Overseas Direct Import Co., Ltd. v. Family Dollar Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Overseas Direct Import Co., Ltd. |
Defendant: |
Family Dollar Stores, Inc. and Prestige Global Co., Ltd. |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv04919 |
Filed: |
June 24, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
John G. Koeltl |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1114 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 12, 2013 |
Filing
153
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 140 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 68. filed by Family Dollar Stores, Inc. For the reasons stated above, FDSs motion for attorneys fees is denied. ODIs request for attorneys fees incurred in responding to FDSs motion is also denied. FDS has ten days from the receipt of this decision to file a Bill of Costs with the Clerk pursuant to Local Rule 54.1. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 140. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/12/2013) (djc)
|
March 14, 2013 |
Filing
88
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Family Dollar Stores, Inc. and Prestige Global Co., Ltd as to Counts I, III, IV, V and VIII of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint and Defendant Family Dollars breach of contrac t counterclaim in their entirety, and a filed by Family Dollar Stores, Inc., Prestige Global Co., Ltd. Accordingly, FDSs motion for summary judgment on the counterclaim for breach of contract is denied. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed above, they are either moot or without merit. The Defendants' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 71. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/13/2013) (djc)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing
17
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal after the decision of the District Court for the Western District of North Carolina re: 3 MOTION to Dismiss Or Transfer Case to the Western District of North Carolina, filed by Family Dollar Stores, Inc. This case is stayed pending further order of the Court. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 3. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 11/23/10) (cd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?