Alzheimer's Foundation of America v. Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Alzheimer's Foundation of America |
Defendant: |
Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Association, Inc. and Northern Trust Bank |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv03314 |
Filed: |
April 20, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert W. Sweet |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1114 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 1, 2018 |
Filing
369
OPINION: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's motion for sanctions is denied, and Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in its entirety. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 3/14/2018) *** This document was previously filed under seal in envelope number 170 and unsealed on May 1, 2018. Per directions from chambers, this document has not been spread. (mml)
|
April 20, 2018 |
Filing
364
OPINION & ORDER [CORRECTED]: For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds in favor of Counterclaim Defendant Alzheimer's Foundation of America and dismisses Counterclaim Plaintiff's claims in the entirety. The Court does not award attorney's fees. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/20/2018) (mml)
|
June 29, 2015 |
Filing
234
OPINION re: 225 MOTION to Compel Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Association, Inc. to Produce Documents. filed by Alzheimer's Foundation of America, 202 MOTION to Compel Alzheimer's Foundation of A merica, Inc. to Produce Documents and Things. filed by Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Association, Inc., 185 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Associa tion, Inc. Based upon the facts and conclusions of law set forth above, the Association's motion for a preliminary injunction isdenied. Both the Association's and the AFA's motions to compelare granted in their entirety. It is so ordered. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/26/2015) (ajs)
|
August 29, 2014 |
Filing
200
OPINION: Based upon the facts and conclusions of law set forth above, Plaintiff's request for relief from the judgment dismissing Count IX of the FAC is denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/22/2014) (ama)
|
May 25, 2011 |
Filing
33
OPINION re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Association, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and (6). MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Alzheimer's Disease and Related Di sorders Association, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and (6) filed by Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Association, Inc., 5 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (6). MOTION to Dism iss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (6) filed by Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Association, Inc., Northern Trust Bank, 20 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant The Northern Trust Company's Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Ci v. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Northern Trust Bank. Based upon the conclusions set forth above, the motions to dismiss the Lanham Act claims and related claims are denied, the motion to dismiss the U.C.C., conversion libel are unjust enrichment claims are granted, and the motion to dismiss the Trust is granted. Leave to amend within 20 days is granted. The parties are directed to meet and confer on a schedule for further pleading, discovery and consolidation. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/24/2011) (tro)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?