Willagirl, LLC v. The Wella Corporation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Willagirl, LLC
Defendant: The Wella Corporation
Counter_claimant: The Wella Corporation
Counter_defendant: Willagirl, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv01017
Filed: February 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S. Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel that the above-captioned action is dismissed, with prejudice against Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Willagirl LLC and Defendant and Counter-Plaintiff The Wella Corporation pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/17/2011) (ab)
October 13, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 10/13/2011. (lmb)
October 3, 2011 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
September 30, 2011 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re: 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Errata Sheet. Document filed by Willagirl, LLC. (Widell, Alexander)
September 26, 2011 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
September 12, 2011 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
September 2, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Willagirl, LLC.(Widell, Alexander)
September 2, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by The Wella Corporation. Responses due by 9/26/2011(Koonce, Lance)
August 30, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein: Settlement Conference held on 8/30/2011. (ft)
August 29, 2011 Filing 12 ANSWER to 9 Counterclaim. Document filed by Willagirl, LLC.(Widell, Alexander)
August 22, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 8/22/2011. (ft)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A settlement conference in this matter is scheduled for August 30, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17-A, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. The parties should be sure to arrive a few minutes early so that the conference may begin promptly. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 8/11/11) (djc)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/10/2011) (ab)
August 11, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 8/30/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (djc)
August 5, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 8/5/2011. (lmb)
June 24, 2011 Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Willagirl, LLC. Document filed by The Wella Corporation. (Koonce, Lance)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/16/2011) (ab)
May 24, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/24/2011. (mbe)
April 21, 2011 Filing 7 REPLY To Counterclaims. Document filed by Willagirl, LLC. (Widell, Alexander)
April 6, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/6/2011, ( Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2011 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (mbe)
April 6, 2011 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: that this Court requires that this Court be ready for trial on 8-28-11. This case is to be tried to a jury. Joinder of Parties due by 5/13/2011. Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2011. All Deposition (including any expert depositions, see item 3 above) must be due by 7/1/2011. All Discovery due by 7/15/201. Post discovery Summary Judgment Motions due by 8/1/2011, Responses due by 8/15/2011, Replies due by 8/22/2011. Final Pretrial Conference, as well as oral argument on any post-discovery summary judgment motions, shall be held on 8/29/2011 at 04:00 PM. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/6/11) (pl)
April 1, 2011 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Willagirl, LLC. Document filed by The Wella Corporation.(Koonce, Lance)
March 11, 2011 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Wella Corporation served on 2/17/2011, answer due 3/10/2011. Service was accepted by Lilly Barra -- Human Resources. Document filed by Willagirl, LLC. (Widell, Alexander)
March 4, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/4/2011. (ab)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/28/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/3/11) (laq)
February 15, 2011 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Willagirl, LLC.(ama) (ama).
February 15, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Wella Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 929723)Document filed by Willagirl, LLC.(ama) (ama).
February 15, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Wella Corporation. (ama)
February 15, 2011 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (ama)
February 15, 2011 Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (ama)
February 15, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willagirl, LLC v. The Wella Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willagirl, LLC
Represented By: William Andrew Brewer, III
Represented By: P. Kent Correll
Represented By: Alexander David Widell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wella Corporation
Represented By: Lance Herman Koonce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: The Wella Corporation
Represented By: Lance Herman Koonce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Willagirl, LLC
Represented By: William Andrew Brewer, III
Represented By: P. Kent Correll
Represented By: Alexander David Widell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?