Accident Fund Insurance Company of America et al v. Coyle et al
Plaintiff: The Trustees of Boston College, The Kroger Co. Master Retirement Trust, PSEG Master Retirement Trust, Pactive Corporation General Employee Benefit Trust, The University Of Connecticut Foundation, Inc., William Loftus, The Common Fund For Nonprofit Organizations and Its Subsidiaries and Affiliates, Broad Foundation, Horace Mann Techers Insurance Company and Allegiance Life Insurance Company, Horace Mann Life Insurance Co., Yampol Family Trust, Anne Arundel County, Maryland, T/A Anne Arundel County Retirement & Pension System, Texas County and District Retirement System, Broadsword Limited, The Foundation For Research and The Research Development Foundation, Congregation Of Divine Providence, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania State Employees' Retirement System, Trinity College, Willard E. Alexander, Kamilche Company, Elizabeth M. Johnston, Multi-strategy Bond Fund and Equity Opportunities Fund, Caterpillar, Inc. Pension Master Trust, Melvin Markey, Stitchting Bedrijfspensioenfonds Voor De Metaal En Technisehe Bedrijifstakken, Goldsmith Family Foundation, The Fisher Scientific Int'l Inc. Defined Benefit Master Trust, Qwest Pension Trust, California State Automobile Association, Barry Yampol Trust, University at Buffalo Foundation, Inc., Sandra Green, John T. Thornton, Eric Yampol Trust, Harry Orgler, Anthony Yampol Trust, Museum of Science, Eximius Capital Funding Ltd., Dominion Resources, Sally Freund, Richard Miller, Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Employees Retirement System, CCC Investment Trust, University of Minnesota Foundation Investment Advisors, Father Flanagan's Trust Fund, Gail Yampol, MLC Investments Limited, Goldsmith Testamentary Trusts, Granite Growth Investment LLC, IV, Demeter Trust, General Motors Investment Management Corp., Carol Judelson, James T. Morley, Western Conference of Teamsters Pension Trust Fund, People Energy Corporation Pension Trust, L-3 Communications Corporation, Research Beneficial Trust, International Paper, Joanne Yampol Revocable Trust, PSEG Nuclear LLC Master Decommissioning Trust, Pictet & Cie, American Friends of The Hebrew University, Charles Genuardi, Bennett Goodman, Qwesy Occupational Health Trust, Lydia Green, Tennessee Valley Authority Retirement System, Peter Kalkus Ira, The Timken Company Collective Investment Trust For Retirement Trusts, CommonFund Absolute Return Investors Company, Retail Clerks Pension Trust, Jessica Yampol Trust, Celanese America Corp. Retirement Pension Plan, Monsanto Company, XL Investments, Ltd., Blue Moon Fund, PSEG Qualified CIV, First Church of Christ, Scientist, The Mother Church Pension & Benefit Trust and The Christian Science Trustees For Gift and Endowments, Exora Investments LLC, Sarah Paturick, Joseph Yampol Trust #2, Stanley Diller, Brian Yampol Trust, The New York Public Library, Astor, Lenox and Tilden Foundations, Joseph Yampol, The Bradley Trusts, Simon Young, Joanne Yampol, Aluminum Company of America, Inc., Wells College, Hebrew Rehabilitation Center For The Aged, College of The Holy Cross, Stichting Blue Sky Active High Yield Fixed Income USA Fund, Lukeswood Holdings, L.P., Brown Family Partnership, Costas Kondylis, John F. Gottshall, Sprint Corporation, Navy Exchange Service Command Retirement Trust, Bruce A. Bassock, Accident Fund Insurance Company of America, San Diego County Employees Retirement Association, Hope Yampol, Jeffrey L. Bassock, The Edgerton Foundation, Dallas Police & Fire Pension System, Wagner & Brown, Ltd., Granite Growth Investment III, LP, The Children's Hospital Foundation, Ilene Powers, Charles Paturick, Amphenol Corporation Pension Plan, Delta Air Lines Benefit Trusts, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Deerfield, L.L.C., Virginia retirement System, Stephen A. Bassock, Robert Paturick, New York Times Companies Pension Trust, William Kelly, Allegheny Technologies Incorporated Defined Benefit Master Fund, Orchid Investments L.L.C., Del Monte Corporation Defined Benefit Master Trust, Central States Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, XL RE Ltd., Horace Mann Insurance Company, Edwin Gould Foundation, International Monetary Fund Staff Retirement Plan, Bowdoin College, Alan Green, Stephen Robin, WRH Offshore High Yield Partners, L.P., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.Benefit Plan, Sprugos Investments, L.L.C., Western Pennsylvania Teamsters and Employers Pension Fund, Jane Gerben Trust, Granite Growth Investment VI, LP, Honeywell Pension Investment Committee, Richard Ferguson, Depauw University, The American University in Cairo, Fred Galland, Lehigh University, Wesleyan College, Joseph Wallendal, Marissa Ferguson, Lukeswood, L.L.C., Devon Kelly, CommonFund Institutional Core Plus Bond Fund, LLC, Dallas Symphony Foundation, Inc., The Penates Foundation, Levine Investments Limited Partnership, Joan Diller, Howw, L.L.C. and Bonnie Loftus
