July 13, 2012 |
Filing
197
OPINION AND ORDER. This litigation, filed more than two years ago, has already engendered four judicial opinions- now five. I once again urge the Government to heed the now famous words of Justice Louis Brandeis with which I began this opinion. For t he reasons stated above, the motions of OLC and EOIR are granted. The motions of ICE, the FBI, DHS, and plaintiffs are granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close these motions [Docket Nos. 177 and 186]. The partie s are instructed to meet and confer and then to submit letters to the Court proposing a time line for the effectuation of this decision. If the parties prefer, they may call Chambers to schedule a conference. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/13/2012) (rjm)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing
161
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER: re: 150 MOTION to Stay October 24, 2011 Opinion and Order Pending Appeal. filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency. For the reasons stated above, defendants' motion for a stay of my October 24, 2011 Opinion and Order pending appeal is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion [Docket No. 150]. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/7/2011) (jfe)
|
October 24, 2011 |
Filing
140
OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants motion for summary judgment is denied and plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close these motions [Docket Nos. 125 and 128]. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/24/2011) (ft)
|
August 8, 2011 |
Filing
109
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: re: 102 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 99 Memorandum & Opinion filed by Center for Constitutional Rights, Immigration Justice Clinic of The Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law, National Day Laborer Organizing Network. Defendants are ordered to make any additional productions and/or to justify further withholdings consistent with this Order by August 29, 2011. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion [Docket No. 102]. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/8/2011) (jar)
|
July 11, 2011 |
Filing
99
OPINION AND ORDER. Summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part as to each party. As detailed above, defendants are required to submit revised Vaughn indexes containing further justifications for certain of their withholdings including repr esentations regarding the confidentiality of attorney-client communications and to produce certain documents, or portions thereof, that have previously been withheld. They are required to do so by August 1, 2011. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close these motions [Docket Nos. 32 and 47]. A conference is scheduled for August 11, 2011 at 5 p.m. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/11/11) (rjm)
|
February 7, 2011 |
Filing
41
OPINION AND ORDER: Once again, this Court is required to rule on an e-discovery issue that could have been avoided had the parties had the good sense to "meet and confer," "cooperate" and generally make every effort to "commu nicate" as to the form in which ESI would be produced. The quoted words are found in opinion after opinion and yet lawyers fail to take the necessary steps to fulfill their obligations to each other and to the court. While certainly not rising to the level of a breach of an ethical obligation, such conduct certainly shows that all lawyers even highly respected private lawyers, Government lawyers, and professors of law need to make greater efforts to comply with the expectations that court s now demand of counsel with respect to expensive and time-consuming document production. Lawyers are all too ready to point the finger at the courts and the Rules for increasing the expense of litigation, but that expense could be greatly diminished if lawyers met their own obligations to ensure that document production is handled as expeditiously and inexpensively as possible. This can only be achieved through cooperation and communication. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/7/2011) (lnl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2011: # 1 Exhibit A) (lnl).
|
February 3, 2011 |
Filing
39
OPINION AND ORDER Once again, this Court is required to rule on an e-discovery issue that could have been avoided had the parties had the good sense to "meet and confer," "cooperate" and generally make every effort to "communicate" as to the form in which ESI would be produced, and as further set forth in this document, see document. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/3/11) (cd)
|