Time Warner Cable Inc. v. Viacom International Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Time Warner Cable Inc.
Defendant: Viacom International Inc., Comedy Partners, Black Entertainment Television LLC and Country Music Television, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv02376
Filed: April 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Leonard B. Sand
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Defendants Viacom International Inc., Comedy Partners, Black Entertainment Television LLC, and Country Music Television, Inc. ("Defendants") have accepted service of the Complaint in this action. Defendants shall have until May 31, 2011 to answer or otherwise move in response to the Complaint. (Black Entertainment Television LLC answer due 5/31/2011; Comedy Partners answer due 5/31/2011; Country Music Television, Inc. answer due 5/31/2011; Viacom International Inc. answer due 5/31/2011). (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 4/25/11); (djc) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
April 12, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Thomas Salzmann on behalf of Black Entertainment Television LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Viacom International Inc. (Salzmann, Matthew) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff is granted leave to file the unredacted version of the Complaint in this action under seal and that the unredacted version of the Complaint will remain under seal until further order of this Court, with access thereto to be provided only to the Court and, to the parties and their counsel and financial advisors. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 4/7/11) (js) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Time Warner Cable Inc.(ama) (ama). (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Time Warner Cable Inc. v. Viacom International Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Time Warner Cable Inc.
Represented By: Brian T Markley
Represented By: Ronald William Meister
Represented By: Jonathan David Thier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom International Inc.
Represented By: Lucy Sarah McMillan
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Salzmann
Represented By: Michael David Schissel
Represented By: Peter L. Zimroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comedy Partners
Represented By: Lucy Sarah McMillan
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Salzmann
Represented By: Michael David Schissel
Represented By: Peter L. Zimroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Entertainment Television LLC
Represented By: Lucy Sarah McMillan
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Salzmann
Represented By: Michael David Schissel
Represented By: Peter L. Zimroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Music Television, Inc.
Represented By: Lucy Sarah McMillan
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Salzmann
Represented By: Michael David Schissel
Represented By: Peter L. Zimroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?