Defendant: Dennis P. Coyle, Leslie J. Gelber, Pete J. Metros and Erland E. Kailbourne
Case Number: 1:2010cv04539
Filed: June 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Harold Baer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/12/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01529-JMF-RLE et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
March 7, 2013 Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/12/2012 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01529-JMF-RLE et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Unless notified otherwise by the Court, any Scheduling Order or Case Management Plan remains in effect notwithstanding the transfer, except that any currently scheduled conferences or oral arguments with the Court are adjourned until further notification. Plaintiffs in all open cases in, or related to, the above multi district litigation are to submit a single letter, not to exceed ten (10) pages, updating the Court on the status of the case no later than December 7, 2012. This single letter shall be on behalf of all plaintiffs. Defendants in all open cases in, or related to, the above multidistrict litigation are to submit a similar letter by the same date. The parties are directed to the Court's applicable Individual Rules and Practices (available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Furman) regarding the submission of letters. The status letters should include the following information listed herein. If any party believes that a separate letter regarding the status of its individual action is warranted, it shall submit, no later than November 26, 2012, a letter to the Court requesting leave to file a separate status letter. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/9/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01529-JMF-RLE et al.(ft)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Counsel for the parties in all open cases in or related to the above multidistrict litigation are directed to supply the Court, not later than September 5, 2012, with a list of all pending undecided motions filed by them, indicating, as to each motion, the docket number of the case and the docket entry number(s) of the motion(s), if any, adding an asterisk if the case is the subject of settlement discussions which, if successful, would render the motion moot. (Signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna on 8/28/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01529-LMM-RLE et al.(lmb)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AND NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the claims asserted by the plaintiffs in the above-captioned matter against Defendants Dennis P. Coyle, Erland E. Kailbourne, Pete J. Metros and Leslie J. Gelber are hereby voluntarily dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Presumably the parties have all consented and without the necessity of individual signatures and it is on that basis that I've signed off and direct the clerk to close the case and remove it from my docket. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 3/14/2012) (lmb)
February 29, 2012 Filing 41 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Harold Baer. Judge Lawrence M. McKenna is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
February 23, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Lawrence Rolnick Document #40 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Lawrence M. McKenna for approval. (dt)
February 22, 2012 Filing 40 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Dennis P. Coyle, Leslie J. Gelber, Erland E. Kailbourne, Pete J. Metros. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rolnick, Lawrence) Modified on 2/23/2012 (dt).
