Wireless Ink Corporation v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Wireless Ink Corporation
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC and MySpace, Inc.
Counter_claimant: MySpace, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Wireless Ink Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv01751
Filed: March 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: P. Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROTECTIVE ORDER:...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/26/2011) (js)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE granting 35 Motion for Elizabeth Stameshkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Elizabeth Stameshkin is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for MySpace, Inc. in this action. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/23/2011) (tro) Modified on 5/23/2011 (tro).
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: Brian S. Rosenbloom is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for MySpace, Inc. in this action. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/23/2011) (tro)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: Sharon L. Davis is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for MySpace, Inc. in this action. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/23/2011) (tro)
May 20, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 05/13/2011, Receipt Number 6746. (jd)
May 20, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 05/10/2011, Receipt Number 6349. (jd)
May 16, 2011 Filing 34 ANSWER to Counterclaim. Document filed by Wireless Ink Corporation.(Pitcock, Jeremy)
May 13, 2011 Filing 35 MOTION for Elizabeth Stameshkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(sjo)
May 10, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION for Brian S. Rosenbloom to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by MySpace, Inc.(sjo)
May 10, 2011 Filing 36 MOTION for Sharon L. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by MySpace, Inc.(sjo)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER: Identification of potentially disputed claim terms: 6/3/2011. Exchange of constructions of all disputed terms and supporting evidence: 6/24/2011. Opening claim construction briefs due 7/14/2011. Oposition claim construction briefs due 8/12/2011. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/9/2011) (jar)
May 9, 2011 Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. Initial disclosures shall be completed no later than 14 days from the date of this order. All fact discovery shall be completed by 12/30/2011. All expert discovery due by 3/30/2012. Parties to submit a proposed schedule on claim construction. The next Case Management conference set for 1/20/2012 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/9/2011) (jar)
May 9, 2011 Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/9/2011. The two actions 10civ 1841 and 11civ. 1751 are consolidated solely to coordinate pretrial proceedings. Next conference date on both cases is scheduled for January 20, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. (djc)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, granting 24 Motion for Mark Weinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/6/11) (pl)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, granting 26 Motion for Michael G. Rhodes to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/6/11) (pl)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, granting 25 Motion for Heidi Keefe to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/6/11) (pl)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, granting 27 Motion for Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/6/11) (pl)
May 9, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $100.00, paid on 05/02/2011, Receipt Number 5576. (jd)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, granting 21 Motion for Jennifer Ishimoto to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff Wireless Ink Corporation. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/4/2011) (lnl)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, granting 20 Motion for David R. Stevens to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Plaintiff Wireless Ink Corporation. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/4/2011) (lnl)
May 3, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 04/28/2011, Receipt Number 5309. (jd)
May 2, 2011 Filing 27 MOTION for Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(mbe)
May 2, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION for Michael G. Rhodes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(mbe)
May 2, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION for Heidi Keefe to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(mbe)
May 2, 2011 Filing 24 MOTION for Mark Weinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(mbe)
April 28, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION for Jennifer Ishimoto to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Wireless Ink Corporation.(mbe)
April 28, 2011 Filing 20 MOTION for David R. Stevens to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Wireless Ink Corporation.(mbe)
April 25, 2011 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Youtube, LLC.(McGann, Kevin)
April 25, 2011 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Youtube, LLC.(McGann, Kevin)
April 25, 2011 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Google, Inc..(McGann, Kevin)
April 25, 2011 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Google, Inc..(McGann, Kevin)
April 25, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Chase on behalf of Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC (Chase, Aaron)
April 25, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin X. McGann on behalf of Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC (McGann, Kevin)
April 25, 2011 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Ink Corporation. Document filed by MySpace, Inc..(Lieberman, Steven)
April 25, 2011 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying News Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by MySpace, Inc..(Lieberman, Steven)
April 25, 2011 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Chaudhury, Arastu)
April 25, 2011 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Chaudhury, Arastu)
April 1, 2011 Filing 9 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS FACEBOOK, INC., GOOGLE INC., AND YOUTUBE, LLC TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: It is hereby stipulated and greed by and between the parties that the Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended to April 25, 2011. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/1/2011) (jpo)
April 1, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Paul Bach on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Bach, Jonathan)
April 1, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arastu Kabeer Chaudhury on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Chaudhury, Arastu)
March 31, 2011 Filing 6 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Steven Lieberman dated 3/31/2011 re: Requesting a 20 day extension of the time to respond to the Complaint until April 25, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/31/2011) (jpo)
March 31, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven M Lieberman on behalf of MySpace, Inc. (Lieberman, Steven)
March 18, 2011 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. (sjo)
March 18, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
March 18, 2011 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:10-cv-01841-PKC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (sjo)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/9/2011 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Unassigned. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/17/2011) (laq)
March 15, 2011 Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (ama)
March 15, 2011 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wireless Ink Corporation.(ama)
March 15, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (ama)
March 15, 2011 CASE REFERRED TO Judge P. Kevin Castel as possibly related to 1:10-cv-1841. (ama)
March 15, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Facebook, Inc., Google, Inc., MySpace, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (ama)
March 15, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc., Google, Inc., MySpace, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 931846)Document filed by Wireless Ink Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B)(ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wireless Ink Corporation v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wireless Ink Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Ishimoto
Represented By: Jeremy S. Pitcock
Represented By: David R. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Bach
Represented By: Arastu Kabeer Chaudhury
Represented By: Heidi Keefe
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Jessica Valenzulela Santamaria
Represented By: Mark Randolph Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Chase
Represented By: Kevin X. McGann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Chase
Represented By: Kevin X. McGann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MySpace, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MySpace, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Wireless Ink Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy S. Pitcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?