Major League Baseball Properties Inc. v. The Upper Deck Company, LLC Featured Case
Plaintiff: Major League Baseball Properties Inc.
Defendant: The Upper Deck Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv00732
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2010 Filing 28 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Major League Baseball Properties Inc. against The Upper Deck Company, LLC. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/11/10) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml)
March 8, 2010 Filing 27
STIPULATION: It is hereby stipulated and agreed that the time for defendant Upper Deck to serve a response to the complaint shall be extended to March 1, 2010, except that for purposes of Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 (c)(1)(B), the date the "a responsive pleading is due: shall remain February 22, 2010 and shall not be extended. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/3/2010) (jfe)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26
PRETRIAL ORDER: Counsel are directed to appear for a pretrial conference set for 4/28/2010 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/4/10) (dle)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 17 Motion for an Order consolidating the preliminary injunction hearing in this action with all phases of a full trial on the merits, pursuant Rule 65(a)(2) of the F.R.C.P. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted as set forth in open court. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/15/2010) (jpo)
February 16, 2010 Filing 24 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 21 Motion to Bifurcate. ENDORSEMENT: Motion denied as set forth in open Court. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/16/2010) (jpo)
February 11, 2010 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 21 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Discovery with Respect to Trademark Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(b). Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Phases of Consolidated Full Trial. Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties Inc.. (O'Rourke, Brendan)
February 10, 2010 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Discovery with Respect to Trademark Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(b).. Document filed by The Upper Deck Company, LLC. (Anten, Todd)
February 10, 2010 Filing 21 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Discovery with Respect to Trademark Damages Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(b). Document filed by The Upper Deck Company, LLC.(Anten, Todd)
February 9, 2010 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. The Upper Deck Company, LLC served on 2/1/2010, answer due 2/22/2010. Service was accepted by Lena Valentin, Assistant to Robert L. Raskopf, Esq., at Quinn Emanuel, 51 Madison Avenue, New York, NY 10010, of the Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, (Unsign) Order To Show Cause of Plaintiff's Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery, Declaration of Brendan J. O'Rourke, Memorandum of Law in support, Individual Practices of Judge Robert W. Sweet, Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein, and ECF Rules and Instructions (Updated August 1, 2008).. Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties Inc.. (Siegartel, Adam)
February 8, 2010 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Brendan J. O'Rourke in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Preliminary Injunction Hearing With Full Trial on The Merits Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(2). in Support re: 17 MOTION to Consolidate Preliminary Injunction Hearing With Full Trial on the Merits Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(2).. Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties Inc.. (O'Rourke, Brendan)
February 8, 2010 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION to Consolidate Preliminary Injunction Hearing With Full Trial on the Merits Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(2).. Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties Inc.. (O'Rourke, Brendan)
February 8, 2010 Filing 17 MOTION to Consolidate Preliminary Injunction Hearing With Full Trial on the Merits Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(a)(2). Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties Inc..(O'Rourke, Brendan)
February 5, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Conference held on 2/5/2010. (mro)
February 4, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Brendan Joseph O'Rourke for noncompliance with Section (14.3) of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement to: case_openings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (rdz)
February 4, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Brendan Joseph O'Rourke for noncompliance with Section (14.3) of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement to: case_openings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (rdz)
February 3, 2010 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying The Upper Deck Company as Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Upper Deck Company, LLC.(Anten, Todd)
February 3, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sanford Ian Weisburst on behalf of The Upper Deck Company, LLC (Weisburst, Sanford)
February 3, 2010 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Todd Anten in Opposition re: 11 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by The Upper Deck Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Anten, Todd)
February 3, 2010 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Jason Masherah in Opposition re: 11 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by The Upper Deck Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Anten, Todd)
February 3, 2010 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Michael Bernstein in Opposition re: 11 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by The Upper Deck Company, LLC. (Anten, Todd)
February 3, 2010 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 3 Order to Show Cause, Temporary Restraining Order. Document filed by The Upper Deck Company, LLC. (Anten, Todd)
February 3, 2010 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - OPPOSITION BRIEF To Plaintiff's Motion for TRO). Document filed by The Upper Deck Company, LLC.(Anten, Todd) Modified on 2/4/2010 (KA).
February 2, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Steven Anten on behalf of The Upper Deck Company, LLC (Anten, Todd)
February 2, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Anne Rose on behalf of The Upper Deck Company, LLC (Rose, Jessica)
February 2, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Lloyd Raskopf on behalf of The Upper Deck Company, LLC (Raskopf, Robert)
February 2, 2010 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Howard Smith in Support of Plaintiff's Application For a Temporary Restraining Order in Support re: 3 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1.1, # 2 Exhibit 1.2, # 3 Exhibit 1.3, # 4 Exhibit 2.1, # 5 Exhibit 2.2, # 6 Exhibit 3)(O'Rourke, Brendan)
February 2, 2010 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Brendan J. O'Rourke in Support of Plaintiff's Application For a Temporary Restraining Order in Support re: 3 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A.1, # 2 Exhibit A 2, # 3 Exhibit A 3, # 4 Exhibit A 4, # 5 Exhibit A 5, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C)(O'Rourke, Brendan)
February 2, 2010 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 Order to Show Cause, Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Application for a Temporary Restrainig Order and Expedited Discovery. Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties Inc.. (O'Rourke, Brendan)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Major League Baseball Properties Inc.. Defendant shall show cause as to why a Temporary Restraining Order should not be issued pursuant to FRCP 65(b). Show Cause Hearing set for 2/3/2010 at 12:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/1/10) (cd)
February 1, 2010 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Major League Baseball Enterprises, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties Inc.(ama) (ama).
February 1, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Upper Deck Company, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 893379)Document filed by Major League Baseball Properties Inc. (Attachments: # 1 exhibit A, # 2 exhibit A-2, # 3 exhibit B-1, # 4 exhibit B-2, # 5 exhibit C, # 6 exhibit D-1, # 7 exhibit D-2, # 8 exhibit D-3, # 9 exhibit D-4)(ama)
February 1, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Upper Deck Company, LLC. (ama)
February 1, 2010 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (ama)
February 1, 2010 Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (ama)
February 1, 2010 Case Designated ECF. (ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Major League Baseball Properties Inc. v. The Upper Deck Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Upper Deck Company, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Anne Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major League Baseball Properties Inc.
Represented By: Adam David Siegartel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?