February 6, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lawrence M. McKenna. Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
February 1, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Lawrence M. McKenna is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT: Plaintiffs and Defendants, by their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate and agree that Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is adjourned until June 1, 2011, less than two weeks after the class action hearing. (Signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna on 4/11/2011) (jpo)
March 1, 2011 Filing 36 STIPULATION GRANTING DEFENDANTS EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT, Plaintiffs and Defendants, by their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate and agree that Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is adjourned until March 25, 2011, one week after the class action hearing. (Signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna on 3/1/11) (pl)
November 22, 2010 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Pete J. Metros waiver sent on 10/1/2010, answer due 11/30/2010. Document filed by Accident Fund Insurance Company of America; Willard E. Alexander; Allegheny Technologies Incorporated Defined Benefit Master Fund; Aluminum Company of America, Inc.; American Friends of The Hebrew University; Amphenol Corporation Pension Plan; Anne Arundel County, Maryland, T/A Anne Arundel County Retirement & Pension System; Anthony Yampol Trust; Barry Yampol Trust; Bruce A. Bassock; Jeffrey L. Bassock; Stephen A. Bassock; Blue Moon Fund; Bowdoin College; Brian Yampol Trust; Broad Foundation; Broadsword Limited; Brown Family Partnership; CCC Investment Trust; California State Automobile Association; Caterpillar, Inc. Pension Master Trust; Celanese America Corp. Retirement Pension Plan; Central States Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund; College of The Holy Cross; CommonFund Absolute Return Investors Company; CommonFund Institutional Core Plus Bond Fund, LLC; Commonwealth of Pennsylvania State Employees' Retirement System; Congregation Of Divine Providence; Dallas Police & Fire Pension System; Dallas Symphony Foundation, Inc.; Deerfield, L.L.C.; Del Monte Corporation Defined Benefit Master Trust; Delta Air Lines Benefit Trusts; Demeter Trust; Depauw University; Joan Diller; Stanley Diller; Dominion Resources; Edwin Gould Foundation; Eric Yampol Trust; Eximius Capital Funding Ltd.; Exora Investments LLC; Father Flanagan's Trust Fund; Marissa Ferguson; Richard Ferguson; First Church of Christ, Scientist, The Mother Church Pension & Benefit Trust and The Christian Science Trustees For Gift and Endowments; Sally Freund; Fred Galland; General Motors Investment Management Corp.; Charles Genuardi; Goldsmith Family Foundation; Goldsmith Testamentary Trusts; Bennett Goodman; John F. Gottshall; Granite Growth Investment III, LP; Granite Growth Investment LLC, IV; Granite Growth Investment VI, LP; Alan Green; Lydia Green; Sandra Green; Hebrew Rehabilitation Center For The Aged; Honeywell Pension Investment Committee; Horace Mann Insurance Company; Horace Mann Life Insurance Co.; Horace Mann Techers Insurance Company and Allegiance Life Insurance Company; Howw, L.L.C.; International Monetary Fund Staff Retirement Plan; International Paper; Peter Kalkus Ira; J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.Benefit Plan; Jane Gerben Trust; Jessica Yampol Trust; Joanne Yampol Revocable Trust; Elizabeth M. Johnston; Joseph Yampol Trust #2; Carol Judelson; Kamilche Company; Devon Kelly; William Kelly; Costas Kondylis; L-3 Communications Corporation; Lehigh University; Levine Investments Limited Partnership; Bonnie Loftus; William Loftus; Lukeswood Holdings, L.P.; Lukeswood, L.L.C.; MLC Investments Limited; Melvin Markey; Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital; Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Employees Retirement System; Richard Miller; Monsanto Company; James T. Morley; Multi-strategy Bond Fund and Equity Opportunities Fund; Museum of Science; Navy Exchange Service Command Retirement Trust; New York Times Companies Pension Trust; Orchid Investments L.L.C.; Harry Orgler; PSEG Master Retirement Trust; PSEG Nuclear LLC Master Decommissioning Trust; PSEG Qualified CIV; Pactive Corporation General Employee Benefit Trust; Charles Paturick; Robert Paturick; Sarah Paturick; People Energy Corporation Pension Trust; Pictet & Cie; Ilene Powers; Qwest Pension Trust; Qwesy Occupational Health Trust; Research Beneficial Trust; Retail Clerks Pension Trust; Stephen Robin; San Diego County Employees Retirement Association; Sprint Corporation; Sprugos Investments, L.L.C.; Stichting Blue Sky Active High Yield Fixed Income USA Fund; Stitchting Bedrijfspensioenfonds Voor De Metaal En Technisehe Bedrijifstakken; Tennessee Valley Authority Retirement System; Texas County and District Retirement System; The American University in Cairo; The Bradley Trusts; The Children's Hospital Foundation; The Common Fund For Nonprofit Organizations and Its Subsidiaries and Affiliates; The Edgerton Foundation; The Fisher Scientific Int'l Inc. Defined Benefit Master Trust; The Foundation For