEST: Plaintiff shall file and serve on defendants Irwin Boock, Stanton BJ. DeFreitas, Birte Boock, and 1621566 Ontario, Inc. (with a courtesy copy to my chambers) Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law conc erning damages no later than May 21, 2010. Plaintiff shall include with such service a copy of this Order. Defendants Irwin Boock, Stanton B.1. DeFreitas, Birte Boock, and 1621566 Ontario, Inc. shall submit their responses, if any, to Plaintiff' ;s submission no later than JUNE 21, 2010. IF DEFENDANTS (I) FAIL TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SUBMISSIONS, OR (2) FAIL TO CONTACT MY CHAMBERS IN WRITING BY JUNE 21, 2010, TO REQUEST AN IN-COURT HEARING, IT IS MY INTENTION TO ISSUE A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION CONCERNING DAMAGES ON THE BASIS OF PLAINTIFF'S WRITTEN SUBMISSIONS ALONE WITHOUT AN IN-COURT HEARING. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 4/21/2010) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jpo) Modified on 4/21/2010 (jpo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Boock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Paul W. Kisslinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin Boock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanton B.J. Defreitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolette D. Loisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger L. Shoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason C. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Relief defendant: Birte Boock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Relief defendant: 1621566 Ontario, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?