Club Texting, Inc. v. T-Mobile USA, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Club Texting, Inc.
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv07205
Filed: September 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: P. Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2010 Filing 23 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Document filed by Club Texting, Inc.. (Robinson, Jayne)
September 30, 2010 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 09/23/2010, Receipt Number 915703. (jd)
September 27, 2010 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. T-Mobile USA, Inc. served on 9/23/2010, answer due 10/14/2010. Service was accepted by Robert Singh. Document filed by Club Texting, Inc.. (Robinson, Jayne)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Michael B. Hazzard to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Club Texting, Inc. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/23/10) (jmi)
September 24, 2010 Filing 20 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Shahriyar Neman in Support re: 6 Order to Show Cause,,,. Document filed by Club Texting, Inc.. (Robinson, Jayne)
September 24, 2010 Filing 19 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 6 Order to Show Cause,,, with Certificate of Service. Document filed by Club Texting, Inc.. (Robinson, Jayne)
September 23, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION for Michael B. Hazzard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Club Texting, Inc.(mro)
September 23, 2010 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 6 Order to Show Cause,,, to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Unger, Alan)
September 23, 2010 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Venetia Espinoza-Dawson in Opposition re: 6 Order to Show Cause,,,. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A - Part 4)(Unger, Alan)
September 23, 2010 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Alan M. Unger in Opposition re: 6 Order to Show Cause,,,. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Unger, Alan)
September 22, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Alan M. Unger to RE-FILE Document 8 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. Use the event type Memorandum in Support (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers, then link to 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (db)
September 22, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Alan M. Unger to RE-FILE Document 9 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, 7 Declaration in Opposition to Motion. Use the event type Declaration in Opposition (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers, then link to 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (db)
September 22, 2010 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Shahriyar Neman in Support re: 6 Order to Show Cause,,,. Document filed by Club Texting, Inc.. (Robinson, Jayne)
September 22, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan M. Unger on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Unger, Alan)
September 22, 2010 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 6 Order to Show Cause,,, for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. Document filed by Club Texting, Inc.. (Robinson, Jayne)
September 22, 2010 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Unger, Alan)
September 22, 2010 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff EZ Texting, Inc.s Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and the Declarations of Alan M. Unger and Venetia Espinoza-Dawson served on Club Texting, Inc., d/b/a EZ Texting on 09-22-2010. Service was made by the Court's CM/ECF system. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Unger, Alan)
September 22, 2010 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - DECLARATION of Venetia Espinoza-Dawson in Opposition re: 3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order with Declaration of Shahriyar Neman and Complaint. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Part1, # 2 Exhibit A-Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A- Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A- Part 4)(Unger, Alan) Modified on 9/23/2010 (db).
September 22, 2010 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order with Declaration of Shahriyar Neman and Complaint.. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Unger, Alan) Modified on 9/23/2010 (db).
September 22, 2010 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - DECLARATION of Alan M. Unger in Opposition re: 3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order with Declaration of Shahriyar Neman and Complaint. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Unger, Alan) Modified on 9/23/2010 (db).
September 21, 2010 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Jayne Scimeca Robinson to RE-FILE Document 4 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Use the event type Memorandum in Support (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers, then link to 6 ORDER. (db)
September 21, 2010 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause with Supporting Papers and Memorandum of Law served on T-Mobile USA, Inc. on 09/17/10. Service was made by Federal Express for overnight delivery. Document filed by Club Texting, Inc.. (Robinson, Jayne)
September 21, 2010 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order with Declaration of Shahriyar Neman and Complaint. Document filed by Club Texting, Inc. (Robinson, Jayne) Modified on 9/22/2010 (db).
September 21, 2010 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order with Declaration of Shahriyar Neman and Complaint. Document filed by Club Texting, Inc. Return Date set for 9/30/2010 at 02:15 PM.(Robinson, Jayne) Modified on 9/22/2010 (db).
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant shall show cause as to why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure enjoining the defendant during the pendency of this action from blocking test messages to and from Plaintiff's short code 313131. It is further ordered that Plaintiff is not required to post a bond or other security. ENDORSEMENT: It is further ordered that personal service of a copy of this order and annexed papers upon which it is based upon the defendant or its counsel, by hand delivery on 9/17/2010 or overnight Federal Express Saturday for arrival 9/18/10. delivery shall be deemed good and sufficient service thereof. So Ordered Show Cause Hearing set for 9/30/2010 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/17/2010) (js)
September 17, 2010 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Club Texting, Inc.(ama) (ama).
September 17, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 915435)Document filed by Club Texting, Inc.(ama) (ama).
September 17, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to T-Mobile USA, Inc. (ama)
September 17, 2010 Case Designated ECF. (ama)
September 17, 2010 Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Club Texting, Inc. v. T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Club Texting, Inc.
Represented By: Jayne Scimeca Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?