Research and The Research Development Foundation; The Kroger Co. Master Retirement Trust; The New York Public Library, Astor, Lenox and Tilden Foundations; The Penates Foundation; The Timken Company Collective Investment Trust For Retirement Trusts; The Trustees of Boston College; The University Of Connecticut Foundation, Inc.; John T. Thornton; Trinity College; Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania; University at Buffalo Foundation, Inc.; University of Minnesota Foundation Investment Advisors; Virginia retirement System; WRH Offshore High Yield Partners, L.P.; Wagner & Brown, Ltd.; Joseph Wallendal; Wells College; Wesleyan College; Western Conference of Teamsters Pension Trust Fund; Western Pennsylvania Teamsters and Employers Pension Fund; XL Investments, Ltd.; XL RE Ltd.; Gail Yampol; Hope Yampol; Joanne Yampol; Joseph Yampol; Yampol Family Trust; Simon Young. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
June 15, 2010 Filing 34 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Lawrence M. McKenna. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jnm)
June 15, 2010 Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (jnm)
June 15, 2010 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01529-LMM-RLE. (jnm)
June 15, 2010 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01529-LMM-RLE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jnm)
June 9, 2010 Filing 33 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying XL Insurance(Bermuda)Ltd; XL Capital, Ltd. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by XL RE Ltd.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 32 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying XL Insurance (Bermuda)Ltd.; XL Capital, Ltd. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by XL Investments, Ltd.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 31 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by WRH Offshore High Yield Partners, L.P.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 30 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wagner & Brown, Ltd.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Stichting Blue Sky Active High Yield Fixed Income USA Fund.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 28 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Howard Hughes Medical Institute as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sprugos Investments, L.L.C.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 27 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sprint Corporation.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pictet & Cie.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Orchid Investments L.L.C.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lukeswood, L.L.C.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lukeswood Holdings, L.P.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Levine Investments Limited Partnership.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by L-3 Communications Corporation.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kamilche Company.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by International Paper.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Howw, L.L.C.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Horace Mann Educators Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Horace Mann Life Insurance Co.(ama) (ama). (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Horace Mann Educators Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Horace Mann Insurance Company.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Horace Mann Educators Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Horace Mann Insurance Company.(ama)
June 9, 2010 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Horace Mann Educators Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Horace Mann Insurance Company.(ama)
June 9, 2010 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Granite Growth Investment LLC, IV.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Granite Growth Investment VI, LP.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Granite Growth Investment III, LP.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Exora Investments LLC.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Eximius Capital Funding Ltd.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dominion Resources.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Deerfield, L.L.C.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CCC Investment Trust.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by California State Automobile Association.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Accident Fund Holdings, Inc.; Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Accident Fund Insurance Company of America.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Brown Family Partnership.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying BlackRock, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Aluminum Company of America, Inc.(ama) (ama).
