Kriss et al v. BayRock Group LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jody Kriss, Michael Ejekam, BayRock Spring Street LLC and BayRock Whitestone LLC
Defendant: BayRock Group LLC, Tevfik Arif, Julius Schwarz, Felix Satter, Brian Halberg, Salvatore Lauria, Alex Salomon, Jerry Weinrich, Salomon & Company PC, Akerman Senterfitt LLP, Martin Domb, Craig Brown, Duval & Stachenfeld LLP, Bruce Stachenfeld, David Granin, Nixon Peabody LLP, Adam Gilbert, Roberts & Holland LLP, Elliot Pisem, Michael Samuel, Mel Dogan, BayRock Spring Street LLC, John Does 1-100, BayRock Whitestone LLC, BayRock Camelback LLC, BayRock Merrimac LLC, BayRock Group Inc. and National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 1:2010cv03959
Filed: May 10, 2010
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2016 439 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION re: 330 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint. filed by Bayrock Ocean Club LLC, Tevfik Arif, Elliot Pisem, Felix Satter, Salomon & Co., P.C., Roberts & Holland LLP, BayRock Group LLC, BayRock Spring Street LLC, Jerry Weinreich, Salvatore Lauria, BayRock Camelback LLC, Alex Salomon, BayRock Merrimac LLC, Julius Schwarz, BayRock Whitestone LLC, Mel Dogan.All other arguments in the parties' submissions related to this motion have been considered and determined to lack merit. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED with respect to the following herein. The motion is DENIED as to all other claims. For clarity the surviving claims and De fendants are as follows: Plaintiffs' substantive RICO claims as to Defendants Tevfik Arif, Felix Satter, Julius Schwarz, Bayrock Ocean Club LLC, Bayrock Merrimac LLC, Bayrock Camelback LLC, Bayrock Whitestone LLC, Bayrock Spring Street, LLC; Plaintiffs' RICO conspiracy claims as to Defendants Tevfik Arif, Felix Satter, Julius Schwarz, Alex Salomon, Jerry Weinreich, Salomon & Co.; Plaintiffs' fraudulent inducement claims, which are asserted against Defendants Bayrock Group LL C, Tevfik Arif, Felix Satter, Bayrock Ocean Club LLC, Bayrock Merrimac LLC, Bayrock Camelback LLC, Bayrock Whitestone LLC, Bayrock Spring Street, LLC; Plaintiffs' breach of contract claims, which are asserted against Defendants Bayrock Group LL C, Tevfik Arif, Felix Satter, Bayrock Ocean Club LLC, Bayrock Merrimac LLC, Bayrock Camelback LLC, Bayrock Whitestone LLC, Bayrock Spring Street, LLC; Plaintiffs' breach of fiduciary duty and aiding and abetting breach of fiduciary duty claims, which are asserted against Defendants Tevfik Arif, Felix Satter, Julius Schwarz, Bayrock Group LLC, Alex Salomon, Jerry Weinreich, Salomon & Co., Mel Dogan, Elliot Pisem, Roberts & Holland LLP; and Plaintiffs' alter ego/corporate veil piercing claims, which are asserted against Defendants Tevfik Arif, Felix Satter, Julius Schwarz. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 330. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/2/2016) (kgo)
February 1, 2016 269 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re: 256 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint dated 10/18/2013. filed by BayRock Group LLC, BayRock Merrimac LLC, BayRock Spring Street LLC, BayRock Camelback LLC, BayRock Whitestone LLC, 147 MOTION to Set Aside April 30, 2015 Order of Magistrate Judge Maas. filed by Frederick Oberlander.For the foregoing reasons, the Order is VACATED. No later than February 22, 2016, the parties shall file simultaneous briefs, not to exceed 25 page s, to show cause why an order should not be issued forbidding Frederick Oberlander and Richard Lerner from filing any action in federal court that appends any of the Bayrock Documents or relies on information from the Bayrock Documents, and from filing any action in state court without appending the order restricting the filing in federal court. Each party shall file a 15-page response no later than March 7, 2016. The opening briefs shall include a detailed factual recitation supported by citations, including a description of the proceedings, findings and appeals in and from all relevant actions including those in the Eastern District of New York and the Second Circuit Court of Appeals. Apart from the April 30, 2015, Order which is addressed herein, this Order shall not affect the prior order of any court restraining the possession or dissemination of the Bayrock Documents, and shall not be interepreted or deemed to do so without an explicit ruling from a court with authority to issue such a ruling. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/1/2016) (kgo)
November 9, 2015 198 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re: 178 Report and Recommendations. For the foregoing reasons, the Report is ADOPTED in its entirety. Plaintiffs' application for leave to amend the FAC is granted. No later than November 23, 2015, Plaintiffs shall (i) file on ECF the SAC, redacting the agreed upon language in paragraphs 100, 248(b) and 248(d); and (ii) file an unredacted version of the SAC under seal. Plaintiffs shall serve the SAC promptly on each of the Defendants. The application to require a formal motion for leave to amend is denied. The application for attorneys' fees as a sanction for the delays in the filing of the Complaint is denied without prejudice and may be renewed, if appropriate, after discovery is complete. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/9/2015) (kgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kriss et al v. BayRock Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Kriss
Represented By: Frederick Martin Oberlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ejekam
Represented By: Frederick Martin Oberlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BayRock Spring Street LLC
Represented By: Frederick Martin Oberlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BayRock Whitestone LLC
Represented By: Frederick Martin Oberlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BayRock Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tevfik Arif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julius Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Satter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore Lauria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Weinrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salomon & Company PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akerman Senterfitt LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Domb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duval & Stachenfeld LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Stachenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Granin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nixon Peabody LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts & Holland LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Pisem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel Dogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BayRock Spring Street LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BayRock Whitestone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BayRock Camelback LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BayRock Merrimac LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BayRock Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?