June 9, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dennis P. Coyle, Erland E. Kailbourne, Pete J. Metros, Leslie J. Gelber. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 905989)Document filed by Pactive Corporation General Employee Benefit Trust, Central States Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, The Children's Hospital Foundation, College of The Holy Cross, Allegheny Technologies Incorporated Defined Benefit Master Fund, The Common Fund For Nonprofit Organizations and Its Subsidiaries and Affiliates, Multi-strategy Bond Fund and Equity Opportunities Fund, CommonFund Institutional Core Plus Bond Fund, LLC, CommonFund Absolute Return Investors Company, Congregation Of Divine Providence, Dallas Police & Fire Pension System, Dallas Symphony Foundation, Inc., Deerfield, L.L.C., Del Monte Corporation Defined Benefit Master Trust, Delta Air Lines Benefit Trusts, Aluminum Company of America, Inc., Demeter Trust, Depauw University, Joan Diller, Stanley Diller, Dominion Resources, Retail Clerks Pension Trust, Accident Fund Insurance Company of America, The University Of Connecticut Foundation, Inc., Edwin Gould Foundation, Eximius Capital Funding Ltd., Exora Investments LLC, American Friends of The Hebrew University, Father Flanagan's Trust Fund, Richard Ferguson, Marissa Ferguson, First Church of Christ, Scientist, The Mother Church Pension & Benefit Trust and The Christian Science Trustees For Gift and Endowments, The Fisher Scientific Int'l Inc. Defined Benefit Master Trust, The Foundation For Research and The Research Development Foundation, Sally Freund, Fred Galland, General Motors Investment Management Corp., Charles Genuardi, The American University in Cairo, Goldsmith Family Foundation, Goldsmith Testamentary Trusts, Bennett Goodman, John F. Gottshall, Granite Growth Investment III, LP, Granite Growth Investment VI, LP, Granite Growth Investment LLC, IV, Alan Green, Lydia Green, Sandra Green, Amphenol Corporation Pension Plan, Hebrew Rehabilitation Center For The Aged, Honeywell Pension Investment Committee, Horace Mann Insurance Company, Horace Mann Life Insurance Co., Horace Mann Techers Insurance Company and Allegiance Life Insurance Company, Howw, L.L.C., International Monetary Fund Staff Retirement Plan, International Paper, J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.Benefit Plan, Jane Gerben Trust, Anne Arundel County, Maryland, T/A Anne Arundel County Retirement & Pension System, Joanne Yampol Revocable Trust, Joanne Yampol, Joseph Yampol, Anthony Yampol Trust, Barry Yampol Trust, Brian Yampol Trust, Eric Yampol Trust, Joseph Yampol Trust #2, Jessica Yampol Trust, Yampol Family Trust, Bruce A. Bassock, Elizabeth M. Johnston, Carol Judelson, Peter Kalkus Ira, Kamilche Company, Devon Kelly, William Kelly, Costas Kondylis, The Kroger Co. Master Retirement Trust, L-3 Communications Corporation, Lehigh University, Jeffrey L. Bassock, Levine Investments Limited Partnership, William Loftus, Bonnie Loftus, Lukeswood Holdings, L.P., Lukeswood, L.L.C., Melvin Markey, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Employees Retirement System, Richard Miller, San Diego County Employees Retirement Association, Stephen A. Bassock, James T. Morley, Museum of Science, Navy Exchange Service Command Retirement Trust, The New York Public Library, Astor, Lenox and Tilden Foundations, New York Times Companies Pension Trust, Orchid Investments L.L.C., Harry Orgler, Celanese America Corp. Retirement Pension Plan, Charles Paturick, Robert Paturick, Blue Moon Fund, Sarah Paturick, The Penates Foundation, People Energy Corporation Pension Trust, Pictet & Cie, Ilene Powers, PSEG Master Retirement Trust, PSEG Qualified CIV, PSEG Nuclear LLC Master Decommissioning Trust, Qwest Pension Trust, Qwesy Occupational Health Trust, Research Beneficial Trust, Stephen Robin, The Trustees of Boston College, Monsanto Company, Sprint Corporation, Sprugos Investments, L.L.C., Stitchting Bedrijfspensioenfonds Voor De Metaal En Technisehe Bedrijifstakken, Stichting Blue Sky Active High Yield Fixed Income USA Fund, Tennessee Valley Authority Retirement System, Texas County and District Retirement System, John T. Thornton, The Timken Company Collective Investment Trust For Retirement Trusts, Trinity College, Bowdoin College, University at Buffalo Foundation, Inc., The Edgerton Foundation, University of Minnesota Foundation Investment Advisors, Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, Willard E. Alexander, Virginia retirement System, Wagner & Brown, Ltd., Joseph Wallendal, Wells College, Wesleyan College, Western Conference of Teamsters Pension Trust Fund, The Bradley Trusts, Western Pennsylvania Teamsters and Employers Pension Fund, WRH Offshore High Yield Partners, L.P., XL Investments, Ltd., XL RE Ltd., Gail Yampol, Hope Yampol, Simon Young, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania State Employees' Retirement System, Caterpillar, Inc. Pension Master Trust, MLC Investments Limited, Broad Foundation, Broadsword Limited, Brown Family Partnership, California State Automobile Association, CCC Investment Trust.(ama) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2010: #1 Complaint pages 40-99, #2 Complaint pages 100-142) (ama). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2010: #1 Complaint exhibits pages 1-39, #2 Complaint exhibits pages 40-99, #3 Complaint exhibits pages 100-142) (ama).
June 9, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dennis P. Coyle, Erland E. Kailbourne, Pete J. Metros, Leslie J. Gelber. (ama)
June 9, 2010 Case Designated ECF. (ama)
June 9, 2010 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lawrence M. McKenna as possibly Related to 1:03-MD-1529. (ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Accident Fund Insurance Company of America et al v. Coyle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Trustees of Boston College
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Kroger Co. Master Retirement Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSEG Master Retirement Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pactive Corporation General Employee Benefit Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The University Of Connecticut Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Loftus
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Common Fund For Nonprofit Organizations and Its Subsidiaries and Affiliates
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broad Foundation
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horace Mann Techers Insurance Company and Allegiance Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horace Mann Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yampol Family Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Arundel County, Maryland, T/A Anne Arundel County Retirement & Pension System
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas County and District Retirement System
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadsword Limited
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Foundation For Research and The Research Development Foundation
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Congregation Of Divine Providence
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania State Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity College
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willard E. Alexander
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamilche Company
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth M. Johnston
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Multi-strategy Bond Fund and Equity Opportunities Fund
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caterpillar, Inc. Pension Master Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Markey
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stitchting Bedrijfspensioenfonds Voor De Metaal En Technisehe Bedrijifstakken
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goldsmith Family Foundation
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fisher Scientific Int'l Inc. Defined Benefit Master Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qwest Pension Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California State Automobile Association
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Yampol Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University at Buffalo Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Green
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Thornton
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Yampol Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Orgler
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Yampol Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Museum of Science
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eximius Capital Funding Ltd.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominion Resources
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Freund
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Miller
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CCC Investment Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Minnesota Foundation Investment Advisors
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Father Flanagan's Trust Fund
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Yampol
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MLC Investments Limited
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goldsmith Testamentary Trusts
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite Growth Investment LLC, IV
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demeter Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Motors Investment Management Corp.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Judelson
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T. Morley
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Conference of Teamsters Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People Energy Corporation Pension Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L-3 Communications Corporation
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Research Beneficial Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Paper
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Yampol Revocable Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSEG Nuclear LLC Master Decommissioning Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pictet & Cie
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Friends of The Hebrew University
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Genuardi
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennett Goodman
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qwesy Occupational Health Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Green
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Valley Authority Retirement System
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Kalkus Ira
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Timken Company Collective Investment Trust For Retirement Trusts
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CommonFund Absolute Return Investors Company
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retail Clerks Pension Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Yampol Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celanese America Corp. Retirement Pension Plan
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XL Investments, Ltd.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Moon Fund
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSEG Qualified CIV
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Church of Christ, Scientist, The Mother Church Pension & Benefit Trust and The Christian Science Trustees For Gift and Endowments
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exora Investments LLC
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Paturick
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Yampol Trust #2
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Diller
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Yampol Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The New York Public Library, Astor, Lenox and Tilden Foundations
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Yampol
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bradley Trusts
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Young
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Yampol
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aluminum Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells College
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hebrew Rehabilitation Center For The Aged
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: College of The Holy Cross
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stichting Blue Sky Active High Yield Fixed Income USA Fund
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lukeswood Holdings, L.P.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brown Family Partnership
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Costas Kondylis
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. Gottshall
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Corporation
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navy Exchange Service Command Retirement Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce A. Bassock
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accident Fund Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego County Employees Retirement Association
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Yampol
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. Bassock
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Edgerton Foundation
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Police & Fire Pension System
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wagner & Brown, Ltd.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite Growth Investment III, LP
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Children's Hospital Foundation
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilene Powers
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Paturick
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amphenol Corporation Pension Plan
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Air Lines Benefit Trusts
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deerfield, L.L.C.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia retirement System
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Bassock
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Paturick
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Times Companies Pension Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kelly
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allegheny Technologies Incorporated Defined Benefit Master Fund
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orchid Investments L.L.C.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Del Monte Corporation Defined Benefit Master Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central States Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XL RE Ltd.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horace Mann Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Gould Foundation
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Monetary Fund Staff Retirement Plan
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bowdoin College
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Green
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Robin
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WRH Offshore High Yield Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.Benefit Plan
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprugos Investments, L.L.C.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Pennsylvania Teamsters and Employers Pension Fund
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Gerben Trust
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite Growth Investment VI, LP
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honeywell Pension Investment Committee
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ferguson
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Depauw University
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The American University in Cairo
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Galland
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lehigh University
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesleyan College
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wallendal
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Ferguson
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lukeswood, L.L.C.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Kelly
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CommonFund Institutional Core Plus Bond Fund, LLC
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Symphony Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Penates Foundation
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levine Investments Limited Partnership
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Diller
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howw, L.L.C.
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Loftus
Represented By: Marc B. Kramer
Represented By: Sheila A. Sadighi
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Rolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis P. Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie J. Gelber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete J. Metros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erland E. Kailbourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?